Ryan v. Judicial Branch
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:12-cv-01282

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 5, 2019 at 3:32 PM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Kristine Ryan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Furniss & Quinn

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Rose Longo-McLean +1 203 562 9931 r.l.mclean@snet.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
v.
No Logo Judicial Branch, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Connecticut Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Josephine S. Graff +1 860 808 5340 +1 860 808 5383 Josephine.Graff@ct.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 12/16/2014 Matthew Larock +1 860 808 5340 +1 860 808 5383 matthew.laRock@ct.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erik Thebin Lohr +1 860 808 5340 +1 860 808 5383 Erik.Lohr@ct.gov
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 2601
Nature of Suit 790 - Labor: Other
  Entries (78) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER APPROVING re 68 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Judicial Branch Signed by Clerk on 6/15/15.(Johnson, D.) (Entered: 06/15/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: 6/12/2015 Unknown Document Type
    STIPULATION of Dismissal of case with prejudice by Judicial Branch. (Lohr, Erik)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The parties have reported that this action has been settled in full. Rather than continue to keep the case open on the docket, the Clerk is directed to administratively close the file without prejudice to reopening on or before April 27, 2015. If the parties wish to file a stipulation of dismissal (for approval by the Court or simply for inclusion in the Court's file), they may do so on or before April 27, 2015. The dates set forth in this order may be extended for good cause pursuant to a motion filed in accordance with Local Rule 7. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 3/27/15.(Bradley, K.) (Entered: 03/27/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER. The Court GRANTS the parties' motion 65 for an extension of time until March 27, 2015 to file their Joint Trial Memorandum. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 3/13/15. (Bradley, K.) (Entered: 03/13/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: 3/12/2015 Unknown Document Type
          Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until March 27, 2015 to File Joint Trial Memorandum by Judicial Branch. (Lohr, Erik)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ORDER. The Court GRANTS the parties' motion 63 for a forty-five (45) day extension until March 12, 2015 for the filing of their Joint Trial Memorandum. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 1/19/15. (Bradley, K.) (Entered: 01/19/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: 1/16/2015 Unknown Document Type
              Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until March 12, 2015 Joint Trial Memorandum Set Deadlines/Hearings, 61 Order by Kristine Ryan. (Longo-McLean, Rose)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William I. Garfinkel: Follow-up Telephone Settlement Conference held on 12/17/2014 instead of 12/18/2014. 45 minutes (Sanders, C.) (Entered: 12/17/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  ORDER. The parties' joint trial memorandum is due on or before January 26, 2015. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 12/16/14. (Bradley, K.) (Entered: 12/16/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ORDER. The Court GRANTS Attorney Larock's 58 motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Matthew Larock terminated. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 12/16/14. (Bradley, K.) (Entered: 12/16/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Follow-up Telephone Settlement Conference is set for 12/18/2014 @ 11:30 AM before Judge William I. Garfinkel. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the phone call. Once all counsel are on the line, contact chambers at 203-579-5593. (Sanders, C.) (Entered: 12/09/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: 12/8/2014 Unknown Document Type
                        MOTION for Matthew LaRock to Withdraw as Attorney by Judicial Branch. (Lohr, Erik)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: 12/8/2014 Unknown Document Type
                          NOTICE of Appearance by Erik Thebin Lohr on behalf of Judicial Branch (Lohr, Erik)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            Minute Entry for continuing settlement discussions held before Judge William I. Garfinkel: Status Conference held on 9/2/2014. and 20 minutes (Smith, M.) (Entered: 09/02/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Follow-up Telephone Settlement Conference is set for 9/2/2014 @ 1:00 PM before Judge William I. Garfinkel. Plaintiff's Attorney Rose Longo-McLean is requested to initiate this phone call. Once all parties are on the line, contact chambers at 203-579-5593. (Sanders, C.) (Entered: 08/26/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William I. Garfinkel: Settlement Conference held on 8/6/2014. Mediation discussions are on going amongst the parties. Counsel shall follow up with the court on or before August 29, 2014. 30 minutes (Sanders, C.) (Entered: 08/06/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.Defendant's Attorney report on July 25, 2014 that mediation discussions are on going. A Follow-up Telephone Settlement Conference to check status is set for 8/6/2014 @ 1:00 PM before Judge William I. Garfinkel. Plaintiff's Attorney Rose Longo-McLean is requested to initiate this phone call. Once all parties are on the line, contact chambers at 203-579-5593. (Sanders, C.) (Entered: 07/30/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William I. Garfinkel: Follow-up Telephone Settlement Conference held on 7/16/2014. Mediation discussions on going. Counsel will follow-up with the court as to status on or before July 24, 2014. 30 minutes (Sanders, C.) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William I. Garfinkel: Settlement Conference held on 7/2/2014. Case not settled. Mediation discussions on going. (Follow-up Telephone Settlement Conference set for 7/16/2014 @ 11:45 AM before Judge William I. Garfinkel. Plaintiff's Attorney Rose Longo-McLean is requested to initiate this phone call. Once all parties are on the line, contact chambers at 203-579-5593.). Total Time: 2 hours and 30 minutes (Sanders, C.) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William I. Garfinkel: Telephone Pre-Settlement Conference held on 6/2/2014, ( Settlement Conference set for 7/2/2014 @ 10:00 AM in Magistrate Courtroom, 4th Floor, Room 435, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge William I. Garfinkel. Counsel shall check in with Judge Garfinkel's chambers, room 429 prior to the conference. THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE MEMO IS ATTACHED FOR REVIEW). 