Odeh v. City of Baton Rouge/Parish of East Baton Rouge
Federal Civil Lawsuit Louisiana Middle District Court, Case No. 3:14-cv-00793

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 3, 2017 at 3:34 PM EDT (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Eiad Odeh, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jill L. Craft

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/28/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jill Leininger Craft +1 225 663 2612 +1 225 663 2613 jcraft@craftlaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 2010

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Victor R. Farrugia +1 504 525 0250 +1 504 293 0651 vfarrugia@farrugialawfirm.com
v.
No Logo City of Baton Rouge/Parish of East Baton Rouge, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Breazeale, Sachse & Wilson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Murphy James Foster, III +1 225 387 4000 +1 225 387 5397 mjf@bswllp.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Yvonne Reed Olinde +1 225 387 4000 +1 225 387 5397 yro@bswllp.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jacob Ellis Roussel +1 225 381 3172 jacob.roussel@bswllp.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Dyess Sims +1 225 381 8048 +1 225 381 8029 jds@bswllp.com
  Entries (149) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 2/16/2017, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: None Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: None Continue
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: None Order Setting Trial and Related Deadlines
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Pretrial Conference - Initial
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank 128 Filed: 12/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          AFFIDAVIT of Settlement Efforts by City of Baton Rouge/Parish of East Baton Rouge. (West, Sunny) (Entered: 12/30/2016)
                            LREF
                            Blank 127 Filed: 12/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            AFFIDAVIT OF SETTLEMENT EFFORTS by Eiad Odeh. (Farrugia, Victor) (Entered: 12/30/2016)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 12/26/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 12/26/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  PRETRIAL ORDER by Eiad Odeh. (Farrugia, Victor) Modified on 12/16/2016 to edit text. (EDC). (Entered: 12/15/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    ORDER granting 122 Motion to Enroll Additional Attorney. Added attorney Sunny Mayhall West as additional counsel of record for City of Baton Rouge/Parish of East Baton Rouge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/8/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL) (Entered: 12/08/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 12/7/2016, Entered: None Enroll Additional Attorney
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        NOTICE on 119 MOTION in Limine , 120 MOTION in Limine :. Opposition, limited to 10 pages, to the motion shall be filed on or before 12/26/16. The mover may file a reply brief, limited to 5 pages, within 14 days of the filing of the opposition.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (MJ) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None In Limine
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            MOTION in Limine by Eiad Odeh. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit)(Farrugia, Victor) (Entered: 12/05/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None In Limine
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 6/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                AMENDED MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION to 76 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Eiad Odeh. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(LLH) (Entered: 06/13/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 6/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  RULING granting in part and denying in part 76 Motion for Summary Judgment. The 100 Motion to Strike and 116 Motion for Leave are DENIED. The 103 Motion for Leave is GRANTED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 6/13/2016. (LLH) (Entered: 06/13/2016)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    MOTION for Leave to to File Reply Memo in Support of Motion to Strike by City of Baton Rouge/Parish of East Baton Rouge. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit Guillot Depo, # 3 Exhibit Hobson Depo, # 4 Attachment Order)(Sims, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/27/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 5/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition to 103 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits to Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment and Amended Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment , 92 MOTION for Leave to File Additional Exhibits to Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment , 112 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Strike filed by City of Baton Rouge/Parish of East Baton Rouge. (Sims, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/25/2016)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER granting 108 Motion to Continue Trial. 4-Day Jury Trial is rescheduled for for 2/13/2017 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge James J. Brady. Pretrial Conference set for 1/5/2017 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Judge James J. Brady. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 5/24/2016. (SGO) (Entered: 05/24/2016)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER granting 112 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 5/23/2016. (SGO) (Entered: 05/23/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Amended Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Strike by Eiad Odeh. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading;, # 2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Farrugia, Victor) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE with LR 7(g) as to 110 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. REQUIRED CORRECTION: A combined Motion for Leave to Exceed the Page Limits and Motion to Strike the Incorrect Pleading must filed within 24 hours of this notice. Otherwise, the original filing may be stricken by the Court without further notice. (EDC) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                AMENDED MEMORANDUM in Opposition to 100 MOTION to Strike 90 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Eiad Odeh. (Farrugia, Victor) Modified to substitute document per rec. doc. 113 on 5/23/2016 (SGO). (Entered: 05/20/2016)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition to 108 MOTION to Continue Trial filed by Eiad Odeh. (Farrugia, Victor) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 5/18/2016, Entered: None
