Bennett et al v. Fidelity Management & Research Company et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-11651-MLW

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Guy E. Miller, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sara B Davis +1 617 854 4000 +1 617 854 4040

Toggle Switch Represented by Burns & Levinson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua N. Cook +1 617 345 3249 +1 617 345 3299 jcook@burnslev.com
Space Harry S. Miller +1 617 345 3000 +1 617 345 3299 hmiller@burnslev.com
Space Matthew J. Tuttle +1 617 345 3000 +1 617 345 3299 mtuttle@burnslev.com

Represented by Keller Rohrback LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Shapiro Haber & Urmy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michelle H. Blauner +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 mblauner@shulaw.com
No Logo Andrea M Phillips, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Burns & Levinson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew J. Tuttle +1 617 345 3000 +1 617 345 3299 mtuttle@burnslev.com

Represented by Keller Rohrback LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Shapiro Haber & Urmy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michelle H. Blauner +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 mblauner@shulaw.com
No Logo Cindy Schurgin, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Burns & Levinson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew J. Tuttle +1 617 345 3000 +1 617 345 3299 mtuttle@burnslev.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Keller Rohrback LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Y. Chen +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 dchen@kellerrohrback.com
Space Laura R. Gerber +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 lgerber@kellerrohrback.com
Space Michael Dean Woerner +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 mwoerner@kellerrohrback.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shapiro Haber & Urmy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michelle H. Blauner +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 mblauner@shulaw.com
No Logo Cynthia Bennett, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sara B Davis +1 617 854 4000 +1 617 854 4040

Toggle Switch Represented by Burns & Levinson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua N. Cook +1 617 345 3249 +1 617 345 3299 jcook@burnslev.com
Space Robert D. Friedman +1 617 345 3248 rfriedman@burnslev.com
Space Harry S. Miller +1 617 345 3000 +1 617 345 3299 hmiller@burnslev.com
Space Matthew J. Tuttle +1 617 345 3000 +1 617 345 3299 mtuttle@burnslev.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Keller Rohrback LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Y. Chen +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 dchen@kellerrohrback.com
Space Laura R. Gerber +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 lgerber@kellerrohrback.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shapiro Haber & Urmy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michelle H. Blauner +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 mblauner@shulaw.com
No Logo Haugen Plaintiffs, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Keller Rohrback LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Y. Chen +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 dchen@kellerrohrback.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shapiro Haber & Urmy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michelle H. Blauner +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 mblauner@shulaw.com
No Logo James Gilliam, and others, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Burns & Levinson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert D. Friedman +1 617 345 3248 rfriedman@burnslev.com
No Logo Karen L. Magnan, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Burns & Levinson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew J. Tuttle +1 617 345 3000 +1 617 345 3299 mtuttle@burnslev.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Keller Rohrback LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Y. Chen +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 dchen@kellerrohrback.com
Space Laura R. Gerber +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 lgerber@kellerrohrback.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shapiro Haber & Urmy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michelle H. Blauner +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 mblauner@shulaw.com
No Logo Michael F. Magnan, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Burns & Levinson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew J. Tuttle +1 617 345 3000 +1 617 345 3299 mtuttle@burnslev.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Keller Rohrback LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Y. Chen +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 dchen@kellerrohrback.com
Space Laura R. Gerber +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 lgerber@kellerrohrback.com
Space Michael Dean Woerner +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 mwoerner@kellerrohrback.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shapiro Haber & Urmy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michelle H. Blauner +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 mblauner@shulaw.com
No Logo Nancy Haugen, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Burns & Levinson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert D. Friedman +1 617 345 3248 rfriedman@burnslev.com
Space Matthew J. Tuttle +1 617 345 3000 +1 617 345 3299 mtuttle@burnslev.com

Represented by Keller Rohrback LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Shapiro Haber & Urmy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michelle H. Blauner +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 mblauner@shulaw.com
No Logo Presley C Phillips, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Burns & Levinson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew J. Tuttle +1 617 345 3000 +1 617 345 3299 mtuttle@burnslev.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Keller Rohrback LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Y. Chen +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 dchen@kellerrohrback.com
Space Laura R. Gerber +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 lgerber@kellerrohrback.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shapiro Haber & Urmy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michelle H. Blauner +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 mblauner@shulaw.com
No Logo Donald J. Kirk, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Fidelity Funds, Consolidated Defendant

Represented by K&L Gates LLP

No Logo Fidelity Management & Research Company, Consolidated Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert J. Liubicic +1 212 530 5333 +1 212 822 5333

Toggle Switch Represented by COHEN MOHR, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Samuel Cohen +1 202 835 7517 +1 202 263 7517 dcohen@cohenmohr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Debevoise & Plimpton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Sheridan Kiernan +1 212 909 6692 +1 212 521 7692 jskiernan@debevoise.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David J. Apfel +1 617 570 1970 +1 617 227 8591 dapfel@goodwinprocter.com
Space Sarah Heaton Concannon +1 617 570 1182 +1 617 227 8591 sconcannon@goodwinprocter.com
Space James S. Dittmar +1 617 570 1944 +1 617 227 8591 jdittmar@goodwinprocter.com
Space Stuart Marc Glass +1 617 570 1970 +1 617 523 1231 sglass@goodwinprocter.com
Space Christopher D. Moore +1 617 570 1319 +1 617 523 1213 cmoore@goodwinprocter.com
No Logo FMR Company, Incorporated, Consolidated Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by COHEN MOHR, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Samuel Cohen +1 202 835 7517 +1 202 263 7517 dcohen@cohenmohr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Debevoise & Plimpton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Sheridan Kiernan +1 212 909 6692 +1 212 521 7692 jskiernan@debevoise.com
Space Shannon Rose Selden +1 212 909 6000 +1 212 909 6836 srselden@debevoise.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David J. Apfel +1 617 570 1970 +1 617 227 8591 dapfel@goodwinprocter.com
Space Sarah Heaton Concannon +1 617 570 1182 +1 617 227 8591 sconcannon@goodwinprocter.com
Space James S. Dittmar +1 617 570 1944 +1 617 227 8591 jdittmar@goodwinprocter.com
Space Stuart Marc Glass +1 617 570 1970 +1 617 523 1231 sglass@goodwinprocter.com
Space Christopher D. Moore +1 617 570 1319 +1 617 523 1213 cmoore@goodwinprocter.com
No Logo George H. Heilmeier, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Gerald C. McDonough, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo J. Michael Cook, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Marie L. Knowles, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Marvin L. Mann, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Ned C. Lautenbach, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Ralph F. Cox, Consolidated Defendant
Gates, Robert M. Gates, Robert M., Consolidated Defendant
Officially listed as "Robert M. Gates"
Nacco Industries, Inc. Unknown Role, Nacco Industries, Inc.
