Prakopiy Cam- Adversary Proceeding
Bankruptcy Case Oregon Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 13-03259
District Judge Elizabeth L Perris, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 24, 2016 at 10:39 AM EDT (5.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Ernesto Martinez-Ramirez, Plaintiff
No Logo Eutimio Ortiz-Garcia, Plaintiff
No Logo Rafael Ortiz-Garcia, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Northwest Workers' Justice Project

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/11/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY ERIN MAUREEN PETTIGREW +1 503 525 8454
Space Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich +1 503 525 8454 +1 503 946 3029 corinna@nwjp.org
No Logo Ramiro Martinez-Lopez, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Prakopiy Cam, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Prakopiy Cam
  Entries (42) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None
Order Re: Dismissal or Other Final Disposition Effective Within 30 Days. Last Date to Comply 1/8/2015, (sfs) (Entered: 12/09/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None
    Hearing Held. (sfs) (Entered: 12/09/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None
      Certificate of Notice Re: 39 Notice of Hearing Re: Status. Continued hearing to be held on 12/09/2014 at 09:30 AM at Telephone Hearing. (sfs). (Admin.) (Entered: 11/06/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None
        Notice of Hearing Re: Status. Continued hearing to be held on 12/09/2014 at 09:30 AM at Telephone Hearing. (sfs) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None
          Hearing Held. (sfs) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: None
            Certificate of Notice Re: 36 Notice of Hearing Re: Continued Status hearing to be held on 11/04/2014 at 09:30 AM at Telephone Hearing. (sfs). (Admin.) (Entered: 09/26/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None
              Notice of Hearing Re: Continued Status hearing to be held on 11/04/2014 at 09:30 AM at Telephone Hearing. (sfs) (Entered: 09/24/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None
                Hearing Held. (sfs) (Entered: 09/24/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None
                  Certificate of Notice Re: 33 Rescheduled Notice of Hearing Re: 31 Notice of Hearing Re: Continued Status hearing to be held on 09/22/2014 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom #1,Portland. (sfs). Status hearing to be held on 09/23/2014 at 09:00 AM at Telephone Hearing. (sfs). (Admin.) (Entered: 09/12/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None
                    Rescheduled Notice of Hearing Re: 31 Notice of Hearing Re: Continued Status hearing to be held on 09/22/2014 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom #1,Portland. (sfs). Status hearing to be held on 09/23/2014 at 09:00 AM at Telephone Hearing. (sfs) (Entered: 09/10/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/17/2014, Entered: None
                      Certificate of Notice Re: 31 Notice of Hearing Re: Continued Status hearing to be held on 09/22/2014 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom #1,Portland. (sfs). (Admin.) (Entered: 05/17/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                        Notice of Hearing Re: Continued Status hearing to be held on 09/22/2014 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom #1,Portland. (sfs) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                          Hearing Held. (sfs) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                            Certificate of Notice Re: 28 Notice of Hearing Re: Contnued Status hearing to be held on 05/13/2014 at 10:00 AM at Telephone Hearing. (sfs). (Admin.) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None
                              Notice of Hearing Re: Contnued Status hearing to be held on 05/13/2014 at 10:00 AM at Telephone Hearing. (sfs) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None
                                Hearing Held. (sfs) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/13/2014, Entered: None
                                  Certificate of Notice Re: 25 Notice of Hearing Re: Status hearing to be held on 04/29/2014 at 09:30 AM at Telephone Hearing. (sfs). (Admin.) (Entered: 04/13/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None
                                    Notice of Hearing Re: Status hearing to be held on 04/29/2014 at 09:30 AM at Telephone Hearing. (sfs) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None
                                      Hearing Held. (sfs) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/9/2014, Entered: None
                                        Certificate of Notice Re: 22 Order Staying Proceedings (ljr). (Admin.) (Entered: 03/09/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
