Wayne Ernest Dupree
Bankruptcy Case Maryland Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 14-23036
District Judge James F. Schneider, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 4, 2016 at 5:21 AM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ellen W. Cosby, Trustee
No Logo Shanel Lakisha Dupree, Debtor
No Logo Wayne Ernest Dupree, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Jeffrey M. Sirody and Associates, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey M. Sirody +1 410 415 0445 +1 410 415 0744
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Requirement to Complete Financial Management Course. (related document(s)28 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/19/2014. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/20/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None
    Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (admin) (Entered: 11/17/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/16/2014, Entered: None
      BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s)26 Order Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan with Leave to Amend). No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/16/2014. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/17/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        Order Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan with Leave to Amend (related document(s)24 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Wayne Ernest Dupree, Debtor Shanel Lakisha Dupree). Amended Chapter 13 Plan due by 12/28/2014. Confirmation hearing to be held on 1/28/2015 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 9-C, Baltimore - Judge Schneider. (James, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/14/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None
          Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan. (Cosby, Ellen) (Entered: 10/06/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None
            Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Shanel Lakisha Dupree, Wayne Ernest Dupree. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Sirody, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/10/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None
            Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly and Disposable Income on Behalf of Shanel Lakisha Dupree, Wayne Ernest Dupree Filed by Jeffrey M. Sirody (related document(s)15 Order on Motion to Extend Time). (Sirody, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/10/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None
              Statement of Financial Affairs on behalf of Shanel Lakisha Dupree, Wayne Ernest Dupree Filed by Jeffrey M. Sirody. (Sirody, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/10/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None
                Schedules A-J on behalf of Shanel Lakisha Dupree, Wayne Ernest Dupree Filed by Jeffrey M. Sirody. (Sirody, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/10/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None
                  Summary of Schedules on behalf of Shanel Lakisha Dupree, Wayne Ernest Dupree Filed by Jeffrey M. Sirody. (Sirody, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/10/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/7/2014, Entered: None
                    BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s)17 Order on Motion to Extend Automatic Stay). No. of Notices: 59. Notice Date 09/07/2014. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/08/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/6/2014, Entered: None
                      BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s)15 Order on Motion to Extend Time). No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/06/2014. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/07/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None
                        Order Extending Automatic Stay as to All Creditors (related document(s):9 Motion to Extend Automatic Stay filed by Debtor Wayne Ernest Dupree, Debtor Shanel Lakisha Dupree) (James, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/05/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None
                          Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by HSBC Bank USA, National Association as Trustee for Wells Fargo Home Equity Asset-Backed Securities 2005-3 Trust, Home Equity Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2005-3. (Bennett, Michael) (Entered: 09/04/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None
                            Notice and Notice Extending Time to File Statement of Financial Affairs, Schedules, and/or Chapter 13 Plan, Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period and Disposable Income (related document(s):14 Motion to Extend Time filed by Debtor Wayne Ernest Dupree, Debtor Shanel Lakisha Dupree). Chapter 13 Plan and Certificate of Service due by 9/25/2014. Statement of Financial Affairs due 9/25/2014. Schedules A-J due 9/25/2014. Summary of schedules due 9/25/2014. Chapter 13 Monthly and Disposable Income Form 22C due 9/25/2014. Incomplete Filings due 9/25/2014 (James, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/04/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None
                              Motion to Extend Time Filed by Shanel Lakisha Dupree, Wayne Ernest Dupree. (Sirody, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/02/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: None
                                BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s)12 Order Setting Hearing (bk)). No. of Notices: 62. Notice Date 08/28/2014. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/29/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  Order and Notice of a Hearing on Motion to Extend Automatic Stay (related document(s)9 Motion to Extend Automatic Stay filed by Debtor Wayne Ernest Dupree, Debtor Shanel Lakisha Dupree). Hearing scheduled for 9/4/2014 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 9-C, Baltimore - Judge Schneider. (James, Stephanie) (Entered: 08/26/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None
                                    BNC Certificate of Mailing. (related document(s)1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Wayne Ernest Dupree, Debtor Shanel Lakisha Dupree). No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/22/2014. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/23/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None
                                      BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. (related document(s)8 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13). No. of Notices: 54. Notice Date 08/22/2014. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/23/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None
                                        Motion to Extend Automatic Stay Filed by Shanel Lakisha Dupree, Wayne Ernest Dupree. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Motion # 2 Proposed Order) (Sirody, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/20/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Trustee Ellen W. Cosby, with 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/02/2014 at 10:00 AM at 341 meeting room 2650 at 101 W. Lombard St., Baltimore. Proof of Claim due by 12/31/2014. Confirmation to be held on 11/12/2014 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 9-C, Baltimore - Judge Schneider. Objection to Confirmation due by 11/04/2014. Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 12/01/2014. (Entered: 08/19/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None
                                            CORRECTIVE ENTRY: DUPLICATE OF DOCUMENT NO. 5. Certificate of Credit Counseling on Behalf of Wayne Ernest Dupree Filed by Jeffrey M. Sirody. (Sirody, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/20/2014 (Hegerle, Robert). Modified on 8/20/2014 (Hegerle, Robert). (Entered: 08/19/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None
                                              CORRECTIVE ENTRY: INCORRECT DEBTOR'S NAME ON CERTIFICATE. Certificate of Credit Counseling on Behalf of Shanel Lakisha Dupree, Wayne Ernest Dupree Filed by Jeffrey M. Sirody. (Sirody, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/20/2014 (Hegerle, Robert). (Entered: 08/19/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                Certificate of Credit Counseling on Behalf of Shanel Lakisha Dupree, Wayne Ernest Dupree Filed by Jeffrey M. Sirody. (Sirody, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/19/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                  Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(14-23036) [misc,volp13a] ( 310.00). Receipt number 24952998. Fee amount 310.00 (re: Doc # 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 08/19/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                    Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Jeffrey M. Sirody. (Sirody, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/19/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                      Social Security Number Verification Page on behalf of Shanel Lakisha Dupree, Wayne Ernest Dupree Filed by Jeffrey M. Sirody. (Sirody, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/19/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                        Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $310 Filed by Wayne Ernest Dupree, Shanel Lakisha Dupree. Government Proof of Claim due by 02/17/2015. Chapter 13 Plan and Certificate of Service due by 09/2/2014. Schedules A-J due 09/2/2014. Statement of Financial Affairs due 09/2/2014. Summary of schedules due 09/2/2014. Chapter 13 Monthly and Disposable Income Form 22C due 09/2/2014. Incomplete Filings due 09/2/2014 Section 521(i)(1) Incomplete Filing date: 10/3/2014. (Sirody, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/19/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 747 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?