Merrill v. Holder et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-09763

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 1, 2017 at 5:48 AM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Nicholas Merrill, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Levine Sullivan Koch & Schulz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Schulz +1 212 850 6103 +1 212 850 6299 dschulz@lskslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Yale University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Matthew Manes +1 203 432 9387 +1 203 432 3034 jonathan.manes@yale.edu
v.
No Logo Eric Holder, Jr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
in his official capacity as Attorney General of the United States Benjamin H. Torrance +1 212 637 2703 +1 212 637 2702 benjamin.torrance@usdoj.gov
No Logo Comey, James B., Defendant
Officially listed as "James B. Comey"
Federal Bureau of Investigation Director, Federal Bureau of Investigation, September 4, 2013 - May 9, 2017
Unknown Role, Lockheed Martin Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
in his official capacity as Director of the Federal Bureau of Investigation Benjamin H. Torrance +1 212 637 2703 +1 212 637 2702 benjamin.torrance@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2709
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (54) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Benjamin H. Torrance dated 1/26/2016 re: The parties jointly request an expansion of time for the government's response to plaintiff's motion for attorneys' fees. ENDORSEMENT: Request GRANTED. The time for the Government to respond to the motion for attorney's fees herein is extended to 2-26-16., ( Responses due by 2/26/2016.) (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 1/26/2016) (lmb) (Entered: 01/26/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Benjamin H. Torrance dated 12/21/2015 re: I am writing to request an expansion of time for the government's response to plaintiffs motion for attorneys' fees. ENDORSEMENT: Request GRANTED. The time for the Government to respond to the motion for attorneys' fees herein is extended to 1-29-16., ( Responses due by 1/29/2016.) (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 12/22/2015) (lmb) (Entered: 12/22/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None
      DECLARATION of Jonathan Manes in Support re: 48 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs.. Document filed by Nicholas Merrill. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Manes, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/16/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 50 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None
        DECLARATION of Nicholas Merrill in Support re: 48 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs.. Document filed by Nicholas Merrill. (Manes, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/16/2015)
          LREF
          Blank 49 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None
          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 48 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs. . Document filed by Nicholas Merrill. (Manes, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/16/2015)
            LREF
            Blank 48 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None
            MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs. Document filed by Nicholas Merrill.(Manes, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/16/2015)
              LREF
              Blank 47 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
              DECISION AND ORDER: For the reasons discussed above, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 16) of Plaintiff Nicholas Merrill is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the motion to dismiss the Complaint or for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 24) of the Government is DENIED; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall file the redacted version of this Decision and Order on the public docket; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly but stay enforcement of the judgment pending any appeal, or, if no appeal is filed, for 90 days from the date of this Decision and Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 16) and the motion to dismiss or for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 24), and to close this case. (As further set forth in this Decision and Order.) (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 8/28/2015) (This document was previously filed under seal in envelope #43 and unsealed on 11/30/2015.)(mro) Modified on 12/1/2015 (mro). (Entered: 11/30/2015)
                LREF
                Blank 47 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                DECISION AND ORDER: For the reasons discussed above, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 16) of Plaintiff Nicholas Merrill is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the motion to dismiss the Complaint or for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 24) of the Government is DENIED; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall file the redacted version of this Decision and Order on the public docket; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly but stay enforcement of the judgment pending any appeal, or, if no appeal is filed, for 90 days from the date of this Decision and Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 16) and the motion to dismiss or for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 24), and to close this case. (As further set forth in this Decision and Order.) (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 8/28/2015) (This document was previously filed under seal in envelope #43 and unsealed on 11/25/2015.)(mro) (Entered: 11/30/2015)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Jonathan M. Manes dated 11/23/2015 re: We write in order to obtain clarification on two issues regarding the upcoming expiration of the nondisclosure order. ENDORSEMENT: Request GRANTED. The Court confirms its understanding and intent of the Decision and Order dated 8-28-15 that the stay of enforcement would be lifted within 90 days thereof, which would extend until 11-30-15, and that the unredacted order would be docketed then. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 11/25/2015) (lmb) (Entered: 11/25/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 45 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None
