William Bartel v. Alcoa Steamship Company, Inc., et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit, Case No. 15-30004

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 4, 2017 at 12:49 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3340 - Personal Injury: Marine
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503237434 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None
JUDGMENT ENTERED AND FILED. [15-30032] (JMA)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503237430 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None
    JUDGMENT ENTERED AND FILED. [15-30005] (JMA)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503237426 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None
      JUDGMENT ENTERED AND FILED. [15-30004] (JMA)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503237414 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
        PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [15-30004 Affirmed 15-30005 Affirmed 15-30032 Affirmed ] Judge: TMR , Judge: JWE , Judge: CH Mandate pull date is 11/09/2015 [15-30004, 15-30005, 15-30032] (JMA)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503214302 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None
          Attorney John Cardello is advised to resubmit appearance form. Reason: The submitted appearance form does not list the party represented. [15-30004, 15-30005, 15-30032] (MAS)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503210933 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: None
            APPELLANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF FILED. # of Copies Provided: 0. Miscellaneous deadline satisfied [15-30004, 15-30005, 15-30032]REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF FILED by Alcoa Steamship Company, Incorporated, Central Gulf Lines, Incorporated, Central Gulf Steamship Corporation, Chas. Kurz & Company, Crowley Marine Services, Incorporated, Crowley Maritime Corporation, Delta Steamship Lines, Incorporated, Empire Transport, Incorporated, Farrell Lines, Incorporated, James River Transport, Incorporated, Keystone Shipping Company, Marine Navigation Company, Marine Transport Lines, Incorporated, Matson Navigation Company, Incorporated, National Bulk Carriers, Incorporated, Ogden Leader Stransport, Incorporated, Pan Atlantic Steamship Company, Sea-Land Service, Incorporated, Wabash Transport, Incorporated and Waterman Steamship Corporation in 15-30004, American Export Isbrantsen, American Export Lines, Incorporated, American Trading & Production Corporation, American Trading Transportation Company, Central Gulf Lines, Incorporated, Chas. Kurz & Company, Farrell Lines, Incorporated and Trinidad Corporation in 15-30005, Rio Grande Transport, Incorporated, Sea-Land Service, Incorporated and Waterman Steamship Corporation in 15-30032. Date of service: 09/28/2015 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Barbier, Blanque, Bolles, LaVie; Attorney for Appellees: Anderman, Waddell [15-30004, 15-30005, 15-30032] (Kevin Jacob LaVie )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503208627 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None
              APPELLEE'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF FILED # of Copies Provided: 0 Miscellaneous deadline satisfied [15-30004, 15-30005, 15-30032]REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLEE'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF FILED by Mr. William E. Bartel in 15-30004, 15-30005, Mr. Lawrence Craig in 15-30032 Date of service: 09/25/2015 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Barbier, Blanque, Bolles, LaVie; Attorney for Appellees: Anderman, Waddell [15-30004, 15-30005, 15-30032] (Jody Edward Anderman )
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503199603 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None
                ORAL ARGUMENT panel has requested of the parties the following: letter briefs. Miscellaneous due by 5:00 pm on 09/25/2015 for Appellants Alcoa Steamship Company, Incorporated, American President Lines Limited, Central Gulf Lines, Incorporated, Central Gulf Steamship Corporation, Chas. Kurz & Company, Crowley Marine Services, Incorporated, Crowley Maritime Corporation, Delta Steamship Lines, Incorporated, Empire Transport, Incorporated, Farrell Lines, Incorporated, James River Transport, Incorporated, Keystone Shipping Company, Marine Navigation Company, Marine Transport Lines, Incorporated, Mathiasen Tanker Industry, Incorporated, Matson Navigation Company, Incorporated, National Bulk Carriers, Incorporated, Ogden Leader Stransport, Incorporated, Pan Atlantic Steamship Company, Sea-Land Service, Incorporated, Wabash Transport, Incorporated, Waterman Steamship Corporation, American Export Isbrantsen, American Export Lines, Incorporated, American Trading & Production Corporation, American Trading Transportation Company, Trinidad Corporation, American Overseas Marine Corporation and Rio Grande Transport, Incorporated and Appellees William E. Bartel and Lawrence Craig [15-30004, 15-30005, 15-30032] (SME)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503150146 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                  COURT ORDER DENYING motion for reconsideration filed by Appellants Marine Transport Lines, Incorporated, Farrell Lines, Incorporated, Central Gulf Steamship Corporation, Waterman Steamship Corporation, National Bulk Carriers, Incorporated, Keystone Shipping Company, Sea-Land