Unknown
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-00091
District Judge Richard G. Andrews, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 26, 2016 at 4:22 PM EDT (5.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Pragmatus Telecom, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W Coutu +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 jcoutu@dpelaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Gerald DiNovo +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 adinovo@dpelaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam G Price +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 aprice@dpelaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chester J. Shiu +1 512 539 2626 cshiu@dpelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Farnan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian E. Farnan +1 302 777 0300 +1 302 777 0301 bfarnan@farnanlaw.com
v.
FedEx Corporation FedEx Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Federal Express Corporation"

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lauren Murphy Pringle +1 302 652 5070 pringle@fr.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,311,231 B1; US 6,668,286 B2; US 7,159,043 B2. (Attachments: # 1 Order of Dismissal)(nms) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 14 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
    SO ORDERED Granting 13 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice, filed by Federal Express Corporation (***Civil Case Terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/29/2012. (nms) (Entered: 05/29/2012)
      LREF
      Blank 13 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None
      STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice, by Federal Express Corporation. (Pringle, Lauren) Modified on 5/21/2012 (nms). (Entered: 05/21/2012)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/11/2012, Entered: None
        STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, - filed by Federal Express Corporation. (Pringle, Lauren) Modified on 5/14/2012 (nms). (Entered: 05/11/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
          Order Setting Rule 16(b) Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 5/29/2012, at 4:15 PM in Chambers before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/8/2012. (nms) (Entered: 05/09/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None
            STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER complaint to 05/11/2012 - filed by Federal Express Corporation, Pragmatus Telecom LLC. (Pringle, Lauren) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None
              Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to April 27, 2012 - filed by Federal Express Corporation. (Pringle, Lauren) Modified on 4/16/2012 (nms). (Entered: 04/13/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to April 13, 2012 - filed by Federal Express Corporation. (Pringle, Lauren) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None
                  STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER complaint to 3/30/12 - filed by Federal Express Corporation, Pragmatus Telecom LLC. (Pringle, Lauren) (Entered: 03/23/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None
                    MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew G. DiNovo, Adam G. Price, Chester J. Shiu, and James W. Coutu of DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP - filed by Pragmatus Telecom LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/23/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: None
                      STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER Complaint to March 23, 2012 - filed by Federal Express Corporation. (Pringle, Lauren) (Entered: 02/17/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pragmatus Telecom LLC. Federal Express Corporation served on 2/1/2012, answer due 2/22/2012. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
                          Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,311,231 B1; 6,668,286 B2; 7,159,043 B2;. (els) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                            Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (els) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
                              COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Federal Express Corporation - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-1013541.) - filed by Pragmatus Telecom LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(els) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 154 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?