McNally et al v. Sentry Fence & Iron Co. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-11754-DPW

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo James Merloni, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Martin F. Walsh, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Paul J McNally, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
v.
No Logo James Marconi, Defendant
No Logo Sentry Fence & Iron Co., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by gregsonlawoffice.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brent J. Bass +1 781 233 1133 +1 781 233 9146 bbass@gregsonlawoffice.com
No Logo Eastern Bank, Trustee
Office Boston
Filed 8/10/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Transfer to Another District
County Suffolk
Terminated 6/13/2006
Origin 4
Reopened 12/29/2005
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (58) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 42 Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: 6/22/2006 Writ Issued
WRIT of First Execution issued (Nici, Richard).
    LREF
    Legal Document 41 Filed: 6/13/2006, Entered: 6/13/2006 Default -JudgmentCourt Filing
    Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : ORDER entered. DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plantiff (Nici, Richard)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: 6/12/2006 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
      Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered finding as moot [29] Motion for Default Judgment in light of new motion for default judgment filed as document [35]. (Rynne, Michelle)
        LREF
        Legal Document 40 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: 5/17/2006 Proposed Document(s) submitted
        Proposed Document(s) submitted by Paul J McNally, James Merloni, Jr, Martin F. Walsh. Document received: Default Judgment. (Geiman, Gregory)
          LREF
          Legal Document 39 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: 5/17/2006 Affidavit
          AFFIDAVIT of Anne R. Sills by Paul J McNally, James Merloni, Jr, Martin F. Walsh. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Geiman, Gregory)
            LREF
            Legal Document 38 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: 5/17/2006 Affidavit
            AFFIDAVIT of Philip M. Mackay by Paul J McNally, James Merloni, Jr, Martin F. Walsh. (Geiman, Gregory)
              LREF
              Legal Document 37 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: 5/17/2006 Affidavit
              AFFIDAVIT of Thomas P.V. Masiello as to Military Service, Infancy and Incompetence by Paul J McNally, James Merloni, Jr, Martin F. Walsh. (Geiman, Gregory)
                LREF
                Legal Document 36 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: 5/17/2006 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                MEMORANDUM in Support re [35] MOTION for Default Judgment as to Sentry Fence & Iron Co. and James Marconi filed by Paul J McNally, James Merloni, Jr, Martin F. Walsh. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2)(Geiman, Gregory)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 35 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: 5/17/2006, Terminated: 6/13/2006 Motion for Default Judgment
                  MOTION for Default Judgment as to Sentry Fence & Iron Co. and James Marconi by Paul J McNally, James Merloni, Jr, Martin F. Walsh.(Geiman, Gregory)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 34 Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: 3/31/2006 Proposed Document(s) submitted
                    Proposed Document(s) submitted by Paul J McNally, James Merloni, Jr, Martin F. Walsh. Document received: Default Judgment. (Geiman, Gregory)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 33 Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: 3/31/2006 Affidavit
                      AFFIDAVIT of Anne R. Sills by Paul J McNally, James Merloni, Jr, Martin F. Walsh. (Geiman, Gregory)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 32 Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: 3/31/2006 Affidavit
                        AFFIDAVIT of Philip M. Mackay by Paul J McNally, James Merloni, Jr, Martin F. Walsh. (Geiman, Gregory)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 31 Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: 3/31/2006 Affidavit
                          AFFIDAVIT of Thomas P.V. Masiello as to Military Service, Infancy and Incompetence by Paul J McNally, James Merloni, Jr, Martin F. Walsh. (Geiman, Gregory)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 30 Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: 3/31/2006 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                            MEMORANDUM in Support re [29] MOTION for Default Judgment as to Sentry Fence & Iron Co. and James Marconi filed by Paul J McNally, James Merloni, Jr, Martin F. Walsh. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2)(Geiman, Gregory)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 29 Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: 3/31/2006, Terminated: 6/12/2006 Motion for Default Judgment
                            MOTION for Default Judgment as to Sentry Fence & Iron Co. and James Marconi by Paul J McNally, James Merloni, Jr, Martin F. Walsh.(Geiman, Gregory)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 3/7/2006, Entered: 3/7/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                              Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered granting [28] Motion for Extension of Time to File motion for default judgment. Motion due 3/31/06. (Rynne, Michelle)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 28 Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: 3/6/2006, Terminated: 3/7/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                MOTION for Extension of Time to March 31, 2006 to File for Entry of Default Judgment by Paul J McNally, James Merloni, Jr, Martin F. Walsh.(Geiman, Gregory)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/17/2006, Entered: 2/17/2006 Terminate Motions
