District Appellate Supreme
Federal
Massachusetts District Court Court of Appeals for the First Circuit United States Supreme Court

ConnectU LLC v. Zuckerberg et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-11923-DPW

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.

Reality Check: Facebook, Inc.

This docket is featured in the January 24, 2019 article Reality Check: Facebook, Inc..

Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Connectu LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Margaret A. Esquenet +1 202 408 4000 +1 202 408 4400 margaret.esquenet@finnegan.com
Space Kenneth W Curtis +1 571 203 2715 +1 202 408 4400 kenneth.curtis@finnegan.com
Space John Francis Hornick +1 202 408 4076 +1 202 408 4400 john.hornick@finnegan.com
Space Meredith H. Schoenfeld +1 202 408 4000 +1 202 408 4400 meredith.schoenfeld@finnegan.com

Represented by Griesinger, Tighe & Maffei, LLP

No Logo Andrew McCollum, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Michael Bauer +1 617 526 9600 +1 617 526 9899 sbauer@proskauer.com
Space Jeremy P. Oczek +1 617 526 9600 joczek@proskauer.com
No Logo Morgan & Finnegan, LLP, Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Christopher Hughes"

Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Michael Bauer +1 617 526 9600 +1 617 526 9899 sbauer@proskauer.com
Space Jeremy P. Oczek +1 617 526 9600 joczek@proskauer.com
Moskovitz, Dustin A. Moskovitz, Dustin A., Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Dustin Moskovitz"
Facebook, Inc. Unknown Role, Facebook, Inc.
Unknown Role, Asana, Inc.

Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Michael Bauer +1 617 526 9600 +1 617 526 9899 sbauer@proskauer.com
Space Jeremy P. Oczek +1 617 526 9600 joczek@proskauer.com
No Logo Saverin, Eduardo, Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Eduardo Saverin"
Facebook, Inc. Unknown Role, Facebook, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel K. Hampton +1 617 523 2700 +1 617 523 6850 dan.hampton@hklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Theresa A. Sutton +1 650 614 7430 +1 650 614 7401 tsutton@orrick.com
Zuckerberg, Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Mark Elliot, Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Mark Zuckerberg"

Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Michael Bauer +1 617 526 9600 +1 617 526 9899 sbauer@proskauer.com
Space Jeremy P. Oczek +1 617 526 9600 joczek@proskauer.com
Facebook, Inc. Facebook, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "TheFaceBook.com"

Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Michael Bauer +1 617 526 9600 +1 617 526 9899 sbauer@proskauer.com
Space Jeremy P. Oczek +1 617 526 9600 joczek@proskauer.com
v.
No Logo Andrew McCollum, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Heller Ehrman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Annette Louise Hurst +1 415 773 4585 +1 415 773 5759 ahurst@orrick.com

Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Michael Bauer +1 617 526 9600 +1 617 526 9899 sbauer@proskauer.com
Space Jeremy P. Oczek +1 617 526 9600 joczek@proskauer.com
No Logo Morgan & Finnegan, LLP, Defendant
Officially listed as "Christopher Hughes"

Toggle Switch Represented by Heller Ehrman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Annette Louise Hurst +1 415 773 4585 +1 415 773 5759 ahurst@orrick.com

Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Michael Bauer +1 617 526 9600 +1 617 526 9899 sbauer@proskauer.com
Space Jeremy P. Oczek +1 617 526 9600 joczek@proskauer.com
Moskovitz, Dustin A. Moskovitz, Dustin A., Defendant
Officially listed as "Dustin Moskovitz"
Facebook, Inc. Unknown Role, Facebook, Inc.
Unknown Role, Asana, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Heller Ehrman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Annette Louise Hurst +1 415 773 4585 +1 415 773 5759 ahurst@orrick.com

Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Michael Bauer +1 617 526 9600 +1 617 526 9899 sbauer@proskauer.com
Space Jeremy P. Oczek +1 617 526 9600 joczek@proskauer.com
No Logo Saverin, Eduardo, Defendant
Officially listed as "Eduardo Saverin"
Facebook, Inc. Unknown Role, Facebook, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Heller Ehrman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert B. Hawk +1 650 324 7165 +1 650 324 6016 rhawk@hewm.com
Space Annette Louise Hurst +1 415 773 4585 +1 415 773 5759 ahurst@orrick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel K. Hampton +1 617 523 2700 +1 617 523 6850 dan.hampton@hklaw.com
Space Gordon P. Katz +1 617 573 5839 +1 617 523 6850 gordon.katz@hklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bhanu Sadasivan +1 650 324 7169 +1 650 324 6074 bsadasivan@mwe.com

Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Michael Bauer +1 617 526 9600 +1 617 526 9899 sbauer@proskauer.com
Zuckerberg, Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Mark Elliot, Defendant
Officially listed as "Mark Zuckerberg"

Toggle Switch Represented by Heller Ehrman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Annette Louise Hurst +1 415 773 4585 +1 415 773 5759 ahurst@orrick.com

Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Michael Bauer +1 617 526 9600 +1 617 526 9899 sbauer@proskauer.com
Space Jeremy P. Oczek +1 617 526 9600 joczek@proskauer.com
Facebook, Inc. Facebook, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "TheFaceBook.com"

Toggle Switch Represented by Heller Ehrman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Annette Louise Hurst +1 415 773 4585 +1 415 773 5759 ahurst@orrick.com

Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Michael Bauer +1 617 526 9600 +1 617 526 9899 sbauer@proskauer.com
Space Jeremy P. Oczek +1 617 526 9600 joczek@proskauer.com
No Logo Winklevoss, Cameron Howard, Counter-Defendant
Officially listed as "Cameron Winklevoss"

Toggle Switch Represented by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Margaret A. Esquenet +1 202 408 4000 +1 202 408 4400 margaret.esquenet@finnegan.com
Space John Francis Hornick +1 202 408 4076 +1 202 408 4400 john.hornick@finnegan.com

Represented by Griesinger, Tighe & Maffei, LLP

No Logo Connectu LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Margaret A. Esquenet +1 202 408 4000 +1 202 408 4400 margaret.esquenet@finnegan.com
Space John Francis Hornick +1 202 408 4076 +1 202 408 4400 john.hornick@finnegan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Michael Bauer +1 617 526 9600 +1 617 526 9899 sbauer@proskauer.com
No Logo Divya Narendra, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Margaret A. Esquenet +1 202 408 4000 +1 202 408 4400 margaret.esquenet@finnegan.com
Space John Francis Hornick +1 202 408 4076 +1 202 408 4400 john.hornick@finnegan.com

Represented by Griesinger, Tighe & Maffei, LLP

No Logo Tyler Winklevoss, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Margaret A. Esquenet +1 202 408 4000 +1 202 408 4400 margaret.esquenet@finnegan.com
Space John Francis Hornick +1 202 408 4076 +1 202 408 4400 john.hornick@finnegan.com

