Green et al v. Proskauer Rose, LLP et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Northern District Court, Case No. 3:12-cv-01808
District Judge David C Godbey, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2017 at 5:41 PM EST (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Julio Padilla, Plaintiff
No Logo Miguel Green, Plaintiff

Represented by Castillo Snyder PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Edward C Snyder +1 210 630 4200 +1 210 630 4210 esnyder@casnlaw.com
v.
No Logo Chadbourne & Parke, LLP, Defendant

Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Daniel J. Beller +1 212 373 3312 +1 212 373 2315 dbeller@paulweiss.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted DANIEL J. LEFFELL +1 212 373 3218 dleffell@paulweiss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted William B Michael +1 212 373 3000 wmichael@paulweiss.com

Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Harry M Reasoner +1 713 758 2358 + 713 615 5173 hreasoner@velaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing William D. Sims, Jr. +1 214 220 7700 bsims@velaw.com
Proskauer Rose LLP Proskauer Rose LLP, Defendant

Represented by Carrington, Coleman, Sloman & Blumenthal, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Neil Ross Burger +1 214 855 3076 +1 214 840 0120 nburger@ccsb.com

Represented by Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Richard Cooper +1 212 450 4000 +1 212 701 5800 richard.cooper@davispolk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Rajesh S. James , +1 212 450 4000 +1 212 450 3384 rajesh.james@davispolk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted James P. Rouhandeh +1 212 450 4000 +1 212 450 3835 james.rouhandeh@dpw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Daniel Jacob Schwartz +1 212 450 4581 +1 212 450 3581 daniel.schwartz@dpw.com
No Logo Spencer C Barasch, Defendant

Represented by Weitzman Law Offices, LLC (NJ)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Paul Edward Coggins +1 214 740 8000 +1 214 740 8800 pcoggins@lockelord.com
No Logo THOMAS V. SJOBLOM, Defendant

Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing William B Mateja +1 214 747 5070 + 214 747 2091 mateja@fr.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 77
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (70) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Compliance with Rule 1.11(c) filed by Spencer C Barasch (Coggins, Paul) (Entered: 09/09/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 69 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER: The cases referenced in this order are stayed until the sooner of thirty (30) days after issuance of a decision by this Court on plaintiffs' forthcoming motion for class certification in Troice, et al. v. Proskauer Rose, LLP, et al., Civil Action No. 3:09-cv-1600-N, or the issuance of a final order dismissing the complaint in that action. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 10/3/2014) (gmg) (Entered: 10/03/2014)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None
      Joint MOTION to Stay filed by Spencer C Barasch, CHADBOURNE & PARKE, LLP, PROSKAUER ROSE, LLP (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 10/02/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 66 Motion to Extend Time. Responses due by 10/6/2014. Replies due by 10/20/2014. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 9/29/2014) (chmb) (Entered: 09/29/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None
          STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER by Spencer C Barasch, CHADBOURNE & PARKE, LLP, PROSKAUER ROSE, LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Rouhandeh, James) Modified to add motion part on 9/29/2014 (gmg). (Entered: 09/22/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER re 11 Motion to Remand: Given the Supreme Court's decision, this Court orders that Defendants must respond to the pending motions to remand within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order. The Plaintiffs may reply fourteen (14) days after the date of Defendants response. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 9/8/2014) (twd) (Entered: 09/08/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
              ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David C Godbey: Status Conference held on 8/21/2014. Attorney Appearances: SEC - David Reece; Receiver- Kevin Sadler, Michael Kuckelman, Douglas Buncher; Examiner- John Little; Defense - Jonathan Polkes, Ashley Kleber, Brian Tagtmeier, Robert Plotkin, Phil Preis, Jesse Castillo, Edward Valdepino, and Randy Pulman. (Court Reporter: Linda Langford) (No exhibits) Time in Court - 01:11. (chmb) (Entered: 08/21/2014) (jkm) (Entered: 08/21/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                The Court will hold a status hearing for all parties to the Stanford MDL proceeding on 8/21/2014 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1505, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Judge David C Godbey. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/22/2014) (jkm) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                  It is ordered that all matters and motions previously referred to the Honorable E. Scott Frost, United States Magistrate Judge, in the In re Stanford Entities Securities Litigation multidistrict litigation, are now hereby referred to the Honorable Nancy M. Koenig, United States Magistrate Judge, except for two matters outlined in the order. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 2/13/2014) (gmg) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David C Godbey: Status Conference held on 1/16/2014. Attorney Appearances: Receiver - Kevin Sadler; SEC - David Reece; Examiner - John Little; Defendants - Daniel Schwartz, Michael Kuckelman, Jim E. Cowles, Sim Israeloff, Chuck Green, Bill Mateja, Ed Snyder, Emil Lippe, Jr. (Court Reporter: Linda Langford) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :48. (chmb) (jkm) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER requesting input regarding the priority of decision in various matters pending in all cases within the In re Stanford Entities Securities Litigation. Input must be filed with the Court within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 12/3/2013) (gmg) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER: Status Hearing for all parties to the Stanford MDL proceeding set for 1/16/2014 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1505, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Judge David C Godbey. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 12/2/2013) (gmg) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel of Record filed by PROSKAUER ROSE, LLP (Burger, Neil) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER: Status Conference set for 10/19/2012 02:00 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1505, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Magistrate Judge E. Scott Frost. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge E. Scott Frost on 10/4/2012)(gmg) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636, it is ordered that all cases within the In re Stanford Entities Securities Litigation multidistrict litigation, other than Securities Exchange Commission v. Stanford, et al., Civil Action No. 3:09-0298-N, are hereby referred to the Hon. E. Scott Frost, United States Magistrate Judge, for hearing and determination. See Order for specifics. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 9/24/2012) (gmg) (Entered: 09/26/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 45 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel J. Beller. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/30/2012) (chmb) (Entered: 07/30/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 44 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel J. Leffell. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/30/2012) (chmb) (Entered: 07/30/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 43 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of William B. Michael. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/30/2012) (chmb) (Entered: 07/30/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 51 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Richard A. Cooper. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/30/2012) (chmb) (Entered: 07/30/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/26/2012, Entered: None
                                        Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Cert. of Good Standing for Attorney Richard A. Cooper (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-4718562) filed by PROSKAUER ROSE, LLP (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Cooper, Richard) (Entered: 07/26/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
                                          Appendix in Support filed by CHADBOURNE & PARKE, LLP, PROSKAUER ROSE, LLP re 49 Response/Objection to Motion to Remand (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C, # 4 Exhibit(s) D) (Burger, Neil) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
                                            RESPONSE filed by CHADBOURNE & PARKE, LLP, PROSKAUER ROSE, LLP re: 11 Opposed MOTION to Remand (Burger, Neil) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER: granting Examiner's request for status conference. Status Conference set for 7/26/2012 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1505, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Judge David C Godbey. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/16/2012) (gr) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Harry M Reasoner on behalf of CHADBOURNE & PARKE, LLP. (Reasoner, Harry) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William D Sims, Jr on behalf of CHADBOURNE & PARKE, LLP. (Sims, William) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                    Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Cert. of Good Standing for Attorney Daniel J. Beller (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-4712169) filed by CHADBOURNE & PARKE, LLP (Beller, Daniel) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                      Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Cert. of Good Standing for Attorney Daniel J. Leffell (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-4711937) filed by CHADBOURNE & PARKE, LLP (Leffell, Daniel) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                        Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Cert. of Good Standing for Attorney William B. Michael (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-4711430) filed by CHADBOURNE & PARKE, LLP (Michael, William) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER: This Order addresses pending motions to remand: 10 in 3:12-CV-1803-N; 6 in 3:12-CV-1805-N; 9 in 3:12-CV-1806-N; 11 in 3:12-CV-1808-N; 7 in 3:12-CV-1809-N. The Court orders that Defendants must respond to the pending motions to remand within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order. The Plaintiffs may reply fourteen (14) days after the date of Defendants' response. To the extent that any case is stayed, the Court lifts the stay, and to the extent that there are pending motions to stay in any case, the Court denies those motions as moot. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/3/2012) (jrb) (Entered: 07/03/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 39 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel J. Schwartz. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/3/2012) (chmb) (Entered: 07/03/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 38 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of James P. Rouhandeh. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/3/2012) (chmb) (Entered: 07/03/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Cert. of Good Standing for Attorney Daniel J. Schwartz (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-4664121) filed by PROSKAUER ROSE, LLP (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order) (Schwartz, Daniel) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Cert. of Good Standing for Attorney James P. Rouhandeh (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-4664002) filed by PROSKAUER ROSE, LLP (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order) (Rouhandeh, James) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge Godbey. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (jrb) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      Case electronically transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 4:12-cv-00276. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        JPML TRANSFER ORDER (certified copy) transferring case to Northern District of Texas to be included in MDL Docket No. 2099. Case terminated on 6/8/2012 Parties notified.(ltien, ) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 06/11/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel of Record by Proskauer Rose, LLP, filed. (Burger, Neil) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 05/22/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting 17 Motion to Stay.(Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(jewilliams, ) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                              ADVISORY by Miguel Green, Julio Padilla, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A")(Snyder, Edward) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 04/19/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                ADVISORY by Chadbourne & Parke, LLP, Proskauer Rose, LLP, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Burger, Neil) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 04/17/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                  ADVISORY by Chadbourne & Parke, LLP, Proskauer Rose, LLP, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Burger, Neil) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 04/06/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                    RESPONSE to 28 Advisory and in Further Support of Motion to Stay, filed by Chadbourne & Parke, LLP, Proskauer Rose, LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Burger, Neil) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 03/27/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                      ADVISORY by Miguel Green, Julio Padilla, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A")(Snyder, Edward) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 03/22/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                        ADVISORY by Miguel Green, Julio Padilla, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A")(Snyder, Edward) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 03/13/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                          REPLY in Support of 17 Opposed MOTION to Stay All Further Proceedings, filed by Proskauer Rose, LLP. (Burger, Neil) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 03/05/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting granting 24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(jewilliams, ) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 02/29/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                              Renewed MOTION for Rajesh S. James to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Proskauer Rose, LLP, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/20/2012. (Burger, Neil) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 02/28/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                APPENDIX re: 22 Response to Motion by Miguel Green, Julio Padilla, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix 1-50)(Snyder, Edward) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 02/20/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                  RESPONSE to 17 Opposed MOTION to Stay All Further Proceedings filed by Miguel Green, Julio Padilla. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Snyder, Edward) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 02/20/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Proskauer Rose, LLP, filed.(Burger, Neil) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 02/15/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting 14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(jewilliams, ) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 02/15/2012)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER granting 15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(jewilliams, ) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 02/15/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time.(Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(jewilliams, ) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 02/15/2012)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Opposed MOTION to Stay All Further Proceedings by Proskauer Rose, LLP, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/6/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Burger, Neil) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 02/14/2012)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Proskauer Rose, LLP, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/6/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Burger, Neil) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 02/14/2012)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                MOTION for Daniel J. Schwartz to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Proskauer Rose, LLP, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/6/2012. (Burger, Neil) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 02/14/2012)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  MOTION for James P. Rouhandeh to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Proskauer Rose, LLP, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/6/2012. (Burger, Neil) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 02/14/2012)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    MOTION for Rajesh S. James to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Proskauer Rose, LLP, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/6/2012. (Burger, Neil) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 02/14/2012)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OPPOSITION TO CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER WITH JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION by Miguel Green, Julio Padilla, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "1")(Snyder, Edward) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 02/13/2012)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Opposed MOTION to Remand by Miguel Green, Julio Padilla, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/24/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Snyder, Edward) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 02/03/2012)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time.(Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(jewilliams, ) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 02/03/2012)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/4/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake.(Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(jewilliams, ) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond by Proskauer Rose, LLP, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/23/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Burger, Neil) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Sim Lake. Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (dhansen, ) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  RECUSAL ORDER. Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr recused. Deadlines in scheduling orders subsist. Court settings are vacated. Initial Conference terminated.(Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(kcarr, ) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 02/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/8/2012 at 03:00 PM in Room 11521 before Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr.(Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(rosaldana) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 01/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by Spencer C Barasch, Chadbourne & Parke, LLP, Proskauer Rose, LLP, Thomas V. Sjoblom, filed.(Burger, Neil) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 01/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Proskauer Rose, LLP, filed.(Burger, Neil) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 01/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE Defendant Chadbourne & Parke LLP's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chadbourne & Parke, LLP, filed. (Wander, John) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 01/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 189th District Court, case number 2011-77805 (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0541-9175493) filed by Spencer C Barasch, Thomas V. Sjoblom, Proskauer Rose, LLP, Chadbourne & Parke, LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 1 Index, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22)(Burger, Neil) Modified on 1/31/2012 (rosaldana, ). [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/12/2012.] (Entered: 01/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 150 times.

                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?