Service, Incorporated, Crowley Marine Services, Incorporated, Central Gulf Lines, Incorporated, Alcoa Steamship Company, Incorporated, Delta Steamship Lines, Incorporated, Empire Transport, Incorporated, James River Transport, Incorporated, Chas. Kurz & Company, Marine Navigation Company, Crowley Maritime Corporation, Matson Navigation Company, Incorporated, Ogden Leader Stransport, Incorporated, Pan Atlantic Steamship Company and Wabash Transport, Incorporated, Appellants Farrell Lines, Incorporated, Trinidad Corporation, American Trading Transportation Company, Central Gulf Lines, Incorporated, American Export Isbrantsen, American Export Lines, Incorporated, Chas. Kurz & Company and American Trading & Production Corporation, Appellants Waterman Steamship Corporation, Sea-Land Service, Incorporated and Rio Grande Transport, Incorporated [7978539-2]; DENYING motion for clarification of the court's order, except that the Court clarifies that a merits panel of this Court will subsequently rule on whether to remand these cases to state court, filed by Appellants Marine Transport Lines, Incorporated, Farrell Lines, Incorporated, Central Gulf Steamship Corporation, Waterman Steamship Corporation, National Bulk Carriers, Incorporated, Keystone Shipping Company, Sea-Land Service, Incorporated, Crowley Marine Services, Incorporated, Central Gulf Lines, Incorporated, Alcoa Steamship Company, Incorporated, Delta Steamship Lines, Incorporated, Empire Transport, Incorporated, James River Transport, Incorporated, Chas. Kurz & Company, Marine Navigation Company, Crowley Maritime Corporation, Matson Navigation Company, Incorporated, Ogden Leader Stransport, Incorporated, Pan Atlantic Steamship Company and Wabash Transport, Incorporated, Appellants Farrell Lines, Incorporated, Trinidad Corporation, American Trading Transportation Company, Central Gulf Lines, Incorporated, American Export Isbrantsen, American Export Lines, Incorporated, Chas. Kurz & Company and American Trading & Production Corporation, Appellants Waterman Steamship Corporation, Sea-Land Service, Incorporated and Rio Grande Transport, Incorporated [7978539-3] Judge(s): WED, EBC and CH. (IN DETAIL) [15-30004, 15-30005, 15-30032] (DDV)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503145805 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None
                    CASE TENTATIVELY calendared for oral argument for the week of 10/05/2015. [15-30004, 15-30005, 15-30032] (GAM)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503143140 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None
                      OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants Alcoa Steamship Company, Incorporated, Central Gulf Lines, Incorporated, Central Gulf Steamship Corporation, Chas. Kurz & Company, Crowley Marine Services, Incorporated, Crowley Maritime Corporation, Delta Steamship Lines, Incorporated, Empire Transport, Incorporated, Farrell Lines, Incorporated, James River Transport, Incorporated, Keystone Shipping Company, Marine Navigation Company, Marine Transport Lines, Incorporated, Matson Navigation Company, Incorporated, National Bulk Carriers, Incorporated, Ogden Leader Stransport, Incorporated, Pan Atlantic Steamship Company, Sea-Land Service, Incorporated, Wabash Transport, Incorporated and Waterman Steamship Corporation in 15-30004, Appellants American Export Isbrantsen, American Export Lines, Incorporated, American Trading & Production Corporation, American Trading Transportation Company, Central Gulf Lines, Incorporated, Chas. Kurz & Company, Farrell Lines, Incorporated and Trinidad Corporation in 15-30005, Appellants Rio Grande Transport, Incorporated, Sea-Land Service, Incorporated and Waterman Steamship Corporation in 15-30032 for reconsideration of the Order dated 07/22/2015 [7978539-2], alternatively for clarification of the Order dated 07/22/2015. Date of service: 08/05/2015 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Barbier, Blanque, Bolles, LaVie; Attorney for Appellees: Anderman, Waddell [15-30004, 15-30005, 15-30032] (Meredith Wilson Blanque )
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503124685 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                        COURT ORDER granting opposed motion for partial dismissal of appeals filed by Appellee Mr. William E. Bartel, Appellee Mr. Lawrence Craig [7909231-2] as to Appellants American President Lines Limited and Mathiasen Tanker Industry, Incorporated in 15-30004, Appellants American President Lines Limited and Mathiasen Tanker Industry, Incorporated in 15-30005 and Appellant American Overseas Marine Corporation in 15-30032; denying alternative motion to vacate the remand orders from which the appeals were taken filed by Appellants Mathiasen Tanker Industry, Incorporated, Marine Transport Lines, Incorporated, Farrell Lines, Incorporated, Central Gulf Steamship Corporation, American President Lines Limited, Waterman Steamship Corporation, National Bulk Carriers, Incorporated, Keystone Shipping Company, Sea-Land Service, Incorporated, Crowley Marine Services, Incorporated, Central Gulf Lines, Incorporated, Alcoa Steamship Company, Incorporated, Delta Steamship Lines, Incorporated, Empire Transport, Incorporated, James River Transport, Incorporated, Chas. Kurz & Company, Marine Navigation Company, Crowley Maritime Corporation, Matson Navigation Company, Incorporated, Ogden Leader Stransport, Incorporated, Pan Atlantic Steamship Company and Wabash Transport, Incorporated, Appellants Mathiasen Tanker Industry, Incorporated, Farrell Lines, Incorporated, Trinidad Corporation, American President Lines Limited, American Trading Transportation Company, Central Gulf Lines, Incorporated, American Export Isbrantsen, American Export Lines, Incorporated, Chas. Kurz & Company and American Trading & Production Corporation, Appellants American Overseas Marine Corporation, Waterman Steamship Corporation, Sea-Land Service, Incorporated and Rio Grande Transport, Incorporated. [7919341-3] (IN DETAIL). Judge(s): WED, EBC and CH. [15-30004, 15-30005, 15-30032] (SEP)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503100354 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None