                    CLERK'S JUDGMENT: It is, ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Decision and Order dated August 28, 2015, it is hereby ordered that the motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 16) of Plaintiff Nicholas Merrill is granted; and it is further ordered that the motion to dismiss the Complaint or for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 24) of the Government is denied; and it is further ordered that the Clerk of Court shall file the redacted version of the Decision and Order on the public docket; and it is further ordered that the judgment shall be entered accordingly but stay enforcement of the judgment pending any appeal, or, if no appeal is filed, for 90 days from the date of this Decision and order; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 09/15/2015) (Attachments: # 1 Right to Appeal, # 2 Right to Appeal)(km) (Entered: 09/15/2015)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 44 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                      DECISION AND ORDER granting 16 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 24 Motion to Dismiss; denying 24 Motion for Summary Judgment. For the reasons discussed above, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 16) of Plaintiff Nicholas Merrill is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the motion to dismiss the Complaint or for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 24) of the Government is DENIED; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall file the redacted version of this Decision and Order on the public docket; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly but stay enforcement of the judgment pending any appeal, or, if no appeal is filed, for 90 days from the date of this Decision and order. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 16) and the motion to dismiss or for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 24), and to close this case. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 8/28/2015) (lmb) (Entered: 09/14/2015)
                        LREF
                        Sealed Legal Document 43 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
                        SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                          LREF
                          Blank 42 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None
                          REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 24 MOTION to Dismiss . MOTION for Summary Judgment . and in opposition to plaintiff's motion 16 . Document filed by James B. Comey, Eric Holder, Jr. (Torrance, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/31/2015)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Benjamin H. Torrance dated 7/30/2015 re: I am writing to request a page expansion of the government's reply memorandum of law, due July 31, 2015. ENDORSEMENT: Request GRANTED. The Government is authorized to submit a reply brief herein not to exceed 20 pages. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 7/30/2015) (lmb) (Entered: 07/30/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Benjamin H. Torrance dated 7/15/2015 re: I am writing to request an extension of time for the government to submit its reply memorandum of law, now due July 17, 2015, to July 31, 2015. ENDORSEMENT: Request GRANTED. The time for the Government to submit its reply to the motion herein is extended to 7-31-15., ( Replies due by 7/31/2015.) (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 7/15/2015) (lmb) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None
                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment, Statement Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 56.1(b), Second Declaration of Jonathan Manes and accompanying Exhibits A-B served on Benjamin Torrance, Assistant United States Attorney, Counsel for Defendants Eric Holder, Jr., and James B. Comey on June 12, 2015. Service was made by Federal Express. Document filed by Nicholas Merrill. (Manes, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None
                                  DECLARATION of Jonathan Manes in Opposition re: 24 MOTION to Dismiss . MOTION for Summary Judgment ., 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Nicholas Merrill. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Manes, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None
                                    RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Nicholas Merrill. (Manes, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None
                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 24 MOTION to Dismiss . MOTION for Summary Judgment ., 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment . and Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Nicholas Merrill. (Manes, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Benjamin H. Torrance dated 6/24/2015 re: Request for extension of time for government to submit its reply memorandum of law as further specified in this letter. ENDORSEMENT: Request granted. The time for the Government to submit its reply to the motion herein is extended to 7/17/2015. So ordered. (Replies due by 7/17/2015.) (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 6/24/2015) (rjm) (Entered: 06/25/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Benjamin H. Torrance dated 6/18/2015 re: Request for extension of time through June 26, 2015 for the parties to submit the redactions to the merits briefing. ENDORSEMENT: Request GRANTED. The time for the parties to submit the redactions to the merits briefing described above is extended to 6-26-15. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 6/18/2015) (kko) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Sealed Legal Document 33 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None
