EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC et al v. MetroPCS Communications, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 4:10-cv-02567-LW
District Judge Lesley Wells, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Emsat Advanced Geo-location Technology, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Buckingham, Doolittle & Burroughs, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John F. Hill +1 330 376 5300 +1 330 258 6559 jhill@bdblaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by InnovaLaw, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy E Grochocinski +1 314 853 8146 teg@innovalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
Space Brent Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 bbumgardner@nbclaw.net
Space Christine Brow Lindsey +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 clindsey@nbclaw.net
Space Edward R. Nelson, III +1 817 377 9111 ed@nelbum.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Simon Law Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony Gerard Simon +1 314 241 2929 +1 314 241 2020 ipteam@simonlawpc.com
No Logo Emsat Advanced Geo-location Technology, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Buckingham, Doolittle & Burroughs, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John F. Hill +1 330 376 5300 +1 330 258 6559 jhill@bdblaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
Space Brent Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 bbumgardner@nbclaw.net
Space Christine Brow Lindsey +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 clindsey@nbclaw.net
Space Edward R. Nelson, III +1 817 377 9111 ed@nelbum.com
No Logo Location Based Services LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Buckingham, Doolittle & Burroughs, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John F. Hill +1 330 376 5300 +1 330 258 6559 jhill@bdblaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by InnovaLaw, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy E Grochocinski +1 314 853 8146 teg@innovalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
Space Brent Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 bbumgardner@nbclaw.net
Space Christine Brow Lindsey +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 clindsey@nbclaw.net
Space Edward R. Nelson, III +1 817 377 9111 ed@nelbum.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Simon Law Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony Gerard Simon +1 314 241 2929 +1 314 241 2020 ipteam@simonlawpc.com
Office Youngstown
Filed 11/9/2010
Jury Demand Both
Demand
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Cause Section 35 U.S.C. § 271 Patent Infringement
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Mahoning
Terminated 3/30/2011
Origin 5
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 2:08-cv-00381[Texas Eastern]
Defendant Custody Status
Flags Cat07,Termed,Vecchiar
  Entries (182) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: 3/30/2011 Order and Notice of Party DismissalCourt Filing
Order of Dismissal of all claims asserted by Plaintiffs against Centennial in the instant matter, and all counterclaims asserted by Centennial against the Plaintiffs in the instant matter are hereby dismissed with prejudice.Judge Lesley Wells(C,KA)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: 3/9/2011 Notice
    Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice Under FRCP 41(a)(2) and (c) as to Defendant Centennial Communications Corp. filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC., Centennial Communications Corp. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) Modified text on 3/10/2011 (B,B).
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank  Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
      Order [non-document]Granting Motion to withdraw as counsel. Jennifer Haltom Doan and Morgan Day Vaughan are removed as counsel on this case on behalf of Centennial Communications Corp. (Related Doc # [221]). Judge Lesley Wells on 11/30/2010.(C,LS) Modified text on 11/30/2010 (B,B).
        LREF
        Blank  Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
        Order [non-document]Granting Motion to withdraw as counsel. Attorney James W. Bristow is removed from case as to Centennial Communications Corp. (Related Doc # [222]). Judge Lesley Wells on 11/30/2010.(C,LS) Modified text on 11/30/2010 (B,B).
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: 11/24/2010, Terminated: 11/30/2010 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
          Unopposed Motion filed by James W. Bristow to withdraw as attorney on behalf of Defendant Centennial Communications Corp. (H,LA) Modified text on 11/24/2010 (B,B).
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: 11/24/2010, Terminated: 11/30/2010 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
            Unopposed Motion with jury demand by Jennifer H. Doan and Morgan D. Vaughan to withdraw as attorneys filed by Defendant Centennial Communications Corp. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(JLG) Modified text on 11/24/2010 (B,B).
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank  Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
              Order [non-document]Granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice. Attorney Christopher W. Kennerly is added as counsel for defendant Centennial Communications Corp. (Related Doc # [219]). Judge Lesley Wells on 11/23/2010.(C,LS)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: 11/22/2010, Terminated: 3/30/2011 Motion to Consolidate Cases
                Joint Motion to consolidate cases filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Nelson, Edward)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: 11/22/2010, Terminated: 11/23/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                  Motion for attorney Christopher W. Kennerly to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0647-4412896, filed by Defendant Centennial Communications Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit)(Conley, Colleen)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank  Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                    Order [non-document]Granting Unopposed Motion to withdraw as counsel for plaintiffs EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC and Location Based Services LLC. Jack Wesley Hill and T. John Ward, Jr are removed from case. (Related Doc # [213]). Judge Lesley Wells on 11/22/2010.(C,LS)
                      LREF
                      Blank  Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                      Order [non-document]Granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice. Attorney Joshua Parker is added as counsel for defendant Centennial Communications Corp. (Related Doc # [217]). Judge Lesley Wells on 11/22/2010.(C,LS)
                        LREF
                        Blank  Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                        Order [non-document]Granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice. Attorney Kevin E. Cadwell is added as counsel for defendant Centennial Communications, Corp. (Related Doc # [218]). Judge Lesley Wells on 11/22/2010.(C,LS)
                          LREF
                          Blank  Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                          Order [non-document]Granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice. Attorney Russell J. Crain is added as counsel for defendant Centennial Communications Corp. (Related Doc # [216]). Judge Lesley Wells on 11/22/2010.(C,LS)
                            LREF
                            Blank  Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                            Order [non-document]Granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice. Attorney Bryant C. Boren, Jr. is added as counsel for Defendant Centennial Communications Corp.(Related Doc # [215]). Judge Lesley Wells on 11/22/2010.(C,LS)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: 11/19/2010, Terminated: 11/22/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                              Motion for attorney Kevin Cadwell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0647-4410445, filed by Defendant Centennial Communications Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit)(Conley, Colleen)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: 11/19/2010, Terminated: 11/22/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                Motion for attorney Joshua Parker to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0647-4410433, filed by Defendant Centennial Communications Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit)(Conley, Colleen)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: 11/19/2010, Terminated: 11/22/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                  Motion for attorney Russell Crain to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0647-4409519, filed by Defendant Centennial Communications Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit)(Conley, Colleen)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: 11/19/2010, Terminated: 11/22/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                    Motion for attorney Bryant C. Boren to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0647-4409506, filed by Defendant Centennial Communications Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit)(Conley, Colleen)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: 11/19/2010 Attorney Appearance
                                      Attorney Appearance by Colleen A. Conley filed by Charles B. Lyon and Colleen A. Conley on behalf of Centennial Communications Corp.. (Conley, Colleen) Modified text on 11/19/2010 (B,B).
