Banks et al v. New York Police Department et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oklahoma Western District Court, Case No. 5:14-cv-01427

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 25, 2017 at 4:48 AM DT (3.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Banks, Frederick H., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Frederick Banks"

Toggle Switch Represented by FREDERICK BANKS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frederick Banks
No Logo Kenneth Posner, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kenneth Posner

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth Posner
v.
No Logo Aaron Schock, Defendant
Schiff, Adam Schiff, Adam, Defendant
Officially listed as "Adam B Schiff"
No Logo Adam Kinzinger, Defendant
No Logo Adam Smith, Defendant
No Logo Adnrew L Carter, Jr, Defendant
No Logo Adrian, Smith +., Defendant
No Logo Al Franken, Defendant
No Logo Al Green, Defendant
No Logo Alan Grayson, Defendant
No Logo Alan Lowenthal, Defendant
No Logo Alan Nunnelee, Defendant
No Logo Albert Branson Maris, Defendant
No Logo Albio Sires, Defendant
No Logo Alcee L Hastings, Defendant
No Logo Alison J Nathan, Defendant
No Logo Allyson Y Schwartz, Defendant
No Logo Ami Bera, Defendant
No Logo Amy Klobuchar, Defendant
No Logo Ander Crenshaw, Defendant
No Logo Andre Carson, Defendant
No Logo Andrew L Carter, Jr, Defendant
No Logo Andy Barr, Defendant
No Logo Andy Harris, Defendant
No Logo Angus King, Defendant
No Logo Ann Kirkpatrick, Defendant
No Logo Ann McLane Kuster, Defendant
No Logo Ann Wagner, Defendant
No Logo Anna G Eshoo, Defendant
No Logo Austin, Scott, Defendant
Obama, Barack Hussein Obama, Barack Hussein, Defendant
Officially listed as "Barack Obama"
United States of America President, United States of America, January 20, 2009 - January 20, 2017
No Logo Barbara A Mikulski, Defendant
No Logo Barbara Boxer, Defendant
No Logo Barbara Lee, Defendant
No Logo Ben Orrison, Defendant
No Logo Ben Ray Lujan, Defendant
No Logo Benjamin L Cardin, Defendant
No Logo Bennie Thompson, Defendant
No Logo Bernard Sanders, Defendant
No Logo Beto ORourke, Defendant
No Logo Betty McCollum, Defendant
No Logo Bill Cassidy, Defendant
No Logo Bill Enyart, Defendant
No Logo Bill Flores, Defendant
No Logo Bill Foster, Defendant
No Logo Bill Huizenga, Defendant
No Logo Bill Johnson, Defendant
No Logo Bill Nelson, Defendant
No Logo Bill Owens, Defendant
No Logo Bill Pascrell, Jr, Defendant
No Logo Bill Posey, Defendant
No Logo Bill Shuster, Defendant
No Logo Billy Long, Defendant
No Logo Blaine Luetkemeyer, Defendant
No Logo Blake Farenthold, Defendant
No Logo Bob Casey, Defendant
No Logo Bob Corker, Defendant
No Logo Bob Gibbs, Defendant
No Logo Bob Latta, Defendant
No Logo Bobby L Rush, Defendant
No Logo Brad Schneider, Defendant
No Logo Brad Sherman, Defendant
No Logo Brad Wenstrup, Defendant
No Logo Brett Guthrie, Defendant
No Logo Brian Higgins, Defendant
No Logo Brian Schatz, Defendant
No Logo Bruce Braley, Defendant
No Logo Byrne, Bradley, Defendant
No Logo CA Dutch Ruppersberger, Defendant
No Logo Candice S Miller, Defendant
No Logo CARL LEVIN, Defendant
No Logo Carol Shea-Porter, Defendant
No Logo Carolyn B Maloney, Defendant
No Logo Carolyn McCarthy, Defendant
No Logo Cathy McMorris Rodgers, Defendant
No Logo Cedric L Richmond, Defendant
No Logo Central Intelligance Agency, Defendant
No Logo Chaka Fattah, Defendant
No Logo Charles E Schumer, Defendant
No Logo Charles B Rangel, Defendant
No Logo Charles Boustany, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Charles E Grassley, Defendant
