Linda Birdette v. Redline Recovery Services, LLC, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit, Case No. 11-13047

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 4, 2016 at 5:28 AM DT (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3150 - Overpayments & Enforcement of Judgments
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106700762 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None
Public Communication: Letter from Pro Se Appellant no action requested - appeals are closed, reconsiderations have been denied - sent SPCT-5 information. [11-12997, 11-13045, 11-13048, 11-13047]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106402466 Filed: 1/10/2012, Entered: None
    ENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to the 11th Cir.R.42-1(b), this appeal is DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the appellant Linda A. Birdette has failed to pay the filing and docketing fees to the district court within the time fixed by the rules
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106379292 Filed: 12/13/2011, Entered: None
      ORDER: Motion for reconsideration of single judge's order filed by Appellant Linda A. Birdette is DENIED [6423569-2] GBT and BBM
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106355325 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None
        MOTION for reconsideration of single judge's order filed by Appellant Linda A. Birdette. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [6423569-1]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106340188 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: None
          ORDER: Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Linda A. Birdette is DENIED [6363769-2] BBM
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106317656 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: None
            Amended Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Linda A. Birdette.
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106289284 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
              MOTION to proceed IFP filed by Party Linda A. Birdette. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [6363769-1]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106276710 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None
                USDC order denying IFP as to Appellant Linda A. Birdette was filed on 07/22/2011. Docket Entry 12.
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106275593 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None
                  Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Linda A. Birdette.
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 46 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?