                          BRIEF MADE SUFFICIENT filed by Appellee Mr. William E. Bartel, Appellee Mr. Lawrence Craig in 15-30004, 15-30005, 15-30032 [7925977-2]. Sufficient Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 07/06/2015 for Appellees William E. Bartel and Lawrence Craig. [15-30004, 15-30005, 15-30032] (DDV)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503084871 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None
                            APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED # of Copies Provided: 0 Reply Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 06/29/2015 for Appellants Alcoa Steamship Company, Incorporated, American President Lines Limited, Central Gulf Lines, Incorporated, Central Gulf Steamship Corporation, Chas. Kurz & Company, Crowley Marine Services, Incorporated, Crowley Maritime Corporation, Delta Steamship Lines, Incorporated, Empire Transport, Incorporated, Farrell Lines, Incorporated, James River Transport, Incorporated, Keystone Shipping Company, Marine Navigation Company, Marine Transport Lines, Incorporated, Mathiasen Tanker Industry, Incorporated, Matson Navigation Company, Incorporated, National Bulk Carriers, Incorporated, Ogden Leader Stransport, Incorporated, Pan Atlantic Steamship Company, Sea-Land Service, Incorporated, Wabash Transport, Incorporated, Waterman Steamship Corporation, American Export Isbrantsen, American Export Lines, Incorporated, American Trading & Production Corporation, American Trading Transportation Company, Trinidad Corporation, American Overseas Marine Corporation and Rio Grande Transport, Incorporated. [15-30004, 15-30005, 15-30032]REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED by Alcoa Steamship Company, Incorporated, American President Lines Limited, Central Gulf Lines, Incorporated, Central Gulf Steamship Corporation, Chas. Kurz & Company, Crowley Marine Services, Incorporated, Crowley Maritime Corporation, Delta Steamship Lines, Incorporated, Empire Transport, Incorporated, Farrell Lines, Incorporated, James River Transport, Incorporated, Keystone Shipping Company, Marine Navigation Company, Marine Transport Lines, Incorporated, Mathiasen Tanker Industry, Incorporated, Matson Navigation Company, Incorporated, National Bulk Carriers, Incorporated, Ogden Leader Stransport, Incorporated, Pan Atlantic Steamship Company, Sea-Land Service, Incorporated, Wabash Transport, Incorporated and Waterman Steamship Corporation in 15-30004, American Export Isbrantsen, American Export Lines, Incorporated, American President Lines Limited, American Trading & Production Corporation, American Trading Transportation Company, Central Gulf Lines, Incorporated, Chas. Kurz & Company, Farrell Lines, Incorporated, Mathiasen Tanker Industry, Incorporated and Trinidad Corporation in 15-30005, American Overseas Marine Corporation, Rio Grande Transport, Incorporated, Sea-Land Service, Incorporated and Waterman Steamship Corporation in 15-30032 Date of service: 06/18/2015 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Barbier, Blanque, Bolles, LaVie; Attorney for Appellees: Anderman, Waddell; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Nicholson [15-30004, 15-30005, 15-30032] (Meredith Wilson Blanque )
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503071609 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None
                              DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the Appellees' Brief because it is a duplicate filing. The original brief was electronically filed on 6/1/2015. Counsel was instructed to email the corrected brief back to the clerk's office. [15-30004, 15-30005, 15-30032] (DDV)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503062101 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None
                                APPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED . Additionally the Brief requires TITLE DOES NOT AGREE WITH CASE CAPTION; MISSING STATEMENT REGARDING ORAL ARGUMENT; BRIEF CANNOT BE SCANNED. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0 E/Res's Brief deadline satisfied. Sufficient Brief due on 06/16/2015 for Appellees William E. Bartel and Lawrence Craig.. Reply Brief due on 06/18/2015 for Appellants Alcoa Steamship Company, Incorporated, American President Lines Limited, Central Gulf Lines, Incorporated, Central Gulf Steamship Corporation, Chas. Kurz & Company, Crowley Marine Services, Incorporated, Crowley Maritime Corporation, Delta Steamship Lines, Incorporated, Empire Transport, Incorporated, Farrell Lines, Incorporated, James River Transport, Incorporated, Keystone Shipping Company, Marine Navigation Company, Marine Transport Lines, Incorporated, Mathiasen Tanker Industry, Incorporated, Matson Navigation Company, Incorporated, National Bulk Carriers, Incorporated, Ogden Leader Stransport, Incorporated, Pan Atlantic Steamship Company, Sea-Land Service, Incorporated, Wabash Transport, Incorporated, Waterman Steamship Corporation, American Export Isbrantsen, American Export Lines, Incorporated, American Trading & Production Corporation, American Trading Transportation Company, Trinidad Corporation, American Overseas Marine Corporation and Rio Grande Transport, Incorporated [15-30004, 15-30005, 15-30032]REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLEE'S MEMORANDUM BRIEF FILED by Appellee Mr. William E. Bartel in 15-30004, 15-30005, Appellee Mr. Lawrence Craig in 15-30032. Date of service: 06/01/2015 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Barbier, Blanque, Bolles, LaVie; Attorney for Appellees: Anderman, Waddell; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Nicholson [15-30004, 15-30005, 15-30032] (Jody Edward Anderman )
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503052232 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None
                                  OPPOSED ALTERNATIVE MOTION to vacate the remand orders from which the appeals were taken [7919341-3] and INCORPORATED RESPONSE to the motion for partial dismissal of appeal filed by Appellee Mr. William E. Bartel, Appellee Mr. Lawrence Craig in 15-30004, 15-30005, 15-30032. [7909231-2] Date of service: 05/21/2015. Response/Opposition due on 06/04/2015. [15-30004, 15-30005, 15-30032] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by Alcoa Steamship Company, Incorporated, American President Lines Limited, Central Gulf Lines, Incorporated, Central Gulf Steamship Corporation, Chas. Kurz & Company, Crowley Marine Services, Incorporated, Crowley Maritime Corporation, Delta Steamship Lines, Incorporated, Empire Transport, Incorporated, Farrell Lines, Incorporated, James River Transport, Incorporated, Keystone Shipping Company, Marine Navigation Company, Marine Transport Lines, Incorporated, Mathiasen Tanker Industry, Incorporated, Matson Navigation Company, Incorporated, National Bulk Carriers, Incorporated, Ogden Leader Stransport, Incorporated, Pan Atlantic Steamship Company, Sea-Land Service, Incorporated, Wabash Transport, Incorporated and Waterman Steamship Corporation in 15-30004, American Export Isbrantsen, American Export Lines, Incorporated, American President Lines Limited, American Trading & Production Corporation, American Trading Transportation Company, Central Gulf Lines, Incorporated, Chas. Kurz & Company, Farrell Lines, Incorporated, Mathiasen Tanker Industry, Incorporated and Trinidad Corporation in 15-30005, American Overseas Marine Corporation, Rio Grande Transport, Incorporated, Sea-Land Service, Incorporated and Waterman Steamship Corporation in 15-30032 [7919341-1] to the motion for partial dismissal of appeal filed by Appellee Mr. William E. Bartel, Appellee Mr. Lawrence Craig in 15-30004, 15-30005, 15-30032 [7909231-2] Date of Service: 05/21/2015 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Barbier, Blanque, Bolles, LaVie; Attorney for Appellees: Anderman, Waddell; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Nicholson. [15-30004, 15-30005, 15-30032] (Meredith Wilson Blanque )
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503043840 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None
                                    RECORD EXCERPTS MADE SUFFICIENT filed by Appellants Mathiasen Tanker Industry, Incorporated, Marine Transport Lines, Incorporated, Farrell Lines, Incorporated, Central Gulf Steamship Corporation, American President Lines Limited, Waterman Steamship Corporation, National Bulk Carriers, Incorporated, Keystone Shipping Company, Sea-Land Service, Incorporated, Crowley Marine Services, Incorporated, Central Gulf Lines, Incorporated, Alcoa Steamship Company, Incorporated, Delta Steamship Lines, Incorporated, Empire Transport, Incorporated, James River Transport, Incorporated, Chas. Kurz & Company, Marine Navigation Company, Crowley Maritime Corporation, Matson Navigation Company, Incorporated, Ogden Leader Stransport, Incorporated, Pan Atlantic Steamship Company and Wabash Transport, Incorporated, Appellants Mathiasen Tanker Industry, Incorporated, Farrell Lines, Incorporated, Trinidad Corporation, American President Lines Limited, American Trading Transportation Company, Central Gulf Lines, Incorporated, American Export Isbrantsen, American Export Lines, Incorporated, Chas. Kurz & Company and American Trading & Production Corporation, Appellants American Overseas Marine Corporation, Waterman Steamship Corporation, Sea-Land Service, Incorporated and Rio Grande Transport, Incorporated in 15-30004, 15-30005, 15-30032 [7902719-2]. Sufficient Record Excerpts deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due on 05/19/2015 for Appellants Alcoa Steamship Company, Incorporated, American President Lines Limited, Central Gulf Lines, Incorporated, Central Gulf Steamship Corporation, Chas. Kurz & Company, Crowley Marine Services, Incorporated, Crowley Maritime Corporation, Delta Steamship Lines, Incorporated, Empire Transport, Incorporated, Farrell Lines, Incorporated, James River Transport, Incorporated, Keystone Shipping Company, Marine Navigation Company, Marine Transport Lines, Incorporated, Mathiasen Tanker Industry, Incorporated, Matson Navigation Company, Incorporated, National Bulk Carriers, Incorporated, Ogden Leader Stransport, Incorporated, Pan Atlantic Steamship Company, Sea-Land Service, Incorporated, Wabash Transport, Incorporated, Waterman Steamship Corporation, American Export Isbrantsen, American Export Lines, Incorporated, American Trading & Production Corporation, American Trading Transportation Company, Trinidad Corporation, American Overseas Marine Corporation and Rio Grande Transport, Incorporated. [15-30004, 15-30005, 15-30032] (DDV)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503043818 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None
