Haugen et al v. Fidelity Management & Research Company et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-11756-MLW

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 25, 2017 at 12:31 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Andrea M Phillips, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hutchings, Barsamian, Cross and Mandelcorn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Theodore M. Hess-Mahan +1 781 431 2231 +1 781 431 8726 thess-mahan@hutchingsbarsamian.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Johnson, Blakely, Pope, Bokor, Ruppel & Burns, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Audrey B. Rauchway +1 813 225 2500 +1 813 223 7118 audreyr@jpfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Keller Rohrback LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tana Lin +1 206 623 1900 tlin@kellerrohrback.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shapiro Haber & Urmy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michelle H. Blauner +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 mblauner@shulaw.com
No Logo Cindy Schurgin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hutchings, Barsamian, Cross and Mandelcorn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Theodore M. Hess-Mahan +1 781 431 2231 +1 781 431 8726 thess-mahan@hutchingsbarsamian.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Johnson, Blakely, Pope, Bokor, Ruppel & Burns, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Audrey B. Rauchway +1 813 225 2500 +1 813 223 7118 audreyr@jpfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Keller Rohrback LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tana Lin +1 206 623 1900 tlin@kellerrohrback.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shapiro Haber & Urmy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michelle H. Blauner +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 mblauner@shulaw.com
No Logo James Gilliam, and others, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hutchings, Barsamian, Cross and Mandelcorn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Theodore M. Hess-Mahan +1 781 431 2231 +1 781 431 8726 thess-mahan@hutchingsbarsamian.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Johnson, Blakely, Pope, Bokor, Ruppel & Burns, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Audrey B. Rauchway +1 813 225 2500 +1 813 223 7118 audreyr@jpfirm.com
No Logo Karen L. Magnan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hutchings, Barsamian, Cross and Mandelcorn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Theodore M. Hess-Mahan +1 781 431 2231 +1 781 431 8726 thess-mahan@hutchingsbarsamian.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Johnson, Blakely, Pope, Bokor, Ruppel & Burns, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Audrey B. Rauchway +1 813 225 2500 +1 813 223 7118 audreyr@jpfirm.com

Represented by Keller Rohrback LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Richardson Patrick Westbrook & Brickman, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Christopher Bradley , +1 843 727 6500 +1 843 727 3103 jbradley@rpwb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shapiro Haber & Urmy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michelle H. Blauner +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 mblauner@shulaw.com
No Logo Michael F. Magnan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hutchings, Barsamian, Cross and Mandelcorn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Theodore M. Hess-Mahan +1 781 431 2231 +1 781 431 8726 thess-mahan@hutchingsbarsamian.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Johnson, Blakely, Pope, Bokor, Ruppel & Burns, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Audrey B. Rauchway +1 813 225 2500 +1 813 223 7118 audreyr@jpfirm.com

Represented by Keller Rohrback LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Richardson Patrick Westbrook & Brickman, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Christopher Bradley , +1 843 727 6500 +1 843 727 3103 jbradley@rpwb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shapiro Haber & Urmy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michelle H. Blauner +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 mblauner@shulaw.com
No Logo Nancy Haugen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hutchings, Barsamian, Cross and Mandelcorn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Theodore M. Hess-Mahan +1 781 431 2231 +1 781 431 8726 thess-mahan@hutchingsbarsamian.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Johnson, Blakely, Pope, Bokor, Ruppel & Burns, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Audrey B. Rauchway +1 813 225 2500 +1 813 223 7118 audreyr@jpfirm.com

Represented by Keller Rohrback LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Richardson Patrick Westbrook & Brickman, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Christopher Bradley , +1 843 727 6500 +1 843 727 3103 jbradley@rpwb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shapiro Haber & Urmy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michelle H. Blauner +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 mblauner@shulaw.com
No Logo Presley C Phillips, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hutchings, Barsamian, Cross and Mandelcorn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Theodore M. Hess-Mahan +1 781 431 2231 +1 781 431 8726 thess-mahan@hutchingsbarsamian.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Johnson, Blakely, Pope, Bokor, Ruppel & Burns, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Audrey B. Rauchway +1 813 225 2500 +1 813 223 7118 audreyr@jpfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Keller Rohrback LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tana Lin +1 206 623 1900 tlin@kellerrohrback.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shapiro Haber & Urmy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michelle H. Blauner +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 mblauner@shulaw.com
No Logo Rose M Iannaccone, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hutchings, Barsamian, Cross and Mandelcorn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Theodore M. Hess-Mahan +1 781 431 2231 +1 781 431 8726 thess-mahan@hutchingsbarsamian.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Johnson, Blakely, Pope, Bokor, Ruppel & Burns, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Audrey B. Rauchway +1 813 225 2500 +1 813 223 7118 audreyr@jpfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Keller Rohrback LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tana Lin +1 206 623 1900 tlin@kellerrohrback.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shapiro Haber & Urmy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michelle H. Blauner +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 mblauner@shulaw.com
v.
