USA v. Feiner
Criminal Case Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:04-cr-10180-RWZ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lori J. Holik +1 617 748 3161 +1 617 748 3960 lori.holik@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Boston
Filed 6/18/2004
County Suffolk
Terminated 5/24/2005
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1-7
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1341.F
Offense Level 4
181341-MAIL FRAUDS
Count 16s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1341.F
Offense Level 4
181341 Mail Fraud
Count 17s-18s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1341.F
Offense Level 4
181341 Mail Fraud
Count 19s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1341.F
Offense Level 4
181341 Mail Fraud
Count 1s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1341.F
Offense Level 4
181341 Mail Fraud
Count 2s-15s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1341.F
Offense Level 4
181341 Mail Fraud
Def Custody Status Released
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (61) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: 4/17/2007 Case file sent
Certified Documents sent to USDC RI as to Elliot J. Feiner: (Johnson, Jay)
    LREF
    Legal Document 41 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: 4/17/2007 Transfer Out/Probationer
    Probation Jurisdiction Transferred to USDC RI as to Elliot J. Feiner Transmitted Transfer of Jurisdiction form, with certified copies of indictment, judgment and docket sheet. (Johnson, Jay)
      LREF
      Legal Document 40 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: 12/18/2006 Motion to Amend
      MOTION to Amend Conditions of Supervised Release as to Elliot J. Feiner. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit # (2) Exhibit)(Cohen, Beryl)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: 10/17/2006 Order on Motion to Amend
      Judge Rya W. Zobel : endorsedORDER entered denying [38] Motion to Amend as to Elliot J. Feiner (1) (Urso, Lisa)
        LREF
        Legal Document 39 Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: 10/2/2006 Opposition to Motion
        Opposition by USA as to Elliot J. Feiner re [38] MOTION to Amend Conditions of Supervised Release (Holik, Lori)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 9/26/2006, Entered: 9/26/2006 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
          Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: #38 Motion to Amend corrected because: UNSIGNED DOCUMENT as to Elliot J. Feiner. E-mail sent describing the fix. (Johnson, Jay)
            LREF
            Legal Document 38 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: 9/25/2006, Terminated: 10/17/2006 Motion to Amend
            MOTION to Amend Conditions of Supervised Release as to Elliot J. Feiner. (Cohen, Beryl)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: 8/21/2006 Order on Motion to Amend
              Judge Rya W. Zobel : endorsedORDER entered denying [36] Motion to Amend as to Elliot J. Feiner (1) (Urso, Lisa)
                LREF
                Legal Document 37 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 8/11/2006 Opposition to Motion
                Opposition by USA as to Elliot J. Feiner re [36] MOTION to Amend (Holik, Lori)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 36 Filed: 8/10/2006, Entered: 8/10/2006, Terminated: 8/21/2006 Motion to Amend
                  MOTION to Amend conditions of release as to Elliot J. Feiner. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit judgment)(Urso, Lisa)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 35 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: 7/8/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                    Judge Rya W. Zobel : EndorsedORDER entered. as to Elliot J. Feiner re [32] Amended Judgment, the voluntary surrender of Defendant has been extended to Monday, July, 25, 2005. (Edge, Eugenia)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 34 Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: 6/29/2005 Order on Motion for Forfeiture of PropertyCourt Filing
                      Judge Rya W. Zobel : OrderORDER entered granting [33] Motion for Forfeiture of Property as to Elliot J. Feiner (1) (Urso, Lisa)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 33 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005, Terminated: 6/27/2005 Motion for Forfeiture of Property
                        MOTION for Forfeiture of Property Final Order of Forfeiture as to Elliot J. Feinerby USA. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Final Order of Forfeiture)(Barclay, Kristina)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 32 Filed: 6/1/2005, Entered: 6/6/2005 Amended JudgmentCourt Filing
                          Judge Rya W. Zobel : OrderORDER entered. AMENDED JUDGMENT as to Elliot J. Feiner (1), Count(s) 1-7, 16s, 19s, 1s, 2s-15s, The defendant was sentenced to 15 months BOP; 3 years SR; the first 6 months in home confinement; Standard conditions; special conditions; no guns; no new credit; info to the PO; may be shared with AUSA; fulltime employment; mental health; meet with the IRS; SA $300.00; Surrender to FMC Devens on 7/11/05; restitution in the amounts provided to by AUSA;ORDER OF FORFEITURE INCLUDED. (Urso, Lisa) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2005 (Urso, Lisa).
