American Broadcasting Companies, Inc. v. Aereo, Inc.

Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-09829
District Judge Alison J. Nathan, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Alison J. Nathan
Last Updated January 12, 2017 at 1:27 AM EST (8.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Aereo, Inc., Respondent

Represented by Brown Rudnick LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William R. Baldiga +1 617 856 8586 +1 617 856 8201 wbaldiga@brownrudnick.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Benjamin Chapman +1 617 856 8530
Other Parties
American Broadcasting Companies, Inc. American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., Movant

Represented by Debevoise & Plimpton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce P. Keller +1 212 909 6000 +1 212 909 6836 bpkeller@debevoise.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Miriam Natasha Labovitz +1 212 446 4907 +1 212 446 4900 nlabovitz@debevoise.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael R. Potenza +1 212 909 6000 +1 212 909 6836 mpotenza@debevoise.com
CBS Broadcasting, Inc. CBS Broadcasting, Inc., Movant
CBS Studios, Inc. CBS Studios, Inc., Movant
Disney Enterprises, Inc. Disney Enterprises, Inc., Movant
Officer/Director, DC Holdco, Inc.
Officer/Director, Infoseek Corp /de/
Officer/Director, Active Network, Inc.,
Officer/Director, A.b.c. Enterprises, Inc.
Officer/Director, ABC, Inc.
Officer/Director, ABC Holding CO Inc.
Officer/Director, ESPN Holding Company, Inc.
Officer/Director, Espn, Inc.
Officer/Director, Espn Enterprises, Inc.
Officer/Director, ESPN Digital Media, Inc.
No Logo Fox Broadcasting Company, Movant

Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy M. Gallegos +1 213 239 2203 +1 213 239 2213 agallegos@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julie A Shepard +1 213 239 5100 +1 213 239 5180 jshepard@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Catherine L. Steege +1 312 222 9350 +1 312 527 0484 csteege@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard L. Stone +1 213 239 2203 +1 213 239 2213 rstone@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick J. Trostle +1 212 891 1665 +1 212 891 1699 ptrostle@jenner.com
Fox Television Stations, Inc. Fox Television Stations, Inc., Movant
No Logo KSTU, LLC, Movant
No Logo KUTV Licensee, LLC, Movant
NBC Studios, LLC NBC Studios, LLC, Movant
NBCUniversal Media, LLC NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Movant

Represented by Crowell & Moring LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael V. Blumenthal +1 212 223 4000 +1 212 223 4134 mblumenthal@crowell.com

