Kindig-It Design v. Creative Controls
Federal Civil Lawsuit Utah District Court, Case No. 2:14-cv-00867
District Judge Robert J. Shelby, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 20, 2017 at 1:34 PM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Kindig-It Design, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by MORRISS O'BRYANT COMPAGNI PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bretton Leon Crockett +1 801 478 0071 crockett@utahpatents.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frank W. Compagni +1 801 478 0071 compagni@utahpatents.com
No Logo Kindig-It Design , Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by MORRISS O'BRYANT COMPAGNI PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frank W. Compagni +1 801 478 0071 compagni@utahpatents.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bretton Leon Crockett +1 801 478 0071 crockett@utahpatents.com
v.
No Logo Creative Controls, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by PARSONS BEHLE & LATIMER (UT)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael R. McCarthy +1 801 532 1234

Toggle Switch Represented by Young Basile Hanlon & MacFarlane, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael M. Jacob +1 248 649 3333 +1 248 649 3338 jacob@youngbasile.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas N. Young +1 248 649 3333 +1 248 649 3338 young@youngbasile.com
No Logo Rutter's Rod Shop, Defendant
No Logo Speedway Motors, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (112) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Judgment - Attorney Fees
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Judgment - Default
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Hearing
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document 124 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Memorandum Decision
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Compel
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None Hearing
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Judgment - Default
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None Order to Show Cause
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Default Judgment
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 101 Filed: 6/3/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER granting 90 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim of Defendant Speedway Motors, Inc. under Rule 12(B)(6). Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 6/3/16. (ss) (Entered: 06/03/2016)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                          NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: 90 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : (Notice generated by ss) Motion Hearing set for 6/7/2016 at 10:00 AM in Rm 8.200 before Judge Jill N. Parrish. (ss) (Entered: 05/23/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 5/19/2016, Entered: None
                            Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT CERTIFICATE as to Creative Controls. (jlw) (Entered: 05/19/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/18/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER granting 91 Motion for Sanctions; granting 93 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 5/18/16. (jlw) (Entered: 05/18/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None
                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 90 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM OF DEFENDANT SPEEDWAY MOTORS, INC. filed by Plaintiff Kindig-It Design. (Compagni, Frank) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/4/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Creative Controls is hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why Kindigs Motion for Sanctions (Docket 91) and Speedways Motion for Default Judgment (Docket 93) should not be granted. Creative Controls must respond accordingly by May 13, 2016. Additionally, Creative Controls must comply with the courts order and obtain counsel in this case. Creative Controls is provided notice that failure to comply with this order will result in sanctions including, but not limited to, an award of attorneys fees and entry of default judgment against it. See Klein-Becker USA, LLC, v. Englert, 711 F.3d 1153 (10th Cir. 2013). Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 5/4/16. (jlw) (Entered: 05/04/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    Motions No Longer Referred: 91 MOTION for Sanctions for Failure to Comply. Judge Parrish will handle this motion. (ss) (Entered: 05/03/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: None
                                      REQUEST to Submit for Decision re 91 MOTION for Sanctions for Failure to Comply filed by Plaintiff Kindig-It Design. (Compagni, Frank) (Entered: 05/03/2016)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None
                                        MOTION for Default Judgment as to defendant(s) Creative Controls, Inc. filed by Defendant Speedway Motors. (Meyer, Charles) (Entered: 05/02/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None
                                          RESPONSE to Motion re 90 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendant Speedway Motors. (Meyer, Charles) (Entered: 05/02/2016)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None
                                            MOTION for Sanctions for Failure to Comply filed by Plaintiff Kindig-It Design. Motions referred to Brooke C. Wells.(Compagni, Frank) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: None
                                                **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for Subpoena to Produce Documents served on Kelly Nixon, Registered Agent of eBay Inc. on 03/07/2016, filed by Plaintiff Kindig-It Design. (Compagni, Frank) (Entered: 04/01/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: None