Starbucks Corporation Unknown Role, Starbucks Corporation
No Logo William O. McCoy, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo William S. Stavropoulos, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Gilliam Plaintiffs, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nancy F. Gans +1 781 235 2246 +1 781 239 0353 nlfgans@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Burns & Levinson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert D. Friedman +1 617 345 3248 rfriedman@burnslev.com
Office Boston
Filed 7/23/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Suffolk
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
104-cv-11651-MLW None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CASREF, LEAD
  Entries (346) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 290
    LREF
    Blank 289 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
    Chief Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that: 1. The stay pending mediation is TERMINATED and this case is REOPENED. 2. The parties shall confer again and, by January 20, 2012, report whether this case has been settled. 3. If not, the parties shall, by January 24, 2012, each submit to the court any recent relevant case law concerning the pending motions for summary judgment and to dismiss, or a statement that there is no such recent relevant case law. 4. If necessary, a hearing on the pending motions shall be held on January 30, 2012, at 2:15 p.m. The court may decide the motions at that hearing.(Hohler, Daniel) (Entered: 01/05/2012)
      LREF
      Blank 285 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
      Chief Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered. This case is hereby Administratively Closed. The parties shall file a motion to reopen the case if warranted.(Hohler, Daniel) (Entered: 08/31/2011)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None
        Assented to MOTION to Continue Hearing Date to After November 1, 2011 to Enable the Parties to Pursue Mediation by Cynthia Bennett, Guy E. Miller.(Friedman, Robert) (Entered: 08/31/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: 3/22/2011 Memorandum in Support of Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: 3/18/2011 Motion for Leave to File
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: 3/11/2011 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: 3/11/2011 Opposition to Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: 3/11/2011 Reply to Response to Motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: 2/25/2011 Declaration
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 274 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: 2/25/2011 Brief
                        LREF
                        Blank 273 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: 2/25/2011 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                          LREF
                          Blank 272 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: 2/25/2011 Motion to Dismiss
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: 2/22/2011 Exhibit
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: 2/22/2011 Exhibit
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: 2/22/2011 Affidavit in Support
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: 2/22/2011 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: 2/18/2011 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: 2/15/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: 2/7/2011 Status Report
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: 2/4/2011 Affidavit in Support
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: 2/4/2011 Affidavit in Support
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: 2/4/2011 Affidavit in Support
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: 2/4/2011 Affidavit in Support
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: 2/4/2011 Affidavit in Support
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: 2/4/2011 Affidavit in Opposition
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: 2/4/2011 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: 2/4/2011 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: 2/4/2011 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: 2/4/2011 Exhibit
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: 1/26/2011 Status Report
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: 1/14/2011 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: 1/14/2011 Transcript
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank 251 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: 1/11/2011 Memorandum and Order
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: 1/10/2011 Motion Hearing
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: 1/5/2011 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: 12/22/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: 12/20/2010 Certificate of Service pursuant to LR 5.2
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: 12/17/2010 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: 12/16/2010 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: 12/15/2010 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: 12/1/2010 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: 10/21/2010 Sealed Document +
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: 10/21/2010 Sealed Document +
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: 10/19/2010 Notice of Manual Filing
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: 9/3/2010 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: 9/3/2010 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: 9/3/2010 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: 7/30/2010 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: 7/30/2010 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: 7/30/2010 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: 7/30/2010 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: 7/1/2010 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: 6/24/2010 Motion to Amend
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 230 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: 5/14/2010 Joint statement of counsel
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 229 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: 4/1/2010 Order
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 8/11/2009, Entered: 8/11/2009 Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: 8/7/2009 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: 8/7/2009 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: 8/7/2009 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: 8/7/2009 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: 8/7/2009 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: 8/7/2009 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: 8/7/2009 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: 8/7/2009 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: 8/7/2009 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: 8/7/2009 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: 8/7/2009 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: 8/7/2009 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: 8/7/2009 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 151 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: 9/9/2008, Terminated: 9/9/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION To Amend The Schedule For Expert Discovery And Motions For Summary Judgment by Fidelity Management & Research Company, FMR Company, Incorporated, Nancy Haugen, Karen L. Magnan, Michael F. Magnan, Andrea M Phillips, Presley C Phillips, Cindy Schurgin, Cynthia Bennett, Guy E. Miller.(Dittmar, James)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: 8/7/2009 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: 9/10/2008 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                  Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Status Conference held on 9/9/2008. Further Status Conference set for 12/10/2008 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Duffy, Marc)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: 8/6/2009 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: 9/9/2008 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                      Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Electronic ORDER entered granting [151] Motion. (Bowler, Marianne)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: 8/5/2009 Notice of Manual Filing
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 150 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          Chief Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered. re (131 in 1:04-cv-11651-MLW) Objection, filed by Karen L. Magnan, Andrea M Phillips, Guy E. Miller, Michael F. Magnan, Cynthia Bennett, Presley C Phillips, Cindy Schurgin, Nancy Haugen, (133 in 1:04-cv-11651-MLW) Objection, filed by Gilliam Plaintiffs, Karen L. Magnan, Andrea M Phillips, William S. Stavropoulos, James Gilliam, and others, Guy E. Miller, Michael F. Magnan, Cindy Schurgin, Presley C Phillips, Cynthia Bennett, Haugen Plaintiffs, Nancy Haugen Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-11651-MLW, 1:04-cv-11756-MLW(O'Leary, Dennis)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 7/30/2009, Entered: 7/30/2009 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/18/2008 Order on Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                              Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Electronic ORDER entered granting [149] Motion to Continue. The status conference is continued to September 9, 2008 at 2:30 p.m. (Duffy, Marc)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 7/30/2009, Entered: 7/30/2009 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 149 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: 6/13/2008, Terminated: 6/18/2008 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Continue Status Conference to Week of September 8, 2008 by Nancy Haugen, Karen L. Magnan, Michael F. Magnan, Andrea M Phillips, Presley C Phillips, Cindy Schurgin, Cynthia Bennett, Guy E. Miller.(Tuttle, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: 7/29/2009 Certificate of Service pursuant to LR 5.2
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: 5/16/2008 Order on Motion for Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                      Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Electronic ORDER entered denying [143] Motion for Discovery, without prejudice to be renewed after the deposition of Ms. Lawson, if necessary. (Bowler, Marianne)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: 7/29/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                          Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Motion Hearing held on 5/14/2008 re [143] MOTION for Discovery. Ruling made as stated on the record in open court. (Duffy, Marc)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: 7/29/2009 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 148 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: 5/13/2008 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to [143] MOTION for Discovery filed by Karen L. Magnan, Michael F. Magnan, Andrea M Phillips, Presley C Phillips, Cindy Schurgin, Cynthia Bennett, Guy E. Miller. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A Part 1, # (2) Exhibit A Part 2)(Tuttle, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: 7/29/2009 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                                                                                                                                                  Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Electronic ORDER entered granting [147] Motion for Leave to File. (Bowler, Marianne)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: 7/29/2009 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 147 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/9/2008, Terminated: 5/12/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                      Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Take Additional Fact Discovery by Nancy Haugen, Karen L. Magnan, Michael F. Magnan, Andrea M Phillips, Presley C Phillips, Cindy Schurgin, Cynthia Bennett, Guy E. Miller. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Tuttle, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: 7/29/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: 4/30/2008 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: Hearing on [143] MOTION for Discovery set for 5/14/2008 at 2:00 AM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Duffy, Marc)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: 7/29/2009 Statement of Facts