                                      BRIEF MADE SUFFICIENT filed by Appellants Mathiasen Tanker Industry, Incorporated, Marine Transport Lines, Incorporated, Farrell Lines, Incorporated, Central Gulf Steamship Corporation, American President Lines Limited, Waterman Steamship Corporation, National Bulk Carriers, Incorporated, Keystone Shipping Company, Sea-Land Service, Incorporated, Crowley Marine Services, Incorporated, Central Gulf Lines, Incorporated, Alcoa Steamship Company, Incorporated, Delta Steamship Lines, Incorporated, Empire Transport, Incorporated, James River Transport, Incorporated, Chas. Kurz & Company, Marine Navigation Company, Crowley Maritime Corporation, Matson Navigation Company, Incorporated, Ogden Leader Stransport, Incorporated, Pan Atlantic Steamship Company and Wabash Transport, Incorporated, Appellants Mathiasen Tanker Industry, Incorporated, Farrell Lines, Incorporated, Trinidad Corporation, American President Lines Limited, American Trading Transportation Company, Central Gulf Lines, Incorporated, American Export Isbrantsen, American Export Lines, Incorporated, Chas. Kurz & Company and American Trading & Production Corporation, Appellants American Overseas Marine Corporation, Waterman Steamship Corporation, Sea-Land Service, Incorporated and Rio Grande Transport, Incorporated in 15-30004, 15-30005, 15-30032 [7902718-2]. Sufficient Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 05/19/2015 for Appellants Alcoa Steamship Company, Incorporated, American President Lines Limited, Central Gulf Lines, Incorporated, Central Gulf Steamship Corporation, Chas. Kurz & Company, Crowley Marine Services, Incorporated, Crowley Maritime Corporation, Delta Steamship Lines, Incorporated, Empire Transport, Incorporated, Farrell Lines, Incorporated, James River Transport, Incorporated, Keystone Shipping Company, Marine Navigation Company, Marine Transport Lines, Incorporated, Mathiasen Tanker Industry, Incorporated, Matson Navigation Company, Incorporated, National Bulk Carriers, Incorporated, Ogden Leader Stransport, Incorporated, Pan Atlantic Steamship Company, Sea-Land Service, Incorporated, Wabash Transport, Incorporated, Waterman Steamship Corporation, American Export Isbrantsen, American Export Lines, Incorporated, American Trading & Production Corporation, American Trading Transportation Company, Trinidad Corporation, American Overseas Marine Corporation and Rio Grande Transport, Incorporated. [15-30004, 15-30005, 15-30032] (DDV)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503040076 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None
                                        EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of motion for partial dismissal of appeal [7909231-2] filed by Appellee Mr. William E. Bartel in 15-30004, 15-30005, Appellee Mr. Lawrence Craig in 15-30032. Date of Service: 05/08/2015. [15-30004, 15-30005, 15-30032] (SEP)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503036934 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None
                                          OPPOSED MOTION for partial dismissal of appeals as to as to appellants Mathiasen Tanker Industries, Incorporated, American President Lines, LTD and American Overseas Marine Corporation. Date of service: 05/08/2015. Response/Opposition due on 05/21/2015. [15-30004, 15-30005, 15-30032] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: JOINT STIPULATION filed by Appellee Mr. William E. Bartel in 15-30004, 15-30005, Appellee Mr. Lawrence Craig in 15-30032 for partial dismissal of appeal as to Defendants-Appellants: Mathiasen Tanker Ind., Inc. American President Lines, Ltd. American Overseas Marine Corp. Date of Service: 05/08/2015 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Barbier, Blanque, Bolles, LaVie; Attorney for Appellees: Anderman, Waddell; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Nicholson. [15-30004, 15-30005, 15-30032] (Jody Edward Anderman )
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503036448 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None
                                            DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the Motion because counsel must re-file with the proper event of 'jt stip f' and relief of 'ptl dism ap'; exhibits in support should be combined and filed as 'exhs in sup' of the motion for partial dismissal of the parties and applied to all 3 appeals, 15-30004, 15-30005, & 15-30032 [15-30004, 15-30005, 15-30032] (CMB)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503026754 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None
