Stein v. World Wide Plumbing Supply Incorporated et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-06795

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 29, 2017 at 3:55 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Rivka Stein, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vincent Filardo +1 212 612 3265 +1 212 612 3297 Vincent.Filardo@mishcon.com
Space Daniel Mandell +1 212 612 3289 dan.mandell@mishcon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rivka Stein

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rivka Stein +1 347 930 8292
v.
No Logo Abraham Berger, Defendant
No Logo Baruch Weiss, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baruch Weiss

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Baruch Weiss +1 416 878 8838
No Logo Burtolucci's Catering Corp., Defendant
No Logo Burtolucci's Ristorante, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Chaim Lefkowitz, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Snitow Kanfer Holtzer & Millus LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alan Victor Klein +1 212 317 8500 aklein@skhllp.com
Space Elliot Jeffrey Rosner +1 212 317 8500
Space Franklyn Harvey Snitow +1 212 317 8500 +1 212 317 1308 fsnitow@skhllp.com
No Logo Gedalia Daniel Katz, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gedalia Daniel Katz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gedalia Daniel Katz +1 718 564 4180
No Logo John Doe 1 through 30, Defendant
No Logo John Doe 1 through 5, Defendant
No Logo Moshe Weiss, Defendant
No Logo Pearl Weiss, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pearl Weiss

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Pearl Weiss +1 718 435 5022
No Logo Ruchie Weiss, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ruchie Weiss

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ruchie Weiss +1 718 435 5022
No Logo Sirki Ehrman, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sirki Ehrman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sirki Ehrman +1 773 866 1499
No Logo Suri Lefkowitz, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Snitow Kanfer Holtzer & Millus LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
also known asSarah Weiss Lefkowitz Franklyn Harvey Snitow +1 212 317 8500 +1 212 317 1308 fsnitow@skhllp.com
No Logo Wiztel USA Inc., Defendant
No Logo World-Wide Plumbing Supply Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Snitow Kanfer Holtzer & Millus LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/02/2014 Franklyn Harvey Snitow +1 212 317 8500 +1 212 317 1308 fsnitow@skhllp.com
No Logo Yoel Weiss, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuinn Hillsman & Palefsky