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 146 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: 4/29/2008 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposition re [143] MOTION for Discovery filed by Fidelity Management & Research Company, FMR Company, Incorporated. (Dittmar, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: 7/29/2009 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: 4/28/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Electronic ORDER entered granting [145] Motion for Extension of Time. (Bowler, Marianne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 7/24/2009, Entered: 7/24/2009 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 145 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: 4/25/2008, Terminated: 4/28/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time by Fidelity Management & Research Company, FMR Company, Incorporated.(Dittmar, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: 7/23/2009 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 144 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter/request (non-motion) from Matthew J. Tuttle regarding Request for Oral Argument. (Tuttle, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: 7/7/2009 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 143 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: 4/11/2008, Terminated: 5/16/2008 Motion for Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Discovery by Nancy Haugen, Karen L. Magnan, Michael F. Magnan, Andrea M Phillips, Presley C Phillips, Cindy Schurgin, Cynthia Bennett, Guy E. Miller.(Tuttle, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 7/2/2009, Entered: 7/2/2009 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: 3/26/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on December 3, 2007 before Judge Bowler. Digital Recording: Transcribed by Maryann Young. The original transcripts are maintained by the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting Maryann Young at 508/384-2003 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah) Modified on 3/26/2008 (Scalfani, Deborah).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 7/1/2009, Entered: 7/1/2009 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 141 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: 3/25/2008, Terminated: 3/25/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION For Adjournment of March 26, 2008 Status Conference by Fidelity Management & Research Company, FMR Company, Incorporated, Nancy Haugen, Karen L. Magnan, Michael F. Magnan, Andrea M Phillips, Presley C Phillips, Cindy Schurgin, Cynthia Bennett, Guy E. Miller.(Dittmar, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 6/23/2009, Entered: 6/23/2009 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: 3/25/2008 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Electronic ORDER entered granting [141] Motion. The status conference is continued until June 18, 2008 at 2:30 p.m. (Bowler, Marianne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 140 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Response by Fidelity Management & Research Company, FMR Company, Incorporated to [131] Objection, [133] Objection, (Defendants' Surreply to Plaintiffs' Objections to Order Denying Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion to Compel Discovery (Dkt. 130) and Order Allowing Defendants' Motion for a Protective Order to Quash the Deposition Notice of Edward C. Johnson 3d (Dkt. 131 )). (Dittmar, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Chief Judge Mark L. Wolf: Electronic ORDER entered granting (139) Motion for Leave to File; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. in case 1:04-cv-11651-MLW Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-11651-MLW, 1:04-cv-11756-MLW(O'Leary, Dennis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 6/17/2009, Entered: 6/17/2009 Notice of Manual Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 139 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008, Terminated: 3/7/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Surreply (Unopposed) by Fidelity Management & Research Company, FMR Company, Incorporated. (Attachments: # (1) [Proposed] Surreply to Plaintiffs' Objections to Order Denying Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion to Compel Discovery (Dkt. 130) and Order Allowing Defendants' Motion for A Protective Order to Quash the Deposition Notice of Edward C. Johnson 3d (Dkt. 131))(Dittmar, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 6/17/2009, Entered: 6/17/2009 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 138 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Response by Nancy Haugen, Karen L. Magnan, Michael F. Magnan, Andrea M Phillips, Presley C Phillips, Cindy Schurgin, Cynthia Bennett, Guy E. Miller to [136] Response to Plaintiffs' Objections to Magistrate Orders. (Tuttle, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 6/17/2009, Entered: 6/17/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/4/2008 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Electronic ORDER entered granting [137] Motion for Leave to File. (Bowler, Marianne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 6/17/2009, Entered: 6/17/2009 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 137 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008, Terminated: 2/4/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Objections by Nancy Haugen, Karen L. Magnan, Michael F. Magnan, Andrea M Phillips, Presley C Phillips, Cindy Schurgin, Cynthia Bennett, Guy E. Miller. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Tuttle, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 6/17/2009, Entered: 6/17/2009 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Electronic ORDER entered granting [135] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (Bowler, Marianne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 6/11/2009, Entered: 6/11/2009 Motion to Modify
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 136 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: 1/16/2008 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Response by Fidelity Management & Research Company, FMR Company, Incorporated to [131] Objection, [133] Objection,. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Dittmar, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: 5/20/2009 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 135 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: 1/16/2008, Terminated: 1/17/2008 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Fidelity Management & Research Company, FMR Company, Incorporated.(Dittmar, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: 5/15/2009 Motion to Modify
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: 1/8/2008 Notice of Rescheduling
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING. The Status Conference of 3/13/2008 is hereby rescheduled to 3/26/2008 at 2:30 PM, at the request of counsel. (Duffy, Marc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 5/6/2009, Entered: 5/13/2009 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 134 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: 1/4/2008 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: STIPULATION AND ORDER entered. The Status Conference previously scheduled for 1/11/2008 is rescheduled to 3/13/2008 at 2:30. (Duffy, Marc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 5/6/2009, Entered: 5/13/2009 Sealed Motion +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/28/2007, Entered: 12/28/2007 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Document No. 130, Pltfs' Objection to to Order deleted from docket as an incorrect event was selected when e-filed and has been re-docketed using the correct event as Document No. 133 (Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 5/6/2009, Entered: 5/6/2009 Notice of Manual Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Chief Judge Mark L. Wolf: Electronic ORDER entered granting [132] Motion for Extension of Time (O'Leary, Dennis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 5/5/2009, Entered: 5/5/2009 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 132 Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: 12/20/2007, Terminated: 12/21/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Plaintiff's' Objection to Order Denying Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion to Compel Discovery (DKt.130) and Plaintiffs' Objection to Order Allowing Defendants' Motion for a Protective Order to Quash the Deposition Notice of Edward Johnson 3d (Dkt.131) by Fidelity Management & Research Company, FMR Company, Incorporated. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order To Extend Time)(Dittmar, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: 5/1/2009 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 133 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/28/2007 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Objection to Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Protective Order, by Nancy Haugen, Karen L. Magnan, Michael F. Magnan, Andrea M Phillips, Presley C Phillips, Cindy Schurgin, Cynthia Bennett, Haugen Plaintiffs, Guy E. Miller, William S. Stavropoulos, James Gilliam, and others, Gilliam Plaintiffs, FILED, c/s. (Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 4/29/2009, Entered: 4/29/2009 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 131 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/19/2007 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Objection to Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Protective Order,,,, by Nancy Haugen, Karen L. Magnan, Michael F. Magnan, Andrea M Phillips, Presley C Phillips, Cindy Schurgin, Cynthia Bennett, Guy E. Miller. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Tuttle, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 4/24/2009, Entered: 4/24/2009 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 129 Filed: 12/18/2007, Entered: 12/18/2007 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Expert Discovery and Motions for Summary Judgment by Fidelity Management & Research Company, FMR Company, Incorporated, Nancy Haugen, Karen L. Magnan, Michael F. Magnan, Andrea M Phillips, Presley C Phillips, Cindy Schurgin, Cynthia Bennett, Guy E. Miller. (Dittmar, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 4/8/2009, Entered: 4/8/2009 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: 12/5/2007 Order on Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Electronic ORDER entered denying [95] Motion to Compel, given the inadequate further showing of need on the part of the plaintiffs; granting [99] Motion for Protective Order. Although highly placed executives are not immune from discovery, a court may place limits upon such discovery. Bouchard v. New York Archdiocese, 2007 WL 272866, * 3 (S.D.N.Y. Sept. 19, 2007) (citing Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(b)(2)(C)). The burden of the discovery outweighs its likely benefit. It is also unreasonably cumulative or duplicative and was obtainable to a large degree from less burdensome sources. See Rule 26(b)(2)(C)(i) and (iii). After further consideration Motion to Extend Discovery [107] is denied as untimely. (Bowler, Marianne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 3/23/2009, Entered: 3/23/2009 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: 12/3/2007 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Motion Hearing held on 12/3/2007 as to [95] MOTION to Compel, [99] MOTION for Protective Order and [107] MOTION for Extension of Time to depose. The court takes the motions under advisement. Status Conference set for 1/11/2008 at 2:30 PM. (Duffy, Marc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: 3/18/2009 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 128 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: 11/29/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION re [127] Reply to Response to Motion, by Nancy Haugen, Karen L. Magnan, Michael F. Magnan, Andrea M Phillips, Presley C Phillips, Cindy Schurgin, Cynthia Bennett, Guy E. Miller. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit 4# (5) Exhibit 5 Part 1# (6) Exhibit 5 Part 2)(Gerber, Laura)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 3/17/2009, Entered: 3/17/2009 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 127 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: 11/29/2007 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re [107] MOTION for Extension of Time to 11/30/2007 to Complete Discovery for the Limited Purpose of Conducting a Half Day Deposition of Donald Kirk filed by Nancy Haugen, Karen L. Magnan, Michael F. Magnan, Andrea M Phillips, Presley C Phillips, Cindy Schurgin, Cynthia Bennett, Guy E. Miller. (Gerber, Laura)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: 3/3/2009 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 126 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: 11/29/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION re [99] MOTION for Protective Order To Quash The Deposition Notice Of Edward C. Johnson 3d, Chairman Of FMR. Corp. (Declaration of Karen Hammond) by Fidelity Management & Research Company, FMR Company, Incorporated. (Dittmar, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: 3/2/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 125 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: 11/29/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION re [99] MOTION for Protective Order To Quash The Deposition Notice Of Edward C. Johnson 3d, Chairman Of FMR. Corp. (Declaration of Edward C. Johnson 3d) by Fidelity Management & Research Company, FMR Company, Incorporated. (Dittmar, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: 2/9/2009 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 124 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: 11/29/2007, Terminated: 11/29/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File A Reply To Plaintiffs' Opposition to Fidelity's Motion for a Protective Order to Quash the Deposition Notice of Edward C. Johnson 3d, Chairman of FMR Corp. (Unopposed) by Fidelity Management & Research Company, FMR Company, Incorporated. (Attachments: # (1) [Proposed] Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Fidelity's Motion for a Protective Order to Quash the Deposition Notice of Edward C. Johnson 3d, Chairman of FMR Corp.)(Dittmar, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: 2/9/2009 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: 11/29/2007 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Electronic ORDER entered granting [123] Motion for Leave to File and granting [124] Motion for Leave to File. (Bowler, Marianne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: 2/6/2009 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 123 Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: 11/21/2007, Terminated: 11/29/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Reply to Defendants' and Fidelity Independent Trustee's Separate Memoranda of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Enlarge the Period for Discovery for the Limited Purpose of Conducting a Half-Day Deposition of Donald Kirk by Nancy Haugen, Karen L. Magnan, Michael F. Magnan, Andrea M Phillips, Presley C Phillips, Cindy Schurgin, Cynthia Bennett, Guy E. Miller. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit [Proposed] Reply to Defendants' and the Fidelity Independent Trustee's Memoranda of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Enlarge the Period for Discovery for the Limited Purpose of Conducting a Half-Day Deposition of Donald Kirk# (2) Exhibit Declaration of Laura Gerber# (3) Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Laura Gerber Declaration# (4) Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Laura Gerber Declaration# (5) Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Laura Gerber Declaration# (6) Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Laura Gerber Declaration# (7) Exhibit Exhibit 5(Part 1) to Laura Gerber Declaration# (8) Exhibit Exhibit 5(Part2) to Laura Gerber Declaration)(Gerber, Laura)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: 2/6/2009 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 122 Filed: 11/5/2007, Entered: 11/5/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION re [121] Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, / Declaration of Shannon Rose Selden in Support of Fidelity Independent Trustees' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Enlarge the Period for Discovery for the Limited Purpose of Conducting a Half Day Deposition of Donald Kirk by Fidelity Independent Trustees. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 to Selden Declaration# (2) Exhibit 2 to Selden Declaration# (3) Exhibit 3 to Selden Declaration# (4) Exhibit 4 to Selden Declaration# (5) Exhibit 5 to Selden Declaration# (6) Exhibit 6 to Selden Declaration# (7) Exhibit 7 to Selden Declaration# (8) Exhibit 8 to Selden Declaration# (9) Exhibit 9 to Selden Declaration# (10) Exhibit 10 to Selden Declaration)(Selden, Shannon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: 2/6/2009 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 121 Filed: 11/5/2007, Entered: 11/5/2007 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [107] MOTION for Extension of Time to 11/30/2007 to Complete Discovery for the Limited Purpose of Conducting a Half Day Deposition of Donald Kirk / Fidelity Independent Trustees' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Enlarge the Period for Discovery for the Limited Purpose of Conducting a Half Day Deposition of Donald Kirk filed by Fidelity Independent Trustees. (Selden, Shannon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: 2/6/2009 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 120 Filed: 11/5/2007, Entered: 11/5/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION re [119] Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, (Declaration of James S. Dittmar in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Enlarge the Period for Discovery for the Limited Purpose of Conducting a Half Day Deposition of Donald Kirk) by Fidelity Management & Research Company, FMR Company, Incorporated. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C)(Dittmar, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: 2/6/2009 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 119 Filed: 11/5/2007, Entered: 11/5/2007 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [107] MOTION for Extension of Time to 11/30/2007 to Complete Discovery for the Limited Purpose of Conducting a Half Day Deposition of Donald Kirk filed by Fidelity Management & Research Company, FMR Company, Incorporated. (Dittmar, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: 2/6/2009 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 118 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: 11/2/2007 Surreply to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUR-REPLY to Motion re [112] MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Surreply to Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion to Compel Discovery and Notice of Withdrawal of Motion Plaintiffs' Surreply to Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion to Compel Discovery (Leave to File Granted Oct. 31, 2007) filed by Nancy Haugen, Karen L. Magnan, Michael F. Magnan, Andrea M Phillips, Presley C Phillips, Cindy Schurgin, Cynthia Bennett, Haugen Plaintiffs, Guy E. Miller. (Chen, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: 2/6/2009 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: 10/31/07 Order on Motion for Leave to File: docket text modified to correct typographical error (Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 163 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: 2/6/2009 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007 Order on Motion to Vacate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Electronic ORDER entered granting [117] Motion to Vacate. (Bowler, Marianne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 162 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: 2/6/2009 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 117 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 10/31/2007, Terminated: 11/1/2007 Motion to Vacate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Assented to MOTION to Vacate Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,, by Fidelity Management & Research Company, FMR Company, Incorporated.(Dittmar, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: 2/6/2009 Motion to Amend
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 10/31/2007 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Electronic ORDER entered granting [105] Motion for Leave to File; granting [107] Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; granting [112] Motion for Leave to File and granting [116] Motion. The status conference is continued until December 3, 2007 at 2:30 p.m. (Bowler, Marianne) Modified on 11/1/2007 to correct a typograhical error in docket text (Boyce, Kathy).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: 1/16/2009 Motion to Modify
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 116 Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: 10/30/2007, Terminated: 10/31/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Continue Status Conference by Fidelity Management & Research Company, FMR Company, Incorporated, Cynthia Bennett, Haugen Plaintiffs.(Dittmar, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 12/30/2008, Entered: 12/30/2008 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: 10/30/2007 Withdrawal of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Withdrawal of motion: [103] MOTION to Seal (Unopposed Motion for Leave of Court to File Confidential Materials Under Seal and Exempt from the ECF System) filed by Fidelity Management & Research Company, FMR Company, Incorporated (Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 12/29/2008, Entered: 12/29/2008 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 115 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION re [112] MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Surreply to Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion to Compel Discovery and Notice of Withdrawal of Motion Declaration of Steve Pomerantz, Ph.D. by Nancy Haugen, Karen L. Magnan, Michael F. Magnan, Andrea M Phillips, Presley C Phillips, Cindy Schurgin, Cynthia Bennett, Haugen Plaintiffs, Guy E. Miller. (Chen, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: 12/12/2008 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 114 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION re [112] MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Surreply to Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion to Compel Discovery and Notice of Withdrawal of Motion Declaration of James D. Lamb by Nancy Haugen, Karen L. Magnan, Michael F. Magnan, Andrea M Phillips, Presley C Phillips, Cindy Schurgin, Cynthia Bennett, Haugen Plaintiffs, Guy E. Miller. (Chen, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: 12/11/2008 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 113 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION re [112] MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Surreply to Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion to Compel Discovery and Notice of Withdrawal of Motion Declaration of David Chen by Nancy Haugen, Karen L. Magnan, Michael F. Magnan, Andrea M Phillips, Presley C Phillips, Cindy Schurgin, Cynthia Bennett, Haugen Plaintiffs, Guy E. Miller. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of David Chen# (2) Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration of David Chen# (3) Exhibit Exhibit C to Declaration of David Chen# (4) Exhibit Exhibit D to Declaration of David Chen)(Chen, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: 12/11/2008 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 112 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007, Terminated: 10/31/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Surreply to Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion to Compel Discovery and Notice of Withdrawal of Motion by Nancy Haugen, Karen L. Magnan, Michael F. Magnan, Andrea M Phillips, Presley C Phillips, Cindy Schurgin, Cynthia Bennett, Haugen Plaintiffs, Guy E. Miller. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Plaintiffs' Surreply to Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion to Compel Discovery)(Chen, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 154 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: 12/11/2008 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 111 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Fidelity Management & Research Company, FMR Company, Incorporated re [103] MOTION to Seal (Unopposed Motion for Leave of Court to File Confidential Materials Under Seal and Exempt from the ECF System) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION (Dittmar, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 153 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: 12/11/2008 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 110 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: 10/22/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION re [108] Memorandum in Support of Motion, [109] Declaration, [107] MOTION for Extension of Time to 11/30/2007 to Complete Discovery for the Limited Purpose of Conducting a Half Day Deposition of Donald Kirk Declaration of Nina H. Fields by Nancy Haugen, Karen L. Magnan, Michael F. Magnan, Andrea M Phillips, Presley C Phillips, Cindy Schurgin, Cynthia Bennett, Guy E. Miller. (Chen, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 12/9/2008, Entered: 12/9/2008 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 109 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: 10/22/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION re [108] Memorandum in Support of Motion, [107] MOTION for Extension of Time to 11/30/2007 to Complete Discovery for the Limited Purpose of Conducting a Half Day Deposition of Donald Kirk Declaration of Laura R. Gerber by Andrea M Phillips, Presley C Phillips, Cindy Schurgin, Guy E. Miller. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1-4# (2) Exhibit 5# (3) Exhibit 6 Part 1# (4) Exhibit 6 Part 2# (5) Exhibit 7# (6) Exhibit 8-10# (7) Exhibit 11-16)(Chen, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 108 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: 10/22/2007 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re [107] MOTION for Extension of Time to 11/30/2007 to Complete Discovery for the Limited Purpose of Conducting a Half Day Deposition of Donald Kirk filed by Nancy Haugen, Karen L. Magnan, Michael F. Magnan, Andrea M Phillips, Presley C Phillips, Cindy Schurgin, Cynthia Bennett, Guy E. Miller. (Chen, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 107 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: 10/22/2007, Terminated: 10/31/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to 11/30/2007 to Complete Discovery for the Limited Purpose of Conducting a Half Day Deposition of Donald Kirk by Nancy Haugen, Karen L. Magnan, Michael F. Magnan, Andrea M Phillips, Presley C Phillips, Cindy Schurgin, Cynthia Bennett, Guy E. Miller.(Chen, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 106 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: 10/17/2007 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Opposition re [99] MOTION for Protective Order To Quash The Deposition Notice Of Edward C. Johnson 3d, Chairman Of FMR. Corp. filed by Cynthia Bennett. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Cook, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 105 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: 10/16/2007, Terminated: 10/31/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File and Defer Filing of Surreply to Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion to Compel Discovery by Nancy Haugen, Karen L. Magnan, Michael F. Magnan, Andrea M Phillips, Presley C Phillips, Cindy Schurgin, Cynthia Bennett, Haugen Plaintiffs, Guy E. Miller.(Chen, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Electronic ORDER entered granting [104] Motion for Extension of Time. (Bowler, Marianne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 104 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: 10/12/2007, Terminated: 10/15/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to October 17, 2007 to File Opposition to Motion for a Protective Order to Quash the Deposition Notice of Edward C. Johnson 3d by Cynthia Bennett.(Cook, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 103 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: 10/11/2007, Terminated: 10/30/2007 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Seal (Unopposed Motion for Leave of Court to File Confidential Materials Under Seal and Exempt from the ECF System) by Fidelity Management & Research Company, FMR Company, Incorporated.(Dittmar, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 102 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007 Affidavit in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT in Support re [101] Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, (Affidavit of James S. Dittmar). (Attachments: # (1) Ex. A# (2) Ex. B# (3) Ex. C# (4) Ex. D)(Dittmar, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 101 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [71] MOTION to Compel Discovery, [95] MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion to Compel Discovery filed by Fidelity Management & Research Company, FMR Company, Incorporated. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Robert Glenn Hubbard, Ph.D.# (2) Affidavit of Russell F. Peppet)(Dittmar, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 100 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re [99] MOTION for Protective Order To Quash The Deposition Notice Of Edward C. Johnson 3d, Chairman Of FMR. Corp. filed by Fidelity Management & Research Company, FMR Company, Incorporated. (Dittmar, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 99 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007, Terminated: 12/5/2007 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Protective Order To Quash The Deposition Notice Of Edward C. Johnson 3d, Chairman Of FMR. Corp. by Fidelity Management & Research Company, FMR Company, Incorporated.(Dittmar, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: 9/18/2007 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: document #97 corrected because: incorrectly linked, Court correctly linked to document #95. (Hassett, Kathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 98 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION re [95] MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion to Compel Discovery Declaration of James D. Lamb by Nancy Haugen, Karen L. Magnan, Michael F. Magnan, Andrea M Phillips, Presley C Phillips, Cindy Schurgin, Cynthia Bennett, Haugen Plaintiffs, Guy E. Miller. (Chen, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 97 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION re [95] MOTION to Compel by Nancy Haugen, Karen L. Magnan, Michael F. Magnan, Andrea M Phillips, Presley C Phillips, Cindy Schurgin, Cynthia Bennett, Haugen Plaintiffs, Guy E. Miller. (Chen, David) Modified on 9/18/2007 (Hassett, Kathy).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 96 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION re [95] MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion to Compel Discovery Declaration of Laura R. Gerber by Nancy Haugen, Karen L. Magnan, Michael F. Magnan, Andrea M Phillips, Presley C Phillips, Cindy Schurgin, Cynthia Bennett, Haugen Plaintiffs, Guy E. Miller. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Laura R. Gerber# (2) Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Laura R. Gerber# (3) Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Laura R. Gerber# (4) Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Laura R. Gerber# (5) Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Laura R. Gerber)(Chen, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 95 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007, Terminated: 12/5/2007 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion to Compel Discovery by Nancy Haugen, Karen L. Magnan, Michael F. Magnan, Andrea M Phillips, Presley C Phillips, Cindy Schurgin, Cynthia Bennett, Haugen Plaintiffs, Guy E. Miller.(Chen, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 94 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Nina H. Fields of Guy M. Burns, Becky Ferrell-Anton, Jonathan S. Coleman and the law firm of Johnson Pope Bokor Ruppel & Burns, LLP (Fields, Nina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 93 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Nina H. Fields , Michael J. Brickman, James C. Bradley and the law firm of Richardson Patrick Westbrook & Brickman, LLC (Fields, Nina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: 9/11/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Electronic ORDER entered granting [91] Motion for Extension of Time. The status conference is continued until November 2, 2007 at 2:30 p.m. (Bowler, Marianne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 92 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter/request (non-motion) from James S. Dittmar to the Honorable Marianne B. Bowler regarding Joint Motion for Limited Extension of Discovery Cutoff (related document(s)[91]). (Dittmar, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 91 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007, Terminated: 9/11/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to October 31, 2007 to Complete Fact Discovery by Fidelity Management & Research Company, FMR Company, Incorporated.(Dittmar, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on July 18, 2007 before Judge Bowler. Digital Recording: Tanscribed by Maryann Young. The original transcripts are maintained by the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting Maryann Young at 508/384-2003 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/16/2007, Entered: 8/16/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on June 6, 2007 before Judge Bowler. Digital Recording: Transcribed by Maryann Young. The original transcripts are maintained by the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting Maryann Young at 508/384-2003 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 88 Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: 7/26/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by David Y. Chen on behalf of Nancy Haugen, Karen L. Magnan, Michael F. Magnan, Andrea M Phillips, Presley C Phillips, Cindy Schurgin, Haugen Plaintiffs (Chen, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: 7/20/2007 Order on Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Electronic ORDER entered denying [71] Motion to Compel, after hearing, to the extent and for the reasons set forth on the record in open court. (Bowler, Marianne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: 7/18/2007 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Motion Hearing held on 7/18/2007 as to [71] MOTION to Compel. Rulings made as stated on the record in open court. Further Status Conference set for 9/11/2007 at 2:00 PM. (Duffy, Marc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: 7/18/2007 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Electronic ORDER entered granting [79] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting [83] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages and granting [86] Motion for Leave to File. (Bowler, Marianne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 87 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: 7/17/2007 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re [71] MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Nancy Haugen, Karen L. Magnan, Michael F. Magnan, Andrea M Phillips, Presley C Phillips, Cindy Schurgin, Cynthia Bennett, Guy E. Miller. (Gerber, Laura)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 86 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: 7/17/2007, Terminated: 7/18/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery by Nancy Haugen, Karen L. Magnan, Michael F. Magnan, Andrea M Phillips, Presley C Phillips, Cindy Schurgin, Cynthia Bennett, Guy E. Miller.(Gerber, Laura)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: 7/16/2007 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: Hearing on [71] MOTION to Compel set for 7/18/2007 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Duffy, Marc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: 7/13/2007 Filing Fee/Payment Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filing fee: $ 50.00, receipt number 81134 for [79] MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David Y. Chen (Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 85 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: 7/9/2007 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of James S. Dittmar in Opposition re [71] MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Fidelity Management & Research Company, FMR Company, Incorporated. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Dittmar, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 84 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: 7/9/2007 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [71] MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Fidelity Management & Research Company, FMR Company, Incorporated. (Dittmar, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 83 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: 7/9/2007, Terminated: 7/18/2007 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Unopposed Motion To Enlarge By Five (5) Pages The Page Limit For Defendants' Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion To Compel Discovery) by Fidelity Management & Research Company, FMR Company, Incorporated.