USA v. Turi et al
Criminal Case Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:14-cr-00191

Tags
Last Updated January 9, 2017 at 5:00 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Marc Turi, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jean-Jacques Cabou +1 602 351 8000 +1 602 648 7000 jcabou@perkinscoie.com
Space Thomas Dean Ryerson +1 602 351 8000 +1 602 648 7048 tryerson@perkinscoie.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander Westbrook Samuels - Inactive +1 602 351 8442 +1 602 648 7064 Alexander.Samuels@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (161) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 10/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER as to Marc Turi (1), Turi Defense Group (2): pursuant to the Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice 438 agreed upon by the parties, this matter is dismissed with prejudice; any release conditions previously imposed are immediately terminated. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/4/16.(REW) (Entered: 10/04/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    MOTION to Dismiss Indictment by USA as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit)(Pimsner, David) (Entered: 10/03/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell: Status Conference as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group held on 9/8/2016. Status Conference set for 10/19/2016 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) Hearing held 3:25 PM to 3:32 PM.(TCA) (Entered: 09/09/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 7/6/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
        MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell: Status Conference as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group held on 7/6/2016. Resolution in process. Jury Trial reset for 11/8/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Status Conference set for 9/8/2016 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) Hearing held 4:02 PM to 4:20 PM.(TCA) (Entered: 07/07/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER granting 430 Motion to Continue Status Conference as to Marc Turi (1). Status Conference reset from 6/20/2016 to 7/6/2016 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Order to Continue applies to the following defendants: Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group. See order for additional deadlines. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/17/2016.(TCA) (Entered: 06/17/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None
            MOTION to Continue Status Conference of June 20, 2016 and Production Deadlines (Unopposed) (Expedited Consideration Requested) by Marc Turi. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cabou, Jean-Jacques) (Entered: 06/17/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 4/21/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER granting 408 Motion for continued Modification of Conditions of Pretrial Release as to Marc Turi (1). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/21/2016.(TCA) (Entered: 04/21/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 4/21/2016, Entered: None
                Consent MOTION to Continue Modified Conditions of Pretrial Release by Marc Turi. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cabou, Jean-Jacques) (Entered: 04/21/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of STATUS CONFERENCE proceedings as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group held on 11/17/2015, before Judge David G. Campbell. (Court Reporter: Patricia Lyons). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/21/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/2/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/29/2016. (RAP) (Entered: 04/08/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of STATUS CONFERENCE proceedings as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group held on 06/03/2015, before Judge David G. Campbell. (Court Reporter: Patricia Lyons). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/21/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/2/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/29/2016. (RAP) (Entered: 04/08/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of STATUS CONFERENCE proceedings as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group held on 04/24/2015, before Judge David G. Campbell. (Court Reporter: Patricia Lyons). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/21/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/2/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/29/2016. (RAP) (Entered: 04/08/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of STATUS CONFERENCE proceedings as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group held on 12/02/2014, before Judge David G. Campbell. (Court Reporter: Patricia Lyons). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/21/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/2/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/29/2016. (RAP) (Entered: 04/08/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 3/23/2016, Entered: None
                          NOTICE re RETURN of Passport as to Marc Turi. Passport Number 434581659/508094802 issued by USA. Defendant not permitted to apply for passport/passport card during the pendency of this action. (PTS-MG, ) (Entered: 03/23/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER granting 388 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Marc Turi (1). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/22/2016.(TCA) (Entered: 03/22/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: None
                              MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group as to Marc Turi. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cabou, Jean-Jacques) (Entered: 03/21/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER granting 380 Motion to Unseal Transcript of 1/8/16 status conference as to Marc Turi (1). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/21/2016.(TCA) (Entered: 03/21/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: None
                                  MOTION to Unseal Document Transcript of January 8, 2016 by Marc Turi. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cabou, Jean-Jacques) (Entered: 03/16/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank 374 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None