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: 11/18/2010, Terminated: 11/22/2010 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                        Unopposed Motion to withdraw as attorney for Plaintiff's by John Ward, Jr and Jack Wesley Hill filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC and Location Based Services LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(H,KR)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank  Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                          Order [non-document] Granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice. Christie B. Lindsey is added as counsel for Plaintiffs, EMSAT Geo-Location Technology, LLC and Location Based Services, LLC. (Related Doc # [210]) Judge Lesley Wells on 11/18/2010.(C,LS)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank  Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                            Order [non-document]Granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice. Attorney Anthony G. Simon is added as counsel for Plaintiffs, EMSAT Geo-Location Technology, LLC and Location Based Services, LLC. (Related Doc # [211]) Judge Lesley Wells on 11/18/2010.(C,LS)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank  Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                              Order [non-document]Granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice. Attorney Timothy E. Grochocinski is added as counsel for plaintiffs, EMSAT Geo-Location Technology, LLC and Location Based Services, LLC. (Related Doc # [212]) Judge Lesley Wells on 11/18/2010.(C,LS)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank  Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                Order [non-document]Granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice. Attorney Edward R. Nelson III is added as counsel for Plaintiffs, EMSAT Geo-Location Technology, LLC and Location Based Services, LLC. (Related Doc # [209]) Judge Lesley Wells on 11/18/2010.(C,LS)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: 11/17/2010, Terminated: 11/18/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                  Motion for attorney Timothy E. Grochocinski to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0647-4406450, filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Affidavit of Timothy E. Grochocinski, # (2) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # (3) Proposed Order)(Hill, John) Modified text on 11/18/2010 (B,B).
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: 11/17/2010, Terminated: 11/18/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                    Motion for attorney Anthony G. Simon to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0647-4406429, filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Affidavit of Anthony G. Simon, # (2) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # (3) Proposed Order)(Hill, John) Modified text on 11/18/2010 (B,B).
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: 11/17/2010, Terminated: 11/18/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                      Motion for attorney Christie B. Lindsey to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0647-4406367, filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Affidavit of Christie B. Lindsey, # (2) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # (3) Proposed Order)(Hill, John) Modified text on 11/18/2010 (B,B).
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: 11/17/2010, Terminated: 11/18/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                        Motion for attorney Edward R. Nelson, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0647-4406224, filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Affidavit of Edward R. Nelson, III, # (2) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # (3) Proposed Order)(Hill, John) Modified text on 11/18/2010 (B,B).
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: 11/16/2010 Attorney Appearance
                                                          Attorney Appearance filed by John F. Hill on behalf of EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Hill, John) Modified text on 11/18/2010 (B,B).
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank  Notice Regarding Attorney Admission Status
                                                            Notice to Attorney Russell J. Crain. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, please apply for admission or file a motion to be admitted pro hac vice within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, file a motion to withdraw as attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 within 10 business days. (P,G)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank  Notice Regarding Attorney Admission Status
                                                              Notice to Attorney Nicholas Groombridge. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, please apply for admission or file a motion to be admitted pro hac vice within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, file a motion to withdraw as attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 within 10 business days. (P,G)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank  Notice Regarding Attorney Admission Status
                                                                Notice to Attorney Morgan Day Vaughan. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, please apply for admission or file a motion to be admitted pro hac vice within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, file a motion to withdraw as attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 within 10 business days. (P,G)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank  Notice Regarding Attorney Admission Status
                                                                  Notice to Attorney Joshua J. Parker. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, please apply for admission or file a motion to be admitted pro hac vice within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, file a motion to withdraw as attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 within 10 business days. (P,G)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank  Notice Regarding Attorney Admission Status
                                                                    Notice to Attorney James W. Bristow. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, please apply for admission or file a motion to be admitted pro hac vice within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, file a motion to withdraw as attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 within 10 business days. (P,G)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank  Notice Regarding Attorney Admission Status
                                                                      Notice to Attorney Garreth A. Sarosi. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, please apply for admission or file a motion to be admitted pro hac vice within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, file a motion to withdraw as attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 within 10 business days. (P,G)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank  Notice Regarding Attorney Admission Status
                                                                        Notice to Attorney Christopher W. Kennerly. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, please apply for admission or file a motion to be admitted pro hac vice within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, file a motion to withdraw as attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 within 10 business days. (P,G)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank  Notice Regarding Attorney Admission Status
                                                                          Notice to Attorney Kevin E. Cadwell. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, please apply for admission or file a motion to be admitted pro hac vice within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, file a motion to withdraw as attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 within 10 business days. (P,G)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank  Notice Regarding Attorney Admission Status
                                                                            Notice to Attorney Jennifer Haltom Doan. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, please apply for admission or file a motion to be admitted pro hac vice within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, file a motion to withdraw as attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 within 10 business days. (P,G)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank  Notice Regarding Attorney Admission Status
                                                                              Notice to Attorney Bryant C. Boren, Jr.. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, please apply for admission or file a motion to be admitted pro hac vice within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, file a motion to withdraw as attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 within 10 business days. (P,G)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank  Notice Regarding Attorney Admission Status
                                                                                Notice to Attorney Timothy E. Grochocinski. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, please apply for admission or file a motion to be admitted pro hac vice within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, file a motion to withdraw as attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 within 10 business days. (P,G)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank  Notice Regarding Attorney Admission Status
                                                                                  Notice to Attorney T. John Ward, Jr.. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, please apply for admission or file a motion to be admitted pro hac vice within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, file a motion to withdraw as attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 within 10 business days. (P,G)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank  Notice Regarding Attorney Admission Status
                                                                                    Notice to Attorney Jack Wesley Hill. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, please apply for admission or file a motion to be admitted pro hac vice within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, file a motion to withdraw as attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 within 10 business days. (P,G)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank  Notice Regarding Attorney Admission Status
                                                                                      Notice to Attorney Christine Brow Lindsey. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, please apply for admission or file a motion to be admitted pro hac vice within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, file a motion to withdraw as attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 within 10 business days. (P,G)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank  Notice Regarding Attorney Admission Status
                                                                                        Notice to Attorney Brent N. Bumgardner. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, please apply for admission or file a motion to be admitted pro hac vice within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, file a motion to withdraw as attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 within 10 business days. (P,G)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank  Notice Regarding Attorney Admission Status
                                                                                          Notice to Attorney Barry J. Bumgardner. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, please apply for admission or file a motion to be admitted pro hac vice within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, file a motion to withdraw as attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 within 10 business days. (P,G)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank  Notice Regarding Attorney Admission Status
                                                                                            Notice to Attorney Anthony G. Simon. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, please apply for admission or file a motion to be admitted pro hac vice within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, file a motion to withdraw as attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 within 10 business days. (P,G)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank  Notice Regarding Attorney Admission Status
                                                                                              Notice to Attorney Edward R. Nelson, III. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, please apply for admission or file a motion to be admitted pro hac vice within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, file a motion to withdraw as attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 within 10 business days. (P,G)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Transfer Case (District)
                                                                                                CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Texas Eastern. Case number 2:08-cv-00381. Electronic file and docket sheet received.
