J&J Sports Productions Inc v. Duran
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arkansas Eastern District Court, Case No. 4:14-cv-00712

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 13, 2018 at 3:41 PM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 47 U.S.C. § 521
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER dismissing this action without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/16/2015. (ks)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None Complaint
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 3 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?