McNally et al v. Mac's Contracting Co., Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-11775-JLT

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo James Jr. Merloni, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Martin F. Walsh, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Paul J McNally, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
v.
No Logo Mac's Contracting Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo Eastern Bank, Trustee
Office Boston
Filed 8/13/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Middlesex
Terminated 6/27/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 18 Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: 6/27/2005 Settlement Order of DismissalCourt Filing
Judge Joseph L. Tauro : Electronic ORDER entered. SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL (Lovett, Zita)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: 6/27/2005 Terminated Case
    Civil Case Terminated. (Lovett, Zita)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 5/10/2005, Entered: 5/10/2005 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
      Judge Joseph L. Tauro : Electronic ORDER entered granting [13] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney., granting [14] Motion to Seal, denying as moot [17] Motion to Stay (Abaid, Kim)
        LREF
        Legal Document 17 Filed: 5/3/2005, Entered: 5/3/2005, Terminated: 5/10/2005 Motion to Stay
        Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Paul J McNally, James Jr. Merloni, Martin F. Walsh.(Sills, Anne)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: 4/28/2005 Notice Resetting/Cancelling Deadline
          Notice Resetting Hearing. Scheduling Conference rescheduled to May 10, 2005 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 20 before Judge Joseph L. Tauro. (Abaid, Kim)
            LREF
            Legal Document 16 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: 5/2/2005 Affidavit in Support
            AFFIDAVIT in Support re [14] MOTION to Impound Affidavit. (Abaid, Kim)
              LREF
              Legal Document 15 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: 5/2/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
              MEMORANDUM in Support re [14] MOTION to Impound Affidavit filed by Peabody Construction Company. (Abaid, Kim)
                LREF
                Legal Document 14 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: 5/2/2005 Motion to Seal
                MOTION to Impound Affidavit of John J. Mcnamara by Peabody Construction Company.(Abaid, Kim)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 13 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: 5/2/2005 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                  MOTION for Leave to Withdraw as Attorney by Peabody Construction Company.(Abaid, Kim)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 12 Filed: 3/24/2005, Entered: 3/24/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                    Judge Joseph L. Tauro : RULE 26 DISCOVERY ORDER entered. (Abaid, Kim)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/24/2005, Entered: 3/24/2005 Notice of Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                      NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 5/3/2005 10:15 AM in Courtroom 20 before Judge Joseph L. Tauro. (Abaid, Kim)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 10 Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: 2/28/2005 Answer to Amended Complaint
                        ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Peabody Construction Company.(Abaid, Kim)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 9 Filed: 2/16/2005, Entered: 2/16/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                          SUMMONS Returned Executed Mac's Contracting Co., Inc. served on 2/12/2005, answer due 3/4/2005. (Geiman, Gregory)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 8 Filed: 2/11/2005, Entered: 2/11/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                            SUMMONS Returned Executed Peabody Construction Company served on 2/4/2005, answer due 2/24/2005. (Geiman, Gregory)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 7 Filed: 1/20/2005, Entered: 1/20/2005 Amended Complaint
                              AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Paul J McNally, James Jr. Merloni, Martin F. Walsh. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit Exhibit B)(Sills, Anne)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 10/13/2004, Entered: 10/18/2004 Order
                              Judge Joseph L. Tauro : Electronic ORDER entered denying [2] Sealed Motion. (Abaid, Kim)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 6 Filed: 10/6/2004, Entered: 10/7/2004 Sealed Document +
                                SEALED DOCUMENT - Affidavit of Anne R. Sills - placed in secure file room.. (Abaid, Kim)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 5 Filed: 10/6/2004, Entered: 10/7/2004 Sealed Document +
                                  SEALED DOCUMENT - Affidavit of Philip Mackay - placed in secure file room.. (Abaid, Kim)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 10/6/2004, Entered: 10/7/2004 Sealed Document +
                                    SEALED DOCUMENT - Certificate - placed in secure file room.. (Abaid, Kim)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 3 Filed: 10/6/2004, Entered: 10/7/2004 Sealed Document +
                                      SEALED DOCUMENT - Memorandum in Support - placed in secure file room.. (Abaid, Kim)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 10/6/2004, Entered: 10/7/2004 Sealed Document +
                                        SEALED DOCUMENT - EX Parte Motion - placed in secure file room. (Abaid, Kim)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/13/2004, Entered: 8/16/2004 Complaint
                                          COMPLAINT Filing fee: $ 150, receipt number 57972, filed by Paul J McNally, James Jr. Merloni, Martin F. Walsh.(Abaid, Kim)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/13/2004, Entered: 8/16/2004 Summons Issued
                                            Summons Issued as to Eastern Bank, Mac's Contracting Co., Inc.. (Abaid, Kim)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/13/2004, Entered: 8/16/2004 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                              If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Cohen. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 35 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?