COOK v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:13-cv-00523
District Judge Margaret M. Sweeney, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 21, 2016 at 7:27 PM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo RONALD C. COOK, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by National Veterans Legal Services Program

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/15/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY Thomas Alan Moore +1 202 621 5687 +1 202 328 0063 thomas_moore@nvlsp.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul Hastings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lee F Berger +1 415 856 7000 +1 415 856 7100 leeberger@paulhastings.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas Glenn Edelschick +1 202 353 9303 +1 202 353 7988 douglas.edelschick@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 29 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. Reply due by 1/23/2015. Signed by Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. (kb1) (Entered: 01/07/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None
    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 01-23-2015 to File Reply as to 23 Response to Motion, , filed by RONALD C. COOK.Response due by 1/26/2015.(Berger, Lee) (Entered: 01/07/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 28 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None
      REPLY to Response to Motion re 20 Corrected MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and (6) Corrected MOTION for Judgment on the Administrative Record (Filed to correct minor typographical errors in Docket No. 17, filed with the consent of plaintiff's counsel), 17 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and (6) MOTION for Judgment on the Administrative Record and Accompanying Appendix , filed by USA. (Edelschick, Douglas) (Entered: 12/18/2014)
        LREF
        Blank 27 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER finding as moot 25 Motion for Extension of Time and granting 26 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's Reply and Response due by 12/19/2014. Plaintiff's Reply due by 1/9/2015. Signed by Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. (kb1) (Entered: 11/07/2014)
          LREF
          Blank 26 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None
          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/19/2014 to File Reply and Response Brief (Corrected Version), filed by USA.Response due by 11/24/2014.(Edelschick, Douglas) (Entered: 11/07/2014)
            LREF
            Blank 25 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None
            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/19/2014 to File Reply and Response Brief, filed by USA.Response due by 11/24/2014.(Edelschick, Douglas) (Entered: 11/07/2014)
              LREF
              Blank 24 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None
              RESPONSE to 20 Corrected MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and (6) Corrected MOTION for Judgment on the Administrative Record (Filed to correct minor typographical errors in Docket No. 17, filed with the consent of plaintiff's counsel) and Cross-Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record (Filed to correct minor typographical errors in Docket No. 23, filed with the consent of defendant's counsel), filed by RONALD C. COOK.Reply due by 10/31/2014. (Berger, Lee) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None
                RESPONSE to 20 Corrected MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and (6) Corrected MOTION for Judgment on the Administrative Record (Filed to correct minor typographical errors in Docket No. 17, filed with the consent of plaintiff's counsel) and Cross-Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by All Plaintiffs.Reply due by 10/27/2014. (Berger, Lee) (Entered: 10/17/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER granting 21 Motion to Amend Schedule. Plaintiff's Response and Cross-Motion due by 10/17/2014. Defendant's Reply and Response due by 11/7/2014. Plaintiff's Reply due by 11/28/2014. Signed by Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. (kb1) (Entered: 09/24/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 21 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None
                    Consent MOTION to Amend Schedule re: 19 Order on Motion to Amend Schedule,, filed by RONALD C. COOK.Response due by 10/10/2014.(Berger, Lee) (Entered: 09/23/2014)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None
                      Corrected MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and (6) (Response due by 10/14/2014.), Corrected MOTION for Judgment on the Administrative Record (Filed to correct minor typographical errors in Docket No. 17, filed with the consent of plaintiff's counsel), filed by USA.(Edelschick, Douglas) (Entered: 09/11/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER granting 18 Motion to Amend Schedule. Plaintiff's Response and Cross-Motion due by 9/26/2014. Defendant's Reply and Response due by 10/17/2014. Plaintiff's Reply due by 11/7/2014. Signed by Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. (kb1) (Entered: 08/29/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: None
                          Consent MOTION to Amend Schedule re: 16 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, filed by RONALD C. COOK.Response due by 9/15/2014.(Berger, Lee) (Entered: 08/28/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None
                            MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and (6) (Response due by 8/18/2014.), MOTION for Judgment on the Administrative Record and Accompanying Appendix, filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Edelschick, Douglas) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                              ORDER granting 15 Motion to Amend Briefing Schedule. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record due by 7/18/2014. Plaintiff's Response and Cross-Motion due by 9/5/2014. Defendant's Reply and Response due by 9/26/2014. Plaintiff's Reply due by 10/17/2014. (kb1) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                                Consent MOTION Consent Motion to Alter Schedule re 11 Scheduling Order, Order Lifting Stay,, and Proposed Order, filed by RONALD C. COOK.Response due by 7/14/2014.(Berger, Lee) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None
                                  ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD , filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 AR Vol. I - 1 of 3, # 2 AR Vol. I - 2 of 3, # 3 AR Vol. I - 3 of 3, # 4 AR Vol. II - 1 of 6, # 5 AR Vol. II - 2 of 6, # 6 AR Vol. II - 3 of 6, # 7 AR Vol. II - 4 of 6, # 8 AR Vol. II - 5 of 6, # 9 AR Vol. II - 6 of 6)(Edelschick, Douglas) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                                    Consented MOTION to Substitute Attorney Lee F. Berger in place of Thomas A. Moore , filed by RONALD C. COOK.(Berger, Lee) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT against USA, filed by RONALD C. COOK. . (Moore, Thomas) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER LIFTING STAY; SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Complaint due by 5/9/2014. Administrative Record due by 6/6/2014. Motion to Dismiss due by 6/27/2014. Response due by 7/17/2014. Reply due by 8/1/2014. Signed by Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. (kb1) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                          JOINT STATUS REPORT , filed by RONALD C. COOK. (Moore, Thomas) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER CONTINUING STAY. If the board rules on plaintiff's application before the stay expires, the parties shall file a joint status report suggesting further proceedings within two weeks of plaintiff's receipt of the board's decision. Otherwise, plaintiff shall file a status report by 9/25/2014. Signed by Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. (kb1) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
                                              STATUS REPORT , filed by RONALD C. COOK, filed by RONALD C. COOK.(Moore, Thomas) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER granting 6 Motion to Stay. Plaintiff's Status Report due by 3/25/2014. Signed by Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. (kb1) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings , filed by RONALD C. COOK.Response due by 10/15/2013.(Moore, Thomas) (Entered: 09/25/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Glenn Edelschick for USA . (Edelschick, Douglas) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (ac7) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. (ac7) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE of Directly Related Case(s) [08-899], filed by RONALD C. COOK. (ac7) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                            COMPLAINT against USA (ARM) (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 075378) (Copy Served Electronically on Department of Justice), filed by RONALD C. COOK.Answer due by 9/27/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ac7) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 239 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?