Adams, et al v. United Assoc of Jour, et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Louisiana Middle District Court, Case No. 3:98-cv-00400
District Judge James J. Brady, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge James J. Brady
Last Updated October 27, 2022 at 6:37 PM EDT (2.5 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Alfred Wallace, Plaintiff
No Logo Alfreddie Greensberry, Plaintiff
No Logo ALL PLAINTIFFS, Plaintiff
No Logo Andre Christopher Gatlin, Plaintiff
No Logo Andre Gatlin, Plaintiff
No Logo Angela C Rogers, Plaintiff
No Logo Carl Dillon, Plaintiff
No Logo Carl Judson, Plaintiff
No Logo Charles Adams, Plaintiff

Represented by Grodner and Associates, APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donna Unkel Grodner +1 225 769 1919 dgrodner@grodnerlaw.com

Represented by Law Offices of Andre P. LaPlace

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/08/2002, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andre Phillip LaPlace +1 225 924 6898 alaw@andrelaplace.com

Represented by Law Offices of Charlotte McDaniel McGehee

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/25/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charlotte McDaniel McGehee +1 225 389 6711 +1 225 372 2607 charlotte@mcdanielmcgehee.com

Represented by Law Offices of Philip Miles Bradley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Philip Miles Bradley +1 800 713 9446

Represented by Suite 607

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James William Standley, IV +1 225 293 3900 +1 225 293 3300 jamess@ladb.org

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George E. Downing, Jr. +1 225 924 1630 +1 225 924 4691 sycstreet@yahoo.com
No Logo Charles Taylor, Sr, Plaintiff
No Logo Cleveland Dyer, Plaintiff
No Logo Clifford Kemp, Jr, Plaintiff
No Logo Clyde Holliday, Plaintiff
No Logo Darryl Freeman, Plaintiff
No Logo DAVID DIXON, Plaintiff
No Logo Dennis Taylor, Plaintiff
No Logo Derrick Wicker, Plaintiff
No Logo Donald Bennett, Plaintiff
No Logo Donald L Robertson, Plaintiff
No Logo Doris C White, Plaintiff
No Logo Earl Turner, Plaintiff
No Logo Earnest Bell, Plaintiff
No Logo Earnest Ford, Sr, Plaintiff
No Logo Earnest Johnson, Plaintiff
No Logo Edward Buggage, Plaintiff
No Logo Frank A Alexander, Jr, Plaintiff

Represented by Grodner & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Holmes Cooper +1 225 766 1100
No Logo Frank Cage, Plaintiff
No Logo Fred Gice, Plaintiff
No Logo Freddie Jackson, Plaintiff
No Logo Freddie Judson, Jr, Plaintiff
No Logo Frederick Wicker, Plaintiff
No Logo George Fountain, Plaintiff
No Logo George Hillard, Jr, Plaintiff
No Logo George Jackson, Plaintiff
No Logo Hebert Lavergne, Plaintiff
No Logo Ivan W Morgan, Plaintiff
No Logo Jacquiline W Edwards, Plaintiff
No Logo James Miles, Plaintiff
No Logo James Snowden, Plaintiff
No Logo JAMES WHITE, Plaintiff
No Logo Jason R Lee, Plaintiff
No Logo Jerry Adams, Plaintiff
No Logo Jesse Gross, Plaintiff
No Logo Jill Edwards, Plaintiff
No Logo John Green, Plaintiff
No Logo Johnny Huggins, Plaintiff
No Logo Jonas Jacob, Plaintiff
No Logo Joseph B Stone, Plaintiff
No Logo Joseph, Catherine, Plaintiff
No Logo Joseph Collins, Plaintiff
No Logo Joseph Payne, Plaintiff
No Logo Joseph Wicker, Plaintiff
No Logo Kayla Lexus Benoit, Plaintiff
No Logo Kelvin D Freeman, Plaintiff
No Logo Kenneth Judson, Plaintiff
No Logo Kenny Bell, Plaintiff
No Logo Kenny W Adams, Plaintiff
No Logo Kevin Gauthier, Plaintiff
No Logo Kevin T Gauthier, Plaintiff
No Logo Kimla Jade Gatlin, Plaintiff
No Logo LARRY BELL, Plaintiff
No Logo Larry Freeman, Plaintiff
No Logo Larry Gilmore, Plaintiff
No Logo Larry Stone, Plaintiff
No Logo Lee Fox, Plaintiff
No Logo Leo Davis, Jr, Plaintiff
No Logo Linus Lavergne, Plaintiff
No Logo Lionel Jackson, Plaintiff
No Logo Lionel Richard, Plaintiff
No Logo Lorechia Brown, Plaintiff
No Logo Louis Square, Plaintiff
No Logo Mannie Henderson, Plaintiff
No Logo Mary Barrow, Plaintiff
No Logo Michael Jackson, Plaintiff
No Logo Michael Kyles, Plaintiff
No Logo Michael Robertson, Plaintiff
No Logo Napoleon Shriver, III, Plaintiff
No Logo Paul Womack, Plaintiff
No Logo Rayfield Goings, Plaintiff
No Logo Rita Curry, Plaintiff
No Logo Roberta McDomic, Plaintiff
No Logo Robin Nicole Hayes, Plaintiff
No Logo Ronald Lethermon, Sr, Plaintiff
No Logo Ronald Smith, Plaintiff
No Logo Sam Honore, Plaintiff
No Logo Sam Parker, Plaintiff
No Logo Silvester Lethermon, Sr, Plaintiff
No Logo Tommie Williams, Plaintiff
No Logo Vernon Ashford, Plaintiff
No Logo Vernon Thomas, Plaintiff
No Logo Wayne Dukes, Plaintiff
No Logo Wendolyn Johnson, Plaintiff
No Logo Wesley R Edwards, Jr, Plaintiff
No Logo Willie Brown, Plaintiff
No Logo Willie Stone, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Jeff Armstrong, Defendant
No Logo Legion Insurance Company, Defendant

Represented by Sessions, Fishman, Nathan & Israel, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sharon Cormack Mize +1 504 582 1500 smize@sessions-law.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert E. Winn +1 504 582 1500 +1 504 582 1555 rew@sessions-law.com
No Logo Louis LeBlanc, Defendant
No Logo United Association of Jouneymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada, Defendant

Represented by O'Donoghue & O'Donoghue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Louis P. Malone, III +1 202 362 0041
Space James Roger O'Connell +1 202 362 0041

Represented by O'DONOGHUE & O'DONOGHUE LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas Roman Femia +1 202 362 0041 +3622 362 362 2640 nfemia@odonoghuelaw.com

Represented by Robein, Urann, Spencer, Picard & Cangemi, APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nancy Picard +1 504 885 9994 +1 504 885 9969 npicard@ruspclaw.com
No Logo United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada AFL-CIO, Local 198, Defendant

Represented by O'Donoghue & O'Donoghue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Keith R. Bolek +1 202 362 0041
Space Jean M. Kelly +1 202 362 0041
Space Daniel J. McNeil +1 202 362 0041
Space Teresa White Murray +1 202 362 0041

Represented by Robein, Urann & Lurye

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert P. Curley +1 504 885 9994
TERMINATED: 10/18/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen M. Torre +1 504 885 9994 +1 504 885 9969

Represented by Robein, Urann, Spencer, Picard & Cangemi, APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nancy Picard +1 504 885 9994 +1 504 885 9969 npicard@ruspclaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julie Richard-Spencer +1 504 885 9994 +1 504 885 9969 jrichard@ruspclaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Louis Leo Robein, III +1 504 885 9994 lrobein@ruspclaw.com

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward K Newman +1 718 254 6069 edward.newman@usdoj.gov
Other Parties
No Logo Diane Robinson Qaadir, Intervenor Plaintiff

Represented by Roedel, Parsons, Koch, Blache, Balhoff & McCollis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terry T. Dunlevy +1 225 929 7033 +1 225 928 4925 tdunlevy@roedelparsons.com

Represented by State of Louisiana, Office of General Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hilary Taylor +1 225 342 7232 +1 225 219 7572
No Logo Diane Robinson Qaadir, Movant
No Logo Jeff Armstrong, Intervenor Defendant
No Logo Louis LeBlanc, Intervenor Defendant
No Logo United Association of Jouneymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada, Intervenor Defendant
No Logo United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada AFL-CIO, Local 198, Intervenor Defendant
Attributes
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1981
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Timeline
  Entries (826) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Page 1 Page 2

