Cellular Communications Equipment LLC v. Microsoft Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:13-cv-00738

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 28, 2017 at 9:12 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cellular Communications Equipment LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brent Nelson Bumgardner +1 817 377 3490 +1 817 377 3485 brent@nelbum.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Christopher Cecil +1 817 806 3812 +1 817 377 3485 tcecil@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Brannon Latimer +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 blatimer@nbclaw.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward R. Nelson, III +1 817 377 9111 ed@nelbum.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 2400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/20/2014 Michael J. Fagan, Jr. +1 214 627 9975 mfagan@chenmalin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claire Abernathy Henry +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 claire@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@jwfirm.com
v.
Microsoft Corporation Microsoft Corporation, Defendant
Unknown Role, Devry Inc.
Facebook, Inc. Unknown Role, Facebook, Inc.
Unknown Role, Visiocorp
Unknown Role, Immersion Corp
Unknown Role, Avanade Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of MATTHEW GROSSMAN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christina Marie Von Der Ahe +1 415 773 4138 cvonderahe@orrick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LUBE & SOTO LAW OFFICES, P.S.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/06/2014 Daniel John Galligan +1 214 478 9233 dangalligan@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Microsoft Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David E. Killough +1 425 703 8865 +1 425 869 1327 davkill@microsoft.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard A. Cederoth +1 312 853 7000 +1 312 853 7036 rcederoth@sidley.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nathaniel C. Love +1 312 853 7804 +1 312 853 7036 nlove@sidley.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John W McBride +1 312 853 7000 jwmcbride@sidley.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DAVID T. PRITIKIN +1 312 853 7000 +1 312 853 7036 dpritikin@sidley.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ellen Sue Robbins +1 312 853 7000 erobbins@sidley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Robertson & Cornelius PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Parker Ainsworth +1 903 509 5000 +1 903 509 5092 jainsworth@wilsonlawfirm.com
  Entries (60) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
    NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation Of Order In Related Case (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cederoth, Richard) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER granting the Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Daniel J. Galligan, on behalf of Defendant Microsoft Corporation, filed in the lead case, 6:13cv507. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/6/14. (mjc, ) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER denying as moot 9 Sealed Motion to Dismiss or Transfer. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/03/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/04/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
          NOTICE by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC OF ORDER IN RELATED CASE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - related order)(Henry, Claire) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christina Marie Von der Ahe on behalf of Microsoft Corporation (Von der Ahe, Christina) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nathaniel C Love on behalf of Microsoft Corporation (Love, Nathaniel) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David E Killough on behalf of Microsoft Corporation (Killough, David) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER that the stay in this case be lifted either when settlement negotiations between Microsoft and Acacia Research Corp. reach an impasse or on 5-01-2014, whichever is earlier. At that time, all deadlines applicable to Microsoft in this case shall resume. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/14/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Sealed Legal Document 51 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None
                    SEALED SURREPLY by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC to 50 Response to Non-Motion, filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D- Microsoft Letter)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Sealed Legal Document 50 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None
                      SEALED REPLY by Microsoft Corporation to 49 Response to Non-Motion, filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Redacted 3/27/14 Email, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Redacted 3/28/14 Email, # 3 Exhibit 3 - 4/7/14 Email)(Cederoth, Richard) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/9/2014, Entered: None
                        RESPONSE to 48 Notice (Other), Response to Microsoft Corporation's Protective Notice of Renewal of its Motion to Dismiss or Transfer filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
                          NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation re 9 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(7) or Alternatively to Dismiss or Transfer Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(3), 28 U.S.C. § 1406, and 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) Protective Notice of Renewal of its Motion to Dismiss or Transfer (Cederoth, Richard) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
                            AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION consolidating cases 6:13cv507, 6:13cv508, 6:13cv509, 6:13cv510, 6:13cv511, 6:13cv568, 6:13cv569, 6:13cv584 and 6:13cv738 for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. Lead case is 6:13cv507. The Clerk of the Court shall add the consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as Lead and Local Counsel only. Any other counsel who wishes to appear in the lead case shall file a notice of appearance in that case. Individual cases remain active for venue motions and trial, and all pending motions will be considered as filed. All future motions, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the consolidated case. Parties shall submit a single Docket Control Order by 3/15/2014, and a single Discovery, ESI, and Protective Order by 3/21/2014. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/27/14. (mjc, ) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER denying 37 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Sur-Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss or Transfer. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/24/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER granting 41 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael James Fagan, Jr terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/20/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER granting 38 Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/20/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC REGARDING SPECIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
