World Wide Medical Technologies, LLC et al v. Biscotti et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-11619-NG

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 27, 2017 at 11:35 PM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Advanced Care Pharmacy, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Devine, Millimet & Branch, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George R. Moore +1 978 475 9100 +1 978 470 0618 gmoore@devinemillimet.com
No Logo Gary A. Lamoureux, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Devine, Millimet & Branch, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George R. Moore +1 978 475 9100 +1 978 470 0618 gmoore@devinemillimet.com
No Logo Richard A. Terwilliger, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Devine, Millimet & Branch, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/08/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George R. Moore +1 978 475 9100 +1 978 470 0618 gmoore@devinemillimet.com
TERMINATED: 03/08/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark J. Sampson +1 978 208 8386 +1 888 749 9368 mjs@marksampsonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Dean Dusseault +1 213 229 7855 +1 213 229 7520 cdusseault@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carol M Silberberg +1 213 229 7000 +1 213 229 7520 csilberberg@gibsondunn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hiscock & Barclay, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John T. Gutkoski +1 617 274 2906 +1 617 722 6003 jgutkoski@hblaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pepper Hamilton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexandra C. Fennell +1 617 204 5158 fennella@pepperlaw.com
No Logo Worldwide Medical Technologies, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Devine, Millimet & Branch, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George R. Moore +1 978 475 9100 +1 978 470 0618 gmoore@devinemillimet.com
No Logo Anthony D. Biscotti, Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo Anthony D. Biscotti, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Tocci, Goss & Lee, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John F. Tocci +1 617 542 6200 +1 617 542 6201 jtocci@lawtgl.com
No Logo Nuclear Consultants Group, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Tocci, Goss & Lee, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John F. Tocci +1 617 542 6200 +1 617 542 6201 jtocci@lawtgl.com
No Logo Advanced Care Pharmacy, Inc., Counter-Defendant
No Logo Gary A. Lamoureux, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Richard A. Terwilliger, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Worldwide Medical Technologies, LLC, Counter-Defendant
Office Boston
Filed 7/20/2004
Jury Demand Both
Demand
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Cause Section 35 U.S.C. § 271 Patent Infringement
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 10/3/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (87) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 10/3/2006, Entered: 10/3/2006 Order Dismissing Case
Judge Nancy Gertner: Electronic ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Case reported settled on 10/2/2006.(Filo, Jennifer)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 10/3/2006, Entered: 10/3/2006 Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge
    Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Filo, Jennifer)
      LREF
      Legal Document 61 Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: 10/2/2006 Stipulation of Dismissal
      STIPULATION of Dismissal of Remaining Parties by Anthony D. Biscotti. (Tocci, John)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 10/3/2006 Terminate Motions
        Motions terminated: [33] MOTION to Dismiss Patent Claims by Anthony D. Biscotti and filed by Nuclear Consultants Group, Inc.,, [41] MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11 filed by Anthony D. Biscotti,, [39] MOTION to Amend [1] Complaint, To Join Ideamatrix, Inc. as a Plaintiff filed by Gary A. Lamoureux,, Richard A. Terwilliger,, World Wide Medical Technologies, LLC,, Advanced Care Pharmacy, Inc. Case reported settled. (Filo, Jennifer)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: 9/8/2006 Order on Motion to Continue
          Judge Judith G. Dein : Electronic ORDER entered granting [60] Joint Motion to Continue Hearing on Outstanding Motions:Hearing reset for 10/10/2006 03:00 PM in Courtroom 15 before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
            LREF
            Legal Document 60 Filed: 9/7/2006, Entered: 9/7/2006, Terminated: 9/8/2006 Motion to Continue
            Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing Date on Outstanding Motions by Anthony D. Biscotti.(Tocci, John)
              LREF
              Legal Document 59 Filed: 8/19/2006, Entered: 8/23/2006 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
              NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance Attorney Mark J. Sampson terminated. (Filo, Jennifer)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: 8/4/2006 Order on Motion to Continue
                Judge Judith G. Dein : Electronic ORDER entered granting [58] Motion to Continue Hearing.Motion hearing reset for 9/7/2006 02:45 PM in Courtroom 15 before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 58 Filed: 8/3/2006, Entered: 8/3/2006, Terminated: 8/4/2006 Motion to Continue