No Logo Charles Miller Metzner, Defendant
No Logo Charlie Dent, Defendant
No Logo Charmaigne Odom, Defendant
No Logo Chellie Pingree, Defendant
No Logo Cheri Bustos, Defendant
No Logo Chris Collins, Defendant
No Logo Chris Coons, Defendant
No Logo Chris Gibson, Defendant
No Logo Chris Stewart, Defendant
No Logo Chris Van Hollen, Defendant
No Logo Christopher H Smith, Defendant
No Logo Christopher S Murphy, Defendant
No Logo Chuck Fleischmann, Defendant
No Logo Claire McCaskill, Defendant
No Logo Claire V Eagan, Defendant
No Logo Colleen Hanabusa, Defendant
No Logo Colleen McMahon, Defendant
No Logo Collin C Peterson, Defendant
No Logo Congressman Lamar Smith, Defendant
No Logo Corrine Brown, Defendant
Booker, Cory A. Booker, Cory A., Defendant
Officially listed as "Cory Booker"
No Logo Cory Gardner, Defendant
No Logo Cynthia M Lummis, Defendant
No Logo Dan Benishek, Defendant
No Logo Dan Coats, Defendant
No Logo Dan Kildee, Defendant
No Logo Dan Maffei, Defendant
No Logo Dana Rohrabacher, Defendant
No Logo Daniel Holcombe Thomas, Defendant
No Logo Daniel Lipinski, Defendant
No Logo Daniel Pantaleo, Defendant
No Logo Daniel Webster, Defendant
No Logo Danny K Davis, Defendant
No Logo Darrell Issa, Defendant
No Logo Dave Camp, Defendant
No Logo Dave Loebsack, Defendant
No Logo Dave Reichert, Defendant
No Logo David B McKinley, Defendant
No Logo David Cicilline, Defendant
No Logo David E. Price, Defendant
No Logo DAVID JOLLY, Defendant
No Logo David Joyce, Defendant
No Logo David Norton Edelstein, Defendant
No Logo David Schweikert, Defendant
No Logo David Scott, Defendant
No Logo David Valadao, Defendant
No Logo David Vitter, Defendant
No Logo Dean Heller, Defendant
No Logo Deb Fischer, Defendant
No Logo Debbie Stabenow, Defendant
No Logo Debbie Wasserman Schultz, Defendant
No Logo Deborah A Batts, Defendant
No Logo Denise L Cote, Defendant
No Logo Dennis A Ross, Defendant
No Logo Denny Chin, Defendant
No Logo Denny Heck, Defendant
No Logo Department of Interior, Defendant
No Logo Derek Kilmer, Defendant
Nunes, Devin G. Nunes, Devin G., Defendant
Officially listed as "Devin Nunes"
No Logo Diana DeGette, Defendant
No Logo Diane Black, Defendant
No Logo Dianne Feinstein, Defendant
No Logo Dina Titus, Defendant
No Logo Doc Hastings, Defendant
No Logo Don Young, Defendant
No Logo Donald M Payne, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Donna Edwards, Defendant
No Logo Doris Matsui, Defendant
No Logo Doug Collins, Defendant
No Logo Doug LaMalfa, Defendant
No Logo Doug Lamborn, Defendant
No Logo Doug Williams, Defendant
No Logo Duncan Hunter, Defendant
No Logo Earl Blumenauer, Defendant
No Logo Earl Kohlbacker, Defendant
No Logo Ed Pastor, Defendant
No Logo Ed Perimutter, Defendant
No Logo Ed Royce, Defendant
No Logo Eddie Bernice Johnson, Defendant
No Logo Edward J Markey, Defendant
No Logo Edward Joseph McManus, Defendant
No Logo Edward Whitfield, Defendant
No Logo Elijah E Cummings, Defendant
No Logo Eliot L Engel, Defendant
No Logo Elizabeth Esty, Defendant
Warren, Elizabeth Warren, Elizabeth, Defendant
Officially listed as "Elizabeth Warren"
No Logo Emanuel Cleaver, II, Defendant
No Logo Eric Cantor, Defendant
No Logo Eric Holder, Defendant
No Logo Eric Swalwell, Defendant
No Logo Erik Paulsen, Defendant
No Logo F Dennis Saylor, IV, Defendant
Federal Bureau of Investigation Federal Bureau of Investigation, Defendant
No Logo Frank R Wolf, Defendant
No Logo Frank A LoBiondo, Defendant
No Logo Frank D Lucas, Defendant
No Logo Frank Pallone, Jr, Defendant
No Logo Fred Upton, Defendant