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 6/1/2005, Entered: 6/2/2005 Order on Motion to Correct
                            Judge Rya W. Zobel : endorsedORDER entered granting [31] Motion to Correct as to Elliot J. Feiner (1) (Urso, Lisa)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 5/31/2005, Entered: 6/2/2005 Order on Motion to Dismiss
                              Judge Rya W. Zobel : endorsedORDER entered granting [28] Motion to Dismiss counts 2s-15s and 17s and 18s as to Elliot J. Feiner (1) (Urso, Lisa)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 31 Filed: 5/27/2005, Entered: 5/27/2005, Terminated: 6/1/2005 Motion to Correct
                                MOTION to Correct [29] Judgment, as to Elliot J. Feinerby USA. (Barclay, Kristina)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 30 Filed: 5/24/2005, Entered: 5/25/2005 Statement of Reasons +Court Filing
                                  Judge Rya W. Zobel : OrderORDER entered. STATEMENT OF REASONS as to Elliot J. Feiner (Urso, Lisa)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 29 Filed: 5/24/2005, Entered: 5/25/2005 Judgment*Court Filing
                                    Judge Rya W. Zobel : JudgmentORDER entered. JUDGMENT as to Elliot J. Feiner (1), Count(s) 1s 16s & 19s, The defendant was sentenced to 15 months BOP; 3 years SR; the first 6 months in home confinement; Standard conditions; special conditions; no guns; no new credit; info to the PO; may be shared with AUSA; fulltime employment; mental health; meet with the IRS; SA $300.00; Surrender to FMC Devens on 7/11/05; restitution in the amounts provided to by AUSA; (Urso, Lisa) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/20/2005 (Urso, Lisa).
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 28 Filed: 5/24/2005, Entered: 5/24/2005, Terminated: 5/31/2005 Motion to Dismiss
                                      MOTION to Dismiss Counts Two through Fifteen, Seventeen, Eighteen of Superseding Indictment as to Elliot J. Feinerby USA. (Holik, Lori)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 27 Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: 5/17/2005 Sentencing Memorandum
                                        SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by USA as to Elliot J. Feiner (Holik, Lori)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: 5/17/2005 Sentencing
                                          Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Rya W. Zobel :Sentencing held on 5/17/2005 for Elliot J. Feiner (1), Count(s) 1-7, 16s, 17s-18s, 19s, 1s, 2s-15s, The defendant was sentenced to 15 months BOP; 3 years SR; the first 6 months in home confinement; Standard conditions; special conditions; no guns; no new credit; info to the PO; may be shared with AUSA; fulltime employment; mental health; meet with the IRS; SA $300.00; Surrender to FMC Devens on 7/11/05; restitution in the amounts provided to by AUSA;. (Court Reporter Catherine Handel.) (Urso, Lisa)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 26 Filed: 5/12/2005, Entered: 5/13/2005 Motion for Departure
                                            MOTION for Downward Departure as to Elliot J. Feiner. (Johnson, Jay)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 25 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: 4/29/2005 Order for Forfeiture of PropertyCourt Filing
                                              Judge Rya W. Zobel : Preliminary Order of Forfeiture enteredORDER entered. as to Elliot J. Feiner. (Urso, Lisa)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 24 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: 4/25/2005, Terminated: 5/24/2005 Motion for Forfeiture of Property
                                                MOTION for Forfeiture of Property as to Elliot J. Feinerby USA. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Preliminary Order of Forfeiture)(Barclay, Kristina)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 23 Filed: 3/23/2005, Entered: 3/23/2005 Procedural Order re sentencing hearingCourt Filing
                                                Judge Rya W. Zobel : OrderORDER entered. AMENDED PROCEDURAL ORDER re sentencing hearing as to Elliot J. Feiner Sentencing set for 5/17/2005 02:30 PM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel. (Urso, Lisa)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 22 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: 3/17/2005 Plea Agreement
                                                  PLEA AGREEMENT as to Elliot J. Feiner (Urso, Lisa)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 21 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: 3/7/2005 Procedural Order re sentencing hearingCourt Filing
                                                    Judge Rya W. Zobel : ORDER entered. PROCEDURAL ORDER re sentencing hearing as to Elliot J. Feiner Sentencing set for 5/17/2005 02:30 PM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel. (Urso, Lisa) Modified on 3/8/2005 (Johnson, Jay).
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: 3/7/2005 Change of Plea Hearing
                                                      Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Rya W. Zobel :Change of Plea Hearing as to Elliot J. Feiner held on 3/7/2005, Plea entered by Elliot J. Feiner (1) Guilty Count 1s,16s,19s. Sentencing set for 5/17/2005 02:30 PM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel. (Court Reporter Catherine Handel.) (Urso, Lisa)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/16/2005, Entered: 2/16/2005 Notice of Hearing.
