Cellular Communications Equipment LLC v. BlackBerry Limited et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:13-cv-00510

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 19, 2017 at 2:16 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cellular Communications Equipment LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brent Nelson Bumgardner +1 817 377 3490 +1 817 377 3485 brent@nelbum.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Christopher Cecil +1 817 806 3812 +1 817 377 3485 tcecil@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Brannon Latimer +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 blatimer@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward R. Nelson, III +1 817 377 9111 ed@nelbum.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 2400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/20/2014 Michael J. Fagan, Jr. +1 214 627 9975 mfagan@chenmalin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claire Abernathy Henry +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 claire@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@jwfirm.com
v.
AT&T, Inc. AT&T, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Ncr Corp
Unknown Role, At Home Corp
Unknown Role, Net2phone, Inc.
Unknown Role, Mail.com, Inc.
AT&T Mobility LLC AT&T Mobility LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roshan Suresh Mansinghani +1 214 953 6737 +1 214 661 4737 roshan.mansinghani@bakerbotts.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kurt Max Pankratz +1 214 953 6584 +1 214 661 4584 kurt.pankratz@bakerbotts.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Eugene Cadwell +1 713 469 3861 +1 713 469 3899 kcadwell@reedsmith.com
No Logo Blackberry Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roshan Suresh Mansinghani +1 214 953 6737 +1 214 661 4737 roshan.mansinghani@bakerbotts.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kurt Max Pankratz +1 214 953 6584 +1 214 661 4584 kurt.pankratz@bakerbotts.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Harrison Gheens Rich +1 214 953 6896 +1 214 661 4896 harrison.rich@bakerbotts.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Eugene Cadwell +1 713 469 3861 +1 713 469 3899 kcadwell@reedsmith.com
BlackBerry Ltd. BlackBerry Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "BlackBerry Limited"

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roshan Suresh Mansinghani +1 214 953 6737 +1 214 661 4737 roshan.mansinghani@bakerbotts.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kurt Max Pankratz +1 214 953 6584 +1 214 661 4584 kurt.pankratz@bakerbotts.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Harrison Gheens Rich +1 214 953 6896 +1 214 661 4896 harrison.rich@bakerbotts.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Eugene Cadwell +1 713 469 3861 +1 713 469 3899 kcadwell@reedsmith.com
No Logo Boost Mobile, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rouse Hendricks German May PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark W McGrory +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 mark.mcgrory@eriseip.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence A Rouse +1 816 471 7711 +1 816 471 2221 larryr@rhgm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Weber LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert William Weber +1 903 223 5656 +1 903 223 5652 bweber@smithweber.com
No Logo Cellco Partnership, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roshan Suresh Mansinghani +1 214 953 6737 +1 214 661 4737 roshan.mansinghani@bakerbotts.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kurt Max Pankratz +1 214 953 6584 +1 214 661 4584 kurt.pankratz@bakerbotts.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV +1 903 597 8311 patrickclutter@potterminton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Eugene Cadwell +1 713 469 3861 +1 713 469 3899 kcadwell@reedsmith.com
Sprint Nextel Corporation Sprint Nextel Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roshan Suresh Mansinghani +1 214 953 6737 +1 214 661 4737 roshan.mansinghani@bakerbotts.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kurt Max Pankratz +1 214 953 6584 +1 214 661 4584 kurt.pankratz@bakerbotts.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rouse Hendricks German May PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark W McGrory +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 mark.mcgrory@eriseip.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence A Rouse +1 816 471 7711 +1 816 471 2221 larryr@rhgm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Weber LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert William Weber +1 903 223 5656 +1 903 223 5652 bweber@smithweber.com
No Logo Sprint Solutions, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roshan Suresh Mansinghani +1 214 953 6737 +1 214 661 4737 roshan.mansinghani@bakerbotts.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kurt Max Pankratz +1 214 953 6584 +1 214 661 4584 kurt.pankratz@bakerbotts.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Eugene Cadwell +1 713 469 3861 +1 713 469 3899 kcadwell@reedsmith.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rouse Hendricks German May PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark W McGrory +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 mark.mcgrory@eriseip.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence A Rouse +1 816 471 7711 +1 816 471 2221 larryr@rhgm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Weber LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert William Weber +1 903 223 5656 +1 903 223 5652 bweber@smithweber.com
No Logo Sprint Spectrum, LP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roshan Suresh Mansinghani +1 214 953 6737 +1 214 661 4737 roshan.mansinghani@bakerbotts.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kurt Max Pankratz +1 214 953 6584 +1 214 661 4584 kurt.pankratz@bakerbotts.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Eugene Cadwell +1 713 469 3861 +1 713 469 3899 kcadwell@reedsmith.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rouse Hendricks German May PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark W McGrory +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 mark.mcgrory@eriseip.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence A Rouse +1 816 471 7711 +1 816 471 2221 larryr@rhgm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Weber LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert William Weber +1 903 223 5656 +1 903 223 5652 bweber@smithweber.com
T-Mobile USA, Inc. T-Mobile USA, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roshan Suresh Mansinghani +1 214 953 6737 +1 214 661 4737 roshan.mansinghani@bakerbotts.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kurt Max Pankratz +1 214 953 6584 +1 214 661 4584 kurt.pankratz@bakerbotts.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roshan Suresh Mansinghani +1 214 953 6737 +1 214 661 4737 roshan.mansinghani@bakerbotts.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kurt Max Pankratz +1 214 953 6584 +1 214 661 4584 kurt.pankratz@bakerbotts.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Eugene Cadwell +1 713 469 3861 +1 713 469 3899 kcadwell@reedsmith.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Eugene Cadwell +1 713 469 3861 +1 713 469 3899 kcadwell@reedsmith.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas James Dixon +1 949 226 6741 +1 888 775 0898 DDixon@hueston.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas James Dixon +1 949 226 6741 +1 888 775 0898 DDixon@hueston.com
