Shanley v. O'Prey et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:14-cv-01929

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 20, 2017 at 5:51 AM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo William Brandon Shanley, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Attorney at Law Offices of Marlene Thomason

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Brandon Shanley +1 203 857 2043 wbs2012@zoho.com
v.
No Logo Anderson Cooper, Defendant
No Logo Andrew Julien, Defendant
No Logo Ann Sweeney, Defendant
No Logo Banks Tarver, Defendant
No Logo Brian L. Roberts, Defendant
No Logo Daniel L. Doctoroff, Defendant
No Logo David Fanning, Defendant
No Logo David Rhodes, Defendant
No Logo Deborah Turness, Defendant
No Logo Doug Herzog, Defendant
No Logo Frank Koughan, Defendant
No Logo James C. Smith, Defendant
No Logo James Goldston, Defendant
No Logo Jeff Fager, Defendant
No Logo Jeff Zucker, Defendant
No Logo Immelt, Jeffrey R., Defendant
Officially listed as "Jeffrey R. Immelt"
General Electric Company CEO, General Electric Company, September 7, 2001 - August 1, 2017
Unknown Role, Athenahealth, Inc.
Unknown Role, Twilio, Inc.
Unknown Role, Bloom Energy Corp
Unknown Role, Bear Newco, Inc.
No Logo Joe Beshenkovsky, Defendant
No Logo John Marks, Defendant
No Logo JOHN MILLER, Defendant
No Logo John Skipper, Defendant
No Logo Jon Abbott, Defendant
No Logo Ken Druckerman, Defendant
No Logo Kevin O'Prey, Defendant
No Logo Les Moonves, Defendant
No Logo Linda Winslow, Defendant
Bloomberg, Michael Rubens Bloomberg, Michael Rubens, Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael Bloomberg"
No Logo Nicholas Chiaia, Defendant
No Logo Paula A. Kerger, Defendant
No Logo Peter Dunn, Defendant
No Logo Phil Griffin, Defendant
No Logo Richard Graziano, Defendant
No Logo Robert D. Marcus, Defendant
No Logo Robert Iger, Defendant
No Logo Roger Ailes, Defendant
Murdoch, A.C., K. Rupert Murdoch, A.C., K. Rupert, Defendant
Officially listed as "Rupert Murdoch"
No Logo Sumner M. Redstone, Defendant
No Logo Tony Hall, Defendant
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None USCA Mandate
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: None Appearance Pro Se
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Admission Pro Hac Vice
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/6/2016, Entered: None
          MOTION for Attorney(s) to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by William Brandon Shanley. (Shanley, William) (Entered: 05/06/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/4/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
            Index to Record on Appeal by William Brandon Shanley re 15 Notice of Appeal, 4 MOTION for Order, 9 Amended Complaint,, 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 1 Complaint,, 8 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,, Order on Motion for Order, 3 Consent to Electronic Notice, 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, 13 First MOTION for Disqualification of Judge, Reopen Dismissed Case, Appoint Counsel, Grant 60 days time to Revise Complaint Notice Fraud Upon the Court and Motions Order MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Reopen Case MOTION to Transfer/Disqualify/Recuse Judge, 12 Electronic Filing Order (PRO SE), 10 MOTION by pro se litigant to participate in electronic filing, 11 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 7 Order Dismissing Case, 14 First MOTION for Disqualification of Judge, Reopen Dismissed Case, Appoint Counsel, Grant 60 days time to Revise Complaint Notice Fraud Upon the Court and Motions Order MOTION to Transfer/Disqualify/Recuse Judge MOTION to Reopen Case MOTION to Amend/Correct, 6 Protective Order. For docket entries without a hyperlink, contact the court to arrange for the document(s) to be made available to you. (Caffrey, A.) (Entered: 05/05/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/4/2016, Entered: None
              NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 7 Order Dismissing Case by William Brandon Shanley. This corrects documents 13 and 14 of which wrong event was used. (Pesta, J.) (Entered: 05/05/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/4/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                ENTERED IN ERROR: : First MOTION for Disqualification of Judge, Reopen Dismissed Case, Appoint Counsel, Grant 60 days time to Revise Complaint Notice Fraud Upon the Court and Motions Order by William Brandon Shanley. (Shanley, William). Added MOTION to Transfer/Disqualify/Recuse Judge, MOTION to Reopen Case, MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint on 5/5/2016 (Caffrey, A.). Modified on 5/5/2016 (Pesta, J.). (Entered: 