Sheehan et al v. A.C. Electric Systems, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-11970-DPW

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Anthony J. Salamone, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Local 103, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Russell F. Sheehan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
v.
No Logo A.C. Electric Systems, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Sovereign Bancorp, Inc., Trustee
Officially listed as "Sovereign Bank"
Office Boston
Filed 9/10/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Transfer to Another District
County Suffolk
Terminated 6/10/2005
Origin 4
Reopened 6/21/2005
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 6/21/2005, Entered: 6/21/2005 Case Reopened
Case Reopened (Nici, Richard)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 6/20/2005, Entered: 6/20/2005 Terminated Case
    Civil Case Terminated. (Nici, Richard)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 6/20/2005, Entered: 6/20/2005 Terminate Motions
      Motions terminated: [13] MOTION for Default Judgment as to A.C. Electrical Systems, Inc. filed by Russell F. Sheehan,, Anthony J. Salamone,, Local 103, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers,. (Nici, Richard)
        LREF
        Legal Document 19 Filed: 6/10/2005, Entered: 6/21/2005 Default -JudgmentCourt Filing
        Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : ORDER entered. DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plantiff (Nici, Richard)
          LREF
          Legal Document 18 Filed: 5/11/2005, Entered: 5/11/2005 Affidavit
          AFFIDAVIT of Anne R. Sills by Russell F. Sheehan, Anthony J. Salamone, Local 103, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers. (Geiman, Gregory)
            LREF
            Legal Document 17 Filed: 5/11/2005, Entered: 5/11/2005 Affidavit
            AFFIDAVIT of Russell Sheehan as to Military Service, Infancy and Incompetence by Russell F. Sheehan, Anthony J. Salamone, Local 103, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers. (Geiman, Gregory)
              LREF
              Legal Document 16 Filed: 5/11/2005, Entered: 5/11/2005 Affidavit
              AFFIDAVIT of Russell Sheehan by Russell F. Sheehan, Anthony J. Salamone, Local 103, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers. (Geiman, Gregory)
                LREF
                Legal Document 15 Filed: 5/11/2005, Entered: 5/11/2005 Proposed Document(s) submitted
                Proposed Document(s) submitted by Russell F. Sheehan, Anthony J. Salamone, Local 103, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers. Document received: Default Judgment. (Geiman, Gregory)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 14 Filed: 5/11/2005, Entered: 5/11/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                  MEMORANDUM in Support re [13] MOTION for Default Judgment as to A.C. Electrical Systems, Inc. filed by Russell F. Sheehan, Anthony J. Salamone, Local 103, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers. (Geiman, Gregory)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 13 Filed: 5/11/2005, Entered: 5/11/2005, Terminated: 6/20/2005 Motion for Default Judgment
                    MOTION for Default Judgment as to A.C. Electrical Systems, Inc. by Russell F. Sheehan, Anthony J. Salamone, Local 103, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers.(Geiman, Gregory)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 3/21/2005, Entered: 3/22/2005 Mail Returned
                      Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to A.C. Electrical Systems Inc., (Nici, Richard)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 12 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: 3/31/2005 Standing Order re motions for default judgmentCourt Filing
                        Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on motions for default judgment re [11] Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default filed by A.C. Electric Systems, Inc., (Nici, Richard)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: 3/31/2005 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default
                          NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to A.C. Electric Systems, Inc. Mailed on 3/14/05 (Nici, Richard)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: 4/13/2005 Order on Motion for Entry of Default
                            Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered granting [9] Motion for Entry of Default. (Rynne, Michelle)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 10 Filed: 3/11/2005, Entered: 3/15/2005 Request for notice of default
                              Verified Request for notice of default. (Nici, Richard)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/11/2005, Entered: 3/11/2005, Terminated: 3/14/2005 Motion for Entry of Default
                                MOTION for Entry of Default by Russell F. Sheehan, Anthony J. Salamone, Local 103, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers.(Geiman, Gregory)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 2/25/2005, Entered: 2/25/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                  Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : PROCEDURAL ORDER entered. More than 20 days have elapsed since service was effected in this matter (or more than 60 days after waiver of service) and no appearance has been entered by the defendant(s). Unless appropriate action is taken within 20 days of this Order, this case is subject to dismissal for lack of prosecution.?(Rynne, Michelle)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: 1/18/2005 Preliminary InjunctionCourt Filing
                                    Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : ORDER entered. PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION(Nici, Richard)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 1/4/2005, Entered: 1/13/2005 Certificate of Consultation
                                      CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION re [3] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Anne R. Sills on behalf of Russell F. Sheehan. (Nici, Richard)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: 12/16/2004 Affidavit
                                        AFFIDAVIT of Russell Sheehan by Russell F. Sheehan. (Nici, Richard)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: 12/16/2004 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                          Plantiff's MEMORANDUM in Support re [3] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Local 103, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Anthony J. Salamone, Russell F. Sheehan. (Nici, Richard)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: 12/16/2004 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                            Plantiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Local 103, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Anthony J. Salamone, Russell F. Sheehan.(Nici, Richard)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 11/12/2004, Entered: 11/18/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed A.C. Electric Systems, Inc. served on 11/1/2004, answer due 11/22/2004. (Nici, Richard)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/10/2004, Entered: 9/15/2004 Complaint
                                                COMPLAINT Filing fee: $ 150, receipt number 58383, filed by Local 103, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Anthony J. Salamone, Russell F. Sheehan. (Attachments: # (1) Category Sheet/Civil Cover Sheet)(Rynne, Michelle)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 9/10/2004, Entered: 9/15/2004 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                                If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Cohen. (Rynne, Michelle)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/10/2004, Entered: 9/15/2004 Summons Issued
                                                  Summons Issued as to A.C. Electric Systems, Inc. (Rynne, Michelle)
                                                    LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 24 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?