United States v. Izzo Group, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-11689-GAO

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 3:02 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas L. Sansonetti +1 202 514 2738

Toggle Switch Represented by Alumit Ip

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Alumit msullivan@mikesullivanlaw.com

Represented by United States Department of Justice

v.
No Logo Izzo Group, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Pasco Izzo, Sr., Defendant
Office Boston
Filed 7/30/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 893 - Environmental Matters
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 9607 Real Property Tort to Land
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Judgment on Consent
County Barnstable
Terminated 12/6/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 12/6/2004, Entered: 12/6/2004 Terminated Case
Civil Case Terminated. (Lyness, Paul)
    LREF
    Legal Document 5 Filed: 11/30/2004, Entered: 11/30/2004 Consent JudgmentCourt Filing
    Judge George A. O'Toole Jr.: ORDER entered CONSENT JUDGMENT(O'Toole, George)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 11/22/2004, Entered: 11/22/2004 Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment
      Judge George A. O'Toole Jr.: Electronic ORDER entered granting [4] Motion to Approve Consent Judgment (Lyness, Paul)
        LREF
        Legal Document 4 Filed: 9/28/2004, Entered: 9/28/2004, Terminated: 11/22/2004 Motion to Approve Consent Judgment
        MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by United States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support of Unopposed Motion# (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Boer, J.)
        LREF
        Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/30/2004, Entered: 8/2/2004 Exhibit
        Consent Decree re [2] Notice of Lodging by United States of America. (Barrette, Mark)
          LREF
          Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/30/2004, Entered: 8/2/2004 ~Notice (other)
          NOTICE of Lodging by United States of America re [1] Complaint (Barrette, Mark)
            LREF
            Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/30/2004, Entered: 8/2/2004 Complaint
            COMPLAINT Filing fee: , filed by United States of America.(Barrette, Mark)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 7/30/2004, Entered: 8/2/2004 Summons Issued
              Summons Issued as to Pasco Izzo Sr., Izzo Group, Inc.. (Barrette, Mark)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 7/30/2004, Entered: 8/2/2004 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Bowler. (Barrette, Mark)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 41 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?