                                                                    MOTION to Continue Trial by City of Baton Rouge/Parish of East Baton Rouge. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(Foster, Murphy) (Entered: 05/18/2016)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 107 Filed: 5/11/2016, Entered: None
                                                                      SEALED Plaintiffs Exhibit 31 to 90 Memorandum in Opposition to 76 Motion for Summary Judgment. (JDL) (Entered: 05/11/2016)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 5/11/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion (doc. 105) for Leave to File Exhibit 31 to Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Summary under seal pursuant to Court Order (Rec. Doc. 94), the motion is GRANTED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 5/11/2016. (BLR) (Main Document 106 replaced on 5/11/2016 to add routing information) (JDL). Modified on 5/11/2016 to edit text (JDL). (Entered: 05/11/2016)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 105 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None
                                                                          SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit 31 to 90 Memorandum in Opposition to 76 Motion for Summary Judgment Under Seal Pursuant to 94 Court Order by Eiad Odeh. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Proposed Pleading; Exhibit 31)(Farrugia, Victor) Modified on 5/11/2016 to edit text (JDL). (Entered: 05/10/2016)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            Notice to Counsel Resetting Hearing: (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)Considering the pending motions in this case, the Pretrial Conference is re-set for 9/15/2016 at 02:00 PM in chambers before Judge James J. Brady. Pretrial order due 8/25/2016.(SWE) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 5/6/2016, Entered: None
                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits to Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment and Amended Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment by Eiad Odeh. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order, # 2 Proposed Pleading; Exhibits 37,38,40,43,46-50,58,60,61,63, # 3 Proposed Pleading; Exhibits J-5 and J-6, # 4 Proposed Pleading; Amended Memo in Opposition)(Farrugia, Victor) (Attachment 2 replaced on 5/9/2016) (EDC). (Entered: 05/06/2016)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                REPLY to 90 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 76 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by City of Baton Rouge/Parish of East Baton Rouge. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(Foster, Murphy) (Entered: 05/02/2016)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                  Additional Exhibits to 100 MOTION to Strike 90 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, by City of Baton Rouge/Parish of East Baton Rouge. filed by City of Baton Rouge/Parish of East Baton Rouge. (Foster, Murphy) (Entered: 05/02/2016)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                    MOTION to Strike 90 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, by City of Baton Rouge/Parish of East Baton Rouge. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Foster, Murphy) (Entered: 05/02/2016)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER denying 81 Second MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Answer to Supplemental and Amending Petition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 4/26/2016. (LLH) (Entered: 04/26/2016)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE of Exhibits J and K filed conventionally by Plaintiff. (THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY). (BLR) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 97 Filed: 4/21/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                          SEALED Exhibits to 90 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment. (NLT) (Entered: 04/21/2016)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 4/21/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting 93 Sealed Motion for Leave to Additional Exhibits to Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment Under Seal. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 04/21/2016. (NLT) (Entered: 04/21/2016)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 4/21/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                              Additional Exhibits to 90 Memorandum in Opposition to 76 Motion, filed by Eiad Odeh. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit)(LLH) (Entered: 04/21/2016)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 4/21/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER granting 92 MOTION for Leave to File Additional Exhibits to 90 Opposition to 76 Motion for Summary Judgment into the record. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 4/21/2016. (LLH) (Entered: 04/21/2016)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 93 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                  SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Additional Exhibits to Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment Under Seal by Eiad Odeh. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order, # 2 Proposed Pleading; Exhibit 29, # 3 Proposed Pleading; Exhibit 30, # 4 Proposed Pleading; Exhibit I)(Farrugia, Victor) (Entered: 04/20/2016)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits to 90 Memorandum Opposition for 76 Motion for Summary Judgment by Eiad Odeh. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order, # 2 Proposed Pleading; Exhibits 22,27,28, # 3 Proposed Pleading; Exhibit 32 (and 36), # 4 Proposed Pleading; Exhibit 33, # 5 Proposed Pleading; Exhibit 35, # 6 Proposed Pleading; Exhibit 39, # 7 Proposed Pleading; Exhibit 41, # 8 Proposed Pleading; Exhibit 42, # 9 Proposed Pleading; Exhibit 44, # 10 Proposed Pleading; Exhibit 45, # 11 Proposed Pleading; Exhibits 46-50, # 12 Proposed Pleading; Exhibits 51-55, # 13 Proposed Pleading; Exhibit 56, # 14 Proposed Pleading; Exhibit 57,59,62,J1,J3, # 15 Proposed Pleading; Exhibits C-H)(Farrugia, Victor) Modified to rotate pages and edit text on 4/21/2016 (BLR). (Entered: 04/20/2016)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting 89 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits J and K to 90 Opposition to 76 Motion for Summary Judgment Conventionally . Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 4/19/2016. (LLH) (Entered: 04/20/2016)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/19/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition to 76 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Eiad Odeh. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Contested Facts, # 2 Exhibit A Odeh Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B Roper Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 1-25)(Farrugia, Victor) (Entered: 04/20/2016)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/19/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits J and K to Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment Conventionally by Eiad Odeh. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Farrugia, Victor) (Entered: 04/19/2016)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER granting 87 MOTION for Leave to Enlarge Page Limitation, with Request for Expedited Consideration. Odeh may file his Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment in excess of the page limitation, allowing an enlargement of such memorandum to total twenty-five (25) pages, exclusive of the certificate of service. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 4/12/2016. (LLH) (Entered: 04/13/2016)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None Leave
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None Continue
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Amend filed by Eiad Odeh. (Farrugia, Victor) Modified on 4/1/2016 to edit text (ELW). (Entered: 03/30/2016)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/23/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              AMENDED ANSWER to Supplemental and 12 Amended Complaint by City of Baton Rouge/Parish of East Baton Rouge. (Foster, Murphy) (Entered: 03/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE on 76 MOTION for Summary Judgment :. Opposition, limited to 10 pages, to the motion shall be filed on or before 04/05/16. The mover may file a reply brief, limited to 5 pages, within 14 days of the filing of the opposition.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (MJ) (Entered: 03/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/10/2016, Entered: None Leave
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 69 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    SEALED Exhibit A to 61 Amended MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony of Chandler Loupe. (NLT) (Entered: 03/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File A Document
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 66 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT: Employment Records for Stacy Simmons filed in accordance with record document 64 . (Sims, Jennifer) Modified on 3/2/2016 (NLT). (Entered: 03/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr.: Motion Hearing held on 2/24/2016. Oral Arguments heard on the following motions: 45 Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer to Supplemental and Amending Petition, 46 Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline Only for thePurpose of Issuing a Subpoena to Hannis T. Bourgeois, LLP, 48 Motion to Compel and 49 Motion to Compel. The parties presented arguments on the pending Motions and the Court has taken the Motions under advisement. The Court ordered The parties to confer and submit a proposed protective order within 7 days, and to supplement their responses to discovery as listed. (LLH) (Entered: 02/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 62 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit A to Motion to Compel Under Seal by Eiad Odeh. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A)(Farrugia, Victor) (Entered: 02/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Amended MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony of Chandler Loupe by Eiad Odeh. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit Rule 37 Certificate, # 3 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Farrugia, Victor) Modified on 3/1/2016 to replace motion as per order #67(LLH). (Entered: 02/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition to 49 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Answers to Interrogatories and for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by City of Baton Rouge/Parish of East Baton Rouge. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(LLH) (Entered: 02/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 58 Motion to Strike and Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in Opposition to the Motion to Compel 49 . The previously filed Opposition [R. Doc. 53] shall be struck. The Memorandum in Opposition [R. Doc. 58-3] and included attachments [R. Docs. 58-4 to 58-12] shall be filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 2/23/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard) (Entered: 02/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE with LR 7(g) as to 53 Response in Opposition to Motion,. REQUIRED CORRECTION: A combined Motion for Leave to Exceed the Page Limits and Motion to Strike the Incorrect Pleading must filed within 24 hours of this notice. Otherwise, the original filing may be stricken by the Court without further notice. (LLH) (Entered: 02/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: None Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry/ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr.: Telephone Conference held on 2/16/2016. The parties discussed that depositions were being held outside the the court's deadline to complete fact discovery and file any discovery related motions. The parties are hereby advised that any motions pertaining to the discovery at issue in the deposition shall be filed within 7 days of this order. (LLH) (Entered: 02/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 47 Motion for Expedited Consideration. The Court will set a briefing schedule and hearing date on the motion to extend discovery deadline and all other currently pending motions (R. Docs. 45, 46, 48 and 49) in a separate order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 2/5/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard) (Entered: 02/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 44 Motion to Strike 39 Amended Answer to Complaint, 40 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer to Supplemental and Amending Complaint . At the request of Defendant, R. Docs. 39 and 40 shall be struck. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 2/1/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard) (Entered: 02/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/30/2016, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Answers to Interrogatories and for Attorney Fees and Costs by Eiad Odeh. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit Rule 37 Certificate, # 6 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Farrugia, Victor) (Entered: 01/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None Extension of Discovery Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None Amend