No Logo Donald J. Kirk, Defendant
No Logo Fidelity Funds, Defendant

Represented by K&L Gates LLP

No Logo Fidelity Management & Research Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence GD Scarborough +1 602 364 7137 +1 602 364 8137

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James S. Dittmar +1 617 570 1944 +1 617 227 8591 jdittmar@goodwinprocter.com
No Logo FMR Co., Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Alexander Grimsley
Space Lawrence GD Scarborough +1 602 364 7137 +1 602 364 8137

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James S. Dittmar +1 617 570 1944 +1 617 227 8591 jdittmar@goodwinprocter.com
No Logo George H. Heilmeier, Defendant
No Logo Gerald C. McDonough, Defendant
No Logo J. Michael Cook, Defendant
No Logo Marie L. Knowles, Defendant
No Logo Marvin L. Mann, Defendant
No Logo Ned C. Lautenbach, Defendant
No Logo Ralph F. Cox, Defendant
Gates, Robert M. Gates, Robert M., Defendant
Officially listed as "Robert M. Gates"
Nacco Industries, Inc. Unknown Role, Nacco Industries, Inc.
Starbucks Corporation Unknown Role, Starbucks Corporation
No Logo William O. McCoy, Defendant
No Logo William S. Stavropoulos, Defendant
No Logo Gilliam Plaintiffs, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nancy F. Gans +1 781 235 2246 +1 781 239 0353 nlfgans@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hutchings, Barsamian, Cross and Mandelcorn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Theodore M. Hess-Mahan +1 781 431 2231 +1 781 431 8726 thess-mahan@hutchingsbarsamian.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Johnson, Blakely, Pope, Bokor, Ruppel & Burns, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Audrey B. Rauchway +1 813 225 2500 +1 813 223 7118 audreyr@jpfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Keller Rohrback LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tana Lin +1 206 623 1900 tlin@kellerrohrback.com
Office Boston
Filed 8/10/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause JS 44 Sec. IV - no matching citation currently in database
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 10/28/2005
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
104-cv-11651-MLW None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (70) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
Chief Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered denying (257) Motion Enter Evidence, Extend Time; finding as moot (266) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in case 1:04-cv-11651-MLW.Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that:1. Plaintiffs' Motion to Enter Evidence (Docket No. 257) isDENIED.2. By February 22, 2011, at 3: 00 p.m., plaintiffs shall submita renewed supplemental submission that references only evidencethat was before the court at the January 7, 2011 hearing.Plaintiffs shall also submit a new copy of the documentary evidenceon which they rely in their supplemental submission, assembled inan accessible form.3. Defendants' Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs'Motion to Enter Evidence (Docket No. 266) is MOOT.4. All previously established deadlines remain in effect. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-11651-MLW, 1:04-cv-11756-MLW(Hohler, Daniel) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: None
    STATUS REPORT (Joint Report Re: Settlement Discussions) by Bennett Plaintiffs, FMR Co., Inc., Fidelity Management & Research Company, Nancy Haugen, Karen L. Magnan, Michael F. Magnan, Andrea M Phillips, Presley C Phillips, Cindy Schurgin. (Apfel, David) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
      Chief Judge Mark L. Wolf: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered.Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Plaintiffs' Motion to Withdraw their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, made orally at the January 7, 2011 hearing, is ALLOWED, and plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Docket No. 153) is WITHDRAWN. 2. The parties' Joint Motion Concerning Summary Judgment Materials Under Seal (Docket No. 249) is ALLOWED. Except for Exhibit 92 (Docket No. 207-18), all sealed documents are UNSEALED. By February 4, 2011, the parties shall file a redacted version ofExhibit 92 for the public record. 3. Plaintiffs' Partially Assented-To Motion for Reconsideration of Orders to File Summary Judgment Materials Under Seal (Docket No. 243) is MOOT. 4. The parties shall order the transcript of the January 7, 2011 hearing. 5. By January 26, 2011, the parties shall meet to discuss settlement and report whether they have agreed to settle this case. 6. Plaintiffs shall make the supplemental submission regarding summary judgment described herein above by February 4, 2011. Defendants shall respond by February 25, 2011. Plaintiffs shall file any reply by March 11, 2011. These submissions shall be made in the form required by Local Rule 56.1.7. A hearing on defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment will be held on March 23, 2011, at 2:00 p.m. Representatives of each party with full settlement authority shall attend. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-11651-MLW, 1:04-cv-11756-MLW(O'Leary, Dennis) (Entered: 01/11/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