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 977 Filed: 10/27/2022, Entered: None Notice to Counsel - General Order 2019-04
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 976 Filed: 10/27/2022, Entered: None Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 975 Filed: 10/27/2022, Entered: None order on report and recommendation
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 973 Filed: 10/24/2022, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 972 Filed: 10/12/2022, Entered: None Telephone Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 971 Filed: 9/22/2022, Entered: None Order on Motion for Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 969 Filed: 9/19/2022, Entered: None Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 968 Filed: 9/13/2022, Entered: None Telephone Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 965 Filed: 8/23/2022, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 964 Filed: 7/29/2022, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 963 Filed: 7/28/2022, Entered: None Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 962 Filed: 6/9/2022, Entered: None Order Setting Trial and Related Deadlines
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 961 Filed: 6/7/2022, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 960 Filed: 6/5/2022, Entered: None Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 959 Filed: 5/18/2022, Entered: None Settlement Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 958 Filed: 3/15/2022, Entered: None Settlement Conference Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 955 Filed: 1/27/2022, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 954 Filed: 1/20/2022, Entered: None Order on Motion for Reconsideration
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 951 Filed: 5/25/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 949 Filed: 5/19/2021, Entered: None Enroll Additional Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 948 Filed: 5/19/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 947 Filed: 5/14/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 945 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: None Telephone Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 944 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 940 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: None Reconsideration
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 939 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: None Leave to File Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 937 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 935 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 934 Filed: 4/21/2021, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief (First)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 933 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 931 Filed: 4/14/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response to a Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 930 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: None Telephone Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 928 Filed: 3/24/2021, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 927 Filed: 3/23/2021, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 926 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 925 Filed: 3/19/2021, Entered: None Leave to File Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 923 Filed: 3/3/2021, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief (First)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 922 Filed: 1/20/2021, Entered: None Telephone Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 919 Filed: 1/14/2021, Entered: None Settlement Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 917 Filed: 1/6/2021, Entered: None Settlement Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 914 Filed: 1/6/2021, Entered: None Status Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 913 Filed: 1/5/2021, Entered: None Settlement Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 911 Filed: 12/22/2020, Entered: None Settlement Conference Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 909 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 907 Filed: 12/16/2020, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 906 Filed: 12/16/2020, Entered: None Settlement Conference Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 904 Filed: 12/15/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 902 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: None Substitute Party
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 901 Filed: 12/2/2020, Entered: None Settlement Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 900 Filed: 12/1/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 899 Filed: 11/25/2020, Entered: None Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 898 Filed: 11/19/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 896 Filed: 11/18/2020, Entered: None Settlement Conference Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 895 Filed: 11/18/2020, Entered: None Settlement Conference Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 893 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 891 Filed: 11/6/2020, Entered: None Substitute Party
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 890 Filed: 10/15/2020, Entered: None Ruling
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 889 Filed: 10/13/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 888 Filed: 10/9/2020, Entered: None Settlement Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 884 Filed: 10/9/2020, Entered: None Withdraw
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 882 Filed: 10/6/2020, Entered: None Settlement Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 881 Filed: 10/6/2020, Entered: None Telephone Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 879 Filed: 10/4/2020, Entered: None Expedited Hearing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 878 Filed: 10/4/2020, Entered: None Enforce Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 877 Filed: 10/2/2020, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 875 Filed: 10/1/2020, Entered: None Settlement Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 872 Filed: 9/23/2020, Entered: None Substitute Party
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 870 Filed: 9/15/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief (First)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 869 Filed: 9/11/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 868 Filed: 9/4/2020, Entered: None Produce
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 867 Filed: 8/31/2020, Entered: None Telephone Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 865 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: None Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 862 Filed: 8/18/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 861 Filed: 8/11/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 860 Filed: 8/7/2020, Entered: None Settlement Conference Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 859 Filed: 8/6/2020, Entered: None Response
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 857 Filed: 7/29/2020, Entered: None Status Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 856 Filed: 7/27/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 855 Filed: 7/27/2020, Entered: None Reconsideration
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 854 Filed: 7/24/2020, Entered: None Response
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 852 Filed: 7/23/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 851 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: None Reconsideration
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 849 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 848 Filed: 6/1/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 847 Filed: 5/29/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 846 Filed: 5/28/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Substitute Party
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 845 Filed: 5/22/2020, Entered: None Substitute Party
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 843 Filed: 5/14/2020, Entered: None Response
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 842 Filed: 5/8/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 840 Filed: 5/6/2020, Entered: None File Excess Pages
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 839 Filed: 4/14/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 838 Filed: 4/13/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Strike
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 837 Filed: 4/10/2020, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 835 Filed: 4/7/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 834 Filed: 4/6/2020, Entered: None Strike
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 832 Filed: 4/6/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 831 Filed: 4/3/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 830 Filed: 4/3/2020, Entered: None Leave
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 828 Filed: 3/24/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response to a Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 826 Filed: 3/24/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 825 Filed: 3/23/2020, Entered: None File Excess Pages
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 823 Filed: 3/20/2020, Entered: None Reconsideration
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 822 Filed: 3/18/2020, Entered: None Order Administratively Terminating Case
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 816 Filed: 2/26/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 815 Filed: 2/25/2020, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 814 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: None Response
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 811 Filed: 2/21/2020, Entered: None Voluminous Exhibits - Additional Exhibits to Main Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 810 Filed: 2/21/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 808 Filed: 2/21/2020, Entered: None Telephone Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 805 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: None Substitute Pleading (In Order to Correct Deficiency)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 804 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 802 Filed: 2/14/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 801 Filed: 2/11/2020, Entered: None Response
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 799 Filed: 2/3/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 798 Filed: 2/3/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 796 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 795 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 794 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief (First)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 793 Filed: 1/30/2020, Entered: None Strike
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 792 Filed: 1/30/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 790 Filed: 1/29/2020, Entered: None Response
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 788 Filed: 1/29/2020, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 787 Filed: 1/29/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Substitute Pleading (In Order to Correct Deficiency)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 785 Filed: 1/22/2020, Entered: None Substitute Pleading (In Order to Correct Deficiency)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 784 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 783 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 782 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 781 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 780 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: None Telephone Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 779 Filed: 1/14/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 778 Filed: 1/13/2020, Entered: None File Excess Pages
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 775 Filed: 1/13/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 774 Filed: 1/10/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 773 Filed: 1/9/2020, Entered: None Response
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 772 Filed: 1/9/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief (First)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 771 Filed: 1/9/2020, Entered: None Response
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 770 Filed: 1/7/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 769 Filed: 1/6/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Strike
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 767 Filed: 1/3/2020, Entered: None Strike
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 766 Filed: 1/3/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief (Second)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 765 Filed: 1/3/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief (First)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 761 Filed: 1/2/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 760 Filed: 1/2/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response to a Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 759 Filed: 1/2/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File a Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 758 Filed: 12/23/2019, Entered: None Response
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 757 Filed: 12/19/2019, Entered: None Telephone Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 756 Filed: 12/13/2019, Entered: None Response
