USA v. Lizarraga

Criminal Case California Southern District Court, Case No. 3:14-cr-01594
Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Last Updated August 2, 2017 at 11:23 PM EDT (7.7 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Juan Antonio Lizarraga, Defendant (1)

Represented by Galvin & Mlawski

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: CJA Appointment Gerald T McFadden +1 619 338 0507 +1 619 239 5872 gtmcfadden@hotmail.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None
SENTENCING SUMMARY CHART by USA as to Juan Antonio Lizarraga (Millsaps, Cynthia) (cxl). (Entered: 11/06/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Cynthia Lynne Millsaps appearing for USA. (Millsaps, Cynthia)Attorney Cynthia Lynne Millsaps added to party USA(pty:pla) (cxl). (Entered: 10/24/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER ACCEPTING GUILTY PLEA as to count(s) 1 of the Information, as to Juan Antonio Lizarraga, adopting 22 Findings and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 10/22/2014. (cxl) (Entered: 10/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING as to Defendant Juan Antonio Lizarraga. Upon the joint request of counsel, the Sentence With PSR set for 10/24/2014 is HEREBY VACATED AND RESCHEDULED TO 12/22/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4C before Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo. (no document attached) (lmh) (Entered: 10/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None
ADDENDUM TO PRE-SENTENCE REPORT as to Juan Antonio Lizarraga. Report prepared by: Cara Brown. (Document applicable to USA, Juan Antonio Lizarraga.) (Lara, R.) (cxl). (Entered: 10/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None
OBJECTION TO PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT by Juan Antonio Lizarraga (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(McFadden, Gerald)(cxl). (Entered: 10/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None
PRE-SENTENCE REPORT as to Juan Antonio Lizarraga. Report prepared by: Cara Brown. (Document applicable to USA, Juan Antonio Lizarraga.) (Lara, R.) (cxl). (Entered: 09/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Harold W. Chun appearing for USA. (Chun, Harold)Attorney Harold W. Chun added to party USA(pty:pla) (yeb). (Entered: 08/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge upon a Tendered Plea of Guilty as to Juan Antonio Lizarraga: Recommending that the district judge accept the defendant's plea of guilty. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 8/7/2014. (yeb) (Entered: 08/11/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin: Change of Plea Hearing as to Juan Antonio Lizarraga held on 8/7/2014. Plea Tendered by Juan Antonio Lizarraga Guilty on counts one of the Information. Excludable(s) started as to Juan Antonio Lizarraga: XK Proposed Plea Agreement 8/7/14-10/24/14. PSR Ordered. Consent, Plea Agreement, and Findings filed. Objection to Findings due within 14 days. Motion for Discovery and Leave to File further motions withdrawn. Motion Hearing/Trail Setting set for 8/18/14 before Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo vacated. Sentence With PSR set for 10/24/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4C before Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo. (Interpreter Matias Pizarro). (CD# 8/7/2014 MDD:2:05-2:44). (Plaintiff Attorney Connie Wu, AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Gerald McFadden, CJA). (no document attached) (cap) (Entered: 08/08/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None
PLEA AGREEMENT as to Juan Antonio Lizarraga (yeb) (Entered: 08/08/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
CONSENT TO RULE 11 PLEA before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin by Juan Antonio Lizarraga. (yeb) (Entered: 08/08/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Defendant Juan Antonio Lizarraga: At the request of defense counsel, Change of Plea Hearing set for 8/7/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1E before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. (no document attached) (mkz) (Entered: 07/30/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING as to Defendant Juan Antonio Lizarraga. Upon the request of defense counsel (first request) with no opposition from the government, the Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 7/9/2014 is HEREBY VACATED AND RESCHEDULED TO 8/18/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4C before Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo. Defense motions are currently pending on the court's docket.(no document attached) (lmh) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING as to Defendant Juan Antonio Lizarraga. Due to the unavailability of the Court on the current scheduled hearing date, the Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 7/11/2014 is HEREBY VACATED AND RESCHEDULED TO 7/9/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4C before Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo. Counsel to contact the courtroom deputy should the hearing need to be rescheduled to another date. Counsel to inform their client of the change of date if the defendant is released on bond. (no document attached) (lmh) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