                                    *RESPONSE to Motion re: 345 MOTION to Compel Production of Brady Information by USA as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group. (Pimsner, David) *Modified to correct event, link added on 3/15/2016* (REW). (Entered: 03/14/2016)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of STATUS CONFERENCE proceedings as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group held on 11/02/2015, before Judge David G. Campbell. (Court Reporter: Patricia Lyons). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/28/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/7/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/6/2016. (RAP) (Entered: 03/11/2016)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of STATUS HEARING proceedings as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group held on 09/18/2015, before Judge David G. Campbell. (Court Reporter: Patricia Lyons). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/28/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/7/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/6/2016. (RAP) (Entered: 03/11/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank 371 Filed: 3/10/2016, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of Supplemental Authority Confirming United States' Arming of Libyan Rebels by Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group re: 55 MOTION to Compel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cabou, Jean-Jacques) (Entered: 03/10/2016)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            TRANSCRIPT REQUEST AMENDED by USA as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group for proceedings held on 08/11/15, 09/18/15 & 11/02/15, Judge David G Campbell hearing judge(s). (Pimsner, David) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None
                                              *MOTION to Extension of Time to File Response to 345 Motion to Compel PRODUCTION OF BRADY INFORMATION by USA as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pimsner, David) *Modified to correct event and add document linkage on 3/4/2016 (ATD). (Entered: 03/03/2016)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                AMENDED TRANSCRIPT REQUEST pursuant to 362 Notice of Deficiency by Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group for proceedings held on 12/2/14; 4/24/15; 6/3/15; 11/2/15; 11/17/15; 1/8/16, Judge David G Campbell hearing judge(s). (Cabou, Jean-Jacques) (Entered: 03/01/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: 347 Transcript Request filed by Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group, 348 Transcript Request filed by Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group, 349 Transcript Request filed by Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group, 350 Transcript Request filed by Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group, 351 Transcript Request filed by Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group, 352 Transcript Request filed by Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group, 353 Transcript Request filed by Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group. Requester must be the CJA appointed lead attorney and an AUTH-24 wasn't created through the CJA e-Voucher system. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile the transcript request on form AO435 under the CJA appointed lead attorney (Jean-Jacques Cabou), consolidating all requested dates on one form and also create an AUTH-24 through the CJA e-Voucher system, attaching a copy of the e-filed AMENDED AO435 in the DOCUMENTS tab. Please contact the district's CJA Unit for more information on the CJA e-Voucher system at (602) 322-7150. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RAP) (Entered: 03/01/2016)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by USA as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group for proceedings held on 8/11/15, 9/18/15, 11/2/15, Judge David G Campbell hearing judge(s). (Pimsner, David) (Entered: 02/29/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group for proceedings held on January 8, 2016, Judge David G Campbell hearing judge(s). (Attachments: # 1 CJA Form 24)(Ryerson, Thomas) (Entered: 02/23/2016)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group for proceedings held on November 17, 2015, Judge David G Campbell hearing judge(s). (Attachments: # 1 CJA Form 24)(Ryerson, Thomas) (Entered: 02/23/2016)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group for proceedings held on November 2, 2015, Judge David G Campbell hearing judge(s). (Attachments: # 1 CJA Form 24)(Ryerson, Thomas) (Entered: 02/23/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group for proceedings held on June 3, 2015, Judge David G Campbell hearing judge(s). (Attachments: # 1 CJA Form 24)(Ryerson, Thomas) (Entered: 02/23/2016)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group for proceedings held on April 24, 2015, Judge David G Campbell hearing judge(s). (Attachments: # 1 CJA Form 24)(Ryerson, Thomas) (Entered: 02/23/2016)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group for proceedings held on December 2, 2014, Judge David G Campbell hearing judge(s). (Attachments: # 1 CJA Form 24)(Ryerson, Thomas) (Entered: 02/23/2016)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (Amended) by Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group for proceedings held on August 11, 2015, Judge David G Campbell hearing judge(s). (Attachments: # 1 CJA Form 24)(Ryerson, Thomas) (Entered: 02/23/2016)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    *(AMENDED BY DOC. 347 ) TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Marc Turi for proceedings held on August 11, 2015, Judge David G Campbell hearing judge(s). (Ryerson, Thomas) *Modified on 2/23/2016 (RAP). (Entered: 02/22/2016)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None