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey R. Berke +1 212 888 8787 +1 888 316 1631 jrberke@aol.com
  Entries (113) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 1/12/2016, Entered: None Judgment - Clerk
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 1/12/2016, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None Order(Other)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None Stay
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None Status Conference
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None Scheduling Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None Pre Motion Conference
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None Order(Other)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None
                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File documents by Rivka Stein. (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 09/02/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None Letter
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None
                        Letter from Plaintiff Rivka Stein agreeing to dismiss against Burtolluccis and Moishe Weiss and agreeing to have State Court record divorce action be disclosed with a confidentiality order. (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None Initial Conference Hearing
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Appoint Counsel
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None NOTICE of Change of Address/Firm/Email
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE of Change of address by Rivka Stein. (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 04/20/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Sanctions
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None Sanctions
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                MOTION for Sanctions submitted by Ruchie Weiss, Pro Se Defendant by Ruchie Weiss. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-D) (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 04/02/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                  AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 69 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Rivka Stein Redacted filed by Rivka Stein. (Filardo, Vincent) (Entered: 04/01/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                    AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 69 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Rivka Stein Filed Under Seal and Ex Parte filed by Rivka Stein. (Filardo, Vincent) (Entered: 04/01/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                      AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 69 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Rivka Stein Redacted filed by Rivka Stein. (Filardo, Vincent) (Entered: 04/01/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                        AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 69 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Rivka Stein Filed Under Seal and Ex Parte filed by Rivka Stein. (Filardo, Vincent) (Entered: 04/01/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                          AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 69 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Rivka Stein Redacted filed by Rivka Stein. (Filardo, Vincent) (Entered: 04/01/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                            AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 69 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Rivka Stein Filed Under Seal and Ex Parte filed by Rivka Stein. (Filardo, Vincent) (Entered: 04/01/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None Reply in Support
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None Reply in Support
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                    Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Mishcon Drey New York LLP's 69 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Rivka Stein filed by Rivka Stein, plaintiff pro se. (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 03/25/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                          AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 69 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Rivka Stein Filed Ex Parte and Under Seal Pursuant to March 10, 2015 Order in Unredacted Form filed by Rivka Stein. (Filardo, Vincent) (Entered: 03/11/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Support
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                              AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 69 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Rivka Stein Redacted Pursuant to March 10, 2015 Order filed by Rivka Stein. (Filardo, Vincent) (Entered: 03/11/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Support
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Blank 65 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                            Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss by Baruch Weiss. (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 02/11/2015)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Order(Other)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                  EXHIBITS 1-7 Related document: 61 Letter dated 1/28/15 from Baruch Weiss, defendant pro se re: seeking permission to dismiss certain claims of the amended complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 8, # 2 Exhibit 9, # 3 Exhibit 10) (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 02/04/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Letter dated 1/28/15 from Baruch Weiss, defendant pro se re: seeking permission to dismiss certain claims of the amended complaint. Voluminous Exhibits attached (will scan separately) (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 01/30/2015)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/10/2015, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rivka Stein re 57 Status Conference, (Mandell, Daniel) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: None Adjourn Conference
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rivka Stein re 50 Memorandum in Opposition (Mandell, Daniel) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              REPLY in Support re 33 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference to dismiss Amended Complaint Memorandum of Law filed by Chaim Lefkowitz, Suri Lefkowitz, World-Wide Plumbing Supply Inc.. (Klein, Alan) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 46 Letter MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss filed by Rivka Stein. (Filardo, Vincent) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Mail Returned as Undeliverable. The 36 Order was sent to Sirki Ehrman, 6172 North Drake Avenue, Chicago, IL 60659. Returned with postal notations: Return to Sender. Not deliverable as addressed. Unable to Forward. (On 5/19/2014, copies of the 4 , 21 , and 36 Orders and a copy of the docket sheet were re-mailed to Sirki Ehrman, 6132 North Drake Avenue, Chicago, IL 60659.) (Barrett, C) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 33 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference to dismiss Amended Complaint , First MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Chaim Lefkowitz, Suri Lefkowitz, World-Wide Plumbing Supply Inc.. (Rosner, Elliot) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER re 46 Letter MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss filed by Gedalia Daniel Katz. The Court will deem this letter as Katz' motion to dismiss. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 5/9/2014. (Barrett, C) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Letter MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss by Gedalia Daniel Katz. (Barrett, C) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rivka Stein re 27 Amended Complaint on defendant Sirki Ehrman at Confirmed Address (Mandell, Daniel) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Verified ANSWER to 27 Amended Complaint by Ruchie Weiss. (Barrett, C) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Verified ANSWER to 27 Amended Complaint by Pearl Weiss. (Barrett, C) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re 41 MOTION for More Definite Statement Leave To Serve Defendant Sirky Ehrman At Alternative Address And Order Declaring Such Service To Be Sufficient filed by Rivka Stein. (Mandell, Daniel) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for More Definite Statement Leave To Serve Defendant Sirky Ehrman At Alternative Address And Order Declaring Such Service To Be Sufficient by Rivka Stein. (Mandell, Daniel) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    Mail Returned as Undeliverable. A copy of Judge Cogan's Order dated 3/31/2014, was sent to Sirki Ehrman, 6172 North Drake Avenue, Chicago, IL 60659. Returned with postal notations: Return to Sender. Vacant. Unable to forward. (Barrett, C) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 33 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference to dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Rivka Stein. (Filardo, Vincent) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 27 Amended Complaint by Yoel Weiss. (Berke, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for pre motion conference re 27 Amended Complaint by Yoel Weiss. (Berke, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 35 Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition and Reply to Motion to Dismiss: 1. Plaintiff Rivka Stein shall have until April 30, 2014 to file her Opposition to defendants World Wide Plumbing Supply, Inc.'s, Chaim Lefkowitz's, and Suri Lefkowitz's Motion to Dismiss, filed March 31, 2014 (Docket No. 33 ) ("Motion to Dismiss"); and 2. Defendants World Wide Plumbing Supply, Inc., Chaim Lefkowitz, and Suri Lefkowitz shall have until May 15, 2014 to file their Reply in support of the Motion to Dismiss. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/4/2014. (Barrett, C) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition and Reply to Motion to Dismiss by Rivka Stein. (Filardo, Vincent) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rivka Stein re 27 Amended Complaint (Mandell, Daniel) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Letter MOTION for pre motion conference to dismiss Amended Complaint by Chaim Lefkowitz, Suri Lefkowitz, World-Wide Plumbing Supply Inc.. (Rosner, Elliot) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 27 Amended Complaint by Yoel Weiss. (Berke, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rivka Stein. Burtolucci's Ristorante, LLC served on 3/17/2014, answer due 4/7/2014. (Filardo, Vincent) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION Extending Time of Defendant Yoel Weiss to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the First Amended Complaint by Rivka Stein (Filardo, Vincent) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Summons Issued as to Burtolucci's Ristorante, LLC. (Barrett, C) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Rivka Stein of WIZTEL USA, Inc. (Filardo, Vincent) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Rivka Stein. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Summons to Bertolucci's Ristorante, LLC) (Filardo, Vincent) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Mandell on behalf of Rivka Stein (aty to be noticed) (Mandell, Daniel) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Attorney's Firm Name, Address, Phone, Fax, and E-mail by Vincent Filardo, Jr (Filardo, Vincent) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter Regarding Motion to Dismiss and Amended Complaint by Rivka Stein (Filardo, Vincent) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION Extending Time To File Amended Complaint And Answer, Move, Or Otherwise Respond Thereto by Rivka Stein (Filardo, Vincent) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent Filardo, Jr on behalf of Rivka Stein (aty to be noticed) (Filardo, Vincent) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re 20 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. The premotion conference is waived. This letter is deemed to constitute the Moving Defendants' motion to dismiss. Plaintiff must file opposition papers by 2/17/14 or this action may be dismissed. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/30/2014. (Cogan, Brian) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter MOTION for pre motion conference to Dismiss Complaint by Chaim Lefkowitz, Suri Lefkowitz, World Wide Plumbing Supply Incorporated. (Klein, Alan) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Elliot Jeffrey Rosner on behalf of Chaim Lefkowitz, Suri Lefkowitz, World Wide Plumbing Supply Incorporated (aty to be noticed) (Rosner, Elliot) (Entered: 01/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter dated January 7, 2014, from Franklyn H. Snitow, Esq., seeking extension of time to respond to the Complaint to and including January 31, 2014 by Chaim Lefkowitz, Suri Lefkowitz, World Wide Plumbing Supply Incorporated (Snitow, Franklyn) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Victor Klein on behalf of Chaim Lefkowitz, Suri Lefkowitz, World Wide Plumbing Supply Incorporated (aty to be noticed) (Klein, Alan) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Franklyn H. Snitow on behalf of Chaim Lefkowitz, Suri Lefkowitz, World Wide Plumbing Supply Incorporated (aty to be noticed) (Snitow, Franklyn) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Gedalia Daniel Katz. (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Ruchie Weiss. (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Pearl Weiss. (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Baruch Weiss. (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Sirki Ehrman. (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Yoel Weiss. (Berke, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rivka Stein. Ruchie Weiss served on 12/4/2013, answer due 12/26/2013. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rivka Stein. Sirki Ehrman / Weiss served on 12/4/2013, answer due 12/26/2013. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rivka Stein. Baruch Weiss served on 12/4/2013, answer due 12/26/2013. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rivka Stein. Pearl Weiss served on 12/4/2013, answer due 12/26/2013. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rivka Stein. Moshe Weiss a/k/a Joel Weiss served on 12/4/2013, answer due 12/26/2013. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER -- Federal law requires a plaintiff to serve the Complaint and the Summons on each named defendant no later than 120 days after the filing of the Complaint in court. See Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m). The plaintiff filed the Complaint in this case on December 3, 2013. As a result, if she does not serve the Complaint on the defendants by April 2, 2014, the court will be required under that same rule either to dismiss the case without prejudice (meaning that it can be filed later, subject to certain conditions) or to set a final deadline for the plaintiff to serve the Complaint and Summons on the defendants. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 12/17/2013. c/m to pro se litigant. (Guy, Alicia) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Rivka Stein. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 427 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?