Represented by Griesinger, Tighe & Maffei, LLP

Office Boston
Filed 9/2/2004
Jury Demand Both
Demand
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated
Origin 4
Reopened 4/9/2008
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '07-1796'['First Circuit']
Def Custody Status
Flag REMAND
  Entries (417) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/24/2008 Appeal Record Returned
Appeal Record Returned: [300] Notice of Appeal, (Ramos, Jeanette) Modified to remove document number on 7/25/2008 (Seelye, Terri).
    LREF
    Legal Document 314 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 USCA Mandate
    MANDATE of USCA as to [300] Notice of Appeal, filed by ConnectU LLC. Mandate issued in the USCA 7/21/2008 (Ramos, Jeanette)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge
      Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings. (Dolan, Kathleen)
        LREF
        Legal Document 313 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: 7/9/2008 Certificate Of Service.
        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com re [312] Notice (Other). (Sutton, Theresa)
          LREF
          Legal Document 312 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008 ~Notice (other)
          NOTICE by Mark Zuckerberg, TheFaceBook.com of Entry of Judgment enforcing settlement agreement (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Judgment Enforcing Settlement Agreement)(Sutton, Theresa) Modified text on 7/14/2008 (Seelye, Terri).
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008 E-mail Notice Returned
            E-Mail Notice re 312 originally issued on 7/8/08 returned as undeliverable. Name of Addressee: Kenneth Curtis. The ECF help desk has contacted the law firm on record, who advised that the attorney is no longer employed by that firm. The attorney's email address has been removed from the database to prevent the return of additional undelivered email notices. (Jones, Sherry)
              LREF
              Legal Document 310 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: 4/29/2008 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
              NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Adam Wolfson of Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Oliver & Hedges, LLP (Wolfson, Adam)
                LREF
                Legal Document 309 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: 4/29/2008 ~Notice (other)
                NOTICE by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss of Attorneys' Lien (Wolfson, Adam) Modified text on 5/5/2008 (Seelye, Terri).
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: 4/29/2008 E-mail Notice Returned
                  E-Mail Notice originally issued on 4/29/08 returned as undeliverable. Name of Addressee: Joshua Walker. The ECF Help Desk has contacted the law firm on record, who advised that the attorney is no longer employed by that firm. The attorneys email address has been removed from the database to prevent the return of additional undeliverable email notices. (Hassett, Kathy)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: 4/29/2008 Sealed Document +
                    Notice of filing of motion. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A: Confidential Motion)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-10593-DPW, 1:04-cv-11923-DPW.(Seelye, Terri) FILED UNDER SEAL.
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document 308 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: 4/9/2008 USCA Opinion
                      OPINION of USCA. Opinion issued in the USCA 4/3/2008 (Ramos, Jeanette)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 307 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: 4/9/2008 USCA Judgment
                        USCA Judgment as to[300] Notice of Appeal, filed by Connectu LLC. This cause came on to be heard on appeal from the United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts and was argued by counsel. Upon consideration whereof, it is now here ordered, adjudged and decreed as follows: The judgment of the district court is reversed and the matter is remanded to the district court for further proceedings consistent with the opinion issued this day. Judgment issued in the USCA 4/9/2008 (Ramos, Jeanette)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: 12/4/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                          TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on November 30, 2007 before Judge Woodlock. Court Reporter: Brenda K. Hancock. The original transcripts are maintained by the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at 617/439-3214 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 12/3/2007 Order on Sealed Motion +
                            Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Motion Hearing held on 11/30/2007 re (305) SEALED Motion for Temporary Restraining Order in case # 1:04-cv-11923-DPW, and (162) SEALED Motion for Temporary Restraining Order in case # 1:07-cv-10593-DPW: Parties inform the Court of discovery leading up to todays hearing; Court will allow a proposed plan for discovery; O'Brien and representative of magazine are to file declarations by 12/4/07; parties inform the Court of preliminary plans for discovery; Court recesses to allow the parties to consult with their clients; Court resumes; atty Balin reports that some of the documents at issue were received from the Clerks Office of the Court of Appeals; 02138 states that redactions as to the deposition transcript will be made; the cash flow document does not disclose much; 02138 has additional documents in it's possession; after oral arguments of the parties; the Court DENIES (162) Motion for TRO in case 1:07-cv-10593-DPW; and DENIES (305) Motion for TRO in case 1:04-cv-11923-DPW treated as a preliminary injunction as stated and recorded in the stenogropher's notes. Facebook is to file a response as to 02138's request to unseal submissions by 12/7/07; the parties proposals as to discovery are due by 12/7/07 if necessary. (Court Reporter: Brenda Hancock)(Attorneys present: Tighe, Hornick, Schoenfeld, Calamari, Wolfson, Esquenet, Hart, Bea, Chatterjee, Bauer, Batten, Hampton, Hawk, Shafroth, Pulgram, Ritvo, Balin, Handman, Husbanda) Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-10593-DPW, 1:04-cv-11923-DPW(Lovett, Jarrett)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: 11/29/2007, Terminated: 11/30/2007 Sealed Motion +
                              SEALED MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Mark Zuckerberg, Eduardo Saverin, Dustin Moskovitz, ConnectU LLC, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration# (2) Exhibit # (3) Exhibit # (4) Text of Proposed Order) This document is related to case# 07-10593 and is filed as docket entry #162.(Nici, Richard)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: 11/29/2007 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [305] SEALED MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order : Motion Hearing set for 11/30/2007 12:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Lovett, Jarrett)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: 11/29/2007 E-mail Notice Returned
                                  E-Mail Notice originally issued on 11/29/07 returned as undeliverable. Name of Addressee: Robert D. Nagel. The ECF Help Desk has contacted the law firm on record, who advised that the attorney is no longer employed by that firm. The attorneys email address has been removed from the database to prevent the return of additional undeliverable email notices. (Hassett, Kathy)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: 6/28/2007 Terminate Motions
                                    Motions terminated: as moot [299] Assented to MOTION for Leave to File A REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' CORRECTED RESPONSE TO CONNECTU'S OBJECTIONS TO CLERK'S AUTHORITY TO TAX COSTS, AND OPPOSITION TO TAXATION OF COSTS - filed by Tyler Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC, Cameron Winklevoss, Divya Narendra. (Nici, Richard)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 304 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: 6/15/2007 Withdrawal of Motion
                                      Withdrawal of motion: [295] Bill of Costs filed by Mark Zuckerberg, Andrew McCollum, TheFaceBook.com, Eduardo Saverin, Christopher Hughes, Dustin Moskovitz, [296] Declaration, filed by Mark Zuckerberg, Andrew McCollum, TheFaceBook.com, Eduardo Saverin, Christopher Hughes, Dustin Moskovitz.. (Sutton, Theresa)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 303 Filed: 5/24/2007, Entered: 5/24/2007 USCA Case Number
                                        USCA Case Number 07-1796 for [300] Notice of Appeal, filed by ConnectU LLC. (Ramos, Jeanette)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 302 Filed: 5/21/2007, Entered: 5/21/2007 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
                                          Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re [300] Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(Ramos, Jeanette)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 301 Filed: 5/10/2007, Entered: 5/10/2007 Appeal Transcript Order Form
                                            TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC re [300] Notice of Appeal, (Hornick, John)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 300 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: 4/27/2007, Terminated: 7/21/2008 Notice of Appeal
                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL as to Order Adopting Report and Recommendations,,,, [289] Order Dismissing Case by ConnectU LLC Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 1498923 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/clerks/transcript.htm MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Appeal Record due by 5/17/2007. (Hornick, John)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: 5/2/2008 Reopen Document
                                                Reopen Document [300] Notice of Appeal, (Ramos, Jeanette)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 299 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: 4/17/2007, Terminated: 6/28/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                  Assented to MOTION for Leave to File A REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' CORRECTED RESPONSE TO CONNECTU'S OBJECTIONS TO CLERK'S AUTHORITY TO TAX COSTS, AND OPPOSITION TO TAXATION OF COSTS - by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - PROPOSED REPLY BRIEF# (2) Text of Proposed Order # (3) DECLARATION OF MEREDITH H. SCHOENFELD IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED REPLY BRIEF# (4) Exhibit 1 - EXHIBIT 1 TO M.H. SCHOENFELD DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED REPLY# (5) Exhibit 2 - EXHIBIT 2 TO M.H. SCHOENFELD DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED REPLY# (6) Exhibit 3 - EXHIBIT 3 TO M.H. SCHOENFELD DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED REPLY)(Hornick, John)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 298 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: 4/13/2007 Objection
                                                    Objection to [293] Objection by Mark Zuckerberg, Eduardo Saverin, Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, Eduardo Saverin, TheFaceBook.com, Dustin Moskovitz, Mark Zuckerberg, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com CORRECTION OF DOCKET #[297]. (Sutton, Theresa)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 297 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: 4/13/2007, Terminated: 6/15/2007 Motion for Bill of Costs
                                                      MOTION for Bill of Costs DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO CONNECTU'S OBJECTIONS TO CLERK'S AUTHORITY TO TAX COSTS, AND OPPOSITION TO TAXATION OF COSTS by Mark Zuckerberg, Eduardo Saverin, Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, Eduardo Saverin, TheFaceBook.com, Dustin Moskovitz, Mark Zuckerberg, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com.(Sutton, Theresa)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 296 Filed: 4/12/2007, Entered: 4/12/2007 Declaration
                                                        DECLARATION re [291] Bill of Costs, [295] Bill of Costs, [294] Bill of Costs Corrected Chatterjee Decl ISO Bill of Costs by Mark Zuckerberg, Eduardo Saverin, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com. (Sutton, Theresa)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 295 Filed: 4/12/2007, Entered: 4/12/2007 Bill of Costs
                                                          BILL OF COSTS Corrected Itemization of Costs by Mark Zuckerberg, Eduardo Saverin, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com. (Sutton, Theresa)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 294 Filed: 4/12/2007, Entered: 4/12/2007 Bill of Costs
                                                            BILL OF COSTS Errata re Itemization of Costs and Chatterjee Decl in Support by Mark Zuckerberg, Eduardo Saverin, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com. (Sutton, Theresa)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 293 Filed: 4/12/2007, Entered: 4/12/2007 Objection
                                                              Objection to [291] Bill of Costs by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss - CONNECTU'S OBJECTIONS TO CLERK'S AUTHORITY TO TAX COSTS, AND OPPOSITION TO TAXATION OF COSTS. (Tighe, Daniel)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 292 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: 4/11/2007 Declaration
                                                                DECLARATION re [291] Bill of Costs (Chatterjee Decl) In Support of Bill of Costs by Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C (Part 1 of 3)# (4) Exhibit C (Part 2 of 3)# (5) Exhibit C (Part 3 of 3)# (6) Exhibit D# (7) Exhibit E)(Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 291 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: 4/11/2007 Bill of Costs
                                                                  BILL OF COSTS by Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com. (Attachments: # (1) Itemization of Costs ISO Defs' Bill of Costs)(Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 290 Filed: 4/10/2007, Entered: 4/10/2007 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                    Letter/request (non-motion) from Christopher Sovak. (Nici, Richard)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 289 Filed: 3/28/2007, Entered: 3/28/2007 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
                                                                      Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE.(Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/28/2007, Entered: 3/28/2007 Order on Report and Recommendations
                                                                        Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, the clerk is directed to dismiss this case. Because this dismissal is without prejudice in the sense that it does not address the merits of the allegations, refiling might be contemplated. In this connection, the attention of the parties is directed to Local Rule 40.1(G)which would for the near future cause the refiled case to be treated as a related matter which will be reassigned to this session (and in parallel to Magistrate Judge Collings' session). I would anticipate that under such circumstances case management concerns will result in proceedings effectively picking up where they were left off with this dismissal and previous discovery will be available with a view toward assuring that the case proceeds promptly to resolution. See, e.g., Arrow International v. Spire Biomedical Inc., 443 F.Supp. 2d 182 (D.Mass. 2006)(Woodlock, Douglas)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 288 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: 3/26/2007 Response
                                                                          Response by TheFaceBook.com to [285] Objection to Report and Recommendations. (Chatterjee, I.)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 287 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: 3/26/2007 Reply to Objection to Report and Recommendations
                                                                            REPLY TO OBJECTION to [283] Report and Recommendations by ConnectU LLC filed by Eduardo Saverin. (Hampton, Daniel)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: 3/20/2007 Order
                                                                              Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered. Defendants RESPONSE to [285] Objection to [283] Report and Recommendations filed by ConnectU LLC, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra is DUE NO LATER THAN MONDAY MARCH 26, 2007.(Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 286 Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: 3/16/2007 Declaration
                                                                                DECLARATION re [285] Objection to Report and Recommendations - DECLARATION OF MEREDITH H. SCHOENFELD IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION DATED MARCH 2, 2007 by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit 4# (5) Exhibit 38# (6) Exhibit 40# (7) Exhibit 41# (8) Exhibit 42# (9) Exhibit 53)(Hornick, John)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 285 Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: 3/16/2007 Objection to Report and Recommendations
                                                                                  OBJECTION to [283] Report and Recommendations Dated March 2, 2007 filed by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Hornick, John)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 284 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: 3/12/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    Judge Robert B. Collings : PROCEDURAL ORDER entered. (Dolan, Kathleen)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 283 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: 3/2/2007, Terminated: 3/28/2007 Report and RecommendationsCourt Filing
                                                                                      Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings: ORDER entered. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re [94] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com; Recommendation: RECOMMEND that Facebook Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #94 be ALLOWED. Objections to R&R due by 3/16/2007(Russo, Noreen)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: 3/2/2007 Order on Motion for Contempt
                                                                                        Judge Robert B. Collings: Electronic ORDER entered terminating [175] Motion for Contempt, terminating [227] Motion to Substitute Party. These terminations are administrative; if the case is not dismissed as recommended, the terminations shall be vacated.
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 282 Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: 1/22/2007 Memorandum of Law
                                                                                          Brief by ConnectU LLC to [281] Notice (Other). (Nici, Richard)FILED UNDER SEAL
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 281 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: 1/19/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                            NOTICE by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC OF FILING WITH THE CLERK'S OFFICE (Hornick, John) Received on 1/22/2007 (Nici, Richard).
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 280 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: 1/19/2007 Objection
                                                                                              Objection to [255] Brief by TheFaceBook.com (CORRECTED) Supplemental Opposition to ConnectU's Post Hearing Brief. (Chatterjee, I.)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 279 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: 1/19/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                DECLARATION re [107] Opposition to Motion,, Declaration of Meredith H. Schoenfeld in Support of Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Hornick, John)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: 1/19/2007 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                                                                  Judge Robert B. Collings : Electronic ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part [181] Motion for Leave to File. The Court shall accept the pleading only to the extent that legal argument is presented; the factual underpinnings of the issue were the subject of a full evidentiary hearing before the Court. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document.
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: 1/19/2007 Order on Motion to Strike
                                                                                                    Judge Robert B. Collings: Electronic ORDER entered granting [191] Motion to Strike since the issue to which the affidavits relate were the subject of a full evidentiary hearing before the Court.
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: 1/19/2007 Order on Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                      Judge Robert B. Collings : Electronic ORDER entered granting [174] Motion to Seal Document, granting [180] Motion to Seal Document, no oppositions having been filed to these motions.
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: 1/19/2007 Order on Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                        Judge Robert B. Collings : Electronic ORDER entered granting [195] Motion to Seal Document.
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: 1/19/2007 Order on Motion to Correct
