David Neto v. Takata Corporation et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-24446

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2017 at 12:03 AM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Amanda J. Revelia, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Motley Rice, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin R. Dean +1 843 216 9000 +1 843 216 9450 kdean@motleyrice.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jodi Westbrook Flowers +1 843 216 9000 +1 843 216 9450 jflowers@motleyrice.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph F. Rice +1 843 216 9000 +1 843 216 9450 jrice@motleyrice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schlesinger Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey L. Haberman +1 954 320 9507 +95320950 953 320 9509 JHaberman@schlesingerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sheldon J Schlesinger PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Robert Gdanski +1 954 320 9507 +1 954 320 9509 jonathan@schlesingerlawoffices.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott P. Schlesinger +1 954 467 8800 scott@schlesingerlaw.com
No Logo David Neto, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Motley Rice, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin R. Dean +1 843 216 9000 +1 843 216 9450 kdean@motleyrice.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jodi Westbrook Flowers +1 843 216 9000 +1 843 216 9450 jflowers@motleyrice.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph F. Rice +1 843 216 9000 +1 843 216 9450 jrice@motleyrice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schlesinger Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey L. Haberman +1 954 320 9507 +95320950 953 320 9509 JHaberman@schlesingerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sheldon J Schlesinger PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Robert Gdanski +1 954 320 9507 +1 954 320 9509 jonathan@schlesingerlawoffices.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott P. Schlesinger +1 954 467 8800 scott@schlesingerlaw.com
No Logo David W. Ellis, Sr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Motley Rice, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin R. Dean +1 843 216 9000 +1 843 216 9450 kdean@motleyrice.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jodi Westbrook Flowers +1 843 216 9000 +1 843 216 9450 jflowers@motleyrice.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph F. Rice +1 843 216 9000 +1 843 216 9450 jrice@motleyrice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schlesinger Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey L. Haberman +1 954 320 9507 +95320950 953 320 9509 JHaberman@schlesingerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sheldon J Schlesinger PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Robert Gdanski +1 954 320 9507 +1 954 320 9509 jonathan@schlesingerlawoffices.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott P. Schlesinger +1 954 467 8800 scott@schlesingerlaw.com
No Logo Howard G. Frey, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Motley Rice, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin R. Dean +1 843 216 9000 +1 843 216 9450 kdean@motleyrice.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jodi Westbrook Flowers +1 843 216 9000 +1 843 216 9450 jflowers@motleyrice.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph F. Rice +1 843 216 9000 +1 843 216 9450 jrice@motleyrice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schlesinger Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey L. Haberman +1 954 320 9507 +95320950 953 320 9509 JHaberman@schlesingerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sheldon J Schlesinger PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Robert Gdanski +1 954 320 9507 +1 954 320 9509 jonathan@schlesingerlawoffices.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott P. Schlesinger +1 954 467 8800 scott@schlesingerlaw.com
No Logo Macy A. Flett, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Motley Rice, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin R. Dean +1 843 216 9000 +1 843 216 9450 kdean@motleyrice.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jodi Westbrook Flowers +1 843 216 9000 +1 843 216 9450 jflowers@motleyrice.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph F. Rice +1 843 216 9000 +1 843 216 9450 jrice@motleyrice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schlesinger Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey L. Haberman +1 954 320 9507 +95320950 953 320 9509 JHaberman@schlesingerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sheldon J Schlesinger PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Robert Gdanski +1 954 320 9507 +1 954 320 9509 jonathan@schlesingerlawoffices.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott P. Schlesinger +1 954 467 8800 scott@schlesingerlaw.com
No Logo Margaret Bace, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Motley Rice, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin R. Dean +1 843 216 9000 +1 843 216 9450 kdean@motleyrice.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jodi Westbrook Flowers +1 843 216 9000 +1 843 216 9450 jflowers@motleyrice.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph F. Rice +1 843 216 9000 +1 843 216 9450 jrice@motleyrice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schlesinger Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey L. Haberman +1 954 320 9507 +95320950 953 320 9509 JHaberman@schlesingerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sheldon J Schlesinger PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Robert Gdanski +1 954 320 9507 +1 954 320 9509 jonathan@schlesingerlawoffices.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott P. Schlesinger +1 954 467 8800 scott@schlesingerlaw.com