        Letter/request (non-motion) from James S. Dittmar to Chief Judge Mark L. Wolf. (Dittmar, James) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
          Chief Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered. ( Status Report due by 5/14/2010.)Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-11651-MLW, 1:04-cv-11756-MLW(O'Leary, Dennis) (Entered: 04/01/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/11/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
            Chief Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Defendants' Motion to Stay Hearing on Motions for Summary Judgment Pending Decision by the Supreme Court in Jones v. Harris Associates, L.P. (Docket No. 200) is ALLOWED. 2. No later than 45 days after the Supreme Court decides Jones, the parties shall propose, jointly if possible, a schedule for further briefing of the pending motions or trial. 3. This case is otherwise STAYED.(O'Leary, Dennis) (Entered: 08/11/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
              Chief Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered. Based on the Joint Stipulation, dated March 23, 2009, it is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Plaintiffs shall have until April 10, 2009 to file an opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment. 2. Defendants shall have until May 11, 2009 to file a reply to Plaintiffs opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment.Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-11651-MLW, 1:04-cv-11756-MLW(O'Leary, Dennis) (Entered: 05/05/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document 69 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                Chief Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered. re (131 in 1:04-cv-11651-MLW) Objection, filed by Karen L. Magnan, Andrea M Phillips, Guy E. Miller, Michael F. Magnan, Cynthia Bennett, Presley C Phillips, Cindy Schurgin, Nancy Haugen, (133 in 1:04-cv-11651-MLW) Objection, filed by Gilliam Plaintiffs, Karen L. Magnan, Andrea M Phillips, William S. Stavropoulos, James Gilliam, and others, Guy E. Miller, Michael F. Magnan, Cindy Schurgin, Presley C Phillips, Cynthia Bennett, Haugen Plaintiffs, Nancy Haugen Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-11651-MLW, 1:04-cv-11756-MLW(O'Leary, Dennis)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                  Chief Judge Mark L. Wolf: Electronic ORDER entered granting (139) Motion for Leave to File; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. in case 1:04-cv-11651-MLW Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-11651-MLW, 1:04-cv-11756-MLW(O'Leary, Dennis)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: 1/31/2008 Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge
                    Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Boyce, Kathy)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 10/5/2006, Entered: 10/5/2006 Order on Motion to Continue
                      Judge Mark L. Wolf : Electronic ORDER entered finding as moot [68] Motion to Continue (O'Leary, Dennis)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 68 Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: 8/4/2006, Terminated: 10/5/2006 Motion to Continue
                        Joint MOTION to Continue Status Conference to September 19, 2006 by all parties.(Dittmar, James)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 7/27/2006, Entered: 7/27/2006 Notice of Hearing.
                          ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 8/7/2006 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Duffy, Marc)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 1/15/2006, Entered: 1/15/2006 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                            Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Electronic ORDER entered granting [67] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Bowler, Marianne)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 67 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: 1/13/2006 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Guy M. Burns, Becky Ferrell-Anton, Jonathan S. Coleman and Audrey B. Rauchway Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 69565. by James Gilliam, and others, Gilliam Plaintiffs, Nancy Haugen, Michael F. Magnan, Karen L. Magnan, Cindy Schurgin, Andrea M Phillips, Presley C Phillips, Rose M Iannaccone. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Good Standing of Guy M. Burns)(Boyce, Kathy) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/13/2006 (Boyce, Kathy). Additional attachment(s) added on 1/13/2006 (Boyce, Kathy).