                                                                                                          Judge Robert B. Collings: Electronic ORDER entered granting [268] Motion to Correct, granting [272] Motion for Leave to File; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document., granting [274] Motion to Seal, granting [147] Motion to Seal, granting [200] Motion to Seal, granting [204] Motion to Seal Document, granting [211] Motion to Seal Document, granting [223] Motion to Seal.
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 278 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: 1/16/2007 Exhibit
                                                                                                            EXHIBIT A-E re [276] Declaration,, by Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Nici, Richard)FILED UNDER SEAL
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 277 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: 1/12/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 276 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: 1/12/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                DECLARATION re [275] Brief - DECLARATION OF MEREDITH H. SCHOENFELD IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' CORRECTED SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO CONNECTU LLC'S POST HEARING BRIEF by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - SEALED EXHIBIT# (2) Exhibit B - SEALED EXHIBIT# (3) Exhibit C - SEALED EXHIBIT# (4) Exhibit D - SEALED EXHIBIT# (5) Exhibit E - SEALED EXHIBIT# (6) Exhibit F# (7) Exhibit G# (8) Exhibit H)(Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 275 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: 1/12/2007 Brief
                                                                                                                  BRIEF by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC -- PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' CORRECTED SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO CONNECTU LLC'S POST-HEARING BRIEF. (Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 274 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: 1/12/2007, Terminated: 1/19/2007 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION to Seal Exhibits A-E to the Declaration of Meredith H. Schoenfeld in Support of Plaintiff's Reply to Facebook Defendants' Supplemental Opposition to ConnectU LLC's Post-Hearing Brief by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ENDORSED ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASEAssociated Cases: 1:07-cv-10593-DPW, 1:04-cv-11923-DPW(York, Steve) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 273 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: 1/12/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                        NOTICE by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC NOTICE OF FILING WITH CLERK'S OFFICE (Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT re Issuance of Mandate from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals by Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, TheFaceBook.com, Mark Zuckerberg. (Cooper, Monte) (Entered: 07/05/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 272 Filed: 1/9/2007, Entered: 1/9/2007, Terminated: 1/19/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                            Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Supplemental Opposition to ConnectU's 10/25/06 Brief by Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com. (Attachments: # (1) Corrected Supplemental Brief# (2) Proposed Order)(Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: 1/19/2010 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 271 Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: 1/8/2007 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                Opposition re [270] MOTION for Extension of Time to 01/19/07 to To File Supplemental Briefs filed by TheFaceBook.com. (Chatterjee, I.)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 9/30/2009, Entered: 9/30/2009 Case Stayed
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 12/28/2006, Entered: 12/28/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                    Judge Robert B. Collings: Electronic ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part [270] Motion for Extension of Time. The defendants' predicament is of their own making. Even if they innocently misperceived the Court's instructions, they should have sought clarification from the Court when they received plaintiff's brief in which all legal issues were raised. The Court shall extend the time for defendants to file their brief from January 5 to January 8 and extend the time for plaintiff's reply to January 12, 2007 but shall grant no further extensions.
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 9/30/2009, Entered: 9/30/2009 Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 270 Filed: 12/27/2006, Entered: 12/27/2006, Terminated: 12/28/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to 01/19/07 to To File Supplemental Briefs by Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes.(Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: 2/27/2009 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Daniel K. Hampton (Hampton, Daniel) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 269 Filed: 12/21/2006, Entered: 12/21/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            Judge Robert B. Collings : ORDER entered. (Dolan, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: 1/22/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER entered granting substitution of attorney filed by Eduardo Saverin. re (329 in 1:04-cv-11923-DPW)(Seelye, Terri) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 268 Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: 12/11/2006, Terminated: 1/19/2007 Motion to Correct
                                                                                                                                                Assented to MOTION to Correct [265] Brief by Eduardo Saverin. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Defendant Eduardo Saverin's Corrected Brief in Response to the Court's October 25, 2006 Order)(Hampton, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 1/21/2009, Entered: 1/21/2009 Motion to Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                                  Proposed order granting substitution of attorney by Eduardo Saverin.(Hampton, Daniel) Modified text & termed motion on 1/22/2009 (Seelye, Terri). (Entered: 01/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 267 Filed: 12/7/2006, Entered: 12/7/2006 Response
                                                                                                                                                    Response by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC - PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO FACEBOOK DEFENDANTS' AND SAVERINS OPPOSITIONS TO POST-HEARING BRIEF IN COMPLIANCE WITH THE COURT'S OCTOBER 25, 2006 ORDER. (Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: 1/7/2009 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                      Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of James E. Towery and Alison F. Buchanan Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 01010000000002249469. by ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Bailey, Gregg) (Entered: 01/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 266 Filed: 11/30/2006, Entered: 11/30/2006 Response
                                                                                                                                                        Response by Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com to [255] Brief re Connectu's October 25, 2006 Post Hearing Brief. (Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: 12/22/2008 Amended Document
                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED DOCUMENT by ConnectU LLC. Amended Corporate Disclosure Statement. (Bailey, Gregg) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 265 Filed: 11/30/2006, Entered: 11/30/2006 Brief
                                                                                                                                                            BRIEF by Eduardo Saverin in response to the Court's October 25, 2006 Order. (Hampton, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: 12/22/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Peter M. Durney on behalf of ConnectU LLC (Durney, Peter) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 264 Filed: 11/28/2006, Entered: 11/28/2006 Memorandum and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                Judge Robert B. Collings : MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE ADMISSIONS (#244).(Dolan, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: 12/22/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Gregg P. Bailey on behalf of ConnectU LLC (Bailey, Gregg) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 263 Filed: 11/22/2006, Entered: 11/22/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Evidentiary Hearing (Day Two) held on October 25, 2006 before Judge Collings. Digital Recording: Transcribed by Maryann Young. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting Maryann Young at 508/384-2003 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: 12/19/2008 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re 316 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com. (Sutton, Theresa) (Entered: 12/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 262 Filed: 11/22/2006, Entered: 11/22/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Evidentiary Hearing (Afternoon Session) held on October 24, 2006 before Judge Collings. Digital Recording: Transcribed by Maryann Young. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting Maryann Young at 508/384-2003 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 12/18/2008, Entered: 12/18/2008 Certificate of Service pursuant to LR 5.2
                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mark Zuckerberg, Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, TheFaceBook.com re 322 Response to Motion,. (Sutton, Theresa) (Entered: 12/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 261 Filed: 11/22/2006, Entered: 11/22/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Evidentiary Hearing held on October 24, 2006 before Judge Collings. Digital Recording: Transcribed by Maryann Young. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting Maryann Young at 508/384-2003 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 12/18/2008, Entered: 12/18/2008 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to Motion re 320 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of D. Michael Underhill, 318 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Evan A. Parke filed by Mark Zuckerberg, Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, TheFaceBook.com. (Sutton, Theresa) (Entered: 12/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 260 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: 11/21/2006 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Troy Grabow (Grabow, Troy)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: 12/17/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION re 320 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of D. Michael Underhill by D. Michael Underhill, Esquire by Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss. (McConchie, Scott) (Entered: 12/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 259 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: 11/21/2006 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                    Amended REPLY to Response to Motion re [244] MOTION to Strike Admissions - Leave to File Granted on November 20, 2006 filed by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: 12/17/2008 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of D. Michael Underhill by Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss.(McConchie, Scott) (Entered: 12/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: 11/20/2006 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Robert B. Collings: Electronic ORDER entered granting [258] Motion for Leave to File; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document.
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: 12/17/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION re 318 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Evan A. Parke by Evan A. Parke, Esquire by Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss. (McConchie, Scott) (Entered: 12/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 258 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: 11/17/2006, Terminated: 11/20/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                            Assented to MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Reply to Facebook Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Admissions by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Amended Reply# (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: 12/17/2008 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Evan A. Parke by Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss.(McConchie, Scott) (Entered: 12/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 257 Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: 11/15/2006 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re [244] MOTION to Strike Admissions filed by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: 12/16/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss with prejudice by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg, Eduardo Saverin. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-11923-DPW, 1:07-cv-10593-DPW(Seelye, Terri) (Entered: 12/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 256 Filed: 11/10/2006, Entered: 11/10/2006 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION re [255] Brief -- DECLARATION OF MEREDITH H. SCHOENFELD IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S POST-HEARING BRIEF IN COMPLIANCE WITH THE COURT'S OCTOBER 25, 2006 ORDER by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2)(Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 316 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: 12/16/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss with prejudice all claims against The Facebook, Inc. and Mark Zuckerberg by Connectu, Inc., ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss.Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-11923-DPW, 1:07-cv-10593-DPW(Seelye, Terri) (Entered: 12/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 255 Filed: 11/10/2006, Entered: 11/10/2006 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                        BRIEF by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC - - PLAINTIFF'S POST-HEARING BRIEF IN COMPLIANCE WITH THE COURT'S OCTOBER 25, 2006 ORDER. (Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: 12/16/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by James P. Harrington on behalf of Special Master George C. Fisher to comply with order and judgment in action before the Honorable James Ware in US District Court for the Northern District of California ("California Action") involving claims in and parties to this action ("Massachusetts Action"). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Seelye, Terri) (Entered: 12/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/1/2006, Entered: 11/1/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Robert B. Collings: Electronic ORDER entered. Counsel for the plaintiffs shall file and serve a reply memorandum on or before the close of business on November 15, 2006 replying to the arguments made in [253] Opposition to Motion filed by Mark Zuckerberg,, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com. Among other points, the Court would like to hear the plaintiff's position on (1) whether it is only admissions which may not be used in other proceedings but that the use of responses which are not admissions is not so proscribed and (2) whether Mr. Narendra's response over and above the statement "party admits visitng FACEBOOK'S website" is not an admission since it is not responsive to the request.
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 254 Filed: 10/27/2006, Entered: 10/27/2006 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION re [253] Opposition to Motion by Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B)(Chatterjee, I.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 253 Filed: 10/27/2006, Entered: 10/27/2006 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Opposition re [244] MOTION to Strike Admissions filed by Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com. (Chatterjee, I.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 252 Filed: 10/25/2006, Entered: 10/25/2006 Addendum to Motion/Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ADDENDUM re [249] MOTION for Leave to File Introduce Depo Testimony ISO Evidentiary Hearing (FACEBOOK DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS) filed by Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com. (Oczek, Jeremy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/25/2006, Entered: 10/25/2006 Evidentiary Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Robert B. Collings: Continued Evidentiary Hearing on motion to dismiss held on 10/25/2006. Testimony of Mr. Nerendra is completed. Counsel to submit exhibits which have been admitted in the case. At the hearing, Court rules on the record on objections to plaintiff's counterdesignations of Maria Antonelli's deposition. Court will deny motion [243] without prejudice to bringing the motion in the Western District of Washington, the Court from which the subpoena in dispute was issued. Legal briefs to be filed on legal issues (with no citations to transcripts) as follows: plaintiff by cob 11/10/2006; defendants by 11/30/2006; plaintiff's reply (which shall not exceed seven (7) pages) by cob 12/7/2006.(Digital Recording)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/25/2006, Entered: 10/25/2006 Order on Motion to Quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Robert B. Collings: Electronic ORDER entered denying [243] Motion to Quash without prejudice to filing the motion in the Western District of Washington which is the Court "by which [the] subpoena was issued" and which, as such, under Rule 45(c)(3)(A), Fed. R. Civ. P., has the power to quash the subpeona.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: 10/24/2006 Evidentiary Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Robert B. Collings: Evidentiary Hearing re: motion to dismiss held on 10/24/2006. Messrs. Tyler Winklevoss, Paulkner and Cameron Winklevoss testify. Mr. Nerendra's testimony commences. Case continued to 10/25/2006 at 9:00 A.M. (Digital Recording)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: 10/24/2006 Order on Motion to Quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Robert B. Collings: Electronic ORDER entered withdrawing [247] Motion to Quash, granting in part and denying in part [249] Motion for Leave to Introduce Deposition Testimony. The motion [249] is allowed as to Maria Antonelli to the extent that after the Court rules on any objections to plaintiffs' counterdesignations, the Court will admit the witness' deposition testimony and shall consider designated and counterdesignated portions of the deposition transcript; the motion [249] is denied as to witness Paulkner as he testified at the hearing; the motion [249] is denied as to the witness Kumar since counsel for the defendants is no longer pressing the admission of his deposition testimony.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 251 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: 10/23/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com (FACEBOOK DEFENDANTS' PRE-HEARING STATEMENT) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Oczek, Jeremy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 250 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: 10/23/2006, Terminated: 3/28/2007 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Seal Document by Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 249 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: 10/23/2006, Terminated: 10/24/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Introduce Depo Testimony ISO Evidentiary Hearing by Mark Zuckerberg, Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, TheFaceBook.com, Dustin Moskovitz, Mark Zuckerberg, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com.(Sutton, Theresa) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/24/2006 (Nici, Richard). Received Exhibits A-C on 10/25/2006 (Nici, Richard).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 248 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: 10/23/2006 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re [247] MOTION to Quash the Subpoena Served on Howard Winklevoss filed by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 247 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: 10/23/2006, Terminated: 10/24/2006 Motion to Quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Quash the Subpoena Served on Howard Winklevoss by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 246 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: 10/23/2006 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Meredith H. Schoenfeld in Support of Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Strike Admissions by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 245 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: 10/23/2006 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re [244] MOTION to Strike Admissions filed by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 244 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: 10/23/2006, Terminated: 11/28/2006 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Strike Admissions by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC.(Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 243 Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: 10/19/2006, Terminated: 10/25/2006 Motion to Quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Quash Deposition Subpoenas Duces Tecum Served on Non-Parties by John Taves, Pacific Northwest Software. