EJIKEME v. MUELLER
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Western District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-00008

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 14, 2019 at 10:17 PM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Appeal In Forma Pauperis
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Withdraw
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None Appeal In Forma Pauperis
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            MEMORANDUM resolving 1 plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 11/9/15. (mwm)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None Appoint Counsel
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 8 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?