Brown v. Herschend Family Entertainment Corporation et al (PLR2)
Federal Civil Lawsuit Tennessee Eastern District Court, Case No. 3:14-cv-00593

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 2, 2017 at 11:38 PM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Derryl D Brown, Plaintiff
No Logo Tedi A. Brown, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Butler Vines & Babb

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Darren V Berg +1 865 637 3531 +1 865 637 3385 dberg@bvblaw.com
v.
No Logo Dolly Parton Productions, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Herschend Family Entertainment Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Neil, Parker & Williamson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel M Gass +1 865 546 7190 +1 865 546 0789 dgass@opw.com
  Entries (58) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None Report of Mediation
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: None Response to Statement of Material Facts
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None Order Staying Case
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None Amend/Revise
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None Consent to Mediation
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None Statement of Material Facts
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: None Amend/Revise
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/28/2015, Entered: None Amended Answer to Complaint
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: None Supplement
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None Amend/Revise
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None Subpoena Returned executed
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Subpoena Returned executed
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None Subpoena Returned executed
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None Quash
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None Quash
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed (non-USA)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None Proposed Pretrial Order
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None Deposition Order
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None Notice of Consent/Nonconsent
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Order Regarding Availability of Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed (non-USA)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 1,220 times.

                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?