MOTION for Discovery , MOTION for Leave to File Further Motions by Juan Antonio Lizarraga. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Proof of Service)(McFadden, Gerald) (yeb). (Entered: 06/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin: Arraignment on Information as to Juan Antonio Lizarraga (1) Count 1 held on 6/5/2014. Not Guilty plea entered. Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 7/11/2014 10:30 AM before Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo. (Interpreter Lucinda Bush). (CD# 6/5/2014 MDD 14-1:2:04-2:16). (Plaintiff Attorney Julia Cline, AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Artemis Spyridonidis, S/A). (no document attached) (aje) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None
WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Juan Antonio Lizarraga (aje) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None
INFORMATION as to Juan Antonio Lizarraga (1) count(s) 1. (aje) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE of Vacated Hearing(s), re 9 Waiver of Preliminary Hearing Rule 5.1: Preliminary Hearing set for 05/22/2014 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin is vacated. (no document attached) (mkz) [3:14-mj-01656-MDD] (Entered: 05/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF DETENTION ON DEFENDANT'S WAIVER OF BAIL PENDING TRIAL as to Juan Antonio Lizarraga. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 5/14/14. (dls) [3:14-mj-01656-MDD] (Entered: 05/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing Rule 5.1 by Juan Antonio Lizarraga (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(McFadden, Gerald)(dlg). [3:14-mj-01656-MDD] (Entered: 05/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin: Detention Hearing as to Juan Antonio Lizarraga not held on 5/13/2014. Defendant stipulates to detention pending trial without prejudice. The Court finds the 5 Motion to Detain as to Juan Antonio Lizarraga moot. Order of detention to be submitted by AUSA. (CD# 5/13/2014 MDD:1:45-1:48). (Plaintiff Attorney Andrew Wasicek, AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Artemis Spryridonidis, S/A for Gerald McFadden, CJA). (no document attached) (mkz) [3:14-mj-01656-MDD] (Entered: 05/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Juan Antonio Lizarraga (tkl) [3:14-mj-01656-MDD] (Entered: 05/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
***Spanish Interpreter needed as to Juan Antonio Lizarraga (no document attached) (lao) [3:14-mj-01656-MDD] (Entered: 05/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
Oral MOTION to Detain (flight) by USA as to Juan Antonio Lizarraga. (no document attached) (lao) [3:14-mj-01656-MDD] (Entered: 05/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin: Initial Appearance as to Juan Antonio Lizarraga held on 5/9/2014. Attorney Gerald T McFadden (n/a) appointed for Juan Antonio Lizarraga. Financial Affidavit filed. Bond set as to Juan Antonio Lizarraga (1) No Bail. Detention Hearing (flight) set for 5/13/2014 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. Preliminary Hearing set for 05/22/2014 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. Arraignment set for 06/05/2014 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. (Interpreter Salvador Castellanos). (CD# 5/9/2014 MDD 14:2:39-3:09). (Plaintiff Attorney Andrew Wasicek, AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Morgan Stewart, FD-S/A). (no document attached) (lao) [3:14-mj-01656-MDD] (Entered: 05/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin: Status Hearing re Initial Appearance as to Juan Antonio Lizarraga (n/a) held on 5/8/2014. Initial Appearance continued to 5/9/2014 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. Defendant's Rule 5 objection denied without prejudice. (CD# 5/8/2014 MDD 14:3:14-3:15). (Plaintiff Attorney Andrew Wasicek, AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Rory McHale, FD-S/A). (no document attached) (lao) [3:14-mj-01656-MDD] (Entered: 05/08/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Juan Antonio Lizarraga: Initial Appearance set for 5/8/2014 before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. (no document attached) (lao) [3:14-mj-01656-MDD] (Entered: 05/08/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
COMPLAINT as to Juan Antonio Lizarraga. (Attachments: # 1 Info Sheet)(mtb) [3:14-mj-01656-MDD] (Entered: 05/08/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 87 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?