J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Jaculito Lopez, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-08877

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 13, 2018 at 3:24 PM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 47 U.S.C. § 521
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: None Alter Judgment
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        JUDGMENT by Judge William D. Keller. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND ADJUDGED:1. Defendant Jaculito Lopez, Inc., an unknown business entitydoing business as Mi Jacalito Restaurant, shall pay the plaintiff, J & J SportsProductions, Inc., $5,500.00 in t otal damages. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Plaintiff shall serve, by United States mail or by telefax or by email, copies of this Judgment on counsel for the defendant or the pro se defendant in this matter. Related to: MOTION for Summary Judgment 23 (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (jre)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None Affidavit
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None Mediation Report (ADR-3) Unable to Reach Agreement
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None Notice of Mediation Date (ADR-13)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None Order
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 0 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?