Public Employees Ret, et al v. Fastow, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 4:02-cv-04788
District Judge Melinda Harmon, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 28, 2016 at 5:08 AM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cincinnati Retirement System, Plaintiff
No Logo Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System, Plaintiff
No Logo Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, Plaintiff
No Logo Public Employees Retirement System Board, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Grant & Eisenhofer, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Jay W. Eisenhofer +1 646 722 8512 +1 646 722 8501 jeisenhofer@gelaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED SIDNEY STEVEN LIEBESMAN +1 302 622 7000 +1 302 622 7100 sliebesman@gelaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Eric Sellinger +1 302 622 7000 +1 302 622 7100

Toggle Switch Represented by Maguire & Schneider

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith W Schneider +1 614 224 1222 + 614 224 1236
No Logo Public Employees' Retirement System of Ohio, Plaintiff
No Logo School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, Plaintiff
No Logo State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Grant & Eisenhofer, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jill Agro +1 302 622 7061 +1 302 622 7100
v.
Arthur Andersen LLP Arthur Andersen LLP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shepherd, Scott, Clawater & Houston, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George W Billy Shepherd, III +1 713 650 6600 +1 713 650 1720 bshepherd@sschlaw.com
No Logo Banc Of America Securities LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory Arthur Markel +1 212 504 6112 +1 212 504 6666 greg.markel@cwt.com

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Pennington LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles G King, III +1 713 225 8400 +1 713 225 8488
Bank of America Corporation Bank of America Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Bank of America Corp"
Barclays Bank PLC Barclays Bank PLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Blank Rome LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry Abrams +1 713 228 6601 +1 713 228 6605 babrams@BlankRome.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Harold Braff +1 212 558 4705 +1 212 558 3333 braffd@sullcrom.com
Barclays Capital Inc. Barclays Capital Inc., Defendant
Barclays PLC Barclays PLC, Defendant
Unknown Role, Imperial Holly Corp
Unknown Role, Jcg Inc
Unknown Role, Candie's, Inc.
Unknown Role, Eott Energy LLC
No Logo Ben F Glisan, Jr, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Houston

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tom P Allen +1 832 393 6411
No Logo Benjamin Neuhausen, Defendant
No Logo Canadian Imperial Bank Of Commerce, Defendant
No Logo Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce World Markets Corp., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Manela Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Daniel Manela +1 713 240 4843
No Logo Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce World Markets PLC, Defendant
No Logo Charles A LeMaistre, Defendant
No Logo Charles E Walker, Defendant
No Logo Cindy K Olson, Defendant
Citibank, NA Citibank, NA, Defendant
Unknown Role, Kemet Corporation
Unknown Role, Chippac, Inc.
Citigroup, Inc. Unknown Role, Citigroup, Inc.
Unknown Role, CITICORP
Unknown Role, Intersil Holding Co
Unknown Role, Citigroup Holdings Co
Citigroup Global Markets, Inc. Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Defendant
Citigroup, Inc. Citigroup, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Chippac, Inc.
Unknown Role, Amis Holdings, Inc.
Citibank, NA Unknown Role, Citibank, NA
Unknown Role, Keane, Inc.
Unknown Role, Macdermid Inc.
Unknown Role, CITICORP
Unknown Role, Imc Mortgage Co
Unknown Role, Fashion Dynamics Corp
Unknown Role, Pfs Services Inc
Unknown Role, Citicorp Banking Corp
Unknown Role, Intersil Holding Co
Unknown Role, Citigroup Holdings Co
Unknown Role, Cvc Partners LLC
Unknown Role, Ness Technologies Inc
Unknown Role, Primerica, Inc.
Unknown Role, Student Loan Corp
Unknown Role, Pacholder Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Munienhanced Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Salomon Inc
Unknown Role, Jones Energy, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brad Scott Karp +1 212 373 2384 +1 212 373 2384 bkarp@paulweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Vorys Sater Seymour & Pease, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary Ellen Fairfield +1 614 464 6335 +1 614 719 4707 mefairfield@vorys.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilshire Scott et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jacalyn D Scott +1 713 651 1221 +1 713 651 0020
Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & McKenzie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence David Finder +1 713 427 5030 +1 713 427 5099 lawrence.finder@bakermckenzie.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard W. Clary +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 rclary@cravath.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Haynes And Boone, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Odean L Volker +1 713 547 2036 +1 713 236 5581 odean.volker@haynesboone.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson Hine, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED WILLIAM C. WILKINSON +1 614 469 3266 William.Wilkinson@ThompsonHine.com
Credit Suisse (USA), Inc. Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Credit Suisse First Boston USA Inc"
No Logo D Stephen Goddard, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Dan Boyle, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dan Boyle

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dan Boyle +1 281 480 5968
No Logo Daniel Bayly, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardere Wynne Sewell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Anthony Hagemann +1 713 276 5064 +1 713 276 6064 thagemann@gardere.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marla Thompson Poirot +1 713 276 5122 mpoirot@gardere.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Scaff +1 713 276 5193 pscaff@gardere.com
No Logo Daniel Ferguson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Heller Ehrman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence Zweifach +1 212 832 8300 +1 212 763 7600
No Logo David Duncan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon & Rees LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry G. Flynn +1 713 961 3366 +1 713 961 3938 bflynn@gordonrees.com
No Logo Debra A Cash, Defendant
Deutsche Bank AG Deutsche Bank AG, Defendant
Unknown Role, Nrp, Inc.
Unknown Role, Sherwood Group, Inc.,
Unknown Role, Briazz, Inc.
Unknown Role, Dsl.net, Inc.
Unknown Role, Blockbuster, Inc.
Unknown Role, Korea Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Brazil Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Solv Ex Corp
Unknown Role, Newmark Homes Corp
Unknown Role, Comple Tel Europe Nv
Unknown Role, Doblique Inc
Unknown Role, Mesa Airlines Inc
Unknown Role, Emerson Radio Corp
Unknown Role, Emachines Inc /de/
Unknown Role, Rreef America L.l.c.
Unknown Role, Id Arizona Corp.

Toggle Switch Represented by Berg & Androphy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joel Marc Androphy +1 713 529 5622 +1 713 529 3785 jandrophy@bafirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pepper Hamilton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence Byrne +1 212 808 2700 +1 800 551 0278 byrnel@pepperlaw.com
Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc. Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Defendant
Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Defendant
Officially listed as "Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas f/k/a Bankers Trust Company"
No Logo Estate of J Clifford Baxter, Defendant
No Logo F Scott Yeager, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Canales Simonson PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J A Tony Canales +1 361 883 0601 +1 361 884 7023 tonycanales@canalessimonson.com
No Logo Frank Savage, Defendant
No Logo Gary B Goolsby, Defendant
No Logo Goldman Sachs & Co. Health & Welfare Plan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nancy I Ruskin +1 212 225 2000 +2253 225 225 3999 nruskin@cgsh.com
No Logo Herbert S Winokur, Jr, Defendant
No Logo Ian Schottlaender, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Matthew E Fishbein

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/25/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew E Fishbein
JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, Defendant
Officially listed as "J P Morgan Chase & Co"

Toggle Switch Represented by Bruce D Angiolillo

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/02/2009 Bruce D Angiolillo

Toggle Switch Represented by Hunton & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Winford Bowen , +1 214 979 3000 +1 214 740 7110 jbowen@hunton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mithoff Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Warren Mithoff, Jr. +1 713 654 1122 +1 713 739 8085 rmithoff@mithofflaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Porter, Wright, Morris & Arthur, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Kingsley Merkle, Jr. +1 614 227 2000 + 614 227 2100

Toggle Switch Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marcia A Griffith +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 mgriffith@stblaw.com
Space Amanda Hector +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502
Space Morgan F Kelly +1 212 455 2000
Space Jill M O'Toole +1 212 455 2000 + 212 455 2502
Space Thomas C. Rice , +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 trice@stblaw.com
Space Jonathan K. Youngwood +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 jyoungwood@stblaw.com
No Logo J.P. Morgan Chase Bank f/k/a Chase Manhattan Bank, Defendant
No Logo J.P. Morgan Securities Inc. f/k/a Chase Securities, Inc., Defendant
No Logo James A Brown, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelley Drye & Warren, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Michael Keneally +1 212 661 0040 +1 212 808 7897 JKeneally@KelleyDrye.com
No Logo Jeffery McMahon, Defendant
No Logo Jeffrey K Skilling, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel M. Petrocelli +1 310 553 6700 +1 213 430 6407 dpetrocelli@omm.com
No Logo Jerome J Meyer, Defendant
No Logo Joe H Foy, Defendant
No Logo John A Urquhart, Defendant
No Logo JOHN E. STEWART, Defendant
No Logo John H Duncan, Defendant
No Logo John Mendelsohn, Defendant
No Logo Joseph F Berardino, Defendant
No Logo Joseph M Hirko, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Stoel Rives, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barnes H. Ellis +1 503 294 9243 +1 503 220 2480 bhellis@stoel.com
No Logo Joseph W Sutton, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jesse R. Pierce & Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward John Jack O'Neill, Jr. +1 713 634 3638 +1 713 634 3639 joneill@pierceoneill.com
No Logo Ken L Harrison, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Tonkon Torp LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary W L Wright +1 503 802 2041 +1 503 802 3741 zach.wright@tonkon.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William F. Martson, Jr. +1 503 802 2005 +1 503 972 3705 rick.martson@tonkon.com
No Logo Kenneth D Rice, Defendant
Lay, Kenneth L Lay, Kenneth L, Defendant
Officially listed as "Kenneth L Lay"

Toggle Switch Represented by Bieser, Greer & Landis, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Carr Greer +1 937 223 6337 +1 937 223 6339 DCG@BGLLAW.COM
No Logo Kevin Howard, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Okin & Adams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Okin +1 713 228 4100 +1 888 865 2118 mokin@okinadams.com
No Logo Kevin P Hannon, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Reid Mason Figel +1 202 326 7918 +1 202 326 7999 RFIGEL@KHHTE.COM
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David L. Schwarz +1 202 326 7900 +1 202 326 7999 dschwarz@khhte.com
No Logo Lawrence G Whaley, Defendant
Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc. Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David M Bays +1 832 239 3939 +1 832 239 3600 dmbays@JonesDay.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hugh R Whiting +1 832 239 3939 +1 832 239 3600 hrwhiting@jonesday.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Fordham Eric Huffman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fordham Eric Huffman +1 614 371 8085 +1 614 461 4198
Lehman Brothers, Inc. Lehman Brothers, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Lehman Abs Corp
No Logo Linda Lay, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Kenneth L. Lay, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Nathan Sommers Jacobs, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George R Gibson +1 713 892 4843 +1 713 892 4840 ggibson@nathansommers.com
No Logo Lou L Pai, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Zuckerman Spaeder LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deborah J Jeffrey +1 202 778 1800 + 202 822 8106 djeffrey@zuckerman.com
No Logo Mark A Frevert, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Edison, McDowell & Hetherington LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JESSICA L. WILSON +1 713 337 5584 jessica.wilson@emhllp.com
No Logo Mark E Koenig, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Crowell & Moring LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Philip Thomas Inglima +1 202 624 2795 +1 202 628 5116 pinglima@crowell.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justin P. Murphy +1 202 624 2536 justin.murphy@crowell.com
No Logo MARK WOLF, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Krantz & Berman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry Howard Krantz +1 212 661 0009 +1 212 335 5009 lkrantz@krantzberman.com
No Logo Merrill Lynch & Co Inc, Defendant
Unknown Role, Cumulus Media Inc.
Unknown Role, Lodgian, Inc.
Unknown Role, Mlgpe Ltd
Merrill Lynch GP Inc. Unknown Role, Merrill Lynch GP Inc.
Unknown Role, Mk Rail Corp
Unknown Role, New BlackRock, Inc.
Unknown Role, Bibb Co /de
Unknown Role, Digirad Corp
Unknown Role, GMI Investments, Inc.
Unknown Role, Gabelli Utility Fund
Unknown Role, Utility Income Trust

Toggle Switch Represented by Beck Redden & Secrest - Houston

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J Beck +1 713 951 6209 +1 713 951 3720 dbeck@beckredden.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hicks Thomas & Lilienstern

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Taylor Mayo Hicks +1 713 547 9100 +1 713 547 9150 thicks@hicks-thomas.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shearman & Sterling LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Herbert Scott Washer +1 212 848 7216 +1 212 848 7179 herbert.washer@shearman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Zeiger & Carpenter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Wolcott Zeiger +1 614 365 4100
Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc. Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Cumulus Media Inc.
Unknown Role, Lodgian, Inc.
Unknown Role, Mlgpe Ltd
Merrill Lynch GP Inc. Unknown Role, Merrill Lynch GP Inc.
Unknown Role, Infospace.com, Inc.
Unknown Role, New BlackRock, Inc.
Unknown Role, NATIONSBANK CORP
Bank of America, NA Unknown Role, Bank of America, NA
Unknown Role, Gabelli Utility Fund
Unknown Role, Muniholdings Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Munienhanced Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Munivest Fund II Inc
No Logo Michael C Odom, Defendant
No Logo MICHAEL D. JONES, Defendant
No Logo Michael Krautz, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller & Chevalier Chartered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Pollack +1 202 626 5830 +1 202 626 5801 bpollack@milchev.com
No Logo Michael L Bennett, Defendant
No Logo Michael M Lowther, Defendant
No Logo National Westminister plc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles M Kennedy +1 216 586 7181 +1 216 579 0212 cmkennedy@jonesday.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Marshall Newman, Jr. +1 216 586 3939 +1 216 579 0212 jmnewman@jonesday.com
No Logo Norman P Blake, Jr, Defendant
No Logo Paula Rieker, Defendant
No Logo Pershing LLC, Defendant
No Logo Richard A Causey, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuireWoods LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jacks C Nickens +1 713 353 6668 +1 713 571 9652 jnickens@mcguirewoods.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Tekell, Book, Matthews & Limmer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED C. Robert Mace +1 713 222 9542 +1 713 655 7727 bmace@tekellbook.com
No Logo Richard B Buy, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by James N. Esterkin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas M Kirkendall +1 281 364 9946 +1 888 582 0646 bigtkirk@kir.com
No Logo Rick Petersen, Defendant
No Logo Robert A Belfer, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibbs & Bruns, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robin C Gibbs +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903 rgibbs@gibbs-bruns.com
No Logo Robert K Jaedicke, Defendant
No Logo Robert S Furst, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Beth G Jaynes +1 214 292 4066 +1 214 747 2091 jaynes@fr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lillard Wise Szygenda PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/17/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine R Hendler +1 214 739 2012 +1 214 739 2010 khendler@lwsattorneys.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weitzman Law Offices, LLC (NJ)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Edward Coggins +1 214 740 8000 +1 214 740 8800 pcoggins@lockelord.com
No Logo Ronnie C Chan, Defendant
Royal Bank of Canada Royal Bank of Canada, Defendant
Unknown Role, Centura Banks, Inc.
Unknown Role, Muniholdings Fund Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Hall Maines Lugrin, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claude L Stuart, III +1 713 871 9000 +1 713 971 8962 cstuart@hallmaineslugrin.com
No Logo Salomon Smith Barney, Inc. n/k/a Citigroup Global Markets Inc, Defendant
No Logo Schuyler M Tilney, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by TROUT CACHERIS, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert P. Trout +1 202 464 3300 +1 202 463 3319 rtrout@troutcacheris.com
No Logo Steven J Kean, Defendant
Royal Bank of Scotland PLC Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, Defendant
Officially listed as "The Royal Bank of Scotland plc"
No Logo Thomas Davis, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICES OF THOMAS FITZPATRICK