No Logo Frederica S Wilson, Defendant
No Logo G K Butterfield, Defendant
No Logo Garret Gaetano, Defendant
No Logo Gary G Miller, Defendant
No Logo Gary Peters, Defendant
No Logo Gene Green, Defendant
No Logo George B Daniels, Defendant
No Logo George C Young, Defendant
No Logo George Holding, Defendant
No Logo George Miller, Defendant
No Logo Gerald E Connolly, Defendant
No Logo Glenn Thompson, Defendant
No Logo Gloria Negrete McLeod, Defendant
No Logo Grace F Napolitano, Defendant
No Logo Grace Meng, Defendant
No Logo Greg Walden, Defendant
No Logo gregg Harper, Defendant
No Logo Gregory W Meeks, Defendant
No Logo Gus Bilirakis, Defendant
No Logo Gwen Moore, Defendant
No Logo Hakeem Jeffries, Defendant
No Logo Hank Johnson, Defendant
No Logo Harold Baer, Defendant
No Logo Harold Rogers, Defendant
No Logo Harry Reid, Defendant
No Logo Heidi Heltkamp, Defendant
No Logo Henry A Waxman, Defendant
No Logo Henry Cuellar, Defendant
No Logo Henry Potter, Defendant
Clinton, Hillary Rodham Clinton, Hillary Rodham, Defendant
Officially listed as "Hillary Rodham Clinton"
No Logo Howard Buck McKeon, Defendant
No Logo Howard Coble, Defendant
No Logo Ileana Ros-Lehtinen, Defendant
No Logo Indian Affairs, Bureau of, Defendant
No Logo J Randy Forbes, Defendant
No Logo Jack Kingston, Defendant
No Logo Jack Reed, Defendant
No Logo Jackie Speier, Defendant
No Logo Jackie Walorski, Defendant
No Logo Jaime Herrera Beutler, Defendant
No Logo James B Renacci, Defendant
No Logo James R Browning, Defendant
No Logo James B Zagel, Defendant
No Logo James E Boasberg, Defendant
No Logo James E Clyburn, Defendant
No Logo James Lankford, Defendant
No Logo James P Moran, Defendant
No Logo Jan Schakowsky, Defendant
No Logo Janice Hahn, Defendant
No Logo Jared Huffman, Defendant
No Logo Jared Polis, Defendant
No Logo Jason Chaffetz, Defendant
No Logo Jason Smith, Defendant
No Logo Jay Rockefeller, Defendant
No Logo Jeanne Shaheen, Defendant
No Logo Jeb Hensarling, Defendant
No Logo Jeff Denham, Defendant
No Logo Jeff Duncan, Defendant
No Logo Jeff Flake, Defendant
No Logo Jeff Fortenberry, Defendant
No Logo Jeff Merkley, Defendant
No Logo Jeff Miller, Defendant
Sessions, Jefferson Beauregard, III Sessions, Jefferson Beauregard, III, Defendant
Officially listed as "Jeff Sessions"
United States Department of Justice Attorney General, United States Department of Justice, February 9, 2017 - November 7, 2018
United States of America Attorney General, United States of America, February 9, 2017 - November 7, 2018
No Logo Jerrold Nadler, Defendant
No Logo Jerry McNerney, Defendant
No Logo Jerry Moran, Defendant
No Logo Jessica Albert, Defendant
No Logo Jim Brennan, Defendant
No Logo Jim Bridenstine, Defendant
No Logo JIM COOPER, Defendant
No Logo Jim Costa, Defendant
No Logo Jim Gerlach, Defendant
No Logo Jim Himes, Defendant
No Logo Jim Jordan, Defendant
No Logo Jim Langevin, Defendant
No Logo Jim Matheson, Defendant
No Logo Jim McDermott, Defendant
No Logo Jim McGovern, Defendant
No Logo Jim Risch, Defendant
No Logo Jim Sensenbrenner, Defendant
No Logo Joaquin Castro, Defendant
No Logo Joe Courtney, Defendant
No Logo Joe Donnelly, Defendant
No Logo Joe Garcia, Defendant
No Logo Joe Heck, Defendant
No Logo Joe L Barton, Defendant
No Logo Joe Manchin, III, Defendant
No Logo Joe Pitts, Defendant
No Logo Joe Wilson, Defendant
No Logo John A Boehner, Defendant
No Logo John J Duncan, Jr, Defendant
No Logo John B Larson, Defendant
No Logo John Barrasso, Defendant
No Logo John Barrow, Defendant
No Logo John Boozman, Defendant
No Logo John Campbell, Defendant
No Logo John Carney, Defendant