                                                    ANSWER to 26 Amended Complaint,,, , CROSSCLAIM against Creative Controls, COUNTERCLAIM against Kindig-It Design filed by Speedway Motors.(Meyer, Charles) (Entered: 03/11/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/10/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: None Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan O. Hafen on behalf of Speedway Motors (Hafen, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/08/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None
                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 74 Defendant's MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Creative Controls, Inc. filed by Defendant Creative Controls. (McCarthy, Michael) (Entered: 03/03/2016)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE of Subpoena by Kindig-It Design (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Subpoena) (Compagni, Frank) (Entered: 03/03/2016)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 74 Defendant's MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Creative Controls, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Kindig-It Design. (Compagni, Frank) (Entered: 02/29/2016)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None
                                                                          Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support re 74 Defendant's MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Creative Controls, Inc. filed by Defendant Creative Controls. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Supplemental Declaration of Michael R. McCarthy in Support of Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel)(McCarthy, Michael) (Entered: 02/26/2016)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            DOCKET TEXT ORDER taking under advisement 74 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The Court has reviewed the Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Upon review, the Court notes the Motion does not contain any discussion regarding the effect a withdrawal will have on counsel admitted pro hac vice in this case. Therefore, counsel for Creative Controls, Inc. is to submit a supplemental memorandum by Friday, February 26, 2016 that addresses whether counsel admitted pro hac vice has been notified of this motion and any effect withdrawal will have on the representation. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 2/24/2016. No attached document. (lam) (Entered: 02/24/2016)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order)(Compagni, Frank) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                    Supplemental BRIEF re 32 Defendant's MOTION to Stay the Claims Against the Retailer Defendants filed by Defendant Creative Controls. (McCarthy, Michael) (Entered: 02/05/2016)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                      Supplemental BRIEF re 32 Defendant's MOTION to Stay the Claims Against the Retailer Defendants filed by Plaintiff Kindig-It Design. (Compagni, Frank) (Entered: 02/05/2016)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                        Creative Controls, Inc.'s ANSWER to 26 Amended Complaint,,, and Statement of Affirmative Defenses filed by Creative Controls.(McCarthy, Michael) (Entered: 02/03/2016)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 67 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None Memorandum Decision
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                              Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 31 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Change Venue filed by Plaintiff Kindig-It Design. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Email, # 2 Exhibit 2- Catalog)(Compagni, Frank) (Entered: 10/12/2015)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support re 31 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Change Venue filed by Defendant Creative Controls. (McCarthy, Michael) (Entered: 10/12/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL of Sarah E. Jelsema filed by Sarah E. Jelsema on behalf of Creative Controls (Jelsema, Sarah) (Entered: 10/02/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jill N. Parrish. Motion Hearing held on 9/24/2015 re 31 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Change Venue filed by Creative Controls. After hearing arguments from counsel, Court took the matter under advisement. Court will issue a written ruling. Attorney for Plaintiff: Frank W. Compagni and Bretton Crockett, Attorney for Defendant: Sarah E. Jelsema and Michael McCarthy. Court Reporter: Patti Walker.(ss) (Entered: 09/24/2015)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                        SURREPLY in Opposition re 31 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Change Venue filed by Plaintiff Kindig-It Design. (ss) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting 56 Motion for Leave to File a Surreply. The surreply that was attached as Exh 1 to the motion will be filed by the Court. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 9/22/15. No attached document. (ss) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING of Intent Not to File an Opposition re 56 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File TO FILE A SURREPLY and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Creative Controls. (Jelsema, Sarah) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              DOCKET TEXT ORDER - All defendants in this case are hereby ordered to file their response, if any, to Kindig-It Design, Inc.'s Motion for Leave a Surreply 56 by 9/21/15. No attached document. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 9/15/15. (ss) (Entered: 09/15/2015)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                Motions No Longer Referred: 56 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File TO FILE A SURREPLY and Memorandum in Support This is related to a dispositive motion and will be handled by Judge Parrish. (ss) (Entered: 09/15/2015)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    DOCKET TEXT ORDER: Before the Court is Kindig-It Design, Inc.'s Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File a Surreply. 54 It appears this was not served on opposing parties to the proceeding. The motion makes no indication as to why it is appropriate for the Court to consider this on an ex parte basis. The motion is DENIED without prejudice. The Court would be willing to reconsider the motion upon refiling containing a required proof of service. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 9/11/15. No attached document. (wh) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah E. Jelsema on behalf of Creative Controls (Jelsema, Sarah) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: 31 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Change Venue : (Notice generated by ss) Motion Hearing set for 9/24/2015 at 02:30 PM in Rm 8.200 before Judge Jill N. Parrish. (ss) (Entered: 09/09/2015)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. So ordered by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 8/31/15 (docket text only - no attached document) (alt) (Entered: 09/02/2015)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Motions No Longer Referred: 32 Defendant's MOTION to Stay and Memorandum in Support the Claims Against the Retailer Defendants (ss) (Entered: 09/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of Sarah E. Jelsema in Support re 31 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Creative Controls, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss and/or Transfer Plaintiff's Supplemental and Second Amended Complaint Under Rules 12(B)(2), (3) and (6) filed by Defendant Creative Controls. (McCarthy, Michael) (Entered: 08/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of Thomas R. Stowers in Support re 31 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Creative Controls, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss and/or Transfer Plaintiff's Supplemental and Second Amended Complaint Under Rules 12(B)(2), (3) and (6) filed by Defendant Creative Controls. (McCarthy, Michael) (Entered: 08/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 31 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Creative Controls, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss and/or Transfer Plaintiff's Supplemental and Second Amended Complaint Under Rules 12(B)(2), (3) and (6) filed by Defendant Creative Controls. (McCarthy, Michael) (Entered: 08/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of Thomas R. Stowers in Support re 32 Defendant's MOTION to Stay and Memorandum in Support the Claims Against the Retailer Defendants filed by Defendant Creative Controls. (McCarthy, Michael) (Entered: 08/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 32 Defendant's MOTION to Stay and Memorandum in Support the Claims Against the Retailer Defendants filed by Defendant Creative Controls. (McCarthy, Michael) (Entered: 08/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          REASSIGNMENT to Newly Appointed District Judge. Case Reassigned to District Judge Jill N. Parrish. Judge Robert J. Shelby no longer assigned to the case. Case number will now read 2:14-cv-00867-JNP. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (rks) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 31 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Creative Controls, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss and/or Transfer Plaintiff's Supplemental and Second Amended Complaint Under Rules 12(B)(2), (3) and (6) filed by Plaintiff Kindig-It Design. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Mark Anthony Zarate)(Compagni, Frank) (Entered: 08/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 32 Defendant's MOTION to Stay and Memorandum in Support the Claims Against the Retailer Defendants filed by Plaintiff Kindig-It Design. (Compagni, Frank) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                REDACTION Declaration of Thomas R. Stowers in Support of Defendant Creative Controls, Inc.'s Motion to Supplement Its 12(b)(2) Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Creative Controls. (McCarthy, Michael) (Entered: 08/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  REDACTION Defendant Creative Controls, Inc.'s Motion to Supplement Its 12(b)(2) Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Creative Controls. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- Kindig Website)(McCarthy, Michael) (Entered: 08/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 38 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    **SEALED DOCUMENT**Declaration of Thomas R. Stowers in Support re 37 *SEALED DOCUMENT* SEALED MOTION to Supplement its 12(B)(2) Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Creative Controls. (las) (Entered: 08/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 37 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        *SEALED DOCUMENT* SEALED MOTION to Supplement Its 12(B)(2) Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Creative Controls. Document is linked to 31 (las) Modified on 9/8/2015 (ss). (Entered: 08/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Sarah E. Jelsema re 35 Notice of Conventional Filing filed by Creative Controls. (McCarthy, Michael) (Entered: 07/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF CONVENTIONAL FILING of Defendant Creative Controls, Inc.'s Motion to Supplement