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, B and C)(Giunta, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 242 Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: 10/19/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin G. Kenneally on behalf of John Taves, Pacific Northwest Software (Kenneally, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 241 Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: 10/19/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Giunta on behalf of John Taves, Pacific Northwest Software (Giunta, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: 10/18/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Robert B. Collings: Electronic ORDER entered. If any party wishes to offer deposition testimony at the hearing on October 24th because the witness or witnesses is/are beyond the subpoena power of the Court, the party shall file and serve a motion for leave to introduce the deposition testimony together with the designations of the deposition transcript(s) which the party seeks to introduce. At the hearing, the other party shall be prepared to counterdesignate portions of the deposition(s) in the event the Court grants leave for the deposition(s) to be introduced.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 240 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: 10/17/2006 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Lawrence R. Robins (Robins, Lawrence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 239 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: 10/17/2006 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Jonathan M. Gelchinsky (Gelchinsky, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 238 Filed: 10/13/2006, Entered: 10/13/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Scott McConchie on behalf of Divya Narendra (McConchie, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 237 Filed: 10/13/2006, Entered: 10/13/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel P. Tighe on behalf of ConnectU LLC (Tighe, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 236 Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: 9/27/2006 Withdrawal of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Withdrawal of motion: [163] MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by ConnectU LLC,, Cameron Winklevoss,, Tyler Winklevoss,, Divya Narendra,.. (Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: 9/25/2006 Order on Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Robert B. Collings: Electronic ORDER entered denying [63] Motion to Compel, denying [68] Motion to Compel, denying [90] Motion to Compel, denying [121] Motion to Compel, denying [126] Motion to Compel. These actions are taken for administrative purposes and are without prejudice pending resolution of the pending jurisdictional dispute. If jurisdiction is found, the denials will be vacated forthwith and the motions will be decided.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 235 Filed: 9/7/2006, Entered: 9/7/2006 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re [227] MOTION to Substitute Party Plaintiff - - Leave to file granted on September 7, 2006 filed by ConnectU LLC. (Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/7/2006, Entered: 9/7/2006 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Robert B. Collings : Electronic ORDER entered granting [233] Motion for Leave to File; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Dolan, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/7/2006, Entered: 9/7/2006 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Hearings: Evidentiary Hearing reset for 10/24/2006 @ 10:00 AM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings. (Russo, Noreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/7/2006, Entered: 9/7/2006 Order on Motion for Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Robert B. Collings : Electronic ORDER entered granting [234] Motion to Re-Schedule Evidentiary Hearing. Motion ALLOWED to 10/24/06 at 10:00 A.M. (Dolan, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 234 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: 9/6/2006, Terminated: 9/7/2006 Motion for Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION for Hearing re [230] Order (ASSENTED-TO MOTION FOR RESCHEDULING OF THE EVIDENTIARY HEARING ON 09/26/2006) by Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com.(Oczek, Jeremy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 233 Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: 9/5/2006, Terminated: 9/7/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Facebook Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute Party Plaintiff by ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Proposed Reply# (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 232 Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: 9/5/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Eduardo Saverin Notice of Clarification regarding joining of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute Party Plaintiff (Hampton, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 231 Filed: 8/29/2006, Entered: 8/29/2006 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposition re [227] MOTION to Substitute Party Plaintiff filed by Mark Zuckerberg, Eduardo Saverin, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com. (Cooper, Monte)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/25/2006, Entered: 8/25/2006 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Hearings: Evidentiary Hearing set for 9/26/2006 @ 10:00 AM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings. (Russo, Noreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 230 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: 8/24/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Robert B. Collings : SECOND MEMORANDUM AND PROCEDURAL ORDER entered. Evidentiary hearing scheduled for September 26, 2006 at 10:00 A.M.(Dolan, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 229 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: 8/15/2006 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION re [228] Memorandum in Support of Motion - Declaration of Meredith H. Schoenfeld in Support of Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute Party Plaintiff by ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2)(Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 228 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: 8/15/2006 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re [227] MOTION to Substitute Party Plaintiff filed by ConnectU LLC. (Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 227 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: 8/15/2006, Terminated: 3/2/2007 Motion to Substitute Party
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Substitute Party Plaintiff by ConnectU LLC.(Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 226 Filed: 7/27/2006, Entered: 7/27/2006 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION re [225] Objection by Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E# (6) Exhibit G# (7) Exhibit H# (8) Exhibit L# (9) Exhibit M# (10) Exhibit N# (11) Exhibit O# (12) Exhibit P# (13) Exhibit R# (14) Exhibit V# (15) Exhibit Y)(Chatterjee, I.) Modified on 8/2/2006 (Nici, Richard). Exhibits F, J, K, Q, S, T, U, W and X FILED UNDER SEAL.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 225 Filed: 7/27/2006, Entered: 7/27/2006 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Objection to [212] Memorandum of Law by Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com. (Chatterjee, I.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 224 Filed: 7/27/2006, Entered: 7/27/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com re [223] Assented to MOTION to Seal , Notice of Manual Filing (Chatterjee, I.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 223 Filed: 7/27/2006, Entered: 7/27/2006, Terminated: 1/19/2007 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Assented to MOTION to Seal by Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com.(Chatterjee, I.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 222 Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: 7/25/2006 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION re [212] Memorandum of Law - - Declaration of John F. Hornick in Support of Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Compliance with the Court's June 22, 2006 Order Regarding Legal Arguments Raised by Facebook Defendants (Filed July 13, 2006) by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 10)(Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 221 Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: 7/25/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing (Volume 3) held on June 22, 2006 before Judge Collings. Digital Recording: Transcribed by Maryann Young. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting Maryann Young at 508/384-2003 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 220 Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: 7/25/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing (Volume 2) held on June 22, 2006 before Judge Collings. Digital Recording: Transcribed by Maryann Young. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting Maryann Young at 508/384-2003 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 219 Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: 7/25/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing (Volume 1) held on June 22,2006 before Judge Collings. Digital Recording: Transcribed by Maryann Young. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting Maryann Young at 508/384-2003 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 218 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: 7/24/2006 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter/request (non-motion) from Margaret A. Esquenet regarding D.I. 213.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 9)(Esquenet, Margaret)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 217 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: 7/24/2006 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re [175] MOTION for Contempt - LEAVE TO FILE REPLY GRANTED 7/19/2006 filed by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 7/19/2006, Entered: 7/19/2006 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Robert B. Collings: Electronic ORDER entered granting [215] Motion for Leave to File; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 216 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: 7/14/2006 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Margaret A. Esquenet in Support of Plaintiff's Reply to Facebook Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Contempt by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3)(Esquenet, Margaret)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 215 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: 7/14/2006, Terminated: 7/19/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply to the Facebook Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Contempt by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A- Proposed Reply# (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Esquenet, Margaret)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: 7/14/2006 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered granting [209] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Theresa A. Sutton for Mark Zuckerberg and Eduardo Saverin (Nici, Richard)Receipt #73717 $50
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 214 Filed: 7/13/2006, Entered: 7/13/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 213 Filed: 7/13/2006, Entered: 7/13/2006 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Meredith H. Schoenfeld in Support of Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Compliance with the Court's June 22, 2006 Order Regarding Legal Arguments Raised by Facebook Defendants by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - FILED UNDER SEAL# (2) Exhibit 2 - FILED UNDER SEAL# (3) Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit 4# (5) Exhibit 5# (6) Exhibit 6# (7) Exhibit 7 - FILED UNDER SEAL# (8) Exhibit 8# (9) Exhibit 9)(Hornick, John) Modified on 7/18/2006 (Nici, Richard). Received exhibits 1, 2 & 7.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 212 Filed: 7/13/2006, Entered: 7/13/2006 Memorandum of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 211 Filed: 7/13/2006, Entered: 7/13/2006, Terminated: 1/19/2007 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Assented to MOTION to Seal Document by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 210 Filed: 7/13/2006, Entered: 7/13/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC NOTICE OF FILING WITH CLERK'S OFFICE (Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 209 Filed: 7/13/2006, Entered: 7/13/2006, Terminated: 7/14/2006 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Theresa A. Sutton by Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration)(Oczek, Jeremy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 208 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Mark Zuckerberg, Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, TheFaceBook.com, Dustin Moskovitz, Mark Zuckerberg, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com. ConnectU LLC served on 7/10/2006, answer due 7/31/2006; Eduardo Saverin served on 7/10/2006, answer due 7/31/2006; Eduardo Saverin served on 7/10/2006, answer due 7/31/2006; ConnectU LLC served on 7/10/2006, answer due 7/31/2006. Acknowledgement filed by Mark Zuckerberg; Christopher Hughes; Andrew McCollum; Dustin Moskovitz; TheFaceBook.com; Dustin Moskovitz; Mark Zuckerberg; Andrew McCollum; Christopher Hughes; TheFaceBook.com. (Cooper, Monte)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 207 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Monte Cooper ISO Facebook Defs' Oppo to PL's Mtn for Contempt by Mark Zuckerberg, Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, TheFaceBook.com, Dustin Moskovitz, Mark Zuckerberg, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-F)(Cooper, Monte) Modified on 7/11/2006 (Nici, Richard). Exhibits E & F received and FILED UNDER SEAL.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 206 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposition re [175] MOTION for Contempt filed by Mark Zuckerberg, Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, TheFaceBook.com, Dustin Moskovitz, Mark Zuckerberg, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com. (Cooper, Monte)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 205 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Mark Zuckerberg, Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, TheFaceBook.com, Dustin Moskovitz, Mark Zuckerberg, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com of Filing With Clerk's Office (Cooper, Monte)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 204 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006, Terminated: 1/19/2007 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Assented to MOTION to Seal Document by Mark Zuckerberg, Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, TheFaceBook.com, Dustin Moskovitz, Mark Zuckerberg, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com.(Cooper, Monte)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 203 Filed: 7/5/2006, Entered: 7/5/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Esquenet, Margaret)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 202 Filed: 7/5/2006, Entered: 7/5/2006 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION re [201] Opposition to Motion, - - Declaration of Margaret A. Esquenet in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Facebook Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Supplemental Declarations of Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, and Cameron Winklevoss in Support of Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Filed Under Seal Cover Page# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit 4)(Esquenet, Margaret) Modified on 7/6/2006 (Nici, Richard). Received EXHIBIT 1 on 7/6/06.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 201 Filed: 7/5/2006, Entered: 7/5/2006 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Opposition re [191] MOTION to Strike PL's Supp Decls of Narendra, and Winkelvoss - - Plaintiff's Opposition to Facebook Defendant's Motion to Strike Supplemental Declarations of Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, and Cameron Winklevoss in Support of Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief filed by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Esquenet, Margaret)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 200 Filed: 7/5/2006, Entered: 7/5/2006, Terminated: 1/19/2007 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Assented to MOTION to Seal Documents by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Esquenet, Margaret)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 199 Filed: 7/5/2006, Entered: 7/5/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC -- NOTICE OF FILING WITH CLERK'S OFFICE (Esquenet, Margaret)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: 6/26/2006 Evidentiary Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Robert B. Collings: Evidentiary Hearing held on 6/22/2006 on the question of the citizenship of Mr. Zuckerberg at the time the Complaint was filed on 9/2/2004. Plaintiff to file and serve a memorandum of law with respect to three legal arguments advanced by defendants by cob 7/13/2006; defendants may reply by cob 7/27/2006. Whether or not Nerenda was a member of the LLC on September 2, 2004 will be the subject of a further evidentiary hearing if necessary. (Digital Recording)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 198 Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: 6/21/2006 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION -- CORRECTED Declaration of Meredith H. Schoenfeld in Support of Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, Presenting New Evidence and Supplemental Authority in View of PRAMCO by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 197 Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: 6/21/2006 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBITS A & H re [194] Affidavit,, by ConnectU LLC. FILED UNDER SEAL (Nici, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 196 Filed: 6/20/2006, Entered: 6/20/2006 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com. ConnectU LLC served on 6/20/2006, answer due 7/10/2006; ConnectU LLC served on 6/20/2006, answer due 7/10/2006. Acknowledgement filed by Mark Zuckerberg; Dustin Moskovitz; Andrew McCollum; Christopher Hughes; TheFaceBook.com. (Nagel, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 195 Filed: 6/20/2006, Entered: 6/20/2006, Terminated: 1/19/2007 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Seal Document by Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com.(Nagel, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 194 Filed: 6/20/2006, Entered: 6/20/2006 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OMNIBUS DECL OF COOPER ISO FACEBOOK'S OPPO TO PL'S MTN FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPP BREIF AND FACEBOOK DEFS' MTN TO STRIKE PL'S SUPP DECLS OF NARENDRA AND WINKLEVOSS by Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit B# (2) Exhibit C# (3) Exhibit D# (4) Exhibit E# (5) Exhibit F# (6) Exhibit G# (7) Exhibit I# (8) Exhibit J# (9) Exhibit K# (10) Exhibit L# (11) Exhibit M# (12) Exhibit N# (13) Exhibit O# (14) Exhibit P# (15) Exhibit Q)(Nagel, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 193 Filed: 6/20/2006, Entered: 6/20/2006 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Robert D. Nagel in Opposition re [181] MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, Presenting New Evidence and Supplemental Authority in View of PRAMCO filed by Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Nagel, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 192 Filed: 6/20/2006, Entered: 6/20/2006 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [181] MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, Presenting New Evidence and Supplemental Authority in View of PRAMCO filed by Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com. (Nagel, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 191 Filed: 6/20/2006, Entered: 6/20/2006, Terminated: 1/19/2007 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Strike PL's Supp Decls of Narendra, and Winkelvoss by Mark Zuckerberg, Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, TheFaceBook.com, Dustin Moskovitz, Mark Zuckerberg, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com.(Nagel, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: 6/16/2006 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered granting [190] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Annette L. Hurst for Mark Zuckerberg and Eduardo Saverin (Nici, Richard)Receipt #73183 $50
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Robert B. Collings: Electronic ORDER entered granting [189] Assented-to Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered granting [188] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Meredith H. Schoenfeld for ConnectU LLC (Nici, Richard)Receipt #73140 $50
