Medina v. Reilly
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-11983-RWZ

Tags
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Dan Medina, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Kathleen M. Dennehy, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daryl F. Glazer +617727 330 0ext102 +1 617 727 7403 Dfglazer@doc.state.ma.us
No Logo Romney, Willard Mitt, Defendant
Officially listed as "Mitt Romney"

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daryl F. Glazer +617727 330 0ext102 +1 617 727 7403 Dfglazer@doc.state.ma.us
No Logo Paula D. Silsby, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Damian W. Wilmot +1 617 570 1368 +1 617 523 1231 dwilmot@goodwinprocter.com
No Logo Thomas Reilly, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Massachusetts Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daryl F. Glazer +617727 330 0ext102 +1 617 727 7403 Dfglazer@doc.state.ma.us
Office Boston
Filed 9/14/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Suffolk
Terminated 10/26/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 9 Filed: 10/26/2004, Entered: 10/26/2004 Judgment*Court Filing
Judge Rya W. Zobel : ORDER entered JUDGMENT entered DISMISSING the case against all defendants.(Urso, Lisa)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/6/2010, Entered: None
    Letter regarding access to court w/attachments by Dan Medina.(Johnson, Jay) Modified on 4/6/2010 (Johnson, Jay). (Entered: 04/06/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document 8 Filed: 10/26/2004, Entered: 10/26/2004 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
      Judge Rya W. Zobel : Order ORDER entered granting [3] Motion to Dismiss, granting [6] Motion to Dismiss. Judgment may be entered dismissing the complaint. (Urso, Lisa)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 10/26/2004, Entered: 10/26/2004 Terminated Case
        Civil Case Terminated. (Urso, Lisa)
          LREF
          Legal Document 7 Filed: 10/1/2004, Entered: 10/1/2004 Memorandum in Support of Motion
          MEMORANDUM in Support re [6] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Kathleen M. Dennehy, Thomas Reilly, Mitt Romney. (Glazer, Daryl)
            LREF
            Legal Document 6 Filed: 10/1/2004, Entered: 10/1/2004, Terminated: 10/26/2004 Motion to Dismiss
            MOTION to Dismiss by Kathleen M. Dennehy, Mitt Romney, Thomas Reilly.(Glazer, Daryl)
              LREF
              Legal Document 5 Filed: 9/23/2004, Entered: 9/24/2004 state court record
              STATE COURT Record. (Johnson, Jay)
                LREF
                Legal Document 4 Filed: 9/22/2004, Entered: 9/23/2004 Opposition to Motion
                Opposition re [3] MOTION to Dismiss . (Johnson, Jay)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 9/14/2004, Entered: 9/15/2004 Motion to Dismiss
                  MOTION to Dismiss by Paula D. Silsby.(Johnson, Jay)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 9/14/2004, Entered: 9/15/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                    NOTICE of Appearance by Damian W. Wilmot on behalf of Paula D. Silsby (Johnson, Jay)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/14/2004, Entered: 9/15/2004 Notice of Removal
                      NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Paula D. Silsby from Worcester Superior, case number WOCV 2004-01468. $ 150, receipt number NA, filed by Paula D. Silsby.(Johnson, Jay)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 9/14/2004, Entered: 9/15/2004 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                        If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Collings. (Johnson, Jay)
                          LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 61 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?