30 minutes (Sanders, C.) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Larock on behalf of Judicial Branch (Larock, Matthew) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.Telephone Pre-Settlement Conference set for 6/2/2014 @ 4:00 PM before Judge William I. Garfinkel. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate this call. Once all parties are on the line, please contact Chambers at (203)579-5593. A date for the settlement conference will be set during the telephone call. As the Court requires parties or their representatives with settlement authority to attend the settlement conference, counsel should obtain dates of unavailability from their clients over the next 160 days and have their own calendars available to aid in the scheduling. During the telephone call, counsel should be prepared to discuss what information needs to be exchanged and anything else that needs to be accomplished prior to the settlement conference for the discussions to be productive. This telephone conference will not be rescheduled based on requests from counsel. If counsel is not available at the scheduled time, please arrange for coverage by another lawyer who will have the necessary background knowledge to participate. (Sanders, C.) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William I. Garfinkel for Settlement Conference Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 5/19/14.(Johnson, D.) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                ORDER adopting 45 Recommended Ruling; denying 32 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 5/13/2014. (Best, Z) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  RECOMMENDED RULING denying 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Judicial Branch 22 Pages. Objections due by 4/22/2014. Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 4/8/2014.(Smith, M.) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    RESPONSE re 39 Reply to Response to Motion, 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Kristine Ryan. (Barrille, J.) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER granting 42 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Surreply. Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 3/5/2014. (Smith, M.) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Sur Reply in Response to Defendant's Reply [Doc # 39] by Kristine Ryan. Motions referred to William I. Garfinkel(Barrille, J.) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          ENTERED IN ERROR RESPONSE re 39 Reply to Response to Motion Sur Reply- Motion for Leave to file filed by Kristine Ryan. (Longo-McLean, Rose) Modified on 3/5/2014 and will be correctly docketed as two separate entries - a motion for leave and a sur reply. (Barrille, J.). (Entered: 03/04/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William I. Garfinkel for all pretrial matters excluding trial, unless the parties consent to trial before the magistrate judge. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 2/21/14.Motions referred to William I. Garfinkel(Johnson, D.) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              REPLY to Response to 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Judicial Branch. (Graff, Josephine) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER. Defendant's 37 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. Defendant shall file a reply brief by February 19, 2014. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 1/8/2014. (Best, Z) (Entered: 01/08/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment until February 19, 2014 by Judicial Branch. (Graff, Josephine) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Memorandum in Opposition re 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Kristine Ryan. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Material Facts, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Longo-McLean, Rose) (Entered: 01/05/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting 34 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's 32 Motion for Summary Judgment on or before January 6, 2014. The Court is unlikely to grant further extensions of this deadline. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 11/19/2013. (Best, Z) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment until Jan. 6, 2014 by Kristine Ryan. (Longo-McLean, Rose) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Rose Longo-McLean on behalf of Kristine Ryan (Longo-McLean, Rose) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment by Judicial Branch.Responses due by 11/22/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Statement of Material Facts, # 3 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit H, # 12 Exhibit I)(Graff, Josephine) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER. In light of the parties' 30 Joint Status Report, the telephonic status conference scheduled for 8/29/2013 at 09:00 AM is hereby CANCELED. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 8/20/2013. (Best, Z) (Entered: 08/20/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Joint STATUS REPORT by Judicial Branch, Kristine Ryan. (Graff, Josephine) (Entered: 08/09/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                  NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. The telephonic status conference previously scheduled for 8/19/2013 at 04:00 PM has been RESCHEDULED to 8/29/2013 at 09:00 AM before Judge Michael P. Shea. (Best, Z) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Michael P. Shea for all further proceedings. Signed by Clerk on 1/2/13. (Bauer, J.) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                      ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 22 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and granting 22 Motion to Vacate, over defendant's objection (Dkt. #23), in light of plaintiff's dire financial situation. (Dkt #26). THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 12/4/12. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 12/04/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT re 25 Order, Signed By Kristine Ryan filed by Kristine Ryan. (Williams, John) (Entered: 12/03/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          ELECTRONIC ORDER -- In order to ensure that the Court has as complete financial information as possible regarding plaintiff in order to rule on this pending motion, on or before December 10, 2012, plaintiff shall complete the financial affidavit which is provided on this Court's webpage. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 11/30/12. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joan G. Margolis for Motion including 22 Second MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis MOTION to Vacate. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 11/27/12. Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Torday, B.) (Entered: 11/27/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              RESPONSE re 22 Second MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Judicial Branch. (Graff, Josephine) (Entered: 11/27/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Second MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kristine Ryan. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Williams, John). Added Renewed MOTION to Vacate 13 Order for Bond on 11/27/2012 (Malone, P.). (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER denying 14 Motion to Vacate, without prejudice to renew. While plaintiff's affidavit describes poverty, it does not reference assets. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 11/16/12. (Tooker, A.) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    ORDER granting 19 MOTION for Extension of Time until January 4, 2013 To Respond to Defendants' Interrogatories and Requests for Production. Signed by Clerk on 11/9/2012. (Malone, P.) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time until January 4, 2013 To Respond to Defendants' Interrogatories and Requests for Production by Kristine Ryan. (Williams, John) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses by Judicial Branch.(Graff, Josephine) (Entered: 11/05/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER:Telephone Status Conference set for 8/19/2013 04:00 PM before Judge Janet Bond Arterton; Amended Pleadings due by 10/27/2012; Discovery due by 10/1/2013; Dispositive Motions due by 11/1/2013; Status Report due by 8/12/2013; Trial Ready Date 5/1/2014 Trial Brief due by 12/1/2013. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 10/16/16. (Torday, B.) (Entered: 10/17/2012)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            RESPONSE re 14 MOTION to Vacate 13 Order on Motion for Security for Costs, Order on Motion for Extension of Time,,,, and For Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Judicial Branch. (Graff, Josephine) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/6/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Williams, John) (Entered: 10/06/2012)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                MOTION to Vacate 13 Order on Motion for Security for Costs, Order on Motion for Extension of Time,,,, and For Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Kristine Ryan. (Williams, John) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 11 Motion for Security for Costs. The defendant(s) having made application to the Clerk of Court for an order requiring the plaintiff(s) to deposit or file a bond with sufficient surety in the sum of $500.00 pursuant to Local Rule 83.3(a) of the Rules of Civil Procedure for the United States District of Connecticut, it is ORDERED that the plaintiff(s) herein file a bond as security for costs in this action within thirty (30) days from this date ; granting 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until October 27, 2012 to file responsive pleading. Signed by Clerk on 9/27/12. (Malone, P.) (Entered: 09/27/2012)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until October 27, 2012 to file responsive pleading by Judicial Branch. (Graff, Josephine) (Entered: 09/26/2012)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      MOTION for Security for Costs by Judicial Branch. (Graff, Josephine) (Entered: 09/26/2012)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Josephine S. Graff on behalf of Judicial Branch (Graff, Josephine) (Entered: 09/26/2012)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kristine Ryan. Judicial Branch served on 9/6/2012, answer due 9/27/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Marshal's Return)(Williams, John) (Entered: 09/10/2012)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 1 Complaint, filed by Kristine Ryan, 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 6 Electronic Filing Order, 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Kristine Ryan, 3 Docket Annotation, 7 Protective Order. Signed by Clerk on 9/5/2012. (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 09/05/2012)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 9/4/2012. (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 09/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 9/4/2012. (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 09/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 12/4/2012. Amended Pleadings due by 11/3/2012 Discovery due by 3/6/2013 Dispositive Motions due by 4/5/2013. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 9/4/2012. (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 09/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Judicial Branch* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John R. Williams* *51 Elm Street Suite 409* *New Haven, CT 06510*. (Falcone, K.) (Entered: 09/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      Docket Entry Correction re 1 Complaint - added corrected pdf. (Walker, J.) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Williams on behalf of Kristine Ryan (Williams, John) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against Judicial Branch of The State of Connecticut ( Filing fee $350 receipt number 0205-2615144.), filed by Kristine Ryan.(Williams, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/4/2012: # 1 PDF of complaint with electronic signature) (Walker, J.). (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Johnson, D.)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            Set Deadlines: Joint Trial Brief due by 3/27/2015 (Johnson, D.)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              Set Deadlines: Trial Brief due by 3/12/2015 (Johnson, D.)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                Set Deadlines: Joint Trial Brief due by 1/26/2015 (Johnson, D.)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  Set Deadlines as to 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Responses due by 2/19/2014 (Johnson, D.)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    Set Deadlines as to 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Responses due by 1/6/2014 (Johnson, D.)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      Answer deadline updated for Judicial Branch to 10/27/2012. (Malone, P.)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Judicial Branch of The State of Connecticut. (Williams, John)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          Judge Janet Bond Arterton added. (Malone, P.)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?