Landmark Technology, LLC v. Weightwatchers.com, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:14-cv-00902

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 1, 2017 at 2:14 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Landmark Technology, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Parker, Bunt & Ainsworth, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles Ainsworth +1 903 531 3535 +1 903 533 9687 charley@pbatyler.com
Space Robert Christopher Bunt +1 903 531 3535 +1 903 533 9687 rcbunt@pbatyler.com
v.
No Logo Weight Watchers International, Inc., Defendant
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None Stay
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None Counterclaim
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Case Assigned/Reassigned
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None Return of Service Executed
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None Summons Issued
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Christopher Bunt on behalf of Landmark Technology, LLC (Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 12/09/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None Jury Demand
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None
                                    DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Landmark Technology, LLC. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 12/09/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None
                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Landmark Technology, LLC (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 12/09/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None
                                            Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 12/09/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None Complaint
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 52 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?