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 66 Filed: 12/29/2005, Entered: 12/29/2005 Notice regarding mandatory use of ECF
                                NOTICE issued to Attorney Tana Lin regarding mandatory use of ECF in compliance with Local Rule 5.4. Failure to comply may result in the imposition of sanctions. (Boyce, Kathy)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 65 Filed: 10/28/2005, Entered: 11/1/2005 Order consolidating casesCourt Filing
                                  Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ORDER consolidating cases.(Filo, Jennifer)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/28/2005, Entered: 1/5/2006 Terminated Case
                                    Civil Case Terminated. See order [65] consolidating case with 04cv11651MLW. (Filo, Jennifer)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: 8/22/2005 Order on Motion to Intervene
                                      Judge Mark L. Wolf : Electronic ORDER entered finding as moot [45] Motion to Intervene (O'Leary, Dennis)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 64 Filed: 6/10/2005, Entered: 6/10/2005 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FMR Co., Inc., Fidelity Management & Research Company. (Dittmar, James)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/3/2005, Entered: 5/3/2005 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                                          Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Electronic ORDER entered granting [41] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting [49] Motion for Leave to File; granting [50] Motion for Leave to File; denying [53] Motion to Strike; denying [54] Motion to Strike; granting [55] Motion for Leave to File; denying [57] Motion to Strike; denying [58] Motion to Strike and granting [59] Motion for Leave to File. (Bowler, Marianne)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/30/2005, Entered: 3/30/2005 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                                            Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Electronic ORDER entered granting [63] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Bowler, Marianne)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 63 Filed: 3/29/2005, Entered: 3/29/2005, Terminated: 3/30/2005 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Tana Lin by Nancy Haugen, Michael F. Magnan, Karen L. Magnan, Cindy Schurgin, Andrea M Phillips, Presley C Phillips, Rose M Iannaccone. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Hess-Mahan, Theodore)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/10/2005, Entered: 3/11/2005 Hearing (Other)
                                                Electronic clerk's notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Motion hearing held on 3/10/2005; Motion Hearing was held on the motions filed in CA 04-11600-NG; Motion to Consolidate Cases filed by James Gilliam, and others, Motion for Appointment of Tri-Lead COunsel and Appointment of Liaison Counsel filed by James Gilliam, and others, and Motion to Consolidate Cases And Severance Of Claims, Memorandum, And Request For Oral Argument filed by Fidelity Distributors Corporation,, Fidelity Management & Research Company,, FMR Corporation,, FMR Company, Incorporated,, Edward C. Johnson, III, Abigail P. Johnson,, Edward C. Johnson, IV, Elizabeth L. Johnson,, Peter S. Lynch,, Laura B. Cronin,, Robert L. Reynolds,, Robert C. Pozen,and J. Gary Burkhead; The court hears the argument on the motions as well as 04-11642, 04-11651, 04-11709, 04-11735, 04-11756 and 04-11812 and argument on the related motions; The court takes docket entries [2], [6] and [70] for CA 04-11600-NG under advisement and will make rulings on the related motions accordingly.(Court Reporter James Gibbons.) (Saccoccio, Dianalynn
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/23/2005, Entered: 2/23/2005 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                  NOTICE of Hearing; [38] NOTICE by Nancy Haugen, Rose M Iannaccone, Karen L. Magnan, Michael F. Magnan, Andrea M Phillips, Presley C Phillips, Cindy Schurgin of Pending Motions in Related Cases: Plaintiffs' Motion for Appointment of Tri-Lead Counsel and Appointment of Liaison Counsel and Motion for Consolidation, [49] MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Tri-Lead Counsel and Liaison Counsel and Plaintiffs' Motion for Consolidation, [50] MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Motions for Consolidation and Appointment of Tri-Lead and Liason Counsel, [53] MOTION to Strike The Haugen Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply and the Haugen Plaintiffs' [Proposed] Sur-Reply in Opposition to Motions for Consolidation and Appointment of Tri-Lead and Liaison Counsel, [54] MOTION to Strike The Fidelity Defendants' Motion for Consolidation and Severance of Claims, [55] MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Motion for Consolidation, [57] MOTION to Strike [55] MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Motion for Consolidation (filed by the Bennett Plaintiffs), [58] MOTION to Strike the Independent Trustee Defendants' Submission in Support of Fidelity Defendants' Motion for Consolidation and Severance of Claims and [59] MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority; Motion hearing set for 3/10/2005 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 17 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Saccoccio, Dianalynn)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 62 Filed: 2/17/2005, Entered: 2/17/2005 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                    Judge Mark L. Wolf : ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler Referred for: Motion to Consolidate(O'Leary, Dennis)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 61 Filed: 1/24/2005, Entered: 1/24/2005 Opposition to Motion