                                              RECORD EXCERPTS FILED. Record Excerpts NOT Sufficient as they require TITLE DOES NOT AGREE WITH CASE CAPTION; IN EXCESS OF OPTIONAL PAGES. Optional contents exceed page limitations by 17 pages. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0 Sufficient Record Excerpts due on 05/14/2015 for Appellants Alcoa Steamship Company, Incorporated, American President Lines Limited, Central Gulf Lines, Incorporated, Central Gulf Steamship Corporation, Chas. Kurz & Company, Crowley Marine Services, Incorporated, Crowley Maritime Corporation, Delta Steamship Lines, Incorporated, Empire Transport, Incorporated, Farrell Lines, Incorporated, James River Transport, Incorporated, Keystone Shipping Company, Marine Navigation Company, Marine Transport Lines, Incorporated, Mathiasen Tanker Industry, Incorporated, Matson Navigation Company, Incorporated, National Bulk Carriers, Incorporated, Ogden Leader Stransport, Incorporated, Pan Atlantic Steamship Company, Sea-Land Service, Incorporated, Wabash Transport, Incorporated, Waterman Steamship Corporation, American Export Isbrantsen, American Export Lines, Incorporated, American Trading & Production Corporation, American Trading Transportation Company, Trinidad Corporation, American Overseas Marine Corporation and Rio Grande Transport, Incorporated, and Sufficient Record Excerpts due on 05/19/2015 for Appellant Sea-Land Service, Incorporated [15-30004, 15-30005, 15-30032]REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellants Alcoa Steamship Company, Incorporated, American President Lines Limited, Central Gulf Lines, Incorporated, Central Gulf Steamship Corporation, Chas. Kurz & Company, Crowley Marine Services, Incorporated, Crowley Maritime Corporation, Delta Steamship Lines, Incorporated, Empire Transport, Incorporated, Farrell Lines, Incorporated, James River Transport, Incorporated, Keystone Shipping Company, Marine Navigation Company, Marine Transport Lines, Incorporated, Mathiasen Tanker Industry, Incorporated, Matson Navigation Company, Incorporated, National Bulk Carriers, Incorporated, Ogden Leader Stransport, Incorporated, Pan Atlantic Steamship Company, Sea-Land Service, Incorporated, Wabash Transport, Incorporated and Waterman Steamship Corporation in 15-30004, Appellants American Export Isbrantsen, American Export Lines, Incorporated, American President Lines Limited, American Trading & Production Corporation, American Trading Transportation Company, Central Gulf Lines, Incorporated, Chas. Kurz & Company, Farrell Lines, Incorporated, Mathiasen Tanker Industry, Incorporated and Trinidad Corporation in 15-30005, Appellants American Overseas Marine Corporation, Rio Grande Transport, Incorporated, Sea-Land Service, Incorporated and Waterman Steamship Corporation in 15-30032. Date of service: 04/30/2015 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Barbier, Blanque, Bolles, LaVie; Attorney for Appellee: Anderman; US mail - Attorney for Appellees: Nicholson, Waddell [15-30004, 15-30005, 15-30032] (Meredith Wilson Blanque )
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503026751 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED Additionally the Brief requires TITLE DOES NOT AGREE WITH CASE CAPTION. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0 A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Sufficient Brief due on 05/19/2015 for Appellants Alcoa Steamship Company, Incorporated, American President Lines Limited, Central Gulf Lines, Incorporated, Central Gulf Steamship Corporation, Chas. Kurz & Company, Crowley Marine Services, Incorporated, Crowley Maritime Corporation, Delta Steamship Lines, Incorporated, Empire Transport, Incorporated, Farrell Lines, Incorporated, James River Transport, Incorporated, Keystone Shipping Company, Marine Navigation Company, Marine Transport Lines, Incorporated, Mathiasen Tanker Industry, Incorporated, Matson Navigation Company, Incorporated, National Bulk Carriers, Incorporated, Ogden Leader Stransport, Incorporated, Pan Atlantic Steamship Company, Sea-Land Service, Incorporated, Wabash Transport, Incorporated, Waterman Steamship Corporation, American Export Isbrantsen, American Export Lines, Incorporated, American Trading & Production Corporation, American Trading Transportation Company, Trinidad Corporation, American Overseas Marine Corporation and Rio Grande Transport, Incorporated.. Appellee's Brief due on 06/02/2015 for Appellees William E. Bartel and Lawrence Craig [15-30004, 15-30005, 15-30032]REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Alcoa Steamship Company, Incorporated, American President Lines Limited, Central Gulf Lines, Incorporated, Central Gulf Steamship Corporation, Chas. Kurz & Company, Crowley Marine Services, Incorporated, Crowley Maritime Corporation, Delta Steamship Lines, Incorporated, Empire Transport, Incorporated, Farrell Lines, Incorporated, James River Transport, Incorporated, Keystone Shipping Company, Marine Navigation Company, Marine Transport Lines, Incorporated, Mathiasen Tanker Industry, Incorporated, Matson Navigation Company, Incorporated, National Bulk Carriers, Incorporated, Ogden Leader Stransport, Incorporated, Pan Atlantic Steamship Company, Sea-Land Service, Incorporated, Wabash Transport, Incorporated and Waterman Steamship Corporation in 15-30004, American Export Isbrantsen, American Export Lines, Incorporated, American President Lines Limited, American Trading & Production Corporation, American Trading Transportation Company, Central Gulf Lines, Incorporated, Chas. Kurz & Company, Farrell Lines, Incorporated, Mathiasen Tanker Industry, Incorporated and Trinidad Corporation in 15-30005, American Overseas Marine Corporation, Rio Grande Transport, Incorporated, Sea-Land Service, Incorporated and Waterman Steamship Corporation in 15-30032. Date of service: 04/30/2015 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Barbier, Blanque, Bolles, LaVie; Attorney for Appellee: Anderman; US mail - Attorney for Appellees: Nicholson, Waddell [15-30004, 15-30005, 15-30032] (Meredith Wilson Blanque )