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 755 Filed: 12/13/2019, Entered: None Response
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 754 Filed: 12/12/2019, Entered: None Response
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 753 Filed: 12/12/2019, Entered: None Response
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 752 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 750 Filed: 11/27/2019, Entered: None Continue
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 748 Filed: 11/20/2019, Entered: None Response
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 747 Filed: 11/20/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response to a Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 746 Filed: 11/13/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Strike
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 745 Filed: 11/11/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 743 Filed: 11/6/2019, Entered: None Strike
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 742 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 741 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: None Continue
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 738 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: None Strike
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 737 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 736 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 735 Filed: 10/30/2019, Entered: None Leave
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 734 Filed: 10/29/2019, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 733 Filed: 10/29/2019, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 732 Filed: 10/28/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Alter Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 729 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 727 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: None Alter Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 726 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Strike
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 724 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 723 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: None Order on Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 722 Filed: 8/19/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 720 Filed: 8/12/2019, Entered: None Strike
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 719 Filed: 8/12/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 717 Filed: 8/10/2019, Entered: None Reconsideration
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 715 Filed: 8/7/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Reconsideration
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 714 Filed: 8/3/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 713 Filed: 8/1/2019, Entered: None Amend
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 712 Filed: 8/1/2019, Entered: None Reconsideration
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 711 Filed: 8/1/2019, Entered: None Reconsideration
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 709 Filed: 7/31/2019, Entered: None Reconsideration
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 708 Filed: 7/31/2019, Entered: None Reconsideration
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 707 Filed: 7/31/2019, Entered: None Reconsideration
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 705 Filed: 7/30/2019, Entered: None Reconsideration
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 702 Filed: 7/26/2019, Entered: None Alter Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 700 Filed: 7/18/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 699 Filed: 7/16/2019, Entered: None Motion Hearing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 698 Filed: 7/3/2019, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 697 Filed: 6/25/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Substitute Pleading (In Order to Correct Deficiency)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 696 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: None Substitute Pleading (In Order to Correct Deficiency)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 694 Filed: 5/20/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 693 Filed: 5/17/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 692 Filed: 5/16/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 689 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: None extension of time
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 688 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 687 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 686 Filed: 4/12/2019, Entered: None Status Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 683 Filed: 4/2/2019, Entered: None Continue
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 679 Filed: 3/5/2019, Entered: None Voluminous Exhibits - Additional Exhibits to Main Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 678 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Strike
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 676 Filed: 3/2/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 675 Filed: 3/1/2019, Entered: None Strike
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 673 Filed: 2/27/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 672 Filed: 2/26/2019, Entered: None Leave
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 671 Filed: 2/21/2019, Entered: None Strike
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 669 Filed: 2/15/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 667 Filed: 2/15/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 666 Filed: 2/15/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Strike an Incorrectly Filed Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 665 Filed: 2/15/2019, Entered: None Leave
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 664 Filed: 2/14/2019, Entered: None Strike an Incorrectly Filed Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 662 Filed: 2/13/2019, Entered: None Leave
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 660 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 659 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 658 Filed: 2/7/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 657 Filed: 2/7/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 656 Filed: 1/30/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 653 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: None Strike
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 652 Filed: 1/24/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 651 Filed: 1/23/2019, Entered: None File Excess Pages
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 649 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 648 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 646 Filed: 1/12/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 645 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 643 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response to a Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 641 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None extension of time
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 639 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 637 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None File Excess Pages
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 636 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Telephone Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 634 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 633 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 632 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Telephone Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 630 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 629 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Response
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 626 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Status Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 625 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Status Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 621 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None Status Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 620 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 619 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File A Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 616 Filed: 3/11/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 615 Filed: 3/10/2018, Entered: None Amend
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 614 Filed: 3/10/2018, Entered: None Withdraw
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 612 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Enroll as Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 611 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Enroll as Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 609 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: None Status Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 608 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Enroll as Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 605 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Response
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 601 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: None Enroll as Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 596 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 595 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 594 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None Withdraw
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 593 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: None Status Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 591 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 590 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: None Status Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 577 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None Withdraw
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 576 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 575 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Scheduling Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 574 Filed: 3/23/2017, Entered: None Withdraw
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 572 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None 90 DAY CONFERENCE ORDER
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 571 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Lift Stay
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 568 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: None Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 565 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
RULING AND ORDER denying 545 Motion to Lift Stay and Bifurcate; denying 554 Motion to Dismiss Legion Insurance Company without prejudice. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 11/7/11. (DCB) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 564 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None
REPLY Memorandum to 560 Memorandum in Opposition to 554 MOTION to Dismiss Legions Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(LSM) (Entered: 11/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 563 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 562 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to the opposition to Plaintiffs' 560 Motion to Dismiss Legion Insurance Company submitted by Defendant United Association Local 198. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 11/7/011. (LSM) (Entered: 11/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 562 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File Reply to the opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss Legion Insurance Company submitted by Defendant United Association Local 198 560 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Proposed Pleading;, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3)(Grodner, Donna) (Entered: 11/04/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 561 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to 554 MOTION to Dismiss Legions Insurance Company filed by United Association of Jouneymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada. (Femia, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 560 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to 554 MOTION to Dismiss Legions Insurance Company filed by United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada AFL-CIO, Local 198. (Picard, Nancy) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 559 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 554 MOTION to Dismiss Legions Insurance Company, 557 Order, Set Deadlines filed by Legion Insurance Company. (Mize, Sharon) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 558 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 550 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Charlotte C. McDaniel McGehee is withdrawn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 10/25/2011. (LSM) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 557 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: as to 554 MOTION to Dismiss Legions Insurance Company: Any opposition is due on or before 10/28/2011.. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 10/19/11. (DCB) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 556 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 555 Motion to Withdraw Karen M. Torre as counsel of record on behalf of Local 198 and local counsel on behalf of the UA in the referenced matter and removed from the ECF service list.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 10/18/2011. (CMM) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 555 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