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Fitzpatrick +1 212 930 1290 +1 212 930 9690 tfitzpatrick@tfitzpatrick.com
No Logo Thomas H Bauer, Defendant
No Logo Toronto-Dominion Bank, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Doyle, Restrepo, Harvin & Robbins, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Eloi Doyle +1 713 228 5100 +1 713 228 6138 jdoyle@drhrlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuireWoods LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Stuart Plotkin +1 202 857 1700 +1 202 857 1737 rplotkin@mcguirewoods.com
No Logo Vinson & Elkins LLP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by John Cooper McDonald

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/30/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY John Cooper McDonald
No Logo Wendy L Gramm, Defendant
No Logo Wesley Colwell, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Porter & Hedges, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John F Higgins, IV +1 713 226 6000 +1 713 226 6287 jhiggins@porterhedges.com
No Logo William E Swanson, Defendant
No Logo William Fuhs, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Riddle & Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chad Edward Robinson +1 214 760 6766 +1 214 760 6765 crobinson@riddleandwilliams.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Spears & Imes, L.L.P.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Debra A. Karlstein +1 212 213 1715 +1 212 213 0849 dkarlstein@spearsimes.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Spears +1 212 213 6996 +1 212 213 0849 dspears@spearsimes.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Spears Imes LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher W Dysard +1 212 213 6996

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Patrick Cohoon +1 210 757 0286 +1 713 987 7120 pcohoon@shmsfirm.com
Bank of America Corporation Bank of America Corporation, Movant
No Logo Bank of America Securities, LLC, Movant
No Logo Charles A LeMaistre, Movant
No Logo Charles E Walker, Movant
No Logo Daniel Ferguson, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardere Wynne Sewell LLP - Houston