(Apfel, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 82 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: 7/9/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fidelity Independent Trustees. (McQuay, Sandra)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 81 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: 7/9/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Sandra Sue McQuay by Fidelity Independent Trustees. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4) # (5))(McQuay, Sandra)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 80 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: 7/9/2007 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [71] MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Fidelity Independent Trustees. (McQuay, Sandra)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 79 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: 7/9/2007, Terminated: 7/18/2007 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David Y. Chen by Nancy Haugen, Karen L. Magnan, Michael F. Magnan, Andrea M Phillips, Cindy Schurgin, Cynthia Bennett, Guy E. Miller. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Blauner, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: 7/9/2007 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Electronic ORDER entered granting [74] Motion and granting [78] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Bowler, Marianne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 78 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: 7/6/2007, Terminated: 7/9/2007 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of John S. Kiernan and Shannon Rose Selden Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 1583901. by Fidelity Management & Research Company, FMR Company, Incorporated. (Attachments: # (1) Ex. A# (2) Ex. B)(Dittmar, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 77 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: 7/6/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Heaton Concannon on behalf of Fidelity Management & Research Company, FMR Company, Incorporated (Concannon, Sarah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 76 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: 7/6/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Apfel on behalf of Fidelity Management & Research Company, FMR Company, Incorporated (Apfel, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 75 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: 7/5/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua N. Cook on behalf of Cynthia Bennett, Guy E. Miller (Cook, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 74 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: 7/5/2007, Terminated: 7/9/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Assented to MOTION to Enlarge Time by Two Business Days to Reply to Pending Motion to Compel Discovery by Fidelity Management & Research Company, FMR Company, Incorporated.(Dittmar, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 73 Filed: 6/21/2007, Entered: 6/21/2007 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Matthew J. Tuttle in Support re [71] MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Nancy Haugen, Karen L. Magnan, Michael F. Magnan, Andrea M Phillips, Presley C Phillips, Cindy Schurgin, Cynthia Bennett, Haugen Plaintiffs, Guy E. Miller. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1-5# (2) Exhibit 6# (3) Exhibit 7 part 1# (4) Exhibit 7 part 2# (5) Exhibit 8# (6) Exhibit 9 part 1# (7) Errata 9 part 2# (8) Errata 10-12# (9) Exhibit 13-14# (10) Exhibit 15 part 1# (11) Exhibit 15 part 2# (12) Exhibit 16-20)(Tuttle, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 72 Filed: 6/21/2007, Entered: 6/21/2007 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re [71] MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Nancy Haugen, Karen L. Magnan, Michael F. Magnan, Andrea M Phillips, Presley C Phillips, Cindy Schurgin, Cynthia Bennett, Guy E. Miller. (Tuttle, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 71 Filed: 6/21/2007, Entered: 6/21/2007, Terminated: 7/20/2007 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Compel Discovery by Nancy Haugen, Karen L. Magnan, Michael F. Magnan, Andrea M Phillips, Presley C Phillips, Cindy Schurgin, Cynthia Bennett, Guy E. Miller.(Tuttle, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: 6/6/2007 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Status Conference held on 6/6/2007. Further Status Conference set for 7/18/2007 at 2:30 PM. (Duffy, Marc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 70 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Dana Foster , Scott J. Link, Richard J. Brener, Thomas R. Grady and the firms of Ackerman, Link & Sartory, and Thomas R. Grady, P.A. (Foster, Dana)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: 3/20/2007 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Electronic ORDER entered granting [69] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Bowler, Marianne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 69 Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: 3/19/2007, Terminated: 3/20/2007 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Mia C. Korot Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1450671. by Fidelity Management & Research Company, FMR Company, Incorporated. (Attachments: # (1) Ex. A (Certificate of Mia C. Korot))(Glass, Stuart)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: 3/5/2007 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Status Conference held on 3/5/2007. Further Status Conference set for 6/6/2007 at 2:30 PM. (Duffy, Marc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: 3/2/2007 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Electronic ORDER entered granting [68] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Bowler, Marianne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 68 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: 2/26/2007, Terminated: 3/2/2007 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Robert J. Liubicic Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1422866. by Fidelity Management & Research Company, FMR Company, Incorporated. (Attachments: # (1) Ex. A (Certificate of Robert J. Liubicic))(Glass, Stuart)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/17/2007, Entered: 1/17/2007 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Electronic ORDER entered granting [65] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice and granting [66] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Bowler, Marianne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 67 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: 1/16/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Conference held on September 19, 2006 before Judge Bowler. Digital Recording: Transcribed by Maryann Young. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting Maryann Young at 508/384-2003 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 66 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: 1/16/2007, Terminated: 1/17/2007 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Richard J. Brener by Cynthia Bennett. (Attachments: # (1) Certification)(Davis, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 65 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: 1/16/2007, Terminated: 1/17/2007 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Scott J. Link by Cynthia Bennett. (Attachments: # (1) Certification)(Davis, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: 1/18/2007 Filing Fee/Payment Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filing fee: $ 50.00, receipt number 77644 re Document No. 66 (Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: 1/18/2007 Filing Fee/Payment Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filing fee: $50.00, receipt number 77643 re Document No. 66 (Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 64 Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: 1/11/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on October 30, 2006 before Judge Bowler. Digital Recording: Transcribed by Maryann Young. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting Maryann Young at 508/384-2003 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 63 Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: 1/5/2007 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Theodore M. Hess-Mahan (Hess-Mahan, Theodore)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/4/2007, Entered: 1/4/2007 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Status Conference held on 1/4/2007. Attorney Blauner for the Pltfs. and Attorney Dittmar for the Defts. Further Status Conference set for 3/5/2007 at 2:30 PM. (Duffy, Marc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: 12/18/2006 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Electronic ORDER entered granting [62] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Bowler, Marianne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: 2/6/2007 Filing Fee/Payment Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filing fee: $ 50.00, receipt number 76843 re Document No. 62, Assented To Motion for Admission Pro hac Vice (Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 62 Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: 12/8/2006, Terminated: 12/18/2006 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Dana E. Foster by Cynthia Bennett. (Attachments: # (1) Certification)(Davis, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 10/30/2006 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Status Conference held on 10/30/2006. Attorney Blauner for the Pltfs. and Attorney Dittmar for the Defts. Further Status Conference set for 1/4/2007 at 2:30 PM. (Duffy, Marc) Modified on 10/30/2006 to correct a date. (Duffy, Marc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 61 Filed: 10/20/2006, Entered: 10/20/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Brickman on behalf of all plaintiffs (Brickman, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 60 Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: 10/18/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by James C. Bradley on behalf of all plaintiffs (Bradley, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 59 Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: 10/18/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Nina H. Fields on behalf of all plaintiffs (Fields, Nina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 58 Filed: 9/19/2006, Entered: 9/19/2006 Report of Rule 26.f Planning Meeting
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3)(Blauner, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 9/19/2006, Entered: 9/19/2006 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Status Conference held on 9/19/2006. Discovery schedule as stated on the record in open court. Further Status Conference set for 10/30/2006 at 2:30 PM. (Duffy, Marc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 57 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: 8/18/2006 Notice of Change of Address or Firm Name