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502987448 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                  CLERK ORDER granting motion to consolidate cases filed by Appellants Mathiasen Tanker Industry, Incorporated, Marine Transport Lines, Incorporated, Farrell Lines, Incorporated, Central Gulf Steamship Corporation, American President Lines Limited, Waterman Steamship Corporation, National Bulk Carriers, Incorporated, Keystone Shipping Company, Sea-Land Service, Incorporated, Crowley Marine Services, Incorporated, Central Gulf Lines, Incorporated, Alcoa Steamship Company, Incorporated, Delta Steamship Lines, Incorporated, Empire Transport, Incorporated, James River Transport, Incorporated, Chas. Kurz & Company, Marine Navigation Company, Crowley Maritime Corporation, Matson Navigation Company, Incorporated, Ogden Leader Stransport, Incorporated, Pan Atlantic Steamship Company and Wabash Transport, Incorporated [7874777-2] in 15-30004, granting motion to consolidate cases filed by Appellants Mathiasen Tanker Industry, Incorporated, Farrell Lines, Incorporated, Trinidad Corporation, American President Lines Limited, American Trading Transportation Company, Central Gulf Lines, Incorporated, American Export Isbrantsen, American Export Lines, Incorporated, Chas. Kurz & Company and American Trading & Production Corporation [7875602-2] in 15-30005, granting motion to consolidate cases filed by Appellants American Overseas Marine Corporation, Waterman Steamship Corporation, Sea-Land Service, Incorporated and Rio Grande Transport, Incorporated [7875565-2] in 15-30032; granting in part motion to extend time to file appellant's brief filed by Appellants Mathiasen Tanker Industry, Incorporated, Marine Transport Lines, Incorporated, Farrell Lines, Incorporated, Central Gulf Steamship Corporation, American President Lines Limited, Waterman Steamship Corporation, National Bulk Carriers, Incorporated, Keystone Shipping Company, Sea-Land Service, Incorporated, Crowley Marine Services, Incorporated, Central Gulf Lines, Incorporated, Alcoa Steamship Company, Incorporated, Delta Steamship Lines, Incorporated, Empire Transport, Incorporated, James River Transport, Incorporated, Chas. Kurz & Company, Marine Navigation Company, Crowley Maritime Corporation, Matson Navigation Company, Incorporated, Ogden Leader Stransport, Incorporated, Pan Atlantic Steamship Company and Wabash Transport, Incorporated [7874777-3] in 15-30004, granting in part motion to extend time to file appellant's brief filed by Appellants Mathiasen Tanker Industry, Incorporated, Farrell Lines, Incorporated, Trinidad Corporation, American President Lines Limited, American Trading Transportation Company, Central Gulf Lines, Incorporated, American Export Isbrantsen, American Export Lines, Incorporated, Chas. Kurz & Company and American Trading & Production Corporation [7875602-3] in 15-30005, granting in part motion to extend time to file appellant's brief filed by Appellants American Overseas Marine Corporation, Waterman Steamship Corporation, Sea-Land Service, Incorporated and Rio Grande Transport, Incorporated [7875565-3] in 15-30032 A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 04/30/2015 for Appellants Alcoa Steamship Company, Incorporated, American President Lines Limited, Central Gulf Lines, Incorporated, Central Gulf Steamship Corporation, Chas. Kurz & Company, Crowley Marine Services, Incorporated, Crowley Maritime Corporation, Delta Steamship Lines, Incorporated, Empire Transport, Incorporated, Farrell Lines, Incorporated, James River Transport, Incorporated, Keystone Shipping Company, Marine Navigation Company, Marine Transport Lines, Incorporated, Mathiasen Tanker Industry, Incorporated, Matson Navigation Company, Incorporated, National Bulk Carriers, Incorporated, Ogden Leader Stransport, Incorporated, Pan Atlantic Steamship Company, Sea-Land Service, Incorporated, Wabash Transport, Incorporated, Waterman Steamship Corporation, American Export Isbrantsen, American Export Lines, Incorporated, American Trading & Production Corporation, American Trading Transportation Company, Trinidad Corporation, American Overseas Marine Corporation and Rio Grande Transport, Incorporated. [15-30004, 15-30005, 15-30032] (CMB)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502987421 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                    CLERK ORDER denying motion to suspend briefing notice filed by Appellants Mathiasen Tanker Industry, Incorporated, Marine Transport Lines, Incorporated, Farrell Lines, Incorporated, Central Gulf Steamship Corporation, American President Lines Limited, Waterman Steamship Corporation, National Bulk Carriers, Incorporated, Keystone Shipping Company, Sea-Land Service, Incorporated, Crowley Marine Services, Incorporated, Central Gulf Lines, Incorporated, Alcoa Steamship Company, Incorporated, Delta Steamship Lines, Incorporated, Empire Transport, Incorporated, James River Transport, Incorporated, Chas. Kurz & Company, Marine Navigation Company, Crowley Maritime Corporation, Matson Navigation Company, Incorporated, Ogden Leader Stransport, Incorporated, Pan Atlantic Steamship Company and Wabash Transport, Incorporated [7874803-2] in 15-30004, denying motion to suspend briefing notice filed by Appellants Mathiasen Tanker Industry, Incorporated, Farrell Lines, Incorporated, Trinidad