Nassar v. Nassar
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 3:14-cv-01501

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2019 at 9:04 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (73) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None USCA Mandate
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: None Writ of Certiorari Denied - Supreme Court
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: None USCA Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: None Stay
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Judgment
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  ORDER denying 66 Plaintiff's Motion to Take Judicial Notice; granting 63 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; denying 98 Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. The Amended Complaint is dismissed. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment in accordance with this Order and close the file. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 1/3/2017. (JW)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Mediation report
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Withdraw
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Modify
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 10/12/2016, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None Notice to take judicial notice
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None Case management and scheduling order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: None Dismiss
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: None Certificate of Compliance
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/10/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None Order on motion to stay discovery
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: None Stay discovery
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Response to Order to Show Cause
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Case Management Report
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/15/2016, Entered: None Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: None Response to Order to Show Cause
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: None Order to Show Cause
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Strike
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/24/2015, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/11/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/10/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/10/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: None Notice to take judicial notice
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/27/2015, Entered: None Response
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/27/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: None Order of Recusal
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None Notice to take judicial notice
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: None Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None Related case order and track 2 notice
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None Affidavit of indigency
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?