Smartflash LLC et al v. Amazon.Com, Inc., et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:14-cv-00992

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 27, 2018 at 3:41 PM ST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Smartflash LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Caldwell Cassady Curry

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bradley Wayne Caldwell +1 214 593 7129 bcaldwell@caldwellcc.com
Space Jason Dodd Cassady +1 214 810 4705 +1 214 481 1757 jcassady@cassadycurry.com
Space J Austin Curry +1 214 888 4848 +1 214 888 4849 acurry@caldwellcc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Claire Abernathy Henry +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 claire@wsfirm.com
Space Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
Space Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@jwfirm.com
No Logo Smartflash Technologies Ltd., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Smartflash Technologies Limited"
v.
Amazon Web Services, Inc. Amazon Web Services, Inc., Defendant
Amazon.com, Inc. Amazon.com, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Drugstore.com, Inc.
Officer/Director, Audible, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. David Hadden +1 650 988 8500 +1 650 938 5200 dhadden@fenwick.com
Space Saina Sason Shamilov +1 650 988 8500 +1 650 938 5200 sshamilov@fenwick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 allengardner@potterminton.com
Space Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com
Amazon.com LLC Amazon.com LLC, Defendant
No Logo AMZN Mobile, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Audible, Inc., Defendant
  Entries (47) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None Order Staying Case
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None Brief
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None
                    BRIEF filed In Support of Stay of Litigation Pending Review of the Asserted Patents By The Patent Trial and Appeal Board re Court's May 4, 2015 Order [Dkt. 36] by AMZN Mobile, LLC, Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc.,, Amazon.com, LLC, Audible, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Shamilov, Saina) Modified on 5/7/2015 (gsg). (Entered: 05/06/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None Order
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None Return of Service Executed
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None Return of Service Executed
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None Return of Service Executed
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None Return of Service Executed
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None Return of Service Executed
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                SUMMONS Issued as to AMZN Mobile, LLC, Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc.,, Amazon.com, LLC, Audible, Inc., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/08/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: None Jury Demand
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                Space Space

                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                This case has been viewed 67 times.

                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                 
                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                Need Password Help?