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Blank  Link to Local Patent Rules
                                                                                                  This action has been identified as a Patent Case that is subject to the Local Patent Rules. Link to Local Patent Rules. (G,D) 207 Filed & Entered: 11/09/2010 Transfer Case (District) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Texas Eastern. Case number 2:08-cv-00381. Electronic file and docket sheet received. Filed & Entered: 11/10/2010 Notice Regarding Attorney Admission Status Notice to Attorney Edward R. Nelson, III. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, please apply for admission or file a motion to be admitted pro hac vice within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, file a motion to withdraw as attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 within 10 business days. (P,G) Filed & Entered: 11/10/2010 Notice Regarding Attorney Admission Status Notice to Attorney Anthony G. Simon. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, please apply for admission or file a motion to be admitted pro hac vice within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, file a motion to withdraw as attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 within 10 business days. (P,G) Filed & Entered: 11/10/2010 Notice Regarding Attorney Admission Status Notice to Attorney Barry J. Bumgardner. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, please apply for admission or file a motion to be admitted pro hac vice within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, file a motion to withdraw as attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 within 10 business days. (P,G) Filed & Entered: 11/10/2010 Notice Regarding Attorney Admission Status Notice to Attorney Brent N. Bumgardner. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, please apply for admission or file a motion to be admitted pro hac vice within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, file a motion to withdraw as attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 within 10 business days. (P,G) Filed & Entered: 11/10/2010 Notice Regarding Attorney Admission Status Notice to Attorney Christine Brow Lindsey. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, please apply for admission or file a motion to be admitted pro hac vice within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, file a motion to withdraw as attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 within 10 business days. (P,G) Filed & Entered: 11/15/2010 Notice Regarding Attorney Admission Status Notice to Attorney Jack Wesley Hill. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, please apply for admission or file a motion to be admitted pro hac vice within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, file a motion to withdraw as attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 within 10 business days. (P,G) Filed & Entered: 11/15/2010 Notice Regarding Attorney Admission Status Notice to Attorney T. John Ward, Jr.. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, please apply for admission or file a motion to be admitted pro hac vice within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, file a motion to withdraw as attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 within 10 business days. (P,G) Filed & Entered: 11/15/2010 Notice Regarding Attorney Admission Status Notice to Attorney Timothy E. Grochocinski. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, please apply for admission or file a motion to be admitted pro hac vice within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, file a motion to withdraw as attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 within 10 business days. (P,G) Filed & Entered: 11/15/2010 Notice Regarding Attorney Admission Status Notice to Attorney Bryant C. Boren, Jr.. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, please apply for admission or file a motion to be admitted pro hac vice within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, file a motion to withdraw as attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 within 10 business days. (P,G) Filed & Entered: 11/15/2010 Notice Regarding Attorney Admission Status Notice to Attorney Jennifer Haltom Doan. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, please apply for admission or file a motion to be admitted pro hac vice within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, file a motion to withdraw as attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 within 10 business days. (P,G) Filed & Entered: 11/15/2010 Notice Regarding Attorney Admission Status Notice to Attorney Kevin E. Cadwell. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, please apply for admission or file a motion to be admitted pro hac vice within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, file a motion to withdraw as attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 within 10 business days. (P,G) Filed & Entered: 11/15/2010 Notice Regarding Attorney Admission Status Notice to Attorney Christopher W. Kennerly. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, please apply for admission or file a motion to be admitted pro hac vice within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, file a motion to withdraw as attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 within 10 business days. (P,G) Filed & Entered: 11/15/2010 Notice Regarding Attorney Admission Status Notice to Attorney Garreth A. Sarosi. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, please apply for admission or file a motion to be admitted pro hac vice within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, file a motion to withdraw as attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 within 10 business days. (P,G) Filed & Entered: 11/15/2010 Notice Regarding Attorney Admission Status Notice to Attorney James W. Bristow. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, please apply for admission or file a motion to be admitted pro hac vice within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, file a motion to withdraw as attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 within 10 business days. (P,G) Filed & Entered: 11/15/2010 Notice Regarding Attorney Admission Status Notice to Attorney Joshua J. Parker. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, please apply for admission or file a motion to be admitted pro hac vice within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, file a motion to withdraw as attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 within 10 business days. (P,G) Filed & Entered: 11/15/2010 Notice Regarding Attorney Admission Status Notice to Attorney Morgan Day Vaughan. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, please apply for admission or file a motion to be admitted pro hac vice within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, file a motion to withdraw as attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 within 10 business days. (P,G) Filed & Entered: 11/15/2010 Notice Regarding Attorney Admission Status Notice to Attorney Nicholas Groombridge. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, please apply for admission or file a motion to be admitted pro hac vice within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, file a motion to withdraw as attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 within 10 business days. (P,G) Filed & Entered: 11/15/2010 Notice Regarding Attorney Admission Status Notice to Attorney Russell J. Crain. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, please apply for admission or file a motion to be admitted pro hac vice within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, file a motion to withdraw as attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 within 10 business days. (P,G) 208 Filed & Entered: 11/16/2010 Attorney Appearance Attorney Appearance filed by John F. Hill on behalf of EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Hill, John) Modified text on 11/18/2010 (B,B). 209 Filed & Entered: 11/17/2010Terminated: 11/18/2010 Motion to appear pro hac vice Motion for attorney Edward R. Nelson, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0647-4406224, filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Affidavit of Edward R. Nelson, III, # (2) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # (3) Proposed Order)(Hill, John) Modified text on 11/18/2010 (B,B). 210 Filed & Entered: 11/17/2010Terminated: 11/18/2010 Motion to appear pro hac vice Motion for attorney Christie B. Lindsey to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0647-4406367, filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Affidavit of Christie B. Lindsey, # (2) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # (3) Proposed Order)(Hill, John) Modified text on 11/18/2010 (B,B). 211 Filed & Entered: 11/17/2010Terminated: 11/18/2010 Motion to appear pro hac vice Motion for attorney Anthony G. Simon to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0647-4406429, filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Affidavit of Anthony G. Simon, # (2) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # (3) Proposed Order)(Hill, John) Modified text on 11/18/2010 (B,B). 