                  Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing Date to 09/07/06 by Anthony D. Biscotti.(Tocci, John)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: 7/24/2006 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                    ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing on [33] MOTION to Dismiss Patent Claims, [41] MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11, and [39] MOTION to Amend Complaint To Join Ideamatrix, Inc. as a Plaintiff: Motion Hearing set for 8/31/2006 02:45 PM in Courtroom 15 before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 57 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006 Stipulation of Dismissal
                      STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Plaintiff Richard A. Terwilliger's Claims and Defendants' Counterclaims Against Richard A. Terwilliger Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1) by Richard A. Terwilliger. (Fennell, Alexandra)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: 6/1/2006 Order
                        Judge Judith G. Dein : Electronic ORDER entered adopting [56] Stipulation to Extend Any and All Deadlines Relating to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, provided, however, that the deadlines shall be extended for thirty (30) days and no further extensions shall be granted absent exceptional circumstances.(Dambrosio, Jolyne)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 56 Filed: 5/31/2006, Entered: 5/31/2006 Stipulation
                          STIPULATION to Extend Any and All Deadlines Relating to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Richard A. Terwilliger. (Fennell, Alexandra)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: 5/17/2006 Order
                            Judge Judith G. Dein : Electronic ORDER entered adopting [55] Stipulation to Extend Deadlines in 2/15/06 Court Order for an additional 14 days.(Dambrosio, Jolyne)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 55 Filed: 5/16/2006, Entered: 5/16/2006 Stipulation
                              STIPULATION to Extend Any and All Deadlines Relating to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Richard A. Terwilliger. (Fennell, Alexandra)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 5/1/2006, Entered: 5/1/2006 Order
                                Judge Judith G. Dein : Electronic ORDER entered adopting [54] Stipulation to Extend Deadlines in 2/15/06 Court Order for an additional 15 days. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 54 Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: 4/28/2006 Stipulation
                                  STIPULATION To Extend Any and All Deadlines Relating to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Richard A. Terwilliger. (Fennell, Alexandra)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/19/2006, Entered: 4/19/2006 Order
                                    Judge Judith G. Dein : Electronic ORDER entered allowing [53] Stipulation To Extend Deadlines in 2/15/06 Court Order for an additional 15 days. The hearing scheduled for 5/1/06 has been cancelled and will be rescheduled if necessary.(Dambrosio, Jolyne)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 53 Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: 4/14/2006 Stipulation
                                      STIPULATION to Extend Any and All Deadlines Relating to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Richard A. Terwilliger. (Fennell, Alexandra)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/16/2006, Entered: 3/16/2006 Order
                                        Judge Judith G. Dein : Electronic ORDER entered allowing [52] Stipulation To Extend Deadlines in 2/15/06 Court Order for 30 days. The hearing on the pending motions has been continued to 5/1/06 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom #15 on the 5th floor. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 52 Filed: 3/15/2006, Entered: 3/15/2006 Stipulation
                                          STIPULATION to Extend Any and All Deadlines Relating to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Anthony D. Biscotti. (Tocci, John)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/15/2006, Entered: 3/15/2006 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                                            Judge Judith G. Dein : Electronic ORDER entered granting [50] & [51] Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Carol M. Silberberg and Christopher D. Dusseault for Richard A. Terwilliger. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/13/2006, Entered: 3/14/2006 Filing Fee/Payment Received
                                              Filing fee: $ 100.00, receipt number 71004 for [50] MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Carol M. Silberberg, [51] MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard A. Terwilliger (Filo, Jennifer)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 51 Filed: 3/8/2006, Entered: 3/8/2006, Terminated: 3/15/2006 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher D. Dusseault by Richard A. Terwilliger.(Fennell, Alexandra)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 50 Filed: 3/8/2006, Entered: 3/8/2006, Terminated: 3/15/2006 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Carol M. Silberberg by Richard A. Terwilliger.