Janet Sobel, et al v. Hertz Corporation
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 14-17349

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 21, 2016 at 6:12 PM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 4150 - Contract: Overpayment Recovery
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009026772283 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None
Filed order MEDIATION (VLS): A dial-in telephonic conference will be held on February 9, 2015, at 2:00 p.m. Pacific Time. Dial-in information is available to counsel of record as a separate document attached to the electronic filing notification of this order. If any counsel of record is not able to access the dial-in information, please notify the Mediation Program immediately at virna_sanchez@ca9.uscourts.gov. [9412981] [14-17349, 14-17408] (SML) [Entered: 02/06/2015 03:28 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None
    Filed Mediation order: These cases are not selected for inclusion in the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [9414961] [14-17349, 14-17408] (VS) [Entered: 02/09/2015 03:24 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None
      MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - The court has scheduled a telephone Assessment Conference, 02/09/2015, 2:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The Circuit Mediator will initiate the conference call by contacting each person on the attached list. Please be available for the call at least five minutes before the scheduled time. Counsel should review the attached list and inform the Mediation Assistant by email at least 72 hours in advance of the scheduled call of any corrections to the list....The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. [9370737] [14-17349, 14-17408] (VS) [Entered: 01/05/2015 03:45 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: None
        Filed Mediation order: This case is under consideration for inclusion in the Mediation Program. By 12/31/2014 , counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [9352843] (VS) [Entered: 12/17/2014 11:09 AM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None
          Filed (ECF) Appellees Daniel Dugan and Janet Sobel Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 12/16/2014. [9352158] [14-17349] --[COURT UPDATE: Spread to case 14-17408. 12/18/2014 by TL] (GDR) [Entered: 12/16/2014 05:03 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None
            DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. Setting cross-appeal briefing schedule as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 12/16/2014 for Janel Sobel and Daniel Dugan. First cross-appeal brief due 03/06/2015 for Hertz Corporation. Second brief on cross-appeal due 04/06/2015 for Daniel Dugan and Janet Sobel. Third brief on cross-appeal due 05/06/2015 for Hertz Corporation; and the optional reply brief is due within 14 days of service of the third brief on cross-appeal. [9342155] [14-17349, 14-17408] (HH) [Entered: 12/09/2014 10:56 AM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None
              Filed (ECF) Appellant Hertz Corporation Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 12/05/2014. [9339242] [14-17349] (RBB) [Entered: 12/05/2014 03:10 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None
                Filed (ECF) Appellees Daniel Dugan and Janet Sobel Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 12/05/2014. [9339201] [14-17349] (GDR) [Entered: 12/05/2014 02:58 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/28/2014, Entered: None
                  DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 12/05/2014. Transcript ordered by 12/26/2014. Transcript due 01/26/2015. Appellant Hertz Corporation opening brief due 03/06/2015. Appellees Daniel Dugan and Janet Sobel answering brief due 04/06/2015. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [9329480] (RT) [Entered: 11/28/2014 11:04 AM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 97 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?