                                                        NOTICE OF HEARING as to Elliot J. Feiner Change of Plea Hearing set for 3/7/2005 09:00 AM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel. (Urso, Lisa)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: 1/14/2005 Order on Motion to Exclude
                                                          Judge Rya W. Zobel : ElectronicORDER entered granting [20] Motion to Exclude as to Elliot J. Feiner 1/12/05 to 3/7/05 (1) (Johnson, Jay)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 20 Filed: 1/13/2005, Entered: 1/13/2005, Terminated: 1/14/2005 Motion to Exclude
                                                            First MOTION to Exclude as to Elliot J. Feinerby USA. (Holik, Lori)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: 1/13/2005 Pretrial Conference
                                                              electronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Rya W. Zobel :Pretrial Conference as to Elliot J. Feiner held on 1/12/2005 Jury Trial set for 3/7/2005 09:00 AM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel. Alternate date of 5/23/05; (Urso, Lisa)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 12/29/2004, Entered: 12/29/2004 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                NOTICE OF HEARING as to Elliot J. Feiner Pretrial Conference set for 1/12/2005 02:30 PM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel. (Urso, Lisa)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 19 Filed: 12/21/2004, Entered: 12/21/2004 Report and Order on Final Status Conference by MagCourt Filing
                                                                  Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings : ORDER entered ORDER AND RECOMMENDATION AFTER FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 116.5(C) as to Elliot J. Feiner. (Russo, Noreen)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 18 Filed: 12/21/2004, Entered: 12/21/2004 Order on Excludable DelayCourt Filing
                                                                    Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings : ORDER entered ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Elliot J. Feiner. Time excluded from 12/21/2004 until 12/21/2004. Thus, as of December 21, 2004, THIRTEEN (13) non-excludable days have occured leaving FIFTY-SEVEN (57) days left to commence trial so as to be within the seventy-day period for trial set by statute. (Russo, Noreen)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/21/2004, Entered: 12/21/2004 Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge
                                                                      Case as to Elliot J. Feiner no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings. (Russo, Noreen)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/21/2004, Entered: 12/21/2004 Status Conference
                                                                        Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings :Final Status Conference as to Elliot J. Feiner held on 12/21/2004. L. Hoik for Gov't, B. Cohen for Def't. Arraignment on Superceeding Indictment held at same time. After review of joint memorandum court to forward case to District Court Judge. (Digital Recording.) (Russo, Noreen)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/21/2004, Entered: 12/21/2004 Arraignment
                                                                          Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings :Arraignment on Superceeding Indictment as to Elliot J. Feiner (1) Count 1s-19s held on 12/21/2004. L. Holik for Gov't, B. Cohen for Def't. Def't pleads not guilty to call counts. Final Status Conf. also held. (Digital Recording) (Russo, Noreen)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: 12/17/2004 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                            Electronic NOTICE OF HEARING as to Elliot J. Feiner Arraignment set for 12/21/2004 @ 11:00 AM in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings. (Russo, Noreen)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 17 Filed: 12/16/2004, Entered: 12/17/2004 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                              Judge Rya W. Zobel : ORDER entered ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings Reason for referral: Pretrial proceedings re: Superseding Indictment as to Elliot J. Feiner (Gawlik, Cathy)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 16 Filed: 12/16/2004, Entered: 12/17/2004 Indictment
                                                                                SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT as to Elliot J. Feiner (1) count(s) 1s-19s. (Gawlik, Cathy)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 15 Filed: 12/16/2004, Entered: 12/16/2004 Joint Memorandum - Initial Status Conference
                                                                                  JOINT MEMORANDUM of the parties re initial status conference by Elliot J. Feiner (Final Status Conference) (Holik, Lori)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 14 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: 11/29/2004 Order on Excludable DelayCourt Filing
                                                                                    Judge Robert B. Collings : ORDER entered ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Elliot J. Feiner Time excluded from 6/17/2004 until 6/17/2004. Time excluded from 6/30/2004 until 6/30/2004. Time excluded from 7/1/2004 until 7/28/2004. Time excluded from 8/11/2004 until 8/11/2004. Time excluded from 8/12/2004 until 11/17/2004. Time excluded from 11/18/2004 until 11/18/2004. Time excluded from 11/19/2004 untill 12/20/2004. Thus as of December 20, 2004, THIRTEEN (13) Non-excludable days will have occured leaving FIFTY-SEVEN (57) days left to commence trial so as to be within the seventy-day period for trial set by statute. (Russo, Noreen)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: 11/29/2004 Report and Order on Initial Status Conference by MCourt Filing