                                            SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz) (Entered: 06/12/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ENDORSED LETTER re: 24 MOTION to Dismiss . MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by James B. Comey, Eric Holder, Jr. addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Jonathan M. Manes dated 6/3/2015 re: Request for extension of time to file response and reply. ENDORSEMENT: Request GRANTED. The briefing schedule with regards to the motions for summary judgment herein is extended as set forth herein motion papers submitted by; response by plaintiff: 6/12/15: reply by government: 6/19/15. Set Deadlines/Hearing as to 24 MOTION to Dismiss. MOTION for Summary Judgment:(Responses due by 6/12/2015.) (Replies due by 6/26/2015.) (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 6/3/2015) (spo) Modified on 6/3/2015 (spo). (Entered: 06/03/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Benjamin H. Torrance dated 5/14/2015 re: Pursuant to the stipulation and order entered by the Court on February 27, 2015, the parties have conferred regarding appropriate redactions to the government's papers filed on April 24, 2015. Accordingly, the government will file that version on the public docket, and we enclose a courtesy copy. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to enter into the public record of this action the letter above submitted to the Court by the parties. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 5/19/2015) (ama) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                  DECLARATION of Gary Douglas Perdue in Support re: 24 MOTION to Dismiss . MOTION for Summary Judgment ., 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by James B. Comey, Eric Holder, Jr. (Torrance, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/14/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Benjamin H. Torrance dated 5/7/2015 re: We respectfully request that the Court extend the deadline to May 14, 2015. ENDORSEMENT: Request GRANTED. The time for the parties to file the redacted papers referred to in the Court's stipulated order dated 2-27-15 is extended to 5-14-15. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 5/7/2015) (lmb) (Entered: 05/07/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Jonathan M. Manes dated 4/30/2015 re: Plaintiff respectfully asks the Court to extend, through May 7, 2015, the deadline for the parties to confer in an effort to reach agreement regarding proposed redactions. ENDORSEMENT: Request GRANTED. The time for the parties to confer regarding the redactions described above is extended until 5-7-15. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 4/30/2015) (lmb) (Entered: 05/01/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Sealed Legal Document 27 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz) (Entered: 04/28/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                          COUNTER STATEMENT TO 18 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by James B. Comey, Eric Holder, Jr. (Torrance, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/24/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 24 MOTION to Dismiss . MOTION for Summary Judgment ., 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment . and in opposition to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. Document filed by James B. Comey, Eric Holder, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 NSL Attachment--redacted)(Torrance, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/24/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION to Dismiss ., MOTION for Summary Judgment .( Responses due by 6/5/2015) Document filed by James B. Comey, Eric Holder, Jr.(Torrance, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/24/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Benjamin H. Torrance dated 4/6/2015 re: I am writing to request a modification of the schedule previously entered by the Court regarding the submission of the parties' cross- motions for dismissal or summary judgment. ENDORSEMENT: Request GRANTED. The briefing schedule for summary judgment motions is modified as set forth above., ( Cross Motions due by 4/24/2015., Responses due by 6/5/2015., Replies due by 6/19/2015.) (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 4/6/2015) (lmb) (Entered: 04/07/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Benjamin H. Torrance dated 3/17/2015 re: The government seeks an additional extension of time through 3/20/2015 regarding redactions. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 3/17/2015) (tro) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Nicholas Merrills Motion for Summary Judgment, Memorandum of Law in Support of Nicholas Merrills Motion for Summary Judgment, Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment, Declaration of Nicholas Merrill and accompanying Exhibits A through C, Declaration of Jonathan Manes and accompanying Exhibits A through T served on Benjamin Torrance, Assistant United States Attorney, Counsel for Defendants Eric Holder, Jr., and James B. Comey on 3/11/2015. Service was made by Federal Express. Document filed by Nicholas Merrill. (Manes, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                      DECLARATION of Jonathan Manes in Support re: 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Nicholas Merrill. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Manes Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Manes Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Manes Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Manes Declaration, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E to Manes Declaration, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F to Manes Declaration, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit G to Manes Declaration, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit H to Manes Declaration, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit I to Manes Declaration, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit J to Manes Declaration, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit K to Manes Declaration, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit L to Manes Declaration, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit M to Manes Declaration, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit N to Manes Declaration, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit O to Manes Declaration, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit P to Manes Declaration, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit Q to Manes Declaration, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit R to Manes Declaration, # 19 Exhibit Exhibit S to Manes Declaration, # 20 Exhibit Exhibit T to Manes Declaration)(Manes, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                        DECLARATION of Nicholas Merrill in Support re: 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Nicholas Merrill. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Merrill Declaration, # 2 Exhibit B to Merrill Declaration, # 3 Exhibit C to Merrill Declaration)(Manes, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                          RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Nicholas Merrill. (Manes, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 17 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Nicholas Merrill. (Manes, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                              MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Nicholas Merrill. Responses due by 4/8/2015(Manes, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER granting 13 Motion to File Amicus Brief. Request GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter into the record of this action the amicus curiae brief submitted by the organizations described above. SO ORDERED.(Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 3/20/2015) (ama) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 14 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                  BRIEF re: 11 Sealed Document in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press.(Steger, Michael) (Entered: 03/18/2015)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                    MOTION to File Amicus Brief . Document filed by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press.(Steger, Michael) (Entered: 03/18/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Benjamin H. Torrance dated 3/13/2015 re: The government seeks an extension of time through Tuesday, March 17, 2015. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 3/13/2015) (lmb) (Entered: 03/13/2015)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps) (Entered: 03/11/2015)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 3/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Jonathan M. Manes dated 3/5/2015 re: We write to propose a time for a pre-motion conference, as directed by the Court earlier today. We have conferred with the government and have agreed upon a mutually acceptable time, set forth below, for the Court's consideration. We also write respectfully to request a delay of three business days in the briefing schedule that Your Honor approved yesterday afternoon. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to enter into the public record of this action the letter above submitted to the Court by plaintiff., James B. Comey answer due 4/8/2015; Eric Holder, Jr answer due 4/8/2015.( Cross Motions due by 4/8/2015., Motions due by 3/11/2015., Responses due by 5/6/2015., Replies due by 5/20/2015.) (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 3/9/2015) (lmb) (Entered: 03/09/2015)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            LAW STUDENT INTERN APPEARANCE FORM: I authorize this student (Matthew Halgren): (a) to appear in court or other proceedings on behalf of the above client, and (b) to prepare documents on behalf of the above client. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 3/6/2015) (lmb) (Entered: 03/09/2015)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              LAW STUDENT INTERN APPEARANCE FORM: I authorize this student (Nicholas Handler): (a) to appear in court or other proceedings on behalf of the above client, and (b) to prepare documents on behalf of the above client. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 3/6/2015) (lmb) (Entered: 03/09/2015)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                LAW STUDENT INTERN APPEARANCE FORM: I authorize this student (Benjamin Graham): (a) to appear in court or other proceedings on behalf of the above client, and (b) to prepare documents on behalf of the above client. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 3/6/2015) (lmb) (Main Document 7 replaced on 3/9/2015) (lmb). (Entered: 03/09/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  LAW STUDENT INTERN APPEARANCE FORM: I authorize this student (Amanda Lynch): (a) to appear in court or other proceedings on behalf of the above client, and (b) to prepare documents on behalf of the above client. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 3/6/2015) (lmb) (Entered: 03/09/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Benjamin H. Torrance and Jonathan M. Manes dated 2/20/2015 re: Briefing Schedule and Extension of Answer to the Complaint. ENDORSEMENT: Request GRANTED. The parties may proceed with the motions and schedule set forth above. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 3/4/2015) (kl) (Entered: 03/04/2015)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned parties that the following procedure will govern submission of documents in the above-captioned matter: 1. Any document that contains information subject to the nondisclosure requirement set forth in the Stipulation and Order entered by this Court on April 15, 2014, in Case No. 04 Civ. 2614 (VM), shall be filed in the first instance under seal. 2. On the date of any such filing, the parties shall confer and endeavor to agree upon a proposed redacted version of the document for filing on the public docket. The filing party shall then submit to the opposite party for verification a version of the document containing all redactions which either party proposes. Once verified and agreed upon, that document as redacted shall be filed on the public docket. The discussions, verification, and public filing mentioned above shall be completed by the end of the business day following the date of the initial sealed filing. With respect to merits briefing, the time period shall be two business days. 3. In the event there are disputed redactions, the proponent of any disputed redaction shall, within two business days following any filing under paragraph 2, write a letter to the Court explaining the specific and compelling reasons why those disputed portions of the filing should be redacted. The opposite party shall have two business days within which to respond by letter. With respect to merits briefing, each party shall have four business days, instead of two. Those letters shall be filed under seal, with proposed redacted versions. As appropriate, the Court will then direct the parties to file the original redacted version, or a revised redacted version of the document and the letters. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 2/27/2015) (lmb) (Entered: 02/27/2015)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. James B. Comey served on 12/18/2014, answer due 2/17/2015; Eric Holder, Jr served on 12/18/2014, answer due 2/17/2015. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Nicholas Merrill. (Manes, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                          CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (moh) (moh). (Entered: 12/11/2014)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against James B. Comey, Eric Holder, Jr. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401111955)Document filed by Nicholas Merrill.(moh) (moh). (Entered: 12/11/2014)
                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 207 times.

                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                               
                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                              Need Password Help?