(Fennell, Alexandra)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 49 Filed: 3/8/2006, Entered: 3/8/2006 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                    NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by George R. Moore and Mark J. Sampson as Counsel for Richard A. Terwilliger (Moore, George)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 48 Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: 3/3/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                      NOTICE by Richard A. Terwilliger Regarding Scheduling Order (Fennell, Alexandra)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 47 Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: 3/3/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra C. Fennell on behalf of Richard A. Terwilliger (Fennell, Alexandra)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 46 Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: 3/3/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by John T. Gutkoski on behalf of Richard A. Terwilliger (Gutkoski, John)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 45 Filed: 2/15/2006, Entered: 2/15/2006 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                            Judge Judith G. Dein : ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER: Hearing on pending motions scheduled for 4/12/06 at 10:00 AM.(Dambrosio, Jolyne)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/15/2006, Entered: 2/22/2006 Scheduling Conference
                                                              Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Judith G. Dein : Scheduling Conference held on 2/15/2006.; Attorneys Tocci, Moore and Sampson report current case status; Motion hearing date is set for 4/12/06 @ 10:00am. (Court Reporter DR.) (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 44 Filed: 2/14/2006, Entered: 2/14/2006 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                Judge Nancy Gertner : ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein..referred for an R&R on dispostive motions. (Molloy, Maryellen)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 43 Filed: 2/13/2006, Entered: 2/13/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                  NOTICE by Anthony D. Biscotti, Anthony D. Biscotti re [41] MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11, [42] Memorandum in Support of Motion of Certification by Counsel of Compliance with Rule 11 (Tocci, John)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 42 Filed: 2/13/2006, Entered: 2/13/2006 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re [41] MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11 filed by Anthony D. Biscotti, Anthony D. Biscotti. (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(Tocci, John)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 41 Filed: 2/13/2006, Entered: 2/13/2006, Terminated: 9/29/2006 Motion for Sanctions
                                                                      MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11 by Anthony D. Biscotti, Anthony D. Biscotti.(Tocci, John)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: 2/10/2006 Order
                                                                        Judge Judith G. Dein: Electronic ORDER entered re Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend (#40): ALLOWED. Oral argument on the motion to dismiss and the motion to amend shall be set at the status conference on February 15, 2006.(Irwin, Nancy)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 40 Filed: 2/8/2006, Entered: 2/8/2006 Stipulation
                                                                          STIPULATION to Extend Time Within Which Defendants Must Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend by Anthony D. Biscotti. (Tocci, John)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 39 Filed: 2/3/2006, Entered: 2/3/2006, Terminated: 9/29/2006 Motion to Amend
                                                                            MOTION to Amend [1] Complaint, To Join Ideamatrix, Inc. as a Plaintiff by Richard A. Terwilliger, World Wide Medical Technologies, LLC, Advanced Care Pharmacy, Inc., Gary A. Lamoureux.(Moore, George)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 38 Filed: 2/3/2006, Entered: 2/3/2006 Opposition to Motion
                                                                              Opposition re [33] MOTION to Dismiss Patent Claims by Anthony D. Biscotti filed by Richard A. Terwilliger, World Wide Medical Technologies, LLC, Advanced Care Pharmacy, Inc., Gary A. Lamoureux. (Moore, George)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: 1/19/2006 Order
                                                                                Judge Judith G. Dein : Electronic ORDER entered approving the parties' [37] Stipulation extending the time within which Plaintiff must respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss until 2/3/06.(Dambrosio, Jolyne)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 37 Filed: 1/18/2006, Entered: 1/18/2006 Stipulation
                                                                                  STIPULATION re [30] Memorandum in Support of Motion, [33] MOTION to Dismiss Patent Claims by Anthony D. Biscotti and, [34] Memorandum in Support of Motion To extend Time in Which Plaintiffs Must Respond by Anthony D. Biscotti. (Tocci, John)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005 Order
                                                                                    Judge Judith G. Dein : Electronic ORDER entered approving the parties' [36] Stipulation extending the time within which Plaintiffs must respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss until 1/20/06.(Dambrosio, Jolyne)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 36 Filed: 12/21/2005, Entered: 12/21/2005 Stipulation
                                                                                      STIPULATION to Extend Time Within Which Plaintiffs Must Respond re [30] Memorandum in Support of Motion, [33] MOTION to Dismiss Patent Claims by Anthony D. Biscotti and, [34] Memorandum in Support of Motion by Gary A. Lamoureux. (Moore, George) Modified on 12/29/2005 to correct docket text (Filo, Jennifer).
