J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Kafil
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:14-cv-07073

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 9, 2019 at 8:51 PM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 47 U.S.C. § 521
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/9/2019, Entered: None Satisfaction of Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Attorney Fees
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None Attorney Fees
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          JUDGMENT by Judge William D. Keller: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND ADJUDGED:1. Defendants Bruce Johan Kafil, individually and doing business as Lotuson Flower, and Lotus on Flower, LLC, an unknown business entity doing businessas Lotus on Flower, shall pay the plaintiff, J & J Sports Productions, Inc.,$8,800.00 in total damages. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (shb)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None Mediation Report (ADR-3) Unable to Reach Agreement
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None Notice of Mediation Date (ADR-13)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None Status Report
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: None Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?