J & J Sports Productions Inc v. Leticia Ayala
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:14-cv-07005

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 5, 2018 at 7:39 AM DT (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 47 U.S.C. § 521
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Satisfaction of Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: None Attorney Fees
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      JUDGMENT by Judge William D. Keller. Judgment is hereby entered in favor of plaintiff J & J Sports Productions, Inc. and against defendants Leticia Ayala, individually and doing business as Mariscos Los Kabos and Oscar Ayala, individually and d oing business as Mariscos Los Kabos upon the Court's grant of summary judgment in favor of plaintiff 36 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND ADJUDGED: Defendants shall pay the plaintiff $6,600.00 in total total damages. damages. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (lom)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None Mediation Report (ADR-3) Unable to Reach Agreement
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None Notice of Mediation Date (ADR-13)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None Notice of Mediation Date (ADR-13)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None More Definite Statement
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Response
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Clerk to Enter Default
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?