MOTION to Withdraw Counsel of Record Karen M. Torre by United Association of Jouneymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada, United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada AFL-CIO, Local 198. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading;)(Picard, Nancy) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 554 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
MOTION to Dismiss Legions Insurance Company by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Order, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Exhibit)(Grodner, Donna) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 553 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada AFL-CIO, Local 198 re 551 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Amended Certificate of Service (Picard, Nancy) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 552 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to 545 MOTION to Lift Stay MOTION to Bifurcate filed by United Association of Jouneymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada. (Picard, Nancy) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 551 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to 545 MOTION to Lift Stay MOTION to Bifurcate filed by United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada AFL-CIO, Local 198. (Picard, Nancy) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 550 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
MOTION for Charlotte C. McDaniel McGehee to Withdraw as Attorney by All Plaintiffs. (McGehee, Charlotte) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 549 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 547 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to 545 MOTION to Lift Stay MOTION to Bifurcate. Deft United Association and UA Local 198 granted until 10/6/2011 to file their response to Pltfs Motion. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 10/3/2011. (JDL) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 548 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 545 MOTION to Lift Stay MOTION to Bifurcate, 546 Order, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,, filed by Legion Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Mize, Sharon) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 547 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to 545 MOTION to Lift Stay MOTION to Bifurcate by United Association of Jouneymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada, United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada AFL-CIO, Local 198. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading;)(Picard, Nancy) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 546 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE TO PARTIES: A 545 motion to lift stay and bifurcate has been filed by plaintiffs.. Defendants shall respond in writing to the motion on or before October 3, 2011. (Note: this is an expedited briefing schedule.). Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 9/26/2011. (CMM) (Entered: 09/27/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 545 Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: None
MOTION to Lift Stay, MOTION to Bifurcate by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading; Order, # 2 Memorandum in Support)(Grodner, Donna) (Entered: 09/23/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 544 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
RULING denying 528 Motion and Incorporated Memorandum in Support to Lift Stay. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 7/16/2008. (NLT, ) (Entered: 07/16/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 543 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 527 MOTION to Lift Stay for leave to File, MOTION for Leave to File Tenth Amended Complaint, and File the Tenth Amended Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 7/16/2008. (NLT, ) (Entered: 07/16/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 542 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 526 MOTION to Lift Stay to File Pla's Motion and Incorporated Memo in Support for Leave of Court to File Ninth Amended Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 7/16/2008. (NLT, ) (Entered: 07/16/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 541 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE of Oral Argument on 528 MOTION to Lift Stay, 527 MOTION for Leave to File Tenth Amended Complaint MOTION to Lift Stay, 536 Second MOTION to Lift Stay to set Status Confrence, 533 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Opposition to Lift Stay, 537 MOTION to Lift Stay and bifurcate, 526 MOTION to Lift Stay :(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) Oral Argument set for 7/17/2008 at 09:30 AM before Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson. ARGUMENTS ARE LIMITED TO A MAXIMUM OF TEN (10) MINUTES FOR EACH SIDE.(DCB) (Entered: 06/19/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 540 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to 537 MOTION to Lift Stay and bifurcate filed by United Association of Jouneymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada. (Picard, Nancy) (Entered: 09/28/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 539 Filed: 9/13/2006, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to 537 MOTION to Lift Stay and bifurcate filed by United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada AFL-CIO, Local 198. (Torre, Karen) (Entered: 09/13/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 538 Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Support of 537 MOTION to Lift Stay and bifurcate filed by Larry Bell. (McGehee, Charlotte) (Entered: 09/05/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 537 Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: None
MOTION to Lift Stay and bifurcate by Donald L Robertson. (McGehee, Charlotte) (Entered: 09/05/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 536 Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: None
Second MOTION to Lift Stay to set Status Confrence by Charles Adams. (McGehee, Charlotte) (Entered: 09/05/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 535 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to 533 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Opposition to Lift Stay filed by United Association of Jouneymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada. (Torre, Karen) (Entered: 06/05/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 534 Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to 533 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Opposition to Lift Stay filed by United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada AFL-CIO, Local 198. (Torre, Karen) (Entered: 05/19/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 533 Filed: 5/15/2006, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Opposition to Lift Stay by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading;)(McDaniel, Charlotte) (Entered: 05/15/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 532 Filed: 5/12/2006, Entered: None
***Disregard this entry. Filed in error. Leave of Court is required to file a reply to a response to a motion. (Entered: 05/12/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 531 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to 528 MOTION to Lift Stay filed by United Association of Jouneymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada. (Torre, Karen) (Entered: 05/08/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 530 Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: None
RESPONSE To Motion to Lift Stay in Response to 529 Order, filed by Legion Insurance Company. (SAH, ) (Entered: 05/03/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 529 Filed: 4/18/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE TO COUNSEL... This matter is before the court on Plaintiffs' Ex-Parte Motion and Incorporated Memorandum in Support to Lift Stay... Cnsl for the dft's Response to Motion is due by 5/8/2006.. Signed by Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 4/17/2006.(SAH, ) (Entered: 04/19/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 528 Filed: 4/12/2006, Entered: None
MOTION and Incorporated Memorandum in Support to Lift Stay by All Plaintiffs. (NLT, ) (Entered: 04/12/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 527 Filed: 7/1/2005, Entered: None
MOTION to Lift Stay for leave to File, MOTION for Leave to File Tenth Amended Complaint, and File the Tenth Amended Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (SAH, ) (Entered: 07/05/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 526 Filed: 6/21/2005, Entered: None
MOTION to Lift Stay to File Pla's Motion and Incorporated Memo in Support for Leave of Court to File Ninth Amended Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (DCB, ) Modified on 6/22/2005 (DCB, )...docuements submitted (Entered: 06/22/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 525 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying [521-1] motion to Lift Stay and Set Status Conference by All Plaintiffs ( signed by Judge Ralph E. Tyson ), issued notices. (dcb) (Entered: 03/02/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 524 Filed: 9/22/2003, Entered: None
INTERVENOR'S Complaint by Diane Robinson Qaadir against United Assoc of Jour, United Assoc Journey, Louis LeBlanc, Jeff Armstrong (elp) (Entered: 09/23/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 523 Filed: 9/22/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [520-1] motion to Intervene as a Pla under rule 24 of the FRCP by Diane Robinson Qaadir by Diane Robinson Qaadir ( signed by Mag. Judge Docia L. Dalby ), issued notices. (sah) (Entered: 09/22/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 522 Filed: 9/11/2003, Entered: None
RESPONSE by United Assoc Journey to [521-1] motion to Lift Stay and Set Status Conference by All Plaintiffs (elp) (Entered: 09/11/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 521 Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: None
MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Lift Stay and Set Status Conference (elp) (Entered: 08/25/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 520 Filed: 8/8/2003, Entered: None
MOTION by Diane Robinson Qaadir to Intervene as a Pla under rule 24 of the FRCP by Diane Robinson Qaadir (sah) (Entered: 08/12/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 519 Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: None
LETTER dated 6/26/03 TO: RET FROM: Deana Lejarza RE: status of stay (dcb) (Entered: 06/30/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 518 Filed: 4/15/2003, Entered: None
EIGHTH AMENDED COMPLAINT by All Plaintiffs amending [1-1] complaint (elp) (Entered: 04/15/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 517 Filed: 4/15/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [516-1] motion for Leave to File Eighth Amended Complaint by Roberta McDomic ( signed by Mag. Judge Docia L. Dalby ), issued notices. (elp) (Entered: 04/15/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 516 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: None
MOTION by Roberta McDomic for Leave to File Eighth Amended Complaint (elp) Modified on 03/31/2003 (Entered: 03/18/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 515 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [514-1] motion to Lift Stay to file plas' motion for leave of court to File Eighth Amended Complaint by All Plaintiffs ( signed by Judge Ralph E. Tyson ), issued notices. (elp) (Entered: 03/18/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 2/20/2003, Entered: None
MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Lift Stay to file plas' motion for leave of court to File Eighth Amended Complaint (elp) Modified on 03/05/2003 (Entered: 02/20/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 513 Filed: 2/13/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
RULING granting [509-1] motion to Stay Proceedings against Legion Insurance Co by Legion Insurance Co, granting [425-1] motion to Stay by United Assoc of Jour...the Clerk shall administratively terminate this action in his record, without prejudice to the right of the parties to reopen the proceedings...all pending motions are hereby dismissed, without prejudice, as moot, reserving the parties right to re-urge the motions should this action be reinstated on the docket of this court... dismissing [507-1] motion to Stay Proceedings by Legion Insurance Co, dismissing [478-1] motion to server under rule 42(b) or separate trial under rule 21 by All Plaintiffs, dismissing [443-1] motion for Protective Order by All Plaintiffs, dismissing [432-1] motion to Strike Affidavits of Lisa Jennine Vaughan Swinney and Danielle Wadsack by United Assoc of Jour, dismissing [428-1] motion to Strike [407-1] motion to Compel by United Assoc of Jour, [407-2] motion for Sanctions by United Assoc of Jour by All Plaintiffs, dismissing [422-1] motion for Reconsideration of [400-1] order by United Assoc of Jour, dismissing [411-1] motion to Compel Dfts Local 198 to Disqualify Counsel of Record or Alternatively to Provide Discovery Requested by All Plaintiffs, dismissing [407-1] motion to Compel by United Assoc of Jour, dismissing [407-2] motion for Sanctions by United Assoc of Jour, dismissing [384-1] motion to Compel Dfts Local 198 to Provide Discovery as Requested by All Plaintiffs ( signed by Judge Ralph E. Tyson ), issued notices. (elp) (Entered: 02/13/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 512 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [487-1] motion to Extend Time for opposing pla's mtn to sever under rule 42(b) or for separate trial under Rule 21 by United Assoc of Jour ( signed by Judge Ralph E. Tyson ), issued notices. (nlt) (Entered: 02/04/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 511 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [486-1] motion to Extend Time to file brief in response to pla's mtn to sever under rule 42(b) or separate trial under rule 21 by United Assoc Journey ( signed by Judge Ralph E. Tyson ), issued notices. (nlt) (Entered: 02/04/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 510 Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Legion Insurance Co in support of [509-1] motion to Stay Proceedings against Legion Insurance Co by Legion Insurance Co (clp) (Entered: 01/17/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 509 Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: None