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change of Address by Matthew J. Tuttle and Change of Firm Name (Tuttle, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 56 Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: 8/4/2006, Terminated: 8/4/2006 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Continue Status Conference to September 19, 2006 by all parties.(Dittmar, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: 8/4/2006 Order on Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Electronic ORDER entered granting [56] Motion to Continue Status Conference until September 19, 2006 at 2:30 p.m. No additional notice will be sent to counsel. (Bowler, Marianne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 55 Filed: 8/3/2006, Entered: 8/3/2006 Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Marianne B. Bowler: PROTECTIVE ORDER entered. (Duffy, Marc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 54 Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: 8/2/2006 Proposed Document(s) submitted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Document(s) submitted by Nancy Haugen, Karen L. Magnan, Michael F. Magnan, Andrea M Phillips, Presley C Phillips, Cindy Schurgin, Cynthia Bennett, Guy E. Miller. Document received: Protective Order. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Tuttle, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/27/2006, Entered: 7/27/2006 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 8/7/2006 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Duffy, Marc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 53 Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: 7/25/2006 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Mark L. Wolf : ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler Referred for: Full Pretrial including dispositive motions(O'Leary, Dennis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 52 Filed: 6/13/2006, Entered: 6/13/2006 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION And [Proposed] Protective Order by Fidelity Management & Research Company, FMR Company, Incorporated, Nancy Haugen, Karen L. Magnan, Michael F. Magnan, Andrea M Phillips, Presley C Phillips, Cindy Schurgin, Cynthia Bennett, Guy E. Miller, William S. Stavropoulos, Gerald C. McDonough, William O. McCoy, Marvin L. Mann, Ned C. Lautenbach, Marie L. Knowles, Donald J. Kirk, George H. Heilmeier, Robert M. Gates, Ralph F. Cox, J. Michael Cook, James Gilliam, and others. (Glass, Stuart)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/13/2006, Entered: 3/13/2006 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Electronic ORDER entered granting [51] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Bowler, Marianne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/10/2006, Entered: 3/10/2006 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Document No. 50, Motion to Admit Counsel Pro hac Vice terminated as moot as a Correction Version of the Assented To Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Havc Vice was e-filed, Document No. 51 (Boyce, Kathy) Modified on 3/17/2006 to correct the text (Boyce, Kathy).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/10/2006, Entered: 3/10/2006 Terminate Motions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion terminated: [50] Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Laura Gerber filed by Cynthia Bennett,, Guy E. Miller,, Nancy Haugen,, Michael F. Magnan,, Karen L. Magnan,, Presley C Phillips,, Andrea M Phillips,, Cindy Schurgin (Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/9/2006, Entered: 3/10/2006 Filing Fee/Payment Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filing fee: $50.00, receipt number 70956 regarding Document No. 51, Assented to Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice (Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 51 Filed: 3/8/2006, Entered: 3/8/2006, Terminated: 3/13/2006 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Laura Gerber (Corrected Motion) by Nancy Haugen, Karen L. Magnan, Michael F. Magnan, Andrea M Phillips, Presley C Phillips, Cindy Schurgin, Cynthia Bennett, Guy E. Miller. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Certificate of Good Standing of Laura Gerber))(Blauner, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 50 Filed: 3/7/2006, Entered: 3/7/2006, Terminated: 3/10/2006 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Laura Gerber by Nancy Haugen, Karen L. Magnan, Michael F. Magnan, Andrea M Phillips, Presley C Phillips, Cindy Schurgin, Cynthia Bennett, Guy E. Miller. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Certificate of Good Standing of Laura Gerber))(Blauner, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/7/2006, Entered: 3/7/2006 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Electronic ORDER entered granting [49] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Bowler, Marianne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/2/2006, Entered: 3/6/2006 Filing Fee/Payment Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filing fee: $50.00, receipt number 70720 regarding Assented-To Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David S. Cohen (Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 49 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: 2/28/2006, Terminated: 3/7/2006 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David S. Cohen by Fidelity Management & Research Company, FMR Company, Incorporated. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Certificate of David S. Cohen))(Glass, Stuart)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 48 Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: 12/19/2005 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendants' ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Fidelity Management & Research Company, FMR Company, Incorporated.(Dittmar, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 47 Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: 12/19/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart M. Glass on behalf of Fidelity Management & Research Company, FMR Company, Incorporated (Glass, Stuart)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 46 Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: 11/3/2005 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT Consolidated Complaint Under Investment Company Act 0f 1940 against Fidelity Management & Research Company, FMR Company, Incorporated, filed by Nancy Haugen, Karen L. Magnan, Michael F. Magnan, Andrea M Phillips, Presley C Phillips, Cindy Schurgin, Cynthia Bennett, Guy E. Miller. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3 (Part 1)# (4) Exhibit 3 part 2# (5) Exhibit 3 (part 3)# (6) Exhibit 3 (part 4)# (7) Exhibit 3 (part 5)# (8) Exhibit 4)(Blauner, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 45 Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: 11/3/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle H. Blauner on behalf of Nancy Haugen, Karen L. Magnan, Michael F. Magnan, Andrea M Phillips, Presley C Phillips, Cindy Schurgin (Blauner, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 44 Filed: 10/28/2005, Entered: 11/1/2005 Order consolidating casesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ORDER consolidating cases.(Filo, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/28/2005, Entered: 10/28/2005 Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Electronic ORDER entered granting [41] Motion to Consolidate Cases, there being no opposition. (Bowler, Marianne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 43 Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: 10/27/2005 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Mark L. Wolf : ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler Referred for: Event only. Motion to Consolidate (docket no. 41).(O'Leary, Dennis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 42 Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: 10/7/2005 Proposed Document(s) submitted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Document(s) submitted by Cynthia Bennett. Document received: Proposed Order for Consolidation. (Davis, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 41 Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: 10/7/2005, Terminated: 10/28/2005 Motion to Consolidate Cases
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Cynthia Bennett.(Davis, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: 8/22/2005 Order on Motion to Intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Mark L. Wolf : Electronic ORDER entered finding as moot [23] Motion to Intervene (O'Leary, Dennis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/3/2005, Entered: 5/3/2005 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Electronic ORDER entered granting [26] Motion for Leave to File; granting [27] Motion for Leave to File; denying [30] Motion to Strike; granting [31] Motion to Strike; granting [32] Motion for Leave to File; denying [34] Motion to Strike; denying [35] Motion to Strike; granting [37] Motion for Leave to File; granting [8] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [11] Motion for Extension of Time and granting [19] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Bowler, Marianne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/10/2005, Entered: 3/11/2005 Hearing (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Electronic clerk's notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Motion hearing held on 3/10/2005; Motion Hearing was held on the motions filed in CA 04-11600-NG; Motion to Consolidate Cases filed by James Gilliam, and others, Motion for Appointment of Tri-Lead COunsel and Appointment of Liaison Counsel filed by James Gilliam, and others, and Motion to Consolidate Cases And Severance Of Claims, Memorandum, And Request For Oral Argument filed by Fidelity Distributors Corporation,, Fidelity Management & Research Company,, FMR Corporation,, FMR Company, Incorporated,, Edward C. Johnson, III, Abigail P. Johnson,, Edward C. Johnson, IV, Elizabeth L. Johnson,, Peter S. Lynch,, Laura B. Cronin,, Robert L. Reynolds,, Robert C. Pozen,and J. Gary Burkhead; The court hears the argument on the motions as well as 04-11642, 04-11709, 04-11735, 04-11756 and 04-11812 and argument on the related motions; The court takes docket entries [2], [6] and [70] for CA 04-11600-NG under advisement and will make rulings on the related motions accordingly.(Court Reporter James Gibbons.) (Saccoccio, Dianalynn
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/25/2005, Entered: 2/25/2005 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Document No. 37 modified as it was inadvertently e-filed again after the e-filing of Document No. 36 (Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/25/2005, Entered: 2/25/2005 Terminate Motions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motions terminated as moot [36] MOTION for Leave to File to File Supplemental Authority filed by Haugen Plaintiffs, as a response was filed as to Document No. 37, the duplicate of this Motion (Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/23/2005, Entered: 2/23/2005 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Hearing; [15] NOTICE by Cynthia Bennett, Guy E. Miller of Pending Motions in Related Cases: Plaintiffs' Motion for Appointment of Tri-Lead Counsel and Appointment of Liaison Counsel and Motion for Consolidation, [31] MOTION to Strike The Fidelity Defendants' Motion for Consolidation and Severance of Claims, [32] MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Motion for Consolidation, [34] MOTION to Strike [32] MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Motion for Consolidation (filed by the Bennett Plaintiffs), [35] MOTION to Strike the Independent Trustee Defendants' Submission in Support of Fidelity Defendants' Motion for Consolidation and Severance of Claims, [36] MOTION for Leave to File to File Supplemental Authority, [37] MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority, [26] MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Tri-Lead Counsel and Liaison Counsel and Plaintiffs' Motion for Consolidation, [27] MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Motions for Consolidation and Appointment of Tri-Lead and Liason Counsel and [30] MOTION to Strike The Haugen Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply and the Haugen Plaintiffs' [Proposed] Sur-Reply in Opposition to Motions for Consolidation and Appointment of Tri-Lead and Liaison Counsel; Motion hearing set for 3/10/2005 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 17 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Saccoccio, Dianalynn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 40 Filed: 2/17/2005, Entered: 2/17/2005 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Mark L. Wolf : ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler Referred for: Motion to Consolidate(O'Leary, Dennis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 39 Filed: 1/24/2005, Entered: 1/24/2005 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Opposition re [34] MOTION to Strike [32] MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Motion for Consolidation (filed by the Bennett Plaintiffs) filed by Cynthia Bennett. (Davis, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 38 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: 1/21/2005 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposition re [37] MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority of The Haugen Plaintiffs filed by Gilliam Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Opinion attached)(Gans, Nancy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 37 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/18/2005, Terminated: 5/3/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority by Haugen Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2 (Part 1)# (3) Exhibit 2 (Part 2)# (4) Exhibit 3)(Blauner, Michelle) Modified on 2/25/2005 for the docket to reflect that this entry is a duplicate of Document No. 36 (Boyce, Kathy).