212 Filed & Entered: 11/17/2010Terminated: 11/18/2010 Motion to appear pro hac vice Motion for attorney Timothy E. Grochocinski to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0647-4406450, filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Affidavit of Timothy E. Grochocinski, # (2) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # (3) Proposed Order)(Hill, John) Modified text on 11/18/2010 (B,B). Filed & Entered: 11/18/2010 Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice Order [non-document]Granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice. Attorney Edward R. Nelson III is added as counsel for Plaintiffs, EMSAT Geo-Location Technology, LLC and Location Based Services, LLC. (Related Doc # [209]) Judge Lesley Wells on 11/18/2010.(C,LS) Filed & Entered: 11/18/2010 Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice Order [non-document]Granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice. Attorney Timothy E. Grochocinski is added as counsel for plaintiffs, EMSAT Geo-Location Technology, LLC and Location Based Services, LLC. (Related Doc # [212]) Judge Lesley Wells on 11/18/2010.(C,LS) Filed & Entered: 11/18/2010 Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice Order [non-document]Granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice. Attorney Anthony G. Simon is added as counsel for Plaintiffs, EMSAT Geo-Location Technology, LLC and Location Based Services, LLC. (Related Doc # [211]) Judge Lesley Wells on 11/18/2010.(C,LS) Filed & Entered: 11/18/2010 Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice Order [non-document] Granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice. Christie B. Lindsey is added as counsel for Plaintiffs, EMSAT Geo-Location Technology, LLC and Location Based Services, LLC. (Related Doc # [210]) Judge Lesley Wells on 11/18/2010.(C,LS) 213 Filed & Entered: 11/18/2010Terminated: 11/22/2010 Motion to withdraw as attorney Unopposed Motion to withdraw as attorney for Plaintiff's by John Ward, Jr and Jack Wesley Hill filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC and Location Based Services LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(H,KR) 214 Filed & Entered: 11/19/2010 Attorney Appearance Attorney Appearance by Colleen A. Conley filed by Charles B. Lyon and Colleen A. Conley on behalf of Centennial Communications Corp.. (Conley, Colleen) Modified text on 11/19/2010 (B,B). 215 Filed & Entered: 11/19/2010Terminated: 11/22/2010 Motion to appear pro hac vice Motion for attorney Bryant C. Boren to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0647-4409506, filed by Defendant Centennial Communications Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit)(Conley, Colleen) 216 Filed & Entered: 11/19/2010Terminated: 11/22/2010 Motion to appear pro hac vice Motion for attorney Russell Crain to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0647-4409519, filed by Defendant Centennial Communications Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit)(Conley, Colleen) 217 Filed & Entered: 11/19/2010Terminated: 11/22/2010 Motion to appear pro hac vice Motion for attorney Joshua Parker to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0647-4410433, filed by Defendant Centennial Communications Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit)(Conley, Colleen) 218 Filed & Entered: 11/19/2010Terminated: 11/22/2010 Motion to appear pro hac vice Motion for attorney Kevin Cadwell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0647-4410445, filed by Defendant Centennial Communications Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit)(Conley, Colleen) Filed & Entered: 11/22/2010 Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice Order [non-document]Granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice. Attorney Bryant C. Boren, Jr. is added as counsel for Defendant Centennial Communications Corp.(Related Doc # [215]). Judge Lesley Wells on 11/22/2010.(C,LS) Filed & Entered: 11/22/2010 Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice Order [non-document]Granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice. Attorney Russell J. Crain is added as counsel for defendant Centennial Communications Corp. (Related Doc # [216]). Judge Lesley Wells on 11/22/2010.(C,LS) Filed & Entered: 11/22/2010 Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice Order [non-document]Granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice. Attorney Kevin E. Cadwell is added as counsel for defendant Centennial Communications, Corp. (Related Doc # [218]). Judge Lesley Wells on 11/22/2010.(C,LS) Filed & Entered: 11/22/2010 Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice Order [non-document]Granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice. Attorney Joshua Parker is added as counsel for defendant Centennial Communications Corp. (Related Doc # [217]). Judge Lesley Wells on 11/22/2010.(C,LS) Filed & Entered: 11/22/2010 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorney Order [non-document]Granting Unopposed Motion to withdraw as counsel for plaintiffs EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC and Location Based Services LLC. Jack Wesley Hill and T. John Ward, Jr are removed from case. (Related Doc # [213]). Judge Lesley Wells on 11/22/2010.(C,LS) 219 Filed & Entered: 11/22/2010Terminated: 11/23/2010 Motion to appear pro hac vice Motion for attorney Christopher W. Kennerly to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0647-4412896, filed by Defendant Centennial Communications Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit)(Conley, Colleen) 220 Filed & Entered: 11/22/2010Terminated: 03/30/2011 Motion to consolidate cases Joint Motion to consolidate cases filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Nelson, Edward) Filed & Entered: 11/23/2010 Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice Order [non-document]Granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice. Attorney Christopher W. Kennerly is added as counsel for defendant Centennial Communications Corp. (Related Doc # [219]). Judge Lesley Wells on 11/23/2010.(C,LS) 221 Filed & Entered: 11/24/2010Terminated: 11/30/2010 Motion to withdraw as attorney Unopposed Motion with jury demand by Jennifer H. Doan and Morgan D. Vaughan to withdraw as attorneys filed by Defendant Centennial Communications Corp. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(JLG) Modified text on 11/24/2010 (B,B). 222 Filed & Entered: 11/24/2010Terminated: 11/30/2010 Motion to withdraw as attorney Unopposed Motion filed by James W. Bristow to withdraw as attorney on behalf of Defendant Centennial Communications Corp. (H,LA) Modified text on 11/24/2010 (B,B). Filed & Entered: 11/30/2010 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorney Order [non-document]Granting Motion to withdraw as counsel. Attorney James W. Bristow is removed from case as to Centennial Communications Corp. (Related Doc # [222]). Judge Lesley Wells on 11/30/2010.(C,LS) Modified text on 11/30/2010 (B,B). Filed & Entered: 11/30/2010 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorney Order [non-document]Granting Motion to withdraw as counsel. Jennifer Haltom Doan and Morgan Day Vaughan are removed as counsel on this case on behalf of Centennial Communications Corp. (Related Doc # [221]). Judge Lesley Wells on 11/30/2010.(C,LS) Modified text on 11/30/2010 (B,B). 223 Filed & Entered: 03/09/2011 Notice Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice Under FRCP 41(a)(2) and (c) as to Defendant Centennial Communications Corp. filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC., Centennial Communications Corp. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) Modified text on 3/10/2011 (B,B). 224 Filed & Entered: 03/30/2011 Order and Notice of Party Dismissal Order of Dismissal of all claims asserted by Plaintiffs against Centennial in the instant matter, and all counterclaims asserted by Centennial against the Plaintiffs in the instant matter are hereby dismissed with prejudice.Judge Lesley Wells(C,KA)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank  Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                    Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Nancy A. Vecchiarelli. (G,D)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank  Utility Event
                                                                                                      Judge Lesley Wells assigned to case. (G,D)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank  Order Dismissing Case
                                                                                                        Interdistrict transfer to the Northern District of Ohio, Eastern Division (ch, ) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Address Change Notice
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Address by Anthony G Simon (Simon, Anthony) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Order on motion to change/transfer venueCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER granting [204] Motion to Change Venue. ORDERED that this case be transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio, Eastern Division. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/15/2010. (ch, )[Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: 10/13/2010, Terminated: 10/15/2010 Motion to change/transfer venue
                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Change Venue by Centennial Communications Corp., EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Kennerly, Christopher) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: 8/31/2010 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy E Grochocinski on behalf of EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC (Grochocinski, Timothy) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: 8/31/2010 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anthony G Simon on behalf of EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC (Simon, Anthony) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: 8/24/2010 Notice