Corporation, American President Lines Limited, American Trading Transportation Company, Central Gulf Lines, Incorporated, American Export Isbrantsen, American Export Lines, Incorporated, Chas. Kurz & Company and American Trading & Production Corporation [7875607-2] in 15-30005, denying motion to suspend briefing notice filed by Appellants American Overseas Marine Corporation, Waterman Steamship Corporation, Sea-Land Service, Incorporated and Rio Grande Transport, Incorporated [7875584-2] in 15-30032. [15-30004, 15-30005, 15-30032] (CMB)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502984336 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                      MOTION filed by Appellants Alcoa Steamship Company, Incorporated, American President Lines Limited, Central Gulf Lines, Incorporated, Central Gulf Steamship Corporation, Chas. Kurz & Company, Crowley Marine Services, Incorporated, Crowley Maritime Corporation, Delta Steamship Lines, Incorporated, Empire Transport, Incorporated, Farrell Lines, Incorporated, James River Transport, Incorporated, Keystone Shipping Company, Marine Navigation Company, Marine Transport Lines, Incorporated, Mathiasen Tanker Industry, Incorporated, Matson Navigation Company, Incorporated, National Bulk Carriers, Incorporated, Ogden Leader Stransport, Incorporated, Pan Atlantic Steamship Company, Sea-Land Service, Incorporated, Wabash Transport, Incorporated and Waterman Steamship Corporationto Suspend Briefing Schedule in Appeal Nos. 15-30004, 15-30005, 15-30032 [7874803-2]. Date of service: 03/27/2015 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Barbier, Blanque, Bolles, LaVie; Attorney for Appellees: Nicholson, Waddell [15-30004] (John A. Bolles )
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502984293 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION to consolidate cases 15-30005 and 15-30032 with 15-30004 for briefing purposes, to extend time to file a single brief as appellant until 05/18/2015 [7874777-3]. Date of service: 03/27/2015 [15-30004] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: MOTION filed by Appellants Alcoa Steamship Company, Incorporated, American President Lines Limited, Central Gulf Lines, Incorporated, Central Gulf Steamship Corporation, Chas. Kurz & Company, Crowley Marine Services, Incorporated, Crowley Maritime Corporation, Delta Steamship Lines, Incorporated, Empire Transport, Incorporated, Farrell Lines, Incorporated, James River Transport, Incorporated, Keystone Shipping Company, Marine Navigation Company, Marine Transport Lines, Incorporated, Mathiasen Tanker Industry, Incorporated, Matson Navigation Company, Incorporated, National Bulk Carriers, Incorporated, Ogden Leader Stransport, Incorporated, Pan Atlantic Steamship Company, Sea-Land Service, Incorporated, Wabash Transport, Incorporated and Waterman Steamship Corporation to consolidate cases 15-30004, 15-30005 and 15-30032 for briefing and oral argument purposes. Date of service: 03/27/2015 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Barbier, Blanque, Bolles, LaVie; Attorney for Appellees: Nicholson, Waddell [15-30004] (John A. Bolles )
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502917694 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                          BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 03/09/2015 for Appellants Alcoa Steamship Company, Incorporated, American President Lines Limited, Central Gulf Lines, Incorporated, Central Gulf Steamship Corporation, Chas. Kurz & Company, Crowley Marine Services, Incorporated, Crowley Maritime Corporation, Delta Steamship Lines, Incorporated, Empire Transport, Incorporated, Farrell Lines, Incorporated, James River Transport, Incorporated, Keystone Shipping Company, Marine Navigation Company, Marine Transport Lines, Incorporated, Mathiasen Tanker Industry, Incorporated, Matson Navigation Company, Incorporated, National Bulk Carriers, Incorporated, Ogden Leader Stransport, Incorporated, Pan Atlantic Steamship Company, Sea-Land Service, Incorporated, Wabash Transport, Incorporated and Waterman Steamship Corporation. [15-30004] (SMH)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502904712 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                            INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [7821078-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [15-30004] (MAC)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502889144 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                              PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Alcoa Steamship Company, Incorporated, American President Lines Limited, Central Gulf Lines, Incorporated, Central Gulf Lines, Incorporated, Central Gulf Steamship Corporation, Chas. Kurz & Company, Crowley Marine Services, Incorporated, Crowley Maritime Corporation, Delta Steamship Lines, Incorporated, Empire Transport, Incorporated, Farrell Lines, Incorporated, James River Transport, Incorporated, Keystone Shipping Company, Marine Navigation Company, Marine Transport Lines, Incorporated, Mathiasen Tanker Industry, Incorporated, Matson Navigation Company, Incorporated, National Bulk Carriers, Incorporated, Ogden Leader Stransport, Incorporated, Pan Atlantic Steamship Company, Sea-Land Service, Incorporated, Wabash Transport, Incorporated and Waterman Steamship Corporation [15-30004] (MAC)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 173 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?