Fifth Amended MOTION by Legion Insurance Co to Stay Proceedings against Legion Insurance Co (clp) (Entered: 01/17/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 508 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Legion Insurance Co in support of [507-1] motion to Stay Proceedings by Legion Insurance Co (clp) (Entered: 12/17/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 507 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: None
FOURTH AMENDED MOTION by Legion Insurance Co to Stay Proceedings (clp) (Entered: 12/17/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 506 Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [505-1] motion to Extend Time to File Answer to Seventh Amended Complaint by United Assoc Journey...extension granted until either 1) 20 days after any decision by the Court that the current proceedings are not stayed or 2) 20 days after any stay of these proceedings are lifted... ( signed by Mag. Judge Docia L. Dalby ), issued notices. (clp) (Entered: 12/12/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 505 Filed: 12/10/2002, Entered: None
MOTION by United Assoc Journey to Extend Time to File Answer to Seventh Amended Complaint (clp) (Entered: 12/11/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: None
ANSWER to Seventh Amended Complaint by United Assoc Journey to amended complaint (clp) (Entered: 12/09/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503 Filed: 12/3/2002, Entered: None
EXHIBIT(S) to [502-1] letter (copies of transcripts of depostitions taken by dft UA Local 198 pursuant to 11/27/02 Court's Order) (clp) (Entered: 12/04/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 502 Filed: 12/3/2002, Entered: None
LETTER dated 12/2/02 TO: Clerk, USDC FROM: Karen M. Torre RE: Copies of Condensed Transcripts pursuant to Court's Order of 11/27/02 (rec.doc.no.500) (clp) (Entered: 12/04/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501 Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
RULING...the ruling of the USMJ, dated 11/4/02, granting the Motion for Leave to File Seventh Amended Complaint is AFFIRMED... ( signed by Judge Ralph E. Tyson ), issued notices. (clp) (Entered: 11/27/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500 Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
RULING...the ruling of the USMJ dated 11/4/02, granting in part and denying in part the Motion to Compel Dfts Local 198 to provide opportunity to read and sign depositions and have copies of depositions at a reasonable cost is AFFIRMED... ( signed by Judge Ralph E. Tyson ), issued notices. (clp) (Entered: 11/27/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 499 Filed: 11/19/2002, Entered: None
NOTICE of Adoption of dft Local 198's Statement of Appeal from USMJ's order (rec.doc.num.488) in light of Stay of Proceedings by United Assoc of Jour (clp) (Entered: 11/19/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498 Filed: 11/19/2002, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by United Assoc of Jour in support of [497-1] by United Assoc of Jour (clp) (Entered: 11/19/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 497 Filed: 11/19/2002, Entered: None
Response/Statement of Appeal from USMJ's Order by United Assoc of Jour to [488-1] order re: Desposition Transcripts (clp) (Entered: 11/19/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 496 Filed: 11/19/2002, Entered: None
NOTICE of Adoption of Dft Local 198's Statement of Appeal from USMJ Order (rec.doc.num.489) in Light of Stay of Proceedings by United Assoc of Jour (clp) (Entered: 11/19/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 495 Filed: 11/19/2002, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by United Assoc of Jour in support of [494-1] by United Assoc of Jour (clp) (Entered: 11/19/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 494 Filed: 11/19/2002, Entered: None
Response/Statement of Appeal from USMJ Order by United Assoc of Jour to [489-1] order re: 7th Amended Complaint (clp) (Entered: 11/19/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 493 Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: None
SEVENTH AMENDED COMPLAINT (Answer due 11/14/02 for Legion Insurance Co, for Jeff Armstrong, for Louis LeBlanc, for United Assoc Journey, for United Assoc of Jour ) by All Plaintiffs amending [335-1] amended complaint by All Plaintiffs adding Roberta McDomic, Willie Brown, James Snowden, Wayne Dukes, Joseph Wicker (clp) (Entered: 11/05/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492 Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [420-1] motion to Extend Time for Filing Response to 6th Amended Complaint by United Assoc Journey ( signed by Mag. Judge Docia L. Dalby ), issued notices. (elp) (Entered: 11/04/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491 Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [460-1] motion to Extend Deadline for Filing Discovery Motions by United Assoc Journey as stated herein... dismissing as moot [410-1] motion to Extend Deadline for Filing Discovery Motions by United Assoc Journey ( signed by Mag. Judge Docia L. Dalby ), issued notices. (elp) (Entered: 11/04/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490 Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER dismissing as moot [461-1] motion to Stay Proceedings by Legion Insurance Co ( signed by Mag. Judge Docia L. Dalby ), issued notices. (elp) (Entered: 11/04/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 489 Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [372-1] motion for Leave to File Seventh Amended Complaint by All Plaintiffs ( signed by Mag. Judge Docia L. Dalby ), issued notices. (elp) (Entered: 11/04/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 488 Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting in part, denying in part [404-1] motion to Compel Dfts Local 198 to Provide Opportunity to Read and Sign Depositions and Have Copies of Depositions at a Reasonable Cost by All Plaintiffs...as stated herein... ( signed by Mag. Judge Docia L. Dalby ), issued notices. (elp) (Entered: 11/04/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 487 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: None
MOTION by United Assoc of Jour to Extend Time for opposing pla's mtn to sever under rule 42(b) or for separate trial under Rule 21 (clp) (Entered: 10/18/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: None
MOTION by United Assoc Journey to Extend Time to file brief in response to pla's mtn to sever under rule 42(b) or separate trial under rule 21 (clp) (Entered: 10/17/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 485 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Legion Insurance Co in support of [484-1] motion to Stay proceedings against Legion Insurance Company by Legion Insurance Co (clp) (Entered: 10/09/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 484 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: None
Third Amended MOTION by Legion Insurance Co to Stay proceedings against Legion Insurance Company (clp) (Entered: 10/09/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483 Filed: 10/7/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [482-1] motion to Extend Time to file response to 26(a) discovery as ordered 9/12/02 by All Plaintiffs reset Response to discovery deadline for 11/25/02 for All Plaintiffs ( signed by Mag. Judge Docia L. Dalby ), issued notices. (elp) (Entered: 10/07/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482 Filed: 10/1/2002, Entered: None
MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Extend Time to file response to 26(a) discovery as ordered 9/12/02 (clp) (Entered: 10/04/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 481 Filed: 10/2/2002, Entered: None
Supplemental Memo by United Assoc Journey in opposition [411-1] motion to Compel Dfts Local 198 to Disqualify Counsel of Record or Alternatively to Provide Discovery Requested by All Plaintiffs (clp) (Entered: 10/02/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 10/2/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [477-1] motion for Leave to File Supplemental Memo in opposition to plas' mtn to compel Local 198 to provide discovery as requested by United Assoc Journey ( signed by Mag. Judge Docia L. Dalby ), issued notices. (clp) (Entered: 10/02/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 479 Filed: 10/2/2002, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by All Plaintiffs in support of [478-1] motion to server under rule 42(b) or separate trial under rule 21 by All Plaintiffs (clp) (Entered: 10/02/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 478 Filed: 10/2/2002, Entered: None
MOTION by All Plaintiffs to server under rule 42(b) or separate trial under rule 21 (clp) (Entered: 10/02/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Filed: 10/1/2002, Entered: None
MOTION by United Assoc Journey for Leave to File Supplemental Memo in opposition to plas' mtn to compel Local 198 to provide discovery as requested (clp) (Entered: 10/01/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 476 Filed: 9/23/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [475-1] motion to Extend Time to file response to 26(a) Discovery by All Plaintiffs ( signed by Mag. Judge Docia L. Dalby ), issued notices. (nlt) (Entered: 09/23/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 475 Filed: 9/19/2002, Entered: None
MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Extend Time to file response to 26(a) Discovery (clp) Modified on 09/20/2002 (Entered: 09/20/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 9/18/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER dismissing [334-1] motion for Sanctions by All Plaintiffs as stated herein... ( signed by Mag. Judge Docia L. Dalby ), issued notices. (clp) (Entered: 09/18/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 9/12/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting in part, denying in part [345-1] motion for Protective Order by United Assoc Journey as stated herein... ( signed by Mag. Judge Docia L. Dalby ), issued notices. (clp) (Entered: 09/12/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472 Filed: 9/9/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting in part, denying in part [327-1] joint motion for Rule 37(b) Sanctions by Jeff Armstrong, Louis LeBlanc, United Assoc Journey, United Assoc of Jour...as stated herein... ( signed by Mag. Judge Docia L. Dalby ), issued notices. (elp) (Entered: 09/09/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 8/9/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying [322-1] motion to Remove Philip Bradley as Counsel of Record by All Plaintiffs ( signed by Mag. Judge Docia L. Dalby ), issued notices. (kmk) (Entered: 08/09/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 8/1/2002, Entered: None
Supplemental Memo by All Plaintiffs in support of [411-1] motion to Compel Dfts Local 198 to Disqualify Counsel of Record or Alternatively to Provide Discovery Requested by All Plaintiffs (kmk) (Entered: 08/02/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 8/1/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [465-1] motion for Leave to File supplemental memo in support of pla motion to compel dfts Local 198 to disqualify counsel of record as requested by All Plaintiffs ( signed by Mag. Judge Docia L. Dalby ), issued notices. (kmk) (Entered: 08/01/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 468 Filed: 8/1/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [466-1] motion to Suspend Dispositive Motion Deadline by United Assoc of Jour...the deadline will be reset after ruling on outstanding discovery motions...( signed by Mag. Judge Docia L. Dalby ), issued notices. (kmk) (Entered: 08/01/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 7/31/2002, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by United Assoc of Jour in support of [466-1] motion to Suspend Dispositive Motion Deadline by United Assoc of Jour (kmk) (Entered: 08/01/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 7/31/2002, Entered: None
MOTION by United Assoc of Jour (Attorney ) to Suspend Dispositive Motion Deadline (kmk) (Entered: 08/01/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 7/31/2002, Entered: None
MOTION by All Plaintiffs (Attorney ) for Leave to File supplemental memo in support of pla motion to compel dfts Local 198 to disqualify counsel of record as requested (nlt) (Entered: 07/31/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: None
REPLY by All Plaintiffs to response to [384-1] motion to Compel Dfts Local 198 to Provide Discovery as Requested by All Plaintiffs (kmk) (Entered: 07/31/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 6/26/2002, Entered: None
SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION by United Assoc of Jour (kmk) (Entered: 07/31/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 7/23/2002, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Legion Insurance Co in support of [461-1] motion to Stay Proceedings by Legion Insurance Co (kmk) (Entered: 07/24/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 7/23/2002, Entered: None
SECOND MOTION by Legion Insurance Co (Attorney ) to Stay Proceedings (kmk) (Entered: 07/24/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 7/11/2002, Entered: None
SECOND MOTION by United Assoc Journey (Attorney ) to Extend Deadline for Filing Discovery Motions (kmk) (Entered: 07/11/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 7/8/2002, Entered: None
ANSWER by United Assoc Journey (Attorney ) to 6th amended complaint (kmk) (Entered: 07/10/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 6/28/2002, Entered: None
RETURN on Subpoena to U.A. Local 198 Health and Welfare, and Pension Fund (kmk) (Entered: 06/28/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 6/26/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [455-1] motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority in Support of its Motion for Reconsideration by United Assoc of Jour ( signed by Judge Ralph E. Tyson ), issued notices. (kmk) (Entered: 06/26/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by United Assoc of Jour in support of [455-1] motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority in Support of its Motion for Reconsideration by United Assoc of Jour (kmk) (Entered: 06/25/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: None
MOTION by United Assoc of Jour (Attorney ) for Leave to File Supplemental Authority in Support of its Motion for Reconsideration (kmk) (Entered: 06/25/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 6/19/2002, Entered: None
NOTICE by All Plaintiffs to take deposition of U.A. Local Health and Welfare, and Pension Fund, et al... (kmk) (Entered: 06/19/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 6/12/2002, Entered: None
NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing Set for 8/3/02 at 10:00 , issued notices. (kmk) (Entered: 06/13/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 6/11/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER...oral argument set in this matter for 6/28/02 at 10:00am in Courtroom 5 is CANCELLED...all motions that have completed the briefing cycle are considered submitted for decision...vacating [430-1] relief Oral argument set for 10:00 6/28/02 before DLD in Courtroom 5 for [322-1] motion to Remove Philip Bradley as Counsel of Record, set for 10:00 6/28/02 before DLD in Courtroom 5 for [327-1] joint motion for Rule 37(b) Sanctions, set for 10:00 6/28/02 before DLD in Courtroom 5 for [334-1] motion for Sanctions, set for 10:00 6/28/02 before DLD in Courtroom 5 for [345-1] motion for Protective Order, set for 10:00 6/28/02 before DLD in Courtroom 5 for [372-1] motion for Leave to File Seventh Amended Complaint, set for 10:00 6/28/02 before DLD in Courtroom 5 for [384-1] motion to Compel Dfts Local 198 to Provide Discovery as Requested, set for 10:00 6/28/02 before DLD in Courtroom 5 for [404-1] motion to Compel Dfts Local 198 to Provide Opportunity to Read and Sign Depositions and Have Copies of Depositions at a Reasonable Cost, set for 10:00 6/28/02 before DLD in Courtroom 5 for [407-1] motion to Compel, set for 10:00 6/28/02 before DLD in Courtroom 5 for [407-2] motion for Sanctions, set for 10:00 6/28/02 before DLD in Courtroom 5 for [410-1] motion to Extend Deadline for Filing Discovery Motions, vacating [430-2] order, vacating [431-1] relief Oral argument set for 10:00 6/28/02 in Courtroom 5 before DLD for [428-1] motion to Strike [407-1] motion to Compel by United Assoc of Jour, [407-2] motion for Sanctions by United Assoc of Jour, set for 10:00 6/28/02 in Courtroom 5 before DLD for [420-1] motion to Extend Time for Filing Response to 6th Amended Complaint, vacating [431-2] order, DENYING AS MOOT [450-1] motion for Expedited Hearing on [448-1] motion to Defer Hearing Pending Resolution of Motions for Stay by Legion Insurance Co, United Assoc Journey by Legion Insurance Co, United Assoc Journey, DENYING AS MOOT [448-1] motion to Defer Hearing Pending Resolution of Motions for Stay by Legion Insurance Co, United Assoc Journey ( signed by Mag. Judge Docia L. Dalby ), issued notices. (kmk) (Entered: 06/11/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 6/7/2002, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by United Assoc Journey in support of [448-1] motion to Defer Hearing Pending Resolution of Motions for Stay by Legion Insurance Co, United Assoc Journey (elp) (Entered: 06/07/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 6/7/2002, Entered: None
MOTION by United Assoc Journey, Legion Insurance Co (Attorney ) for Expedited Hearing on [448-1] motion to Defer Hearing Pending Resolution of Motions for Stay by Legion Insurance Co, United Assoc Journey (elp) (Entered: 06/07/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 6/7/2002, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by United Assoc Journey, Legion Insurance Co in support of [448-1] motion to Defer Hearing Pending Resolution of Motions for Stay by Legion Insurance Co, United Assoc Journey (elp) (Entered: 06/07/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 6/7/2002, Entered: None
MOTION by United Assoc Journey, Legion Insurance Co to Defer Hearing Pending Resolution of Motions for Stay (elp) (Entered: 06/07/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 6/5/2002, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by United Assoc of Jour in opposition to [443-1] motion for Protective Order by All Plaintiffs (kmk) (Entered: 06/06/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 6/4/2002, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by All Plaintiffs in opposition to [443-1] motion for Protective Order by All Plaintiffs (kmk) (Entered: 06/04/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 6/3/2002, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by All Plaintiffs in opposition to [432-1] motion to Strike Affidavits of Lisa Jennine Vaughan Swinney and Danielle Wadsack by United Assoc of Jour (kmk) (Entered: 06/04/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 6/3/2002, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by All Plaintiffs in opposition to [407-2] motion for Sanctions by United Assoc of Jour (kmk) (Entered: 06/03/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 5/30/2002, Entered: None
MOTION by All Plaintiffs for Protective Order ( Motion Hearing set for 9:00 7/9/02 ) (clp) (Entered: 05/30/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 5/30/2002, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by All Plaintiffs in opposition to [422-1] motion for Reconsideration of [400-1] order by United Assoc of Jour (clp) (Entered: 05/30/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 5/29/2002, Entered: None
REPLY by Legion Insurance Co to response to [417-1] motion to Stay by Legion Insurance Co (clp) (Entered: 05/30/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 5/29/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [438-1] motion for Leave to File reply memorandum by Legion Insurance Co ( signed by Judge Ralph E. Tyson ), issued notices. (nlt) (Entered: 05/29/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 5/29/2002, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by United Assoc of Jour in opposition to [428-1] motion to Strike [407-1] motion to Compel by United Assoc of Jour, [407-2] motion for Sanctions by United Assoc of Jour by All Plaintiffs (elp) (Entered: 05/29/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 5/28/2002, Entered: None
MOTION by Legion Insurance Co for Leave to File reply memorandum (nlt) (Entered: 05/29/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 5/22/2002, Entered: None
LETTER dated 5/10/02 TO: DLD FROM: Charlotte C. McDaniel RE: Withdrawal of portion of plas' motion to dismiss Mr. Robein as it relates to service of the discovery resposes to Nancy Picard on requesting his home address...Please strike from motion any reference to the discovery requesting Mr. Robein's home address... (kmk) (Entered: 05/22/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 5/21/2002, Entered: None
NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing set for 10:00 6/21/02 for [432-1] motion to Strike Affidavits of Lisa Jennine Vaughan Swinney and Danielle Wadsack . (kmk) (Entered: 05/21/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by United Assoc of Jour in opposition to [404-1] motion to Compel Dfts Local 198 to Provide Opportunity to Read and Sign Depositions and Have Copies of Depositions at a Reasonable Cost by All Plaintiffs (kmk) (Entered: 05/21/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by United Assoc of Jour in opposition to [411-1] motion to Compel Dfts Local 198 to Disqualify Counsel of Record or Alternatively to Provide Discovery Requested by All Plaintiffs (kmk) (Entered: 05/21/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by United Assoc of Jour in support of [432-1] motion to Strike Affidavits of Lisa Jennine Vaughan Swinney and Danielle Wadsack by United Assoc of Jour (kmk) (Entered: 05/21/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: None
MOTION by United Assoc of Jour (Attorney ) to Strike Affidavits of Lisa Jennine Vaughan Swinney and Danielle Wadsack ...atty to submit notice of hearing... (kmk) Modified on 05/21/2002 (Entered: 05/20/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER denying [429-1] motion for Expedited Hearing on [428-1] motion to Strike [407-1] motion to Compel by United Assoc of Jour, [407-2] motion for Sanctions by United Assoc of Jour by All Plaintiffs by All Plaintiffs...It is ordered that the following motions be added to those already scheduled for oral argument on 6/28/02 at 10:00am in Courtroom 5...10) Plas' Motion and Incorporated Memo to Strike Dft United Assoc. of Journeyman and Apprentices...Motion to Compel and for Sanctions (rec.doc.428) and (11) Dft United Association's Motion and Incorporated Memorandum to Extend Deadline for Filing Response to 6th Amended Complaint (rec.doc. 420)... Oral argument set for 10:00 6/28/02 in Courtroom 5 before DLD for [428-1] motion to Strike [407-1] motion to Compel by United Assoc of Jour, [407-2] motion for Sanctions by United Assoc of Jour, set for 10:00 6/28/02 in Courtroom 5 before DLD for [420-1] motion to Extend Time for Filing Response to 6th Amended Complaint ( signed by Mag. Judge Docia L. Dalby ), issued notices. (kmk) Modified on 05/20/2002 (Entered: 05/20/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 5/15/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER...oral argument will be had on the following motions on 6/28/02 at 10:00am in Courtroom 5... Oral argument set for 10:00 6/28/02 before DLD in Courtroom 5 for [322-1] motion to Remove Philip Bradley as Counsel of Record, set for 10:00 6/28/02 before DLD in Courtroom 5 for [327-1] joint motion for Rule 37(b) Sanctions, set for 10:00 6/28/02 before DLD in Courtroom 5 for [334-1] motion for Sanctions, set for 10:00 6/28/02 before DLD in Courtroom 5 for [345-1] motion for Protective Order, set for 10:00 6/28/02 before DLD in Courtroom 5 for [372-1] motion for Leave to File Seventh Amended Complaint, set for 10:00 6/28/02 before DLD in Courtroom 5 for [384-1] motion to Compel Dfts Local 198 to Provide Discovery as Requested, set for 10:00 6/28/02 before DLD in Courtroom 5 for [404-1] motion to Compel Dfts Local 198 to Provide Opportunity to Read and Sign Depositions and Have Copies of Depositions at a Reasonable Cost, set for 10:00 6/28/02 before DLD in Courtroom 5 for [407-1] motion to Compel, set for 10:00 6/28/02 before DLD in Courtroom 5 for [407-2] motion for Sanctions, set for 10:00 6/28/02 before DLD in Courtroom 5 for [410-1] motion to Extend Deadline for Filing Discovery Motions ( signed by Mag. Judge Docia L. Dalby ), issued notices. (kmk) (Entered: 05/15/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 5/15/2002, Entered: None
MOTION by All Plaintiffs (Attorney ) for Expedited Hearing on [428-1] motion to Strike [407-1] motion to Compel by United Assoc of Jour, [407-2] motion for Sanctions by United Assoc of Jour by All Plaintiffs (kmk) (Entered: 05/15/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 5/15/2002, Entered: None
MOTION by All Plaintiffs (Attorney ) to Strike [407-1] motion to Compel by United Assoc of Jour, [407-2] motion for Sanctions by United Assoc of Jour ( Motion Hearing set for 10:00 6/21/02 ) (kmk) (Entered: 05/15/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 5/13/2002, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by United Assoc of Jour in support of [425-1] motion to Stay by United Assoc of Jour (kmk) (Entered: 05/14/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 5/13/2002, Entered: None
Response by All Plaintiffs to [417-1] motion to Stay by Legion Insurance Co, [420-1] motion to Extend Time for Filing Response to 6th Amended Complaint by United Assoc Journey (kmk) (Entered: 05/14/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 5/9/2002, Entered: None
MOTION by United Assoc of Jour (Attorney ) to Stay ( Motion Hearing set for 10:00 7/19/02 ) (kmk) (Entered: 05/09/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 5/8/2002, Entered: None
NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing set for 10:00 7/5/02 for [413-1] motion to Stay Proceedings , issued notices. (kmk) (Entered: 05/08/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by United Assoc of Jour in support of [422-1] motion for Reconsideration of [400-1] order by United Assoc of Jour (kmk) (Entered: 05/08/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: None