                                                                                                                    NOTICE by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC of Order in Related Cases (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Nelson, Edward) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank  Notice
                                                                                                                      NOTICE from clerk - modified document # 199 to the show SurReply to Dft's [183] instead of Response to [183] (ch, ) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 8/5/2010, Entered: 8/5/2010 Response
                                                                                                                        SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re [184] MOTION for Reconsideration re [178] Memorandum & Opinion,, Claim Construction Order MOTION for Reconsideration re [178] Memorandum & Opinion,, Claim Construction Order filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Nelson, Edward) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 8/5/2010, Entered: 8/5/2010 Answer
                                                                                                                          SURREPLY to DFT'S [183] Objection to Report and Recommendations by Location Based Services LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Declaration of Edward R. Nelson, III, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2)(Nelson, Edward) Modified on 8/6/2010 (ch, ).[Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: 8/4/2010 Transcript - Official Court Transcript filed by Court ReporterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING held on 6/22/10 before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 663-5082. (83 Pages)NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/30/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/10/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/5/2010. (tja, )[Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: 7/27/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [196] Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply surreplies to Defendant Centennial Communications Corp.s Reply in Support of Its Objections to and Request for Reconsideration of the Magistrates June 23, 2010 Memorandum Opinion and Order and Defendant Centennial Communications Corp.s Reply in Support of Its Objections to the Magistrates June 25, 2010 Report and Recommendation Responses due by 8/5/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/27/10. (ehs, )[Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: 7/26/2010, Terminated: 7/27/2010 Motion for Extension of Time - Other
                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: 7/23/2010 Answer
                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [190] Response to Non-Motion (Centennial Communications Corp.'s Reply in Support of its Objections to the Magistrate's June 25, 2010 Report and Recomendation) by Centennial Communications Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 4)(Kennerly, Christopher) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: 7/23/2010 Response
                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re [184] MOTION for Reconsideration re [178] Memorandum & Opinion,, Claim Construction Order MOTION for Reconsideration re [178] Memorandum & Opinion,, Claim Construction Order (Centennial Communications Corp.'s Reply in Support of its Objections to and Request for Reconsideration of the Magistrate's June 23, 2010 Memorandum Opinion and Order) filed by Centennial Communications Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit D)(Kennerly, Christopher) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: 7/20/2010 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Russell Jon Crain on behalf of Centennial Communications Corp. (Crain, Russell) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: 7/19/2010 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [189] Motion to Amend docket control order. Deadlines amended in accordance with the deadlines proposed in Centennial's motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/19/10. (ehs, ) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: 7/16/2010 Response
                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re [184] MOTION for Reconsideration re [178] Memorandum & Opinion,, Claim Construction Order MOTION for Reconsideration re [178] Memorandum & Opinion,, Claim Construction Order filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Declaration of Edward R. Nelson, III, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: 7/16/2010 Answer
                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [183] Objection to Report and Recommendations by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: 7/15/2010, Terminated: 7/19/2010 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order [75] by Centennial Communications Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Kennerly, Christopher) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: 7/14/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [187] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants Defendant Centennial Communications Corp.s Objections to and Request for Reconsideration of the Magistrates June 23, 2010 Memorandum Opinion and Order and Defendant Centennial Communications Corp.s Objections to the Magistrates June 25, 2010 Report and Recommendation. Responses due by 7/16/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/14/10. (ehs, ) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: 7/13/2010, Terminated: 7/14/2010 Motion for Extension of Time - Other
                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: 7/8/2010 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                    Additional Attachments to Main Document: [184] MOTION for Reconsideration re [178] Memorandum & Opinion,, Claim Construction Order MOTION for Reconsideration re [178] Memorandum & Opinion,, Claim Construction Order.. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Conference, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Vaughan, Morgan) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: 7/8/2010 Response
                                                                                                                                                      SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re [157] MOTION to Change Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Nelson, Edward) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: 7/7/2010, Terminated: 11/8/2010 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Reconsideration re [178] Memorandum & Opinion,, Claim Construction Order by Centennial Communications Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit C)(Vaughan, Morgan) Modified on 7/8/2010 (sm, ). Modified on 7/8/2010 (sm, ). [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: 7/7/2010 Objection to Report and Recommendation
                                                                                                                                                          OBJECTION to [179] Report and Recommendations of Magistrate by Centennial Communications Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit)(Vaughan, Morgan) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: 6/29/2010 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [180] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/29/10. (ehs, ) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: 6/28/2010 Response
                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [157] MOTION to Change Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio filed by Centennial Communications Corp.. (Vaughan, Morgan) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: 6/28/2010, Terminated: 6/29/2010 Motion for Leave