No Logo JOHN CARTER, Defendant
No Logo John Conyers, Jr, Defendant
No Logo John Cornyn, Defendant
No Logo John Culberson, Defendant
No Logo John D Dingell, Defendant
No Logo John Delaney, Defendant
No Logo John F Keenan, Defendant
No Logo John F Tierney, Defendant
No Logo John Fleming, Defendant
No Logo John G Koeltl, Defendant
No Logo John Garamendi, Defendant
No Logo John Hoeven, Defendant
No Logo John Kline, Defendant
No Logo John L Mica, Defendant
No Logo John Lewis, Defendant
No Logo John McCain, Defendant
No Logo John Sarbanes, Defendant
No Logo John Shimkus, Defendant
No Logo John Thune, Defendant
No Logo John Walsh, Defendant
No Logo John Yarmuth, Defendant
No Logo Johnny Isakson, Defendant
No Logo Jon Runyan, Defendant
No Logo Jon Tester, Defendant
No Logo Jose E Serrano, Defendant
No Logo Joseph Buffington, Defendant
No Logo Joseph Chappell Hutcheson, Jr, Defendant
No Logo JOSEPH CROWLEY, Defendant
No Logo Joseph P Kennedy, III, Defendant
No Logo Joseph William Woodrough, Defendant
No Logo Joy Flowers Conti, Defendant
No Logo Joyce Beatty, Defendant
No Logo Juan C Vargas, Defendant
No Logo Judy Chu, Defendant
No Logo Julia Brownley, Defendant
No Logo Justin Amash, Defendant
No Logo K Michael Conaway, Defendant
No Logo Karen Bass, Defendant
No Logo Katherine Polk Failla, Defendant
No Logo Katherine M Clark, Defendant
No Logo Kathy Castor, Defendant
No Logo Kay Granger, Defendant
No Logo Kay Hagan, Defendant
No Logo Keith Ellison, Defendant
No Logo Keith Rothfus, Defendant
No Logo Kelly Ayotte, Defendant
No Logo Ken Calvert, Defendant
No Logo Ken Salizar, Defendant
No Logo Kenny Marchant, Defendant
No Logo Kerry Bentivolio, Defendant
No Logo Keven P Caster, Defendant
No Logo Keven T Duffy, Defendant
No Logo Kevin Brady, Defendant
No Logo Kevin Cramer, Defendant
No Logo Kevin McCarthy, Defendant
No Logo Kevin Yoder, Defendant
Gillibrand, Kirsten Gillibrand, Kirsten, Defendant
Officially listed as "Kirsten Gillibrand"
No Logo Kristi Noem, Defendant
No Logo Krysten Sinema, Defendant
No Logo Kurt Schrader, Defendant
No Logo Kyle Kohlbacker, Defendant
No Logo Lamar, Alexander, Defendant
No Logo Larry Bucshon, Defendant
No Logo Learned Hand, Defendant
No Logo Lee, Terry, Defendant
No Logo Leonard Lance, Defendant
No Logo Linda T Sanchez, Defendant
Graham, Lindsey O. Graham, Lindsey O., Defendant
Officially listed as "Lindsey Graham"
No Logo Lisa Murkowski, Defendant
No Logo Lloyd Doggett, Defendant
No Logo Lois Capps, Defendant
No Logo Lois Frankel, Defendant
No Logo Loretta Sanchez, Defendant
No Logo Lou Barletta, Defendant
No Logo Louie Gohmert, Defendant
No Logo Louise M Slaughter, Defendant
No Logo Lucille Roybal-Allard, Defendant
No Logo Luis V Guitierrez, Defendant
No Logo Luke Messer, Defendant
No Logo Lynn Jenkins, Defendant
No Logo Lynn Westmoreland, Defendant
No Logo Mac Thornberry, Defendant
No Logo Marc Veasey, Defendant
No Logo Marcia L Fudge, Defendant
No Logo Rubio, Marco, Defendant
Officially listed as "Marco Rubio"
No Logo Marcy Kaptur, Defendant
No Logo Maria Cantwell, Defendant
No Logo Mario Diaz-Balart, Defendant
No Logo Mark Amodel, Defendant
No Logo Mark Begich, Defendant
No Logo Mark Meadows, Defendant
No Logo Mark Pocan, Defendant
No Logo Mark Pryor, Defendant
No Logo Mark S Kirk, Defendant
No Logo Mark Sanford, Defendant
No Logo Mark Takano, Defendant
No Logo Mark Udall, Defendant
No Logo Mark Warner, Defendant
No Logo Markwayne Mullin, Defendant
No Logo Marlin Stultzman, Defendant
No Logo Marsha Blackburn, Defendant
No Logo Martha Roby, Defendant
No Logo Martin, Heinrich, Defendant