MOTION by United Assoc of Jour (Attorney ) for Reconsideration of [400-1] order ( Motion Hearing set for 10:00 7/19/02 ) (kmk) (Entered: 05/08/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: None
ANSWER by United Assoc of Jour (Attorney ) to SIXTH AMENDED COMPLAINT (kmk) (Entered: 05/08/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 5/8/2002, Entered: None
MOTION by United Assoc Journey (Attorney ) to Extend Time for Filing Response to 6th Amended Complaint (kmk) (Entered: 05/08/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [390-1] joint motion to Extend Deadline for Filing Discovery Motions by Jeff Armstrong, Louis LeBlanc, United Assoc Journey, United Assoc of Jour ( signed by Mag. Judge Docia L. Dalby ), issued notices. (nlt) (Entered: 05/07/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Legion Insurance Co in support of [417-1] motion to Stay by Legion Insurance Co (kmk) (Entered: 05/07/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: None
AMENDED MOTION by Legion Insurance Co (Attorney ) to Stay ...atty to submit notice of hearing... (kmk) (Entered: 05/07/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Legion Insurance Co in support of [415-1] motion for Expedited Hearing on [413-1] motion to Stay Proceedings by Legion Insurance Co by Legion Insurance Co (kmk) (Entered: 05/07/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: None
MOTION by Legion Insurance Co (Attorney ) for Expedited Hearing on [413-1] motion to Stay Proceedings by Legion Insurance Co (kmk) (Entered: 05/07/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Legion Insurance Co in support of [413-1] motion to Stay Proceedings by Legion Insurance Co (kmk) (Entered: 05/07/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 5/2/2002, Entered: None
MOTION by Legion Insurance Co (Attorney ) to Stay Proceedings ...atty to submit notice of hearing... (kmk) (Entered: 05/03/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 5/1/2002, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by All Plaintiffs in support of [411-1] motion to Compel Dfts Local 198 to Disqualify Counsel of Record or Alternatively to Provide Discovery Requested by All Plaintiffs (kmk) (Entered: 05/02/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 5/1/2002, Entered: None
MOTION by All Plaintiffs (Attorney ) to Compel Dfts Local 198 to Disqualify Counsel of Record or Alternatively to Provide Discovery Requested ( Motion Hearing set for 10:00 6/21/02 ) (kmk) (Entered: 05/02/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: None
MOTION by United Assoc Journey (Attorney ) to Extend Deadline for Filing Discovery Motions (kmk) (Entered: 05/01/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: None
EXHIBIT(S) to [408-1] support memorandum by United Assoc of Jour (kmk) (Entered: 04/30/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by United Assoc of Jour in support of [407-1] motion to Compel by United Assoc of Jour, [407-2] motion for Sanctions by United Assoc of Jour (kmk) (Entered: 04/30/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: None
MOTION by United Assoc of Jour (Attorney ) to Compel , and for Sanctions ( Motion Hearing set for 10:00 7/5/02 ) (kmk) (Entered: 04/30/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [401-1] motion for Leave to File Response to Dfts United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipe Fitting Industry of the USA and Canada, AFL-CIO, Local 198's Opposition to Plas' Motion to Compel Local 198 to Provide Discovery Requested by All Plaintiffs ( signed by Mag. Judge Docia L. Dalby ), issued notices. (kmk) (Entered: 04/30/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by All Plaintiffs in support of [404-1] motion to Compel Dfts Local 198 to Provide Opportunity to Read and Sign Depositions and Have Copies of Depositions at a Reasonable Cost by All Plaintiffs (kmk) (Entered: 04/30/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: None
MOTION by All Plaintiffs (Attorney ) to Compel Dfts Local 198 to Provide Opportunity to Read and Sign Depositions and Have Copies of Depositions at a Reasonable Cost ( Motion Hearing set for 10:00 6/21/02 ) (kmk) (Entered: 04/30/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 4/29/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER ... Following upon dfts notification concerning the Legion Ins Company liquidation proceedings in Pennsylvania, the court is not in a position to render advisory guidance absent a motion ... ( signed by Mag. Judge Docia L. Dalby ), issued notices. (nlt) Modified on 05/02/2002 (Entered: 04/29/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 4/29/2002, Entered: None
NOTICE of Order issued by the Commonwealth Court of Pennsylvania (nlt) (Entered: 04/29/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 4/26/2002, Entered: None
MOTION by All Plaintiffs (Attorney ) for Leave to File Response to Dfts United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipe Fitting Industry of the USA and Canada, AFL-CIO, Local 198's Opposition to Plas' Motion to Compel Local 198 to Provide Discovery Requested (kmk) (Entered: 04/26/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 4/24/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
RULING...for the foregoing reasons...denying without prejudice [257-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment by United Assoc of Jour, denying [293-1] motion to Strike Affidavits and Exhibit by United Assoc of Jour, dismissing [361-1] Magistrate appeal, affirming [333-1] order granting plas leave to file 6th amended complaint..., granting [393-1] Magistrate appeal, vacating [389-1] order regarding mediation...although it may be appropriate at a future time...The undersigned exercises his prerogative as a senior judge and declines to preside over this matter any longer...( signed by Judge John V. Parker ), issued notices. (kmk) (Entered: 04/24/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None
Response by All Plaintiffs to [393-1] Magistrate appeal (kmk) (Entered: 04/22/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [397-1] motion for Leave to File Response to Dfts' Joint Appeal of Magistrate's Order of Referral to Mediation by All Plaintiffs ( signed by Judge John V. Parker ), issued notices. (kmk) (Entered: 04/19/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 4/18/2002, Entered: None
MOTION by All Plaintiffs (Attorney ) for Leave to File Response to Dfts' Joint Appeal of Magistrate's Order of Referral to Mediation (kmk) (Entered: 04/19/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 4/18/2002, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by United Assoc of Jour in opposition to [384-1] motion to Compel Dfts Local 198 to Provide Discovery as Requested by All Plaintiffs (kmk) (Entered: 04/19/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 4/17/2002, Entered: None
REPLY by All Plaintiffs to response to [372-1] motion for Leave to File Seventh Amended Complaint by All Plaintiffs (kmk) (Entered: 04/17/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 4/17/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [392-1] motion for Leave to File reply to response to motion by All Plaintiffs ( signed by Mag. Judge Docia L. Dalby ), issued notices. (kmk) (Entered: 04/17/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 4/12/2002, Entered: None
APPEAL of Magistrate Decision to District Court of [389-1] order (kmk) (Entered: 04/12/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 4/10/2002, Entered: None
MOTION by All Plaintiffs for Leave to File reply to response to motion (nlt) (Entered: 04/10/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 4/2/2002, Entered: None
Response by All Plaintiffs to [379-1] opposition memorandum by United Assoc Journey, United Assoc of Jour (kmk) (Entered: 04/04/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 4/1/2002, Entered: None
JOINT MOTION by United Assoc of Jour, United Assoc Journey, Louis LeBlanc, Jeff Armstrong to Extend Deadline for Filing Discovery Motions (kmk) (Entered: 04/02/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 3/28/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER...considering the opposition to the referral of this matter to mediation...It is ordered that the objection is overruled for the following reasons and the order of referral is affirmed...Unresolved liability and damages issues are inherent in litigation and are not valid reasons to decline mediation. However the order of referral to mediation will be deferred until 4/16/02....( signed by Mag. Judge Docia L. Dalby ), issued notices. (kmk) (Entered: 03/28/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 3/28/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [380-1] motion to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Legion Insurance Co...Legion Insurance Co. shall have until 4/15/02 to file responsive pleadings...further process of the referral to mediation shall be deferred until 4/16/02... Reset Answer deadline to 4/15/02 for Legion Insurance Co ( signed by Mag. Judge Docia L. Dalby ), issued notices. (kmk) (Entered: 03/28/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 3/28/2002, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by United Assoc of Jour, United Assoc Journey in opposition to [372-1] motion for Leave to File Seventh Amended Complaint by All Plaintiffs (kmk) (Entered: 03/28/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 3/27/2002, Entered: None
EXHIBIT(S) to [385-1] support memorandum by All Plaintiffs (kmk) (Entered: 03/27/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 3/27/2002, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by All Plaintiffs in support of [384-1] motion to Compel Dfts Local 198 to Provide Discovery as Requested by All Plaintiffs (kmk) (Entered: 03/27/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 3/27/2002, Entered: None
MOTION by All Plaintiffs (Attorney ) to Compel Dfts Local 198 to Provide Discovery as Requested ( Motion Hearing set for 10:00 5/3/02 ) (kmk) (Entered: 03/27/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [382-1] motion to enroll Robert P. Curley as additional counsel as pro-hac vice by United Assoc of Jour enrolling additional attorney ( signed by Mag. Judge Docia L. Dalby ), issued notices. (kmk) (Entered: 03/25/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 3/22/2002, Entered: None
MOTION by United Assoc of Jour (Attorney ) to enroll Robert P. Curley additional counsel (kmk) (Entered: 03/25/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 3/22/2002, Entered: None
Response by All Plaintiffs to [380-1] motion to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Legion Insurance Co (kmk) (Entered: 03/25/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 3/20/2002, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Legion Insurance Co in opposition to [373-1] order (kmk) (Entered: 03/20/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 3/20/2002, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by United Assoc of Jour, United Assoc Journey in opposition to [373-1] order (kmk) (Entered: 03/20/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 3/18/2002, Entered: None
NOTICE by United Assoc of Jour, Louis LeBlanc, Jeff Armstrong to take deposition of Herbert Lavergne, Joseph Payne, et al. (kmk) (Entered: 03/19/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 3/18/2002, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by All Plaintiffs in opposition to [361-1] Magistrate appeal (kmk) (Entered: 03/19/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [374-1] motion for Daniel J. McNeal to Appear Pro Hac Vice by United Assoc of Jour ( signed by Mag. Judge Docia L. Dalby ), issued notices. (kmk) (Entered: 03/12/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 3/11/2002, Entered: None
NOTICE by United Assoc of Jour, Louis LeBlanc, Jeff Armstrong to take deposition of Joseph Stone, Jacqueline Edwards, et al... (kmk) (Entered: 03/11/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 3/11/2002, Entered: None
MOTION by United Assoc of Jour (Attorney ) for Daniel J. McNeal to Appear Pro Hac Vice (kmk) (Entered: 03/11/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 3/8/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION/EARLY NEUTRAL EVALUATION...this matter is hereby referred to mediation based upon the request of at least one of the parties, or by order of the Court...any opposition to this referral must be filed within 7 days of the date of this order...the ADR Clerk is hereby ordered to send notice of this referral by copy of this order, and a copy of the Register of Neutrals to all counsel of record and unrepresented parties... ( signed by Mag. Judge Docia L. Dalby ), issued notices. (kmk) (Entered: 03/11/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 3/7/2002, Entered: None
MOTION by All Plaintiffs (Attorney ) for Leave to File Seventh Amended Complaint (kmk) (Entered: 03/08/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 3/6/2002, Entered: None
NOTICE by United Assoc of Jour, Louis LeBlanc, Jeff Armstrong to take deposition of Ivan Morgan (kmk) (Entered: 03/07/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 3/6/2002, Entered: None
REPLY by All Plaintiffs to response to [348-1] motion for Leave to File Reply to Dft United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipe Fitting Industry of the USA and Canada, AFL-CIO, Local 198's Opposition to Plas' Motion to Exclude Witnesses by All Plaintiffs...Reply Filed into Record Per L'Reece D. on 3/6/02... (kmk) (Entered: 03/06/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 3/6/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [337-1] motion for Jean M. Kelly and Teresa W. Murray to Appear Pro Hac Vice by United Assoc Journey, granting [368-1] motion for Leave to Substitute Certificate of Good Standing by United Assoc of Jour ( signed by Mag. Judge Docia L. Dalby ), issued notices. (kmk) (Entered: 03/06/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 3/5/2002, Entered: None