                                  Motions terminated: [25] MOTION for Entry of Default filed by James Merloni, Jr., Martin F. Walsh,, Paul J McNally. See [27] Notice of Entry of Default issued 2/3/06. (Rynne, Michelle)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 27 Filed: 2/3/2006, Entered: 2/3/2006 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default
                                    NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Sentry Fence & Iron Co., James Marconi (Nici, Richard)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 26 Filed: 2/3/2006, Entered: 2/3/2006 Standing Order re motions for default judgmentCourt Filing
                                      Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on motions for default judgment (Nici, Richard)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 25 Filed: 1/10/2006, Entered: 1/10/2006, Terminated: 2/17/2006 Motion for Entry of Default
                                        MOTION for Entry of Default by Paul J McNally, James Merloni, Jr, Martin F. Walsh.(Geiman, Gregory)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/29/2005, Entered: 12/29/2005 Order on Motion to Reopen Case
                                          Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered granting [24] Motion to Reopen Case. (Rynne, Michelle)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 24 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005, Terminated: 12/29/2005 Motion to Reopen Case
                                            MOTION to Reopen Case by Paul J McNally, James Merloni, Jr, Martin F. Walsh. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Geiman, Gregory)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 23 Filed: 10/26/2005, Entered: 10/26/2005 Settlement Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                              Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : ORDER entered. SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL.(Rynne, Michelle)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/26/2005, Entered: 10/26/2005 Terminated Case
                                                Civil Case Terminated. (Rynne, Michelle)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: 10/17/2005 Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge
                                                  Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings. (Dolan, Kathleen)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 22 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: 10/17/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    Judge Robert B. Collings : FINDINGS AND ORDER ON MOTION FOR ATTACHMENT (#15) entered. (Dolan, Kathleen)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: 10/17/2005 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                      Judge Robert B. Collings : ElectronicORDER entered granting [15] Motion for Attachment. See Findings and Order, Etc. entered this date. (Dolan, Kathleen)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: 10/13/2005 Motion Hearing
                                                        ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Robert B. Collings: Motion Hearing held on 10/13/2005 re [15] MOTION for attachment of personal property of defendant filed by Paul J McNally. James Marconi appears on behalf of himself and Sentry. Court explains what an attachment on personal property means. Mr. Marconi states that he intends to pay the debt. Court allows attachment; order to issue. (Digital Recording)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: 10/3/2005 Notice of Scheduling Conference
                                                          NOTICE of Rescheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference reset for 10/27/2005 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Rynne, Michelle)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 9/15/2005, Entered: 9/15/2005 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                            NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [15], MOTION for attachment of personal property of defendant. Motion Hearing set for 10/13/2005 02:00 PM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings. (Dolan, Kathleen)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 21 Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: 9/7/2005 Notice of Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                              NOTICE of Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference set for 10/13/2005 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 20 Filed: 8/30/2005, Entered: 8/30/2005 Order Referring MotionCourt Filing
                                                                Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : ORDER entered. REFERRING MOTION [15] MOTION for attachment of personal property of defendant filed by Paul J McNally, to Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings(Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 18 Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: 8/26/2005 Affidavit
                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Philip Mackay. (Nici, Richard)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: 8/24/2005 Order
                                                                    Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered. ELECTRONIC ORDER REQUIRING ELECTRONIC FILING. It is hereby ORDERED that, unless leave is granted, upon good cause shown, to file paper documents in lieu of electronic filing via this Court's CM/ECF system, ALL future submissions in this case must be electronically filed. Such filings shall be made in accordance with, and subject to, the terms and conditions of electronic filing as set forth by this Court. All parties and counsel who choose to appear in this action must make arrangements to register for participation in electronic case filing, if they have not already done so. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Notices, Orders and Memoranda of the Court will only be filed and served electronically. Once a party or counsel has registered for electronic filing, it is his/her responsibility to monitor his/her e-mail to ensure receipt of electronic notices. Any changes in e-mail addresses must be reported to the Court immediately(Nici, Richard).