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Expedited Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 41 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit to Defendant's Motion to Quash filed by City of Baton Rouge/Parish of East Baton Rouge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 1/26/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard) (Entered: 01/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD AMENDED ANSWER to Supplemental and 12 Amended Petition by City of Baton Rouge/Parish of East Baton Rouge. (Foster, Murphy) Modified on 1/27/2016 to edit text (LLH). Modified on 2/3/2016 to remove document as it has been stricken as per Order #50 (LLH). (Entered: 01/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice to Counsel: Counsel for Defendant has filed a motion to quash regarding a Rule 45 subpoena. The subpoena at issue has not been provided to the Court. Counsel for defendant is directed to supplement their motion by filing the subpoena at issue into the record. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard) (Entered: 01/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: None Expedited Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: None Quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/10/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/2/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/2/2015, Entered: None Extension of Discovery Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry/ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr.: Status Conference held on 11/23/2015. The parties discussed possible modifications to the existing 9 Scheduling Order. The parties are ORDERED to confer on proposed modifications before 12/2/2015. If parties can agree a joint motion shall be filed by 12/2/2015. If parties can't agree, each party shall file its own motion by 12/2/2015 indicating proposed deadlines. Any response to 35 Motion to Compel shall be filed by 12/2/2015. (LLH) (Entered: 11/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 27 Motion to Continue Status Conference. Status Conference set for 11/19/2015 is reset for 11/23/2015 at 02:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 11/18/2015. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL) (Entered: 11/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 26 Motion to Enroll as Attorney & 28 Motion to Enroll as Attorney. Victor R. Farrugia enrolled as counsel for plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 11/18/2015. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL) (Entered: 11/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: None Enroll as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: None Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: None Enroll as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice to Counsel and Plaintiff OF TIME CHANGE ONLY: Status Conference set for 11/19/2015 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(JSL) (Entered: 11/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice to Counsel and Plaintiff OF DATE/TIME CHANGE: Status Conference set for 11/19/2015 at 10:15 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL) (Entered: 10/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice to Counsel and Plaintiff OF TIME CHANGE ONLY: Status Conference set for 11/18/2015 at 02:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice to Counsel and Plaintiff: Status Conference set for 11/18/2015 at 01:30 PM in chambers, Room 278, before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL) (Entered: 10/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice to Counsel: This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)In view of the Motion to Stay filed by Plaintiff, the Hearing set for 10/14/2015 at 2:00 p.m. before U.S. Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. is hereby CANCELLED, and will be reset if necessary. (JSL) (Entered: 10/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Pro Se E-Service & E-Notice Consent Form by Eiad Odeh (JDL) (Entered: 10/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None Order Setting Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief (First)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/28/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 12 Supplemental and Amending Complaint by City of Baton Rouge/Parish of East Baton Rouge.(Foster, Murphy) Modified on 4/20/2015 to edit text (LLH). (Entered: 04/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 10 Motion to Amend. The Supplemental and Amending Petition (R. Doc. 10-1) shall be filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 4/3/2015. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard) (Entered: 04/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None Amend
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 7 Motion to Substitute Joint Status Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 3/9/2015. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard) (Entered: 03/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief (First)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs. (Craft, Jill) Modified to substitute document per rec. doc. 8 on 3/10/2015 (SMG). (Entered: 03/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  90 DAY CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/19/2015 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 3/5/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 2/3/2015. (JSL) (Entered: 02/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint by City of Baton Rouge/Parish of East Baton Rouge.(Foster, Murphy) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 2 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. Defendant is granted until January 9, 2015 to file responsive pleadings in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 12/30/2014. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard) (Entered: 12/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to File a Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None Notice of Removal (Complete Case Opening First)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 133 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?