No Logo Martin L.C. Feldman, Defendant
No Logo Mary A McLaughlin, Defendant
No Logo Mary L Landrieu, Defendant
No Logo Matt Cartwright, Defendant
No Logo Matt Salmon, Defendant
No Logo Maxine Waters, Defendant
No Logo Mazie K Hirono, Defendant
No Logo Michael M Honda, Defendant
No Logo Michael B Enzi, Defendant
No Logo Michael Bennet, Defendant
No Logo Michael C Burgess, Defendant
No Logo Michael D Crapo, Defendant
No Logo Michael E Capuano, Defendant
No Logo Michael G Fitzpatrick, Defendant
No Logo Michael G Grimm, Defendant
No Logo Michael H Michaud, Defendant
No Logo Michael McCaul, Defendant
No Logo Michael R Turner, Defendant
No Logo Michael W Moseman, Defendant
No Logo Michele Bachmann, Defendant
No Logo Michelle Lujan Grisham, Defendant
Mulvaney, Mick Mulvaney, Mick, Defendant
Officially listed as "Mick Mulvaney"
No Logo Mike Coffman, Defendant
No Logo Mike D Rogers, Defendant
No Logo Mike Doyle, Defendant
No Logo Mike Johanns, Defendant
No Logo Mike Kelly, Defendant
No Logo Mike Lee, Defendant
No Logo Mike McIntyre, Defendant
Pompeo, Michael Richard Pompeo, Michael Richard, Defendant
Officially listed as "Mike Pompeo"
No Logo Mike Quigley, Defendant
No Logo MIKE ROGERS, Defendant
No Logo Mike Simpson, Defendant
No Logo Mike Thompson, Defendant
No Logo Miriam Goldman Cedarbaum, Defendant
No Logo Mo Brooks, Defendant
No Logo Morgan Griffith, Defendant
No Logo Myron Donovan Crocker, Defendant
Pelosi, Nancy Pelosi, Nancy, Defendant
Officially listed as "Nancy Pelosi"
United States House of Representatives Speaker of the House, United States House of Representatives, January 4, 2007 - January 3, 2011
United States House of Representatives Speaker of the House, United States House of Representatives, January 3, 2019 - Present
New York City Police Department New York City Police Department, Defendant
Officially listed as "New York Police Department"
No Logo Nick J Rahall, II, Defendant
No Logo Niki Tsongas, Defendant
No Logo Nita M Lowey, Defendant
No Logo Nora Barry Fischer, Defendant
No Logo Nydia M Velazquez, Defendant
No Logo Orie Leon Phillips, Defendant
No Logo Pat Tiberi, Defendant
No Logo Patrick J Toomey, Defendant
No Logo Patrick Leahy, Defendant
No Logo Patrick Meehan, Defendant
No Logo Patrick Murphy, Defendant
No Logo Patrick T McHenry, Defendant
No Logo Patty Murray, Defendant
No Logo Paul D Ryan, Defendant
No Logo Paul A. Crotty, Defendant
No Logo Paul A Engelmayer, Defendant
No Logo Paul Broun, Defendant
No Logo Paul Cook, Defendant
No Logo Paul Gosar, Defendant
No Logo Paul J Oetken, Defendant
No Logo Paul Tonko, Defendant
No Logo Pete Gallego, Defendant
No Logo Pete Olson, Defendant
No Logo Pete Sessions, Defendant
No Logo Peter A DeFazio, Defendant
No Logo Peter J Visclosky, Defendant
No Logo Peter Roskam, Defendant
No Logo Peter T King, Defendant
No Logo Peter Welch, Defendant
No Logo Phil Gingrey, Defendant
No Logo Phil Roe, Defendant
No Logo Ralph M Hall, Defendant
No Logo Rand, Paul, Defendant
No Logo Randy Hultgren, Defendant
No Logo Randy Neugebauer, Defendant
No Logo Randy Weber, Defendant
No Logo Raul M Grijalva, Defendant
No Logo Raul R Labrador, Defendant
No Logo Raul Ruiz, Defendant
No Logo Raymond J Dearie, Defendant
No Logo Reid Ribble, Defendant
No Logo Renee Ellmers, Defendant
No Logo Renewal Inc, Defendant
No Logo Rich Nugent, Defendant
No Logo Blumenthal, Richard, Defendant
Officially listed as "Richard Blumenthal"
No Logo Richard C Shelby, Defendant
No Logo Richard E Neal, Defendant
No Logo Richard Hanna, Defendant
No Logo Richard Hudson, Defendant
No Logo Richard J Durbin, Defendant
