Orentreich v. Richard
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-11349-RGS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Craig R. Jalbert, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley Hoag LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space KENNETH SCOTT LEONETTI +1 617 832 1000 +1 617 832 7000 kleonetti@foleyhoag.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley Hoag LLP (Boston)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Zane Schwartz +1 617 832 1000 +1 617 832 7000 aschwartz@foleyhoag.com
v.
No Logo Wayne Richard, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Duane Morris LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul D. Moore +1 617 289 9230 +1 617 289 9201 pdmoore@duanemorris.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Roach & Carpenter, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space M. Ellen Carpenter +1 617 720 1800 +1 617 720 0720
Office Boston
Filed 6/15/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Essex
Terminated 1/31/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: 1/31/2007 Terminated Case
Civil Case Terminated. (Flaherty, Elaine)
    LREF
    Legal Document 17 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: 1/30/2007 Stipulation of Dismissal
    STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice with attached Certificate of Service by Wayne Richard, Craig R. Jalbert. (Schwartz, Andrew)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 10/25/2006, Entered: 10/25/2006 Order on Motion to Continue
      Judge Richard G. Stearns : Electronic ORDER entered granting [16] Motion to Continue : "Based on the information contained in the Joint Motion to Continue Trial filed by counsel, the November 6, 2006 trial date is re-scheduled to MONDAY, 2/26/2007 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Richard G. Stearns. Jury empanelment set for 2/26/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Richard G. Stearns. All Trial Documents pursuant to the previously-issued Trial Order shall be filed with the clerk on or before February 20, 2007 unless the case is reported settled. SO ORDERED." Richard G. Stearns, USDJ. (Johnson, Mary) Modified on 10/25/2006 (Johnson, Mary).
        LREF
        Legal Document 16 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: 10/24/2006, Terminated: 10/25/2006 Motion to Continue
        Joint MOTION to Continue Trial to February 5, 2007 with c/s by Wayne Richard, Craig R. Jalbert.(Carpenter, M.)
          LREF
          Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: 7/24/2006 Notice of Appearance/
          NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth S. Leonetti on behalf of Craig R. Jalbert (Leonetti, Kenneth)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 7/18/2006, Entered: 7/19/2006 Order on Motion to Substitute Party
            Judge Richard G. Stearns : Electronic ORDER entered granting [14] Motion to Substitute Party. Craig R. Jalbert rep by Paul D. Moore added. Norman Orentreich terminated (Flaherty, Elaine)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: 7/17/2006 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
              Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: 13 and 14 corrected because: documents missing signature (Flaherty, Elaine)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 7/13/2006, Entered: 7/17/2006 Order on Motion to Continue
                Judge Richard G. Stearns : Electronic ORDER entered granting [13] Motion to Continue. "Trial is re-scheduled to MONDAY, NOVEMBER 6,2006 AT 9:00 A.M. All Trial Documents pursuant to the previously-issued Trial Order shall be filed with the clerk on or before October 31, 2006. If counsel wish to use the Court's mediation program, they may contact the clerk." R. G. Stearns, USDJ. (Johnson, Mary) Modified on 7/17/2006 (Johnson, Mary).
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: 7/12/2006, Terminated: 7/18/2006 Motion to Substitute Party
                  Assented to MOTION to Substitute Party Craig R. Jalbert, Liquidating Trustee As Plantiff by Norman Orentreich. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Roberts, Bronwyn) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/17/2006 (Flaherty, Elaine).
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document 13 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: 7/12/2006, Terminated: 7/13/2006 Motion to Continue
                    Joint MOTION to Continue trial to 10/23/2006 by Norman Orentreich.(Roberts, Bronwyn) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/17/2006 (Flaherty, Elaine).
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 11/30/2005 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                      Judge Richard G. Stearns : Electronic ORDER entered granting [12] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Roger W. Rosendahl for Norman Orentreich, Jeffrey A. Fuisz for Norman Orentreich (filing fee receipt 68351) (Flaherty, Elaine)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 12 Filed: 11/17/2005, Entered: 11/17/2005, Terminated: 11/30/2005 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                        Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Roger W. Rosendahl and Jeffrey A. Fuisz by Norman Orentreich. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B)(Roberts, Bronwyn)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/18/2005 Order on Motion to Continue
                        Judge Richard G. Stearns : Electronic ORDER entered granting [11] Motion to Continue. Jury Selection set for 7/24/2006 09:00 AM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Richard G. Stearns. Jury Trial set for 7/24/2006 09:00 AM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Richard G. Stearns. (Johnson, Mary)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 11 Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: 11/10/2005, Terminated: 11/16/2005 Motion to Continue
                          Assented to MOTION to Continue Trial Date to July 2006 by Norman Orentreich.(Roberts, Bronwyn)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 10 Filed: 9/20/2005, Entered: 9/20/2005 Procedural Order re pretrial/trialCourt Filing
                            Judge Richard G. Stearns : Electronic ORDER entered. PROCEDURAL ORDER re trial: Jury Trial set for 1/17/2006 09:00 AM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Richard G. Stearns.(Johnson, Mary)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: 3/9/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                              Judge Richard G. Stearns : Electronic ORDER entered granting [9] Motion for Extension of Time (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/1/2005, Entered: 3/4/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                MOTION for Extension of Time to 4/5/05 to complete discovery by Norman Orentreich, Wayne Richard and to 5/4/05 for dispositive motions, filed..(Flaherty, Elaine)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: 2/8/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete
                                  Judge Richard G. Stearns : Electronic ORDER entered granting [8] Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: 1/26/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to 12/31/04 to Complete Discovery and file dispositive motions by Norman Orentreich, Wayne Richard.(Flaherty, Elaine)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: 1/6/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete
                                      Judge Richard G. Stearns : ElectronicORDER entered granting [7] Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 7 Filed: 12/30/2004, Entered: 1/5/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to 12/31/04 to Complete Discovery; to 2/1/05 for dispositive motions by Norman Orentreich, Wayne Richard.(Flaherty, Elaine)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 9/1/2004, Entered: 9/7/2004 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                          CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Norman Orentreich, Wayne Richard.(Flaherty, Elaine)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 9/1/2004, Entered: 9/16/2004 Scheduling Conference
                                            Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Stearns : Scheduling Conference held on 9/1/2004. Atty. Roberts present for the pltf. Atty. Carpenter present for the deft. All fact discovery shall be completed by 12-31-04; dispositive motions shall be filed by 2-1-05 with responses due 14 days thereafter. (Court Reporter None.) (Johnson, Mary) Modified on 9/16/2004 (Johnson, Mary).
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: 8/31/2004 Joint statement re scheduling conference
                                              JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/2/2004, Entered: 8/3/2004 Notice of Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 9/1/2004 04:00 PM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Richard G. Stearns. (Johnson, Mary)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/8/2004, Entered: 7/8/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed Wayne Richard served on 6/17/2004, answer due 7/7/2004. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/7/2004, Entered: 7/20/2004 Answer
                                                    ANSWER to Complaint by Wayne Richard.(Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/17/2004 Complaint
                                                      COMPLAINT Filing fee: $ 150, receipt number 56621, filed by Norman Orentreich.(Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/17/2004 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                                        If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Bowler. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/17/2004 Summons Issued
                                                          Summons Issued as to Wayne Richard. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                            LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 130 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?