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 190 Filed: 6/14/2006, Entered: 6/14/2006, Terminated: 6/16/2006 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Annette L. Hurst by Eduardo Saverin. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Declaration of Annette L. Hurst in Support of Assented-to Motion For Admission Pro Hac Vice# (2) Exhibit Text of Proposed Order)(Hampton, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 189 Filed: 6/14/2006, Entered: 6/14/2006, Terminated: 6/15/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 07/10/2006 to File Response/Reply as to [175] MOTION for Contempt by Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com.(Oczek, Jeremy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 188 Filed: 6/14/2006, Entered: 6/14/2006, Terminated: 6/15/2006 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Meredith H. Schoenfeld by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit - Declaration of Meredith Schoenfeld)(Robins, Lawrence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 187 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: 6/13/2006 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [94] MOTION to Dismiss filed by ConnectU LLC. (Nici, Richard)FILED UNDER SEAL Modified on 6/13/2006 (Nici, Richard).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 186 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: 6/12/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 185 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: 6/12/2006 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Tyler Winklevoss in Support of Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, Presenting New Evidence and Supplemental Authority in View of PRAMCO by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 184 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: 6/12/2006 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Divya Narendra in Support of Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, Presenting New Evidence and Supplemental Authority in View of PRAMCO by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 183 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: 6/12/2006 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Cameron Winklevoss in Support of Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, Presenting New Evidence and Supplemental Authority in View of PRAMCO by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 182 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: 6/12/2006 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Meredith H. Schoenfeld in Support of Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, Presenting New Evidence and Supplemental Authority in View of PRAMCO by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit 4 - FILED UNDER SEAL COVER PAGE# (5) Exhibit 5# (6) Exhibit 6# (7) Exhibit 7 - FILED UNDER SEAL COVER PAGE# (8) Exhibit 8# (9) Exhibit 9 - FILED UNDER SEAL COVER PAGE# (10) Exhibit 10 - FILED UNDER SEAL COVER PAGE# (11) Exhibit 11 - FILED UNDER SEAL COVER PAGE# (12) Exhibit 12 - FILED UNDER SEAL COVER PAGE# (13) Exhibit 13 - FILED UNDER SEAL COVER PAGE# (14) Exhibit 14 - FILED UNDER SEAL COVER PAGE# (15) Exhibit 15 - FILED UNDER SEAL COVER PAGE# (16) Exhibit 16 - FILED UNDER SEAL COVER PAGE# (17) Exhibit 17 - FILED UNDER SEAL COVER PAGE# (18) Exhibit 18 - FILED UNDER SEAL COVER PAGE# (19) Exhibit 19 - FILED UNDER SEAL COVER PAGE# (20) Exhibit 20 - FILED UNDER SEAL COVER PAGE# (21) Exhibit 21 - FILED UNDER SEAL COVER PAGE# (22) Exhibit 22 - FILED UNDER SEAL COVER PAGE# (23) Exhibit 23)(Hornick, John) Received exhibits 4,7,9 and 10-22 6/12/2006 (Nici, Richard). FILED UNDER SEAL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 181 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: 6/12/2006, Terminated: 1/19/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, Presenting New Evidence and Supplemental Authority in View of PRAMCO by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Brief - Filed Under Seal Cover Page# (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 180 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: 6/12/2006, Terminated: 1/19/2007 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Seal Document - MOTION TO SEAL DOCUMENTS by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 179 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: 6/12/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC - NOTICE OF FILING WITH CLERK'S OFFICE (Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 178 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: 6/9/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 177 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: 6/9/2006 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION re [175] MOTION for Contempt - DECLARATION OF MEREDITH H. SCHOENFELD IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CONTEMPT by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Part 1 of 2# (2) Errata 1 - Part 2 of 2# (3) Exhibit 2 - Part 1 of 3# (4) Exhibit 2 - Part 2 of 3# (5) Exhibit 2 - Part 3 of 3# (6) Exhibit 3# (7) Exhibit 4# (8) Exhibit 5# (9) Exhibit 6# (10) Exhibit 7# (11) Exhibit 8# (12) Exhibit 9# (13) Exhibit 10# (14) Exhibit 11# (15) Exhibit 12# (16) Exhibit 13# (17) Exhibit 14# (18) Exhibit 15 - Filed Under Seal Cover Page# (19) Exhibit 16 - Filed Under Seal Cover Page# (20) Exhibit 17 - Filed Under Seal Cover Page)(Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 176 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: 6/9/2006 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re [175] MOTION for Contempt filed by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 175 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: 6/9/2006, Terminated: 3/2/2007 Motion for Contempt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Contempt by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 174 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: 6/9/2006, Terminated: 1/19/2007 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Seal Document - Motion to Seal Documents by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 173 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: 6/9/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC of Filing with Clerk's Office (Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 172 Filed: 5/1/2006, Entered: 5/1/2006 Memorandum and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Robert B. Collings : MEMORANDUM AND PROCEDURAL ORDER. Evidentiary hearing set for June 22, 2006 at 9:00 A.M.(Dolan, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: 4/27/2006 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Robert B. Collings: Electronic ORDER entered granting [165] Motion for Leave to File. Document #170 will be considered a surreply. No further filings are permitted on the issue unless requested by the Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 171 Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: 4/26/2006 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Response by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC to Notice of Newly Identified Authority in Support of ConnectU LLC's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 170 Filed: 4/24/2006, Entered: 4/24/2006 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Opposition re [165] MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff Connectu LLC's Reply to Facebook Defendants' Response to Connectu's "Forensic Recovery" Arguments filed by Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com. (Cooper, Monte)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 169 Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: 4/14/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com re [94] MOTION to Dismiss (Notice of Newly Identified Authority) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Oczek, Jeremy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 168 Filed: 4/13/2006, Entered: 4/13/2006 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of ROBERT D. NAGEL in Opposition re [163] MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by TheFaceBook.com, TheFaceBook.com. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit # (2) Exhibit A# (3) Exhibit B# (4) Exhibit C# (5) Exhibit D# (6) Exhibit E# (7) Exhibit F# (8) Exhibit G# (9) Exhibit H# (10) Exhibit I)(Nagel, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 167 Filed: 4/13/2006, Entered: 4/13/2006 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposition re [163] MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by TheFaceBook.com, TheFaceBook.com. (Nagel, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 166 Filed: 4/13/2006, Entered: 4/13/2006 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re [163] MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Eduardo Saverin. (Hampton, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 165 Filed: 4/10/2006, Entered: 4/10/2006, Terminated: 4/27/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff Connectu LLC's Reply to Facebook Defendants' Response to Connectu's "Forensic Recovery" Arguments by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Proposed Reply# (2) Exhibit A-Exhibit to Proposed Reply)(Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 164 Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: 3/31/2006 Order on Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings : ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORY NOS. 6, 9-14, 16 AND 18 (#52) granting in part and denying in part [52] Motion to Compel. (Russo, Noreen).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: 3/31/2006 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction to entry 164: to add language "granting in part and denying in part" rather than just "granting" re Motion [52] (Russo, Noreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 163 Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: 3/30/2006, Terminated: 9/27/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E)(Gelchinsky, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 162 Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: 3/30/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com re [154] Affidavit in Support Service of Under Seal Exhibit L. (Cooper, Monte)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: 3/30/2006 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBIT L re [159] Response, by TheFaceBook.com. FILED UNDER SEAL (Nici, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 161 Filed: 3/29/2006, Entered: 3/29/2006 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION re [159] Response, Of James Butterworth In Support of [159] by Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Cooper, Monte)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 160 Filed: 3/29/2006, Entered: 3/29/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com Assented-To-Motion to Seal Exhibit L to the Affidavit of Monte Cooper (Cooper, Monte)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 159 Filed: 3/29/2006, Entered: 3/29/2006 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Response by Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com to [148] Status Report,,,, and ConnectU's Renewed "Forensic Recovery" Arguments from the March 3, 2006 Motions Hearing. (Cooper, Monte)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 158 Filed: 3/29/2006, Entered: 3/29/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com re [154] Affidavit in Support (Manual Filing of Exhibit L) (Cooper, Monte)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 157 Filed: 3/29/2006, Entered: 3/29/2006 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBIT re [154] Affidavit in Support (Exhibits C - J and M - N) by Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit D# (2) Exhibit E# (3) Exhibit F# (4) Exhibit G# (5) Exhibit H# (6) Exhibit I# (7) Exhibit J# (8) Exhibit K# (9) Exhibit M# (10) Exhibit N)(Cooper, Monte)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 156 Filed: 3/29/2006, Entered: 3/29/2006 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBIT re [154] Affidavit in Support (Exhibit B) by Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com. (Cooper, Monte)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 155 Filed: 3/29/2006, Entered: 3/29/2006 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBIT re [154] Affidavit in Support (Exhibit A) by Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com. (Cooper, Monte)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 154 Filed: 3/29/2006, Entered: 3/29/2006 Affidavit in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT in Support Of Facebook Defendants' Response to ConnectU's Renewed "Forensic Recovery" Arguments from March 3, 2006 Motions Hearing. (Cooper, Monte)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 153 Filed: 3/29/2006, Entered: 3/29/2006 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Response by Eduardo Saverin to [148] Status Report,,,,. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, previously submitted Declaration of Saverin# (2) Exhibit 2, Saverin answers to forensic discovery interrogatories)(Hampton, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/21/2006, Entered: 3/21/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Robert B. Collings : Electronic ORDER entered granting [150] Motion for Extension of Time to File Responses. (Dolan, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 152 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: 3/20/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing (Volume 2) held on March 3, 2006 before Judge Collings. Digital Recording: Transcribed by Maryann Young. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting Maryann Young at 508/384-2003 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 151 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: 3/20/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on March 3, 2006 before Judge Collings. Digital Recording: Transcribed by Maryann Young. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting Maryann Young at 508/384-2003 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 150 Filed: 3/17/2006, Entered: 3/17/2006, Terminated: 3/21/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 03/29/2006 to File Response/Reply as to [148] Status Report,,,,, Motion Hearing,,,,,,,, and ConnectU's Re-argument on Motion [37] by Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com.(Oczek, Jeremy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 149 Filed: 3/10/2006, Entered: 3/10/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 148 Filed: 3/10/2006, Entered: 3/10/2006 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT - Summary of March 3, 2006 Status Report and Requests Related to Discovery Permitted by November 18, 2005 Electronic Order by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Part 1# (2) Exhibit 1 - Part 2# (3) Exhibit 1 - Part 3# (4) Exhibit 1 - Part 4# (5) Exhibit 1 - Part 5# (6) Exhibit 2 - Part 1# (7) Exhibit 2 - Part 2# (8) Exhibit 2 - Part 3# (9) Exhibit 2 - Part 4# (10) Exhibit 3 - Filed Under Seal Cover Page# (11) Exhibit 4 - Filed Under Seal Cover Page# (12) Exhibit 5# (13) Exhibit 6 - Filed Under Seal Cover Page# (14) Exhibit 7# (15) Exhibit 8 - Filed Under Seal Cover Page# (16) Exhibit 9 - Filed Under Seal Cover Page# (17) Exhibit 10 - Intentionally Skipped# (18) Exhibit 11# (19) Exhibit 12# (20) Exhibit 13 - Filed Under Seal Cover Page# (21) Exhibit 14# (22) Exhibit 15# (23) Exhibit 16# (24) Exhibit 17# (25) Exhibit 18 - Filed Under Seal Cover Page# (26) Exhibit 19# (27) Exhibit 20 - Filed Under Seal Cover Page# (28) Exhibit 21 - Filed Under Seal Cover Page# (29) Exhibit 22)(Hornick, John)Received exhibits 3,4,6,8,9,13,18,20 & 21 on 3/13/2006 (Nici, Richard).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 147 Filed: 3/10/2006, Entered: 3/10/2006, Terminated: 1/19/2007 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Assented to MOTION to Seal Exhibits 3, 4, 6, 8, 9, 13, 18, 20, and 21 to ConnectU's Summary of March 3, 2006 Status Report and Requests Related to Discovery Permitted by November 18, 2005 Electronic Order by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 146 Filed: 3/10/2006, Entered: 3/10/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC Notice of Manual Filing with Clerk's Office (Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: 3/6/2006 Order on Motion for Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Robert B. Collings : Electronic ORDER entered re: [145] Motion for Settlement Conference or Mediation. After hearing, DENIED. The plaintiff is unwilling to participate at this time and the Court, in all circumstances, does not see a reasonable probability that a mediation would be successful. (Dolan, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: 3/4/2006 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Robert B. Collings: Motion Hearing held on 3/3/2006 re [121] MOTION to Compel Facebook Defendants' Answers to Interrogatory Nos. 19-23 filed by ConnectU LLC,, Cameron Winklevoss,, Tyler Winklevoss,, Divya Narendra,, [145] MOTION for Settlement Conference or Mediation filed by Mark Zuckerberg,, Dustin Moskovitz,, Andrew McCollum,, Christopher Hughes,, TheFaceBook.com,, [90] Joint MOTION to Compel Testimony from ConnectU Responsive to Defendants' Amended 30(b)(6) Notice filed by Mark Zuckerberg,, Eduardo Saverin,, Dustin Moskovitz,, Andrew McCollum,, Christopher Hughes,, TheFaceBook.com,, [68] MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents in Response to Production Request Nos. 42, 44-46, 70-71, 85-96, 98-105, 107-110, 113, and 169 filed by ConnectU LLC,, Cameron Winklevoss,, Tyler Winklevoss,, Divya Narendra,, [52] MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatory Nos. 6, 9-14, 16, and 18 filed by ConnectU LLC,, Cameron Winklevoss,, Tyler Winklevoss,, Divya Narendra,, [70] Assented to MOTION to Seal Document (Facebook Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatory Nos. 6, 9-14, 16, and 18) filed by Mark Zuckerberg,, Dustin Moskovitz,, Andrew McCollum,, Christopher Hughes,, TheFaceBook.com,, [126] MOTION to Compel Facebook Defendants' Production of Documents in Response to Request for Production Nos. 171, 174-182, and 184-187 filed by ConnectU LLC,, Cameron Winklevoss,, Tyler Winklevoss,, Divya Narendra,, [63] MOTION to Compel MOTION TO COMPEL PARTICULARIZED IDENTIFICATION OF TRADE SECRETS IN RESPONSE TO THE FACEBOOK DEFENDANTS' INTERROGATORY NO. 2; [PROPOSED ORDER] filed by TheFaceBook.com. Further argument offered by plaintiff on Motion # 37; defendants may reply in writing by cob 3/24/2006. Court orders production of source file directory; defendants to produce the directory by cob 3/6/2006. Production will not constitute a waiver of the work-product protection as to any other document. Court denies motion #145. Other motions taken under advisement.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: 2/28/2006 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [145] MOTION for Settlement Conference or Mediation. Motion Hearing set for 3/3/2006 11:15 AM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings. (Dolan, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 145 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: 2/24/2006, Terminated: 3/3/2006 ~Motion for Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Settlement Conference or Mediation by Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com.(Oczek, Jeremy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: 2/22/2006 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered granting [144] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Kenneth W. Curtis for ConnectU LLC (Nici, Richard)receipt #70472 $50
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 144 Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: 2/21/2006, Terminated: 2/22/2006 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kenneth W. Curtis by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Curtis Declaration)(Gelchinsky, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/17/2006, Entered: 2/17/2006 Notice Resetting/Cancelling Deadline
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice Cancelling Hearing. Hearing cancelled: Status Conference set for 2/23/2006 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/14/2006, Entered: 2/14/2006 Order on Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Robert B. Collings : Electronic ORDER entered granting [136] Motion to Seal Document ; granting [138] Motion for Leave to File Reply; and granting [140] Motion for Leave to File Reply to Opposition. (Dolan, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/14/2006, Entered: 2/14/2006 Order on Motion for Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Robert B. Collings : Electronic ORDER entered granting [141] Motion to Reschedule Motion Hearing set for 2/24/06. Motion hearing re-scheduled to March 3, 2006 at 11:15 A.M. (Dolan, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 143 Filed: 2/9/2006, Entered: 2/9/2006 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Opposition re [141] MOTION for Hearing FACEBOOK DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO RESCHEDULE MOTION HEARING SET FOR FEBRUARY 24, 2006 filed by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Grabow, Troy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 141 Filed: 2/8/2006, Entered: 2/8/2006, Terminated: 2/14/2006 Motion for Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Hearing FACEBOOK DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO RESCHEDULE MOTION HEARING SET FOR FEBRUARY 24, 2006 by Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com.