05/04/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ENTERED IN ERROR: First MOTION for Disqualification of Judge, Reopen Dismissed Case, Appoint Counsel, Grant 60 days time to Revise Complaint Notice Fraud Upon the Court and Motions Order by William Brandon Shanley. (Shanley, William). Added MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint , MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION to Reopen Case, MOTION to Transfer/Disqualify/Recuse Judge on 5/4/2016 (Pesta, J.). Modified on 5/5/2016 (Pesta, J.). (Entered: 05/03/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. PRO SE FILERS ARE REQUIRED TO COMPLY WITH THE JUDGE'S STANDARD ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER WHICH IS ATTACHED. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 4/13/2016.(Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 04/13/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER granting 10 Motion pro se litigant to participate in electronic filing. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 4/13/2016. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 04/13/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: None
                            AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jon Abbott, Roger Ailes, Michael Bloomberg, Nicholas Chiaia, Anderson Cooper, Daniel L. Doctoroff, Ken Druckerman, Peter Dunn, Jeff Fager, David Fanning, James Goldston, Phil Griffin, Tony Hall, Doug Herzog, Robert Iger, Jeffrey R. Immelt, Paula A. Kerger, Robert D. Marcus, John Miller, Les Moonves, Rupert Murdoch(Executive Chairman, News Corporation), Rupert Murdoch(Chairman and CEO, 21st Century Fox), Kevin O'Prey, Sumner M. Redstone, David Rhodes, Brian L. Roberts, John Skipper, James C. Smith, Ann Sweeney, Deborah Turness, Linda Winslow, Jeff Zucker, filed by William Brandon Shanley. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint Part 2, # 2 Complaint Part 3)(Campbell, A) (Entered: 02/26/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER. Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. # 2 ) and motion to participate in electronic filing (Doc. # 4 ) are DENIED as moot in light of the dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 2/20/2015. (Norman, D.) (Entered: 02/20/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/24/2014, Entered: None Protective Order
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank 6 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 12/22/14.(Campbell, A) (Entered: 12/24/2014)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/24/2014, Entered: None Order on Pretrial Deadlines
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None
                                        Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 3/22/15. Amended Pleadings due by 2/20/2015 Discovery due by 6/23/2015 Dispositive Motions due by 7/23/2015 Signed by Clerk on 12/22/14.(Campbell, A) (Entered: 12/24/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/24/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None
                                            MOTION by Pro Se Litigant to Participate in Electronic Filing by William Brandon Shanley.Responses due by 1/12/2015 (Campbell, A) (Entered: 12/24/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/24/2014, Entered: None Consent to Electronic Notice
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                Consent to Electronic Notice by William Brandon Shanley (Campbell, A) (Entered: 12/24/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/24/2014, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                    MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shanley. (Campbell, A) (Entered: 12/24/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/24/2014, Entered: None Complaint
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                        COMPLAINT with Exhibit D(video CD) filed manually against Roger Ailes, Joe Beshenkovsky, Michael Bloomberg, Nicholas Chiaia, Anderson Cooper, Daniel L. Doctoroff, Peter Dunn, Jeff Fager, James Goldston, Richard Graziano, Phil Griffin, Tony Hall, Doug Herzog, Robert Iger, Jeffrey R. Immelt, Andrew Julien, Paula A. Kerger, Robert D. Marcus, John Marks, John Miller, Les Moonves, Rupert Murdoch(Executive Chairman, News Corporation), Rupert Murdoch(Chairman and CEO, 21st Century Fox), Kevin O'Prey, Sumner M. Redstone, David B. Rhodes, John Skipper, James C. Smith, Ann Sweeney, Banks Tarver, Deborah Turness, Jeff Zucker, filed by Shanley. (Attachments: # 1 continued)(Pesta, J.) (Entered: 12/24/2014)
                                                          LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 2,004 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?