Its 12(b)(2) Motion to Dismiss and Declaration of Thomas R. Stowers in Support filed by Defendant Creative Controls (McCarthy, Michael) (Entered: 07/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Creative Controls identifying N/A as Corporate Parent. (McCarthy, Michael) (Entered: 07/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of Thomas R. Stowers in Support re 32 Defendant's MOTION to Stay and Memorandum in Support the Claims Against the Retailer Defendants filed by Defendant Creative Controls. (McCarthy, Michael) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's MOTION to Stay and Memorandum in Support the Claims Against the Retailer Defendants filed by Defendant Creative Controls. (McCarthy, Michael) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kindig-It Design as to Speedway Motors served on 7/1/2015, answer due 7/22/2015. (Compagni, Frank) (Entered: 07/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kindig-It Design as to Rutter's Rod Shop served on 6/30/2015, answer due 7/21/2015. (Compagni, Frank) (Entered: 07/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Speedway Motors. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (bdr) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Rutter's Rod Shop. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (bdr) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. New Defendants: Speedway Motors, Inc. and Rutter's Rod Shop, Inc.., filed by Kindig-It Design. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- US Patent 8544904, # 2 Exhibit B- US Patent 8894109, # 3 Exhibit C- Copyright Reg (kindigit.com), # 4 Exhibit D- Copyright Reg (1964 Cadillac), # 5 Exhibit E- Copyright Reg (Hess Camaro), # 6 Exhibit F - Copyright Reg (Blue Truck), # 7 Exhibit G- Copyright Reg (1956 Chevy), # 8 Exhibit H - who-is listing, # 9 Exhibit I - Silenthand.co, # 10 Exhibit J- ebay listing, # 11 Exhibit K- ebay smooth door handles, # 12 Exhibit L- Speedway Catalog, # 13 Exhibit M- speedwaymotors.com whois, # 14 Exhibit N- speedway website, # 15 Exhibit O- Rutters whois, # 16 Exhibit P- Rutters website) (Compagni, Frank) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 23 MOTION for Leave to File Amended and Supplemental Complaint and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Creative Controls. (McCarthy, Michael) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 17 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and/or transfer filed by Defendant Creative Controls. (McCarthy, Michael) (Entered: 04/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: 17 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and/or transfer : (Notice generated by Mary Jane McNamee) Motion Hearing set for 7/21/2015 at 3:00 PM in Rm 7.300 before Judge Robert J. Shelby. (mjm) (Entered: 04/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 17 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and/or transfer filed by Plaintiff Kindig-It Design. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Mark Anthony Zarate)(Compagni, Frank) (Entered: 04/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  DOCKET TEXT ORDER denying without prejudice 7 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Motion may be refiled in response to the Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 2/20/2015. No attached document. (las) Modified on 2/20/2015 - Correction to docket text(mjm). (Entered: 02/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Creative Controls. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (eat) (Entered: 11/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 7 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and/or Transfer filed by Plaintiff Kindig-It Design. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Mark Anthony Zarate)(Compagni, Frank) (Entered: 02/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Report on the Filing of an action mailed to the Register of Copyrights Office. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Copy of Complaint) (eat) (Entered: 11/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT against Creative Controls with Jury Demand., filed by Kindig-It Design. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- US Patent 8544904, # 2 Exhibit B- US Patent 8894109, # 3 Exhibit C- Copyright Reg (kindigit.com), # 4 Exhibit D- Copyright Reg (1964 Cadillac), # 5 Exhibit E- Copyright Reg (Hess Camaro), # 6 Exhibit F - Copyright Reg (Blue Truck), # 7 Exhibit G- Copyright Reg (1956 Chevy), # 8 Exhibit H - who-is listing, # 9 Exhibit I - Silenthand.co, # 10 Exhibit J- ebay listing) (Compagni, Frank) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (eat) (Entered: 11/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kindig-It Design as to Creative Controls served on 11/26/2014, answer due 12/17/2014. (Compagni, Frank) (Entered: 12/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against Creative Controls (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-2166203), filed by Kindig-It Design. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- US Patent 8544904, # 2 Exhibit B- US Patent 8894109, # 3 Exhibit C- Copyright App (kindigit.com), # 4 Exhibit D- Copyright App (1964 Cadillac), # 5 Exhibit E- Copyright App (Hess Camaro), # 6 Exhibit F - Copyright App (Blue Truck), # 7 Exhibit G- Copyright App (1956 Chevy), # 8 Exhibit H - who-is search, # 9 Exhibit I - Silenthand.co, # 10 Exhibit J- ebay listing, # 11 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet) Assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby (Compagni, Frank) (Entered: 11/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby. Plaintiff Kindig-It Design is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (eat) (Entered: 11/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 3,233 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?