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy Catherine Dinn +1 713 579 9700 +1 832 460 6350 adinn@patelervin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardere Wynne Sewell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James George Munisteri +1 713 276 5752 +1 713 276 6752 jmunisteri@gardere.com
No Logo Frank Savage, Movant
No Logo Goldman Sachs & Co. Health & Welfare Plan, Movant
No Logo Ian Schottlaender, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Debevoise & Plimpton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/25/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew E. Fishbein +1 212 909 6077 +1 212 909 6836 mfishbein@debevoise.com
No Logo Jerome J Meyer, Movant
No Logo Joe H Foy, Movant
No Logo John A Urquhart, Movant
No Logo John H Duncan, Movant
No Logo John Mendelsohn, Movant
No Logo MARK WOLF, Movant
No Logo Norman P Blake, Jr, Movant
No Logo Robert A Belfer, Movant
No Logo Robert K Jaedicke, Movant
No Logo Ronnie C Chan, Movant
Royal Bank of Scotland PLC Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, Movant
Officially listed as "The Royal Bank of Scotland plc"
No Logo Wendy L Gramm, Movant
No Logo Outside Directors Enron, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibbs & Bruns, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Turner Ross +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903 bross@gibbs-bruns.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1452
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (437) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
Clerks Notice regarding CMECF notice returned undeliverable from pcohoon@cozen.com on the account of James Patrick Cohoon. The referenced email address has been deleted from your CM/ECF account, filed. (tferguson, ) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
    Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Charles G King, III re: 432 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, filed. (mmapps, ) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
      Clerks Notice regarding CMECF notice returned undeliverable from CKING@KANDPLAW.COM and KCASEY@KANDPLAW.COM on the account of Charles G King. The referenced email addresses have been deleted from your CM/ECF account, filed. (tferguson, ) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
        Clerks Notice regarding CMECF notice returned undeliverable from sliebesman@gelaw.com on the account of Sidney S Liebesman. The referenced email address has been deleted from your CM/ECF account, filed. (tferguson, ) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
          Clerks Notice regarding CMECF notice returned undeliverable from dsellinger@gelaw.com on the account of David Eric Sellinger. The referenced email address has been deleted from your CM/ECF account, filed. (tferguson, ) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER granting 226 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant Toronto's motion to dismiss is granted and Toronto is DISMISSED with prejudice. This case is CLOSED. Case terminated on July 12, 2012.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None
              STATUS REPORT by Toronto Dominion Bank, filed.(Plotkin, Robert) (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER that counsel for Toronto Dominion file a statement within two weeks indicating if 226 motion to dismiss is still viable..(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(arrivera, ) (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: None
                  Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Charles G King as to Banc of America Securities LLC, Bank of America Corp re: 421 Order, filed. Attorney address updated. Document 421 renoticed. (rsmith) (Entered: 08/18/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: None
                    Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Charles G King as to Banc of America Securities LLC, Bank of America Corp re: 422 Order, filed. Attorney address updated. Document 422 renoticed. (rsmith) (Entered: 08/18/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: None
                      Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Charles G King as to Banc of America Securities LLC, Bank of America Corp re: 420 Order on Motion to Dismiss, filed. Attorney address updated. Document 420 renoticed. (rsmith) (Entered: 08/18/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: None
                        Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Fordham Eric Huffman as to Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc re: 422 Order, filed. (Atty's address updated, order renoticed) (sjones, ) (Entered: 08/11/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: None
                          Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Lawrence Zweifach re: 422 Order, filed. (rsmith) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: None
                            Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Lawrence Zweifach re: 420 Order on Motion to Dismiss, filed. (amaly) (Entered: 07/20/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: None
                              Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Lawrence Zweifach re: 421 Order, filed. (amaly) (Entered: 07/20/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER granting 418 Notice of Dismissal,,.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(kstrouse, ) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER granting 417 Notice of Dismissal,,.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(kstrouse, ) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER granting 419 Motion to Dismiss.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(kstrouse, ) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None
                                      MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiffs of Defendants Dan Boyle, Linda Lay as rep Estate Kenneth Lay, and Jeffrey Skilling by Cincinnati Retirement System, Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, Public Employees Retirement System Board, Public Employees' Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/6/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Eisenhofer, Jay) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of Dismissal as to Richard B Buy, Richard A Causey, David W Delainey, Andrew S Fastow, Ben F Glisan, Jr, Kevin P Hannon, Mark E Koenig, Michael J Kopper, Jeffery McMahon, Lou L Pai, Kenneth D Rice, Rex T Shelby, Lawrence G Whaley, F Scott Yeager by Cincinnati Retirement System, Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, Public Employees Retirement System Board, Public Employees' Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Eisenhofer, Jay) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of Dismissal as to Arthur Andersen LLP, Thomas H Bauer, Michael L Bennett, Joseph F Berardino, Debra A Cash, David Duncan, D Stephen Goddard, Jr, Gary B Goolsby, Michael D Jones, Michael M Lowther, Benjamin Neuhausen, Michael C Odom, Rick Petersen, John E Stewart, William E Swanson by Cincinnati Retirement System, Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, Public Employees Retirement System Board, Public Employees' Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Eisenhofer, Jay) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER Dismissing all Claims Against Goldman, Sachs & Co..(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(jewilliams, ) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of Dismissal as to Goldman Sachs & Co by Cincinnati Retirement System, Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, Public Employees Retirement System Board, Public Employees' Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Eisenhofer, Jay) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL regarding 411 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice. All claims against Hirko are DISMISSED with prejudice with each party to bear its own costs and expenses.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(kcarr, ) (Entered: 03/31/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  Order of Final Judgment granting 412 Motion to Dismiss.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(sbyrum, ) (Entered: 03/30/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                    Agreed MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice as to Defendant Joseph M. Hirko and Bar Order by Public Employees Retirement System Board, State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, Cincinnati Retirement System, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, Joseph M Hirko, Public Employees' Retirement System of Ohio, Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/7/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Eisenhofer, Jay) (Entered: 03/18/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                      STIPULATION of Dismissal ("Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice") by Public Employees Retirement System Board, State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, Cincinnati Retirement System, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, Joseph M Hirko, Public Employees' Retirement System of Ohio, Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System, filed.(Eisenhofer, Jay) (Entered: 03/18/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                        Letter from Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP requesting removal of attorney Bruce Angiolillo from all notification in all Enron-related cases, filed.(ltien, ) (Entered: 02/02/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER OF FINAL JUDGMENT AND DISMISSAL granting 408 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss as to Defendant Ken L. Harrison and Bar Order, Ken L Harrison terminated.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(ypippin, ) (Entered: 07/11/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                            Agreed MOTION to Dismiss as to Defendant Ken L. Harrison and Bar Order by Public Employees Retirement System Board, State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, Cincinnati Retirement System, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, Ken L Harrison, Public Employees' Retirement System of Ohio, Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/28/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order of Final Judgment and Dismissal as to Defendant Ken L. Harrison and Bar Order)(Eisenhofer, Jay) (Entered: 07/08/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                              STIPULATION of Dismissal ("Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice") with certificate of service by Public Employees Retirement System Board, State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, Cincinnati Retirement System, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, Ken L Harrison, Public Employees' Retirement System of Ohio, Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System, filed.(Eisenhofer, Jay) (Entered: 07/08/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER OF PARTIAL FINAL JUDGMENT AND DISMISSAL.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(sbyrum, ) (Entered: 06/27/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  PARTIAL FINAL JUDGMENT ENTRY.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(sbyrum, ) (Entered: 06/26/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    OPINION and ORDER Granting 394 Agreed MOTION for Dismissal with Prejudice and for Entry of Partial Final Judgment Judgment, 400 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(sbyrum, ) (Entered: 06/24/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                      Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney John Wolcott Zeiger re: 6 Motion to Expedite, Motion Docket Date, 402 Order,, filed. (ltrevino, ) (Entered: 05/29/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 2/27/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER OF FINAL JUDGMENT AND DISMISSAL AS TO VINSON & ELKINS LLP (FOOTNOTE: It has come to the Court's attention that due to a clerical error, this ORDER was not entered as it should have been, contemporaneously with 268 Final Judgment Entry as to Vinson & Elkins, L.L.P. on February 27, 2007).(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 05/14/2008)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                          SURREPLY to 394 Agreed MOTION for Dismissal with Prejudice and for Entry of Partial Final Judgment Judgment, filed by Toronto Dominion Bank. (Doyle, James) (Entered: 05/05/2008)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by Toronto Dominion Bank, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/27/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Doyle, James) (Entered: 05/05/2008)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                              REPLY in Support of 394 Agreed MOTION for Dismissal with Prejudice and for Entry of Partial Final Judgment Judgment, filed by Public Employees Retirement System Board, State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, Public Employees' Retirement System of Ohio, Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System. (Eisenhofer, Jay) (Entered: 04/22/2008)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                REPLY in Support of 394 Agreed MOTION for Dismissal with Prejudice and for Entry of Partial Final Judgment Judgment, filed by Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation, Merrill Lynch & Co Inc, The Royal Bank of Scotland plc, Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc, Barclays PLC, Credit Suisse First Boston USA Inc, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas f/k/a Bankers Trust Company, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., National Westminister plc, Pershing LLC, Royal Bank Of Canada. (Stuart, Claude) (Entered: 04/22/2008)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                  Letter to Helen Tippen by Royal Bank Of Canada, filed.(Stuart, Claude) (Entered: 04/10/2008)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                    OBJECTIONS to 394 Agreed MOTION for Dismissal with Prejudice and for Entry of Partial Final Judgment Judgment, filed by Toronto Dominion Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Doyle, James) (Entered: 04/03/2008)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER granting 393 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Beth G Jaynes terminated.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(sbyrum, ) (Entered: 03/28/2008)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                        Agreed MOTION for Dismissal with Prejudice and for Entry of Partial Final Judgment Judgment by Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation, Merrill Lynch & Co Inc, Public Employees Retirement System Board, State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, Cincinnati Retirement System, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc, Barclays PLC, Credit Suisse First Boston USA Inc, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas f/k/a Bankers Trust Company, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., National Westminister plc, Pershing LLC, Royal Bank Of Canada, The Royal Bank of Scotland plc, Public Employees' Retirement System of Ohio, Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/10/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Certificate of Service)(Beck, David) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                          MOTION for Beth G. Jaynes to Withdraw as Attorney by Robert S Furst, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/7/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Jaynes, Beth) (Entered: 03/18/2008)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            AMENDED Order of Final Judgment and Dismissal as to Certian Outside Director Defendants and Bar Order.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(sbyrum, ) (Entered: 01/07/2008)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                              Amended PROPOSED ORDER of Final Judgment and Dismissal as to Certain Outside Director Defendants and Bar Order re: 389 Agreed MOTION for Order of Final Judgment and Dismissal with Prejudice as to Certain Outside Director Defendants and Bar Order, filed.(Ross, Brian) (Entered: 12/19/2007)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER OF FINAL JUDGMENT AND DISMISSAL AS TO CERTAIN OUTSIDE DIRECTOR DEFENDANTS AND BAR ORDER 389 Agreed MOTION for Order of Final Judgment and Dismissal with Prejudice as to Certain Outside Director Defendants and Bar Order, Norman P Blake, Jr; Ronnie C Chan; John H Duncan; Joe H Foy; Wendy L Gramm; Robert K Jaedicke; Charles A LeMaistre; John Mendelsohn; Jerome J Meyer; Frank Savage; John A Urquhart; Charles E Walker; Herbert S Winokur, Jr; and Robert A Belfer terminated.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(sbyrum, ) (Entered: 12/19/2007)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Agreed MOTION for Order of Final Judgment and Dismissal with Prejudice as to Certain Outside Director Defendants and Bar Order by State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, Outside Directors Enron, Cincinnati Retirement System, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, Public Employees' Retirement System of Ohio, Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/3/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order of Final Judgment and Dismissal as to Certain Outside Director Defendants and Bar Order)(Ross, Brian) (Entered: 12/14/2007)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                    STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, Outside Directors Enron, Cincinnati Retirement System, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, Public Employees' Retirement System of Ohio, Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System, filed.(Ross, Brian) (Entered: 12/14/2007)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting 386 Joint Motion for Extension of Time.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 12/12/2007)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supplement Regarding Plaintiffs' Claims Against Outside Directors by Public Employees Retirement System Board, State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, Cincinnati Retirement System, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, Robert A Belfer, Norman P Blake, Jr, Ronnie C Chan, John H Duncan, Joe H Foy, Wendy L Gramm, Robert K Jaedicke, Charles A LeMaistre, John Mendelsohn, Jerome J Meyer, Frank Savage, John A Urquhart, Charles E Walker, Herbert S Winokur, Jr, Public Employees' Retirement System of Ohio, Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/22/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sellinger, David) (Entered: 10/02/2007)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                          REPLY in Support of 344 MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Ken L Harrison. (Wright, Zachary) (Entered: 10/01/2007)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Supplemental REPLY in Support of 216 MOTION to Dismiss 55 Memorandum, 56 Declaration,, Amended Complaint, filed by Goldman Sachs & Co. (King, Charles) (Entered: 09/28/2007)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER granting 380 Defendant Kenneth D. Rice's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 09/25/2007)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                REPLY in Support of 351 MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Kevin P Hannon. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Schwarz, David) (Entered: 09/20/2007)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  REPLY of Defendant Kenneth D. Rice to the Ohio Retirement Systems' 367 Omnibus Memorandum of Law in Opposition to the Motions to Dismiss of Certain Former Enron Officers including Kenneth Rice's 349 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Kenneth D Rice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Part 1# 2)(Nickens, Jacks) Linked to #349 on 9/27/2007 (ltien, ). (Entered: 09/20/2007)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply of Defendant Kenneth D. Rice to the Ohio Retirement Systems' Omnibus Memorandum of Law in Opposition to the Motions to Dismiss of Certain Former Enron Officers by Kenneth D Rice, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/10/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Nickens, Jacks) (Entered: 09/20/2007)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      SURREPLY to 218 MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,, Amended Complaint MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,, Amended Complaint, 216 MOTION to Dismiss 55 Memorandum, 56 Declaration,, Amended Complaint, 226 MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,, MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,,, 221 Joint MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,,Joint MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,,, 227 MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,,, 223 MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,, MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Public Employees Retirement System Board, State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, Cincinnati Retirement System, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, Public Employees' Retirement System of Ohio, Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System. (Sellinger, David) (Entered: 09/19/2007)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 373 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Supplement Regarding Plaintiffs' Claims Against The Outside Directors. Deadline is extended to 10/15/07.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 09/19/2007)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 374 Defendant Ken Harrison's Unopposed Unopposed Mtn Motion for Extension of Time to Reply in Support of 97 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint; Reply deadline is 10/01/07.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 09/19/2007)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to 343 MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,, MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Lou L Pai. (Jeffrey, Deborah) (Entered: 09/17/2007)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              REPLY in Support of 342 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, filed by Mark E Koenig. (Inglima, Philip) (Entered: 09/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Ken L Harrison, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/9/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wright, Zachary) (Entered: 09/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Time To File Supplement Regarding Plaintiffs' Claims Against The Outside Directors by Public Employees Retirement System Board, State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, Cincinnati Retirement System, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, Public Employees' Retirement System of Ohio, Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/2/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sellinger, David) (Entered: 09/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Change of Address by Dan Boyle, filed. (dbiagas, ) (Entered: 09/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Dan Boyle re: 369 Order,, Add and Terminate Parties,, filed. (blacy, ) (Entered: 08/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 186 Motion to Dismiss. The Outside Directors' motion to dismiss is GRANTED IN PART as to Plaintiffs' aiding and abetting common law fraud against them and DENIED as to the § 18 and negligent misrepresentation claims. Plaintiffs shall file within 30 days of entry of this opinion a supplement to their § 18 and their negligent misrepresentation claims or they shall inform the Court that they no longer wish to pursue the cause against Outside Directors. If Plaintiffs file a supplement Outside Directors may timely challenge sufficiency of the new pleading. If the Court finds that Plaintiffs state a claim for which relief can be granted, it will address the discovery requests of Outside Directors..( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 08/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL on 364 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. The dismissal is without prejudice, Kevin Howard; Sheila Kahanek; Michael Krautz; Wesley Colwell and Lea W Fastow terminated.