Represented by Kelley Drye & Warren, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer A. Christian +1 212 808 7800
No Logo Public Broadcasting Service, Movant
No Logo Telemundo Network Group LLC, Movant
No Logo The Univision Network Limited Partnership, Movant
No Logo Thirteen, Movant
No Logo Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Movant
No Logo Universal Network Television, LLC, Movant
No Logo Univision Television Group, Inc., Movant
No Logo W.net, Movant
No Logo WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC, Movant
No Logo Wpix, LLC, Movant
Attributes
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 157
Nature of Suit 423 - Bankruptcy Withdrawal, Rule 28 U.S.C. ยง 157
Timeline
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 34 Filed: None, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
LREF
Blank 27 Filed: None, Entered: None
LREF
Blank 24 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of of Related Proceedings. Document filed by Aereo, Inc.. (Baldiga, William) (Entered: 02/13/2015)
LREF
Blank 23 Filed: 12/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Julie A. Shepard dated 12/30/14 re: In Re: Aereo, Inc., No. 14-cv-09829-AJN (related to WNET, et al. v. Aereo, Inc., No. 12-cv-1540-AJN -- consolidated). Document filed by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Broadcasting Inc., CBS Studios Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox Television Stations, Inc., KSTU, LLC, KUTV Licensee, LLC, NBC Studios, LLC, NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Public Broadcasting Service, THIRTEEN, Telemundo Network Group LLC, The Univision Network Limited Partnership, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal Network Television, LLC, Univision Television Group, Inc., WNET, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC, WPIX, LLC.(Shepard, Julie) (Entered: 12/30/2014)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/30/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE of Mootness re: 1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 14-B-13200 (SHL).. Document filed by Aereo, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit _A)(Baldiga, William) (Entered: 12/30/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Broadcasters' Reply in Support of Motion to Withdraw Reference of the Stay Relief Motion and Sale Motion and Memorandum in Support served on William R. Baldiga, Esq. on December 23, 2014. Document filed by Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox Television Stations, Inc., KSTU, LLC, KUTV Licensee, LLC, Public Broadcasting Service, THIRTEEN, The Univision Network Limited Partnership, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Univision Television Group, Inc., WNET, WPIX, LLC. (Trostle, Patrick) (Entered: 12/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 20 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re: 1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 14-B-13200 (SHL). /Broadcasters' Reply in Support of Motion to Withdraw Reference of the Stay Relief Motion and Sale Motion and Memorandum in Support. Document filed by Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox Television Stations, Inc., KSTU, LLC, KUTV Licensee, LLC, Public Broadcasting Service, THIRTEEN, The Univision Network Limited Partnership, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Univision Television Group, Inc., WNET, WPIX, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Trostle, Patrick) (Entered: 12/23/2014)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent NBCUniversal Media, LLC for NBC Studios, LLC, Telemundo Network Group LLC, Universal Network Television, LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC; Corporate Parent Comcast Corporation for NBCUniversal Media, LLC. Document filed by NBC Studios, LLC, NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Telemundo Network Group LLC, Universal Network Television, LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC.(Blumenthal, Michael) (Entered: 12/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: None
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Twenty-First Century Fox Inc. for Fox Television Stations, Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation; Corporate Parent Tribune Company, Corporate Parent Tribune Broadcasting Company, LLC, Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Company for WPIX, LLC; Corporate Parent Tribune Broadcasting Company, LLC, Corporate Parent Tribune Company, Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Company for KSTU, LLC; Corporate Parent Broadcasting Media Partners, Inc., Corporate Parent PTI Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Broadcast Media Partners Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Univision Local Media, Inc., Corporate Parent Univision Communications, Inc. for Univision Television Group, Inc.; Corporate Parent Broadcasting Media Partners, Inc., Corporate Parent Broadcast Media Partners Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Univision Networks & Studios, Inc., Corporate Parent Univision Communications Inc. for The Univision Network Limited Partnership; Corporate Parent WNET for THIRTEEN; Corporate Parent Twenty-First Century Fox, Inc for Fox Broadcasting Company; Corporate Parent Sinclair Broadcast Group, Inc. for KUTV Licensee, LLC. Document filed by Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox Television Stations, Inc., KSTU, LLC, KUTV Licensee, LLC, Public Broadcasting Service, THIRTEEN, The Univision Network Limited Partnership, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Univision Television Group, Inc., WNET, WPIX, LLC.(Trostle, Patrick) (Entered: 12/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 8 Letter, filed by WNET, Disney Enterprises, Inc., Fox Television Stations, Inc., NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC, Telemundo Network Group LLC, Universal Network Television, LLC, CBS Studios Inc., THIRTEEN, Fox Broadcasting Company, KSTU, LLC, KUTV Licensee, LLC, NBC Studios, LLC, Public Broadcasting Service, American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Broadcasting Inc., Univision Television Group, Inc., The Univision Network Limited Partnership, WPIX, LLC. ENDORSEMENT: No showing has been made necessitating a hearing or expedited review. Accordingly, the Broadcasters' request for expedited consideration of their Withdrawal Motion is DENIED. Pursuant to Local Rule 6.1, Aereo's opposition to the Withdrawal Motion is due on or before December 26, 2014. The Broadcasters' reply, if any, is due one week after the opposition is served. The Court will indicate if oral argument is required. Otherwise, the Withdrawal Motion will be decided by this Court upon being fully briefed and in due course. This resolves Dkt. No.7., ( Responses due by 12/26/2014.), Motions terminated: 7 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: 6 Response, 1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 14-B-13200 (SHL). addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from William R. Baldiga dated 12/15/14. filed by Aereo, Inc. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 12/16/2014) (lmb) (Entered: 12/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Joseph Lipowski in Opposition re: 1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 14-B-13200 (SHL).. Document filed by Aereo, Inc.. (Baldiga, William) (Entered: 12/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Lawton W. Bloom in Opposition re: 1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 14-B-13200 (SHL).. Document filed by Aereo, Inc.. (Baldiga, William) (Entered: 12/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 14-B-13200 (SHL). . Document filed by Aereo, Inc.. (Baldiga, William) (Entered: 12/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Aereo, Inc..(Baldiga, William) (Entered: 12/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None
FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. Document filed by Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox Television Stations, Inc., KSTU, LLC, KUTV Licensee, LLC, Public Broadcasting Service, THIRTEEN, The Univision Network Limited Partnership, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Univision Television Group, Inc., WNET, WPIX, LLC.(Trostle, Patrick) Modified on 12/17/2014 (lb). (Entered: 12/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None
FILING ERROR - NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Comcast Corporation for NBC Studios, LLC, NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Telemundo Network Group LLC, Universal Network Television, LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC. Document filed by NBC Studios, LLC, NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Telemundo Network Group LLC, Universal Network Television, LLC, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC.(Blumenthal, Michael) Modified on 12/17/2014 (lb). (Entered: 12/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The Walt Disney Company for American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc.; Corporate Parent CBS Corporation for CBS Broadcasting Inc., CBS Studios Inc.. Document filed by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Broadcasting Inc., CBS Studios Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc..(Keller, Bruce) (Entered: 12/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Benjamin Chapman on behalf of Aereo, Inc.. (Chapman, Robert) (Entered: 12/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Bruce P. Keller dated 12/15/14 re: addressing a scheduling issue. Document filed by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Broadcasting Inc., CBS Studios Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox Television Stations, Inc., KSTU, LLC, KUTV Licensee, LLC, NBC Studios, LLC, NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Public Broadcasting Service, THIRTEEN, Telemundo Network Group LLC, The Univision Network Limited Partnership, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal Network Television, LLC, Univision Television Group, Inc., WNET, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC, WPIX, LLC.(Keller, Bruce) (Entered: 12/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION for Conference re: 6 Response, 1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 14-B-13200 (SHL). addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from William R. Baldiga dated 12/15/14. Document filed by Aereo, Inc..(Baldiga, William) (Entered: 12/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None
RESPONSE re: 4 Statement of Relatedness,, . Document filed by Aereo, Inc.. (Baldiga, William) (Entered: 12/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William R. Baldiga on behalf of Aereo, Inc.. (Baldiga, William) (Entered: 12/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None
STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 12-cv-1540. Document filed by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Broadcasting Inc., CBS Studios Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox Television Stations, Inc., KSTU, LLC, KUTV Licensee, LLC, NBC Studios, LLC, NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Public Broadcasting Service, THIRTEEN, Telemundo Network Group LLC, The Univision Network Limited Partnership, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal Network Television, LLC, Univision Television Group, Inc., WNET, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC, WPIX, LLC.(bkar) (Entered: 12/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (bkar) (Entered: 12/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None
DECLARATION of M. Natasha Labovitz in Support re: 1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 14-B-13200 (SHL).. Document filed by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Broadcasting Inc., CBS Studios Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Fox Broadcasting Company, Fox Television Stations, Inc., KSTU, LLC, KUTV Licensee, LLC, NBC Studios, LLC, NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Public Broadcasting Service, THIRTEEN, Telemundo Network Group LLC, The Univision Network Limited Partnership, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Universal Network Television, LLC, Univision Television Group, Inc., WNET, WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC, WPIX, LLC. (bkar) (Entered: 12/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None
MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 14-B-13200 (SHL).Document filed by WPIX, LLC, CBS Broadcasting Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Universal Network Television, LLC, The Univision Network Limited Partnership, NBC Studios, LLC, THIRTEEN, Fox Television Stations, Inc., NBCUniversal Media, LLC, American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC, Telemundo Network Group LLC, Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, CBS Studios Inc., WNET, KUTV Licensee, LLC, Univision Television Group, Inc., Fox Broadcasting Company, Public Broadcasting Service, KSTU, LLC.(bkar) (Entered: 12/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 357 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?