Robert Smith v. EVB
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 11-1081

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 3, 2016 at 6:23 PM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00403183001 Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: None
[Edited 02/02/2011 by GMK]. Reason for Edit: Document Struck. [11-1081] Samuel Dumville
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None
    Mandate issued. Referencing: [20],Judgment order , [19],Unpublished per curiam Opinion. Originating case number: 3:09-cv-00554-JRS.. [10-1873, 11-1081] (JSN)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None
      COURT ORDER filed [998664393] denying Motion for rehearing [21] Copies to all parties Mailed to: Robert Smith. [10-1873, 11-1081] (DHB)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
        Mandate stayed by FRAP 41(d)(1). Mailed to: Robert Smith. [10-1873, 11-1081] (JSN)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None
          PETITION for rehearing (FRAP 40; Local Rule 40(a)-(c)) by Appellee Archie C. Berkeley, Jr. in 11-1081. [10-1873, 11-1081] Michele Mulligan
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None
            JUDGMENT ORDER filed. Disposition method: 10-1873 opn.u.sub 11-1081 -. Decision: Vacated and remanded. Originating case number: 3:09-cv-00554-JRS. Entered on Docket Date: 07/12/2011. [998629422] Copies to all parties and the district court/agency. Mailed to: Robert Smith. [10-1873, 11-1081] (JSN)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None
              UNPUBLISHED PER CURIAM OPINION filed. Originating case number: 3:09-cv-00554-JRS Copies to all parties and the district court/agency. [998629414]. Mailed to: Robert Smith. [10-1873, 11-1081] (JSN)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None
                INFORMAL REPLY BRIEF by Appellant Robert C. Smith in 10-1873, 11-1081. [10-1873, 11-1081] (JSN)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                  INFORMAL RESPONSE BRIEF filed by Appellee Archie C. Berkeley, Jr. in 11-1081. [10-1873, 11-1081] Michele Mulligan
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                    INFORMAL RESPONSE BRIEF filed by Appellee EVB in 11-1081. [11-1081, 10-1873] Samuel Dumville
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 15 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None
                      INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF filed by Appellant Robert C. Smith in 11-1081. [11-1081, 10-1873] (JSN)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                        ORDER filed [998522521] denying as moot Motion to proceed in forma pauperis (FRAP 24) [12] in 11-1081 Copies to all parties. [10-1873, 11-1081] (JSN)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                          ORDER filed [998522513] consolidating case 11-1081 with 10-1873. Copies to all parties. [10-1873, 11-1081] (JSN)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: None
                            DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) filed by Appellee EVB. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [998516660] [11-1081] Alison Toepp
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: None
                              APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL filed (Local Rule 46(c)) by Alison Wickizer Toepp for EVB.[998516543] [11-1081]--[Edited 02/02/2011 by JSN] Alison Toepp
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: None
                                APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL filed (Local Rule 46(c)) by Stacy L. Haney for EVB.[998516538] [11-1081] Stacy Haney
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: None
                                  APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL filed (Local Rule 46(c)) by S. Miles Dumville for EVB.[998516531] [11-1081] Samuel Dumville
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None
                                    DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) filed by Appellee Archie C. Berkeley, Jr.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [998510208] [11-1081] Michele Mulligan
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None
                                      APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL filed (Local Rule 46(c)) by Michele A. Mulligan for Archie C. Berkeley, Jr..[998510201] [11-1081] Michele Mulligan
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None
                                        INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Informal Opening Brief due 02/18/2011 Informal response brief, if any: 17 days after informal opening brief filed. [11-1081] (JSN)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None
                                          FEE NOTICE issued to Robert C. Smith - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 02/09/2011 Originating case number: 3:09-cv-00554-JRS. [11-1081] (JSN)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None
                                            Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:09-cv-00554-JRS. Case manager: JeffNeal. Date notice of appeal filed: 01/20/2010 [11-1081] (JSN)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 32 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?