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 08/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of David E. Sellinger re: 343 MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,, MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,,, 339 MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,,, 337 MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,,, 349 MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,, Motion to Dismiss State Law Claims MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,, Motion to Dismiss State Law Claims, 342 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, 344 MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,,, 351 MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,,, 338 MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,,, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Errata A Koenig Information# 2 Exhibit B Koenig Complaint# 3 Exhibit C Howard SEC Complaint# 4 Exhibit D Howard Indictment# 5 Exhibit E Part 1 Powers Report# 6 Exhibit E Part 2 Powers Report# 7 Exhibit E Part 3 Powers Report# 8 Exhibit E Part 4 Powers Report# 9 Exhibit F Ackman Article# 10 Exhibit G Hannon Cooperation Agreement# 11 Exhibit H Rice Cooperation Agreement# 12 Exhibit I - Fastow Testimony)(Sellinger, David) (Entered: 08/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition to 343 MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,, MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,,, 349 MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,, Motion to Dismiss State Law Claims MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,, Motion to Dismiss State Law Claims, 339 MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,,, 342 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, 344 MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,,, 351 MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,,, 337 MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,,, 338 MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Public Employees Retirement System Board, State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, Cincinnati Retirement System, Public Employees' Retirement System of Ohio. (Sellinger, David) (Entered: 08/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                REPLY MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of 246 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint (Instr. No. 97) by William Fuhs, filed.(Robinson, Chad) Linked to #246 on 8/23/2007 (ltien, ). (Entered: 08/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Joint REPLY in Support of 240 MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,, and Motion to Strike 97 MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,, and Motion to Strike 97 , 244 MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Thomas Davis, Schuyler M Tilney. (Trout, Robert) (Entered: 08/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 8/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Dismissal as to Wesley Colwell, Lea W Fastow, Kevin Howard, Sheila Kahanek, Michael Krautz by Public Employees Retirement System Board, State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, Cincinnati Retirement System, Public Employees' Retirement System of Ohio, Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 08/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      REPLY in Support of 221 Joint MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,,Joint MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc, Barclays PLC. (Braff, David) (Entered: 08/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        REPLY in Support of 221 Joint MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,,Joint MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Merrill Lynch & Co Inc, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc.. (Beck, David) (Entered: 08/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Joint REPLY in Support of 221 Joint MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,,Joint MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation, Merrill Lynch & Co Inc, The Royal Bank of Scotland plc, Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc, Barclays PLC, Credit Suisse First Boston USA Inc, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas f/k/a Bankers Trust Company, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., National Westminister plc, Pershing LLC, Royal Bank Of Canada, Toronto Dominion Bank. (Beck, David) (Entered: 08/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            REPLY in Support of 221 Joint MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,,Joint MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas f/k/a Bankers Trust Company. (Byrne, Lawrence) (Entered: 08/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              REPLY in Support of 227 MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Royal Bank Of Canada. (Stuart, Claude) (Entered: 08/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Supplemental REPLY in Support of 221 Joint MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,,Joint MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,,, 223 MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,, MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,,, filed by National Westminister plc, The Royal Bank of Scotland plc. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix of Unreported Cases)(Kennedy, Charles) (Entered: 08/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY in Support of 226 MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,, MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Toronto Dominion Bank. (Doyle, James) (Entered: 08/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY in Support of 218 MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,, Amended Complaint MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,, Amended Complaint, filed by Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation, Credit Suisse First Boston USA Inc, Pershing LLC. (Volker, Odean) (Entered: 08/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY in Support of 216 MOTION to Dismiss 55 Memorandum, 56 Declaration,, Amended Complaint, filed by Goldman Sachs & Co. (King, Charles) (Entered: 08/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 8/9/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 353 Charles M. Kennedy's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 08/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 8/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Charles M. Kennedy to Appear Pro Hac Vice by National Westminister plc, The Royal Bank of Scotland plc, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/29/2007. (Kennedy, Charles) (Entered: 08/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED ANSWER to 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., by Dan Boyle, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment# 2 Attachment# 3 Attachment)(dbiagas, ) (Entered: 08/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,, by Kevin P Hannon, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/20/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Schwarz, David) (Entered: 07/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 7/27/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL, granting 327 Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Stanley Horton, without prejudice, Stanley C Horton terminated.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 07/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 7/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,, Motion to Dismiss State Law Claims by Kenneth D Rice, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/16/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Declaration of Kenneth D. Rice)(Nickens, Jacks) (Entered: 07/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION and Memorandum of Law in Support to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint by Kevin Howard, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/6/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(ltien, ) (Entered: 07/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER OF FINAL JUDGMENT AND DISMISSAL AS TO BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION AND BANC OF AMERICA SECURITEIS LLC granting 292 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss /Motion for Entry of Stipulation and Order of Dismissal with Prejudice of Bank of America Corporation and Banc of America Securities LLC and Bar Order, Motion(s) terminated: 292 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss /Motion for Entry of Stipulation and Order of Dismissal with Prejudice of Bank of America Corporation and Banc of America Securities LLC and Bar Order, Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America Securities LLC terminated.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 07/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying 314 Kevin P. Hannon's Motion to Sever from Newby and Consolidated cases. Mr. Hannon was sentenced in CR 03-93 on June 14, 2007.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 07/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED ORDER re: 344 MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,,, filed.(Wright, Zachary) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,, by Ken L Harrison, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/2/2007. (Wright, Zachary) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice State Law Claims re: 97 Amended Complaint and Conditional MOTION to Reopen Discovery by Lou L Pai, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/30/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum In Support of Motion to Dismiss# 2 Proposed Order)(Jeffrey, Deborah) Motion to reopen added on 7/12/2007 (ltien, ). (Entered: 07/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Mark E Koenig, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/30/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Memorandum In Support of Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint)(Inglima, Philip) (Entered: 07/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss re: 340 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Wesley Colwell's Motion to Dismiss by Wesley Colwell, filed.(Higgins, John) (Entered: 07/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Wesley Colwell's Motion to Dismiss by Wesley Colwell, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/30/2007. (Higgins, John) (Entered: 07/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,, by Lawrence G Whaley, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/30/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed order)(Kirkendall, Thomas) (Entered: 07/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,, by Richard B Buy, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/30/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed order)(Kirkendall, Thomas) (Entered: 07/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,, by Jeffery McMahon, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/30/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kirkendall, Thomas) (Entered: 07/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL, Cindy K Olson; Paula Rieker; Joseph W Sutton; Carol L Whalen; Carol L Whalen as the Personal Representative of the Estate of J. Clifford Baxter; Mark A Frevert and Steven J Kean terminated.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(ypippin, ) (Entered: 07/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Dismissal as to Mark A Frevert, Steven J Kean, Cindy K Olson, Joseph W Sutton, Carol L Whalen as the Personal Representative of the Estate of J. Clifford Baxter, Paula Rieker by State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, Cincinnati Retirement System, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, Public Employees' Retirement System of Ohio, Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 07/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition to 240 MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,, and Motion to Strike 97 MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,, and Motion to Strike 97 , 244 MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,,, 246 MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,, MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,,, filed by State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, Cincinnati Retirement System, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, Public Employees' Retirement System of Ohio, Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sidney S. Liebesman# 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Sidney S. Liebesman# 3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration of Sidney S. Liebesman# 4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Declaration of Sidney S. Liebesman)(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 06/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to 218 MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,, Amended Complaint MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,, Amended Complaint, 216 MOTION to Dismiss 55 Memorandum, 56 Declaration,, Amended Complaint, 226 MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,, MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,,, 221 Joint MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,,Joint MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,,, 227 MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,,, 223 MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,, MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,, The Ohio Retirement Systems' Omnibus Response to the Financial Institution Defendants' Motions to Dismiss the Amended Complaint, filed by State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, Cincinnati Retirement System, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, Public Employees' Retirement System of Ohio, Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sidney S. Liebesman# 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Sidney S. Liebesman# 3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration of Sidney S. Liebesman# 4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Declaration of Sidney S. Liebesman)(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 06/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER The briefing schedule is amended and only the state-law claims will proceed until the United States Supreme Court resolves the issues regarding the scope of section 10(b), Rule 10b-5, and, derivatively, section 20(a).( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(ypippin, ) text Modified on 6/25/2007 (htippen, ). (Entered: 06/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to 325 Letter The Ohio Retirement Systems' Response to Financial Institution Defendants' Submission Regarding Briefing on Federal Claims, filed by State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, Cincinnati Retirement System, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, Public Employees' Retirement System of Ohio, Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System. (Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 06/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition to 282 MOTION to Dismiss The Amended Complaint [PERS of Ohio Docket No. 97] MOTION to Dismiss The Amended Complaint [PERS of Ohio Docket No. 97], 277 MOTION to Dismiss, 274 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Arthur Andersen LLP's Motion to Dismiss The Amended Complaint [PERS of Ohio Docket No. 97], 281 MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,, MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Public Employees Retirement System Board, State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, Cincinnati Retirement System, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, Public Employees' Retirement System of Ohio, Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System. (Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 06/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 238 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, as to Thomas Fitzpatrick.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 06/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Change of Address by Buchwald & Kaufman, counsel for James A Brown, filed. (Keneally, James) (Entered: 06/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              (AMENDED) NOTICE of Dismissal as to Stanley C Horton by State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, Cincinnati Retirement System, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, Public Employees' Retirement System of Ohio, Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Liebesman, Sidney) Modified on 6/7/2007 (htippen, ). (Entered: 06/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Dismissal as to Stanley C Horton by State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, Cincinnati Retirement System, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, Public Employees' Retirement System of Ohio, Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System, filed. (Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 06/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter from Odean Volker re: Notice of Proposed Briefing Schedule 320 was not entirely agreed, filed. (htippen, ) (Entered: 06/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER This Court issued an order 323 approving and effectuating the schedules set out in Plaintiffs' Notice of Proposed Briefing Schedule on Pending and Anticipated Motions to Dismiss 320 which the Court thought was agreed to by the parties. Mr. Odean Volker's 06/01/07 facsimile states the parties are in disagreement. The Court Orders that Mr. Volker's facsimile shall be entered as an instrument in the record and that the parties shall file any responses within 15 days.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 06/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER on 320 The Ohio Retirement Systems' Notice of Proposed Briefing Schedule On Pending And Anticipated Motions to Dismiss. The schedules contained therein are hereby in effect.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 05/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion re: 221 Joint MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,,Joint MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,,, 222 Memorandum, by Banc of America Securities LLC, Bank of America Corp, filed. (King, Charles) (Entered: 05/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 317 Motion to Stay Defendant James Brown's obligation to respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint 97 .( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 05/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 5/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE The Ohio Retirement Systems' Notice of Proposed Briefing Schedule on Pending and Anticipated Motions to Dismiss by State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, Cincinnati Retirement System, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, Public Employees' Retirement System of Ohio, Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Certification)(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 05/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 313 Unopposed Motion to Reset Briefing Schedule Between Plaintiffs and Defendant Mark E. Koenig 97 . Deft. Koenig's response to the amended complaint is due 06/01/07; Plaintiffs' opposition to the response is due 08/01/07. Koenig's reply is due 09/07/07.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 05/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Firm Name by Linklaters by Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas f/k/a Bankers Trust Company, filed. (Byrne, Lawrence) (Entered: 05/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Stay by James A Brown, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/21/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Stay)(Keneally, James) (Entered: 04/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE to be removed from the Clerk of the Court's service list for notices and orders relating to the litigation by Vinson & Elkins LLP, filed. (jegonzalez, ) (Entered: 04/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Defendant Kahanak shall file a motion to dismiss again and counsel for Plaintiffs shall confer with counsel for Defendants and submit within two weeks of entry of this order an agreed proposed briefing schedule for hte pending motions and for any motions intended to be, but not yet filed, to supersede any current deadline.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 04/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Objection to Scheduling Order for Cross-Claims and Third Party Claims (inst #5556 in Case No. H-01-3624) and MOTION to Sever Third-Party Claims against Kevin P Hannon from Newby and Consolidated Cases by Kevin P Hannon, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/4/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) This entry was originally filed elecronically at Case No. H-01-3624 #5620. (ltien, ) (Entered: 04/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time To Set Briefing Schedule Between Plaintiffs and Defendant Koenig (Instr. No. 97) by Mark E Koenig, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/14/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Inglima, Philip) (Entered: 04/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,, by Michael Krautz, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/10/2007. (Pollack, Barry) (Entered: 04/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER mooting 191 Motion to Stay.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 04/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting Daniel Bayly and Robert Furst' 235 Motion to Stay. Bayly's and Furst's obligation to respnd to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint are stayed until defendants are acquitted or sentenced in the criminal proceeding. ( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 04/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 303 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Katherine R Hendler terminated.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(chorace, ) (Entered: 04/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting Richard Causey's 296 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaints until 08/09/07.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 04/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 300 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, as to Jill Agro.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 04/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 298 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to James M. Keneally.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(chorace, ) (Entered: 04/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SURREPLY to 186 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint and Conditional Motion To Reopen Discovery, filed by State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, Cincinnati Retirement System, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, Public Employees' Retirement System of Ohio, Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sidney S. Liebesman in Support of The Ohio Retirement Systems' Sur-Reply in Response to the Outside Director Defendants' Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss The Amended Complaint# 2 Exhibit A to Declaration)(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 04/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion re: 221 Joint MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,,Joint MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,,, 219 MOTION to Dismiss by Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc, Lehman Brothers Inc, filed. (Bays, David) (Entered: 04/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Katherine R. Hendler to Withdraw as Attorney by Robert S Furst, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/3/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw as Counsel)(Hendler, Katherine) (Entered: 04/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 4/10/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER OF FINAL JUDGMENT AND DISMISSAL as to Bank of America Corporation and Banc of Amercia Securities LLC and Bar Order.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 04/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 4/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 97 Amended Complaint by Jeffrey K Skilling, filed.(Barrett, Shannon) (Entered: 04/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 4/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Jill Agro to Appear Pro Hac Vice by State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, Cincinnati Retirement System, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, Public Employees' Retirement System of Ohio, Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/2/2007. (Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 04/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 4/10/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 293 Defendant Michael Krautz's Amended Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Michael Krautz shall respond to 97 Amended Complaint by 04/20/07. Plaintiff's response shall be filed no later than 06/29/97 and Defendant Krautz's reply by 07/20/07.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 04/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 4/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for James M. Keneally to Appear Pro Hac Vice by James A Brown, filed.Motion Docket Date 4/30/2007. (dpower, ) (Entered: 04/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 4/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Supplement to 235 MOTION to Stay by Daniel Bayly, Robert S Furst, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Scaff, Peter) Modified on 4/9/2007 (htippen, ). Modified on 4/17/2007 - linked to #235 (ltien, ). (Entered: 04/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Complaints by Richard A Causey, filed.Motion Docket Date 4/25/2007. (Mace, C. Robert) (Entered: 04/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE Regarding Pending Motions in Enron Tagalong and Coordinated Cases by State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, Cincinnati Retirement System, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, Public Employees' Retirement System of Ohio, Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Certification)(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 04/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 3/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Rescheduling of Status Conference re: 235 Unopposed MOTION to Stay by Daniel Bayly, Robert S Furst, filed. (Scaff, Peter) (Entered: 03/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 3/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amended MOTION for Extension of Time To File a Response to Amended Complaint by Michael Krautz, filed.Motion Docket Date 4/17/2007. (Pollack, Barry) (Entered: 03/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss /Motion for Entry of Stipulation and Order of Dismissal with Prejudice of Bank of America Corporation and Banc of America Securities LLC and Bar Order by Public Employees Retirement System Board, State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, Public Employees' Retirement System of Ohio, Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System, filed.Motion Docket Date 4/16/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice# 2 Proposed Order # 3 Certificate of Service)(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 03/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY in Support of 186 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint and Conditional Motion To Reopen Discovery, filed by Outside Directors Enron. (Ross, Brian) (Entered: 03/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 3/21/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting Nancy I Ruskin's 287 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Goldman, Sachs & Co.