                                                      Opposition re [57] MOTION to Strike [55] MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Motion for Consolidation (filed by the Bennett Plaintiffs) filed by Bennett Plaintiffs. (Davis, Sara)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 60 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: 1/21/2005 Opposition to Motion
                                                        Opposition re [59] MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority of The Haugen Plaintiffs filed by Gilliam Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Opinion attached)(Gans, Nancy)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 59 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/18/2005, Terminated: 5/3/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority by Nancy Haugen, Michael F. Magnan, Karen L. Magnan, Cindy Schurgin, Andrea M Phillips, Presley C Phillips, Rose M Iannaccone. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2 (Part 1)# (3) Exhibit 2 (Part 2)# (4) Exhibit 3)(Blauner, Michelle)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 58 Filed: 1/13/2005, Entered: 1/13/2005, Terminated: 5/3/2005 Motion to Strike
                                                          MOTION to Strike the Independent Trustee Defendants' Submission in Support of Fidelity Defendants' Motion for Consolidation and Severance of Claims by Gilliam Plaintiffs.(Gans, Nancy)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 57 Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: 1/10/2005, Terminated: 5/3/2005 Motion to Strike
                                                            MOTION to Strike [55] MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Motion for Consolidation (filed by the Bennett Plaintiffs) by Gilliam Plaintiffs.(Gans, Nancy)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 56 Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: 1/5/2005 Opposition to Motion
                                                              Opposition re [53] MOTION to Strike The Haugen Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply and the Haugen Plaintiffs' [Proposed] Sur-Reply in Opposition to Motions for Consolidation and Appointment of Tri-Lead and Liaison Counsel filed by Nancy Haugen, Michael F. Magnan, Karen L. Magnan, Cindy Schurgin, Andrea M Phillips, Presley C Phillips, Rose M Iannaccone. (Blauner, Michelle)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 55 Filed: 12/27/2004, Entered: 12/27/2004, Terminated: 5/3/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Motion for Consolidation by Bennett Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Proposed Surreply)(Tuttle, Matthew)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 54 Filed: 12/23/2004, Entered: 12/23/2004, Terminated: 5/3/2005 Motion to Strike
                                                                  MOTION to Strike The Fidelity Defendants' Motion for Consolidation and Severance of Claims by Gilliam Plaintiffs.(Gans, Nancy)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 53 Filed: 12/23/2004, Entered: 12/23/2004, Terminated: 5/3/2005 Motion to Strike
                                                                    MOTION to Strike The Haugen Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply and the Haugen Plaintiffs' [Proposed] Sur-Reply in Opposition to Motions for Consolidation and Appointment of Tri-Lead and Liaison Counsel by Gilliam Plaintiffs.(Gans, Nancy)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 52 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: 12/22/2004 Opposition to Motion
                                                                      Opposition re [45] MOTION to Intervene and to Stay All Proceedings filed by Bennett Plaintiffs. (Davis, Sara)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 51 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: 12/22/2004 Opposition to Motion
                                                                        Opposition re [45] MOTION to Intervene and to Stay All Proceedings filed by Nancy Haugen, Rose M Iannaccone, Karen L. Magnan, Michael F. Magnan, Andrea M Phillips, Presley C Phillips, Cindy Schurgin. (Blauner, Michelle)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 50 Filed: 12/20/2004, Entered: 12/20/2004, Terminated: 5/3/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Motions for Consolidation and Appointment of Tri-Lead and Liason Counsel by Nancy Haugen. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Sur-Reply# (2) Exhibit 1 to Proposed Sur-Reply)(Blauner, Michelle)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 49 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: 12/15/2004, Terminated: 5/3/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Tri-Lead Counsel and Liaison Counsel and Plaintiffs' Motion for Consolidation by Gilliam Plaintiffs.(Gans, Nancy)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 48 Filed: 12/8/2004, Entered: 12/15/2004 Notice of Change of Address or Firm Name