                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Centennial Communications Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Vaughan, Morgan) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: 6/25/2010 Report and RecommendationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re [139] MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed by MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., Centennial Communications Corp., MetroPCS Communications, Inc. Recommending DENYING Centennial's Motion for Summary Judgment.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/24/2010. (ch, ) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: 6/23/2010 Memorandum, Opinion & OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER - The court adopts the constructions set forth in this opinion for the disputed terms of the 611, 404, 822, and 763 patents. The parties are ordered that they may not refer, directly or indirectly, to each others claim construction positions in the presence of the jury. Likewise, the parties are ordered to refrain from mentioning any portion of this opinion, other than the actual definitions adopted by the court, in the presence of the jury. Any reference to claim construction proceedings is limited to informing the jury of the definitions adopted by the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/23/10. (ehs, ) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: 6/22/2010 Markman HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Markman Hearing held on 6/22/2010. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (Attachments: # (1) Attorney sign-in sheet) (jml) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: 6/21/2010 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [174] Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Location Based Services LLC, EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., and MetroPCS Communications, Inc. terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/21/10. (mrm, )[Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: 6/18/2010 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re [157] MOTION to Change Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, part 1, # (6) Exhibit 4, part 2, # (7) Exhibit 5, # (8) Exhibit 6, # (9) Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: 6/18/2010 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendants MetroPCS Communications, Inc. and MetroPCS Wireless, Inc. by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward)[Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: 6/18/2010 Order on Motion for LeaveCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [171] Motion for Leave to File Additional Attachments to Its Sur-Reply in Support of Its Proposed Claim Construction (Dkt. No. 160). Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/18/10. (ehs, ) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: 6/17/2010 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                Additional Attachments to Main Document: [160] Reply to Claim Construction Brief.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 45, # (2) Exhibit 46, # (3) Exhibit 47, # (4) Exhibit 48, # (5) Exhibit 49)(Doan, Jennifer) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: 6/17/2010, Terminated: 6/18/2010 Motion for Leave
                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Additional Attachments to its Sur-Reply in Support of its Proposed Claim Construction (Dkt. No. 160) by Centennial Communications Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)[Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: 6/17/2010 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                    SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re [139] MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit X, # (3) Exhibit Y)(Nelson, Edward) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: 6/14/2010 NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE that pursuant to Patent Rule 4-5(d) the Clerk's Office has received a CD containing the parties' Joint Claim Construction Chart in WordPerfect format and sent to Judge Everingham's Chambers (ehs, )[Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: 6/14/2010 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC of Compliance with Patent Rule 4-5(d) (Nelson, Edward) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: 6/11/2010 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Centennial Communications Corp. of Filing of Centennial's Technology Tutorial Script and Exhibits (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Centennial's Technology Tutorial Script, # (2) Exhibit 54, # (3) Exhibit 55, # (4) Exhibit 56, # (5) Exhibit 57, # (6) Exhibit 58, # (7) Exhibit 59, # (8) Exhibit 60, # (9) Exhibit 61, # (10) Exhibit 62, # (11) Exhibit 63, # (12) Exhibit 64)(Kennerly, Christopher) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 6/9/2010, Entered: 6/9/2010 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying [131] Motion for Reconsideration ; denying as moot [134] Motion to Strike ; denying as moot [140] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/9/10. (mrm, ) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                              ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 164, Reply. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT # 165)(ch, ) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: 6/7/2010 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re [139] MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed by Centennial Communications Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 50, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit 51, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit 52, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit 53)(Kennerly, Christopher) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: 6/7/2010 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.***REPLY to Response to Motion re [139] MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed by Centennial Communications Corp.. (Kennerly, Christopher) Modified on 6/8/2010 (ch, ). [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: 6/7/2010 Order on Motion for LeaveCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [159] Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Support of its Claim Construction Positions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/7/2010. (ch, ) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: 6/7/2010 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Morgan Day Vaughan on behalf of Centennial Communications Corp. (Vaughan, Morgan) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: 6/7/2010 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Haltom Doan on behalf of Centennial Communications Corp. (Doan, Jennifer) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: 6/4/2010 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to [130] Claim Construction Brief, filed by Centennial Communications Corp.. (Kennerly, Christopher) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: 6/4/2010, Terminated: 6/7/2010 Motion for Leave
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply Brief in Support of its Claim Construction Positions by Centennial Communications Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Granting Leave to File)(Kennerly, Christopher)[Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ***FILED IN ERROR. ORDER WAS FILED SEPARATELY - CLERK WILL ATTACH TO MOTION Document # 158, Additional attachment to main document. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, ) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: 6/1/2010 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***Additional Attachments to Main Document: [157] MOTION to Change Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio.. (Kennerly, Christopher) Modified on 6/2/2010 (ch, ). [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: 6/1/2010, Terminated: 11/9/2010 Motion to change/transfer venue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Change Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio by Centennial Communications Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Declaration of Shively)(Kennerly, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/2/2010: # (2) Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ). [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: 5/28/2010 Settlement Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendants MetroPCS Communications, Inc. and MetroPCS Wireless, Inc. by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC (Nelson, Edward) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: 5/25/2010 Initial Disclosures
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Disclosure by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC Notice of Amendment to Initial Disclosures (Nelson, Edward) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: 5/25/2010 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [151] Motion for Leave to File Excess Page limits. Plaintiffs shall be permitted to file their Reply Claim Construction Brief in full, which is in excess of the Courts ten-page limit.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/25/10. (ehs, ) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: 5/24/2010 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re [134] MOTION to Strike Regarding Centennial's Motion for Reconsideration filed by Centennial Communications Corp.. (Kennerly, Christopher) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: 5/24/2010 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re [139] MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit V, # (3) Exhibit W, # (4) Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: 5/21/2010, Terminated: 5/25/2010 Motion for Leave