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 36 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/18/2005, Terminated: 2/25/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File to File Supplemental Authority by Haugen Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2 (Part 1)# (3) Exhibit 2 (Part 2)# (4) Exhibit 3)(Blauner, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 35 Filed: 1/13/2005, Entered: 1/13/2005, Terminated: 5/3/2005 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Strike the Independent Trustee Defendants' Submission in Support of Fidelity Defendants' Motion for Consolidation and Severance of Claims by Gilliam Plaintiffs.(Gans, Nancy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 34 Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: 1/10/2005, Terminated: 5/3/2005 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Strike [32] MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Motion for Consolidation (filed by the Bennett Plaintiffs) by Gilliam Plaintiffs.(Gans, Nancy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 33 Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: 1/5/2005 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposition re [30] MOTION to Strike The Haugen Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply and the Haugen Plaintiffs' [Proposed] Sur-Reply in Opposition to Motions for Consolidation and Appointment of Tri-Lead and Liaison Counsel filed by Haugen Plaintiffs. (Blauner, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 32 Filed: 12/27/2004, Entered: 12/27/2004, Terminated: 5/3/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Motion for Consolidation by Cynthia Bennett. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Proposed Surreply)(Tuttle, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 31 Filed: 12/23/2004, Entered: 12/23/2004, Terminated: 5/3/2005 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Strike The Fidelity Defendants' Motion for Consolidation and Severance of Claims by Gilliam Plaintiffs.(Gans, Nancy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 30 Filed: 12/23/2004, Entered: 12/23/2004, Terminated: 5/3/2005 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Strike The Haugen Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply and the Haugen Plaintiffs' [Proposed] Sur-Reply in Opposition to Motions for Consolidation and Appointment of Tri-Lead and Liaison Counsel by Gilliam Plaintiffs.(Gans, Nancy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 29 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: 12/22/2004 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposition re [23] MOTION to Intervene and to Stay All Proceedings filed by Cynthia Bennett. (Davis, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 28 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: 12/22/2004 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposition re [23] MOTION to Intervene and to Stay All Proceedings filed by Haugen Plaintiffs. (Blauner, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 27 Filed: 12/20/2004, Entered: 12/20/2004, Terminated: 5/3/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Motions for Consolidation and Appointment of Tri-Lead and Liason Counsel by Haugen Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Sur-Reply# (2) Exhibit 1 to Proposed Sur-Reply)(Blauner, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 26 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: 12/15/2004, Terminated: 5/3/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Tri-Lead Counsel and Liaison Counsel and Plaintiffs' Motion for Consolidation by Gilliam Plaintiffs.(Gans, Nancy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 25 Filed: 12/8/2004, Entered: 12/8/2004 Proposed Document(s) submitted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Document(s) submitted by Gilliam Plaintiffs. Document received: [Proposed] Order Granting Intervention and Staying All Proceedings. (Gans, Nancy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 24 Filed: 12/8/2004, Entered: 12/8/2004 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re [23] MOTION to Intervene and to Stay All Proceedings filed by Gilliam Plaintiffs. (Gans, Nancy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 23 Filed: 12/8/2004, Entered: 12/8/2004, Terminated: 8/22/2005 Motion to Intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Intervene and to Stay All Proceedings by Gilliam Plaintiffs.(Gans, Nancy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 22 Filed: 12/2/2004, Entered: 12/2/2004 Memorandum of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW by James Gilliam, and others to [15] Notice (Other). (Gans, Nancy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 21 Filed: 11/30/2004, Entered: 11/30/2004 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter/request (non-motion) from Sandra Sue McQuay. (McQuay, Sandra)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 20 Filed: 11/30/2004, Entered: 11/30/2004 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Response by William S. Stavropoulos, Gerald C. McDonough, William O. McCoy, Marvin L. Mann, Ned C. Lautenbach, Marie L. Knowles, Donald J. Kirk, George H. Heilmeier, Robert M. Gates, Ralph F. Cox, J. Michael Cook to Notice of Pending Motions in Related Cases. (McQuay, Sandra)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 19 Filed: 11/29/2004, Entered: 11/29/2004, Terminated: 5/3/2005 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by James N. Benedict, Thomas A. Arena, Sean M. Murphy, C. Neil Gray, and L. Anthony Pellegrino by FMR Company, Incorporated, Fidelity Management & Research Company. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibits A-E, Certificates of James N. Benedict, Thomas A. Arena, Sean M. Murphy, C. Neil Gray, and L. Anthony Pellegrino)(Dittmar, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 18 Filed: 11/29/2004, Entered: 11/29/2004 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter/request (non-motion) from Michelle H. Blauner Re: NOTICE by James Gilliam, and others of Pending Motions in Related Cases: Plaintiffs' Motion for Appointment of Tri-Lead Counsel and Appointment of Liaison Counsel and Motion for Consolidation. (Blauner, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 17 Filed: 11/23/2004, Entered: 11/23/2004 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter/request (non-motion) from Matthew J. Tuttle (counsel for the Plaintiffs). (Attachments: # (1) Attachment - Bennett Plaintiffs' Response to Notice of Pending Motions)(Davis, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 16 Filed: 11/19/2004, Entered: 11/19/2004 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter/request (non-motion) from James S. Dittmar. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment - Response To Notice Of Pending Motions)(Dittmar, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 15 Filed: 11/17/2004, Entered: 11/17/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Cynthia Bennett, Guy E. Miller of Pending Motions in Related Cases: Plaintiffs' Motion for Appointment of Tri-Lead Counsel and Appointment of Liaison Counsel and Motion for Consolidation (Gans, Nancy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: 10/29/2004 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Mark L. Wolf : Electronic ORDER entered granting [10] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Thomas R Grady for Cynthia Bennett and Guy E. Miller (O'Leary, Dennis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 14 Filed: 10/15/2004, Entered: 10/15/2004 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter/request (non-motion) from Christopher D. Moore. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment - Fidelity Defendants' Memorandum In Opposition To The Gilliam Plaintiffs' Motion For Consolidation Of Related Cases)(Moore, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 10/7/2004, Entered: 10/7/2004 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by FMR Company, Incorporated, Fidelity Management & Research Company.(Dittmar, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 12 Filed: 10/7/2004, Entered: 10/7/2004 Memorandum of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Haugen Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Blauner, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 11 Filed: 10/6/2004, Entered: 10/6/2004, Terminated: 5/3/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to October 7, 2004 to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion For Consolidation of Related Cases and Plaintiffs' Motion For Appointment of Tri-Lead Counsel and Appointment of Liasion Counsel by FMR Company, Incorporated, Fidelity Management & Research Company.(Moore, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 9/28/2004, Entered: 10/7/2004 Filing Fee/Payment Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filing fee: $ 50.00, receipt number 58947 regarding Pro Hac Vice Fee re Document No. 10 (Boyce, Kathy) Modified on 10/7/2004 to correct the filing date previoulsy entered (Boyce, Kathy).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 10 Filed: 9/23/2004, Entered: 9/23/2004, Terminated: 10/29/2004 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas R. Grady Filing fee $ 50.00, receipt number check. by Cynthia Bennett, Guy E. Miller. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of Thomas R. Grandy In Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Tuttle, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 9/20/2004, Entered: 9/20/2004 Add and Terminate Judges
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Mark L. Wolf added. Judge Richard G. Stearns no longer assigned to case. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 9 Filed: 9/15/2004, Entered: 9/20/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re [5] MOTION to consolidate Case (in the form of a letter) filed by Cynthia Bennett, Guy E. Miller. (Flaherty, Elaine) Modified on 9/20/2004 (Flaherty, Elaine).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 9/15/2004, Entered: 9/15/2004, Terminated: 5/3/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to 10/7/2004 to To Respond to Motions to Consolidate and for Appointment of Lead Counsel by Haugen Plaintiffs.(Blauner, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/3/2004, Entered: 9/8/2004 Order on Motion to Reassign Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Richard G. Stearns : Electronic ORDER entered granting [5] Motion to Reassign Case(ca 04-11756-MLW). (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 6 Filed: 8/27/2004, Entered: 9/1/2004 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FMR Company, Incorporated, Fidelity Management & Research Company. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/27/2004, Entered: 9/1/2004 Motion to Reassign Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Reassign Case (ca 04-11756-MLW) by FMR Company, Incorporated, Fidelity Management & Research Company.(Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/26/2004, Entered: 9/1/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by James S. Dittmar on behalf of FMR Company, Incorporated, Fidelity Management & Research Company (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/23/2004, Entered: 8/24/2004 Electronic Endorsement (non-order)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Richard G. Stearns : ORDER entered ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT re [2] Stipulation filed by Fidelity Management & Research Company, FMR Company, Incorporated "so ordered."(Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/17/2004, Entered: 8/24/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed Fidelity Management & Research Company served on 8/2/2004, answer due 8/23/2004. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/17/2004, Entered: 8/24/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed FMR Company, Incorporated served on 8/2/2004, answer due 8/23/2004. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/16/2004, Entered: 8/16/2004 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION re [1] Complaint, Summons Issued by FMR Company, Incorporated, Fidelity Management & Research Company. (Moore, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/23/2004, Entered: 8/2/2004 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT Filing fee: $ 150, receipt number 57529, filed by Cynthia Bennett, Guy E. Miller. (Attachments: # (1))(Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/23/2004, Entered: 8/2/2004 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Cohen. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/23/2004, Entered: 8/2/2004 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Summons Issued as to FMR Company, Incorporated, Fidelity Management & Research Company. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 250 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?