MOTION by United Assoc of Jour (Attorney ) for Leave to Substitute Certificate of Good Standing (kmk) (Entered: 03/05/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 3/5/2002, Entered: None
REPLY by All Plaintiffs to response to [334-1] motion for Sanctions by All Plaintiffs (kmk) (Entered: 03/05/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 3/5/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [360-1] motion for Leave to File Plas' Response to Dfts United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the US and Canada, AFL-CIO and United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the US and Canada, AFL-CIO, Local 198's Joint Memorandum in Oppostion to Plas' Motion for Sanctions by All Plaintiffs ( signed by Mag. Judge Docia L. Dalby ), issued notices. (kmk) (Entered: 03/05/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 3/1/2002, Entered: None
NOTICE by United Assoc of Jour, Louis LeBlanc, Jeff Armstrong to take deposition of Michael Robertson, Leo Davis, Mannie Henderson, Louis Square, et al.... (kmk) (Entered: 03/01/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 3/1/2002, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Legion Insurance Co 2/22/02 Answer due on 3/14/02 for Legion Insurance Co (kmk) (Entered: 03/01/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: None
EXHIBIT(S) to [362-1] support memorandum by United Assoc Journey (kmk) (Entered: 03/01/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by United Assoc Journey in support of [361-1] Magistrate appeal (kmk) (Entered: 03/01/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: None
APPEAL of Magistrate Decision to District Court of [333-1] order (kmk) (Entered: 03/01/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 2/27/2002, Entered: None
MOTION by All Plaintiffs (Attorney ) for Leave to File Plas' Response to Dfts United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the US and Canada, AFL-CIO and United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the US and Canada, AFL-CIO, Local 198's Joint Memorandum in Oppostion to Plas' Motion for Sanctions (kmk) (Entered: 02/28/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 2/27/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [358-1] motion to Substitute Original Signed Declaration for Copy by United Assoc Journey, United Assoc of Jour ( signed by Mag. Judge Docia L. Dalby ), issued notices. (kmk) (Entered: 02/27/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 2/26/2002, Entered: None
MOTION by United Assoc of Jour, United Assoc Journey (Attorney ) to Substitute Original Signed Declaration for Copy (kmk) (Entered: 02/27/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 2/25/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER...oral argument held on 2/22/02 on several outstanding discovery motions... granting in part, denying in part [338-1] motion for Order to Allow Telephonic and Video Deposition by All Plaintiffs, deferring [345-1] motion for Protective Order United Assoc Journey...pending decision on the dfts' motion for summary judgment by the district judge..., denying [316-1] motion to Exclude Individuals Named as Witnesses in Local 198's Third Supplemental and Amended Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures by All Plaintiffs, denying [318-1] motion to Compel Dfts Local 198 to Provide Responses as Requested in the Notice of 30(b)(5) Deposition Records Only by All Plaintiffs, denying [340-1] motion for Protective Order in Response to Dft United Association's 3rd Request for Production of Documents by All Plaintiffs...the plas are ordered to respond to the request for production of documents within 30 days either by providing the requested documents or objecting as appropriate, except to No. 5 which is stricken..., denying [349-1] motion to Treat 2/19/02 Letter From Plas' Counsel as Motion by United Assoc of Jour, granting [339-1] motion for Expedited Hearing on [338-1] motion for Order to Allow Telephonic and Video Deposition by All Plaintiffs by All Plaintiffs, granting [347-1] motion for Expedited Hearing on [345-1] motion for Protective Order by United Assoc Journey by United Assoc Journey...prior to the filing of any discovery motions, Ms. Picard and Ms. McDaniel shall meet in person and attempt to resolve the conflict...a certificate that they have met shall be attached to any future discovery motion with this court... ( signed by Mag. Judge Docia L. Dalby ), issued notices. (kmk) (Entered: 02/26/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 2/25/2002, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by United Assoc of Jour, United Assoc Journey in opposition to [334-1] motion for Sanctions by All Plaintiffs (kmk) (Entered: 02/25/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 2/25/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [352-1] motion to enroll Louis P. Malone III as additional counsel by United Assoc Journey enrolling additional attorney ( signed by Mag. Judge Docia L. Dalby ), issued notices. (kmk) (Entered: 02/25/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 2/25/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute entry:...oral argument held on 2/22/02 on all outstanding discovery motions...the parties presented argument...the Court will issue a ruling on the motions by separate order...( signed by Mag. Judge Docia L. Dalby ) (kmk) (Entered: 02/25/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 2/22/2002, Entered: None
NOTICE by United Assoc of Jour to take deposition of Charles Taylor, Frank Alexander, Kenny Adams, Donald Keller, Johnny Huggins, Jackie Edwards, Fred Wicker, & Donald Bennett... (kmk) (Entered: 02/25/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 2/22/2002, Entered: None
MOTION by United Assoc Journey (Attorney ) to enroll Louis P. Malone III as additional counsel (kmk) (Entered: 02/22/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER...ALL OUTSTANDING DISCOVERY MOTIONS will be brought before DLD at 2:00pm on 2/22/02 in Courtroom 5... Motion Hearing set for 2:00 2/22/02 for [348-1] motion for Leave to File Reply to Dft United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipe Fitting Industry of the USA and Canada, AFL-CIO, Local 198's Opposition to Plas' Motion to Exclude Witnesses, set for 2:00 2/22/02 for [345-1] motion for Protective Order, set for 2:00 2/22/02 for [340-1] motion for Protective Order in Response to Dft United Association's 3rd Request for Production of Documents, set for 2:00 2/22/02 for [338-1] motion for Order to Allow Telephonic and Video Deposition, set for 2:00 2/22/02 for [318-1] motion to Compel Dfts Local 198 to Provide Responses as Requested in the Notice of 30(b)(5) Deposition Records Only, set for 2:00 2/22/02 for [316-1] motion to Exclude Individuals Named as Witnesses in Local 198's Third Supplemental and Amended Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures ...Attys Nancy Picard and Charlotte McDaniel shall appear in person to argue the motions...( signed by Mag. Judge Docia L. Dalby ), issued notices. (kmk) (Entered: 02/22/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER [349-1] motion to Treat 2/19/02 Letter From Plas' Counsel as Motion by United Assoc of Jour referred to Mag. Judge Docia L. Dalby ( signed by Judge John V. Parker ), issued notices. (kmk) (Entered: 02/21/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: None
MOTION by United Assoc of Jour (Attorney ) to Treat 2/19/02 Letter From Plas' Counsel as Motion ( Motion Hearing set for 10:00 4/5/02 ) (kmk) (Entered: 02/21/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: None
MOTION by All Plaintiffs (Attorney ) for Leave to File Reply to Dft United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipe Fitting Industry of the USA and Canada, AFL-CIO, Local 198's Opposition to Plas' Motion to Exclude Witnesses (kmk) (Entered: 02/21/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: None
MOTION by United Assoc Journey (Attorney ) for Expedited Hearing on [345-1] motion for Protective Order by United Assoc Journey (kmk) (Entered: 02/21/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by United Assoc Journey in support of [345-1] motion for Protective Order by United Assoc Journey (kmk) (Entered: 02/21/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: None
MOTION by United Assoc Journey (Attorney ) for Protective Order ( Motion Hearing set for 10:00 4/5/02 ) (kmk) (Entered: 02/21/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: None
NOTICE by United Assoc of Jour, Louis LeBlanc, Jeff Armstrong to take deposition of George Jackson, Doris White, Joseph Catherine, Ernest Ford, Ernest Johnson, Lionel Jackson... (kmk) (Entered: 02/21/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by All Plaintiffs in opposition to [327-1] joint motion for Rule 37(b) Sanctions by Jeff Armstrong, Louis LeBlanc, United Assoc Journey, United Assoc of Jour (kmk) (Entered: 02/21/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 2/19/2002, Entered: None
NOTICE by United Assoc of Jour to take deposition of George Jackson, Doris White, Leo Davis, Ernest Ford, Ernest Johnson, Lionel Jackson (kmk) (Entered: 02/20/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 2/19/2002, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by United Assoc of Jour in opposition to [318-1] motion to Compel Dfts Local 198 to Provide Responses as Requested in the Notice of 30(b)(5) Deposition Records Only by All Plaintiffs (kmk) (Entered: 02/19/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 2/19/2002, Entered: None
MOTION by All Plaintiffs (Attorney ) for Protective Order in Response to Dft United Association's 3rd Request for Production of Documents ( Motion Hearing set for 9:00 4/5/02 ) (kmk) (Entered: 02/19/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 2/19/2002, Entered: None
MOTION by All Plaintiffs (Attorney ) for Expedited Hearing on [338-1] motion for Order to Allow Telephonic and Video Deposition by All Plaintiffs ( Motion Hearing set for 9:00 4/5/02 ) (kmk) (Entered: 02/19/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 2/19/2002, Entered: None
MOTION by All Plaintiffs (Attorney ) for Order to Allow Telephonic and Video Deposition ( Motion Hearing set for 9:00 4/5/02 ) (kmk) (Entered: 02/19/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 2/15/2002, Entered: None
MOTION by United Assoc Journey (Attorney ) for Jean M. Kelly and Teresa W. Murray to Appear Pro Hac Vice (kmk) (Entered: 02/15/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 2/14/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER...[334-1] motion for Sanctions by All Plaintiffs filed on 2/14/02 is hereby referred to Mag. Judge Docia L. Dalby ( signed by Judge John V. Parker ), issued notices. (kmk) (Entered: 02/15/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 2/14/2002, Entered: None
SIXTH AMENDED COMPLAINT (Answer due 2/24/02 for Jeff Armstrong, for Louis LeBlanc, for United Assoc Journey, for United Assoc of Jour ) by All Plaintiffs amending [274-1] amended complaint by All Plaintiffs, [283-1] amended complaint by All Plaintiffs, [227-1] amended complaint by All Plaintiffs, [1-1] complaint adding George Fountain, Ronald Smith, Freddie Judson Jr, Legion Insurance Co (kmk) (Entered: 02/14/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 2/14/2002, Entered: None
MOTION by All Plaintiffs (Attorney ) for Sanctions ( Motion Hearing set for 10:00 3/15/02 ) (kmk) (Entered: 02/14/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 2/14/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [292-1] motion for Leave to File Sixth Amended Complaint by All Plaintiffs ( signed by Mag. Judge Docia L. Dalby ), issued notices. (kmk) (Entered: 02/14/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 2/14/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [311-1] motion to Strike [308-1] response reply by All Plaintiffs or in the alternative, Opposition to Plas' Motion for Leave to File Reply by Jeff Armstrong, Louis LeBlanc, United Assoc Journey, United Assoc of Jour, striking [313-1] response reply ( signed by Mag. Judge Docia L. Dalby ), issued notices. (kmk) (Entered: 02/14/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 2/13/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER [327-1] joint motion for Rule 37(b) Sanctions by Jeff Armstrong, Louis LeBlanc, United Assoc Journey, United Assoc of Jour referred to Mag. Judge Docia L. Dalby ( signed by Judge John V. Parker ), issued notices. (kmk) (Entered: 02/13/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 2/13/2002, Entered: None
NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing set for 10:00 4/5/02 for [327-1] joint motion for Rule 37(b) Sanctions . (kmk) (Entered: 02/13/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 2/12/2002, Entered: None
EXHIBIT(S) to [328-1] support memorandum by Jeff Armstrong, Louis LeBlanc, United Assoc Journey, United Assoc of Jour (kmk) (Entered: 02/12/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 2/12/2002, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by United Assoc of Jour, United Assoc Journey, Louis LeBlanc, Jeff Armstrong in support of [327-1] joint motion for Rule 37(b) Sanctions by Jeff Armstrong, Louis LeBlanc, United Assoc Journey, United Assoc of Jour (kmk) (Entered: 02/12/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 2/12/2002, Entered: None
JOINT MOTION by United Assoc of Jour, United Assoc Journey, Louis LeBlanc, Jeff Armstrong for Rule 37(b) Sanctions ...atty to submit notice of hearing... (kmk) (Entered: 02/12/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 196 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?