                                                                                      Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings : ORDER entered REPORT AFTER INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 116.5 (A) as to Elliot J. Feiner. (Russo, Noreen)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 11 Filed: 11/23/2004, Entered: 11/23/2004 Notice re automatic disclosure
                                                                                        NOTICE re automatic disclosure as to Elliot J. Feiner (Second letter response) (Holik, Lori)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 12 Filed: 11/22/2004, Entered: 11/24/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                          Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings : ORDER entered ORDER FOR FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE (L.R. 116.5(c)) as to Elliot J. Feiner. (Russo, Noreen)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 10 Filed: 11/18/2004, Entered: 11/19/2004 Letter (non-motion)
                                                                                            Letter (non-motion) from Beryl W. Cohen regarding request for reciprocal discovery as to Elliot J. Feiner (Johnson, Jay)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 11/18/2004, Entered: 11/18/2004 Status Conference
                                                                                              Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings :Further Initial Status Conference as to Elliot J. Feiner held on 11/18/2004. Ms. Holik for Gov't, Mr. Cohen for Mr. Feiner. Parties don't expect experts. Final Status Conf. set down for December 21, 2004 @ 11:00 AM. (Digital Recording) (Russo, Noreen)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 8 Filed: 11/16/2004, Entered: 11/16/2004 Notice re automatic disclosure
                                                                                                NOTICE re automatic disclosure as to Elliot J. Feiner ( Government's Response to November 5, 2004 Discovery Request) (Holik, Lori)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                  Legal Document 9 Filed: 11/5/2004, Entered: 11/19/2004 Letter (non-motion)
                                                                                                  Letter (non-motion) regarding request for discovery and inspection as to Elliot J. Feiner (Johnson, Jay)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/11/2004, Entered: 8/12/2004 Report and Order on Initial Status Conference by MCourt Filing
                                                                                                    Judge Robert B. Collings : REPORT After Initial Status Conference as to Elliot J. Feiner. Further Initial Status Conference set for 11/18/2004 11:30 AM in Courtroom 14 before Robert B. Collings. (Dolan, Kathleen)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/11/2004, Entered: 8/11/2004 Status Conference
                                                                                                      Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Robert B. Collings :Status Conference as to Elliot J. Feiner held on 8/11/2004; AUSA Holik and Attorney Cohen report current case status; discovery is ongoing and Attorney Cohen seeks additonal time to review discovery material; Next status is set for 11/18/04 @ 11:30am. (Court Reporter D.R..) (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 6 Filed: 7/23/2004, Entered: 8/9/2004 Notice re automatic disclosure
                                                                                                        NOTICE re automatic disclosure as to Elliot J. Feiner (Johnson, Jay)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 5 Filed: 6/30/2004, Entered: 7/1/2004 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                          Judge Robert B. Collings : ORDER Setting Conditions of Release (Affsa, Gina)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 6/30/2004, Entered: 6/30/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                            Judge Robert B. Collings : MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered following arraignment as to Elliot J. Feiner (Affsa, Gina)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/30/2004, Entered: 6/30/2004 Arraignment
                                                                                                              Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Robert B. Collings :Initial Appearance and Arraignment as to Elliot J. Feiner (1) Count 1-7 held on 6/30/2004. Defendant appears on a summons issued by this court. The defendant appears with Mr. Cohen, who is his chosen retained counsel. The defendant is advised of the charges, his rights and the maximum penalties. The defendant pleads not guilty to all counts upon arraignment. The gov't agrees with the recommendations of conditions of release by pretrail services. The court sets conditions of release and releases defendant on his personal recognizance. The court sets an initial status conference on August 11, 2004 at 10:15 a.m. (Digital Recording.) (Affsa, Gina)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/30/2004, Entered: 6/30/2004 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Beryl W. Cohen appearing for Elliot J. Feiner (Affsa, Gina)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 6/22/2004, Entered: 6/22/2004 Summons IssuedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  Summons Issued as to Elliot J. Feiner. Initial Appearance set for 6/30/2004 12:00 PM in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings. Mr. Feiner must report to pretrial services on 6/30/04 at 9:00 a.m.(Affsa, Gina)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/17/2004, Entered: 6/18/2004 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    Judge Rya W. Zobel : ORDER entered ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings Reason for referral: Pretrial as to Elliot J. Feiner (Diskes, Sheila)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/17/2004, Entered: 6/18/2004 Indictment
                                                                                                                      INDICTMENT as to Elliot J. Feiner (1) count(s) 1-7. (Diskes, Sheila)
                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 768 times.

                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?