                                        Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER setting Initial Case Management Conference for 2/26/2014 02:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/03/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/20/2014, Entered: None
                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 37 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Sur-Reply [Dkt #36] filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 01/20/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None
                                              Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal [Dkt #36] by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/14/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Sur-Reply [Dkt #36] by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/14/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Sealed Legal Document 36 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                  SEALED SUR-SUR-REPLY to Sur-Reply to Motion re 9 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(7) or Alternatively to Dismiss or Transfer Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(3), 28 U.S.C. § 1406, and 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Ainsworth, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/14/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER granting 33 Motion for Leave to File Surreply Under Seal. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/02/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Sealed Legal Document 34 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                      SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 9 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(7) or Alternatively to Dismiss or Transfer Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(3), 28 U.S.C. § 1406, and 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER granting 31 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/20/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal [Dkt #30] by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Sealed Legal Document 30 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                              SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 9 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(7) or Alternatively to Dismiss or Transfer Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(3), 28 U.S.C. § 1406, and 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Ainsworth, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER granting 27 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/10/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/10/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 28 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 9 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(7) or Alternatively to Dismiss or Transfer Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(3), 28 U.S.C. § 1406, and 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal its Response to Microsoft Corporations Motion to Dismiss by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Claire) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation re 9 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(7) or Alternatively to Dismiss or Transfer Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(3), 28 U.S.C. § 1406, and 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) (NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Ainsworth, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC Of Readiness For Scheduling Conference (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward R Nelson, III on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael James Fagan on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Fagan, Michael) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brent Nelson Bumgardner on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Bumgardner, Brent) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Brannon Latimer on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Latimer, Steven) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry Bumgardner on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas Christopher Cecil on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Cecil, Thomas) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by John W McBride on behalf of Microsoft Corporation. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4416287. (McBride, John) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Richard A Cederoth on behalf of Microsoft Corporation. Filing fee $100, receipt number 0540-4416153. (Cederoth, Richard) Modified on 11/22/2013 (mll, ). (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Ellen S Robbins on behalf of Microsoft Corporation. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4416179. (Robbins, Ellen) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                            ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE DOCUMENT 17 FOR CORRECT PLEADING*** NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Richard A Cederoth on behalf of Microsoft Corporation. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4416153. (Cederoth, Richard) Modified on 11/22/2013 (mll, ). (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by David T Pritikin on behalf of Microsoft Corporation. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4416078. (Pritikin, David) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel John Galligan on behalf of Microsoft Corporation (Galligan, Daniel) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Additional Attachments to Main Document (Certificate of authority to seal): 9 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(7) or Alternatively to Dismiss or Transfer Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(3), 28 U.S.C. § 1406, and 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a).. (Ainsworth, Jennifer) Modified on 11/22/2013 (sm, ). (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER granting 10 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/21/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal [Dkt #9] by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 9 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        SEALED MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(7) or Alternatively to Dismiss or Transfer Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(3), 28 U.S.C. § 1406, and 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit First Declaration of Robbins, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Affidavit Second Declaration of Robbins, # 19 Exhibit A, # 20 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Microsoft Corporation.( Ainsworth, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Return of Service Executed as to Microsoft Corporation on 10/3/2013, by personal service; answer due: 10/24/2013. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                              SUMMONS Issued as to Microsoft Corporation and emailed to pltf for service. (klb) (Entered: 10/03/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claire Abernathy Henry on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against Microsoft Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4341079.), filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 7,218,923)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 35 times.

                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?