No Logo Richard M Berman, Defendant
No Logo Richard M Burr, Defendant
No Logo Rick Crawford, Defendant
No Logo Rick Larsen, Defendant
No Logo Rick Nolan, Defendant
No Logo Rob Bishop, Defendant
No Logo Rob Portman, Defendant
No Logo Rob Wittman, Defendant
No Logo Rob Woodall, Defendant
No Logo Robert A Brady, Defendant
No Logo Robert B Aderholt, Defendant
No Logo Robert C Scott, Defendant
No Logo Robert Hurt, Defendant
No Logo Robert Menendez, Defendant
No Logo Robert Pittenger, Defendant
No Logo Robert W Goodlatte, Defendant
No Logo Robin Kelly, Defendant
No Logo Rodney Davis, Defendant
No Logo Rodney Frelinghuysen, Defendant
No Logo Roger Wicker, Defendant
No Logo Roger, William S., Defendant
No Logo Ron Barber, Defendant
No Logo Ron DeSantis, Defendant
No Logo RON JOHNSON, Defendant
No Logo Ron Kind, Defendant
No Logo Ron Wyden, Defendant
No Logo Ronnie Abrams, Defendant
No Logo Rosa DeLauro, Defendant
No Logo Rosemary M Collyer, Defendant
No Logo Roy Blunt, Defendant
No Logo Ruben Hinojosa, Defendant
No Logo Rush D Holt, Defendant
No Logo Sam Farr, Defendant
No Logo Sam Graves, Defendant
No Logo Sam Johnson, Defendant
No Logo Sander M Levin, Defendant
No Logo Sanford D Bishop, Jr, Defendant
No Logo Saxby Chambliss, Defendant
No Logo scott DesJarlais, Defendant
No Logo Whatley Kallas, Llp, Defendant
Officially listed as "Scott Garrett"
No Logo Scott Perry, Defendant
No Logo Scott Peters, Defendant
No Logo Scott Rigell, Defendant
No Logo Scott Tipton, Defendant
No Logo Sean Langford, Defendant
No Logo Sean P Duffy, Defendant
No Logo Sean Patrick Maloney, Defendant
No Logo Senator James M Inhofe, Defendant
McConnell, Jr., Addison Mitch McConnell, Jr., Addison Mitch, Defendant
Officially listed as "Senator Mitch McConnell"
No Logo Senator Orrin G Hatch, Defendant
No Logo Senator Pat Roberts, Defendant
No Logo Seybourn Harris Lynne, Defendant
No Logo Sheila Jackson Lee, Defendant
No Logo Sheldon Whitehouse, Defendant
No Logo Shelley Moore Capito, Defendant
No Logo Sherrod Brown, Defendant
No Logo Spencer Bachus, Defendant
No Logo Steny H Hoyer, Defendant
No Logo Stephen F Lynch, Defendant
No Logo Stephen Fincher, Defendant
No Logo Steve Chabot, Defendant
No Logo STEVE COHEN, Defendant
No Logo Steve Daines, Defendant
No Logo Steve Israel, Defendant
No Logo Steve King, Defendant
No Logo Steve Pearce, Defendant
No Logo Steve Scalise, Defendant
No Logo Steve Southerland, II, Defendant
No Logo Steve Stivers, Defendant
No Logo Steve Stockman, Defendant
No Logo Steve Womack, Defendant
No Logo Steven Horsford, Defendant
No Logo Steven M Palazzo, Defendant
No Logo Susan A Davis, Defendant
No Logo Susan Collins, Defendant
No Logo Susan W Brooks, Defendant
No Logo Susan Webber Wright, Defendant
No Logo Suzan DelBene, Defendant
No Logo Suzanne Bonamici, Defendant
No Logo Tammy Baldwin, Defendant
No Logo Tammy Duckworth, Defendant
No Logo Ted Cruz, Defendant
No Logo Ted Deutch, Defendant
No Logo Ted Poe, Defendant
No Logo Ted Yoho, Defendant
No Logo Terri A Sewell, Defendant
No Logo Thad Cochran, Defendant
No Logo Thomas Massie, Defendant
No Logo Thomas R Carper, Defendant
No Logo Tim Griffin, Defendant
No Logo Tim Huelskamp, Defendant
No Logo Tim Johnson, Defendant
No Logo Tim Kaine, Defendant
No Logo Tim Murphy, Defendant
No Logo Tim Ryan, Defendant
No Logo Tim Scott, Defendant
No Logo Tim Walberg, Defendant
No Logo Tim Walz, Defendant
No Logo Timothy H Bishop, Defendant
No Logo Todd Rokita, Defendant
No Logo TODD YOUNG, Defendant
No Logo Tom Coburn, Defendant
No Logo Tom Cole, Defendant
No Logo Tom Cotton, Defendant
No Logo Tom Graves, Defendant