No Logo Philip Bace, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Motley Rice, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin R. Dean +1 843 216 9000 +1 843 216 9450 kdean@motleyrice.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jodi Westbrook Flowers +1 843 216 9000 +1 843 216 9450 jflowers@motleyrice.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph F. Rice +1 843 216 9000 +1 843 216 9450 jrice@motleyrice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schlesinger Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey L. Haberman +1 954 320 9507 +95320950 953 320 9509 JHaberman@schlesingerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sheldon J Schlesinger PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Robert Gdanski +1 954 320 9507 +1 954 320 9509 jonathan@schlesingerlawoffices.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott P. Schlesinger +1 954 467 8800 scott@schlesingerlaw.com
No Logo Scott T. Strachan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Motley Rice, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin R. Dean +1 843 216 9000 +1 843 216 9450 kdean@motleyrice.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jodi Westbrook Flowers +1 843 216 9000 +1 843 216 9450 jflowers@motleyrice.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph F. Rice +1 843 216 9000 +1 843 216 9450 jrice@motleyrice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schlesinger Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey L. Haberman +1 954 320 9507 +95320950 953 320 9509 JHaberman@schlesingerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sheldon J Schlesinger PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Robert Gdanski +1 954 320 9507 +1 954 320 9509 jonathan@schlesingerlawoffices.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott P. Schlesinger +1 954 467 8800 scott@schlesingerlaw.com
v.
American Honda Motor Company, Inc. American Honda Motor Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "American Honda Motor Co., Inc."
Ford Motor Company Ford Motor Company, Defendant
Officer/Director, Gopivotal, Inc.
Officer/Director, Vastera, Inc.
No Logo Highland Industries, Inc., Defendant
Honda Motor Honda Motor, Defendant
Honda Motor Company, Ltd. Honda Motor Company, Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Honda Motor Co., Ltd."
No Logo Takata Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Tk Holdings Inc., Defendant
  Entries (36) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Granting (574) Motion for Modification of Orders Dismissing Case Without Prejudice in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM. The listed S.D. Fla cases are STAYED. All future pleadings shall be filed under both Master File No. 15-2599-MD-MORENO and either Case No. 14-24009-CIV-MORENO or Case No. 15-20664-CIV-MORENO. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 10/23/2015. (gp) (Entered: 10/26/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None MDL Order Dismissing Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
      NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 6/23/2015 08:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Federico A. Moreno. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/6/2015. This Document relates to: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, All Cases (gp) (Entered: 05/07/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
        NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE : Status Conference set in 1:15-md-02599-FAM for 5/1/2015 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Federico A. Moreno. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 4/15/2015. This Document relates to: All Cases, 1:15-md-02599-FAM (gp) (Entered: 04/16/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER APPOINTING MEDIATOR: Paul C. Huck Jr added. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/31/2015. {filed date: 03/31/2015 in Case 1:15-md-02599-FAM} (gp) (Entered: 04/08/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None
            NOTICE of FILING by John Delionado re 453 Order Referring Case to Special Master in Case 1:15-md-02599-FAM (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of John J. Delionado) {filed date: 03/25/2015 in Case 1:15-md-02599-FAM} (gp) (Entered: 04/08/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER SETTING FILING REQUIREMENT Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/20/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Order Setting Status Hearing) {filed date: 03/23/2015 in Case 1:15-md-02599-FAM} (gp) (Entered: 04/08/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None
                  JOINT REPORT on ORGANIZATION by American Honda Motor Co., Inc., BMW Manufacturing Co., LLC, BMW of North America, LLC, FCA US LLC, Ford Motor Company, Highland Industries, Inc., Honda of America Mfg., Inc., Mazda Motor of America, Inc., Nissan North America, Inc., Subaru of America, Inc., TK Holdings, Inc., Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. {filed date: 03/23/2015 in Case 1:15-md-02599-FAM} (gp) (Entered: 04/08/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None
                      MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from District of Southern Florida. Assigned Case Number 1:14-cv-24446-FAM with documents 1-25. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:15-md-02599-FAM. (gp) (Entered: 03/24/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None
                        WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Takata Corporation waiver sent on 1/23/2015, answer due 4/23/2015. (Haberman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/19/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None
                          WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. TK Holdings, Inc. waiver sent on 1/23/2015, answer due 3/24/2015. (Haberman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/19/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None
                            WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. American Honda Motor Co., Inc. waiver sent on 2/9/2015, answer due 4/10/2015. (Haberman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/19/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None