                                                                      MOTION to Compel Production of Brady Information by Marc Turi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cabou, Jean-Jacques) (Entered: 02/19/2016)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Wade Weems appearing for USA Amended. (Brook, Kristen) (Entered: 02/09/2016)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Wade Weems appearing for USA . (Brook, Kristen) (Entered: 02/09/2016)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of STATUS CONFERENCE/MOTION HEARING proceedings as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group held on 08/11/2015, before Judge David G. Campbell. (Court Reporter: Patricia Lyons). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/23/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/4/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/2/2016. (RAP) (Entered: 02/03/2016)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting 335 Motion to Unseal January 8, 2016 conference for limited purpose to obtain a transcript as to Marc Turi (1), Turi Defense Group (2). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/1/2016.(TCA) (Entered: 02/01/2016)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                TRANSCRIPT REQUEST Status and Motions Hearing by USA as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group for proceedings held on 8/11/2015, Judge David G Campbell hearing judge(s). (Woo, Raymond) (Entered: 02/01/2016)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by USA as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group for proceedings held on 01/08/2016, Judge David G Campbell hearing judge(s). (Woo, Raymond) (Entered: 02/01/2016)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                    MOTION to Unseal Hearing for Transcription Purposes Only by USA as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Woo, Raymond) (Entered: 01/29/2016)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Blank 334 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group: Government may, as it has as elected, conduct interviews of the witnesses identified by defense counsel. Interviews shall be conducted by Touhy counsel, not by the governments prosecution team. Interviews shall be recorded or transcribed by the government. Defense counsel shall provide written questions to Touhy counsel byJanuary 22, 2016. Interviews submitted to counsel or the Court by February 26, 2016. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/8/2016.(TCA) (Entered: 01/08/2016)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Pamela Browne of FOX News as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group for Status Conference proceedings held on 12/18/2015, Judge David G Campbell hearing judge(s). (RAP) (Entered: 01/05/2016)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of STATUS CONFERENCE proceedings as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group held on 12/18/2015, before Judge David G. Campbell. (Court Reporter: Patricia Lyons). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/11/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/21/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/21/2016. (RAP) (Entered: 12/23/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT REQUEST Second Amended by Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group for proceedings held on 12/18/2015, Judge David G Campbell hearing judge(s). (Attachments: # 1 CJA24 Form, # 2 Letter to Hon. Campbell)(Cabou, Jean-Jacques) (Entered: 12/23/2015)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT REQUEST Amended by Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group for proceedings held on 12/18/2015, Judge David G Campbell hearing judge(s). (Attachments: # 1 CJA24 form)(Cabou, Jean-Jacques) (Entered: 12/22/2015)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group for proceedings held on 12/18/2015, Judge David G Campbell hearing judge(s). (Cabou, Jean-Jacques) (Entered: 12/21/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by USA as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group for proceedings held on 12/18/2015, Judge David G Campbell hearing judge(s). (Woo, Raymond) (Entered: 12/21/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell: Status Conference as to Marc Turi and Turi Defense Group held on 12/18/2015. IT IS ORDERED that the Government shall file with the Court no later than December 23, 2015, its proposal that either the CIPA Section 5 hearing should be conducted by the Court in camera to make all determinations concerning the use, relevance or admissibility of classified information or whether Government's counsel prefer to conduct the interviews and provide the Court with the report for review. (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons) Hearing held 4:02 PM to 4:39 PM.(MAW) (Entered: 12/18/2015)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group: Due to a conflict, Status Conference reset for 12/18/2015 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (TCA) (Entered: 12/07/2015)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of MOTION HEARING proceedings as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group held on 10/17/2014, before Judge David G. Campbell. (Court Reporter: Elaine Cropper). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/16/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/28/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/23/2016. (RAP) (Entered: 11/25/2015)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by USA as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group for proceedings held on 10/17/2014, Judge David G Campbell hearing judge(s). (Pimsner, David) (Entered: 11/24/2015)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT REQUEST Final PTC by USA as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group for proceedings held on November 10, 2015, Judge David G Campbell hearing judge(s). (Woo, Raymond) (Entered: 11/19/2015)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER granting 276 Motion to Unseal Transcript as to Marc Turi (1), Turi Defense Group (2). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/18/2015.(TCA) (Entered: 11/18/2015)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell: Status Conference as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group held on 11/17/2015. 12/8/2015 trial date discussed. Parties agree that a firm trial date cannot be set with the ongoing Touhy issues. Parties agree to a 60 day continuance of trial. Defendant agrees to waive time. Government request an extension of time to respond to the Brady motion. Response due 11/30/2015. Reply due 12/7/2015. Appearances: AUSA David Pimsner/Kristen Brook for the Government, CJA Attorney Jean-Jacques Cabou and Thomas Ryerson(pro bono) for defendant. Defendant is not present and released. Jury Trial reset for 2/9/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Status Conference set for 12/21/2015 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Parties to discuss the status of Touhy and possible setting of a firm trial date. (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) Hearing held 4:00 PM to 4:10 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (TCA) (Entered: 11/17/2015)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  MOTION to Unseal Document the November 10, 2015 Pre-trial Conference by USA as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Order to Unseal)(Woo, Raymond) (Entered: 11/17/2015)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Marc Turi for proceedings held on November 10, 2015, Judge David G Campbell hearing judge(s). (Attachments: # 1 CJA 24 Authorization)(Cabou, Jean-Jacques) (Entered: 11/16/2015)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 270 Motion to Unseal Transcript as to Marc Turi (1). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/16/2015.(TCA) (Entered: 11/16/2015)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 11/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MOTION to Unseal Document Motion to Unseal Transcript for Transcription Purposes Only by Marc Turi. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cabou, Jean-Jacques) (Entered: 11/11/2015)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: . (Kedian, Kathleen) (Entered: 11/09/2015)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Scott McCulloch appearing for USA . (Woo, Raymond) (Entered: 11/06/2015)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell: Status Conference as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group held on 11/2/2015. Current 12/8/2015 trial date discussed. Parties are not prepared to set a firm trial schedule until after Touhy hearing is held and issues are resolved. Appearances: AUSA David Pimsner, Kristen Brook, Julie Edelstein(telephonic) for the Government, CJA Attorney Jean-Jacques Cabou, Thomas Ryerson(pro bono), Alexis Danneman(pro bono) for defendants. Defendant is not present and released/waived. A Status Conference is set for 11/17/2015 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Parties shall be prepared to set a firm trial schedule. (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) Hearing held 4:01 PM to 4:11 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (TCA) (Entered: 11/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Raymond K. Woo appearing for USA . (Woo, Raymond) (Entered: 10/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 252 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing Index to Supplemental Authority by Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group re: 240 Notice (Other). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cabou, Jean-Jacques) (Entered: 10/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group. The Court today entered a sealed, ex parte order granting the government's CIPA section 4 motion. The order explains in full the Court's reasons for granting the motion. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10-2-15. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC) (Entered: 10/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 250 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group: Ex parte CIPA § 4 motion. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/2/2015.(TCA) (Entered: 10/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 249 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying 171 Motion for Order to Show Cause why the government should not be sanctioned as to Marc Turi (1). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/2/2015.(TCA) (Entered: 10/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell: Status Conference as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group held on 9/18/2015. CIPA Section 4 motion discussed. Motion Document 171 discussed. Court to issue rulings within the next two weeks. No Touhy issues to be addressed at this time. Security clearance for counsel Ryerson and Danneman addressed. Appearances: AUSA David Pimsner, Kristen Brook, Julie Edelstein(telephonic) for the Government, CJA Attorney Jean-Jacques Cabou for defendant. Thomas Ryerson Pro Bono for defendant.Alexis Danneman Pro Bono for defendant Turi Defense Group. Defendant is not present and released/waived. A Status Conference is set for 11/2/2015 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) Hearing held 3:13 PM to 3:22 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (TCA) (Entered: 09/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 240 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Supplemental Authorities by Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group re: 55 MOTION to Compel, 229 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Seal Document, Status Conference, Motion Hearing, Set Hearings. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-32, # 2 Exhibit 33-37)(Cabou, Jean-Jacques) (Entered: 08/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group. At the hearing yesterday, the Court said it would be issuing a ruling on the CIPA section 4 motion within the next few days. As additional information will be submitted to the Court as discussed with the parties, the ruling will not be entered in the next few days. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8-12-15. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC) (Entered: 08/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell: Status/Motion Hearing as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group held on 8/11/2015. ORDERED denying 217 Motion to Compel Disclosure of Information Relating to Claim of State Secrets. ORDERED granting in part 142 Motion to Compel. FURTHER ORDERED denying 174 Motion for Designation of Separate Counsel for the United States FURTHER ORDERED granting 222 Motion to Seal Ex Parte Motion to Authorize Contact and Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 14 of Protective Order ( 223 lodged). Motion is denied. FURTHER ORDERED Jury Trial Continued to 12/8/2015 at 09:00 AM before Judge David G Campbell. FURTHER ORDERED Status Conference set for 9/18/2015 at 03:00 PM before Judge David G Campbell. FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot Stipulation 219 . See Document for Full Details. (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) Hearing held 3:02 PM to 4:06 PM.(MAP) (Entered: 08/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 226 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group re: 217 MOTION to Compel Disclosure of Information Relating to Claim of State Secrets . (Cabou, Jean-Jacques) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing of Motion to Authorize Contact and Disclosures by Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group. (Cabou, Jean-Jacques) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 221 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group re: 217 MOTION to Compel Disclosure of Information Relating to Claim of State Secrets . (Brook, Kristen) (Entered: 08/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 219 Stipulation re: Touhy Procedures as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/31/2015.