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 03/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 3/21/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 288 Motion to Set Briefing Schedule Plaintiffs and Deft Mark E. Koenig. ( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 03/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Set Briefing Schedule Between Plaintiffs and Defendant Koenig (Instr. No. 97) by Mark E Koenig, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/9/2007. (Inglima, Philip) (Entered: 03/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Nancy I. Ruskin to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Goldman Sachs & Co, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/9/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(King, Charles) (Entered: 03/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER OF FINAL JUDGMENT AND DISMISSAL AS TO VINSON & ELKINS LLP, Vinson & Elkins LLP terminated.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 03/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 3/14/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION and ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting 284 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Motion for Entry of Stipulation and Order of Dismissal with Prejudice of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc and Lehman Brothers Inc, Lehman Brothers Inc; Kenneth L Lay and Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc terminated.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(chorace, ) (Entered: 03/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 3/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Motion for Entry of Stipulation and Order of Dismissal with Prejudice of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc and Lehman Brothers Inc by Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc, State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, Cincinnati Retirement System, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, Lehman Brothers Inc, Public Employees' Retirement System of Ohio, Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/3/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Certificate of Service)(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 03/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM of Law In Support of 282 Motion of Defendant Joseph F. Berardino To Dismiss 97 The Amended Complaint (PERS of Ohio Docket #97) by Joseph F Berardino, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Exhibit A; Affidavit of Joseph F. Berardino)(Shepherd, George) Modified on 3/13/2007 (htippen, ). Modified on 3/20/2007 - linked to #282 (ltien, ). (Entered: 03/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss 97 The Amended Complaint [PERS of Ohio Docket No. 97] by Joseph F Berardino, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/2/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting The Motion Of Defendant Joseph F. Berardino To Dismiss The Amended Complaint [PERS of Ohio Docket No. 97])(Shepherd, George) Modified on 3/13/2007 (htippen, ). (Entered: 03/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., and Memorandum of Law in Support of David B. Duncan's Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint (PERS of Ohio Docket #97). by David Duncan, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/26/2007. (dpower, ) (Entered: 03/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 271 Agreed Motion To Set Schedule Regarding 97 Defendant Ken L. Harrison's Response to Amended Complaint. Harrison's response is due on 03/30/07. Pltf's oppositions due on 06/08/07. Harrison's reply due on 06/29/07. This order is without prejudice to Harrison's rights to raise or assert and jurisdictional, substantive, or other issue in response to the Amended Complaint that he could have raised or assorted prior to filing this motion.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 03/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 278 Defendants mcMahon, Whalley and Buy's Unopposed Motion to Modify Response and Briefing Schedule. Response to Amended Complaint will be due 04/09/07; Pltf's opposition, if necessary will be due by 06/11/07 and reply (ies) by 07/11/07. ( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 03/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 3/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Response and Briefing Schedule by Richard B Buy, Jeffery McMahon, Lawrence G Whaley, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/26/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kirkendall, Thomas) (Entered: 03/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss by Thomas H Bauer, Michael L Bennett, Debra A Cash, D Stephen Goddard, Jr, Gary B Goolsby, Michael D Jones, Michael M Lowther, Benjamin Neuhausen, Michael C Odom, Rick Petersen, John E Stewart, William E Swanson, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/22/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting The Andersen Individual Defendants Motion To Dismiss The Amended Complaint [PERS of Ohio Docket No. 97])(Shepherd, George) (Entered: 03/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM of Law In Support of The Arthur Andersen LLP Individual Defendants 277 Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint [PERS of Ohio Docket # 97] by Thomas H Bauer, Michael L Bennett, Debra A Cash, D Stephen Goddard, Jr, Gary B Goolsby, Michael D Jones, Michael M Lowther, Benjamin Neuhausen, Michael C Odom, Rick Petersen, John E Stewart, William E Swanson, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Part 1 of 2# 2 Exhibit Part 2 of 2)(Shepherd, George) Modified on 3/7/2007 - linked to #277 (ltien, ). (Entered: 03/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED ORDER Granting Defendant Arthur Andersen LLPs 274 Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint [PERS of Ohio Docket No. 97], filed.(Shepherd, George) Modified on 3/7/2007 - linked to #274 (ltien, ). (Entered: 03/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Arthur Andersen LLP's Motion to Dismiss The Amended Complaint [PERS of Ohio Docket No. 97] by Arthur Andersen LLP, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/22/2007. (Shepherd, George) (Entered: 03/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant Arthur Andersen LLPs 274 Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint [PERS of Ohio Docket #97] by Arthur Andersen LLP, filed.(Shepherd, George) Modified on 3/7/2007 - linked to #274 (ltien, ). (Entered: 03/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 3/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROPOSED ORDER re: 271 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Amended Complaint, filed.(Wright, Zachary) (Entered: 03/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 3/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Amended Complaint by Ken L Harrison, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/21/2007. (Wright, Zachary) (Entered: 03/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER that defendants shall file an additional supplement within three days after the March 29, 2007 status conference before Judge Ewing Werlein to update this court whether ther will be retrial under a superseding indictment or other disposition of the case 263 Motion to Stay pending criminal proceedings.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(chorace, ) (Entered: 03/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 2/27/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 255 Agreed Motion to Set Briefing Schedule Between Plaintiffs and Defendant Wesley Colwell.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 02/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 2/27/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FINAL JUDGMENT as to Vinson & Elkins LLP; granting 262 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice Claims Against Vinson & Elkins L.L.P. and For Entry of Dismissal and Bar Order and Final Judgment Entry as to Vinson & Elkins L.L.P..( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 02/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 257 Unopposed Certain Officer Defendants Motion to Modify Response and Briefing Schedule. Responses due by 3/30/2007. Replies due by 6/29/2007.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(chorace, ) (Entered: 02/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 259 MOTION to Amend 256 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To File A Response To Amended Complaint (Instrument No. 97) Responses due by 3/30/2007. Replies due by 6/30/2007. Plaintiff's response shall be filed no later than 06/08/07.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(chorace, ) (Entered: 02/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 261 Motion to Withdraw; withdrawing 256 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To File A Response To Amended Complaint (Instrument No. 97).( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(dhansen, ) (Entered: 02/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition to 186 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint and Conditional Motion To Reopen Discovery, filed by State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, Cincinnati Retirement System, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, Public Employees' Retirement System of Ohio, Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Certificate of Service)(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 02/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Supplement to 235 Unopposed Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Criminal Proceedings by Daniel Bayly, Robert S Furst, filed. (Scaff, Peter) Modified on 3/1/2007 - linked to #235 (ltien, ). (Entered: 02/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Agreed MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice Claims Against Vinson & Elkins L.L.P. and For Entry of Dismissal and Bar Order and Final Judgment Entry as to Vinson & Elkins L.L.P. by Vinson & Elkins LLP, State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, Cincinnati Retirement System, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, Public Employees' Retirement System of Ohio, Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/14/2007. (Johnston, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Withdraw 256 MOTION and MOTION for Leave to File Amended Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time To File A Response To Amended Complaint (Instrument No. 97) by Michael Krautz, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/14/2007. (Pollack, Barry) Additional motion relief added on 2/27/2007 (ltien, ). (Entered: 02/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This is a duplicate of 259 . Amended UNOPPOSED MOTION for EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A Reponse to the Amended Complaint by Michael Krautz, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/14/2007. (Pollack, Barry) Modified on 2/22/2007 (kettac, ). Modified on 2/27/2007 (ltien, ). (Entered: 02/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amended Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To File A Response To Amended Complaint (Instrument No. 97) by Michael Krautz, filed (amending 256 motion). Motion Docket Date 3/14/2007. (Pollack, Barry) Modified on 2/27/2007 (ltien, ). (Entered: 02/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 254 Agreed Motion To Set Schedule Between Pltfs and Vinson & Elkins 97 . V&E to answer date extended to 04/05/07; Pltf's oppostion due by 05/04/07; Reply due 05/22/07. Pltfs and V&E may seek further modifications of the schedule as necessary.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 02/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Modify Response and Briefing Schedule by Mark A Frevert, Steven J Kean, Cindy K Olson, Lou L Pai, Kenneth D Rice, Joseph W Sutton, Paula Rieker, Estate of J Clifford Baxter, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/13/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Certain Officer Defendants' Motion to Modify Response and Briefing Schedule)(Wilson, Jessica) (Entered: 02/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To File A Response To Amended Complaint (Instrument No. 97) by Michael Krautz, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/13/2007. (Pollack, Barry) (Entered: 02/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Motion to Set Briefing Schedule Between Plaintiffs and Defendant Wesley Colwell by Wesley Colwell, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/13/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 02/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time / Setting a Schedule for Responding to the Amended Complaint (Docket No. 97) by Vinson & Elkins LLP, State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, Cincinnati Retirement System, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, Public Employees' Retirement System of Ohio, Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/12/2007. (Johnston, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Set Briefing Schedule Between Plaintiffs and Defendant Wesley Colwell by Wesley Colwell, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/8/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 02/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 250 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time To Set Briefing Schedule Between Plaintiffs and Defendant Mark E. Koenig (Instr. No. 97) Amended Complaint due by 3/20/2007. Mr. Koenig's Repy is due by 6/25/2007. Plaintiff's Opposition to the response of Mr. Koenig is due on May 23, 2007.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(chorace, ) (Entered: 02/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 239 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Scheduling Between Plaintiff's and Daniel Bayly and Robert Furst.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(chorace, ) (Entered: 02/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time To Set Briefing Schedule Between Plaintiffs and Defendant Mark E. Koenig by Mark E Koenig, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/5/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order to Agreed Motion to Set Briefing Schedule Between Plaintiffs and Defendant Mark E. Koenig)(Murphy, Justin) (Entered: 02/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 243 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Debra A. Karlstein.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(chorace, ) (Entered: 02/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 242 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David Spears.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(chorace, ) (Entered: 02/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 241 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher W. Dysard.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(chorace, ) (Entered: 02/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,, by William Fuhs, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/5/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plf's Amended Complaint# 2 Declaration of Christopher Dysard in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plf's Amended Complaint# 3 Exhibit 1# 4 Exhibit 2)(Cohoon, James) (Entered: 02/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM In Support of Defendant Thomas Davis Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint re: 244 MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,, by Thomas Davis, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Fitzpatrick, Thomas) (Entered: 02/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint and MOTION to Strike by Thomas Davis, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/5/2007. (Fitzpatrick, Thomas) Additional motion relief added on 2/20/2007 (ltien, ). (Entered: 02/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Debra A. Karlstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice by William Fuhs, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/5/2007. (Cohoon, James) (Entered: 02/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for David Spears to Appear Pro Hac Vice by William Fuhs, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/5/2007. (Cohoon, James) (Entered: 02/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Christopher W. Dysard to Appear Pro Hac Vice by William Fuhs, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/5/2007. (Cohoon, James) (Entered: 02/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,, and Motion to Strike 97 by Schuyler M Tilney, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/5/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support# 2 Exhibit A to Memorandum# 3 Exhibit B to Memorandum# 4 Proposed Order)(Trout, Robert) (Entered: 02/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Briefing Schedule by Daniel Bayly, Robert S Furst, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/1/2007. (Attachments: # 1)(Scaff, Peter) (Entered: 02/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Thomas Fitzpatrick to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas Davis, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/1/2007. (Fitzpatrick, Thomas) (Entered: 02/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 2/8/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Defendants Bayly and Furst shall file a supplement to 235 Unopposed Joint Motion to Stay Pending Criminal Proceedings within seven days after the 02/16/07 status conference before Judge Ewing Werlein.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 02/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 2/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter from Matthew Fishbein re: removed from noticing list, filed. (sbyrum, ) (Entered: 02/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 2/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Stay by Daniel Bayly, Robert S Furst, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/27/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Scaff, Peter) (Entered: 02/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 230 Unopposed MOTION to Modify Response and Briefing Schedule. Responses due by 2/28/2007 Replies due by 6/19/2007, the Plaintiffs' Opposition to the Estate's response to the Amended Complaint will be due May 21, 2007.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(chorace, ) (Entered: 02/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to William Fuhs served on 12/11/2006, answer due 12/31/2006, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 02/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting Citigroup Inc's Unopposed Motion for Confidential Treatment of Certain Deposition of Susan D Abbott 158 Motion for Confidential Treatment.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(sbyrum, ) (Entered: 02/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Granting Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaints.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(mmar, ) (Entered: 02/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Modify Response and Briefing Schedule by Estate of J Clifford Baxter, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/21/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Estate of J. Clifford Baxter's Motion to Modify Response and Briefing Schedule)(Wilson, Jessica) (Entered: 02/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM In Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint re: 221 Joint MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,,Joint MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,, by Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc, Barclays PLC, filed.(Abrams, Barry) (Entered: 01/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM In Support re: 226 MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,, MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,, by Toronto Dominion Bank, filed.(Doyle, James) (Entered: 01/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,, by Royal Bank Of Canada, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/20/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Stuart, Claude) (Entered: 01/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,, by Toronto Dominion Bank, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/20/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Toronto Dominion Bank's Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint of Plaintiffs Ohio Retirement Systems)(Doyle, James) (Entered: 01/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re: 221 Joint MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,,Joint MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,, by Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas f/k/a Bankers Trust Company, filed.(Byrne, Lawrence) (Entered: 01/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM of Law In Support of Merrill Lynch's Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint re: 221 Joint MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,,Joint MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,, by Merrill Lynch & Co Inc, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., filed.(Beck, David) (Entered: 01/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,, by National Westminister plc, The Royal Bank of Scotland plc, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/20/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix of Unreported Cases Cited in Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint and Supporting Memorandum# 2 Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Charles) (Entered: 01/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Financial Institution Defendants' MEMORANDUM of Law In Support of Their Joint Motion to Dismiss on behalf of Financial Institution Defendants re: 221 Joint MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,,Joint MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,, by Merrill Lynch & Co Inc, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., filed.(Beck, David) Modified on 2/8/2007 (ltien, ). (Entered: 01/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,, by Merrill Lynch & Co Inc, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/20/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Financial Institution Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint)(Beck, David) (Entered: 01/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM In Support re: 218 MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,, Amended Complaint MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,, Amended Complaint by Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation, Credit Suisse First Boston USA Inc, Pershing LLC, filed.(Volker, Odean) (Entered: 01/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION with MEMORANDUM in Support to Dismiss the Amended Complaint's Section 10(B) and 20(A) Claims Against Lehman (Dkt. No. 97) by Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc, Lehman Brothers Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/20/2007. (Bays, David) Motion created on 2/8/2007 (ltien, ). (Entered: 01/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss 97 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,,,,,, Amended Complaint by Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation, Credit Suisse First Boston USA Inc, Pershing LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/20/2007. (Volker, Odean) (Entered: 01/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re: 216 MOTION to Dismiss 55 Memorandum, 56 Declaration,, Amended Complaint by Goldman Sachs & Co, filed.(King, Charles) (Entered: 01/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss 55 Memorandum, 56 Declaration,, Amended Complaint by Goldman Sachs & Co, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/20/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(King, Charles) (Entered: 01/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 1/29/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 203 Defendant Joseph W. Sutton's Unopposed Motion To Modify Response and Briefing Schedule. Deft's response to Pltfs' Amended complaint is due 02/28/07; Pltf's opposition to that response due by 05/21/07, and reply by 06/19/07.