No Logo Tom Harkin, Defendant
No Logo Tom Lathamm, Defendant
No Logo Tom Marino, Defendant
No Logo Tom McClintock, Defendant
No Logo Tom Petri, Defendant
No Logo Tom Price, Defendant
No Logo Tom Reed, Defendant
No Logo Tom Rice, Defendant
No Logo Tom Rooney, Defendant
No Logo Tom Udall, Defendant
No Logo Tony Cardenas, Defendant
No Logo Trent Franks, Defendant
No Logo Trey Gowdy, Defendant
No Logo Tulsi Gabbard, Defendant
No Logo United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of Florida, Defendant
Officially listed as "United States Attorney"
No Logo United States Attorney's Office, Defendant
No Logo UNITED STATES PROBATION OFFICE, Defendant
No Logo Valerie E Caproni, Defendant
No Logo Vance McAllister, Defendant
No Logo Vela Filemon, Defendant
No Logo Vern Buchanan, Defendant
No Logo Vernon S Broderick, Defendant
No Logo Vicky Hartzler, Defendant
No Logo Victor Marrero, Defendant
No Logo Vincent L Briccetti, Defendant
No Logo Virginia Foxx, Defendant
No Logo Walter B Jones, Defendant
No Logo Wesley E Brown, Defendant
No Logo Wilfred Feinberg, Defendant
No Logo William Augustus Bootle, Defendant
No Logo William Cranch, Defendant
No Logo William Joseph Nealon, Jr, Defendant
No Logo William Keating, Defendant
No Logo William Lacy Clay, Defendant
No Logo Xavier Becerra, Defendant
No Logo Yvette D Clarke, Defendant
No Logo Zoe Lofgren, Defendant
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None Letter
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None Judgment
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None order adopting report and recommendation
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None Mail Returned
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Report and Recommendation
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None Mail Returned
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Frederick Banks. (kw) (Entered: 03/06/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/27/2015, Entered: None Return of Service - NON SUMMONS
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/31/2014, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/30/2014, Entered: None
                      MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kenneth Posner. Motions referred to Shon T. Erwin. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(kr) (Entered: 12/31/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/31/2014, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/30/2014, Entered: None
                          MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Frederick Banks. Motions referred to Shon T. Erwin. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(kr) (Entered: 12/31/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/31/2014, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/31/2014, Entered: None Previous Cases
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/30/2014, Entered: None
                                PREVIOUS Cases (kr) (Entered: 12/31/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/31/2014, Entered: None Complaint
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank 1 Filed: 12/30/2014, Entered: None
                                    COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Integrative Health Report, # 2 Attachment Hitchiking Satellites, # 3 Attachment Email from Charmaine Odom, # 4 Envelope)(kr) (Entered: 12/31/2014)
                                      LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 163 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?