District Appellate Supreme
Federal
District Of Columbia District Court Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit
  1. Case No. 04-5313
    Filed 7/20/2007
  2. Case No. 09-5311
    Filed on Unknown Date
United States Supreme Court

Richard Horn v. Arthur Brown, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit, Case No. 09-5311

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 10, 2016 at 10:09 AM EDT (5.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Arthur Brown, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Seth Galanter +1 202 887 1500 seth.galanter@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert A. Salerno +1 202 887 1500 +1 202 887 0763 rsalerno@mofo.com
No Logo Franklin Pancho Huddle, Jr., Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David M. Maria +1 202 637 2200 +1 202 637 2201 david.maria@lw.com
No Logo Richard A. Horn, Plaintiff - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Brian C. Leighton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian C. Leighton +1 559 297 6190 +1 559 297 6194 kim@lawleighton.com
United States of America United States of America, Movant - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space H. Thomas Byron +1 202 514 2000 H.Thomas.Byron@usdoj.gov
Space Ian Gershengorn +1 202 514 2331 +1 202 616 8202 ian.gershengorn@usdoj.gov
Space Barbara L. Herwig barbara.herwig@usdoj.gov
Space Douglas N. Letter +1 202 514 2000 douglas.letter@usdoj.gov
Nature of Suit 2440 - Civil Rights: Other
Case Type Civil US
Lower Court Case https://ecf.dcd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=1:94-cv-01756-RCL
Lower Court Case https://ecf.dcd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=1:94-cv-01756-RCL
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None
MANDATE ISSUED to Clerk, District Court [09-5311]
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01206728889 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None
    CLERK'S ORDER filed [1241679] granting motion to dismiss case voluntarily [1238253-2], issuing mandate [09-5311]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01206655262 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None
      MOTION filed [1238253] by USA to dismiss case voluntarily Pages: 1-10. [09-5311] (Byron, H. Thomas)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01206629951 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: None
        CLERK'S ORDER filed [1236856] considering motion to govern future proceedings [1236462-2], to hold case in abeyance [1236462-3]; directing parties to file motions to govern future proceedings by 04/26/2010 [09-5311]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01206624148 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: None
          CONSENT MOTION filed [1236462] by USA to govern future proceedings, to hold case in abeyance [Service Date: 03/24/2010 ] Pages: 1-10. [09-5311] (Byron, H. Thomas)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01206542526 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
            CLERK'S ORDER filed [1231550] granting motion for leave to file [1230866-4]; granting motion to govern future proceedings [1230866-2]; directing parties to file motions to govern future proceedings by 03/25/2010 [09-5311]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01206528312 Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: None
              CONSENT MOTION filed [1230866] by USA to govern future proceedings, to hold case in abeyance, for leave to file motion Pages: 1-10. [09-5311] (Byron, H. Thomas)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01206426404 Filed: 1/12/2010, Entered: None
                CLERK'S ORDER filed [1225232] granting motion to govern future proceedings [1224213-2]; directing party to file motions to govern future proceedings by 02/11/2010 [09-5311]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01206407462 Filed: 1/6/2010, Entered: None
                  CONSENT MOTION filed [1224213] by USA to govern future proceedings. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 01/22/2010), to hold case in abeyance (Response to Motion served by mail due on 01/22/2010) [Service Date: 01/06/2010 by email] Pages: 1-10. [09-5311] (Byron, H. Thomas)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01206330029 Filed: 12/7/2009, Entered: None
                    CLERK'S ORDER filed [1219199] granting motion to govern future proceedings [1218451-2]; directing parties to file motions to govern future proceedings by 01/06/2010 [09-5311]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01206313516 Filed: 12/1/2009, Entered: None
                      CONSENT MOTION filed [1218451] by USA to govern future proceedings, to hold case in abeyance [Service Date: 12/01/2009 ] Pages: 1-10. [09-5311] (Byron, H. Thomas)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01206244249 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: None
                        CLERK'S ORDER filed [1214582] granting motion to govern future proceedings [1213652-2]; to continue to hold case in abeyance [1213652-3]; directing parties to file motions to govern future proceedings by 12/01/2009 [09-5311]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01206233018 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: None
                          CONSENT MOTION filed [1213652] by USA to govern future proceedings, to hold case in abeyance [Service Date: 11/02/2009 ] Pages: 1-10. [09-5311] (Byron, H. Thomas)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01206150152 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: None
                            CLERK'S ORDER filed [1209443] granting motion to hold case in abeyance [1208954-2] . Case 09-5311 held in abeyance pending mediation; directing parties to file motions to govern future proceedings by 11/02/2009 [09-5311]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01206144414 Filed: 9/30/2009, Entered: None