(Nagel, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 142 Filed: 2/7/2006, Entered: 2/9/2006 Proposed Document(s) submitted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Document(s) submitted by ConnectU LLC. Document received: Reply to response to Motion to compel. Exhibits 6,7,8 & 9 included, but not scanned. (Nici, Richard)FILED UNDER SEAL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 140 Filed: 2/7/2006, Entered: 2/7/2006, Terminated: 2/14/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Facebook Defendants' Opposition to ConnectU's Motion to Compel Facebook Defendants' Answers to Interrogatory Nos. 19-23 by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Proposed Reply# (2) Exhibit 9 to Proposed Reply# (3) Exhibit 10 to Proposed Reply# (4) Text of Proposed Order)(Grabow, Troy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 139 Filed: 2/7/2006, Entered: 2/7/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Grabow, Troy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 138 Filed: 2/7/2006, Entered: 2/7/2006, Terminated: 2/14/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Facebook Defendants' Opposition to ConnectU's Motion to Compel Facebook Defendants' Production of Documents in Response to Request for Production Nos. 171, 174-182, and 184-187 by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Proposed Reply [Sealed Cover Page]# (2) Exhibit 5 to Proposed Reply# (3) Exhibit 6 to Proposed Reply [Sealed]# (4) Exhibit 7 to Proposed Reply [SEALED]# (5) Exhibit 8 to Proposed Reply [SEALED]# (6) Exhibit 9 to Proposed Reply [SEALED]# (7) Exhibit 10 to Proposed Reply# (8) Exhibit 11 to Proposed Reply# (9) Exhibit 12 to Proposed Reply# (10) Text of Proposed Order Exhibit B Proposed Order)(Grabow, Troy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 137 Filed: 2/7/2006, Entered: 2/7/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC Notice of Filing with Clerk's Office (Grabow, Troy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 136 Filed: 2/7/2006, Entered: 2/7/2006, Terminated: 2/14/2006 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Assented to MOTION to Seal Document - Motion to Seal Plaintiff's Proposed Reply (And Exhibits 6, 7, 8, and 9) to Facebook Defendants' Opposition to ConnectU's Motion to Compel Facebook Defendants' Production of Documents in Response to Request for Production Nos. 171, 174-182, and 184-187 by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Grabow, Troy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: 1/31/2006 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing on Motion:[52] MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatory Nos. 6, 9-14, 16, and 18;[126] MOTION to Compel Facebook Defendants' Production of Documents in Response to Request for Production Nos. 171, 174-182, and 184-187;[90] Joint MOTION to Compel Testimony from ConnectU Responsive to Defendants' Amended 30(b)(6) Notice;[68] MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents in Response to Production Request Nos. 42, 44-46, 70-71, 85-96, 98-105, 107-110, 113, and 169;[121] MOTION to Compel Facebook Defendants' Answers to Interrogatory Nos. 19-23;[63] MOTION to Compel MOTION TO COMPEL PARTICULARIZED IDENTIFICATION OF TRADE SECRETS IN RESPONSE TO THE FACEBOOK DEFENDANTS' INTERROGATORY NO. 2; [PROPOSED ORDER]:Motion Hearing set for 2/24/2006 10:30 AM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings. (Dolan, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 135 Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: 1/23/2006 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re [126] MOTION to Compel Facebook Defendants' Production of Documents in Response to Request for Production Nos. 171, 174-182, and 184-187 filed by Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E# (6) Exhibit F# (7) Exhibit G)(Oczek, Jeremy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 134 Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: 1/23/2006 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposition re [126] MOTION to Compel Facebook Defendants' Production of Documents in Response to Request for Production Nos. 171, 174-182, and 184-187 filed by Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com. (Oczek, Jeremy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 133 Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: 1/23/2006 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re [121] MOTION to Compel Facebook Defendants' Answers to Interrogatory Nos. 19-23 filed by Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Errata C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E# (6) Exhibit F# (7) Exhibit G# (8) Exhibit H# (9) Exhibit I# (10) Exhibit J# (11) Exhibit K)(Oczek, Jeremy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 132 Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: 1/23/2006 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Opposition re [121] MOTION to Compel Facebook Defendants' Answers to Interrogatory Nos. 19-23 filed by Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com. (Oczek, Jeremy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: 1/19/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Robert B. Collings : Electronic ORDER entered granting [131] Motion for Extension of Time for Facebook Defendants to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Motions to Compel. (Dolan, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 131 Filed: 1/18/2006, Entered: 1/18/2006, Terminated: 1/19/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 01/23/2006 to File Response/Reply as to [121] MOTION to Compel Facebook Defendants' Answers to Interrogatory Nos. 19-23, [126] MOTION to Compel Facebook Defendants' Production of Documents in Response to Request for Production Nos. 171, 174-182, and 184-187 by Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com.(Oczek, Jeremy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 130 Filed: 1/17/2006, Entered: 1/17/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on November 18, 2005 before Judge Colling. Digital Recording: Transcribed by Maryann Young. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting Maryann Young at 508/384-2003 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: 1/12/2006 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Robert B. Collings: Electronic ORDER entered granting [117] Motion for Leave to File Surreply, Etc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: 1/12/2006 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Robert B. Collings: Electronic ORDER entered granting [62] Motion, granting [70] Motion to Seal Document, granting [76] Motion to Seal Document, granting [81] Motion to Seal Document, granting [93] Motion to Seal.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: 1/10/2006 Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Robert B. Collings : Electronic ORDER entered granting [120] Motion to Seal Plaintiff's Memo in Support of Motion to Compel Facebook Defts' Answers to Ints and Exhibits; and granting [125] Motion to Seal Exhibit 3 to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Facebook Defts' Production of Documents. (Dolan, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 129 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: 1/10/2006 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re [126] MOTION to Compel Facebook Defendants' Production of Documents in Response to Request for Production Nos. 171, 174-182, and 184-187 filed by ConnectU LLC. FILED UNDER SEAL WITH EXHIBITS 1,2,3 & 5. (Nici, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 128 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: 1/5/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Grabow, Troy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 127 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: 1/5/2006 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re [126] MOTION to Compel Facebook Defendants' Production of Documents in Response to Request for Production Nos. 171, 174-182, and 184-187 filed by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3 - FILED UNDER SEAL COVER PAGE# (4) Exhibit 4)(Grabow, Troy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 126 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: 1/5/2006, Terminated: 9/25/2006 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Compel Facebook Defendants' Production of Documents in Response to Request for Production Nos. 171, 174-182, and 184-187 by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Grabow, Troy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 125 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: 1/5/2006, Terminated: 1/9/2006 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Assented to MOTION to Seal Exhibit 3 to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Facebook Defendants' Production of Documents in Response to Request for Production Nos. 171, 174-182, and 184-187 by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Grabow, Troy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 124 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: 1/5/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC Notice of Filing with Clerk's Office (Grabow, Troy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 123 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: 1/5/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Grabow, Troy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 122 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: 1/5/2006 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re [121] MOTION to Compel Facebook Defendants' Answers to Interrogatory Nos. 19-23 filed by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - FILED UNDER SEAL COVER PAGE# (2) Exhibit 2 - FILED UNDER SEAL COVER PAGE# (3) Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit 4# (5) Exhibit 5 - FILED UNDER SEAL COVER PAGE# (6) Exhibit 6# (7) Exhibit 7# (8) Exhibit 8)(Grabow, Troy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 121 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: 1/5/2006, Terminated: 9/25/2006 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Compel Facebook Defendants' Answers to Interrogatory Nos. 19-23 by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Grabow, Troy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 120 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: 1/5/2006, Terminated: 1/9/2006 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION to Seal Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Compel Facebook Defendants' Answers to Interrogatory Nos. 19-23 - AND Exhibits 1, 2, and 5 by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Grabow, Troy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 119 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: 1/5/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC Notice of Filing with Clerk's Office (Grabow, Troy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 118 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 12/1/2005 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposition re [117] MOTION for Leave to File Surreply to Facebook Defendants' Amended Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Facebook Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com. (Oczek, Jeremy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 11/18/2005, Entered: 11/18/2005 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Robert B. Collings: Motion Hearing held on 11/18/2005 re [37] MOTION to Compel the Production of Mirror Images of Defendants' Hard Drives and Other Electronic Memory Devices and Documents Created After May 21, 2004 filed by ConnectU LLC,, Cameron Winklevoss,, Tyler Winklevoss,, Divya Narendra,, [105] MOTION to Modify March 29, 2005 Scheduling Order filed by ConnectU LLC,, Cameron Winklevoss,, Tyler Winklevoss,, Divya Narendra. After hearing, electronic orders issued as to both motions. (Digital Recording)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 11/18/2005, Entered: 11/18/2005 Order on Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Robert B. Collings: Electronic ORDER entered granting in part and pretermitting in part [37] Motion to Compel. Since defendants represent that they have done everything to search for codes which the plaintiff proposes to do by obtaining mirror images and have produced everything that has been found responsive to plaintiff's requests, the Court will not at this time require the production of mirror images of hard drives within the custody, control and/or possession of defendants but permit plaintiff to take discovery as to the steps the defendants have taken to obtain and produce the codes. If defendants' counsel's representations turn out to be inaccurate, the Court may allow the plaintiff to make mirror images of defendants' hard drives. Further, the defendants shall provide all information to the plaintiff as to the identity of the entity which has possession of the server upon which the Facebook was initially launched and the plaintiff may subpoena that entity to permit the making of a mirror image of the hard drive from which the launch occurred. If the entity objects, it may follow the procedures set forth in Rule 45, Fed. R. Civ. P.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 11/18/2005, Entered: 11/18/2005 Order on Motion for Modification
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Robert B. Collings: Electronic ORDER entered granting [105] Motion for Modification of March 29, 2005 Scheduling Order. Paragraphs (2)(3)(4) of the March 29, 2005 scheduling order are VACATED. After the Court enters orders on all pending discovery motions, the Court will set a Scheduling Order which will provide that all non-expert discovery will be completed in 4 months from the date of the last discovery order; initial expert reports will be served three weeks after that; rebuttal expert reports will be served thirty days later; expert depositions will be completed with thirty days after that. A schedule for filing dispositive motions will be set at a further conference to be scheduled at a time when all discovery is complete.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/18/2005, Entered: 11/18/2005 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Robert B. Collings: Electronic ORDER entered granting [111] Motion for Leave to File.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 117 Filed: 11/17/2005, Entered: 11/17/2005, Terminated: 1/12/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Surreply to Facebook Defendants' Amended Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Facebook Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A- Proposed Surreply# (2) Exhibit A to Proposed Surreply# (3) Exhibit B - to Proposed Surreply# (4) Exhibit C - to Proposed Surreply# (5) Exhibit D - to Proposed Surreply# (6) Text of Proposed Order)(Grabow, Troy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 116 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com re [108] Order (DEFENDANTS' JOINT NOTICE REGARDING REASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636(c)) (Oczek, Jeremy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 115 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC re [108] Order - Plaintiff's Notification Regarding Reassignment Under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636(c) (Grabow, Troy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 114 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter/request (non-motion) from Plaintiff ConnectU LLC Regarding Facebook Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D)(Grabow, Troy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Robert B. Collings: Electronic ORDER entered. It is ORDERED that Attorney Grabow's letter of November 16, 2005 (electronically docketed as #114) be, and the same hereby is, STRICKEN. Such a document may not be filed without leave of Court. See L.R. 7.1(B)(3). Further, the "letter to the judge" format is not the proper method of bringing such matters to the attention of the Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 113 Filed: 11/15/2005, Entered: 11/15/2005 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Response by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC to [112] Notice (Other), Notice (Other) of Pending Motions and Suggestion for Consolidating Oral Argument on All Pending Motions Before the Honorable Magistrate Judge Collings. (Grabow, Troy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 112 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: 11/14/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com and Eduardo Saverin (DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF PENDING MOTIONS AND SUGGESTION FOR CONSOLIDATING ORAL ARGUMENT ON ALL PENDING MOTIONS BEFORE THE HONORABLE MAGISTRATE JUDGE COLLINGS) (Bauer, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 111 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: 11/14/2005, Terminated: 11/18/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Facebook Defendants' Amended Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Facebook Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Nagel, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: 11/14/2005 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Robert B. Collings: ElectronicORDER entered granting [58] Motion for Leave to File, granting [73] Motion for Leave to File, granting [88] Motion for Leave to File, granting [89] Motion for Leave to File, granting [106] Motion for Leave to File, granting [110] Motion for Leave to File.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 110 Filed: 11/8/2005, Entered: 11/8/2005, Terminated: 11/14/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Facebook Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Nagel, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 109 Filed: 11/8/2005, Entered: 11/8/2005 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings Referred for: All pretrial proceedings and Report and Recommendation on any dispositive motions.(Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: 11/3/2005 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Docket #108 corrected because: Attachment uploaded. (Dolan, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 108 Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: 11/1/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Robert B. Collings : ORDER entered regarding decision to consent to reassignment of case. (Dolan, Kathleen) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/3/2005 (Dolan, Kathleen).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: 11/1/2005 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [37] MOTION to Compel the Production of Mirror Images of Defendants' Hard Drives and Other Electronic Memory Devices and Documents Created After May 21, 2004: Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2005 10:30 AM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings. (Dolan, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 107 Filed: 10/28/2005, Entered: 10/28/2005 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposition re [94] MOTION to Dismiss filed by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit 4# (5) Exhibit 5# (6) Exhibit 6# (7) Exhibit 7# (8) Exhibit 8# (9) Exhibit 9# (10) Exhibit 10# (11) Exhibit 11# (12) Exhibit 12# (13) Exhibit 13# (14) Exhibit 14# (15) Exhibit 15# (16) Exhibit 16# (17) Exhibit 17# (18) Exhibit 18# (19) Exhibit 19# (20) Exhibit 20# (21) Exhibit 21# (22) Exhibit 22)(Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 106 Filed: 10/26/2005, Entered: 10/26/2005, Terminated: 11/14/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Assented to MOTION for Leave to File a Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Testimony from ConnectU by Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Text of Proposed Order)(Nagel, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 105 Filed: 10/26/2005, Entered: 10/26/2005, Terminated: 11/18/2005 Motion to Modify
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Modify March 29, 2005 Scheduling Order by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Grabow, Troy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 104 Filed: 10/26/2005, Entered: 10/26/2005 Order Referring MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : ORDER entered. REFERRING MOTION [62] ASSENTED TO MOTION TO SEAL THE FACEBOOK'S DEFENDANTS' MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF THE FACEBOOK DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL PARTICULARIZED IDENTIFICATION OF TRADE SECRETS IN RESPONSE TO THE FACEBO, [73] Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Reply to Defendants' Oppositions to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatory NOS. 6,9-14,16,and 18, [88] Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Facebook Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Compel Particularized Identification of Trade Secrets in Response to the Facebook Defendants' Interrogatory No. 2, [63] MOTION TO COMPEL PARTICULARIZED IDENTIFICATION OF TRADE SECRETS IN RESPONSE TO THE FACEBOOK DEFENDANTS' INTERROGATORY NO. 2; [PROPOSED ORDER], [76] Assented to MOTION to Seal Document Exhibit 21 to Plaintiff's Opposition to the Facebook Defendants' Motion to Compel Particularized Identification of Trade Secrets in Response to the Facebook Defendants' Interogatory NO, [89] Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Defendants' Oppositions to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel the Production of Documents in Response to Production Request Nos. 42, 44-46, 70-71, 85-96, 98-105, 107-110, 113, and 169, [90] Joint MOTION to Compel Testimony from ConnectU Responsive to Defendants' Amended 30(b)(6) Notice, [68] MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents in Response to Production Request Nos. 42, 44-46, 70-71, 85-96, 98-105, 107-110, 113, and 169, [70] Assented to MOTION to Seal Document (Facebook Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatory Nos. 6, 9-14, 16, and 18), [81] Assented to MOTION to Seal Document Assented-To Motion To Seal Exhibit E To The Affidavit Of Joshua H. Walker In Support Of Facebook Defendants' Opposition To Connectu LLC's Motion To Compel The Production Of Documents In Response To Produc, [93] Assented to MOTION to Seal, [58] Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of The Facebook Defendants' CROSS-MOTION for Protective Order [43] to Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings. [94] Motion to dismiss referred to Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings for report and recommendation. (Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 103 Filed: 10/20/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by TheFaceBook.com, TheFaceBook.com (NOTICE OF NAME CHANGE AND ASSENTED-TO MOTION TO AMEND CAPTION) (Oczek, Jeremy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 102 Filed: 10/18/2005, Entered: 10/18/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC Exhibit 8 to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion to Compel Testimony from ConnectU LLC Responsive to Defendants' Amended 30(B)(6) Notice. (Grabow, Troy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 101 Filed: 10/18/2005, Entered: 10/18/2005 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposition re [90] Joint MOTION to Compel Testimony from ConnectU Responsive to Defendants' Amended 30(b)(6) Notice filed by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit Exhibt 4# (5) Exhibit Exhibit 5# (6) Exhibit Exhibit 6# (7) Exhibit Exhibit 7, Part 1# (8) Exhibit Exhibit 7, Part 2# (9) Exhibit Exhibit 7, Part 3# (10) Exhibit Exhibit 8# (11) Exhibit Exhibit 9# (12) Exhibit Exhibit 10)(Grabow, Troy) Modified on 10/19/2005 (Nici, Richard). Received DVD
