Rasetta et al v. C&B; Construction Management Trust, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-11716-RWZ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Bruce Wood, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert O. Berger, III +1 617 423 7575 +1 617 275 8000 rberger.esq@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo David Fatini, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert O. Berger, III +1 617 423 7575 +1 617 275 8000 rberger.esq@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo George Jr. Davagian, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert O. Berger, III +1 617 423 7575 +1 617 275 8000 rberger.esq@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo International Union Of Operating Engineers Local 4 Pension Fund,, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert O. Berger, III +1 617 423 7575 +1 617 275 8000 rberger.esq@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo John N. Panaro, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert O. Berger, III +1 617 423 7575 +1 617 275 8000 rberger.esq@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo John Shaugnessy, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert O. Berger, III +1 617 423 7575 +1 617 275 8000 rberger.esq@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Louis Rasetta, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert O. Berger, III +1 617 423 7575 +1 617 275 8000 rberger.esq@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo M. John DeMatteo, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert O. Berger, III +1 617 423 7575 +1 617 275 8000 rberger.esq@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Peter White, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert O. Berger, III +1 617 423 7575 +1 617 275 8000 rberger.esq@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Rodney Gillespie, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert O. Berger, III +1 617 423 7575 +1 617 275 8000 rberger.esq@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Trustees International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert O. Berger, III +1 617 423 7575 +1 617 275 8000 rberger.esq@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo William Ryan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert O. Berger, III +1 617 423 7575 +1 617 275 8000 rberger.esq@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
v.
No Logo BRUCE ROSS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Newman & Newman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marshall F. Newman +1 617 227 3361 +1 617 723 1710 mfn@newmanlegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
No Logo C&B Construction Management Trust, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Newman & Newman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marshall F. Newman +1 617 227 3361 +1 617 723 1710 mfn@newmanlegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
No Logo C&B Construction Management Trust, Inc., Third Party Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
No Logo Centennial Insurance Company, Third Party Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cetrulo & Capone LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas H. Hayman +1 617 217 5500 +1 617 217 5200 thayman@cetcap.com
Office Boston
Filed 8/4/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $56000
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Essex
Terminated 10/21/2005
Origin 4
Reopened 9/6/2005
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 23 Filed: 10/21/2005, Entered: 10/21/2005 Judgment*Court Filing
Judge Rya W. Zobel : Order ORDER entered. JUDGMENT entered against C&B Construction Management Trust, Inc.(Urso, Lisa)
    LREF
    Legal Document 22 Filed: 10/5/2005, Entered: 10/5/2005 Proposed Document(s) submitted
    Proposed Document(s) submitted by M. John DeMatteo, John Shaugnessy, Jr, International Union Of Operating Engineers Local 4 Pension Fund,, John N. Panaro, Peter White, Bruce Wood, Rodney Gillespie, C&B Construction Management Trust, Inc., Bruce Ross, Trustees International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare Fund, Louis Rasetta, Jr, C&B Construction Management Trust, Inc., David Fatini, William Ryan, George Jr. Davagian. Document received: Order and Final Judgment. (Sills, Anne)
      LREF
      Legal Document 21 Filed: 10/5/2005, Entered: 10/5/2005 Agreement for Judgment
      AGREEMENT FOR JUDGMENT by M. John DeMatteo, John Shaugnessy, Jr, International Union Of Operating Engineers Local 4 Pension Fund,, John N. Panaro, Peter White, Bruce Wood, Rodney Gillespie, C&B Construction Management Trust, Inc., Bruce Ross, Trustees International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare Fund, Louis Rasetta, Jr, C&B Construction Management Trust, Inc., David Fatini, William Ryan, George Jr. Davagian. (Sills, Anne)
        LREF
        Legal Document 20 Filed: 10/5/2005, Entered: 10/5/2005, Terminated: 10/21/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
        Joint MOTION Approval of Agreement for Judgment by M. John DeMatteo, John Shaugnessy, Jr, International Union Of Operating Engineers Local 4 Pension Fund,, John N. Panaro, Peter White, Bruce Wood, Rodney Gillespie, C&B Construction Management Trust, Inc., Bruce Ross, Trustees International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare Fund, Louis Rasetta, Jr, C&B Construction Management Trust, Inc., David Fatini, William Ryan, George Jr. Davagian.(Geiman, Gregory)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: 9/6/2005 Order on Motion to Reopen Case
          Judge Rya W. Zobel : Electronic ORDER entered granting [19] Motion to Reopen Case (Johnson, Jay)
            LREF
            Legal Document 19 Filed: 8/30/2005, Entered: 8/30/2005, Terminated: 9/6/2005 Motion to Reopen Case
            MOTION to Reopen Case by M. John DeMatteo, John Shaugnessy, Jr, International Union Of Operating Engineers Local 4 Pension Fund,, John N. Panaro, Peter White, Bruce Wood, Rodney Gillespie, Trustees International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare Fund, Louis Rasetta, Jr, David Fatini, William Ryan, George Jr. Davagian.(Sills, Anne)
              LREF
              Legal Document 18 Filed: 7/1/2005, Entered: 7/1/2005 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
              Judge Rya W. Zobel : Order 60 Day ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE(Urso, Lisa)
                LREF
                Legal Document 17 Filed: 6/30/2005, Entered: 6/30/2005 Stipulation of Dismissal
                STIPULATION of Dismissal by Centennial Insurance Company. (Hayman, Thomas)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 6/30/2005, Entered: 7/1/2005 Scheduling Conference
                  Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Rya W. Zobel : Scheduling Conference held on 6/30/2005. 60 day order of dismissal to issue; (Urso, Lisa)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: 4/27/2005 Scheduling Conference