                              MOTION filed [1208954] by USA to hold case in abeyance [Service Date: 09/30/2009 ] Pages: 1-10. [09-5311] (Byron, H. Thomas)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document 01206127427 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: None
                                MODIFIED DOCKET TEXT--APPENDIX [1208038] filed [Volumes:1] [Service Date: 09/24/2009 ] [09-5311]--[Edited 09/25/2009 by MAL] (Byron, H. Thomas)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01206127409 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: None
                                  APPELLANT BRIEF [1208031] filed by USA [Service Date: 09/24/2009 ] Length of Brief: 13,825. [09-5311] (Byron, H. Thomas)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01206108155 Filed: 9/17/2009, Entered: None
                                    ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1206765] by Robert A. Salerno and co-counsel Seth M. Galanter on behalf of Appellee Arthur Brown. [09-5311] (Galanter, Seth)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01206089350 Filed: 9/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1205471] granting motion to stay case [1204825-2], setting briefing schedule and format: APPELLANT Brief , 14,000 wds, due 09/24/2009. Appendix due 09/24/2009. APPELLEE Briefs (brief for appellee Horn and joint brief for appellees Brown and Huddle, 14,000 wds in the aggregate to be apportioned as appellees see fit) due on 10/08/2009. APPELLANT Reply Brief, 7,000 wds, due 10/15/2009. Clerk directed to calendar case for argument on the first available date following completion of briefing; court will not entertain dispositive motions; parties should therefor address in briefs any arguments otherwise properly raised in such motions; parties directed to hand-deliver paper copies of briefs to Clerk's Office on the date due. Judge Tatel, Griffith and Kavanaugh [09-5311] (Lister, Mary)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01206086808 Filed: 9/9/2009, Entered: None
                                        REPLY FILED [1205211] by USA to response [1205101-2], [1205038-2], [1205015-2], [1204994-2] [Service Date: 09/09/2009 by email] [09-5311] (Byron, H. Thomas)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank  Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: None
                                          (Classified) RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1205101] by Richard A. Horn to motion to stay case [1204825-2] [Service Date: 09/08/2009 by hand delivery, 3rd party] [09-5311]
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01206084420 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: None
                                            RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1205038] by Franklin Pancho Huddle, Jr. to motion to stay case [1204825-2] [Service Date: 09/08/2009 by US mail, email, clerk] [09-5311] (Maria, David)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01206084376 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: None
                                              RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1205015] by Richard A. Horn [Service Date: 09/08/2009 by 3rd party] [09-5311] (Leighton, Brian)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01206084343 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1204994] by Arthur Brown to motion to stay case [1204825-2] [Service Date: 09/08/2009 by US mail, email] [09-5311] (Salerno, Robert)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01206074221 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1204843] that appellees file and serve their responses to the motion for stay by 4:00 p.m. 9/8/09; and that the appellant file and serve any reply by noon 9/9/09. The parties are directed to hand-deliver the paper copies of their submissions to the court by the time and date due. [1204825-2] Judges Tatel, Griffith and Kavanaugh [09-5311]
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01206074190 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                    MOTION filed [1204825] by USA to stay underlying order in case (Response to Motion served by mail due on 09/21/2009) [Service Date: 09/04/2009 by 3rd party, email] [09-5311] (Byron, H. Thomas)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01206071108 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                      LETTER SENT [1204392] regarding attorney membership to David M. Maria for Franklin Pancho Huddle, Jr. Application for Admission due 10/05/2009. [09-5311]
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01206071103 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                        CLERK'S ORDER filed [1204391] directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 10/05/2009. APPELLANT certificate as to parties, etc. due 10/05/2009. APPELLANT statement of issues due 10/05/2009. APPELLANT underlying decision due 10/05/2009. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 10/05/2009. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 10/05/2009. APPELLANT transcript status report due 10/05/2009. APPELLANT procedural motions due 10/05/2009. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 10/19/2009; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties, etc. due 10/05/2009. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 10/05/2009. APPELLEE procedural motions due 10/05/2009. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 10/19/2009 [09-5311]
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank  Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE OF APPEAL filed [1204387] by USA of decision of U.S. District Court. [09-5311]
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank  Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                            US CIVIL CASE docketed. [09-5311]
                                                              LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 383 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?