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 35 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: 12/15/2005, Terminated: 12/15/2005 Motion to Continue
                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Continue Status Conference to As Requested in Motion by Anthony D. Biscotti.(Tocci, John)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: 12/15/2005 Order on Motion to Continue
                                                                                          Judge Judith G. Dein : Electronic ORDER entered granting [35] Joint Motion to Continue. Status Conference reset for 2/9/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 15 before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 12/13/2005, Entered: 12/13/2005 Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                            Judge Nancy Gertner: Electronic ORDER entered withdrawing [29] Motion to Dismiss (Filo, Jennifer)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 34 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/12/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re [33] MOTION to Dismiss Patent Claims by Anthony D. Biscotti and Nuclear Consultants Group, Inc. filed by Nuclear Consultants Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(Tocci, John)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 33 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/12/2005, Terminated: 9/29/2006 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                AMENDED MOTION to Dismiss Patent Claims by Anthony D. Biscotti and by Nuclear Consultants Group, Inc..(Tocci, John) Modified on 12/13/2005 to indicate that this is an amended motion to dismiss. The original motion was filed on 11/30/05 (Filo, Jennifer).
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 32 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/12/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                  NOTICE by Anthony D. Biscotti, Anthony D. Biscotti and Nuclear Consultants Group, Inc. of Withdrawal Without Prejudice of Motion to Dismiss Patent Claim (Tocci, John)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 31 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 11/30/2005 Certificate of Consultation
                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION re [30] Memorandum in Support of Motion, [29] MOTION to Dismiss Patent Claims and for Rule 11 Sanctions by Defendants Anthony Biscotti and Nuclear Consultants Group by John F. Tocci on behalf of all defendants. (Tocci, John)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document 30 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 11/30/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re [29] MOTION to Dismiss Patent Claims and for Rule 11 Sanctions by Defendants Anthony Biscotti and Nuclear Consultants Group filed by Nuclear Consultants Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(Tocci, John)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 29 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 11/30/2005, Terminated: 12/13/2005 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss Patent Claims and for Rule 11 Sanctions by Defendants Anthony Biscotti and by Nuclear Consultants Group, Inc..(Tocci, John)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/28/2005, Entered: 10/28/2005 Order
                                                                                                          Judge Judith G. Dein : Electronic ORDER entered adopting the parties' [28] Stipulation and Order Governing the Production and Disclosure of Confidential Documents and Information.(Dambrosio, Jolyne)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 28 Filed: 10/26/2005, Entered: 10/26/2005 Stipulation
                                                                                                            STIPULATION re [27] Order on Motion for Order, Order on Motion for Discovery Governing the Production and Disclosure of Confidential Documents and Information by Richard A. Terwilliger, World Wide Medical Technologies, LLC, Advanced Care Pharmacy, Inc., Gary A. Lamoureux. (Moore, George)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 27 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/19/2005 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                              Judge Judith G. Dein : ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part [25] & [26] Cross Motions for Confidentiality Order. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 26 Filed: 10/14/2005, Entered: 10/14/2005, Terminated: 10/19/2005 Motion for Discovery