(see order for details)(TCA) (Entered: 07/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION for Extension of Time by Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ryerson, Thomas) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION Regarding Touhy Procedures by USA as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pimsner, David) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 217 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Compel Disclosure of Information Relating to Claim of State Secrets by Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group as to Marc Turi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-3, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cabou, Jean-Jacques) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 215 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion for Relief From Touhy Regulations as to Marc Turi (1), Turi Defense Group (2). Response due 7/22/2015. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/20/2015.(TCA) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM TOUHY REGULATIONS AND TO RESTRICT ACCESS BY GOVERNMENT TRIAL TEAM TO TOUHY-RELATED SUBMISSIONS by USA as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brook, Kristen) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 214 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    PROTECTIVE ORDER as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/16/2015.(TCA) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group : The Court will be entering the protective order with a revision at paragraph 2(e) after conferring with the Classified Information Security Officer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (TCA) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 208 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING MEMORANDUM OF UNDERSTANDING by USA as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Pimsner, David) (Entered: 07/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 187 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response as to Marc Turi (1), Turi Defense Group (2). Government response to Defendant's Motion for relief from Touhy is due 7/20/2015. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/2/2015.(TCA) (Entered: 07/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 172 Motion for Protective Order as to Marc Turi (1), Turi Defense Group (2). Defendants make brief objections to paragraphs 6 and 14 of the government's proposed protective order (Doc. 172-1). Defendants argue that the procedures in these paragraphs will delay trial preparation, but the protection of classified national security information necessarily entails caution and some delay. Defendants cite no authority to suggest that classified information may be compromised in order to avoid trial delay. Defendants also argue that paragraphs 6 and 14 will hinder their "ability to timely retain experts in this highly technical case" (Doc. 175 at 2), but they do not explain why. Defendants can seek court and government approval under these paragraphs as soon as they are ready to retain experts. Defendants can ask both to respond promptly, which the Court will do, and can ask the Court to require the government to respond promptly if necessary. Ensuring that individuals who receive classified information have appropriate security clearances is necessary to protect classified information in this case. Defendants seem to suggest that they can determine who has appropriate clearances or that they can simply rely on a potential expert's statement that he or she has appropriate clearances, but such an unregulated procedure seems quite inconsistent with the careful laws, regulations, and practices governing the dissemination of classified information. Defendants further assert that paragraphs 6 and 14 raise due process concerns under United States v. Bahamonde, 445 F.3d 1225 (9th Cir. 2006), but Bahamonde found due process problems in the requirement that a criminal defendant disclose information to the government without receiving reciprocal discovery. Id. at 1228 ("The regulation, as applied in this criminal prosecution, violates due process by failing to provide reciprocal discovery."). Indeed, the Ninth Circuit was careful to limit its holding to this situation. Id. at 1228 n.6 ("Here we deal only with the application of the regulation requiring a criminal defendant to state how he plans to use material evidence when the government is under no reciprocal discovery obligation."). Defendants say nothing about the government's reciprocal discovery obligation in this case, such as its obligation to disclose expert witnesses under Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 16(a)(1)(G). Finally, Defendants state that it is "unclear" how the language in paragraphs 6 and 14 comports with Touhy regulations, but the Court is confident the parties can resolve that procedural issue. The Court concludes that the procedures proposed in paragraphs 6 and 14 are necessary to protect classified information in this case. Defendants have proposed no alternative protections. The Court will therefore enter the protective order proposed by the government. Before doing so, the Court will confer with the Classified Information Security Officer to obtain his comments on the proposed order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7-2-15. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC) (Entered: 07/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group. Defendants have requested oral argument on their motion to compel grand jury testimony. Doc. 142. The Court will hear oral argument at the status conference scheduled for August 11, 2015. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7-2-15. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC) (Entered: 07/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group: Status Conference reset TIME ONLY for 8/11/2015 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (TCA) (Entered: 07/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM TOUHY REGULATIONS AND TO RESTRICT ACCESS BY GOVERNMENT TRIAL TEAM TO TOUHY-RELATED SUBMISSIONS by USA as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brook, Kristen) (Entered: 07/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS OBJECTIONS TO PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER by USA as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group. (Brook, Kristen) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 126 Motion to Unseal Transcript as to Marc Turi (1) and unsealing the transcript of the March 4, 2015 Status Conference for transcription purposes only. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that once the transcription has been completed and provided to Defendant the transcript shall immediately be resealed. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/2/15. (LAD) (Entered: 04/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Unseal Document for Transcription Purposes Only by Marc Turi. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cabou, Jean-Jacques) (Entered: 04/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group for proceedings held on March 4, 2015, Judge David G Campbell hearing judge(s). (Attachments: # 1 CJA 24, # 2 letter)(Cabou, Jean-Jacques) (Entered: 03/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 118 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            RECEIPT for RETURN of Passports as to Marc Turi. Passport Numbers 434581659 AND 508094802 issued by USA. Defendant must re-surrender passports within 48 hours upon his return to Arizona. (PTS-JTH, ) (Entered: 03/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 116 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 114 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Marc Turi (1). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/13/2015.(TCA) (Entered: 03/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 115 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Additional Attachments to Main Document re: 114 MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release (Expedited Consideration Requested) by Marc Turi. (Cabou, Jean-Jacques) (Entered: 03/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 114 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release (Expedited Consideration Requested) by Marc Turi. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cabou, Jean-Jacques) (Entered: 03/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 110 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT REQUEST of Status Conference by USA as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group for proceedings held on March 4, 2015, Judge David G Campbell hearing judge(s). (Pimsner, David) (Entered: 03/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell: Status Conference as to Marc Turi and Turi Defense Group held on 3/4/2015. Status Conference set for 4/24/2015 at 03:00 PM before Judge David G Campbell [see attached minute entry for details]. (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons) Hearing held 4:29 PM to 5:39 PM.(MAW) (Entered: 03/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 107 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE GOVERNMENTS REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE RELATING TO DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF PUBLIC AUTHORITY by USA as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group. (Brook, Kristen) (Entered: 03/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Alexis Elizabeth Danneman appearing for Turi Defense Group . (Danneman, Alexis) (Entered: 02/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group: Motions due by 7/24/2015. Status Conference is set for 3/4/2015 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Status Conference is set for 6/3/2015 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 9/1/2015 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. A Jury Trial is set for 9/15/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/29/2014.(see order for additional deadlines)(TCA) (Entered: 12/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing of JOINT PROPOSAL OF PRETRIAL DEADLINES by USA as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group re: 78 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Status Conference (Text Only), Util - Set/Clear Flags, Common Prompts (Text Only). (Pimsner, David) (Entered: 12/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition by Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group re: 81 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Government's CIPA SECTION 4 MOTION Defendants' Response to Motion to Extend Time for Filing CIPA Section 4 Motion. (Ryerson, Thomas) (Entered: 12/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Government's CIPA SECTION 4 MOTION by USA as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pimsner, David) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell: Status Conference as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group held on 12/2/2014. ORDERED granting 72 Motion to designate case complex as to Marc Turi (1), Turi Defense Group (2). Discussion held. Government to file a CIPA Section 4 motion on 12/19/2014 that is tailored to Court order Doc. 63 and addresses both categories 1 and 2. Defendants to file on 12/19/2014 ex parte information that defendants think would be helpful to the Court in review of the Goverment's CIPA Section 4 Motion. Government withdraws prior CIPA section 4 motion and ask the Court to take the second motion as superseding. Granted. Parties to confer and submit a more detailed proposed case management order by 12/19/2014,adding a status conference every 90 days. Jury trial to be reset in that order to 9/15/2015. Ex parte discussion with defendants. Defendants to file a motion as addressed on the record. Appearances: AUSA William Mackie and Dave Pimsner for the Government, CJA Attorney Jean-Jacques Cabou and Thomas Ryerson for defendants. Defendant is present and released. (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) Hearing held 2:01 PM to 2:29 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (TCA) (Entered: 12/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE Joint Proposed Scheduling Order by Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group. (Cabou, Jean-Jacques) (Entered: 12/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Julie Ann Edelstein appearing for USA . (Edelstein, Julie) (Entered: 11/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by USA as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group re: 72 MOTION for Complex Designation. (Pimsner, David) (Entered: 11/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            *NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal/Substitution as to Marc Turi and Turi Defense Group. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cabou, Jean-Jacques) *Modified from Motion, filer added on 11/21/2014* (REW). (Entered: 11/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 64 Motion to Unseal Indictment and all further proceedings as to Marc Turi (1), Turi Defense Group (2). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/19/14.(MAP) (Entered: 11/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Complex Designation by Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group. (MAP) (Entered: 11/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE (Response) of Lack of Opposition to 64 Motion to Unseal Case by Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group (MAP) (Entered: 11/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER DISMISSING COUNTS Pursuant to the Court's previous order (Doc. 62 ) and the government's notice of election (Doc. 67 ), it is hereby ordered that Counts 2 and 4 of the Indictment are dismissed as to as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/6/14. (cc: All Counsel) (MAP) (Entered: 11/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Election by USA as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group. (MAP) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 65 Motion to Extend Time as to Marc Turi (1), Turi Defense Group (2). ORDERED that the Government shall notify the Court and Defendants of the counts it elects to dismiss, pursuant to the Order of this Court (Doc. 62-1), on or before November 3, 2014. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/3/14. (cc: counsel) (MAP) (Entered: 11/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Extend Time for the Government to notifY the Court and Defendants of the Counts it elects to Dismiss Pursuant to the Order of this Court (Doc. 62 ) by USA as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group. (MAP) (Entered: 10/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Unseal Indictment by USA as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group. (MAP) (Entered: 10/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting/denying in part 55 Motion to Compel as to Marc Turi (1), Turi Defense Group (2). See Order for Details. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/22/14. (cc: AUSA/Dft's Cnsl) (MAP) (Entered: 10/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting/denying in part 12 Motion to Dismiss. The Court dismisses either counts one and three or counts two and four as multiplicitous. Within seven days of this order, the government shall notify the Court and Defendants of the counts it elects to have dismissed under this ruling. FURTHER ORDERED denying 30 Motion to Strike Surplusage as to Marc Turi (1), Turi Defense Group (2). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/21/14. (cc: AUSA/Dft's Cnsl) (MAP) (Entered: 10/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  *MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell on 10/17/2014: Court has reviewed the briefing on the motion to dismiss indictment and Motion to strike. Doc. 12 , 30 . A ruling will issue next week as to Marc Turi (1), Turi Defense Group (2). FURTHER Defendant's motion to compel. Doc. 55 discussed. Court will review the cases and briefs submitted and issue a ruling. FURTHER ORDERED Status Conference set for 12/2/2014 at 02:00 PM before Judge David G Campbell. FURTHER ORDERED Jury Trial reset for 1/13/2015 at 09:00 AM before Judge David G Campbell. (Court Reporter Elaine Cropper.) Hearing held 1:29 PM to 2:34 PM. (cc: Counsel) (MAP) *Modified to add date of hearing in text on 10/21/2014 (CEI). (Entered: 10/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group re: 55 MOTION to Compel Discovery. (MAP) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group re: 55 MOTION to Compel. (MAP) (Entered: 10/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        INITIAL MOTION to Compel Discovery by Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group. (MAP) (Entered: 10/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 52 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages on their Initial Motion to Compel Discovery as to Marc Turi (1), Turi Defense Group (2). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/2/14. (cc: Dfts' Cnsl) (MAP) (Entered: 10/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            *FILED at Doc. 55 *Sealed Lodged Proposed Motion to Compel Discover re Motion 52 by Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (LAD) *Modified on 10/3/2014 (MAP)*. (Entered: 09/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (re Inital Motion to Compel Discovery) by Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (LAD) (Entered: 09/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                *TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group held on 9/3/14 before Judge David G Campbell. Court Reporter: Patricia Lyons. Type of Hearing: Pretrial Conference. (LAD) *Modified file date from 9/3 to 9/19 on 9/22/2014 (CEI). (Entered: 09/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 47 Motion to Temporarily Unseal Pretrial Conference Transcripts of 9/3/14 as to Marc Turi (1), Turi Defense Group (2). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/11/14. (cc: AUSA)(MAP) (Entered: 09/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group re: 30 MOTION to Strike. (MAP) (Entered: 09/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by USA as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group for proceedings held on 9/3/14, Judge David G Campbell hearing judge(s). (MAP) (Entered: 09/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Temporarily Unseal Pretrial Conference Transcripts by USA as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group. (MAP) (Entered: 09/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Marc Turi re: 12 MOTION to Dismiss Indictment. (MAP) (Entered: 09/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 40 Motion to Continue Trial filed as to Marc Turi (1), Turi Defense Group (2). ORDERED Jury Trial Continued to 11/4/2014 at 09:00 AM before Judge David G Campbell. Pretrial Motions deadline continued to 10/3/2014. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/4/14. (cc: AUSA/Dfts' Cnsl/PTS/USMS) (MAP) (Entered: 09/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              *MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell: Pretrial Conference re Classified Information Procedures Act as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group held on 9/3/2014. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 12 ) discussed. Defendant has no objections to Court ruling without oral argument. Court will review and consider the Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 12 ) and Motion to strike (Doc. 30 ) at the same time, and notify the parties if further argument is needed on the motions. FURTHER granting 35 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendant, by 9/8/14, shall submit a renewed Rule 16 letter to the Government. Government to respond by 9/15/14. If defendant is not satisfied with the response, defendant shall file a motion to compel by 9/22/14. Government response due by 10/3/14. Defendant reply due by 10/10/14. A hearing on the motion to compel will be set for 10/17/14 at 1:30 p.m. before Judge David G Campbell. FURTHER Defendant's Motion to Continue Trial (Doc. 40 ) discussed. Court will reset trial to 11/4/14 without objections. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) Hearing held 2:04 PM to 3:04 PM. (cc: Counsel)(MAP) *Modified on 9/4/2014 to Correct File Date (MAP)*. (Entered: 09/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF CO-COUNSEL: William Mackie appearing for USA. (MAP) (Entered: 09/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group re: 12 Initial Motion to Dismiss Indictment. (MAP) (Entered: 09/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group re: 30 MOTION to Strike Surplusage from the Indictment. (MAP) (Entered: 08/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Continue Trial by Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group. (MAP) (Entered: 08/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group That the Pretrial Conference is Reset to 9/3/2014 at 02:00 PM before Judge David G Campbell. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/22/14. (cc: All Cnsl) (MAP) (Entered: 08/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          *FILED at Doc. 46 * LODGED Proposed Response to Defendnat's Initial Motion to Dismiss by USA as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group re: 35 motion to seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if motion to seal is granted. (MAP) *Modified on 9/4/2014 (MAP)*. (Entered: 08/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by USA as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group. (MAP) (Entered: 08/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 32 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Defendant's Initial Motion to Dismiss Indictment is extended to 8/20/14 at 5:00p.m. as to Marc Turi (1). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/15/14. (cc: AUSA/Dfns Cnsl) (MAP) (Entered: 08/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SECOND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response re: 12 MOTION to Dismiss Indictment by USA as to Marc Turi. (MAP) (Entered: 08/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group re: 17 MOTION to Expedite Pretrial Conference Pursuant to Classified Information Procedures Act. (MAP) (Entered: 08/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Strike Surplusage from Indictment by Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group. (MAP) (Entered: 08/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group re: 17 MOTION to Expedite Pretrial Conference Pursuant to Classified Information Procedures Act. (MAP) (Entered: 08/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response as to Marc Turi (1). ORDERED that the Government's time to file a responsive pleading to Defendant's Initial Motion to Dismiss Indictment is extended to 8/15/14 at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/5/14. (cc: AUSA/Dft's Cnsl) (MAP) (Entered: 08/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 17 Motion to Expedite Pretrial Conference as to Marc Turi (1). ORDERED Pretrial Conference set for 8/22/2014 at 02:00 PM before Judge David G Campbell. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/4/14. (cc: All Cnsl) (MAP) (Entered: 08/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RECEIPT for Surrender of Passport as to Marc Turi, Passport Nos. 434581659 and 508094802 issued by USA. Defendant not permitted to apply for the issuance of a passport/passport card during the pendency of this action. (cc: DOS/Dft's Cnsl) (MAP) (Entered: 07/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Summons Returned Executed on 7/25/2014 as to Turi Defense Group. (MAP) (Entered: 07/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Turi Defense Group. (cc: AUSA/Dft's Cnsl/DGC) (MAP) (Entered: 07/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David K Duncan: Initial Appearance as to Turi Defense Group held on 7/30/2014. Arraignment held on 7/30/2014. Defendant enters plea of NOT guilty to all pending counts. Pretrial Motions due by 8/11/2014. Jury Trial set for 9/9/2014 at 09:00 AM before Judge David G Campbell. OTHER: Summons executed on 7/25/2014. (Recorded by COURTSMART.) Hearing held 10:57 AM to 10:58 AM. (cc: AUSA/Dfns Cnsl/DGC)(MAP) (Entered: 07/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response re: 12 MOTION to Dismiss Indictment by USA as to Marc Turi. (MAP) (Entered: 07/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Set Expedited Pretrial Conference Pursuant to Classified Information Procedures Act by Marc Turi. (MAP) (Entered: 07/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ARREST Warrant Returned Executed on 7/22/2014 as to Marc Turi. (MAP) (Entered: 07/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss Indictment by Marc Turi. (MAP) (Entered: 07/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Marc Turi. Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 7/22/14. (cc: AUSA/Dft's Cnsl/Dft/PROB/PTS/USMS)(MAP) (Entered: 07/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David K Duncan: Initial Appearance as to Marc Turi held on 7/22/2014. FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT TAKEN. Appointment of Counsel Hearing held. Appointing Jean-Jacques Cabou (CJA). Arraignment as to Marc Turi held on 7/22/2014. Defendant enters plea of NOT guilty to all pending counts. Pretrial Motions deadline: 21 days. Jury Trial set for 9/9/2014 at 09:00 AM before Judge David G Campbell. Detention Hearing Submitted. Defendant ordered released. OTHER: Counsel also appears on behalf of the Turi Defense Group listed as co-defendant. (Recorded by COURTSMART.) Hearing held 4:06 PM to 4:13 PM. (cc: AUSA/Dft's Cnsl/PTS/CD) (MAP) (Entered: 07/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF NO PROBABLE JUDGE CONFLICT re: Magistrate Judge Steven P Logan filed by USA as to Marc Turi, Turi Defense Group. (MAP) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  INDICTMENT as to Marc Turi (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, Turi Defense Group (2) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4. (MAP) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 3,638 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?