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 19 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: 8/26/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re [15] MOTION for attachment of personal property of defendant filed by Paul J McNally. (Nici, Richard)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 17 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: 8/26/2005 Proposed Document(s) submitted
                                                                        Proposed Document(s) submitted by Paul J McNally. Document received: Finding and Order of Approval of Attachment. (Attachments: # (1) Writ of Attachment)(Nici, Richard)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 16 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: 8/26/2005 Affidavit
                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Anne R. Sills by Paul J McNally. (Nici, Richard)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 15 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: 8/26/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                          MOTION for attachment of personal property of defendant by Paul J McNally.(Nici, Richard)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 14 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: 4/4/2005 Answer
                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint by James Marconi.(Nici, Richard)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 13 Filed: 3/21/2005, Entered: 3/21/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed Sentry Fence & Iron Co. served on 3/16/2005, answer due 4/5/2005. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 12 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: 2/22/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed James Marconi served on 2/12/2005, answer due 3/4/2005. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: 2/18/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                  Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered granting [8] Motion for Extension of Time to serve complaint, nunc pro tunc. (Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 11 Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: 1/5/2005 Answer
                                                                                    ANSWER of Trustee to Complaint by Eastern Bank.(Nici, Richard)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 10 Filed: 12/30/2004, Entered: 1/4/2005 Summons to Trustee Returned Executed
                                                                                      SUMMONS to Trustee Returned Executed Eastern Bank served on 12/14/2004, answer due 1/3/2005. (Nici, Richard)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 9 Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: 12/9/2004 Affidavit
                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Anne R. Sills by Paul J McNally, James Merloni Jr., Martin F. Walsh. (Nici, Richard)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: 12/9/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to December 21, 2004 to Serve Complaint by Paul J McNally.(Nici, Richard)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 7 Filed: 12/2/2004, Entered: 12/2/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            Judge Robert B. Collings : ORDER ON MOTION FOR AN EX PARTE ORDER OF ATTACHMENT BY TRUSTEE PROCESS (#2) entered.(Dolan, Kathleen)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 12/2/2004, Entered: 1/6/2005 Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                              Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings. (Dolan, Kathleen)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 12/2/2004, Entered: 12/2/2004 Order on Motion for Trustee Process
                                                                                                Judge Robert B. Collings : ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [2] Motion for Order of Attachment by Trustee Process. (Dolan, Kathleen)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 11/23/2004, Entered: 11/23/2004 Order Referring MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                  Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : ORDER entered REFERRING MOTION [2] Ex Parte MOTION for Trustee Process filed by James Merloni, Martin F. Walsh, Paul J McNally to Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings.(Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 11/12/2004, Entered: 11/23/2004 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Anne R. Sills in Support re [2] MOTION for Trustee Process . (Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 11/12/2004, Entered: 11/23/2004 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Philip Mackay in Support re [2] MOTION for Trustee Process . (Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 11/12/2004, Entered: 11/23/2004 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re [2] MOTION for Trustee Process filed by Paul J McNally, James Merloni Jr., Martin F. Walsh. (Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 11/12/2004, Entered: 11/23/2004 Motion for Trustee Process
                                                                                                          Ex Parte MOTION for Trustee Process by Paul J McNally, James Merloni Jr., Martin F. Walsh.(Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/10/2004, Entered: 8/12/2004 Complaint
                                                                                                            COMPLAINT, filed by Paul J McNally, James Merloni, Jr., Martin F. Walsh. Filing fee: $ 150, receipt number 57892 [Attachments A, B, C, D, E not attached].(Greenberg, Rebecca) Modified on 8/12/2004 (Greenberg, Rebecca).
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/10/2004, Entered: 8/13/2004 Summons Issued
                                                                                                              Summons Issued as to James Marconi, Sentry Fence & Iron Co. (Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/10/2004, Entered: 8/12/2004 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                                                                                                If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings. (Greenberg, Rebecca)
                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 79 times.

                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?