                                                                            NOTICE of Change of Address by Guy M Burns, FILED, c/s. (Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 47 Filed: 12/8/2004, Entered: 12/8/2004 Proposed Document(s) submitted
                                                                              Proposed Document(s) submitted by Gilliam Plaintiffs. Document received: [Proposed] Order Granting Intervention and Staying All Proceedings. (Gans, Nancy)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 46 Filed: 12/8/2004, Entered: 12/8/2004 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re [45] MOTION to Intervene and to Stay All Proceedings filed by Gilliam Plaintiffs. (Gans, Nancy)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 45 Filed: 12/8/2004, Entered: 12/8/2004, Terminated: 8/22/2005 Motion to Intervene
                                                                                  MOTION to Intervene and to Stay All Proceedings by Gilliam Plaintiffs.(Gans, Nancy)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 44 Filed: 12/2/2004, Entered: 12/2/2004 Memorandum of Law
                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW by James Gilliam, and others to [38] Notice (Other), Notice (Other). (Gans, Nancy)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 43 Filed: 11/30/2004, Entered: 11/30/2004 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                      Letter/request (non-motion) from Sandra Sue McQuay. (McQuay, Sandra)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 42 Filed: 11/30/2004, Entered: 11/30/2004 Response
                                                                                        Response by William S. Stavropoulos, Gerald C. McDonough, William O. McCoy, Marvin L. Mann, Ned C. Lautenbach, Marie L. Knowles, Donald J. Kirk, George H. Heilmeier, Robert M. Gates, Ralph F. Cox, J. Michael Cook to Notice of Pending Motions in Related Cases. (McQuay, Sandra)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 41 Filed: 11/29/2004, Entered: 11/29/2004, Terminated: 5/3/2005 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by James N. Benedict, Thomas A. Arena, Sean M. Murphy, C. Neil Gray, and L. Anthony Pellegrino by FMR Co., Inc., Fidelity Management & Research Company. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibits A-E, Certificates of James N. Benedict, Thomas A. Arena, Sean M. Murphy, C. Neil Gray, and L. Anthony Pellegrino)(Dittmar, James)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 40 Filed: 11/29/2004, Entered: 11/29/2004 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                            Letter/request (non-motion) from Michelle H. Blauner Responding to NOTICE by James Gilliam, and others of Pending Motions in Related Cases: Plaintiffs' Motion for Appointment of Tri-Lead Counsel and Appointment of Liaison Counsel and Motion for Consolidation. (Blauner, Michelle)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 39 Filed: 11/19/2004, Entered: 11/19/2004 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                              Letter/request (non-motion) from James S. Dittmar. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment - Response To Notice Of Pending Motions)(Dittmar, James)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 38 Filed: 11/17/2004, Entered: 11/17/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                NOTICE by Nancy Haugen, Rose M Iannaccone, Karen L. Magnan, Michael F. Magnan, Andrea M Phillips, Presley C Phillips, Cindy Schurgin of Pending Motions in Related Cases: Plaintiffs' Motion for Appointment of Tri-Lead Counsel and Appointment of Liaison Counsel and Motion for Consolidation (Gans, Nancy)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                  Legal Document 37 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: 11/8/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Beth Abbott on behalf of Fidelity Funds (Abbott, Amy Beth)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 36 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: 11/8/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by William Shaw McDermott on behalf of Fidelity Funds (McDermott, William)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 35 Filed: 10/7/2004, Entered: 10/7/2004 Answer
                                                                                                      Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by FMR Co., Inc., Fidelity Management & Research Company.(Dittmar, James)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 34 Filed: 10/7/2004, Entered: 10/7/2004 Memorandum of Law
                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Cindy Schurgin, Andrea M Phillips, Presley C Phillips, Rose M Iannaccone, Nancy Haugen, Karen L. Magnan, Michael F. Magnan. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Blauner, Michelle)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/23/2004, Entered: 9/23/2004 Add and Terminate Judges