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 100 Filed: 10/14/2005, Entered: 10/17/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re [94] MOTION to Dismiss filed by TheFaceBook.com. (Nici, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 99 Filed: 10/14/2005, Entered: 10/17/2005 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EXHIBITS 3,6,7,8 & 9 re [95] Declaration by TheFaceBook.com. FILED UNDER SEAL (Nici, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 98 Filed: 10/14/2005, Entered: 10/14/2005 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION /Proof of Service of Under Seal Documents by Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com. (Cooper, Monte)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 97 Filed: 10/14/2005, Entered: 10/14/2005 Appendix/Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPENDIX/EXHIBIT re [94] MOTION to Dismiss of Non-Published Cases In Support by Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 and 2)(Cooper, Monte)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 96 Filed: 10/14/2005, Entered: 10/14/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com of Filing Under Seal Documents with the Clerk's Office (Cooper, Monte)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 95 Filed: 10/14/2005, Entered: 10/14/2005 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION re [94] MOTION to Dismiss of Monte M.F. Cooper by Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 and 2# (2) Exhibit 4 and 5# (3) Exhibit 10)(Cooper, Monte)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 94 Filed: 10/14/2005, Entered: 10/14/2005, Terminated: 3/28/2007 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss by Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss# (2) Text of Proposed Order Dismissing Non-Copyright Claims)(Cooper, Monte)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 93 Filed: 10/14/2005, Entered: 10/14/2005, Terminated: 1/12/2006 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Assented to MOTION to Seal by Mark Zuckerberg, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com.(Cooper, Monte)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 92 Filed: 10/4/2005, Entered: 10/4/2005 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION re [90] Joint MOTION to Compel Testimony from ConnectU Responsive to Defendants' Amended 30(b)(6) Notice by Mark Zuckerberg, Eduardo Saverin, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1-3# (2) Exhibit 4-6# (3) Exhibit 7 (1 of 2)# (4) Exhibit 7 (2 of 2)# (5) Exhibit 8-9# (6) Exhibit 10 (1 of 3)# (7) Exhibit 10 (2 of 3)# (8) Exhibit 10 (3 of 3))(Chatterjee, I.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 91 Filed: 10/4/2005, Entered: 10/4/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MEMORANDUM in Support re [90] Joint MOTION to Compel Testimony from ConnectU Responsive to Defendants' Amended 30(b)(6) Notice filed by Mark Zuckerberg, Eduardo Saverin, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com. (Chatterjee, I.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 90 Filed: 10/4/2005, Entered: 10/4/2005, Terminated: 9/25/2006 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Compel Testimony from ConnectU Responsive to Defendants' Amended 30(b)(6) Notice by Mark Zuckerberg, Eduardo Saverin, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Chatterjee, I.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 89 Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: 9/30/2005, Terminated: 11/14/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Defendants' Oppositions to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel the Production of Documents in Response to Production Request Nos. 42, 44-46, 70-71, 85-96, 98-105, 107-110, 113, and 169 by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - PROPOSED REPLY# (2) Exhibit 27 to Proposed Reply# (3) Exhibit 28 - to Proposed Reply# (4) Exhibit 29 to Proposed Reply# (5) Text of Proposed Order Exhibit B to Motion for Leave to File Reply (Proposed Order))(Grabow, Troy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 88 Filed: 9/27/2005, Entered: 9/27/2005, Terminated: 11/14/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Facebook Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Compel Particularized Identification of Trade Secrets in Response to the Facebook Defendants' Interrogatory No. 2 by TheFaceBook.com. (Attachments: # (1) Reply)(Walker, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/27/2005, Entered: 9/28/2005 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : ElectronicORDER entered granting [86] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Robert D Nagel for Mark Zuckerberg and Dustin Moskovitz The Facebook, Inc., Christopher Hughes, and Andrew McCollum (Nici, Richard) Modified on 9/28/2005 (Nici, Richard). Receipt #67145 $ 50 Modified on 10/17/2005 (Nici, Richard).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 87 Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: 9/26/2005 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBIT E re [84] Affidavit in Opposition to Motion by ConnectU LLC. FILED UNDER SEAL (Nici, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 86 Filed: 9/25/2005, Entered: 9/25/2005, Terminated: 9/27/2005 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert D. Nagel by Mark Zuckerberg, Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, TheFaceBook.com, Dustin Moskovitz, Mark Zuckerberg, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com. (Attachments: # (1) Certification)(Oczek, Jeremy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 85 Filed: 9/23/2005, Entered: 9/23/2005 Appendix/Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPENDIX/EXHIBIT Appendix of Non-Published Cases in Support of Facebook Defendants' Opposition to Connectu LLC's Motion to Compel The Production Of Documents In Response To Production Request Nos. 42, 44-46, 70-71, 85-96, 98-105, 107-110, and 169 by TheFaceBook.com. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit 4# (5) Exhibit 5)(Walker, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 84 Filed: 9/23/2005, Entered: 9/23/2005 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Joshua H. Walker in Opposition re [68] MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents in Response to Production Request Nos. 42, 44-46, 70-71, 85-96, 98-105, 107-110, 113, and 169 filed by TheFaceBook.com. (Walker, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 83 Filed: 9/23/2005, Entered: 9/23/2005 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re [68] MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents in Response to Production Request Nos. 42, 44-46, 70-71, 85-96, 98-105, 107-110, 113, and 169 filed by TheFaceBook.com. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit F# (6) Exhibit G# (7) Exhibit H# (8) Exhibit I# (9) Exhibit J# (10) Exhibit K)(Walker, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 82 Filed: 9/23/2005, Entered: 9/23/2005 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposition re [68] MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents in Response to Production Request Nos. 42, 44-46, 70-71, 85-96, 98-105, 107-110, 113, and 169 filed by TheFaceBook.com. (Walker, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 81 Filed: 9/23/2005, Entered: 9/23/2005, Terminated: 1/12/2006 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION to Seal Document Assented-To Motion To Seal Exhibit E To The Affidavit Of Joshua H. Walker In Support Of Facebook Defendants' Opposition To Connectu LLC's Motion To Compel The Production Of Documents In Response To Production Request Nos. 42, 44-46, 70-71, 85-96,98-105, 107-110, 113, and 169 by TheFaceBook.com.(Walker, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 80 Filed: 9/22/2005, Entered: 9/23/2005 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBIT 21 re [78] Opposition to Motion,, by ConnectU LLC. FILED UNDER SEAL (Nici, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 79 Filed: 9/22/2005, Entered: 9/22/2005 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Robert B. Hawk in Opposition re [68] MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents in Response to Production Request Nos. 42, 44-46, 70-71, 85-96, 98-105, 107-110, 113, and 169 filed by Eduardo Saverin. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 E-mail Exchanges Between Counsel)(Katz, Gordon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 78 Filed: 9/22/2005, Entered: 9/22/2005 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposition re [63] MOTION to Compel MOTION TO COMPEL PARTICULARIZED IDENTIFICATION OF TRADE SECRETS IN RESPONSE TO THE FACEBOOK DEFENDANTS' INTERROGATORY NO. 2; [PROPOSED ORDER] filed by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit 4# (5) Exhibit 5# (6) Exhibit 6# (7) Exhibit 7# (8) Exhibit 8# (9) Exhibit 9# (10) Exhibit 10# (11) Exhibit 11# (12) Exhibit 12# (13) Exhibit 13# (14) Exhibit 14# (15) Exhibit 15# (16) Exhibit 16# (17) Exhibit 17# (18) Exhibit 18# (19) Exhibit 19# (20) Exhibit 20# (21) Exhibit 21 - Notice of Manual Filing# (22) Exhibit 22)(Grabow, Troy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 77 Filed: 9/22/2005, Entered: 9/22/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Grabow, Troy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 76 Filed: 9/22/2005, Entered: 9/22/2005, Terminated: 1/12/2006 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Assented to MOTION to Seal Document Motion to Seal Exhibit 21 to Plaintiff's Opposition to the Facebook Defendants' Motion to Compel Particularized Identification of Trade Secrets in Response to the Facebook Defendants' Interogatory NO. 2 by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order re Motion to Seal)(Grabow, Troy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 75 Filed: 9/22/2005, Entered: 9/22/2005 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [68] MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents in Response to Production Request Nos. 42, 44-46, 70-71, 85-96, 98-105, 107-110, 113, and 169 filed by Eduardo Saverin. (Katz, Gordon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 74 Filed: 9/20/2005, Entered: 9/20/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC re [37] MOTION to Compel the Production of Mirror Images of Defendants' Hard Drives and Other Electronic Memory Devices and Documents Created After May 21, 2004 PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF NEWLY IDENTIFIED AUTHORITY (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Grabow, Troy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 73 Filed: 9/19/2005, Entered: 9/19/2005, Terminated: 11/14/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Reply to Defendants' Oppositions to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatory NOS. 6,9-14,16,and 18 by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Proposed Reply# (2) Exhibit 26 - Exhibit to Proposed Reply# (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/15/2005, Entered: 9/15/2005 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: the relationship of docket entry #72 corrected because: the memorandum was related to the wrong motion. The memorandum was incorrectly linked to #68 and correctly reassigned to #52 (Nici, Richard).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 72 Filed: 9/13/2005, Entered: 9/13/2005 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [52] MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatory Nos. 6, 9-14, 16, and 18 by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Grabow, Troy) Modified on 9/15/2005 (Nici, Richard). FILED UNDER SEAL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 71 Filed: 9/13/2005, Entered: 9/13/2005 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [52] MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatory Nos. 6, 9-14, 16, and 18 filed by Eduardo Saverin. (Hampton, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 70 Filed: 9/13/2005, Entered: 9/13/2005, Terminated: 1/12/2006 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Assented to MOTION to Seal Document (Facebook Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatory Nos. 6, 9-14, 16, and 18) by Mark Zuckerberg, Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, TheFaceBook.com, Dustin Moskovitz, Mark Zuckerberg, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com.(Oczek, Jeremy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 69 Filed: 9/9/2005, Entered: 9/9/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re [68] MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents in Response to Production Request Nos. 42, 44-46, 70-71, 85-96, 98-105, 107-110, 113, and 169 filed by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit 4# (5) Exhibit 5# (6) Exhibit 6# (7) Exhibit 7# (8) Exhibit 8# (9) Exhibit 9# (10) Exhibit 10# (11) Exhibit 11# (12) Exhibit 12# (13) Exhibit 13# (14) Exhibit 14# (15) Exhibit 15# (16) Exhibit 16# (17) Exhibit 17# (18) Exhibit 18# (19) Exhibit 19# (20) Exhibit 20# (21) Exhibit 21# (22) Exhibit 22# (23) Exhibit 23# (24) Exhibit 24# (25) Exhibit 25# (26) Exhibit 26)(Grabow, Troy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 68 Filed: 9/9/2005, Entered: 9/9/2005, Terminated: 9/25/2006 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents in Response to Production Request Nos. 42, 44-46, 70-71, 85-96, 98-105, 107-110, 113, and 169 by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Grabow, Troy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 67 Filed: 9/8/2005, Entered: 9/9/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re INCLUDING EXHIBITS 2 AND 7 [63] MOTION to Compel MOTION TO COMPEL PARTICULARIZED IDENTIFICATION OF TRADE SECRETS IN RESPONSE TO THE FACEBOOK DEFENDANTS' INTERROGATORY NO. 2; [PROPOSED ORDER] filed by TheFaceBook.com. FILED UNDER SEAL (Nici, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 66 Filed: 9/8/2005, Entered: 9/8/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by TheFaceBook.com. (Cooper, Monte)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 65 Filed: 9/8/2005, Entered: 9/8/2005 Affidavit in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT in Support re [63] MOTION to Compel MOTION TO COMPEL PARTICULARIZED IDENTIFICATION OF TRADE SECRETS IN RESPONSE TO THE FACEBOOK DEFENDANTS' INTERROGATORY NO. 2; [PROPOSED ORDER] AFFIDAVIT OF MONTE COOPER IN SUPPORT OF THE FACEBOOK DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL PARRTICULARIZED IDENTIFICATION OF TRADE SECRETS IN RESPONSE TO THE FACEBOOK DEFENDANTS' INTERROGATORY NO. 2. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2 [FILED UNDER SEAL]# (3) Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit 4# (5) Exhibit 5# (6) Exhibit 6# (7) Exhibit 7 [FILED UNDER SEAL]# (8) Exhibit 8# (9) Exhibit 9# (10) Exhibit 10# (11) Exhibit 11# (12) Exhibit 12# (13) Exhibit 13# (14) Exhibit 14# (15) Exhibit 15# (16) Exhibit 16# (17) Exhibit 17# (18) Exhibit 18# (19) Exhibit 19)(Cooper, Monte)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 64 Filed: 9/8/2005, Entered: 9/8/2005 Appendix/Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPENDIX/EXHIBIT re [63] MOTION to Compel MOTION TO COMPEL PARTICULARIZED IDENTIFICATION OF TRADE SECRETS IN RESPONSE TO THE FACEBOOK DEFENDANTS' INTERROGATORY NO. 2; [PROPOSED ORDER] APPENDIX OF NON-PUBLISHED CASES AND SECONDARY AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF THE FACEBOOK DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL PARTICULARIZED IDENTIFICATION OF TRADE SECRETS IN RESPONSE TO THE FACEBOOK DEFENDANTS' INTERROGATORY NO. 2 by TheFaceBook.com. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Errata C)(Cooper, Monte)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 63 Filed: 9/8/2005, Entered: 9/8/2005, Terminated: 9/25/2006 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Compel MOTION TO COMPEL PARTICULARIZED IDENTIFICATION OF TRADE SECRETS IN RESPONSE TO THE FACEBOOK DEFENDANTS' INTERROGATORY NO. 2; [PROPOSED ORDER] by TheFaceBook.com. (Attachments: # (1))(Cooper, Monte)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 62 Filed: 9/8/2005, Entered: 9/8/2005, Terminated: 1/12/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Assented to MOTION re [61] Notice (Other) ASSENTED TO MOTION TO SEAL THE FACEBOOK'S DEFENDANTS' MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF THE FACEBOOK DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL PARTICULARIZED IDENTIFICATION OF TRADE SECRETS IN RESPONSE TO THE FACEBOOK DEFENDANTS' INTERROGATORY NO. 2 AND EXHIBITS 2 AND 7; [PROPOSED] ORDER by TheFaceBook.com. (Attachments: # (1))(Cooper, Monte)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 61 Filed: 9/8/2005, Entered: 9/8/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by TheFaceBook.com NOTICE OF FILING WITH THE CLERK'S OFFICE (Cooper, Monte)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 60 Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: 9/6/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re [37] MOTION to Compel the Production of Mirror Images of Defendants' Hard Drives and Other Electronic Memory Devices and Documents Created After May 21, 2004 THE FACEBOOK DEFENDANTS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; AFFIDAVIT OF MONTE M.F. COPPER and APPENDIX OF NON-PUBLISHED CASES filed by TheFaceBook.com. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit # (2) Exhibit E# (3) Exhibit F# (4) Appendix # (5) Exhibit 8# (6) Exhibit 9# (7) Exhibit 10# (8) Exhibit 11)(Cooper, Monte)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 59 Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: 9/6/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Eduardo Saverin re [43] Opposition to Motion,, Joining Cross-Motion for Protective Order (Hampton, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 58 Filed: 9/2/2005, Entered: 9/2/2005, Terminated: 11/14/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of The Facebook Defendants' CROSS-MOTION for Protective Order [43] by Mark Zuckerberg, Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, TheFaceBook.com, Dustin Moskovitz, Mark Zuckerberg, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com.(Oczek, Jeremy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 57 Filed: 9/1/2005, Entered: 9/1/2005 Order Referring MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : ORDER entered. REFERRING MOTION [52] MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatory Nos. 6, 9-14, 16, and 18 filed by ConnectU LLC,, Cameron Winklevoss,, Tyler Winklevoss,, Divya Narendra, to Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings.(Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/1/2005, Entered: 9/1/2005 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: docket entries 43 & 47 corrected because: the documents were not electronically signed (Nici, Richard).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 9/1/2005, Entered: 9/1/2005 Order on Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Robert B. Collings : Electronic ORDER entered granting [53] Motion to Seal Document. (Dolan, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 9/1/2005, Entered: 9/1/2005 Order on Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Robert B. Collings : Electronic ORDER entered granting [48] Motion to Seal Document ; and granting [50] Motion for Leave to File Reply to Defendants' Opposition. (Dolan, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/31/2005, Entered: 8/31/2005 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: description of exhibit 20 change to 21 in docket entry #54 corrected because: a typographical error was made while filing. (Nici, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 56 Filed: 8/30/2005, Entered: 8/31/2005 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EXHIBITS 16, 20 & 22 re [54] Memorandum in Support of Motion,,, by ConnectU LLC. FILED UNDER SEAL (Nici, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 55 Filed: 8/30/2005, Entered: 8/30/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC Service of Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatory Nos. 6, 9-14, 16, and 18 - AND Exhibits 16, 20, and 22. (Grabow, Troy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 54 Filed: 8/30/2005, Entered: 8/30/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re [52] MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatory Nos. 6, 9-14, 16, and 18 filed by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. FILED UNDER SEAL (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit Exhibit 4# (5) Exhibit Exhibit 5# (6) Exhibit Exhibit 6# (7) Exhibit Exhibit 7# (8) Exhibit Exhibit 8# (9) Exhibit Exhibit 9# (10) Exhibit Exhibit 10# (11) Exhibit Exhibit 11# (12) Exhibit Exhibit 12# (13) Exhibit Exhibit 13# (14) Exhibit Exhibit 14# (15) Exhibit Exhibit 15# (16) Exhibit Exhibit 16 - Notice of Manual Filing# (17) Exhibit Exhibit 17# (18) Exhibit Exhibit 18# (19) Exhibit Exhibit 19# (20) Exhibit Exhibit 20 - Notice of Manual Filing# (21) Exhibit Exhibit 21# (22) Exhibit Exhibit 22 - Notice of Manual Filing# (23) Exhibit Exhibit 23# (24) Exhibit Exhibit 24# (25) Exhibit Exhibit 25)(Grabow, Troy) Modified on 8/31/2005 (Nici, Richard). Modified on 9/7/2005 (Nici, Richard).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 53 Filed: 8/30/2005, Entered: 8/30/2005, Terminated: 9/1/2005 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Assented to MOTION to Seal Document (s): Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatory Nos. 6, 9-14, 16, and 18 - AND Exhibits 16, 20, and 22 by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC.(Grabow, Troy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 52 Filed: 8/30/2005, Entered: 8/30/2005, Terminated: 3/31/2006 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatory Nos. 6, 9-14, 16, and 18 by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Grabow, Troy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 51 Filed: 8/26/2005, Entered: 8/29/2005 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBIT #26 re [50] Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel the Production of Mirror Images of Defendants' Hard Drives and Other Electronic Memory Devices and Documents Created by ConnectU LLC. FILED UNDER SEAL (Nici, Richard) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/1/2005 (Nici, Richard).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 50 Filed: 8/26/2005, Entered: 8/26/2005, Terminated: 9/1/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel the Production of Mirror Images of Defendants' Hard Drives and Other Electronic Memory Devices and Documents Created After May 21, 2004 AND Plaintiff's Opposition to THEFACEBOOK Defendants' Cross-Motion for a Protective Order by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - PROPOSED REPLY BRIEF# (2) Exhibit 26 - Notice of Filing Document Under Seal# (3) Exhibit 27 to Proposed Reply Brief# (4) Exhibit 28 to Proposed Reply# (5) Exhibit 29 to Proposed Reply# (6) Exhibit 30 to Proposed Reply# (7) Exhibit 31 to Proposed Reply# (8) Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER - Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief)(Grabow, Troy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 49 Filed: 8/26/2005, Entered: 8/26/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC for Sealed Exhibit 26 in Support of Plaintiff's Reply Brief. (Grabow, Troy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 48 Filed: 8/26/2005, Entered: 8/26/2005, Terminated: 9/1/2005 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Assented to MOTION to Seal Document Exhibit 26 to Plaintiff's Proposed Reply Brief in Support of its Motion to Compel the Production of Mirror Images of Defendants' Hard Drives and Other Electronic Memory Devicecs and Documents Created After May 21, 2004 Pursuant to Parties' Stipulated Protective Order by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC.(Grabow, Troy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: 8/24/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Mark Zuckerberg, Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, TheFaceBook.com, Dustin Moskovitz, Mark Zuckerberg, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com re [43] Opposition to Motion, Newly Identified Authority In Support of Opposition and Cross-Motion (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B)(Chatterjee, I.) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/1/2005 (Nici, Richard).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 46 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005 Appendix/Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPENDIX/EXHIBIT re [43] Opposition to Motion, of Non-Published Cases and Secondary Authority by Mark Zuckerberg, Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, TheFaceBook.com, Dustin Moskovitz, Mark Zuckerberg, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit 4# (5) Exhibit 5# (6) Exhibit 6# (7) Exhibit 7)(Walker, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 45 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005 Affidavit in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT in Support re [43] Opposition to Motion, and Cross-Motion for Protective Order. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D)(Walker, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 44 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005 Affidavit in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT in Support re [43] Opposition to Motion, and Cross-Motion for Protective Order. (Walker, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposition re [37] MOTION to Compel the Production of Mirror Images of Defendants' Hard Drives and Other Electronic Memory Devices and Documents Created After May 21, 2004 and CROSS-MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Mark Zuckerberg, Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, TheFaceBook.com, Dustin Moskovitz, Mark Zuckerberg, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Joshua) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/1/2005 (Nici, Richard).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 42 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposition re [37] MOTION to Compel the Production of Mirror Images of Defendants' Hard Drives and Other Electronic Memory Devices and Documents Created After May 21, 2004 filed by Eduardo Saverin. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C)(Hampton, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/11/2005, Entered: 8/11/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Robert B. Collings : Electronic ORDER entered granting [41] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Compel Production. (Dolan, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 41 Filed: 8/10/2005, Entered: 8/10/2005, Terminated: 8/11/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 8/18/2005 to File Response/Reply as to [37] MOTION to Compel the Production of Mirror Images of Defendants' Hard Drives and Other Electronic Memory Devices and Documents Created After May 21, 2004 by Mark Zuckerberg, Eduardo Saverin, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com.(Hampton, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 40 Filed: 8/2/2005, Entered: 8/2/2005 Order Referring MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : ORDER entered. REFERRING MOTION [37] MOTION to Compel the Production of Mirror Images of Defendants' Hard Drives and Other Electronic Memory Devices and Documents Created After May 21, 2004 filed by ConnectU LLC,, Cameron Winklevoss,, Tyler Winklevoss,, Divya Narendra, to Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings.(Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 39 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: 7/29/2005, Terminated: 7/29/2005 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION to Seal Document Exhibit 20 to Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel the Production of Mirror Images of Defendants' Hard Drives and Other Electronic Memory Devices and Documents Created After May 21, 2004 by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC.(Gelchinsky, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: 7/29/2005 Order on Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered granting [39] Motion to Seal Document (Nici, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 38 Filed: 7/28/2005, Entered: 7/28/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re [37] MOTION to Compel the Production of Mirror Images of Defendants' Hard Drives and Other Electronic Memory Devices and Documents Created After May 21, 2004 filed by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit 4# (5) Exhibit 5# (6) Exhibit 6# (7) Exhibit 7# (8) Exhibit 8# (9) Exhibit 9# (10) Exhibit 10# (11) Exhibit 11# (12) Exhibit 12# (13) Exhibit 13# (14) Exhibit 14# (15) Exhibit 15# (16) Exhibit 16# (17) Exhibit 17A# (18) Exhibit 17B# (19) Exhibit 18# (20) Exhibit 19# (21) Exhibit 20# (22) Exhibit 21# (23) Exhibit 22# (24) Exhibit 23# (25) Exhibit 24# (26) Exhibit 25)(Gelchinsky, Jonathan) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/29/2005 (Nici, Richard).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 37 Filed: 7/28/2005, Entered: 7/28/2005, Terminated: 11/18/2005 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Compel the Production of Mirror Images of Defendants' Hard Drives and Other Electronic Memory Devices and Documents Created After May 21, 2004 by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A)(Gelchinsky, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 36 Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance Attorney Daniel K. Hampton and Gordon P. Katz terminated. (Hampton, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 34 Filed: 7/7/2005, Entered: 7/7/2005, Terminated: 7/7/2005 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert B. Hawk and Bhanu K. Sadasivan by Eduardo Saverin. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A to Amended Assented-To Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice# (2) Exhibit B to Amended Assented-To Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice# (3) Exhibit C To Amended Assented-To Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Hampton, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/7/2005, Entered: 7/7/2005 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered granting [33] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, granting [34] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Nici, Richard). Receipt #65431 $100
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 35 Filed: 7/6/2005, Entered: 7/7/2005 Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : ORDER entered. Second Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER(Nici, Richard).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 33 Filed: 7/6/2005, Entered: 7/6/2005, Terminated: 7/7/2005 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert B. Hawk and Bhanu K. Sadasivan by Eduardo Saverin, Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, Eduardo Saverin, Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A to Motion for Pro Hac Vice# (2) Exhibit B to Motion for Pro Hac Vice# (3) Exhibit C to Motion for Pro Hac Vice)(Hampton, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 32 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION Second Stipulated Protective Order by ConnectU LLC, Mark Zuckerberg, Eduardo Saverin, Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, Eduardo Saverin, TheFaceBook.com, Dustin Moskovitz, Mark Zuckerberg, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com. (Gelchinsky, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: 6/23/2005 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered granting [31] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Joshua H. Walker for Christopher Hughes; TheFaceBook.com; Dustin Moskovitz and Andrew McCollum (Nici, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 31 Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: 6/17/2005, Terminated: 6/23/2005 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joshua H. Walker by Mark Zuckerberg, Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, TheFaceBook.com, Dustin Moskovitz, Mark Zuckerberg, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com. (Attachments: # (1) Certification)(Oczek, Jeremy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/16/2005, Entered: 6/16/2005 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered. ORDER REQUIRING ELECTRONIC FILING. It is hereby ORDERED that, unless leave is granted, upon good cause shown, to file paper documents in lieu of electronic filing via this Court's CM/ECF system, ALL future submissions in this case must be electronically filed. Such filings shall be made in accordance with, and subject to, the terms and conditions of electronic filing as set forth by this Court. All parties and counsel who choose to appear in this action must make arrangements to register for participation in electronic case filing, if they have not already done so. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Notices, Orders and Memoranda of the Court will only be filed and served electronically. Once a party or counsel has registered for electronic filing, it is his/her responsibility to monitor his/her e-mail to ensure receipt of electronic notices. Any changes in e-mail addresses must be reported to the Court immediately.(Nici, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/14/2005, Entered: 6/16/2005 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered granting [26] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added G. Hopkins Guy, III for Dustin Moskovitz; Andrew McCollum; Christopher Hughes; TheFaceBook.com; Mark Zuckerberg, I. Neel Chatterjee for Dustin Moskovitz; Andrew McCollum; Christopher Hughes; TheFaceBook.com; Mark Zuckerberg, Monte Cooper for Dustin Moskovitz; Andrew McCollum; Christopher Hughes; TheFaceBook.com; Mark Zuckerberg , Donald Daybell for Dustin Moskovitz; Andrew McCollum; Christopher Hughes; TheFaceBook.com; Mark Zuckerberg , granting [30] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added G. Hopkins Guy, III for Dustin Moskovitz; Andrew McCollum; Christopher Hughes; TheFaceBook.com; Mark Zuckerberg , I. Neel Chatterjee for Dustin Moskovitz; Andrew McCollum; Christopher Hughes; TheFaceBook.com; Mark Zuckerberg , Monte Cooper for Dustin Moskovitz; Andrew McCollum; Christopher Hughes; TheFaceBook.com; Mark Zuckerberg , Donald Daybell for Dustin Moskovitz; Andrew McCollum; Christopher Hughes; TheFaceBook.com; Mark Zuckerberg (Nici, Richard) Modified on 6/16/2005 (Nici, Richard).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/14/2005, Entered: 6/16/2005 Receipt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Receipt#65023 $200 for Admission Pro Hac Vice for four attorneys. (Nici, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 30 Filed: 6/10/2005, Entered: 6/10/2005, Terminated: 6/14/2005 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by G. Hopkins Guy, III, I. Neel Chatterjee, Monte Cooper, and Donald Daybell by Mark Zuckerberg, Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, TheFaceBook.com, Dustin Moskovitz, Mark Zuckerberg, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com. (Attachments: # (1) Certifications)(Bauer, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 29 Filed: 6/10/2005, Entered: 6/10/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy P. Oczek on behalf of Mark Zuckerberg, Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, TheFaceBook.com, Dustin Moskovitz, Mark Zuckerberg, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com (Oczek, Jeremy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 28 Filed: 6/10/2005, Entered: 6/10/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M. Bauer on behalf of Mark Zuckerberg, Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, TheFaceBook.com, Dustin Moskovitz, Mark Zuckerberg, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, TheFaceBook.com (Bauer, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 27 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/8/2005 Certificate of Good Standing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Good Standing re [26] MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Troy Grabow Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 64791. by ConnectU LLC, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss. (Nici, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 26 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/8/2005 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Troy Grabow Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 64791. by ConnectU LLC, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss.(Nici, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 25 Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: 5/27/2005 Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Stipulated Protective ORDER entered. PROTECTIVE ORDER(Nici, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 24 Filed: 5/24/2005, Entered: 5/24/2005 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed STIPULATION for Protective Order by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A to Protective Order)(Gelchinsky, Jonathan) Modified on 5/27/2005 (Nici, Richard).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 23 Filed: 3/29/2005, Entered: 3/29/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 4/28/2005. Discovery due by 12/15/2005. Motions due by 1/27/2006. Status Report due 2/16/05. Status Conference set for 2/23/2006 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock.(Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/24/2005, Entered: 3/25/2005 Scheduling Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Scheduling Conference held on 3/24/2005. Schedule set: amendments/joining parties by 4/28/05; all discovery, including experts by 12/15/05; Plaintiff experts by 11/1/05; rebuttal experts by 12/1/05; dispositive motions by 1/27/06; response in 14 days; no reply. (Court Reporter Pam Owens.) (Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 22 Filed: 3/18/2005, Entered: 3/18/2005 Joint statement re scheduling conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Plainitff's Certification of Conference# (2) Exhibit Counterclaim defendants' Statement of Conference# (3) Exhibit Defendants' Statement of Conference)(Hampton, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 21 Filed: 2/23/2005, Entered: 2/23/2005 Notice of Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference set for 3/24/2005 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 20 Filed: 2/7/2005, Entered: 2/7/2005 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Counterclaim of TheFaceBook, Inc. and Mark Zuckerberg by ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC.(Gelchinsky, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 19 Filed: 1/13/2005, Entered: 1/13/2005 Notice of Change of Address or Firm Name
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Address by Jonathan M. Gelchinsky (Gelchinsky, Jonathan) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/18/2005 (Nici, Richard).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 18 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: 1/12/2005 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Divya Narendra waiver sent on 12/27/2004, answer due 2/25/2005. (Hampton, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 17 Filed: 12/21/2004, Entered: 12/21/2004 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Tyler Winklevoss waiver sent on 12/14/2004, answer due 2/14/2005. (Hampton, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 16 Filed: 12/21/2004, Entered: 12/21/2004 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Cameron Winklevoss waiver sent on 12/14/2004, answer due 2/14/2005. (Hampton, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 15 Filed: 12/10/2004, Entered: 12/10/2004 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION re [14] Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, For Extension of Time for ConnectU LLC to Respond to Counterclaims of Mark Zuckerberg and TheFaceBook.com, Inc. by ConnectU LLC, TheFaceBook.com, Mark Zuckerberg. (Gelchinsky, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 14 Filed: 11/18/2004, Entered: 11/18/2004 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendants' ANSWER to Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, ConnectU LLC by Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, Eduardo Saverin, TheFaceBook.com, Mark Zuckerberg.(Hampton, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 10/28/2004, Entered: 11/8/2004 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, Eduardo Saverin, TheFaceBook.com and Mark Zuckerberg , filed by ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B)(Barrette, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 12 Filed: 10/22/2004, Entered: 10/22/2004 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, Eduardo Saverin, TheFaceBook.com, Mark Zuckerberg. (Hampton, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/22/2004, Entered: 10/22/2004 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered: The Stipulation with respect to an extension of the time for responding the Complaint to November 18, 2004 is treated as a motion for an extension of time and is hereby ALLOWED.(Greenberg, Rebecca)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 11 Filed: 10/18/2004, Entered: 10/19/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed Eduardo Saverin served on 9/29/2004, answer due 10/19/2004. (Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/28/2004, Entered: 9/28/2004 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered granting [10] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added John F. Hornick for ConnectU LLC, Margaret A. Esquenet for ConnectU LLC. Attorneys admitted pro hac vice should register for CM/ECF - electronic filing/electronic noticing - online at www.mad.uscourts.gov (Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 9 Filed: 9/23/2004, Entered: 9/23/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Gordon P. Katz on behalf of all defendants (Katz, Gordon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/23/2004, Entered: 9/23/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered granting [7] Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to October 23, 2004 to File Response/Reply to Complaint by Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, Eduardo Saverin, TheFaceBook.com, Mark Zuckerberg. (Greenberg, Rebecca)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 9/22/2004, Entered: 9/22/2004 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by TheFaceBook.com a/k/a TheFacebook, Inc.. (Hampton, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 7 Filed: 9/22/2004, Entered: 9/22/2004, Terminated: 9/23/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to October 23, 2004 to File Response/Reply to Complaint by Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, Eduardo Saverin, TheFaceBook.com, Mark Zuckerberg.(Hampton, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 10 Filed: 9/17/2004, Entered: 9/28/2004 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Margaret A. Esquenet and John F. Hornick Filing fee $ 100.00, receipt number 58797. by ConnectU LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Margaret Esquenet # (2) Declaration of John F. Hornick)(Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 6 Filed: 9/9/2004, Entered: 9/17/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed Dustin Moskovitz served on 9/3/2004, answer due 9/23/2004. (Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 5 Filed: 9/9/2004, Entered: 9/17/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed Christopher Hughes served on 9/3/2004, answer due 9/23/2004. (Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 9/9/2004, Entered: 9/17/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed Mark Zuckerberg served on 9/3/2004, answer due 9/23/2004. (Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 9/9/2004, Entered: 9/17/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed Andrew McCollum served on 9/3/2004, answer due 9/23/2004. (Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 9/2/2004, Entered: 9/3/2004 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ConnectU LLC. (Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/2/2004, Entered: 9/3/2004 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT Filing fee: $ 150, receipt number 58398, filed by ConnectU LLC.(Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/2/2004, Entered: 2/7/2005 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ***Attorney Jonathan M. Gelchinsky for ConnectU LLC and ConnectU LLC added. (Attorney is on complaint, but was not added at the time the case was entered onto CM/ECF) (Hurley, Virginia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/2/2004, Entered: 9/3/2004 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Collings. (Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/2/2004, Entered: 9/3/2004 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Summons Issued as to Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, Eduardo Saverin, TheFaceBook.com, Mark Zuckerberg. (Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Appeal Record Returned: 300 Notice of Appeal, (Ramos, Jeanette) Modified to remove document number on 7/25/2008 (Seelye, Terri). (Entered: 07/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 968 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?