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 01/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER of FINAL JUDGMENMT ENTRY as to, Citigroup Inc; Daniel Ferguson; Daniel Ferguson; Daniel Ferguson; J P Morgan Chase & Co; J.P. Morgan Chase Bank f/k/a Chase Manhattan Bank; J.P. Morgan Securities Inc. f/k/a Chase Securities, Inc.; Ian Schottlaender; Ian Schottlaender; Mark Wolf; Mark Wolf; CitiBank N A and Citigroup Global Markets, Inc. terminated.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(chorace, ) (Entered: 01/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Thomas Davis served on 12/5/2006, answer due 12/25/2006, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 01/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Wesley Colwell served on 12/13/2006, answer due 1/2/2007, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 01/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Richard A Causey served on 12/6/2006, answer due 12/26/2006, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 01/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Carol L Whalen as the Personal Representative of the Estate of J. Clifford Baxter served on 12/14/2006, answer due 1/3/2007, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 01/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Dan Boyle served on 12/6/2006, answer due 12/26/2006, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 01/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Daniel Bayly served on 12/11/2006, answer due 12/31/2006, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 01/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Ken L Harrison served on 12/14/2006, answer due 1/3/2007, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 01/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Dan Boyle, filed.(kcarr, ) (Entered: 01/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 200 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time for Ken L. Harrison to Respond to Amended Complaint. Responses due by 2/28/2007 Replies due by 6/19/2007. Plaintiff's oppositions to the response of Harrison are due on May 21, 2007.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(chorace, ) (Entered: 01/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROPOSED ORDER re: 203 Unopposed MOTION Defendant Joseph W. Sutton's Unopposed Motion to Modify Response and Briefing Schedule, filed.(O'Neill, Edward John) (Entered: 01/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION Defendant Joseph W. Sutton's Unopposed Motion to Modify Response and Briefing Schedule by Joseph W Sutton, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/13/2007. (O'Neill, Edward John) (Entered: 01/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 189 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaints. Responses due by 4/11/2007.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(chorace, ) (Entered: 01/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 1/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED ORDER re: 200 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Response to Amended Complaint, filed.(Wright, Zachary) (Entered: 01/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 1/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Response to Amended Complaint by Ken L Harrison, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/12/2007. (Wright, Zachary) (Entered: 01/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 171 Motion for Confidential Treatment.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 01/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 1/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas A. Hagemann, Marla Poirot and Peter Scaff on behalf of Daniel Bayly, filed. (Scaff, Peter) (Entered: 01/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER OF FINAL JUDGMENT AND DISMISSAL RE: 174 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice Claims Against the JPMorgan Chase, Citigroup and CIBC Parties, and Daniel Ferguson, Ian Schottlaender and Mark Wolf.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 01/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 190 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint by Sheila Kahanek. Plaintiff's opposition to response due by 04/23/07. Responses due by 2/20/2007 Replies due by 5/23/2007.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(chorace, ) (Entered: 01/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 188 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time For Plaintiffs to Respond to Motion to Dismiss Filed by Certain Outside Directors Responses due by 2/23/2007.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(chorace, ) (Entered: 01/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 187 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Amended Complaint.Plaintiff's opposition due by 04/23/07. Responses due by 2/20/2007 Replies due by 5/23/2007.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(chorace, ) (Entered: 01/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 185 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time To Set Briefing Schedule Between Plaintiffs and Defendant Mark E. Koenig Responses due by 2/20/2007 Replies due by 5/23/2007, Objections due by 04/23/07.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(chorace, ) (Entered: 01/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 183 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Responsive pleading Responses due by 2/12/2007 Replies due by 5/16/2007, Opposition due by 04/16/07.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(chorace, ) (Entered: 01/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Stay Obligations to File Responsive Pleadings and Answer Discovery by F Scott Yeager, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/7/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Proposed Order) This document was originally filed electronically at CA H-01-3624 inst #5325.(ltien, ) (Entered: 01/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 1/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint by Sheila Kahanek by State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, Cincinnati Retirement System, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, Public Employees' Retirement System of Ohio, Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/5/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 01/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Complaint by Richard A Causey, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/31/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mace, Carl) (Entered: 01/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 1/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time For Plaintiffs to Respond to Motion to Dismiss Filed by Certain Outside Directors by State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, Cincinnati Retirement System, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, Public Employees' Retirement System of Ohio, Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/29/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 01/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Amended Complaint by Wesley Colwell, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/29/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 01/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint and Conditional Motion To Reopen Discovery by Outside Directors Enron, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/29/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Proposed Order)(Ross, Brian) (Entered: 01/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time To Set Briefing Schedule Between Plaintiffs and Defendant Mark E. Koenig by Mark E Koenig, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/29/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Inglima, Philip) (Entered: 01/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Linda Lay, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Kenneth L. Lay, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Court 01e)(Gibson, George) (Entered: 01/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Responsive pleading by Daniel Bayly, James A Brown, Thomas Davis, William Fuhs, Robert S Furst, Schuyler M Tilney, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/25/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Trout, Robert) (Entered: 01/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 170 Certain Officer Defendants' Motion to Modify Response and Briefing Schedule.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 01/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 1/4/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 178 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Amended Complaint and to Set Briefing Schedule Responses due by 3/2/2007 Replies due by 6/15/2007.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(chorace, ) (Entered: 01/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 1/4/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 177 Agreed MOTION to Modify Briefing Schedule Between Plaintiffs and Financial Institution Defendants Responses due by 1/31/2007 Replies due by 5/2/2007.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(chorace, ) (Entered: 01/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 1/4/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER on Agreed Motion to Set Briefing Schedule between Plaintiff's and Vinson and Elkins LLP 173 . Response deadline is February 22, 2007. Reply Brief due on April 10, 2007.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(chorace, ) (Entered: 01/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Amended Complaint and to Set Briefing Schedule by Arthur Andersen LLP, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/23/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Shepherd, George) (Entered: 01/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Agreed MOTION to Modify Briefing Schedule Between Plaintiffs and Financial Institution Defendants by Merrill Lynch & Co Inc, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 1/23/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Beck, David) (Entered: 01/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Paul E. Coggins, Beth G. Jaynes, Katherine R.Hendler on behalf of Robert S Furst, filed. (Coggins, Paul) (Entered: 01/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 12/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Dan Boyle, filed.(sguevara, ) (Entered: 12/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 12/26/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Agreed MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice Claims Against the JPMorgan Chase, Citigroup and CIBC Parties, and Daniel Ferguson, Ian Schottlaender and Mark Wolf, and for Entry of Dismissal and Bar Order and Final Judgment Entry as to JPMorgan Chase, Citigroup and CIBC Parties and Daniel Ferguson, Ian Schottlaender and Mark Wolf by State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, Cincinnati Retirement System, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, Public Employees' Retirement System of Ohio, Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/16/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Certificate of Service)(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 12/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time / Setting a Schedule for Responding to the Amended Complaint (Docket No. 97) by Vinson & Elkins LLP, State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, Cincinnati Retirement System, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, Public Employees' Retirement System of Ohio, Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/11/2007. (Johnston, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROPOSED ORDER re: 171 MOTION for Confidential Treatment of Certain Deposition Testimony of Peter Tufano, filed.(Bowen, James) (Entered: 12/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Confidential Treatment of Certain Deposition Testimony of Peter Tufano by J P Morgan Chase & Co, J.P. Morgan Chase Bank f/k/a Chase Manhattan Bank, J.P. Morgan Securities Inc. f/k/a Chase Securities, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 1/9/2007. (Bowen, James) (Entered: 12/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Modify by Mark A Frevert, Steven J Kean, Cindy K Olson, Lou L Pai, Kenneth D Rice, Paula Rieker, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/8/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order to Certain Officer Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Modify Response and Briefing Schedule)(Wilson, Jessica) (Entered: 12/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 12/12/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OPINION AND ORDER Denying Richard Causey's 130 MOTION to Stay Obligation to Respond to "opt-out" complaints during pendency of criminal proceedings.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 12/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Jeffrey K Skilling served on 11/22/2006, answer due 1/22/2007, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 12/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 12/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Joseph F Berardino served on 12/11/2006, answer due 2/9/2007, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 12/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 12/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Kevin Howard served on 12/11/2006, answer due 2/9/2007, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 12/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to F Scott Yeager served on 12/7/2006, answer due 2/5/2007, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 12/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Linda Lay, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Kenneth L. Lay served on 12/11/2006, answer due 2/9/2007, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 12/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Joseph W Sutton served on 12/6/2006, answer due 2/5/2007, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 12/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Kevin P Hannon served on 12/11/2006, answer due 2/9/2007, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 12/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OPINION AND ORDER DENYING Ohio Retirement Systems, Cincinnati and OTTA motions 86 Motion to Strike; GRANTING in part but denied as to the time-barred Plaintiffs' 54 Motion for Leave to Amend and GRANTING OTTA and Cincinnati's 54 Motion to Join; Responsive pleadings to the amended complaint shall be filed within 30 days of entry of this order. Pltfs' responses to any motions to dismiss shall be filed within 30 days of Defts' filings. Defts replies may file within 30 days of Pltfs' filings.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 12/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Schuyler M Tilney served on 12/6/2006, answer due 2/5/2007, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 12/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 12/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Stanley C Horton served on 12/7/2006, answer due 2/5/2007, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 12/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Confidential Treatment of Certain Deposition Testimony of Susan D Abbott by Citigroup Inc, CitiBank N A, Salomon Smith Barney, Inc. n/k/a Citigroup Global Markets Inc, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 12/26/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jason C. Rubenstein with Exhibits A and B# 2 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Confidential Treatment)(Scott, Jacalyn) (Entered: 12/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 12/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address by Lawrence Byrne, Lance Croffoot-Suede, Ruth E. Harlow, Joseph B. Schmit (Linklaters, counsel for Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas f/k/a Bankers Trust Company, filed. (Byrne, Lawrence) (Entered: 12/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 11/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney John Wolcott Zeiger re: 151 Order on Motion to Modify , filed. (ejuarez, ) (Entered: 11/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Richard B Buy served on 11/21/2006, answer due 1/22/2007, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 11/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Lawrence G Whaley served on 11/6/2006, answer due 1/5/2007, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 11/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Jeffery McMahon served on 11/6/2006, answer due 1/5/2007, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 11/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying 106 Motion to Stay .( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(ltien, ) (Entered: 11/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 149 Motion to Modify Response and Briefing Schedule .( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(ledwards, ) (Entered: 11/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 11/9/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying 143 Motion to Set Briefing Schedule and 148 Motion to Modify Response and Briefing Schedule. The date for all parties in this action to respond to the Proposed Amended Complaint is STAYED until the Court rules on the earlier motions.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 11/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 11/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Agreed MOTION to Modify Briefing Schedule Between Plaintiffs and Lou L. Pai by Lou L Pai, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/28/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Jeffrey, Deborah) (Entered: 11/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 11/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Modify Response and Briefing Schedule by Mark A Frevert, Steven J Kean, Cindy K Olson, Kenneth D Rice, Paula Rieker, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/27/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Certain Officer Defendants' Motion to Modify Response and Briefing Schedule)(Wilson, Jessica) (Entered: 11/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, Attorney George W Billy Shepherd, III for Arthur Andersen LLP and Thomas H Bauer added .( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(sbyrum, ) (Entered: 11/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 141 Motion .( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(mmar, ) (Entered: 11/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 11/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Michael J Kopper served on 11/6/2006, answer due 1/5/2007, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 11/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Rex T Shelby served on 11/6/2006, answer due 1/5/2007, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 11/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 11/3/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time for Briefing Schedule for Responses to Amended Complaint by Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation, Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc, Merrill Lynch & Co Inc, Public Employees Retirement System Board, State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, Cincinnati Retirement System, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, Banc of America Securities LLC, Bank of America Corp, Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc, Barclays PLC, Credit Suisse First Boston USA Inc, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas f/k/a Bankers Trust Company, Goldman Sachs & Co, Lehman Brothers Inc, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., National Westminister plc, Pershing LLC, Royal Bank Of Canada, The Royal Bank of Scotland plc, Toronto Dominion Bank, Public Employees' Retirement System of Ohio, Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/24/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Beck, David) (Entered: 11/03/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION re: to Extend Date to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Amended Complaint by Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Citigroup Inc, J P Morgan Chase & Co, Public Employees Retirement System Board, State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, Cincinnati Retirement System, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce World Markets Corp., Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce World Markets PLC, Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce, CitiBank N A, J.P. Morgan Chase Bank f/k/a Chase Manhattan Bank, J.P. Morgan Securities Inc. f/k/a Chase Securities, Inc., Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System, filed.(Verma, Neeraj) (Entered: 10/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Extend Briefing Deadlines Between Plaintiffs and Certain Outside Directors by Outside Directors Enron, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/13/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ross, Brian) (Entered: 10/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting Hirko's 112 Motion to Stay Obligation to Respond to Opt-Out Complaints until either his acquittal or his sentencing in CR 03-93 .( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(psmith, ) Modified on 10/19/2006 - linked to #112 (ltien, ). (Entered: 10/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 138 Motion to Set Briefing Schedule between Plaintiffs and James Brown.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 10/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 10/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Agreed MOTION Motion to Set Briefing Schedule Between Plaintiffs and James Brown by State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, Cincinnati Retirement System, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, Public Employees' Retirement System of Ohio, Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/26/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A# 2 Waiver of Service)(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 10/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 10/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to James A Brown served on 9/29/2006, answer due 11/28/2006, filed.(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 10/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 125 Motion to Set Briefing Schedule between Plaintiffs and Deft David Duncan. Duncan's response to Amended Complaint is due on 11/29/06; Pltf's Opposition to Duncan's response is due 01/29/07; Duncan's reply is due 02/28/07.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 10/04/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This is a duplicate of 134 . WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David B Duncan Instrument #97, filed.(ejuarez, ) Modified on 10/5/2006 (ltien, ). (Entered: 10/04/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Duncan (Instrument #97), filed.(hler, ) Modified on 10/5/2006 (ltien, ). (Entered: 10/03/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 10/3/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Non Opposition to Defendant Kenneth Rice's Motion to Stay Obligation to Respond to Opt Out Complaints During Pendency of Criminal Proceedings (docket number 106) re: 106 MOTION to Stay by Kenneth D Rice, filed. (Wilson, Jessica) (Entered: 10/03/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Joseph M Hirko served on 9/29/2006, answer due 11/28/2006, filed.(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 09/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 122 Motion to Set Briefing Schedule between Plaintiffs and Certain of the Andersen-Related Parties.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 09/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Stay Obligation to Respond to "Opt-Out" Complaints during Pendency of Criminal Proceedings by Richard A Causey, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/18/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(ledwards, ) (Entered: 09/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 110 Motion to Set Briefing Schedule between Plaintiffs and Vinson & Elkins LLP.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 09/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 104 Motion to Set Briefing Schedule between Plaintiffs and Lou I. Pai.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 09/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 109 Motion to Set Briefing Schedule Between Plaintiffs and Defendant Arthur Andersen LLP.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 09/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 119 Motion to Set Briefing Schedule between Plaintiffs and Mark E. Koenig.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 09/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Agreed MOTION To Set Briefing Schedule Between Plaintiffs and David B. Duncan by State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, Cincinnati Retirement System, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, Public Employees' Retirement System of Ohio, Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/18/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A# 2 Waiver of Service)(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 09/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Duncan, filed.