                                                                                                                First MOTION for Discovery and Adoption of Proposed Confidentiality Order by World Wide Medical Technologies, LLC.(Moore, George)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 25 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: 10/13/2005, Terminated: 10/19/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                  MOTION to Adopt Order Governing Discovery of Confidential Information by Defendants Anthony D. Biscotti and by Nuclear Consultants Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(Tocci, John)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/6/2005, Entered: 10/6/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                  Judge Judith G. Dein : ElectronicORDER entered granting [24] Joint Motion for Extension of Time to 10/13/2005 to File Stipulation Governing Discovery of Confidential Data. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 24 Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: 10/3/2005, Terminated: 10/6/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to 10/13/2005 to File Stipulation Governing Discovery of Confidential Data by Richard A. Terwilliger, Anthony D. Biscotti, Nuclear Consultants Group, Inc., World Wide Medical Technologies, LLC, Advanced Care Pharmacy, Inc., Anthony D. Biscotti, Richard A. Terwilliger, World Wide Medical Technologies, LLC, Advanced Care Pharmacy, Inc., Gary A. Lamoureux, Gary A. Lamoureux.(Tocci, John)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 23 Filed: 9/13/2005, Entered: 9/13/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      Judge Judith G. Dein: SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Confidentiality agreement by 10/4/05; fact discovery completed by 3/10/06; plaintiffs' expert reports by 5/5/06; defendants' expert reports by 6/6/06. Dispositive motions by 7/14/06. Status Conference set for 12/15/2005 02:45 PM before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Irwin, Nancy)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 22 Filed: 9/8/2005, Entered: 9/8/2005 Certificate of Consultation
                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to Local Rule 16(D)(3) by George R. Moore on behalf of all plaintiffs. (Moore, George)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 21 Filed: 9/8/2005, Entered: 9/8/2005 Joint statement re scheduling conference
                                                                                                                          JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference. (Moore, George)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 20 Filed: 8/31/2005, Entered: 8/31/2005 Certificate of Consultation
                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION (Rule 16.1) by John F. Tocci on behalf of all defendants. (Tocci, John)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 19 Filed: 8/15/2005, Entered: 8/15/2005 Notice of Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 9/12/2005 02:30 PM in Courtroom 15 before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 18 Filed: 8/11/2005, Entered: 8/11/2005 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                Judge Nancy Gertner : Electronic ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein Referred for: 16.b and pretrial csmgmt, (no dispositive mtns).(Molloy, Maryellen)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 17 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/8/2005 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Counterclaim by Richard A. Terwilliger, World Wide Medical Technologies, LLC, Advanced Care Pharmacy, Inc., Gary A. Lamoureux.(Filo, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: 3/8/2005 Order on Motion to Preserve Evidence
                                                                                                                                    Judge Nancy Gertner : Electronic ORDER entered finding as moot [2] Motion to Preserve Evidence based on defendants' representations that such an order is unnecessary, denying [3] Motion for Preliminary Injunction based on the record before me, without prejudice to the plaintiffs' refiling the motion. The plaintiff deferred consideration of the motion pending discussions with the defendant. As a result, no memorandum has been filed; no affidavits to buttress the motion were served on defendants. The record as it currently stands before me is inadequate to support a preliminary injunction. (Gertner, Nancy)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 16 Filed: 2/11/2005, Entered: 2/11/2005 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                      Opposition re [2] MOTION to Preserve Evidence of Anthony D. Biscotti and Nuclear Consultants Group, Inc. filed by Anthony D. Biscotti, Anthony D. Biscotti. (Tocci, John)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 15 Filed: 2/11/2005, Entered: 2/11/2005 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                        Opposition re [3] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction of Anthony D. Biscotti and Nuclear Consultants Group, Inc. filed by Anthony D. Biscotti, Anthony D. Biscotti. (Tocci, John)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 14 Filed: 2/11/2005, Entered: 2/11/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                          Defendants Anthony Biscotti's and Nuclear Consultants Group, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and, COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs by Anthony D. Biscotti.