                                                                                                        Judge Mark L. Wolf added. Judge Richard G. Stearns no longer assigned to case. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 9/22/2004, Entered: 9/22/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                          Judge Richard G. Stearns : Electronic ORDER entered granting [33] Motion for Extension of Time (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 33 Filed: 9/15/2004, Entered: 9/15/2004, Terminated: 9/22/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to 10/7/2004 to To Respond to Motions to Consolidate and for Appointment of Lead Counsel by Nancy Haugen, Karen L. Magnan, Michael F. Magnan.(Blauner, Michelle)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/13/2004, Entered: 9/13/2004 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                              Judge Richard G. Stearns : Electronic ORDER entered granting [32] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Lynn Lincoln Sarko for Michael F. Magnan; Nancy Haugen and Karen L. Magnan, Michael D. Woerner for Michael F. Magnan; Nancy Haugen and Karen L. Magnan, Gretchen F. Cappio for Michael F. Magnan; Nancy Haugen and Karen L. Magnan (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 31 Filed: 9/8/2004, Entered: 9/8/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle H. Blauner on behalf of Nancy Haugen, Karen L. Magnan, Michael F. Magnan (Blauner, Michelle)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/8/2004, Entered: 9/8/2004 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                  Case reassigned to Judge Richard G. Stearns. Judge Mark L. Wolf no longer assigned to the case. Counsel are directed to the Court's Standing Orders re: Electronic Case Filing. (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 32 Filed: 9/7/2004, Entered: 9/10/2004 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lynn Sarko, Michael Woerner and Gretchen Cappio Filing fee $ 150.00, receipt number 321 58491. by Nancy Haugen, Karen L. Magnan, Michael F. Magnan, FILED.(Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/31/2004, Entered: 8/31/2004 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                      Judge Mark L. Wolf : Electronic ORDER entered granting [26] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Michael J. Brickman for Michael F. Magnan; Nancy Haugen and Karen L. Magnan, James C Bradley for Michael F. Magnan; Nancy Haugen and Karen L. Magnan, Nina H. Fields for Michael F. Magnan; Nancy Haugen and Karen L. Magnan (O'Leary, Dennis)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 30 Filed: 8/26/2004, Entered: 8/30/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by James S. Dittmar on behalf of Fidelity Management & Research Company, FILED, c/s. (Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 29 Filed: 8/24/2004, Entered: 8/30/2004 Declaration
                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Nina Fields re [26] MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael Brickman, James C. Bradley and Nina H. Fields Filing fee $ 150.00, receipt number 58173. by Nancy Haugen, Karen L. Magnan, Michael F. Magnan, FILED. (Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 28 Filed: 8/24/2004, Entered: 8/30/2004 Declaration
                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of James C. Bradley re [26] MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael Brickman, James C. Bradley and Nina H. Fields Filing fee $ 150.00, receipt number 58173. by Nancy Haugen, Karen L. Magnan, Michael F. Magnan, FILED. (Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 27 Filed: 8/24/2004, Entered: 8/30/2004 Declaration
                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Michale Brickman re [26] MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael Brickman, James C. Bradley and Nina H. Fields Filing fee $ 150.00, receipt number 58173. by Nancy Haugen, Karen L. Magnan, Michael F. Magnan, FILED, c/s. (Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 26 Filed: 8/24/2004, Entered: 8/30/2004 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael Brickman, James C. Bradley and Nina H. Fields Filing fee $ 150.00, receipt number 58173. by Nancy Haugen, Karen L. Magnan, Michael F. Magnan, FILED, c/s.(Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 25 Filed: 8/20/2004, Entered: 8/20/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore M. Hess-Mahan on behalf of all plaintiffs (Hess-Mahan, Theodore)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 24 Filed: 8/10/2004, Entered: 8/12/2004 Case Transferred In - District Transfer
                                                                                                                                    Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 04-0916-PHX-FJM. Original file with documents numbered 1-23, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/10/2004, Entered: 9/1/2004 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                                                                                                                      If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Alexander (Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 288 times.

                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?