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: 5/21/2010 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to [130] Claim Construction Brief, filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit P, # (3) Exhibit Q, # (4) Exhibit R, # (5) Exhibit S, # (6) Exhibit T, # (7) Exhibit U)(Nelson, Edward) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: 5/19/2010 Notice of Hearing or ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Hearing: Markman Hearing RESET for 6/22/2010, 09:00 AM, in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham.(delat) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: 5/13/2010 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re [134] MOTION to Strike Regarding Centennial's Motion for Reconsideration filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Nelson, Edward)[Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: 5/11/2010 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re [131] MOTION for Reconsideration AND OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATES MARCH 24, 2010 ORDER filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Nelson, Edward)[Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: 5/11/2010 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [143] Motion to Amend docket control order. (19) Patentee files reply brief on claim construction P.R. 4-5(c) May 21, 2010. (20) ONLY WITH LEAVE OF COURT Accused infringer files sur-reply brief on claim construction June 4, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/11/10. (ehs, ) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: 5/11/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [142] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. The briefing schedule is as follows: April 30, 2010 Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity. May 24, 2010 Plaintiffs opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity. June 7, 2010 Defendants reply to Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity. June 17, 2010 Plaintiffs surreply to Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/11/10. (ehs, )[Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: 5/10/2010 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re [134] MOTION to Strike Regarding Centennial's Motion for Reconsideration filed by Centennial Communications Corp.. (Kennerly, Christopher) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: 5/7/2010, Terminated: 5/11/2010 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order Deadlines by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: 5/7/2010, Terminated: 5/11/2010 Motion for Extension of Time - Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 5/4/2010, Entered: 5/4/2010 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [131] MOTION for Reconsideration AND OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATES MARCH 24, 2010 ORDER filed by Centennial Communications Corp.. (Kennerly, Christopher) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 5/4/2010, Entered: 5/4/2010, Terminated: 6/9/2010 Motion for Extension of Time - Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in support of its Motion for Reconsideration by Centennial Communications Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit REPLY IN SUPPORT OF CENTENNIAL'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND OBJECTIONS TO MARCH 24 2010 ORDER)(Kennerly, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/5/2010: # (2) Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ). [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: 4/30/2010, Terminated: 11/8/2010 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity by Centennial Communications Corp., MetroPCS Communications, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless, Inc.. (Kennerly, Christopher) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: 4/30/2010 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to [130] Claim Construction Brief, filed by Centennial Communications Corp., MetroPCS Communications, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit 12, # (13) Exhibit 13, # (14) Exhibit 14, # (15) Exhibit 15, # (16) Exhibit 16, # (17) Exhibit 17, # (18) Exhibit 18, # (19) Exhibit 19, # (20) Exhibit 20, # (21) Exhibit 21, # (22) Exhibit 22, # (23) Exhibit 23, # (24) Exhibit 24, # (25) Exhibit 25, # (26) Exhibit 26, # (27) Exhibit 27, # (28) Exhibit 28, # (29) Exhibit 29, # (30) Exhibit 30, # (31) Exhibit 31, # (32) Exhibit 32, # (33) Exhibit 33, # (34) Exhibit 34, # (35) Exhibit 35, # (36) Exhibit 36, # (37) Exhibit 37, # (38) Exhibit 38, # (39) Exhibit 39, # (40) Exhibit 40, # (41) Exhibit 41, # (42) Exhibit 42, # (43) Exhibit 43, # (44) Exhibit 44)(Kennerly, Christopher) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: 4/27/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [136] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Extends the deadline for Defendants to file their Responsive Claim Construction Brief to 4/30/2010, the deadline for Plaintiffs to file their Reply Claim Construction Brief to 5/14/2010, and the deadline for Defendants to file their Sur-Reply Claim Construction Brief to 5/28/2010 (only with leave of court). Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/27/2010. (ch, ) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: 4/23/2010, Terminated: 4/27/2010 Motion for Extension of Time - Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Claim Construction by Centennial Communications Corp., MetroPCS Communications, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless, Inc.. (Groombridge, Nicholas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/23/2010: # (1) Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ). [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: 4/22/2010 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re [131] MOTION for Reconsideration AND OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATES MARCH 24, 2010 ORDER filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: 4/22/2010, Terminated: 6/9/2010 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Strike Regarding Centennial's Motion for Reconsideration by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward)[Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: 4/19/2010 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [132] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Dfts have leave to file a responsive claim construction brief pursuant to P.R. 4-5(b) of up to 40 pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/19/2010. (ch, )[Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: 4/16/2010, Terminated: 4/19/2010 Motion for Leave
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Centennial Communications Corp., MetroPCS Communications, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order granting Defendants Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limits)(Kennerly, Christopher) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: 4/5/2010, Terminated: 6/9/2010 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Reconsideration AND OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATES MARCH 24, 2010 ORDER by Centennial Communications Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order for Reconsideration of Magistrate's March 24, 2010 Order)(Kennerly, Christopher) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/26/2010 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit A, # (4) Exhibit B, # (5) Exhibit C, # (6) Exhibit D, # (7) Exhibit E, # (8) Exhibit F, # (9) Exhibit G, # (10) Exhibit H, # (11) Exhibit I, # (12) Exhibit J, # (13) Exhibit K, # (14) Exhibit L, # (15) Exhibit M, # (16) Exhibit N, # (17) Exhibit O)(Nelson, Edward) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: 3/24/2010 Order on Motion to Extend DeadlinesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying [121] Motion to Continue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/24/10. (ehs, ) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: 3/18/2010 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC of Amended Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions (Nelson, Edward) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: 3/17/2010 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [117] Motion for leave to Amend Infringement Contentions. Plaintiffs shall have 5 days from the entry of this Order to serve their amended infringement contentions on Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/17/10. (ehs, ) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: 3/11/2010 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re [121] MOTION to Continue CLAIM CONSTRUCTION DEADLINES filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Nelson, Edward) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: 3/1/2010 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [121] MOTION to Continue CLAIM CONSTRUCTION DEADLINES filed by Centennial Communications Corp, Metro PCS Communications & Metro PCSWireless.. (Kennerly, Christopher) Modified on 3/2/2010 (rml, ).[Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: 2/22/2010 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re [121] MOTION to Continue CLAIM CONSTRUCTION DEADLINES filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward)[Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: 2/19/2010 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC of Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement Pursuant to P.R. 4-3 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Nelson, Edward)[Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: 2/11/2010 Initial Disclosures
