Trainer et al v. Red Hat, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 5:15-cv-00201

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 29, 2016 at 11:09 AM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Thomas Trainer, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Ofc of David H. Greenberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Scott Houtz +1 323 782 0500

Toggle Switch Represented by Mann & Elias

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Imad Younan Elias +1 323 857 9500
v.
No Logo Rangu Rangashari, Defendant
Red Hat, Inc. Red Hat, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Littler Mendelson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adam J. Fiss +1 408 998 4150 afiss@littler.com
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: None Stipulation without Proposed Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal: Case Management Conference held on 4/28/2015. Jury Trial set for 5/9/2016 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Pretrial Conference set for 4/29/2016 at 10:00 AM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Case management scheduling order to issue. FTR Time: (10:16 to 10:20). Plaintiff Attorney present: No appearance. Defendant Attorney(s) present: Adam Fiss and Megan Ottoboni. This is a text only Minute Entry. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/28/2015) (Entered: 04/28/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None Order on Stipulation selecting Private ADR
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None
                          Defendant Red Hat, Inc.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses byRed Hat, Inc.. (Fiss, Adam) (Filed on 2/3/2015) (Entered: 02/03/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO APRIL 28, 2015 by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting 11 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2015) (Entered: 02/03/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None
                                CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING MAY 12, 2015 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RE CONSENT/DECLINATION DEADLINE: 5/12/2015 Case Management Conference is advanced to 2/24/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. Case Management Statement due by 2/17/2015. Parties shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge within 14 days of this notice, by 2/12/2015. Forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2015) (Entered: 01/29/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2015) (Entered: 01/14/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None Notice of Removal
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 69 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?