                                          Order Staying Proceedings (ljr) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                                            Certificate of Notice Re: 19 Order Re: Application of FRCP 26 (kam). (Admin.) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                                              Certificate of Notice Re: 18 Notice of Hearing Re: 1 Adversary case 13-03259. Complaint by Rafael Ortiz-Garcia, Ramiro Martinez-Lopez, Ernesto Martinez-Ramirez, Eutimio Ortiz-Garcia against Prakopiy Cam Nature of Suit:(41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))),(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)),(62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)). Continued Pre-Trial Hearing Set for 04/11/2014 at 09:30 AM at Telephone Hearing. (kam). (Admin.) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                Order Re: Application of FRCP 26 (kam) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                  Notice of Hearing Re: 1 Adversary case 13-03259. Complaint by Rafael Ortiz-Garcia, Ramiro Martinez-Lopez, Ernesto Martinez-Ramirez, Eutimio Ortiz-Garcia against Prakopiy Cam Nature of Suit:(41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))),(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)),(62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)). Continued Pre-Trial Hearing Set for 04/11/2014 at 09:30 AM at Telephone Hearing. (kam) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                    Hearing Held. Re: 1 Adversary case 13-03259. Complaint by Rafael Ortiz-Garcia, Ramiro Martinez-Lopez, Ernesto Martinez-Ramirez, Eutimio Ortiz-Garcia against Prakopiy Cam Nature of Suit:(41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))),(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)),(62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)). (kam) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                      Certificate of Notice Re: 15 Notice of Hearing Re: 1 Adversary case 13-03259. Complaint by Rafael Ortiz-Garcia, Ramiro Martinez-Lopez, Ernesto Martinez-Ramirez, Eutimio Ortiz-Garcia against Prakopiy Cam Nature of Suit:(41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))),(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)),(62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)). Pre-Trial Hearing Set for 01/28/2014 at 09:30 AM at Telephone Hearing. (kam). (Admin.) (Entered: 01/08/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                        Notice of Hearing Re: 1 Adversary case 13-03259. Complaint by Rafael Ortiz-Garcia, Ramiro Martinez-Lopez, Ernesto Martinez-Ramirez, Eutimio Ortiz-Garcia against Prakopiy Cam Nature of Suit:(41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))),(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)),(62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)). Pre-Trial Hearing Set for 01/28/2014 at 09:30 AM at Telephone Hearing. (kam) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                          Answer to Complaint Filed by Prakopiy Cam (ljr) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                            Certificate of Notice Re: 12 Scheduling Order (ljr). (Admin.) (Entered: 12/14/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                              Scheduling Order (ljr) (Entered: 12/12/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                Substitution of New Attorney Corinna Spencer-Scheurich For Previous Attorney ERIN MAUREEN PETTIGREW. Filed By Ramiro Martinez-Lopez, Ernesto Martinez-Ramirez, Eutimio Ortiz-Garcia, Rafael Ortiz-Garcia (SPENCER-SCHEURICH, CORINNA) (Entered: 12/11/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  Certificate of Notice Re: 8 Order Granting 5 Motion to Extend Time filed by Defendant Prakopiy Cam (ljr). (Admin.) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    Certificate of Notice Re: 6 Notice of Hearing Re: 5 Motion to Extend Time to File Answer Filed by Defendant Prakopiy Cam (ljr). Hearing Scheduled for 12/03/2013 at 09:00 AM at Telephone Hearing. (kam). (Admin.) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      Order Granting 5 Motion to Extend Time filed by Defendant Prakopiy Cam (ljr) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        Hearing Held. Re: 1 Adversary case 13-03259. Complaint by Rafael Ortiz-Garcia, Ramiro Martinez-Lopez, Ernesto Martinez-Ramirez, Eutimio Ortiz-Garcia against Prakopiy Cam Nature of Suit:(41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))),(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)),(62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)). (kam) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          Notice of Hearing Re: 5 Motion to Extend Time to File Answer Filed by Defendant Prakopiy Cam (ljr). Hearing Scheduled for 12/03/2013 at 09:00 AM at Telephone Hearing. (kam) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            Motion to Extend Time to File Answer Filed by Defendant Prakopiy Cam (ljr) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              Summons Served on Prakopiy Cam 10/23/2013 (PETTIGREW, ERIN) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                Summons Issued for service on Prakopiy Cam Date Issued 10/21/2013, Answer Due 11/20/2013 1 Complaint. Pre-Trial Hearing Set for 12/03/2013 at 09:00 AM at Telephone Hearing. Scheduling Order due 12/6/2013. (pjk) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  Receipt of Filing Fee for Complaint(13-03259-elp) [cmp,cmp] ( 293.00). Receipt Number 11113217. (re:Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    Adversary case 13-03259. Complaint by Rafael Ortiz-Garcia, Ramiro Martinez-Lopez, Ernesto Martinez-Ramirez, Eutimio Ortiz-Garcia against Prakopiy Cam Nature of Suit:(41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))),(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)),(62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud))(PETTIGREW, ERIN) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                      This case has been viewed 297 times.

                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                      Space
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                       
                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                      Need Password Help?