Verizon Communications, Inc. Verizon Communications, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roshan Suresh Mansinghani +1 214 953 6737 +1 214 661 4737 roshan.mansinghani@bakerbotts.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kurt Max Pankratz +1 214 953 6584 +1 214 661 4584 kurt.pankratz@bakerbotts.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV +1 903 597 8311 patrickclutter@potterminton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com
  Entries (73) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin Eugene Cadwell on behalf of T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Cadwell, Kevin) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Harrison Gheens Rich on behalf of BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited (Rich, Harrison) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kurt Max Pankratz on behalf of T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Pankratz, Kurt) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roshan Suresh Mansinghani on behalf of T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Mansinghani, Roshan) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
              ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roshan Suresh Mansinghani on behalf of BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited (Mansinghani, Roshan) Modified on 6/26/2014 (mjc, ). (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kurt Max Pankratz on behalf of BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited (Pankratz, Kurt) Modified on 6/26/2014 (mjc, ). (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER denying as moot 43 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/25/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
                    ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim by BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pankratz, Kurt) Modified on 4/8/2014 (sm, ). (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
                      AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin Eugene Cadwell on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC, BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited, Cellco Partnership Inc., Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P. (Cadwell, Kevin) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION consolidating cases 6:13cv507, 6:13cv508, 6:13cv509, 6:13cv510, 6:13cv511, 6:13cv568, 6:13cv569, 6:13cv584 and 6:13cv738 for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. Lead case is 6:13cv507. The Clerk of the Court shall add the consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as Lead and Local Counsel only. Any other counsel who wishes to appear in the lead case shall file a notice of appearance in that case. Individual cases remain active for venue motions and trial, and all pending motions will be considered as filed. All future motions, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the consolidated case. Parties shall submit a single Docket Control Order by 3/15/2014, and a single Discovery, ESI, and Protective Order by 3/21/2014. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/27/14. (mjc, ) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER granting 58 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael James Fagan, Jr terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/20/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
                              NOTICE by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC REGARDING SPECIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
                                Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER setting Initial Case Management Conference for 2/26/2014 02:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/03/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Deutsche Telekom AG, Corporate Parent T-Mobile Global Holding GmbH, Corporate Parent T-Mobile Global Zwischenholding GmbH, Corporate Parent T-Mobile US, Inc., Corporate Parent Deutsche Telekom Holding B.V. for T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Dixon, Douglas) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by T-Mobile US, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Deutsche Telekom AG, Corporate Parent T-Mobile Global Holding GmbH, Corporate Parent T-Mobile Global Zwischenholding GmbH, Corporate Parent Deutsche Telekom Holding B.V. for T-Mobile US, Inc.. (Dixon, Douglas) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT SPRINT NEXTEL CORPORATION granting 53 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. Sprint Nextel Corporation terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/26/13. (mjc, ) (Entered: 12/26/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None
                                          STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice As To Defendant Sprint Nextel Corporation (N/K/A Sprint Communications, Inc.) by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC Of Readiness For Scheduling Conference (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                              SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 43 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Lawrence A Rouse on behalf of Boost Mobile, LLC, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4402849. (Rouse, Lawrence) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark W McGrory on behalf of Boost Mobile, LLC (McGrory, Mark) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 43 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited, Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Pankratz, Kurt) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER that the Clerk of the Court change the docket sheet in this case to reflect the correct names of the following two Defendants in the above-styled case: Research in Motion Corporation shall be changed to BlackBerry Corporation; and Research in Motion Limited shall be changed to BlackBerry Limited. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/06/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 43 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Nelson, Edward) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/4/2013: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (gsg, ). (Entered: 10/31/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER granting 34 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. Pursuant to stipulation of the parties, it is hereby ordered that Defendant Verizon Communications Inc. is dismissed from this action without prejudice. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/15/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Douglas James Dixon on behalf of T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4360013. (Dixon, Douglas) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by AT&T Mobility LLC, Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pankratz, Kurt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/5/2013: # 2 Corrected Proposed Order) (gsg, ). (Entered: 10/14/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cellco Partnership Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc. (Pankratz, Kurt) (Entered: 10/14/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AT&T Mobility LLC identifying Corporate Parent SBC Long Distance, LLC, Corporate Parent BellSouth Mobile Data, Inc., Corporate Parent SBC Telecom, Inc. for AT&T Mobility LLC. (Pankratz, Kurt) (Entered: 10/14/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited identifying Corporate Parent BlackBerry Limited for Research In Motion Corporation. (Pankratz, Kurt) (Entered: 10/14/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited Notice of Change of Name of Party (Pankratz, Kurt) (Entered: 10/14/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roshan Suresh Mansinghani on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., Verizon Communications, Inc. (Mansinghani, Roshan) (Entered: 10/14/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kurt Max Pankratz on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., Verizon Communications, Inc. (Pankratz, Kurt) (Entered: 10/14/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Boost Mobile, LLC, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Sprint Corporation for Boost Mobile, LLC, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Weber, Robert) (Entered: 10/14/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent T-Mobile US, Inc. for T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 10/14/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant Verizon Communications Inc. by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 10/14/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 10/14/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting 30 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. Defendant AT&T Inc is hereby DISMISSED from this action without prejudice. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/10/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert William Weber on behalf of Boost Mobile, LLC, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P. (Weber, Robert) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant AT&T Inc. by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Mark W McGrory on behalf of Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4351751. (McGrory, Mark) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. No more extensions will be granted absent a showing of good cause. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/05/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV on behalf of Cellco Partnership Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc. (Clutter, Patrick) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                Return of Service Executed as to Boost Mobile, LLC on 7/10/2013, by personal service; answer due: 7/31/2013. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Return of Service Executed as to Sprint Solutions, Inc. on 7/10/2013, by personal service; answer due: 7/31/2013. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Return of Service Executed as to Sprint Spectrum L.P. on 7/10/2013, by personal service; answer due: 7/31/2013. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Return of Service Executed as to T-Mobile US, Inc. on 7/10/2013, by personal service; answer due: 7/31/2013. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Return of Service Executed as to T-Mobile USA, Inc. on 7/10/2013, by personal service; answer due: 7/31/2013. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Return of Service Executed as to AT&T Inc. on 7/10/2013, by personal service; answer due: 7/31/2013. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Return of Service Executed as to AT&T Mobility LLC on 7/10/2013, by personal service; answer due: 7/31/2013. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Return of Service Executed as to Cellco Partnership Inc. on 7/10/2013, by personal service; answer due: 7/31/2013. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Return of Service Executed as to Research In Motion Corporation on 7/10/2013, by personal service; answer due: 7/31/2013. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Return of Service Executed as to Verizon Communications, Inc. on 7/10/2013, by personal service; answer due: 7/31/2013. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Return of Service Executed as to Sprint Nextel Corporation on 7/9/2013, by personal service; answer due: 7/30/2013. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E Jones on behalf of Cellco Partnership Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc. (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer on Behalf of All Defendants by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas Christopher Cecil on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Cecil, Thomas) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael James Fagan on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Fagan, Michael) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brent Nelson Bumgardner on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Bumgardner, Brent) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Brannon Latimer on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Latimer, Steven) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry Bumgardner on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Issued as to AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc. and emailed to pltf for service. (Attachments: # 1 Summons(es), # 2 Summons(es), # 3 Summons(es), # 4 Summons(es), # 5 Summons(es), # 6 Summons(es), # 7 Summons(es), # 8 Summons(es), # 9 Summons(es), # 10 Summons(es), # 11 Summons(es))(klb, ) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward R Nelson, III on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Appearance- Barry J. Bumgardner, # 2 Notice of Appearance- Brannon Latimer, # 3 Notice of Appearance- Brent N. Bumgardner, # 4 Notice of Appearance- Michael J. Fagan, Jr., # 5 Notice of Appearance- Thomas C. Cecil)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC identifying Corporate Parent Acacia Research Corporation, Corporate Parent Acacia Research Group LLC for Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 06/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claire Abernathy Henry on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 06/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 06/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 06/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 06/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4197652.), filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - '804 Patent, # 3 Exhibit B - '962 Patent, # 4 Exhibit C - '820 Patent)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 32 times.

                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?