                              Clerks Notice to Filer re 19 Summons Returned Executed. Incorrect Service Date Entered; ERROR - The incorrect service date was entered. The correction was made by the Clerk and filing was re-docketed, see 21 . It is not necessary to refile this document. (asl) (Entered: 03/19/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None
                                SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on 4 Amended Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by All Plaintiffs. Ford Motor Company served on 3/5/2015, answer due 3/26/2015. (asl) (Entered: 03/19/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None
                                  WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Highland Industries, Inc. waiver sent on 2/2/2015, answer due 4/3/2015. (Haberman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/19/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None
                                    SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on 4 Amended Complaint with a 14 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15 by All Plaintiffs. All Plaintiffs served on 3/5/2015, answer due 3/19/2015. (Haberman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/19/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: None Order Reassigning/Transferring Case
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Gdanski on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney Jonathan Gdanski added to party All Plaintiffs(pty:pla). (Gdanski, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/12/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE by All Plaintiffs "Notice of Pending MDL Action and Request for Intra-District Transfer". Attorney Jeffrey Louis Haberman added to party All Plaintiffs(pty:pla). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A") (Haberman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/26/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ENDORSED ORDER granting 12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Kevin R. Dean may appear and participate in this action on behalf of Plaintiffs David Neto, David Ellis, Sr., Amanda Revelia, Scott Strachan, Howard G. Frey, Philip Bace, Margaret Bace and Macy A. Flett. The Clerk shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to Kevin R. Dean at kdean@motleyrice.com. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (alt) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ENDORSED ORDER granting 11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Joseph F. Rice may appear and participate in this action on behalf of Plaintiffs David Neto, David Ellis, Sr., Amanda Revelia, Scott Strachan, Howard G. Frey, Philip Bace, Margaret Bace and Macy A. Flett. The Clerk shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to Joseph F. Rice at jrice@motleyrice.com. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (alt) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ENDORSED ORDER granting 10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Jodi Westbrook Flowers may appear and participate in this action on behalf of Plaintiffs David Neto, David Ellis, Sr., Amanda Revelia, Scott Strachan, Howard G. Frey, Philip Bace, Margaret Bace and Macy A. Flett. The Clerk shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to Jodi Westbrook Flowers, at jflowers@motleyrice.com. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (alt) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None Order of Recusal
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                          Summons Issued as to American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Ford Motor Company, Highland Industries, Inc., Honda Motor Co., Ltd., TK Holdings, Inc., Takata Corporation. (asl) (Entered: 01/06/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Margaret Bace, Philip Bace, David Neto, David W. Ellis, Sr., Macy A. Flett, Howard G. Frey, Amanda J. Revelia, Scott T. Strachan re 4 Amended Complaint filed by Margaret Bace, Macy A. Flett, David Neto, Howard G. Frey, Amanda J. Revelia, Philip Bace, Scott T. Strachan, David W. Ellis, Sr. (Attachments: # 1 Summon(s)) (Haberman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/06/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                              Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 5 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney, 4 Amended Complaint into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Honda Motor Co., Ltd. and American Honda Motor Co., Inc.. (Haberman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                Clerks Notice to Filer re 4 Amended Complaint. Parties Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties (re: Honda Motor Co., Ltd. and American Honda Motor Co., Inc. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties and add the additional parties. (asl) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by David Neto, David W. Ellis, Sr., Howard G. Frey, Philip Bace, Amanda J. Revelia, Macy A. Flett, Scott T. Strachan, Margaret Bace.(Haberman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/19/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re 1 Complaint. See DE 2 for Judge Assignment. (vjk) (Entered: 11/21/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      Judge Assignment to Judge Joan A. Lenard (vjk) Modified case to add Judge Assignment on 11/21/2014 (vjk). (Entered: 11/21/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        COMPLAINT against HIGHLAND INDUSTRIES, INC., TK Holdings, Inc., Takata Corporation. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-7259447, filed by David Neto. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Haberman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/21/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                          Statistics

                                                                          This case has been viewed 63 times.

                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                          Space
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                           
                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                          Need Password Help?