                    electronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Rya W. Zobel : Scheduling Conference held on 4/26/2005. Further Scheduling Conference set for 6/30/2005 02:00 PM in Courtroom 13 before Judge Rya W. Zobel. (Urso, Lisa)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: 2/9/2005 Notice of Rescheduling
                      NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING Scheduling Conference reset for 3/9/2005 03:00 PM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel. (Urso, Lisa)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: 2/9/2005 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                        ***Attorney Anne R. Sills for International Union Of Operating Engineers Local 4 Pension Fund,; John N. Panaro; Peter White; Bruce Wood; Rodney Gillespie; Trustees International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare Fund; Louis Rasetta, Jr; David Fatini; William Ryan; George Jr. Davagian; M. John DeMatteo and John Shaugnessy, Jr added. (Notice of appearance filed 1/5/05 was not properly linked to the parties) (Hurley, Virginia)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: 2/9/2005 Order on Motion to Continue
                          Judge Rya W. Zobel : electronicORDER entered granting [16] Motion to Continue. Further scheduling conference reset for 3/8/05 at 2:00 p.m. (Urso, Lisa)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 16 Filed: 2/4/2005, Entered: 2/4/2005, Terminated: 2/9/2005 Motion to Continue
                            Assented to MOTION to Continue Status Conference to Week of March 7, 2005 by C&B Construction Management Trust, Inc., Bruce Ross, C&B Construction Management Trust, Inc..(Joyce, Richard)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 15 Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: 1/5/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                              NOTICE of Appearance by Anne R. Sills on behalf of all plaintiffs (Sills, Anne)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 14 Filed: 11/22/2004, Entered: 11/22/2004 Document disclosure
                                Document disclosure by C&B Construction Management Trust, Inc., Bruce Ross.(Joyce, Richard)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 11/16/2004, Entered: 11/17/2004 Scheduling Conference
                                  electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Rya W. Zobel : Scheduling Conference held on 11/16/2004. end of January for audit and data re; unbonded projects; Further Scheduling Conference set for 2/10/2005 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel. (Urso, Lisa)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 13 Filed: 11/12/2004, Entered: 11/12/2004 Certificate of Consultation
                                    CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION Defendants Certification Pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Richard Joyce on behalf of C&B Construction Management Trust, Inc., Bruce Ross. (Joyce, Richard)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 12 Filed: 11/9/2004, Entered: 11/9/2004 Certificate of Consultation
                                      CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION by Robert O. Berger III on behalf of all plaintiffs. (Berger, Robert)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 11 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: 11/8/2004 Certificate of Consultation
                                        CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION by Thomas H. Hayman on behalf of Centennial Insurance Company. (Hayman, Thomas)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 10 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: 11/8/2004 Joint statement re scheduling conference
                                          JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference. (Hayman, Thomas)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 9 Filed: 10/15/2004, Entered: 10/15/2004 Notice of Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                            NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 11/16/2004 03:00 PM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel. (Urso, Lisa)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 8 Filed: 10/8/2004, Entered: 10/8/2004 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Centennial Insurance Company. (Hayman, Thomas)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 7 Filed: 10/8/2004, Entered: 10/8/2004 Answer to Third-Party Complaint
                                                ANSWER to Third Party Complaint by Centennial Insurance Company.(Hayman, Thomas)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 10/1/2004, Entered: 10/4/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed C&B Construction Management Trust, Inc. served on 9/2/2004, answer due 9/22/2004. (Johnson, Jay)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 9/23/2004, Entered: 9/24/2004 Affidavit
                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Marshall F. Newman by C&B Construction Management Trust, Inc.. (Johnson, Jay)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 9/23/2004, Entered: 9/24/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                      THIRD PARTY SUMMONS Returned Executed Centennial Insurance Company served on 9/21/2004, answer due 10/11/2004. (Johnson, Jay)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 9/14/2004, Entered: 9/14/2004 Third-Party Complaint
                                                        THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Centennial Insurance Company , filed by C&B Construction Management Trust, Inc..(Johnson, Jay)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 9/14/2004, Entered: 9/14/2004 Answer
                                                          ANSWER to Complaint with Electronic by C&B Construction Management Trust, Inc., Bruce Ross.(Johnson, Jay)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/4/2004, Entered: 8/5/2004 Complaint
                                                            COMPLAINT Filing fee: $ 150, receipt number 57730, filed by George Jr. Davagian, M. John DeMatteo, David Fatini, Rodney Gillespie, International Union Of Operating Engineers Local 4 Pension Fund,, John N. Panaro, Louis Rasetta Jr., William Ryan, John Shaugnessy Jr., Trustees International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 Health and Welfare Fund, Peter White, Bruce Wood.(Johnson, Jay)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/4/2004, Entered: 8/5/2004 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                                              If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Alexander. (Johnson, Jay)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/4/2004, Entered: 8/5/2004 Summons Issued
                                                                Summons Issued as to C&B Construction Management Trust, Inc., Bruce Ross. (Johnson, Jay)
                                                                  LREF

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 74 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?