(swhite) (Entered: 09/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Thomas H Bauer served on 9/25/2006, answer due 11/24/2006; Michael L Bennett served on 9/25/2006, answer due 11/24/2006; Debra A Cash served on 9/25/2006, answer due 11/24/2006; D Stephen Goddard, Jr served on 9/25/2006, answer due 11/24/2006; Gary B Goolsby served on 9/25/2006, answer due 11/24/2006; Michael D Jones served on 9/25/2006, answer due 11/24/2006; Michael M Lowther served on 9/25/2006, answer due 11/24/2006; Benjamin Neuhausen served on 9/25/2006, answer due 11/24/2006; Michael C Odom served on 9/25/2006, answer due 11/24/2006; Rick Petersen served on 9/25/2006, answer due 11/24/2006; John E Stewart served on 9/25/2006, answer due 11/24/2006; William E Swanson served on 9/25/2006, answer due 11/24/2006, filed.(mmar, ) (Entered: 09/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Agreed MOTION to Set Briefing Schedule Between Plaintiffs and Certain of the Andersen-Related Parties by all plaintiffs, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/16/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(sbyrum, ) (Entered: 09/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 9/22/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting the 116 Motion for David E Sellinger to Appear Pro Hac Vice as attorney for The Public Employees' Retirement System of Ohio, the State Teachers' Retirement System of Ohio, et al .( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(psmith, ) (Entered: 09/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 9/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Michael Krautz served on 9/22/2006, answer due 11/21/2006, filed.(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 09/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION Agreed Motion to Set Briefing Schedule Between Plaintiffs and Mark E. Koenig [Instrument No. 97] by State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, Cincinnati Retirement System, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, Public Employees' Retirement System of Ohio, Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/10/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhbit A# 2 Waiver of Service)(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 09/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Mark E Koenig served on 9/20/2006, answer due 11/20/2006, filed.(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 09/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Mark A Frevert served on 9/20/2006, answer due 11/20/2006; Steven J Kean served on 9/20/2006, answer due 11/20/2006; Cindy K Olson served on 9/20/2006, answer due 11/20/2006; Kenneth D Rice served on 9/20/2006, answer due 11/20/2006; Paula Rieker served on 9/20/2006, answer due 11/20/2006, filed.(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 09/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for David E. Sellinger to Appear Pro Hac Vice by State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, Cincinnati Retirement System, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, Public Employees' Retirement System of Ohio, Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/10/2006. (Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 09/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 9/19/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINDER in 95 MOTION to Strike The Ohio Retirement Systems' Motion to Strike JP Morgan Chase & Co.'s August 1, 2006 "Notice of Cross Designation of Expert Witnesses" as Untimely The Ohio Retirement Systems' Joinder in the American National Insurance Company, et al.'s and Ravenswood Capital-1, LLC et al.'s Reply to JPMC's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike JPMC's "Notice of Cross Designation of Expert Witnesses" Dated August 1, 2006 [Instrument No. 4912 and 4914 in CA H-01-3624 and 95 in CA H-02-4788], filed by State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, Cincinnati Retirement System, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, Public Employees' Retirement System of Ohio, Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System. (Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 09/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER ON AGREED MOTION TO SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE BETWEEN PLAINTIFFS AND CERTAIN FINANCIAL INSTITUTIONS 97 granting 101 Motion Agreed.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 09/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED ORDER re: 112 MOTION to Stay, filed.(Ellis, Barnes) (Entered: 09/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Stay by Joseph M Hirko, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/10/2006. (Ellis, Barnes) (Entered: 09/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 9/16/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER striking Ohio Retirement Systems' 100 Joinder. Pleading does not comply with Order #4018 CA H 01-3624. ( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 09/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Set Aside Briefing Schedule Between Plaintiffs and Vinson & Elkins LLP by Vinson & Elkins LLP, State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, Cincinnati Retirement System, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, Public Employees' Retirement System of Ohio, Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/5/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(ypippin, ) (Entered: 09/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Agreed MOTION to Set Briefing Schedule Between Plantiffs and Defendants Arthur Anderson LLP 97 by all plaintiffs, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/5/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(mmar, ) (Entered: 09/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Outside Directors Enron served on 9/2/2006, answer due 11/1/2006, filed.(Ross, Brian) (Entered: 09/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Set Briefing Schedule Between Plaintiffs and Certain Outside Directors by Outside Directors Enron, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/4/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ross, Brian) (Entered: 09/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Stay by Kenneth D Rice, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/4/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wilson, Jessica) (Entered: 09/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of 103 Waiver of Service Executed by State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, Cincinnati Retirement System, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, Public Employees' Retirement System of Ohio, Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System, filed.(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 09/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Agreed MOTION To Set Briefing Schedule Between Plaintiffs and Lou L. Pai by State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, Cincinnati Retirement System, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, Public Employees' Retirement System of Ohio, Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/4/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhbit A Proposed Order# 2 Waiver of Service# 3 Certificate of Service)(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 09/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Lou L Pai served on 9/12/2006, answer due 11/13/2006, filed.(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 09/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Banc of America Securities LLC served on 9/7/2006, answer due 11/6/2006; Bank of America Corp served on 9/7/2006, answer due 11/6/2006; Barclays Bank PLC served on 9/7/2006, answer due 11/6/2006; Barclays Capital Inc served on 9/7/2006, answer due 11/6/2006; Barclays PLC served on 9/7/2006, answer due 11/6/2006; Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce World Markets Corp. served on 9/7/2006, answer due 11/6/2006; Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce World Markets PLC served on 9/7/2006, answer due 11/6/2006; Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce served on 9/7/2006, answer due 11/6/2006; Deutsche Bank AG served on 9/7/2006, answer due 11/6/2006; Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc. served on 9/7/2006, answer due 11/6/2006; Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas f/k/a Bankers Trust Company served on 9/7/2006, answer due 11/6/2006; Goldman Sachs & Co served on 9/7/2006, answer due 11/6/2006; National Westminister plc served on 9/7/2006, answer due 11/6/2006; Royal Bank Of Canada served on 9/7/2006, answer due 11/6/2006; The Royal Bank of Scotland plc served on 9/7/2006, answer due 11/6/2006; Toronto Dominion Bank served on 9/7/2006, answer due 11/6/2006, filed.(Kennedy, Charles) (Entered: 09/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Agreed MOTION To Set Briefing Schedule Between Plaintiffs And Certain Financial Institutions by Citigroup Inc, Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation, J P Morgan Chase & Co, Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc, Merrill Lynch & Co Inc, Public Employees Retirement System Board, State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, Cincinnati Retirement System, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, Banc of America Securities LLC, Bank of America Corp, Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc, Barclays PLC, Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce World Markets Corp., Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce World Markets PLC, Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce, CitiBank N A, Credit Suisse First Boston USA Inc, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas f/k/a Bankers Trust Company, Goldman Sachs & Co, J.P. Morgan Chase Bank f/k/a Chase Manhattan Bank, J.P. Morgan Securities Inc. f/k/a Chase Securities, Inc., Lehman Brothers Inc, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., National Westminister plc, Pershing LLC, Salomon Smith Barney, Inc. n/k/a Citigroup Global Markets Inc, Royal Bank Of Canada, The Royal Bank of Scotland plc, Toronto Dominion Bank, Public Employees' Retirement System of Ohio, Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/2/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Charles) (Entered: 09/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 8/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    The Ohio Retirement Systems' Joinder in the American National Insurance Company, et al.'s and Ravenswood Capital-1, LLC, et al.'s Reply to JPMC's Opposition to Plaintiffs' 95 Motion to Strike JPMC's Notice of Cross Designation of Expert Witnesses dated August 1, 2006, filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Ohio, State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System. (Liebesman, Sidney) Modified on 9/1/2006 - linked to #95 (ltien, ). (Entered: 08/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/23/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Service to Opposition of JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and J.P. Morgan Securities Inc. to the American National, Ravenswood and Ohio Plaintiffs' Motions to Strike JPMorgan Chase's August 1, 2006 Notice of Cross-Designation of Expert Witnesses (Instrument No. 98) by J P Morgan Chase & Co, J.P. Morgan Securities Inc. f/k/a Chase Securities, Inc., filed.(Simms, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/23/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/23/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition to 95 MOTION to Strike The Ohio Retirement Systems' Motion to Strike JP Morgan Chase & Co.'s August 1, 2006 "Notice of Cross Designation of Expert Witnesses" as Untimely, filed by J P Morgan Chase & Co, J.P. Morgan Securities Inc. f/k/a Chase Securities, Inc.. (Simms, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/23/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          First AMENDED Complaint with Jury Demand against AWSC societe Cooperative En Liquidation, Banc of America Securities LLC, Bank of America Corp, Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc, Barclays PLC, Thomas H Bauer, Daniel Bayly, Robert A Belfer, Michael L Bennett, Joseph F Berardino, Norman P Blake, Jr, Dan Boyle, James A Brown, Richard B Buy, Canadian Imperail Bank of Commerce Oppenheimer Corp f/k/a Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce Wood Gundy PLC, Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce World Markets Corp., Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce World Markets PLC, Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce, Debra A Cash, Ronnie C Chan, CitiBank N A, Wesley Colwell, Credit Suisse First Boston USA Inc, Thomas Davis, David W Delainey, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas f/k/a Bankers Trust Company, David Duncan, John H Duncan, Lea W Fastow, Daniel Ferguson, Joe H Foy, Mark A Frevert, William Fuhs, Robert S Furst, D Stephen Goddard, Jr, Goldman Sachs & Co, Gary B Goolsby, Daniel L Gordon, Wendy L Gramm, Kevin P Hannon, Ken L Harrison, Joseph M Hirko, Stanley C Horton, Kevin Howard, J.P. Morgan Chase Bank f/k/a Chase Manhattan Bank, J.P. Morgan Securities Inc. f/k/a Chase Securities, Inc., Robert K Jaedicke, Michael D Jones, Sheila Kahanek, Steven J Kean, Mark E Koenig, Michael Krautz, Linda Lay, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Kenneth L. Lay, Lehman Brothers Inc, Charles A LeMaistre, Michael M Lowther, Jeffery McMahon, John Mendelsohn, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Jerome J Meyer, National Westminister plc, Benjamin Neuhausen, Michael C Odom, Cindy K Olson, Lou L Pai, Paulo V Ferraz Pereira, Pershing LLC, Rick Petersen, Kenneth D Rice, Paula Rieker, Royal Bank Of Canada, Salomon Smith Barney, Inc. n/k/a Citigroup Global Markets Inc, Frank Savage, Ian Schottlaender, Rex T Shelby, John E Stewart, Joseph W Sutton, William E Swanson, The Royal Bank of Scotland plc, Schuyler M Tilney, Toronto Dominion Bank, John A Urquhart, John Wakeham, Charles E Walker, Carol L Whalen as the Personal Representative of the Estate of J. Clifford Baxter, Carol L Whalen, Lawrence G Whaley, Herbert S Winokur, Jr, Mark Wolf, F Scott Yeager, Ben F Glisan, Jr, Arthur Andersen LLP, Citigroup Inc, Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation, J P Morgan Chase & Co, Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc, Merrill Lynch & Co Inc, Vinson & Elkins LLP, Andrew S Fastow, Jeffrey K Skilling, Richard A Causey, Michael J Kopper filed by Public Employees Retirement System Board, State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, Cincinnati Retirement System, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System.(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 08/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Production of Rebuttal Expert Reports by Public Employees Retirement System Board, State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, Cincinnati Retirement System, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System, filed. (Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 08/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 8/3/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Strike The Ohio Retirement Systems' Motion to Strike JP Morgan Chase & Co.'s August 1, 2006 "Notice of Cross Designation of Expert Witnesses" as Untimely by Public Employees Retirement System Board, State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/23/2006. (Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 08/03/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATEMENT The Ohio Retirement Systems' Statement to Opt-Out of the Class Certified by the Court's July 5, 2006 Order by Cincinnati Retirement System, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, Public Employees Retirement System Board, State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System, filed.(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 07/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE Of Designation Of Experts And Production Of Expert Reports by Public Employees Retirement System Board, State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System, filed. (Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 06/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying The Ohio Retirement Systems' 83 Motion to Compel Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corp to Respond to Discovery Requests.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(ltien, ) (Entered: 01/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition to 83 MOTION to Compel Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corp. to Respond to Discovery Requests, filed by Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. (rwestmoreland, ) (Entered: 12/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Andrea W Trento in Opposition re: 83 MOTION to Compel Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corp. to Respond to Discovery Requests, filed.(rwestmoreland, ) (Entered: 12/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SURREPLY to 54 MOTION for Leave to File An Amended Complaint And For The Cincinnati Retirement System And The Ohio Tuition Trust Authority To Join In The Ohio Retirement Systems' Amended Complaint, filed by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America Securities LLC. (King, Charles) (Entered: 12/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to 86 MOTION to Strike 82 Reply to Response to Motion,, 85 Surreply to Motion, of The Ohio Retirement Systems, Cincinnati Retirement System and Ohio Tuition Trust Authority's Motion to Strike the Sur-Reply Briefs of Proposed Defendants Goldman S, filed by Goldman Sachs & Co. (King, Charles) (Entered: 12/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to 86 MOTION to Strike 82 Reply to Response to Motion,, 85 Surreply to Motion, of The Ohio Retirement Systems, Cincinnati Retirement System and Ohio Tuition Trust Authority's Motion to Strike the Sur-Reply Briefs of Proposed Defendants Goldman S, filed by Outside Directors Enron. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Motion to Strike)(Ross, Brian) (Entered: 12/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Strike 82 Reply to Response to Motion,, 85 Surreply to Motion, of The Ohio Retirement Systems, Cincinnati Retirement System and Ohio Tuition Trust Authority's Motion to Strike the Sur-Reply Briefs of Proposed Defendants Goldman Sachs & Co. [Instr. #82] and The Outside Directors [Instr. #88]; and Ordering All Parties and Proposed Defendants to Seek Leave of Court Prior to Filing Sur-Reply Briefs by Public Employees Retirement System Board, State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/28/2005. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting The Ohio Retirement Systems, Cincinnati Retirement System and Ohio Tuition Trust Authority's Motion To Strike the Sur-Reply Briefs of Proposed Defendants Goldman Sachs & Co. [Instr. #82] And The Outside Directors [Instr. #88]# 2 Certificate of Service to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike and Plainitffs' Proposed Order)(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 12/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SURREPLY to 54 MOTION for Leave to File An Amended Complaint And For The Cincinnati Retirement System And The Ohio Tuition Trust Authority To Join In The Ohio Retirement Systems' Amended Complaint, filed by Outside Directors Enron. (Ross, Brian) (Entered: 12/06/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting Ohio Retirment Systems' 81 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Credit Suisse First Boston LLC's First Set of Interrogatories & Requests for Admissions & Merrill Lynch's First Set of Interrogatories & Requests for Production of Documents.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 12/02/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Compel Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corp. to Respond to Discovery Requests by Public Employees Retirement System Board, State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/20/2005. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting The Ohio Retirement Systems' Motion to Compel Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corp. to Respond to Discovery Requests# 2 Certificate of Service to the Ohio Retirement Systems' Motion to Compel Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corp. to Respond to Discovery Requests# 3 The Declaration of Sidney S. Liebesman in Support of the Ohio Retirement Systems' Motion to Compel Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corp. to Respond to Discovery Requests# 4 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Sidney S. Liebesman in Support of the Ohio Retirement Systems' Motion to Compel Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corp. to Respond to Discovery Requests# 5 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Sidney S. Liebesman in Support of the Ohio Retirement Systems' Motion to Compel Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corp. to Respond to Discovery Requests# 6 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Sidney S. Liebesman in Support of the Ohio Retirement Systems' Motion to Compel Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corp. to Respond to Discovery Requests# 7 Exhibit D to the Declaration of Sidney S. Liebesman in Support of the Ohio Retirement Systems' Motion to Compel Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corp. to Respond to Discovery Requests# 8 Exhibit E to the Declaration of Sidney S. Liebesman in Support of the Ohio Retirement Systems' Motion to Compel Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corp. to Respond to Discovery Requests# 9 Exhibit F to the Declaration of Sidney S. Liebesman in Support of the Ohio Retirement Systems' Motion to Compel Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corp. to Respond to Discovery Requests# 10 Exhibit G to the Declaration of Sidney S. Liebesman in Support of the Ohio Retirement Systems' Motion to Compel Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corp. to Respond to Discovery Requests# 11 Exhibit H to the Declaration of Sidney S. Liebesman in Support of the Ohio Retirement Systems' Motion to Compel Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corp. to Respond to Discovery Requests# 12 Certificate of Service to the Declaration of Sidney S. Liebesman in Support of the Ohio Retirement Systems' Motion to Compel Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston Corp. to Respond to Discovery Requests)(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 11/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sur-Reply to Response to 54 MOTION for Leave to File An Amended Complaint And For The Cincinnati Retirement System And The Ohio Tuition Trust Authority To Join In The Ohio Retirement Systems' Amended Complaint, filed by Goldman Sachs & Co. (ypippin, ) (Entered: 11/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Credit Suisse First Boston LLC's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production and Merrill Lynch's First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production by all plaintiffs, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/13/2005. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 11/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Sidney S. Liebesman in Support re: 79 Reply in Support of Motion,, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E)(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 11/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Reply in Support of 54 MOTION for Leave to File An Amended Complaint And For The Cincinnati Retirement System And The Ohio Tuition Trust Authority To Join In The Ohio Retirement Systems' Amended Complaint, filed by all plaintiffs. (Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 11/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COPY OF ORDER Denying JPMorgan Chase Motion to Compel Moody's Investors Service Inc and Standard and Poor's to Produce Documents entered as instrument # 4194 in CA H 01-3624 Newby et al v Enron Corp et al.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(rwestmoreland, ) (Entered: 11/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COPY OF ORDER Granting Motions to Quash entered as instrument # 4193 in CA H 01-3624 Newby et al v Enron Corp et al.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(rwestmoreland, ) (Entered: 11/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 72 Amended Motion to Intervene to oppose the Motion to Amend the Complaint and the Ohio Retirement Systems on or before 11/22/05 may reply to responses to the Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 11/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/8/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER striking 69 Memorandum.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 11/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Zweifach in Support re: 72 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D (part 1)# 5 Exhibit D (part 2)# 6 Exhibit D (part 3)# 7 Exhibit E)(Dinn, Amy) (Entered: 11/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED ORDER re: 72 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene, filed.(Dinn, Amy) (Entered: 11/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Intervene by Daniel Ferguson, Ian Schottlaender, Mark Wolf, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/29/2005. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Fishbein Declaration)# 2 Exhibit 1 (Exhibit 1 to Fishbein Declaration)# 3 Exhibit 2 (Exhibit 2 to Fishbein Declaration)# 4 Exhibit 3 (Exhibit 3 to Fishbein Declaration)# 5 Exhibit 4 (Exhibit 4 to Fishbein Declaration)# 6 Exhibit 5 (Exhibit 5 to Fishbein Declaration)# 7 Exhibit 6 (Exhibit 6 to Fishbein Declaration)# 8 Exhibit A (Schottlaender and Wolf Brief in Opposition)# 9 Exhibit B (Ferguson Brief in Opposition))(Dinn, Amy) (Entered: 11/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Intervene by Daniel Ferguson, Ian Schottlaender, Mark Wolf, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/29/2005. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Declaration of Matthew E. Fishbein)# 2 Exhibit A (Brief of Ian Schottlaender and Mark Wolf in Opposition)# 3 Exhibit B (Corrected Brief of Ferguson in Opposition))(Dinn, Amy) (Entered: 11/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/26/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Corrected APPENDIX of Authorities in Support of Memorandum in Opposition re: 54 MOTION for Leave to File An Amended Complaint And For The Cincinnati Retirement System And The Ohio Tuition Trust Authority To Join In The Ohio Retirement Systems' Amended Complaint by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America Securities LLC, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2# 2 Part 3# 3 Part 4# 4 Part 5)(rwestmoreland, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/7/2005 (rwestmoreland, ). (Entered: 11/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION to the Ohio Retirement Systems' 54 MOTION for Leave to File An Amended Complaint And For The Cincinnati Retirement System And The Ohio Tuition Trust Authority To Join In The Ohio Retirement Systems' Amended Complaint, by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America Securities LLC, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Continuation)(psmith, ) (Entered: 11/03/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPENDIX OF AUTHORITIES in Support of their 65 Memorandum in Opposition to the Ohio Retirement Systems' Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint and for the Cincinnati Retirement System and the Ohio Tuition Trust Authority to join in the Ohio Retirement Systems Amended Complaint, by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America Securities LLC, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Continuation # 2 Continuation # 3 Continuation # 4 Exhibit # 5 Exhibit # 6 Exhibit # 7 Exhibit)(psmith, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/3/2005 (psmith, ). (Entered: 11/03/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/26/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition re: 54 MOTION for Leave to File An Amended Complaint And For The Cincinnati Retirement System And The Ohio Tuition Trust Authority To Join In The Ohio Retirement Systems' Amended Complaint by Goldman Sachs & Co, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-2# 2 Exhibit 3)(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 11/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/26/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORRECTED MEMORANDUM in Opposition re: 54 MOTION for Leave to File An Amended Complaint And For The Cincinnati Retirement System And The Ohio Tuition Trust Authority To Join In The Ohio Retirement Systems' Amended Complaint, ref: 55 Memorandum, by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America Securities LLC, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Pages 20 - End)(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 10/31/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition re: 54 MOTION for Leave to File An Amended Complaint And For The Cincinnati Retirement System And The Ohio Tuition Trust Authority To Join In The Ohio Retirement Systems' Amended Complaint, by Goldman Sachs & Co, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit)(ltien, ) (Entered: 10/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition to 54 MOTION for Leave to File An Amended Complaint And For The Cincinnati Retirement System And The Ohio Tuition Trust Authority To Join In The Ohio Retirement Systems' Amended Complaint, filed by The Royal Bank of Scotland plc et al. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(ltien, ) (Entered: 10/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/25/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting Ohio Retirement Systems' 61 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File a Reply Memorandum in Support of The Ohio Retirement Systems' Motion For Leave To File An Amended Complaint. The Ohio Retirement Systems may reply to responses to their 54 MOTION for Leave to File An Amended Complaint by 11/22/2005.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(ltien, ) (Entered: 10/26/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to 54 MOTION for Leave to File An Amended Complaint And For The Cincinnati Retirement System And The Ohio Tuition Trust Authority To Join In The Ohio Retirement Systems' Amended Complaint, filed by Citigroup Inc, Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation, J P Morgan Chase & Co, Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc, Merrill Lynch & Co Inc. (McMahon, Kerry) (Entered: 10/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/21/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File A Reply Memorandum In Support Of The Ohio Retirement Systems' Motion For Leave To File An Amended Complaint by Public Employees Retirement System Board, State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/10/2005. (Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 10/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION extending time until 10/26/05 to respond to plaintiffs' motion to amend their complaint by Daniel Ferguson, Ian Schottlaender, Mark Wolf, Public Employees Retirement System Board, filed.(ltien, ) Modified on 10/20/2005 - This document was originally filed electronically by attorney as instr #4016 in Case No. H-01-3624.(ltien, ). (Entered: 10/19/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/5/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition to Ohio Plaintiffs' 54 MOTION for Leave to File An Amended Complaint And For The Cincinnati Retirement System And The Ohio Tuition Trust Authority To Join In The Ohio Retirement Systems' Amended Complaint, filed by Robert A Belfer, Norman P Blake, Jr, Ronnie C Chan, John H Duncan, Joe H Foy, Wendy L Gramm, Robert K Jaedicke, Charles A LeMaistre, John Mendelsohn, Jerome J Meyer, Frank Savage, John A Urquhart, Charles E Walker. (ltien, ) (Entered: 10/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/6/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: The 57 MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to Pltfs' Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint is GRANTED. The Financial Institutions shall have until Oct 25, 2005 to file response to pltfs motion.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(psmith, ) (Entered: 10/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to Pltfs' Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint by Financial Institutions filed. Motion Docket Date 10/20/2005. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 10/03/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/15/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Sidney S. Liebesman In Support Of The Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Ohio Retirement Systems' Motion For Leave To File An Amended Complaint And For The Cincinnati Retirement System And The Ohio Tuition Trust Authority To Join In The Ohio Retirement Systems' Amended Complaint, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint# 2 Exhibit B - Order Of 7-11-03# 3 Exhibit C - Deposition Protocol Order# 4 Exhibit D (Part 1 Of 2)# 5 Exhibit D (Part 2 of 2))(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 09/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/15/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM In Support re: 54 MOTION for Leave to File An Amended Complaint And For The Cincinnati Retirement System And The Ohio Tuition Trust Authority To Join In The Ohio Retirement Systems' Amended Complaint by Public Employees Retirement System Board, State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System, filed.(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 09/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/15/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File An Amended Complaint And For The Cincinnati Retirement System And The Ohio Tuition Trust Authority To Join In The Ohio Retirement Systems' Amended Complaint by Public Employees Retirement System Board, State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio, School Employees Retirement System of Ohio, Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/5/2005. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 09/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Rice, Bruce D. Angiolillo, Jonathan K. Youngblood, Morgan F. Kelly, Jill O'Toole, Marcia A. Griffith, and Amanda Hector on behalf of J P Morgan Chase & Co, filed. (kmurphy, ) (Entered: 08/26/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Compel Third-Parties Moody's Investors Service Inc and Standard & Poor's to Produce Documents responsive to Subpoenas and for Expedited Consideration by J P Morgan Chase & Co, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/8/2005. (rroberts, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/22/2005 (rroberts, ). Additional attachment(s) added on 8/22/2005 (rroberts, ). (Entered: 08/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/10/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER on 35 Bank Defts' Motion to Compel. The four Plaintiffs either supplement their respective document production requests by 8/25/05 or confirm that a complete production of all responsive documents in the listed categories has already been made. The Pltfs are to produce the witnesses for Cycle 11 and 13 for depositions by 8/26/05. Instead of producing Cycle 11 Board Members for deposition, Pltfs may produce 30(b)(c) witnesses pursuant to the 30(b)(6) Notice prepared by the Bank Defts, without prejudice to the Bank Defts deposing the Pltfs' Board Members in the future.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 08/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION In Support Of The Ohio Retirement Systems' Memorandum Of Law In Opposition to Bank Defendants' Motion to Compel Plaintiffs To Provide A Supplemental Production of Documents And To Comply With The Deposition Protocol Order Regarding The Provision Of Deposition Dates For Witnesses [[Part 6B, Exhibit Q, Part 4-7]] by all plaintiffs, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Q, part 4# 2 Exhibit Q, part 5# 3 Exhibit Q, part 6# 4 Exhibit 7, part 7)(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 08/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Reply in Support of 35 MOTION to Compel by Bank Defts. (kmurphy, ) (Entered: 08/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION In Support Of The Ohio Retirement Systems' Memorandum Of Law In Opposition to Bank Defendants' Motion to Compel Plaintiffs To Provide A Supplemental Production of Documents And To Comply With The Deposition Protocol Order Regarding The Provision Of Deposition Dates For Witnesses [[Part 6A] Exhibit Q] by all plaintiffs, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Q, part 1# 2 Exhibit Q,part 2# 3 Exhibit Q, part 3)(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 08/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION In Support Of The Ohio Retirement Systems' Memorandum Of Law In Opposition to Bank Defendants' Motion to Compel Plaintiffs To Provide A Supplemental Production of Documents And To Comply With The Deposition Protocol Order Regarding The Provision Of Deposition Dates For Witnesses [Part 7, Exhibits R-Y] by all plaintiffs, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit R# 2 Exhibit S# 3 Exhibit T# 4 Exhibit U# 5 Exhibit V, part 1# 6 Exhibit V, part 2# 7 Exhibit W# 8 Exhibit X# 9 Exhibit Y)(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 08/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION In Support Of The Ohio Retirement Systems' Memorandum Of Law In Opposition to Bank Defendants' Motion to Compel Plaintiffs To Provide A Supplemental Production of Documents And To Comply With The Deposition Protocol Order Regarding The Provision Of Deposition Dates For Witnesses [Part 5, Exhibit P] by all plaintiffs, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit P, part 1# 2 Exhibit P, part 2# 3 Exhibit P, part 3# 4 Exhibit P, part 4# 5 Exhibit P, part 5# 6 Exhibit P, part 6)(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 08/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION In Support Of The Ohio Retirement Systems' Memorandum Of Law In Opposition To The Bank Defendants' Motion To Compel Plaintiffs To Provide A Supplemental Production Of Documents And To Comply With The Deposition Protocol Order Regarding The Provision of Deposition Dates For Witnesses [Part 4 - Exhibit O] by all plaintiffs, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit O, part 1# 2 Exhibit O, part 2# 3 Exhibit O, part 3# 4 Exhibit O, part 4# 5 Exhibit O, part 5# 6 Exhibit O, part 6# 7 Exhibit O, part 7)(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 08/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION In Support Of The Ohio Retirement Systems' Memorandum Of Law In Opposition To The Bank Defendants' Motion To Compel Plaintiffs To Provide A Supplemental Production Of Documents And To Comply With The Deposition Protocol Order Regarding The Provision of Deposition Dates For Witnesses [Part 3 - Exhibit N] by all plaintiffs, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit N, part 1# 2 Exhibit N, part 2# 3 Exhibit N, part 3# 4 Exhibit Exhibit N, part 4# 5 Exhibit N, part 5# 6 Exhibit N, part 6# 7 Exhibit N, part 7# 8 Exhibit N, part 8)(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 08/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION In Support Of The Ohio Retirement Systems' Memorandum Of Law In Opposition To The Bank Defendants' Motion To Compel Plaintiffs To Provide A Supplemental Production Of Documents And To Comply With The Deposition Protocol Order Regarding The Provision of Deposition Dates For Witnesses [Part 2 - Exhibits K-M] by all plaintiffs, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit K# 2 Exhibit L# 3 Exhibit M)(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 08/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION In Support Of The Ohio Retirement Systems' Memorandum Of Law In Opposition To The Bank Defendants' Motion To Compel Plaintiffs To Provide A Supplemental Production Of Documents And To Comply With The Deposition Protocol Order Regarding The Provision of Deposition Dates For Witnesses [Part 1 - Exhibits A-J] by all plaintiffs, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F, part 1# 7 Exhibit F, part 2# 8 Exhibit F, part 3# 9 Exhibit F, part 4# 10 Exhibit G# 11 Exhibit H# 12 Exhibit I# 13 Exhibit J)(Liebesman, Sidney) (Entered: 08/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/2/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition to the Bank Defendants' 35 MOTION to Compel plaintiffs to provide a supplemental production of documents, to comply with the deposition protocol order regarding the provision of deposition dates for witnesses by Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (See Declarations in Support of this Memorandum at 4:01cv3624 #3757 through #3763.)(ltien, ) (Entered: 08/03/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' 39 MOTION for Additional Time to Respond to the Bank Defendants' Motion to Compel, filed by Citigroup Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(ltien, ) (Entered: 08/03/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Additional Time to Respond to the Bank Defendants' Motion to Compel by Ohio State Highway Patrol Retirement System, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/17/2005. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(ltien, ) (Entered: 08/03/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/28/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING Motion to Extend Response Deadline to 35 MOTION to Compel plaintiffs to provide a supplemental production of documents, to comply with the deposition protocol order regarding the provision of deposition dates for witnesses. Responses due by 8/2/2005.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(dhansen) (Entered: 07/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/21/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER EXPEDITING RESPONSE DATE- Plaintiffs shall file responses to Bank Defendants' Motion to Compel 35 by no later than July 28, 2005 with a courtesy copy sent to chambers.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 07/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/19/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Morgan F Kelly in Support re: 35 MOTION to Compel plaintiffs to provide a supplemental production of documents, to comply with the deposition protocol order regarding the provision of deposition dates for witnesses, , filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit A continued# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit B continued# 5 Exhibits C-H# 6 Exhibits I-K# 7 Exhibits L-N# 8 Exhibit O# 9 Exhibit 0 (Continued)# 10 Exhibit P)(ltien, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/21/2005 (kmurphy, ). Modified on 7/21/2005 (kmurphy, ). (Entered: 07/20/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/19/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Compel plaintiffs to provide a supplemental production of documents, to comply with the deposition protocol order regarding the provision of deposition dates for witnesses and Request for Expedited Consideration, by Citigroup Inc, Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation, J P Morgan Chase & Co, Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc, Merrill Lynch & Co Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/8/2005. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(ltien, ) (Entered: 07/20/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION; this member case is consolidated into lead case H.01-3624, entered; Parties notified. (signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) (ddarneille) (Entered: 01/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER transferring case to the MDL panel, entered; Parties notified. (ddarneille) (Entered: 01/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/29/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-8) from MDL; stay lifted as of 11/25/02, entered; Parties notified. (ddarneille) (Entered: 01/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting pltfs' [29-1] motion for Jay W Eisenhofer, Megan D McIntyre and Sidney Liebesman to appear pro hac vice, entered; Parties notified. (signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R Abel) (ddarneille) (Entered: 01/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting Credit Suisse First's [28-1] motion for Julia North and Richard Clary to appear pro hac vice, entered; Parties notified. (signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R Abel) (ddarneille) (Entered: 01/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Jay W Eisenhofer, Megan D McIntyre and Sidney Liebesman to appear pro hac vice by Public Employees Ret, State Teachers OH, School Employees OH, Ohio State Highway P, filed. (ddarneille) (Entered: 01/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/25/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Julia North and Richard Clary to appear pro hac vice by Credit Suisse First, filed. (ddarneille) (Entered: 01/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/24/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting Citigroup Inc's [25-1] motion for Brad Scott Karp, Robert S Smith, Michael E Gertzman and Robert Neil Kravitz to appear pro hac vice as co-counsel, entered; Parties notified. (signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R Abel) (ddarneille) (Entered: 01/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/22/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting Lehman Brother's [5-1] motion to stay proceedings until the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation either transfers this case to the SD of TX or denies the defts' request to transfer this case as a tag-along action; Case stayed, entered; Parties notified. (signed by Judge Algenon L Marbley) (ddarneille) (Entered: 01/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/22/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Brad Scott Karp, Robert S Smith, Michael E Gertzman and Robert Neil Kravitz to appear pro hac vice by Citigroup Inc, filed. (ddarneille) (Entered: 01/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/22/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of withdrawal of response and sur-reply to the motion to stay proceedings by Public Employees Ret, State Teachers OH, School Employees OH, Ohio State Highway P, filed. (ddarneille) (Entered: 01/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/21/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Stipulation and ORDER that all defts shall have until 12/6/02 to move or plead in re pltfs' complaint, entered; Parties notified. (signed by Judge Algenon L Marbley) (ddarneille) (Entered: 01/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/18/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by Citigroup Inc, Credit Suisse First, J P Morgan Chase Co, Lehman Brothers Hold, Merrill Lynch & Co to pltfs' [20-1] motion for leave to file a sur-reply in re dft Lehman's motion to stay proceedings, filed. (ddarneille) (Entered: 01/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of attorney appearance for Credit Suisse First by William Chester Wilkinson, filed. (ddarneille) (Entered: 01/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for leave to file a sur-reply in re dft Lehman's motion to stay proceedings by Public Employees Ret, State Teachers OH, School Employees OH, Ohio State Highway P, filed. (ddarneille) (Entered: 01/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by Lehman Brothers Hold to pltfs' response to their [5-1] motion to stay proceedings, filed. (ddarneille) (Entered: 01/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Corporate Disclosure STATEMENT by Credit Suisse First, filed. (ddarneille) (Entered: 01/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE (memo in opposition) by Public Employees Ret, State Teachers OH, School Employees OH, Ohio State Highway P to Lehman Brothers' [5-1] motion to stay proceedings, filed. (ddarneille) (Entered: 01/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION re: extension of deadline to answer complaint to 10/28/02 by Richard A Causey, Public Employees Ret, State Teachers OH, School Employees OH, Ohio State Highway P, filed. (ddarneille) (Entered: 01/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting Merrill Lynch's [12-1] motion for Herbert S Washer and James D Miller to appear pro hac vice, entered; Parties notified. (signed by Magistrate Judge Norah M King) (ddarneille) (Entered: 01/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of attorney appearance for Merrill Lynch & Co by John W Zeiger, filed. (ddarneille) (Entered: 01/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/7/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of filing other defendants' consents to removal by Lehman Brothers Hold, filed. (ddarneille) (Entered: 01/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/7/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Herbert S Washer and James D Miller to appear pro hac vice by Merrill Lynch & Co, filed. (ddarneille) (Entered: 01/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/7/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Corporate Disclosure STATEMENT by Merrill Lynch & Co, filed. (ddarneille) (Entered: 01/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/4/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION re: extension of deadline to answer complaint to 10/28/02 by Kenneth L Lay, Public Employees Ret, State Teachers OH, School Employees OH, Ohio State Highway P, filed. (ddarneille) (Entered: 01/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/4/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION re: extension of deadline to answer complaint to 10/28/02 by Ben F Glisan Jr, Public Employees Ret, State Teachers OH, School Employees OH, Ohio State Highway P, filed. (ddarneille) (Entered: 01/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/3/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Corporate Disclosure STATEMENT by Credit Suisse First, filed. (ddarneille) (Entered: 01/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/2/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Corporate Disclosure STATEMENT by J P Morgan Chase Co, filed. (ddarneille) (Entered: 01/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/2/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to expedite briefing schedule on motion to stay by Lehman Brothers Hold, filed. (ddarneille) (Entered: 01/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/2/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to stay proceedings by Lehman Brothers Hold, filed. (ddarneille) (Entered: 01/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/1/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION re: extension of deadline to 10/28/02 for defts to answer complaint by Lehman Brothers Hold, Merrill Lynch & Co, Credit Suisse First, Citigroup Inc, J P Morgan Chase Co, Vinson & Elkins LLP, Public Employees Ret, State Teachers OH, School Employees OH, Ohio State Highway P, filed. (ddarneille) (Entered: 01/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/30/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Corporate Disclosure STATEMENT by Citigroup Inc, filed. (ddarneille) (Entered: 01/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/27/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Corporate Disclosure STATEMENT by Lehman Brothers Hold, filed. (ddarneille) (Entered: 01/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1