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Disclosure by Centennial Communications Corp. (Amended Initial) (Kennerly, Christopher) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 2/5/2010, Entered: 2/5/2010, Terminated: 3/24/2010 Motion for Extension of Time - Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Continue CLAIM CONSTRUCTION DEADLINES by MetroPCS Communications, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless, Inc., Centennial Communications Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order GRANTING MOTION TO CONTINUE ALL CLAIM CONSTRUCTION)(Kennerly, Christopher) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: 2/2/2010 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re [117] MOTION for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Nelson, Edward) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ***FILED IN ERROR per attorney. Document # 118 Response. See document # 119 for corrected filing. PLEASE IGNORE # 118.*** (ehs, ) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: 1/28/2010 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ***REPLACES DOCUMENT #[118] WHICH WAS FILED IN ERROR***RESPONSE in Opposition re [117] MOTION for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions filed by Centennial Communications Corp., MetroPCS Communications, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E)(Groombridge, Nicholas) Modified on 1/29/2010 (ehs, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/1/2010: # (6) Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).[Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: 1/28/2010 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT #[119]***RESPONSE in Opposition re [117] MOTION for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions filed by MetroPCS Communications, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E)(Groombridge, Nicholas) Modified on 1/29/2010 (ehs, ). [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 1/11/2010, Entered: 1/11/2010, Terminated: 3/17/2010 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: 12/18/2009 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Centennial Communications Corp. OF COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL PATENT RULE 4-2 (Cadwell, Kevin) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: 12/18/2009 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by MetroPCS Wireless, Inc. of Service of Preliminary Claim Constructions and Extrinsic Evidence (Bremer, Carmen) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: 12/18/2009 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by MetroPCS Communications, Inc. of Service of Preliminary Claim Constructions and Extrinsic Evidence (Bremer, Carmen) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: 12/18/2009 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC of Compliance with P.R. 4-2 (Nelson, Edward) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 11/9/2009, Entered: 11/9/2009 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED IN WRONG CASE. PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC of Amendment to Initial Disclosures (Nelson, Edward) Modified on 11/9/2009 (ch, ).[Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 11/9/2009, Entered: 11/9/2009 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC of Amendment to Initial Disclosures (Nelson, Edward) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED IN WRONG CASE Document # 112, Notice of disclosure. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, ) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/23/2009, Entered: 10/23/2009 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC Regarding Number of Asserted Claims (Nelson, Edward) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 10/12/2009, Entered: 10/12/2009 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC (Hill, Jack) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: 9/25/2009 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Centennial Communications Corp. of Service of P.R. 4-1 Disclosures (Cadwell, Kevin) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: 9/25/2009 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC of Compliance with P.R. 4-1 (Nelson, Edward) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: 9/25/2009 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by MetroPCS Communications, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless, Inc. Notice of Service of P.R. 4-1 (Bremer, Carmen) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/22/2009, Entered: 9/22/2009 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [104] Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Centennial Communications Corp. by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Nelson, Edward) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: 9/15/2009 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED ANSWER to [76] Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs by Centennial Communications Corp.. (Boren, Bryant) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: 9/11/2009 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Earl Glenn Thames, Jr on behalf of MetroPCS Communications, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless, Inc. (Thames, Earl) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: 8/28/2009 Initial Disclosures
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Disclosure by Centennial Communications Corp. Service of P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 Disclosures (Parker, Joshua) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: 8/28/2009 Initial Disclosures
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Disclosure by MetroPCS Communications, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless, Inc. Service of P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 Disclosures (Bremer, Carmen) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: 8/21/2009 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [99] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Eric M. Albritton terminated as counsel for plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/20/09. (ch, ) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/19/2009, Entered: 8/19/2009, Terminated: 8/21/2009 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Eric M. Albritton as Counsel of Record by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric) Modified on 8/19/2009 (sm, ). [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: 8/17/2009 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by MetroPCS Communications, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless, Inc. Defendants' Notice Regarding The Need For A Court-Appointed Mediator (Bremer, Carmen) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/14/2009, Entered: 8/14/2009 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [87] Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant MetroPCS Wireless, Inc. by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Nelson, Edward) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/14/2009, Entered: 8/14/2009 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [86] Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant MetroPCS Communications by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Nelson, Edward) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 8/11/2009, Entered: 8/11/2009 Address Change Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address by Barry Bumgardner (Bumgardner, Barry) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 8/11/2009, Entered: 8/11/2009 Address Change Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Change of Address by Brent Nelson Bumgardner (Bumgardner, Brent) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/11/2009, Entered: 8/11/2009 Address Change Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Address by Christie Brow Lindsey (Lindsey, Christie) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Deficiency regarding #53 the MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Sanford E. Warren, Jr., Todd E. Landis, and Patrick T. Farley by MetroPCS Communications, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless, Inc submitted Document does not include a Certificate of Conference and should be titled as a motion, attorney to revise the proposed order and remove the date signed and the Judge's signature block pursuant to Local Rule CV-7(a) and refile document. Correction should be made by one business day. (mpv, ) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Set Answer Due Date
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Answer Due Deadline Updated for MetroPCS Communications, Inc. to 1/19/2009; MetroPCS Wireless, Inc. to 1/19/2009. (ch, ) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Centennial Communications Corp. to 12/9/2008. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mpv, )[Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for MetroPCS Communications, Inc. to 12/19/2008. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mpv, )[Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for MetroPCS Wireless, Inc. to 12/19/2008. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mpv, )[Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Leap Wireless International, Inc. to 12/4/2008. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mpv, )[Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Cricket Communications, Inc. to 12/4/2008. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mpv, )[Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Deficiency regarding #15 the NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Todd Eric Landis on behalf of MetroPCS Communications, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless, Inc. submitted Document does not include a Certificate of Service, attorney to correct and refile. Correction should be made by one business day. (mpv, ) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for MetroPCS Wireless, Inc. to 12/4/2008. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for MetroPCS Communications, Inc. to 12/4/2008. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )[Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Utility Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Case Assigned to Judge David Folsom. (ch, ) [Transferred from txed on 11/9/2010.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 84 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?