(Tocci, John)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: 2/9/2005 Order on Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                            Judge Nancy Gertner : Electronic ORDER entered granting [9] Motion to Continue, granting [10] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, granting [13] Motion for Extension of Time, see mtns for details. (Molloy, Maryellen)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 13 Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: 1/27/2005, Terminated: 2/9/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to February 11, 2005 to File Responsive Pleadings to Complaint and Motions by Defendants Nuclear Consultants Group, Inc. and by Anthony D. Biscotti.(Tocci, John)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 12 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: 1/21/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Anthony D. Biscotti and Nuclear Consultants Group of Name, Address, E-Mail Address and telephone Number Change of Counsel (Tocci, John)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 11 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: 1/21/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Anthony D. Biscotti of Name, Address Telephone Number and E-Mail Change (Tocci, John)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 10 Filed: 12/28/2004, Entered: 12/28/2004, Terminated: 2/9/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to January 31, 2005 to File Answer re [1] Complaint,, [2] MOTION to Preserve Evidence, [3] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Anthony Biscotti and by Nuclear Consultants Group, Inc..(Tocci, John) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/29/2004 (Filo, Jennifer).
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 9 Filed: 11/19/2004, Entered: 11/19/2004, Terminated: 2/9/2005 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Continue Time for Filing Responsive Pleadings to 12/31/04 by Advanced Care Pharmacy, Inc., Anthony D. Biscotti.(Tocci, John)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 9/23/2004, Entered: 9/29/2004 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                        WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Nuclear Consultants Group, Inc. waiver sent on 7/30/2004, answer due 9/28/2004. (Filo, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 9/23/2004, Entered: 9/29/2004 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Anthony D. Biscotti waiver sent on 7/30/2004, answer due 9/28/2004. (Filo, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/29/2004, Entered: 7/29/2004 Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                            Judge Nancy Gertner : Electronic ORDER entered granting [5] Motion to Seal (Filo, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 6 Filed: 7/20/2004, Entered: 7/29/2004 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                              SEALED AFFIDAVIT by Advanced Care Pharmacy, Inc., Gary A. Lamoureux, Richard A. Terwilliger, World Wide Medical Technologies, LLC. (Filo, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 7/20/2004, Entered: 7/29/2004 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Seal by Advanced Care Pharmacy, Inc., Gary A. Lamoureux, Richard A. Terwilliger, World Wide Medical Technologies, LLC.(Filo, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 7/20/2004, Entered: 7/29/2004 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Charles N. Jacobs by Advanced Care Pharmacy, Inc., Gary A. Lamoureux, Richard A. Terwilliger, World Wide Medical Technologies, LLC. (Filo, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/20/2004, Entered: 7/29/2004 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Advanced Care Pharmacy, Inc., Gary A. Lamoureux, Richard A. Terwilliger, World Wide Medical Technologies, LLC.(Filo, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/20/2004, Entered: 7/29/2004 Motion to Preserve Evidence
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Preserve Electronic and Digital Information by Advanced Care Pharmacy, Inc., Gary A. Lamoureux, Richard A. Terwilliger, World Wide Medical Technologies, LLC.(Filo, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/20/2004, Entered: 7/29/2004 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement, Breach of Non-Disclosure Agreement, and Theft of Trade Secrets Filing fee: $ 150, receipt number 57419, filed by Advanced Care Pharmacy, Inc., Gary A. Lamoureux, Richard A. Terwilliger, World Wide Medical Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Part 2)(Filo, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/20/2004, Entered: 7/29/2004 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                        Summons Issued as to Anthony D. Biscotti, Nuclear Consultants Group, Inc.. (Filo, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/20/2004, Entered: 7/29/2004 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                                                                                                                                                          If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Dein. (Filo, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 89 times.

                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?