Landmark Technology LLC v. PANERA BREAD COMPANY
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:14-cv-00899

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 1, 2017 at 11:19 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Landmark Technology, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Parker, Bunt & Ainsworth, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles Ainsworth +1 903 531 3535 +1 903 533 9687 charley@pbatyler.com
Space Robert Christopher Bunt +1 903 531 3535 +1 903 533 9687 rcbunt@pbatyler.com
v.
No Logo PANERA BREAD COMPANY, Defendant
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Case Assigned/Reassigned
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None Return of Service Executed
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None Summons Issued
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Christopher Bunt on behalf of Landmark Technology LLC (Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 12/09/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None Jury Demand
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None
                    DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Landmark Technology LLC. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 12/09/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None
                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Landmark Technology LLC (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 12/09/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None
                            Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 12/09/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None Complaint
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 67 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?