United States v. $75,000 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:14-cv-07633

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 15, 2019 at 2:09 AM ST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 881
Nature of Suit Drug Related Seizure of Property
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 7 Motion for Default Judgment and Order of Forfeiture ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. Signed by Judge William H. Walls on 5/26/2015. (ld, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    OPINION. Signed by Judge William H. Walls on 5/26/2015. (ld, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None Default Judgment
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None request for default
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/31/2014, Entered: None Letter
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None Warrant Issued
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None Complaint
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 1 time.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?